Bravo et al v. Pelosi et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bravo, P. P., Lindsey Nguyen, D. D., S. M., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, T. M., Jennilyn Salinas, J Cann and Maurice Lynnette
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg, Mike Podhorzer, Pete Sessions, Chuck Schumer, Nancy Pelosi, Brad Raffensperger, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Mitch McConnell, Jack Dorsey, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, All 50 State Governors, All 50 State Secretaries of State, Republican National Committee, All Members of 117th U.S. Congress, Ben Sasse, Cong. Jerry McNerney, Nellie M. Gorbea, Joe Wilson, Cong. Zoe Lofgren, Cong. John Larson, Paul D. Tonko, Pete Stauber, Andy Harris, Mike Gallagher, Edward A. Buchanan, Elaine Luria, Ronny Jackson, Burgess Owens, Gary Palmer, Cong. Ken Calvert, Bill Hagerty, Cong. Darrell Issa, Bill Huizenga, Albio Sires, Sen. Richard J. Durbin, Cong. Mike Quigley, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Sen. John Boozman, Sec. Josh Green, Steve Cohen, Daniel Meuser, Cynthia Axne, Cong. Vern Buchanan, A. Donald McEachin, Ayanna Pressley, Cong. Jahana Hayes, Gov. Ron DeSantis, Tony Gonzales, Yvette Herrell, Troy Balderson, Tahesha Way, Gov. JB Pritzker, Markwayne Mullin, Sec. Lauren M. Lee, Sen. Marco Rubio, Joseph Morelle, Jack Bergman, Cong. Stephanie Murphy, Ron Wyden, Scott Fitzgerald, John R. Ashcroft, Cong. Mike Levin, Glenn Thompson, Gov Kay Ivey, John Kennedy, Tom Malinowski, Kevin Cramer, Margaret Wood Hassan, Susan Wild, Cong. Ken Buck, Laura Kelly, Morgan Griffith, Cong. Frank J. Mrvan, Mike DeWine, Sean Patrick Maloney, Hakeem Jeffries, Mondaire Jones, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Bob Good, Tony Evers, Cong. J. Luis Correa, Debbie Stabenow, Cong. Robin Kelly, Ben Ray Lujan, Cong. C. Scott Franklin, Mike Lee, John Moolenaar, Cong. Andrew S. Clyde, Kyrsten Sinema, Kathy E. Manning, Cong. Devin Nunes, Teresa Leger Fernandez, Don Bacon, Chris Jacobs, Kristi Noem, Andy Kim, Brian Higgins, Lee Zeldin, Robert Menendez, Cong. Bill Posey, Cong. W. Gregory Steube, Susan M. Collins, Jim Jordan, Cong. Darren Soto, Jodey Arrington, Michael Cloud, Tre Hargett, Doug La Follette, Al Green, Ralph Norman, Cong. Bill Foster, Cong. Lucy McBath, John A. Yarmuth, Cong. Tony Cardenas, Cong. Nikema Williams, Cong. Sanford D. Bishop, Cong. Bradley Scheider, Cong. Ami Bera, Cong. Barry Loudermilk, Dan Bishop, Cong. Ruben Gallego, Jamaal Bowman, Tina Smith, Peter Meijer, Joni Ernst, John Hoeven, Mike Kelly, Jeff Merkley, Cong. Bruce Westerman, Cong. Brad Sherman, Vicente Gonzalez, Christi Jacobsen, Abigail Spanberger, Ron Kind, David Cicilline, Tate Reeves, Derek Kilmer, Sen. Mazie K. Hirono, Gov. Ned Lamont, Billy Long, Ben Cline, Roger F. Wicker, David Rouzer, John Bel Edwards, Cong Mike Rogers, Andrew R. Gararino, Cong. Kevin McCarthy, Chris Stewart, Sen. Tammy Duckworth, Carolyn Maloney, Cong Don Young, Shemia Fagan, Sen. Christopher A. Coons, Gregory Francis Murphy, Katherine Clark, Jerry Moran, David Trone, Cong. Maria Elvira Salazar, Cori Bush, Sec. Holli Sullivan, Lloyd Smucker, Alma Adams, Cong. Raul Ruiz, Peter DeFazio, Cong. Ted Lieu, Cong. Rodney Davis, Seth Moulton, Rick Larsen, Steve Barnett, Cong. David Scott, Steve Scalise, Richard Hudson, Terry A. Sewell, Cong. Raja Krishnamoorthi, Maggie Toulouse Oliver, Cong. David G. Valdadao, Robert C. Scott, Troy E. Nehls, Jared Golden, Harold Rogers, Andy Barr, Cong. Adam Kinzinger, Cong. Joe Neguse, Cong. Pete Aguilar, Marcy Kaptur, Kirsten E. Gillibrand, John Thune, Kevin Hern, Adriano Espaillat, Cong. Kaiali'i Kahele, Cong. Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Sen. Dianne Feinstein, Kate Brown, Elizabeth Warren, Sen. Richard Blumenthal, Cong. Mary E. Miller, Cong. Mark Takano, Joyce Beatty, Warren Davidson, John Carter, Roy Blunt, Pramila Jayapal, Madison Cawthorn, Mark R. Warner, Amy Klobuchar, Janet T. Mills, Mark Hammond, Cong. French Hill, Sec. Jeffrey W. Bullock, Larry Hogan, Marsha Blackburn, Dwight Evans, Rashida Tlaib, Andrew M. Cuomo, Cindy Hyde-Smith, Mike Johnson, Kay Granger, Dusty Johnson, Lance Gooden, Cong. Salud Carbajal, Cong. A. Drew Ferguson, Sen. Todd Young, Cong. Debbie Lesko, Gov Asa Hutchinson, John W. Rose, Gov. Brad Little, Diana Harshbarger, Kathleen Rice, Ashley Hinson, Bill Pascrell, Jr., James M. Inhofe, Vacant, Katie Hobbs, Tim Ryan, Tom Reed, John Katko, Sen. Mark Kelly, Tom Wolfe, Gregory W. Meeks, Jacky Rosen, David Kustoff, Cong. Lisa Blunt Rochester, Cong. Buddy Carter, Cong. Byron Donalds, Jamie Raskin, Cong. Julia Brownley, Governor of Oklahoma Kevin Stitt, Cong. Jackie Walorski, James Comer, Cong. Gus M. Bilirakis, Marilyn Strickland, Sen Tommy Tuberville, Stephen F. Lynch, Garret Graves, Joseph Biden, Pete Ricketts, Cong. Michael Waltz, James E. Clyburn, Glenn Grothman, Sec. John H. Merrill, Virginia Foxx, Michelle Fischbach, John Joyce, Susie Lee, Gov. David Y. Ige, Kelly Thomasson, Sen. Mike Braun, Benjamin L. Cardin, Cong. Karen Bass, Cong. Adam Schiff, Emanuel Cleaver, Jay Inslee, Sec. Denise W. Merrill, Chip Roy, Cong. Mike Garcia, Tim Scott, Jennifer Wexton, James C. Condos, Cong. Grace Napolitano, Robert J. Wittman, Shenna Bellows, William Timmons, Cong. John Garamendi, Sen. Thomas R. Carper, G. K. Butterfield, Cong. Daniel Webster, Kurt Schrader, William Francis Galvin, Ann Wagner, Lisa C. McClain, Cong. Ro Khanna, Cong. Josh Harder, Dan Crenshaw, Tracey Mann, Cliff Bentz, James McGovern, Sen. James E. Risch, Phil Murphy, Cong. Austin Scott, Sen. Raphael G. Warnock, Elaine F. Marshall, Tom O'Halleran, Ted Cruz, Cong. Carolyn Bourdeaux, Barry Moore, David Price, Richard Shelby, Lizzie Fletcher, Veronica Degraffenreid, Ilhan Omar, Andy Beshear, Deb Fischer, Cong. Mark DeSaulnier, Martin Heinrich, Sheldon Whitehouse, Tom Emmer, Sara Mahan, Claudia Tenney, Bryan Steil, Cong. Paul Gosar, Chris Pappas, Michael Guest, Liz Cheney, Conor Lamb, Jeff Duncan, Steven Palazzo, Chuck Fleischmann, Cong. Lucille Roybal-Allard, Brad Wenstrup, Roger Marshall, Gerald E. "Gerry& Connolly, Roger Williams, Sec. Jena Griswold, Donald Payne, Jr., Chris Sununu, Charlie Baker, Cong. Rick Allen, Cong. Rosa L. DeLauro, Steve Stivers, Cong. Steve Womack, Cong. Ed Perlmutter, Sen. John W. Hickenlooper, Cong. Jim Banks, Brian Babin, Jim Langevin, Ashley Hoff, Kevin Brady, Cong. Jason Crow, Sylvia Garcia, Josh Hawley, John C. Wobensmith, Fred Keller, Kim Schrier, Gary C. Peters, Cory A. Booker, Cong. Katie Porter, Don Beyer, Cong. Brian Mast, Suzan DelBene, Sen. Christopher Murphy, Jake LaTurner, Tom Cole, Cong. Barbara Lee, Cong. Young Kim, John R. Curtis, Chuck Grassley, Michael Turner, Sen. Brian Schatz, James Lankford, Dean Phillips, Cong. Jesus Garcia, Cong. Marjorie Taylor Greene, Alex Mooney, Jason Smith, Cong. Mario Diaz-Balart, Phil Scott, Mark Amodei, Cong. Ed Chase, Michael Watson, Cong. Jan Schakowsky, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Patty Murray, Ron Johnson, Cong. Mike Thompson, Cong. Neal Dunn, Jim Cooper, Cong. Doris O. Matsul, Cong. Norma Torres, Sen. Jon Ossoff, Clay Higgins, Shelley Moore Capito, John Barrasso, R. Kyle Ardoin, Andy Levin, Ritchie Torres, Jack Reed, Sharice Davids, Cong. Frederica Wilson, Kweisi Mfume, Cong. Judy Chu, Gov. Brian P. Kemp, Cong. Juan Vargas, Cong Robert B. Aderhoft, Lloyd Doggett, Cong. Doug LaMalfa, Robert P. Casey, Jr., Bob Gibbs, Cong. Trey Hollingsworth, Deborah K. Ross, Daniel J. McKee, Thomas Massie, Scott Perry, Madeleine Dean, Cong. Val Demings, Cong. Jimmy Panetta, Cong. Larry Bucshon, Elissa Slotkin, Debbie Dingell, Cong. Danny K. Davis, Sen. Rick Scott, Lindsey Graham, Roy Cooper, Cong. Al Lawson, Sen. Alex Padilla, Bill Johnson, William Keating, Nancy Mace, Steve Sisolak, Henry Cuellar, Tammy Baldwin, Tim Burchett, Cong. Mike Bost, Thomas Suozzi, Cong. Jay Obernolte, Cong. Jim Hines, Marc Veasey, Cong. Raul Grijalva, Ann Kirkpatrick, Cong. Jim Costa, Cong. Linda Sanchez, Kelly Armstrong, Cong. Jerry L. Carl, Chellie Pingree, Cong. Sara Jacobs, Jerrold Nadler, Cong. Jackie Speier, Robert E. Latta, Gretchen Whitmer, Antonio Delgado, Richard E. Neal, Anna G. Eshoo, Rossana Rosado, Jim Hagedorn, Cong. Henry C. Johnson, Jr., Cong. Tom McClintock, Cong. Doug Lamborn, Cong. Mike Simpson, Sen. Tom Cotton, Cong. Andre Carson, Haley Stevens, Angie Craig, Stephanie I. Bice, Veronica Escobar, Cong. Greg Pence, Mariannette Miller-Meeks, Dan Newhouse, Sen Lisa Murkowski, Lori Trahan, Fred Upton, Ann Kuster, Cong. Michelle Steel, Guy Reschenthaler, Cong. Maxine Waters, Greg Gianforte, Alcee L. Hastings, Patrick J. Toomey, Scott Schwab, William M. Gardner, Henry McMaster, Nydia M. Velazquez, Cong. Carlos A. Gimenez, Cong. Jared Huffman, Jeanne Shaheen, Brenda Lawrence, Randy Weber, Cong Mo Brooks, Doug Burgum, Frank Pallone, Jr., Cong. James Baird, Brendan Boyle, Cong. Diana DeGette, Mike Rounds, Gov. Jared Polis, Jocelyn Benson, Cong. Alan Lowenthal, Matthew M. Rosendale, Sec. Lawerence Denney, Anthony Brown, Gwen Moore, Patrick T. McHenry, Cong. Ted Deutch, Michael L. Parson, Donald Norcross, Michael T. McCaul, John Cornyn, Sen Dan Sullivan, Peter Welch, Ron Estes, Cong. Rick Crawford, Cong. Bobby L. Rush, Sheila Jackson Lee, Cong. Andy Biggs, Randy Feenstra, Gov. Gavin Newsom, Cong. Eric Swalwell, Sam Graves, Km Wyman, Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez, Carol Miller, Tim Walz, David Joyce, Sen. Mike Crapo, Greg Abbott, Yvette D. Clarke, Steve Simon, Joaquin Castro, Rand Paul, Barbara K. Cegavske, August Pfluger, Anthony Gonzalez, Jake Auchincloss, Steny H. Hoyer, Catherine Cortez Masto, Pat Fallon, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Bernard Sanders, Beth Van Duyne, Mary Gay Scanlon, Sec. Jesse White, Suzanne Bonamici, Kim Reynolds, Brian Bingman, Sherrod Brown, Steven Horsford, Cong. Matt Gaetz, Mark Pocan, Bennie G. Thompson, Elise Stefanik, Bill Cassidy, Cong. Cheri Bustos, Steve Daines, Chris Van Hollen, Cynthia M. Lummis, Cong. David Schweikert, Paul Pate, Frank Lucas, Thomas P. Tiffany, Brian Fitzpatrick, Tim Walberg, Rob Portman, Michael Burgess, Cong. Lois Franken, Jaime Herrera Beutler, Jon Tester, Gov. John Carney, Cong. Russ Fulcher, Chrissy Houlahan, S. Brett Guthrie, Tim Kaine, Cong. Lauren Boebert, Mark Gordon, Frank LaRose, Chris Smith, Dina Titus, Cong. Darin LaHood, Mitt Romney, Scott DesJarlais, Jefferson Van Drew, Jeff Fortenberry, Filemon Vela, Thom Tillis, Cong. Kathy Castor, Cong. Greg Stanton, Cong. Joe Courtney, Sen. Michael F. Bennet, Cong. Jimmy Gomez, Earl Blumenauer, Tom Rice, Patrick J. Leahy, Al Jaeger, Mac Warner, David McKinley, Edward J. Markey, Cong. Charlie Crist, Ruth Hughs, Louie Gohmert, Cong. Nanette Barragan, Trent Kelly, Steve Chabot, Gov Mike Dunleavy, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Adam Smith, Sec. John Thurston, Angus S. King, Jr., Adrian Smith, Cong. John Rutherford, Mikie Sherrill, Representative Van Taylor, Ted Budd, John P. Sarbanes, Nicole Malliotakis, Cong. Victoria Spatz, Jim Justice, Bill Lee, Josh Gottheimer, Richard Burr, Ralph S. Northam, Joe Manchin, III, Don Ducey, Cong. Sean Castern, Grace Meng, Matt Cartwright, Michael Doyle, Cong. Scott Peters, Vicky Hartzler, Lauren Underwood, Maria Cantwell, Betty McCollum, Blake D. Moore, Mark Green, Cong. Kat Cammack, Kamala Harris, Cong. Marie Newman, John A. Gale, Bonnie Watson Coleman, Cong. Jody Hice, Daniel Kildee, Colin Allred, Eric Gov. Holcomb, Spencer Cox, The Republican National Committee, Facebook, Inc., Twitter, Inc., Democrat National Service Corporation, Sapphire Strategies, Julia Ager, Amber McReynolds, National Vote at Home Institute, Center for Tech and Civic Life and Robert Francis "B O'Rourke
Case Number: 6:2021cv00162
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Referring Judge: Jeffrey C Manske
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennilyn Salinas (Davis, Paul)
July 22, 2021 Filing 179 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jack Dorsey Entry of Appearance. (Leatherbury, Thomas)
July 12, 2021 Filing 178 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Stitt (Ray, Lauren)
June 30, 2021 Filing 177 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to (1) the Republican National Committee, (2) Arkansas Gov. Asa Hutchinson and Sec. John Thurston, (3) Ohio Gov. Mike DeWine and Sec. Frank LaRose, (4) New Hampshire Gov. Chris Sununu and Sec. William H. Gardner, and (5) Kansas Gov. Laura Kelly and Sec. Scott Schwab by Jennilyn Salinas. (Davis, Paul)
June 29, 2021 Filing 176 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #174 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (lad)
June 29, 2021 Filing 175 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (1) Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 148) (in anticipation of motion for leave to file second amended complaint), (2) Deadline for Remaining Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint, (3) Deadline to complete service of process by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
June 29, 2021 Filing 174 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennilyn Salinas (Davis, Paul)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #173 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 28, 2021 Filing 173 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea W. Trento for Larry Hogan, John C. Wobensmith. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 28, 2021 Filing 172 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Brian Kemp and Brad Raffensperger by Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger. (Stoy, Lee)
June 27, 2021 Filing 171 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennilyn Salinas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Paul)
June 25, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Kevin Stitt answer due 7/26/2021. (ir)
June 25, 2021 Filing 170 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over Kansas Gov and Sec of State by Laura Kelly, Scott Schwab. (Chalmers, Arthur)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #163 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that Defendant Oklahoma Governor Kevin Stitt's responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before July 26, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #165 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court ORDERS the following: 1. The RNC will file its motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Second AmendedComplaint (ECF No. 145) on or before August 9, 2021; 2. Plaintiffs have 30 days to respond to the RNC's motion to dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 24, 2021 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss by William M. Gardner, Chris Sununu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Ninth Supplemental Order Regarding Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (W.D. Tex. (Waco)))(Ramsey, Jennifer)
June 24, 2021 Filing 168 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jennilyn Salinas, re #157 MOTION to Strike #145 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Brad Raffensperger, Defendant Brian P. Kemp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Paul)
June 24, 2021 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss First and Second Amended Complaints by Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston. (France, Vincent)
June 24, 2021 Filing 166 NOTICE of Defective Service by Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Chuck Schumer, Pete Sessions re #145 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, #24 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowry, Faith)
June 23, 2021 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by The Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Disher, Todd)
June 23, 2021 Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Second Amended Complaint by Kevin Stitt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ray, Lauren)
June 23, 2021 Filing 163 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony D. Russomanno for Tony Evers, Doug La Follette. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #162 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Nebraska Governor Pete Ricketts and former Nebraska Secretary of State John Gale shall have 21 days after the Court rules on the Opposed Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 157) to file their answers or other responsive pleadings in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 21, 2021 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by John A. Gale, Pete Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Huxoll, Jennifer)
June 21, 2021 Filing 161 RESPONSE in Support, filed by Mike DeWine, Frank LaRose, re #88 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose filed by Defendant Frank LaRose, Defendant Mike DeWine (Johnson, Caitlyn)
June 21, 2021 Filing 160 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jocelyn Benson, Gretchen Whitmer.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ir)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #160 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #156 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendants Mike DeWine and Frank LaRose's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 145) is extended to July 1, 2021.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 21, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Laura Kelly and Scott Schwab answer due 7/23/2021. (lad)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #159 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Defendants Kansas Governor Laura Kelly's and Kansas Secretary of State Scott Schwab's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 145) and/or Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 24) is July 23, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 21, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Mike DeWine and Frank LaRose answer to Second Amended Complaint due 7/1/2021. (lad)
June 18, 2021 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Kansas Defendants by Laura Kelly, Scott Schwab. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Chalmers, Arthur)
June 17, 2021 Filing 158 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, re #113 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Brad Raffensperger, Defendant Brian P. Kemp (Stoy, Lee)
June 17, 2021 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike #145 Amended Complaint, by Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stoy, Lee)
June 17, 2021 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #145 Amended Complaint, by Mike DeWine, Frank LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Johnson, Caitlyn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren J. Ray on behalf of Kevin Stitt (Ray, Lauren)
June 15, 2021 Filing 154 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Stitt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
June 15, 2021 Text Order GRANTING #154 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) authorizes the collection of a $100.00 fee for each application for admission pro hac vice that is granted by the Court; Local Court Rule AT-1(g) further authorizes an exemption from payment of this fee to all attorneys who are full-time judicial officers or attorneys with any federal, state or other governmental entity. IT IS THERFORE ORDERED that the application for pro hac vice status is GRANTED. Further, because counsel meets the requirement for exemption from the $100 fee, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no fee is required for the applicant. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with the Court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING #127 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default #123 , #124 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING #137 Motion to Set Aside #125 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING #132 Motion to Set Aside #121 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
June 14, 2021 Filing 150 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #148 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Plaintiffs' Deadline Agreed to be extended 30 Days to July 12, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
June 14, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Shenna Bellows answer due 7/26/2021; Janet T. Mills answer due 7/26/2021. (ls)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #150 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiffsdeadline to response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 148) is extended 30 days. Plaintiffs shall file their response by July 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #147 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court ORDERS that Defendants Janet T. Mills and Shenna Bellows shall have until July 26, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 145).(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 11, 2021 Filing 149 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jennilyn Salinas, re #88 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose filed by Defendant Frank LaRose, Defendant Mike DeWine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Paul)
June 11, 2021 Filing 148 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shenna Bellows, Janet T. Mills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Bolton, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 146 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jennilyn Salinas, re #113 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Brad Raffensperger, Defendant Brian P. Kemp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Paul)
June 10, 2021 Filing 145 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants amending, filed by M. L., T. M., Deanna Lorraine, Jennilyn Salinas, Lindsey Nguyen, S. M., P. P., D. D., J Cann, Maurice Lynnette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Davis, Paul)
June 10, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur s. Chalmers representing Laura Kelly, Scott Schwab. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
June 10, 2021 Filing 143 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Christopher White, OFFICE OF THE MISSOURI ATTORNEY GENERAL. (lad)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #144 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 9, 2021 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Faith Johnson Lowry on behalf of Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Chuck Schumer, Pete Sessions. Attorney Faith Johnson Lowry added to party Mitch McConnell(pty:dft), Attorney Faith Johnson Lowry added to party Nancy Pelosi(pty:dft), Attorney Faith Johnson Lowry added to party Chuck Schumer(pty:dft), Attorney Faith Johnson Lowry added to party Pete Sessions(pty:dft) (Lowry, Faith)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #141 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Austin Robert Nimocks for Jennifer A Huxoll, Counsel for Nebraska Governor Pete Ricketts and Nebraska Secretary of State John Gale ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14890370) by on behalf of John A. Gale, Pete Ricketts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Nimocks, David)
June 8, 2021 Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott A. Keller on behalf of The Republican National Committee. Attorney Scott A. Keller added to party The Republican National Committee(pty:dft) (Keller, Scott)
June 8, 2021 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Hamilton Frederick on behalf of Republican National Committee. Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick added to party Republican National Committee(pty:dft) (Frederick, Matthew) (Main Document 139 replaced on 6/8/2021) (lad).
June 8, 2021 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of The Republican National Committee. Attorney Todd Lawrence Disher added to party The Republican National Committee(pty:dft) (Disher, Todd)
June 8, 2021 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by The Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of J. Justin Riemer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Justin Hendrix, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Disher, Todd)
June 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines: John R. Ashcroft answer due 7/6/2021 and Michael L. Parson answer due 7/6/2021. (ir)
June 7, 2021 Filing 136 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Misfiled as ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Set Aside Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order Re Motion to Dismiss Schedule)(Hardin, John) Modified to Motions on 6/11/2021 (lad).
June 7, 2021 Filing 135 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Missouri Governor Mike Parson and Secretary John "Jay" Ashcroft Deadline to Answer to be Extended to July 6, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The time for Defendants Mike Parson and John Jay Ashcroft to file a response to the first amended complaint is extended to July 6, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
June 4, 2021 Filing 134 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Ray Whitman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14878212) by on behalf of Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Whitman, W.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Ray Whitman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14878191) by on behalf of Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Whitman, W.)
June 4, 2021 Filing 132 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside #121 Clerk's Entry of Default by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Whitman, W.)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #131 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #133 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #134 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
June 3, 2021 Filing 131 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shenna Bellows, Janet T. Mills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (ir)
June 1, 2021 Filing 130 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Emily R. Brailey ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14864888) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Hardin, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 129 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin for Elisabeth C. Frost ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14864871) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Hardin, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 128 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #126 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose (Plaintiffs' Deadline to be Extended to June 11, 2021) (fixing typographical error in proposed order) by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
June 1, 2021 Filing 127 Opposed MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default and Brief in Support re #124 Clerk's Entry of Default, #123 Clerk's Entry of Default by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Emily Brailey with Exhibits A-B, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jacqui Newman, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Allison Wright, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Hardin, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 126 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #88 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose (Plaintiffs' Deadline to be Extended to June 11, 2021) by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiffs deadline torespond to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 88) filed by Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose is extended by 7 days. Plaintiffs shall file their response by June 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #129 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #126 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Plaintiffs deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 88) filed by Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose is extended by 7 days. Plaintiffs shall file their response by June 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #130 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
May 28, 2021 Filing 125 *SET ASIDE PER ORDER #152 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Republican National Committee (lad) Modified on 6/14/2021 (bw).
May 28, 2021 Filing 124 *SET ASIDE PER ORDER #153 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee (lad) Modified on 6/14/2021 (bw).
May 28, 2021 Filing 123 *SET ASIDE PER ORDER #153 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee (lad) Modified on 6/14/2021 (bw).
May 28, 2021 Filing 122 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jack Dorsey (lad) (Main Document 122 replaced on 5/28/2021) (lad).
May 28, 2021 Filing 121 *SET ASIDE PER ORDER #151 * Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Zuckerberg (lad) Modified on 6/14/2021 (bw).
May 27, 2021 Filing 120 MOTION for Entry of Default against Republican National Committee by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 119 MOTION for Entry of Default against Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 118 MOTION for Entry of Default against Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 117 MOTION for Entry of Default against Jack Dorsey by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 116 MOTION for Entry of Default against Mark Zuckerberg by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Larry Hogan served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021; Asa Hutchinson served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021; Republican National Committee served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 27, 2021 Filing 114 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bw)
May 27, 2021 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss by Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger. (Stoy, Lee)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Andy Biggs served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Sanford D. Bishop served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Carolyn Bourdeaux served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Matt Cartwright served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Jim Costa served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; A. Drew Ferguson served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Scott Fitzgerald served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Mike Gallagher served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Ruben Gallego served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Paul Gosar served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Raul Grijalva served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Chrissy Houlahan served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Henry C. Johnson, Jr served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Ron Johnson served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; John Joyce served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Fred Keller served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Mark Kelly served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Mike Kelly served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Ron Kind served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Conor Lamb served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Sheila Jackson Lee served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Debbie Lesko served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Daniel Meuser served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Gwen Moore served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Jerrold Nadler served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Tom O'Halleran served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Scott Perry served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Mark Pocan served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Guy Reschenthaler served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Marco Rubio served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Mary Gay Scanlon served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Austin Scott served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Kyrsten Sinema served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Lloyd Smucker served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Greg Stanton served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Elizabeth Warren served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021; Nikema Williams served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 26, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lee M. Stoy, Jr by on behalf of Brian P. Kemp, Brad Raffensperger, Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stoy, Lee)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. This docket entry is duplicative of the already-granted ECF No. 107 and is therefore MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #89 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Christopher T. Sununu shall have through and including June 21, 2021, to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 24). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #109 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendants Tom Wolf and Veronica Degraffenreid to file a response to the complaint is extended to July 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #107 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendants Brian Kemp and Brad Raffensperger to file a response to the complaint is extended to July 6, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Brian P. Kemp and Brad Raffensperger answer due 7/6/2021. (lad)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #110 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. ECF No. 88 is deemed timely filed. No further action from the Clerk of Court is required. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Chris Sununu answer due 6/21/2021. (lad)
May 26, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Veronica Degraffenreid and Tom Wolfe answer due 7/8/2021. (lad)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #111 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Further, pursuant to Local Court Rule AT 1(g), the applicant herein is EXEMPT from the $100 fee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 25, 2021 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss [Doc 88] by Mike DeWine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Garrison, William)
May 25, 2021 Filing 109 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 8, 2021 for Defendants Tom Wolf and Veronica Graffenreid by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 108 ***FILED WITH THE WRONG DOCUMENT. REPLACING.*** CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Agreed Motion Extending Time to Answer by July 8, 2021 to Defendants Tom Wolf and Veronica Degaffenreid by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 107 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants Brian Kemp and Brad Raffensperger's Deadline to Answer to be Extended to July 6, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Andy Beshear served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; John Carney served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Mark Gordon served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; David Y. Ige served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Ralph S. Northam served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Spencer Cox served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Andrew M. Cuomo served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Greg Gianforte served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Kay Ivey served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Brian P. Kemp served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Ned Lamont served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Henry McMaster served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Kristi Noem served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Michael L. Parson served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Jared Polis served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; JB Pritzker served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021; Phil Scott served on 4/30/2021, answer due 5/21/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 104 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #90 Stipulation (lad)
May 24, 2021 Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Mike DeWine served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Don Ducey served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; John Bel Edwards served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Katie Hobbs served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Eric Gov. Holcomb served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Jay Inslee served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Bill Lee served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Daniel J. McKee served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Gavin Newsom served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Tate Reeves served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021; Kevin Stitt served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Mike Podhorzer served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer S. Ramsey on behalf of William M. Gardner, Chris Sununu. Attorney Jennifer S. Ramsey added to party William M. Gardner(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer S. Ramsey added to party Chris Sununu(pty:dft) (Ramsey, Jennifer)
May 24, 2021 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Ilhan Omar served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Rashida Tlaib served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Mitch McConnell served on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Chuck Schumer served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Joseph Biden served on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 94 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Kamala Harris served on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 93 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Nancy Pelosi served on 4/29/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Jack Dorsey served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennilyn Salinas. Mark Zuckerberg served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Davis, Paul)
May 24, 2021 Filing 90 STIPULATION of for Extension of Time to Answer for Defendants Tom Wolf and Veronica Degraffenreid (Pennsylvania) by 45 days to July 8, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas. (Davis, Paul)
May 21, 2021 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Amended Complaint, by Chris Sununu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Ramsey, Jennifer)
May 21, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Ohio Governor Mike DeWine and Ohio Secretary of State Frank LaRose by Mike DeWine, Frank LaRose. (Garrison, William)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING #81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2) authorizes the collection of a $100.00 fee for each application for admission pro hac vice that is granted by the Court; Local Court Rule AT-1(g) further authorizes an exemption from payment of this fee to all attorneys who are full-time judicial officers or attorneys with any federal, state or other governmental entity. IT IS THERFORE ORDERED that the above applications for pro hac vice status are GRANTED. Further, because counsel meets the requirement for exemption from the $100 fee, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no fee is required for the above applicants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with the Court within 10 days of this order.Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The time for Defendant Oklahoma Governor Kevin Stitt to file a responsive pleading is extended by 60 days to July 19, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendant Pete Ricketts to file a response to the complaint is extended to July 6, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pete Ricketts answer due 7/6/2021. (bw)
May 20, 2021 Filing 87 CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Nebraska Gov. Pete Ricketts to File Answer by July 6, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 86 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #85 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Okahoma Gov. Pete Ricketts to answer by July 6, 2021 (lad)
May 20, 2021 Filing 85 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Okahoma Gov. Pete Ricketts to answer by July 6, 2021 by Jennilyn Salinas.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 20, 2021 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #24 Amended Complaint, by Kevin Stitt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Lewis, Jennifer)
May 20, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Lewis on behalf of Kevin Stitt. Attorney Jennifer L. Lewis added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft) (Lewis, Jennifer)
May 20, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Summons pursuant to FRCP 4(m) by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 18, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew D McCartney for Mike DeWine, Frank LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
May 18, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Caitlyn Nestleroth Johnson for Mike DeWine, Frank LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw)
May 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Jocelyn Benson answer due 7/9/2021. (bw)
May 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Gretchen Whitmer answer due 7/9/2021. (bw)
May 17, 2021 Filing 79 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to Defendants Gretchen Whitmer and Jocelyn Benson by Jennilyn Salinas.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Davis, Paul)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The time for Defendants Michigan Governor GretchenWhitmer and Michigan Secretary of State Jocelyn Benson to file a response to the complaint is extended by 45 days to July 9, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg)
April 14, 2021 Filing 78 Summons Issued as to per attached pages to summons. (bw)
April 9, 2021 Filing 77 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas. INCLUDES COMPLETE LIST OF DEFENDANTS PER CLERK'S INSTRUCTIONS -- WILL SERVE COPY ON ALL DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
April 1, 2021 Filing 76 Summons Issued from #74 as to James Baird, Jim Banks, Mike Braun, Larry Bucshon, Andre Carson, Eric Gov. Holcomb, Trey Hollingsworth, Frank J. Mrvan, Greg Pence, Victoria Spatz, Holli Sullivan, Jackie Walorski, Todd Young. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 75 Summons Issued from #73 as to Mike Bost, Cheri Bustos, Sean Castern, Danny K. Davis, Rodney Davis, Tammy Duckworth, Richard J. Durbin, Bill Foster, Jesus Garcia, Robin Kelly, Adam Kinzinger, Raja Krishnamoorthi, Darin LaHood, Mary E. Miller, Marie Newman, JB Pritzker, Mike Quigley, Bobby L. Rush, Jan Schakowsky, Bradley Scheider, Lauren Underwood, Jesse White. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 74 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Eric Gov. Holcomb, Holli Sullivan, Mike Braun, Todd Young, Frank J. Mrvan, Jackie Walorski, Jim Banks, James Baird, Victoria Spatz, Greg Pence, Andre Carson, Larry Bucshon, Trey Hollingsworth. INDIANA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
April 1, 2021 Filing 73 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, JB Pritzker, Jesse White, Tammy Duckworth, Richard J. Durbin, Bobby L. Rush, Robin Kelly, Marie Newman, Jesus Garcia, Mike Quigley, Sean Castern, Danny K. Davis, Raja Krishnamoorthi, Jan Schakowsky, Bradley Scheider, Bill Foster, Mike Bost, Rodney Davis, Lauren Underwood, Mary E. Miller, Adam Kinzinger, Cheri Bustos, Darin LaHood. ILLINOIS DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
April 1, 2021 Filing 72 Summons Issued from #64 as to Mike Crapo, Lawerence Denney, Russ Fulcher, Brad Little, James E. Risch, Mike Simpson. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 71 Summons Issued from #63 as to Josh Green, Mazie K. Hirono, David Y. Ige, Kaiali'i Kahele, Brian Schatz, Ed Case. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 70 Summons Issued from #62 as to Rick Allen, Sanford D. Bishop, Carolyn Bourdeaux, Buddy Carter, Andrew S. Clyde, A. Drew Ferguson, Marjorie Taylor Greene, Jody Hice, Henry C. Johnson, Jr, Brian P. Kemp, Barry Loudermilk, Lucy McBath, Jon Ossoff, Brad Raffensperger, Austin Scott, David Scott, Raphael G. Warnock, Nikema Williams. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 69 Summons Issued from #61 as to Gus M. Bilirakis, Vern Buchanan, Kat Cammack, Kathy Castor, Charlie Crist, Ron DeSantis, Val Demings, Ted Deutch, Mario Diaz-Balart, Byron Donalds, Neal Dunn, Lois Franken, C. Scott Franklin, Matt Gaetz, Carlos A. Gimenez, Alcee L. Hastings, Al Lawson, Lauren M. Lee, Brian Mast, Stephanie Murphy, Bill Posey, Marco Rubio, John Rutherford, Maria Elvira Salazar, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Rick Scott, Darren Soto, W. Gregory Steube, Michael Waltz, Daniel Webster, Frederica Wilson. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 68 Summons Issued from #60 as to Jeffrey W. Bullock, John Carney, Thomas R. Carper, Christopher A. Coons, Lisa Blunt Rochester. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 67 Summons Issued from #59 as to Richard Blumenthal, Joe Courtney, Rosa L. DeLauro, Jahana Hayes, Jim Hines, Ned Lamont, John Larson, John H. Merrill, Christopher Murphy. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 66 Summons Issued as to Michael F. Bennet, Lauren Boebert, Ken Buck, Jason Crow, Diana DeGette, Jena Griswold, John W. Hickenlooper, Doug Lamborn, Joe Neguse, Ed Perlmutter, Jared Polis. (bw)
April 1, 2021 Filing 65 Summons Issued as to Pete Aguilar, Nanette Barragan, Karen Bass, Ami Bera, Julia Brownley, Ken Calvert, Salud Carbajal, Tony Cardenas, Judy Chu, J. Luis Correa, Jim Costa, Mark DeSaulnier, Dianne Feinstein, John Garamendi, Mike Garcia, Jimmy Gomez, Josh Harder, Jared Huffman, Darrell Issa, Sara Jacobs, Ro Khanna, Young Kim, Doug LaMalfa, Barbara Lee, Mike Levin, Ted Lieu, Zoe Lofgren, Alan Lowenthal, Doris O. Matsul, Kevin McCarthy, Tom McClintock, Jerry McNerney, Grace Napolitano, Gavin Newsom, Devin Nunes, Jay Obernolte, Alex Padilla, Jimmy Panetta, Nancy Pelosi, Scott Peters, Katie Porter, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Raul Ruiz, Linda Sanchez, Adam Schiff, Jackie Speier, Michelle Steel, Eric Swalwell, Mark Takano, Mike Thompson, Norma Torres, David G. Valdadao, Juan Vargas, Maxine Waters. (bw)
March 31, 2021 Filing 64 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Brad Little, Lawerence Denney, Mike Crapo, James E. Risch, Russ Fulcher, Mike Simpson. IDAHO DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, David Y. Ige, Josh Green, Mazie K. Hirono, Brian Schatz, Ed Chase, Kaiali'i Kahele. HAWAII DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 62 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Brian P. Kemp, Jon Ossoff, Raphael G. Warnock, Buddy Carter, Sanford D. Bishop, A. Drew Ferguson, Henry C. Johnson, Jr, Nikema Williams, Lucy McBath, Carolyn Bourdeaux, Austin Scott, Andrew S. Clyde, Jody Hice, Barry Loudermilk, Rick Allen, David Scott, Marjorie Taylor Greene. GEORGIA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ron DeSantis, Lauren M. Lee, Marco Rubio, Rick Scott, Matt Gaetz, Neal Dunn, Kat Cammack, John Rutherford, Al Lawson, Michael Waltz, Stephanie Murphy, Bill Posey, Darren Soto, Val Demings, Daniel Webster, Gus M. Bilirakis, Charlie Crist, Kathy Castor, C. Scott Franklin, Vern Buchanan, W. Gregory Steube, Brian Mast, Byron Donalds, Alcee L. Hasting, Alcee L. Hastings, Lois Franken, Ted Deutch, Debbie Wasserman Schultz, Frederica Wilson, Mario Diaz-Balart, Carlos A. Gimenez, Maria Elvira Salazar. FLORIDA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 60 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by John Carney, Jeffrey W. Bullock, Thomas R. Carper, Christopher A. Coons, Lisa Blunt Rochester. DELAWARE DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 59 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ned Lamont, Denise W. Merrill, Richard Blumenthal, Christopher Murphy, John Larson, Joe Courtney, Rosa L. DeLauro, Jim Hines, Jahana Hayes, John Carney. CONNECTICUT DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 58 Summons Issued as to John Boozman, Tom Cotton, Rick Crawford, French Hill, Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston, Bruce Westerman, Steve Womack. (bw)
March 31, 2021 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Jared Polis, Jena Griswold, Michael F. Bennet, John W. Hickenlooper, Diana DeGette, Joe Neguse, Lauren Boebert, Ken Buck, Doug Lamborn, Jason Crow, Ed Perlmutter. COLORADO DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 56 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Gavin Newsom, Alex Padilla, Dianne Feinstein, Doug LaMalfa, Jared Huffman, John Garamendi, Tom McClintock, Mike Thompson, Doris O. Matsul, Ami Bera, Jay Obernolte, Jerry McNerney, Josh Harder, Mark DeSaulnier, Barbara Lee, Jackie Speier, Eric Swalwell, Jim Costa, Ro Khanna, Zoe Lofgren, Jimmy Panetta, David G. Valdadao, Devin Nunes, Kevin McCarthy, Salud Carbajal, Mike Garcia, Julia Brownley, Judy Chu, Adam Schiff, Tony Cardenas, Brad Sherman, Pete Aguilar, Grace Napolitano, Ted Lieu, Jimmy Gomez, Norma Torres, Raul Ruiz, Karen Bass, Linda Sanchez, Young Kim, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Mark Takano, Ken Calvert, Maxine Waters, Nanette Barragan, Katie Porter, J. Luis Correa, Alan Lowenthal, Michelle Steel, Mike Levin, Darrell Issa, Juan Vargas, Scott Peters, Sara Jacobs. CALIFORNIA DEFENDANTS (reissuance to Nancy Pelosi requested with new case caption) (Davis, Paul)
March 31, 2021 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Asa Hutchinson, John Thurston, John Boozman, Tom Cotton, Rick Crawford, French Hill, Steve Womack, Bruce Westerman. ARKANSAS DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 30, 2021 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Greg Stanton. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 53 Summons Issued as to Debbie Lesko. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Ruben Gallego. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to David Schweikert. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Andy Biggs. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Paul Gosar. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Raul Grijalva. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Ann Kirkpatrick. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Tom O'Halleran. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to Kyrsten Sinema. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Mark Kelly. (lad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Don Ducey. (lad)
March 29, 2021 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Ducey Ducey, Mark Kelly, Kyrsten Sinema, Tom O'Halleran, Ann Kirkpatrick, Raul Grijalva, Paul Gosar, Andy Biggs, David Schweikert, Ruben Gallego, Debbie Lesko, Greg Stanton. ARIZONA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 28, 2021 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Gary Palmer. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Robert B. Aderhoft. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Terry A. Sewell. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Mo Brooks. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Mike Rogers. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Barry Moore. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to Jerry L. Carl. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Tommy Tuberville. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Richard Shelby. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to John H. Merrill. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Don Young. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Dan Sullivan. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Lisa Murkowski. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to Mike Dunleavy. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Kay Ivey. (bw)
March 28, 2021 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Mike Dunleavy, Lisa Murkowski, Dan Sullivan, Don Young. ALASKA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 28, 2021 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by D. D., M. L., Deanna Lorraine, S. M., T. M., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., Jennilyn Salinas, Kay Ivey, John H. Merrill, Richard Shelby, Tommy Tuberville, Jerry L. Carl, Barry Moore, Mike Rogers, Mo Brooks, Terry A. Sewell, Robert B. Aderhoft, Gary Palmer. ALABAMA DEFENDANTS (Davis, Paul)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Application for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants amending, filed by Lindsey Nguyen, P. P., D. D., S. M., M. L., T. M., Jennilyn Salinas, Deanna Lorraine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Paul)
March 23, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Reissued as to Pete Sessions. (mc5)
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Reissued as to Chuck Schumer. (mc5)
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Reissued as to Mitch McConnell. (mc5)
March 23, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Reissued as to Nancy Pelosi. (mc5)
March 21, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. Reissuance of Summons to Defendants Pelosi, McConnell, Schumer, and Sessions Change Plaintiffs' Attorney Address (Davis, Paul)
March 17, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Republican National Committee. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jack Dorsey. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Brad Raffensperger. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Mark Zuckerberg. (mc5)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. to Mark Zuckerberg, Brad Raffensperger, Jack Dorsey, the DSCC, the DCCC, and the RNC (Davis, Paul)
February 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Chuck Schumer. (bw)
February 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mitch McConnell. (bw)
February 27, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Pete Sessions. (bw)
February 27, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy Pelosi. (bw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. to Nancy Pelosi (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2 - Mitch McConnell, #2 Supplement 3 - Chuck Schumer, #3 Supplement 4 - Pete Sessions, #4 Supplement 5 - All Senators, #5 Supplement 6 - All Congressmen)(Davis, Paul)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Davis, Paul)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ashley Hoff. (am)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul)
February 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Jeremy Bravo, D. D., Lindsey Nguyen, P. P.. (Davis, Paul)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14510561), filed by P. P., Lindsey Nguyen, Jeremy Bravo, D. D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bravo et al v. Pelosi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bravo
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. P.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Nguyen
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. D.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Lorraine
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. M.
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennilyn Salinas
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Cann
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Lynnette
Represented By: Paul M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Jacobus P. van der Ven
Represented By: Jonathan Kravis
Represented By: W. Ray Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Podhorzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Sessions
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schumer
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Represented By: Lee M. Stoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Emily R. Brailey
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Represented By: Faith Johnson Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Dorsey
Represented By: Thomas S. Leatherbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Emily R. Brailey
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All 50 State Governors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All 50 State Secretaries of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Scott A. Keller
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Members of 117th U.S. Congress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Sasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Jerry McNerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellie M. Gorbea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Zoe Lofgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. John Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Tonko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Stauber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Luria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgess Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Ken Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Darrell Issa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Huizenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albio Sires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Richard J. Durbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Mike Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Luetkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. John Boozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Josh Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Meuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Axne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Vern Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Donald McEachin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayanna Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Jahana Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Ron DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Herrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Balderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahesha Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. JB Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markwayne Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Lauren M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Marco Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Morelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Stephanie Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Ashcroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Mike Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Wood Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Ken Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Frank J. Mrvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: William Travis Garrison
Represented By: Caitlyn Nestleroth Johnson
Represented By: Andrew D. Mccartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Patrick Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hakeem Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondaire Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy McMorris Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Represented By: Anthony D. Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. J. Luis Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Stabenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Robin Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Ray Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. C. Scott Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moolenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Andrew S. Clyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyrsten Sinema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy E. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Devin Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Leger Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Zeldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Bill Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. W. Gregory Steube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Darren Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodey Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tre Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug La Follette
Represented By: Anthony D. Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Bill Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Lucy McBath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Yarmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Tony Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Nikema Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Sanford D. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Bradley Scheider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Ami Bera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Barry Loudermilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Ruben Gallego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaal Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Meijer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Bruce Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Brad Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicente Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christi Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abigail Spanberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cicilline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Kilmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Mazie K. Hirono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Ned Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger F. Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rouzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong Mike Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Gararino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Kevin McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Tammy Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong Don Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shemia Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Christopher A. Coons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Francis Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Trone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Maria Elvira Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cori Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Holli Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Smucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Raul Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter DeFazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Ted Lieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Rodney Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. David Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Scalise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Sewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Raja Krishnamoorthi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. David G. Valdadao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy E. Nehls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Adam Kinzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Joe Neguse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Pete Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Kaptur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten E. Gillibrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriano Espaillat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Kaiali'i Kahele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Debbie Wasserman Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Dianne Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Richard Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Mary E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Mark Takano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pramila Jayapal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Cawthorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Klobuchar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. French Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Jeffrey W. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hogan
Represented By: Andrea W. Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashida Tlaib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Hyde-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Salud Carbajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. A. Drew Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Todd Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Debbie Lesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Brad Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Harshbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Pascrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Inhofe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Katko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Mark Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacky Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kustoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Lisa Blunt Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Buddy Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Byron Donalds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Julia Brownley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of Oklahoma Kevin Stitt
Represented By: Jennifer L. Lewis
Represented By: Lauren J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Jackie Walorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Gus M. Bilirakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen Tommy Tuberville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Ricketts
Represented By: Jennifer A. Huxoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Michael Waltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Clyburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Grothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. John H. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Foxx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Fischbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. David Y. Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen. Mike Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin L. Cardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Karen Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cong. Adam Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Cleaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sec. Denise W. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [