Adams et al v. Postmates Inc.
Defendant: Gladys Williams
Petitioner: Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Jamal Adams, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Adriana Aaron, Charles Abbott, Usa Blanco, Jorge Garibay, Janita Diggins, Jasmine Diaz, Michael Acuna, Todd Greene, Aleksandr Umanskiy, Elliot Bocchieri, Estella Taylor, Roi Rivera, Lavelle Alexander, Cuyler Martinez, Josie Salazar, Anthony Mack, Brandon Arebalos, Garsha Arristos, Dave Martinez, Isabella Madrid, James Esqueda, Melody Summers, Jessarela Orozco, Cheree Winston, David Shank, Jessica Clements, Daniel Leflore, Roderick Erwin, Zoe Noelle, Squally Hunter, Matthew Tempchin, Darren Gephart, Trusten Mays, Carly Heath, Richard Brody, Taeyong Noh, Alex Gouge-Schajer, Jonatan Javier Martinez Arroyo, Mark Huerta, Richard Ybarra, Fitsum Gebremichael, Pauline Thomas, Tanisha Green, Jimmy Smith, Steven Turner, Daniel Hernandez, Frederick Stoces, Eduardo Aguilera, Gregory Audiss, Andrew Hafer, Cameron Lgutierrez, Armin Keihani, Roman Romano, Jonathan Kerry, Dajauna Marcella, Samuel Hogan, Tashelle Tarver, Roger Cordon, Annette Goodman, Dominick Baldwin, Lashae Cousin, Gary Espinoza, Jessany Moore, Michael Petriccione, Ateliah Duburg, Tashanna Hester, Joel Maisonet, Kunleg Tshering, Collin Summers, Juliet Frew, Kenneth Rodriguez, Darby Darling, Gerald Phillips, Herbert Hernandez, Martha Escalera, Jemal Brown, Victoria Quisenberry, Miguel Mejia, Dewayne Franklin, Milan Tett, Annahita Kianpour, Said Khalef, Alyna Boyer, Carmel Kolbrener, Michele Strom, Jon Phillips, Zachary Haeberlein, Shilyn Kaufman, Nicholas Sanders, Cory Paul, Susan Mann, Jasmine Jones, Elizabeth Santiago, Tyreonica Lee, Russell Flisk, Rodney Edwards, Po Ung, Silvia Reina Gutierrez, Jeff Yen, Angela Berlfein, Tina Stokes, Stephen Groff, Sun Young Urasaki, Zohar Tito, Amanda Gaeta, Temekisa Davis, Alexis Marquez, Aaron Jeffries, Parsa Mirzaagha, Josh Goepel, Joki Jones, Jeffrey Koenig, Jennifer Powers, Jorge Tayun, Raymond Garcia, Silvia Lopez, Javier Luna, Brian Hoffman, Briana Vick, Marina Villareal, Jose Arturo Torres, Kathleen Erdmann, Shane Wielinga, Ryan Barksdale, Rachelle Fuentez, Michael Carrieri, Annika Embry, Jonathan Sandoval, Austin Mantanona, Eric Lutin, Alejandro Avila, Theresa Mounphoxay, William Johnson, Vanessa Gowett, Zachary Perez, Ryan Miles, Ayaz Ahmed, Savannah Barber, David Lopez, Krishnakumar Bhakta, Steve Delo, Alex George, Diiymilea Crafton, Chandler Le Francis, Ryan Prichard, Hosea Santos, Theodoro Franco, Sheryl Fry, Jesseka Davis, Shannon Rodriguez, Debbie Oluokun, Esequiel Tapia, Landon Wilson, Venus Lopez, Gerald Gonzalez, Ajay Rochester, Khalid Shahin, Joel Ortega, Tanya Blue, Consafos Chavarin, Krystle Dubose, June Lucero, Nick Graham, Cynthia Frye, Tanisha James, Rashida Singleton, Tiffany Wallace, Patrick Lamb, Dylan Brigode, Leeonni Long, Jorge Perez, Dana Krieger, Joseph Alise, Omahr Mead, Veronica Cargill, Jacob Schneider, Erick Hernandez, Michael Becerril, Ashleigh Smalley, Michael Clark, William Bryan, Rodney Latin, Kristina Hollingshead, Heidi Nolan, Chris Pavao, Abraham Navarro, Luis Rea, Monica Garcia, Leticia Granados, Sheilacy Owens, Arjun Bista, Steven Romero, Romeo Vergara, Kayla Seay, Maurice Johnson, Brenda Walls, Carlos Lopez, Deera Brown, Mychal Allen-Conway, Jeremy Mahabir, David Capablanca, Jan Balashov, Brandi Barnett, Olha Tarnovetska, Stephanie Lara, Janaiah Lloyd, Brett Miller, Anita Ramirez, Mario Morataya, Lionel Johnson, Omar Vega, Daniel Berry, Tyaira Felder, Deanna Johnson, Andrea Bortis, Michelle Gutierrez, Josie Abilez, Isabellah Christo, David Ware, Breeanna Simmons, Stephanie Tavarez, Matthew Ryan Lewis, Lakeisha Thomas, Lexi Sinker, Wynter Palmer, Matthew Rubalcaba, Daisy Monae, Leland Nelson, Cesia Chavez, Michael Nusbaum, Jesus Salas, Sarah Roberts, Celestine Velasquez, Miguel Uribe, Brendan Lenhart, James Milligan, Jamal Young, Brittany Watson, George Denny, Robert Prado, Dakquari Moore, Josh Haar, Oscar Cano Jr, Kathy Nunley, Jon Vinson, Amanda Kolar, Laterrius Peters, Vincent Archie, Albert Schindler, Jonathan Sorensen, Rudy Soto, Jennifer Chester, Shawn Miller, Rasheeta Austin, Spain Oneal, Jorge Cervantes, Jenny Brugueras, Daron Blakely, Shavione Blackshear, Allen Pitta, Jr, Kamisha Mills, Paul Fauntleroy, Elio Moreno, Ryan Hoy, Joann Lizarraga, Nictaye Stephens, Emmanuel Woods, Albert Jimnez, Bryan Medeiros, Angelica Sesma, Felicia Warner, Stephanie Martinez, Marie Booker, Maya Benton, Rosely Misailegalu, Eric Paul, Carlos Robbins, Reginaldo Rosario, Antonio Aguilar, Crystal Booher, Brandon Clark, Antoinette Wiley, Trevor Murphy, Benjamin Guterry, Jason Coles, Melissa Coe, Gabriel Garcia, Keith Odett, Elizabeth Saldivar, Constance Dorough, Cesar Rodriguez, Jorge Hernandez, Macaria Toribio, Mark Reyes, Briana Vallejo, Jennifer Ochoa, Opal Dunton, Jennifer Milligan, Sonia Singh, Danielle Santilli, Sergio Perez and Ebony Bryant
Respondent: Postmates Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv03042
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 252 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE AND RENEWED REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (re #251 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF re #250 Status Report ) filed by Postmates Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dhananjay S. Manthripragada, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 251 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF re #250 Status Report AND RENEWED REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Jamal Adams. Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 250 Reply in Support of Status Report and Renewed Request for Case Management Conference by Postmates Inc.. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 10/8/2019) Modified on 10/9/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 249 Petitioners' Response to Postmates's Renewed Request for a Case Management Conference re #248 Status Report, byJamal Adams. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Filing 248 STATUS REPORT REGARDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RENEWED REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Postmates Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 247 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byJamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER DENYING RESPONDENTS REQUEST TO SET A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/3/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 245 RESPONSE re #244 Notice (Other) by Jamal Adams. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE and Request for Status Conference by Postmates Inc. (Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 9/17/2019) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 243 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 is vacated and will be reset if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 242 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court finds that the Motions to Compel #4 , #228 are appropriate for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the 9/11/2019 hearing date is vacated and the Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 241 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by all petitioners and Postmates Inc. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/6/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #239 Stipulation Removing this Case from ADR Multi-Option Program.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 239 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to remove this case from the Court's ADR Multi-Option Program filed by Jamal Adams, all petitioners and Postmates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Filing 238 REPLY (re #228 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byPostmates Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Campbell)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 237 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #228 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byJamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Keller, #2 Proposed Order)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect filing procedure Re: #234 Declaration in Support. Declarations should be filed as an attachment to the brief, not filed as a separate d ocument. No further action is necessary, please comply on future filings. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #231 Administrative Motion CONTINUING THE JULY 10, 2019 HEARING ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #230 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Warren Postman. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 234 Declaration of Ashley Keller in Support of #233 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byJamal Adams. (Related document(s) #233 ) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 233 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Hearing Date re #17 Renotice motion hearing, ) on behalf of all Petitioners filed byJamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 232 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING HEARING ON #4 MOTION TO COMPEL AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Hearing Date re #17 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Postmates Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele L. Maryott, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing Date)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 230 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Warren Postman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13489356.) filed by Jamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Postman, Warren) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 229 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in support of Petitioners' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed byJamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 228 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Postmates Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/11/2019. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theane Evangelis, #2 Appendix of Exhibits A-L to Declaration of Theane Evangelis, #3 Declaration of Ashley Campbell, #4 Appendix of Exhibits A-B to Declaration of Ashley Campbell, #5 Proposed Order)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 227 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Robin Young, Stacy Young, Tyanna Young, Jessica Younger, Asser Yousry, Barbara Yuzbasioglu, Riccardo Zagara, Michelle Zaharek, Marlana Zakon, Laurie Zaleski, Daniel Zamora, Lynda Zamora, Brando Zamudio, Saeed Zandieh, Elizabeth Zapata, Matt Zaragoza, Luis Zarate, Donna Zavala, Jordan Zegarra, Elizabeth Zelaya, Ibis Zelaya, Christian Zepeda, Lisa Zepeda, Yvette Zepeda, James Zhang, Jeremiah Zick, Katelynn Zirtzman, Michael Zisman, Justin Zloty, Ramsey Zreik, Eileen Zubia, Jason Zuniga, Jacqueline Zunun and Justin Zweber. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 226 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Leroy Yeargin, Henrik Yeghikian, Hashabah Yehudah, Jeff Yen, Frederick Ynclino, Jose Yniguez, Nicholas Yocom, Chris Yoder, Jeffrey Yoon, Jerry Yoon, Talal Yordi, Phil Yorio, Jason York, Toni York, Artemus Young, Brenden Young, Bryan Young, Charles Young, Deavn Young, Jacob Young, Jamal Young, Jimmy Young, Johnnie Young, Louis Young, Melanie Young and Monique Young. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 225 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Natasha Wooten Sanford, Erika Word, Gabriel Word, Shanna Worley, Anthony Worthey, Alec Wright, Aleesha Wright, Brenden Wright, Keenan Wright, Shavonte Wright, Stacey Wright, Sylvester Wright, John Wu, Danielle Wurnitsch, Lorenzo Wuysang, Devin Wyant, David Wyatt, Amber Wycuff, Karmen Wyrick, Rachelle Wyse, Aaron Yancey, Carlos Yanez, Ignacio Yanez, Pocholo Yatco, Jennifer Yates, Ricky Yaulianto and Richard Ybarra. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 224 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Tremain Wofford, Chase Wohrle, Justin Wolcott, David Wolfe, Johnathan Wolford, Frank Womack, Jr, Peter Won, Paul Wong, Jeremiah Woo, Steve Woo, Johnathan Wood, Sarah Wood, Samuel Woodall, Kareena Wooder, Randall Woodrugf, Akeem Woods, Emmanuel Woods, Jahmonica Woods, Larry Woods, Phillip Woods, Airyca Woolridge and Bobbie Wooten. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 223 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Joseph Wills, Elita Wilson, Erik Wilson, Jaimie Wilson, Keyon Wilson, Landon Wilson, Larina Wilson, Mackenzie Wilson, Matthew Wilson, Reginald Wilson, Rochelle Wilson, Shudene Wilson, Terrence Wilson, Ymunique Wilson, April Wilton, Hugh Wilton, Camie Wiltshire, Joseph Winakur, Angela Windom, Arion Wingfield, Kasheena Winn, Rob Winn, Taylor Winrow, Cheree Winston, Hadassah Winston, Kenyon Winston, Jabari Winzer, Rommy Wirawan, Debra Wirth, Nich Witham and Shaneisha Wofford. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 222 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Ronald Williams, Rose Williams, Shaniesa Williams, Sharne Williams, Shirley Williams, Sierra Williams, Sonia Williams, Thomanyque Williams, Tonya Williams, Tyler Williams, Tiffanie Willingham, Brandon Willis, Deandre Willis, Jerry Willis, Louis Willis, Michael Willis, Paula Willis, Miesha Willoughby and Alexzus Wills. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 221 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jacob Williams, Jamal Williams, Jamelia Williams, James Williams, Janelle Williams, Janice Williams, Jasmone Williams, Jennifer Williams, Jeremiah Williams, Jesse Williams, Kacy Williams, Kalana Williams, Kathlyn Williams, Kenov Williams, Kimberly Williams, Lorenzo Williams, Mary Williams, Matt Williams, Michael Williams, Natasha Williams, Nikole Williams, Nire Williams, Rachel Williams and Randy Williams. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 220 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Armani Williams, Bernard Williams, Brett Williams, Brian Williams, Carlton Williams, Courtney Williams, Curtis Williams, Daniel Williams, Daryl Williams, Deanndra Williams, Denise Williams, Denzell Williams, Desaree Williams, Dijon Williams, Dontrenae Williams, Frank Williams and Gladys Williams. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 219 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michele Whitman, Ella Whittington, David Wickham, Courtney Wickware, John Wiebe, Shane Wielinga, Jack Wiener, Emily Wiese, Valentino Wijaya, Adam Wilborn, Matthew Wilds, Antoinette Wiley, Ashley Wiley, Quantessa Wiley, Tahj Wiliams, Michael Wilke, Jennifer Wilkerson, Ashley Wilkins, Malica Wilkins, Patrick Wilkins, Alex Williams and Alicia Williams. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 218 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Angelise Western, Michael Western, Matthew Wetta, Thomas Whalen, Shermaine Wherry, Spencer Whisler, Diane Whitaker, Brian White, Cameron White, Cassidy White, Christine White, Christopher White, Derek White, Devonna White, Eboni White, Emilie White, Inishia White, Jason White, Jessica White, Julian White, Larry White, Major White, Nettie White, Paula White, Sherelle White, Sierra White, Skyler White, Stacy White, Tasha White, Timberlyn White, Xzavier White, Zakiyah White, Gary Whitescarver, Courtney Whitfield and Stacie Whitley. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 217 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jhamil Welton, Chris Wendt, Timothy Wentzel, Steven Wenzel, Deanna West, Markeshia West, Roland West, Sylvia West and Terraca West. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 216 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Briana Washington, Deja Washington, Denzel Washington, Fanne Washington, Lloyd Washington, Quentin Washington, Sarah Washington, Patrick Waters, Sarah Waters, Alayjah Watkins, Brittany Watson, Symphony Watts, Eric Webb, Reana Webb, Csllie Webber, Ashleigh Weber, Maurice Webster, Rochelle Weeks, Christopher Weil, Cameron Weir, Douglas Weiss, Curtis Welch, Denisa Welch, Marianne Welch, Brianna Wells, Kayla Wells and Sarah Wells. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 215 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: James Walker, III, Justin Walker, Leomar Walker, Erick Wallace, Felicia Wallace, Lawrence Wallace, Louis Wallace, Tiffany Wallace, Ken Waller, Ramatu Waller, Angie Wallingford, Brenda Walls, Micah Walters, Keiosha Walton, Leanna Ward, Marc Ward, Antwain Ware, Danielle Ware, David Ware, Nettie Warley, Aaron Warner, Erica Warner, Felicia Warner, Brittany Warren, Jordan Warren, Stephanie Warren and Aleishia Wash. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 214 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Gwendolyn Vinson, Jon Vinson, John Vinzon, Julie Viramontes, Tylor Vo, Beverly Vodegel, Peter Voet, Brian Vollmer, Lorna Vollmuth, Dennis Volochkov, Andrea Von Bargen, Alex Vorobyev, Bryant Vu, Cindy Vu, Paul Vu, Kiera Waddy, Earon Wafer, Daniel Wagenseller, Darwin Wagner, Karttie Wahoff, Laurence Waight, Christopher Wakefield, Sandra Walber, Zachariah Waliagha, Antonio Walk, Breana Walker, Devon Walker, Eugene Walker, Jaylen Walker and Jeffrey Walker. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 213 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Noe Villa, Santiago Villa, Antonio Villafuerte, Ruben Villagran, Ana Villalobos, Joseph Villalpando, Nancy Villalpando, Marina Villareal, Irene Villasano, Denis Villatoro, Linda Villegas, Brittany Vincent and Mike Vincent. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 212 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jennifer Vaughn, Melissa Vaught, Alexander Vazquez, Andrea Vazquez, Carmen Vazquez, Jose Vazquez, Karen Vazquez, Ricardo Vazquez, Elizabeth Veal, Jose Vega, Julien Vega, Omar Vega, Andrea Velasquez, Anthony Velasquez, Celestine Velasquez, Della Velasquez, Melania Velazquez, Doreen Velez, Edlin Veliz, Manuel Veloz, Fanny Vences, Giordanni Venegas, Dreyven Vengarick, Doris Ventura, Jonas Ventura, Omar Nogales Verdin, Romeo Vergara, Joycelyn Verma, Leandro Vianna, Briana Vick, Hayley Victory, Sierra Vidal, Logan Vigil, Abraham Villa and Christopher Villa. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 211 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Christin Valle, Justin Valle, Steven Valle, Briana Vallejo, Thuy Van, Gabriel Van De Sande, William Van Der Bloemen, Lonnie Van Horn, Marissa Van Houte, James Van Noy, Carlisa Vanburen, Jaime Vanegas, Nick Vanetta, Bao Vang, Peder Vang, Melisa Vannalom, Joseph Vanover, Bryan Vanveen, Brandon Vaquiz, Cynthia Vasquez, Juan Vasquez, Nick Vasquez, Raquelle Vasquez and Esteban Vasquez-Noriega. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 210 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Salma Ubwa, Constantin Udroica, Md Ullah, Priscilla Ulloa, Aleksandr Umanskiy, Hammed Umoru, Po Ung, Sun Young Urasaki, Jose Urbina, Miguel Uribe, Stephen Urquidez, Stephanie Urquizo, Joseph Urso, Jerri Usher, Lillian Ushurhe, Katalyn Uth, Ebubechukwuu Uzoukwu, Daniel Vakay, Christian Vala, Jimmy Valadez, Whitney Valcin, Chris Valdepena, Crystal Valdez, Daniel Valdez, Leo Valdez, Lavonne Valencia, Madaya Valencia, Andrew Valenzuela, Emmanuel Valenzuela, Johnny Valenzuela, Anthony Valera, Alexander Valeriano, Crystal Valeriano, Leonardo Valladolid and Aurora Valle. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 209 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Raymond Tran, Raul Travesi, Sadiki Treadwell, Kelsey Tredwell, Elena Treiger, Chelora Trice, Lynn Tripp, Brittany Trodder, Jacquis Trodder, Jarah Troupe, Sara Troyer, Joshua Truelson, Damian Trujillo, Jorge Trujillo, Kimberly Trujillo, Monica Trujillo, Nicole Trujillo, Ruben Trujillo, Santa Trujillo, Tristan Trujillo, Courtney Truley, Eddie Truong, Janet Truong, Kevin Truong, Quan Tsang, Kunleg Tshering, Sivan Tsoar, Brian Tsylor, Phuong Tu, Ranier Tuason, Clinton Tucker, Sheri Tucker, Andrea Tullis, Hovanes Tumasyan, Charles Turner, Chryshendall Turner, David Turner, Eddie Turner, Jacob Turner, Kenneth Turner, Lafayette Turner, Mona Turner, Selena Turner, Steven Turner, Tremont Turner, Branden Tuxbury, Luzer Twersky, Rose Tye, Gretchen Tyler, Keaton Tyler, Trelasha Tyler, Warren Tyler and Ezequiel Ubios. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 208 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Priscilla Tocki, Lucas Todd, Adrian Toledo, Britney Tomsula, La Tasha Tonewood, Justin Toney, Adam Tonnessen, Mindy Tons, Vivianne Toppings, Brandon Torbati, Macaria Toribio, Alexander Torres, Angel Torres, Christian Torres, Evelyn Torres, Jacqueline Torres, Jenifer Torres, Jose Arturo Torres, Martin Torres, Micah Torres, Moises Torres, Travis Torres, Veronica Torres, Vibhatsu Torres, Alberto Torres Rodriguez, Hernan Torres-Corona, Karen Torres-Corona, Chanel Tourgeman, Sarah Tourner, Toni Tovar, Maryanna Towle, Lynn Townsel, James Townsend, Kati Tran, Khanh Tran and Nguyen Quoc Huy Tran. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 207 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kyoko Thompson, Marvin Thompson, Michaelle Thompson, Nauliatyce Thompson, Nichole Thompson, Rachel Thompson, Robin Thompson, Shawn Thompson, Stacie Thompson, Tamika Thompson, Toiriana Thompson, Carlton Thompson Mann, Maixee Thor, Craig Thornburg, Walter Thornburgh, Devante Thornton, Kimberly Thornton, Ty Thornton, Sahaja Thorpe, Yamili Thouchalanh, Jason Throop, Jeremy Thurber, Larry Tidwell, Jacob Tierney, Jan Tillman, Nicole Timmons, Charles Timothy, Anthony Tinant-Deepak, Georgina Tinoco, Zohar Tito, Jean To, Jorge Tobar and Ivan Tocar. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 206 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Micheline Thomas, Pauline Thomas, Roderick Thomas, Ryshel Thomas, Sidney Thomas, Tara Thomas, Tiana Thomas, Tierra Thomas, Tonea Thomas, Tyree Thomas, Unique Thomas, Vanisa Thomas, Willie Thomas, III, Alex Thompson, Courtney Thompson, Erwin Thompson and Kasha Thompson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 205 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: James Thayer, John Thek, Keven Theophile, Manjinger Thind, Evan This, Robert Thoman, Aaron Thomas, Alexa Thomas, Andre Thomas, Andrew Thomas, Antral Thomas, Chasmine Thomas, Christopher Thomas, Emille Thomas, Jamel Thomas, Lakeisha Thomas, Latonya Thomas, Lorrel Thomas, Marlicia Thomas and Michael Thomas. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 204 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Joseph Paveena, Dawonna Taylor, Estella Taylor, Fabio Taylor, Lynette Taylor, Malarie Taylor, Melanee Taylor, Robin Taylor, Shawntay Taylor, Taniqua Taylor, Tawny Taylor, Tubotein Taylor, Unique Taylor, Viesha Taylor, Jorge Tayun, Chance Teague, Desiree Tejeda, Paul Philip Tejedor, Dulce Tellez, Matthew Tempchin, Candace Temple, Gerald Temple, James Tene, Eric Tenort, James Terpstra, Milan Tett, Helen Tewolde, Jason Thais, Paveena Thanasaro, Amrit Thapa, Carol Thatcher and Mason Thatcher. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 203 Declaration of Ashley Keller in Support of #202 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byJamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #202 ) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 202 REPLY (re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) on behalf of all Petitioners filed byJamal Adams. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 201 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Bradley Tate, Mary Tate, Shelia Tate, Taizja Tate, Tony Tateyama, Shane Tavarez, Stephanie Tavarez, Kyle Tavizon, Kristen Taxara, Aaliyah Taylor, Audra Taylor, Benjamin Taylor, Brushay Taylor and Charmain Taylor. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 200 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Adasha Surratt, Caitlin Sutton, Sajal Suwal, Olivia Swaim, Charles Swain, Ronald Swallow, Cindy Swanson, Valerie Swanson, Nathan Swartz, Toure Sweeney, Stephanie Swiger, Ruby Swope, Alfreda Swygert, Hamidou Sy, Jacob Sykes, Oliver Szakall, Alexander Szopinski, Alano T.Adriano, Maria Taamu, Marki Tafoya, Vicente Tan, Kenneth Tang, Hailey Tantillo, Esequiel Tapia, Nataly Tapia, Omar Tapia, Serafina Tapper, Michael Taquino, Steven Taren, Marjan Tareq, Olha Tarnovetska, Sevak Tarpinian and Tashelle Tarver. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 199 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Lakiesha Stuart, Eric Stubbs, Kyle Stutesman, Jennifer Styles, Hari Subedi, Mahendra Subedi, Amber Sudduth, Elisha Sullivan, Marleen Sullivan, Michael Sullivan, Sean Sullivan, Sierra Sullivan, Ryan Sumerlin, Collin Summers, Kristin Summers, Melody Summers, Eric Summerville, Donna Sumpman, Angelino Sundiam and Chalinee Suphanthuchat. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 198 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kaile Stevens, Lyle Stevens, Marlee Stevens, Anthony Stevenson, Jessica Stevenson, Brian Stewart, Dante Stewart, Dyllan Stewart, Nicole Stewart, Simone Stewart, William Stewart, Mismonay Stewart-Woolfolk, Leanna Stickel, Michael Stilson, Michael Stinemates, Brian Stinson, Jessica Stobart, Frederick Stoces, Ryan Stockbridge, Amber Stockert, Matthew Stockton, Lewis Stokes, Tina Stokes, Alyssa Stone, Lisa Stover, Jeffrey Strauss, Chalon Stringfellos, Michele Strom, Bonnie Stromer, Danny Stuart and Erma Stuart. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 197 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Marcos Sousa, Amanda South, Shacole Sparks, Ian Spath, Bryan Spelker, Anthony Spencer, Lakeisha Spencer, Yolanda Spigner, Savokia Spignor, Thomas Sponberg, Robin Spruiell, Theresa Sslyer, Peterson St Jean, Carlo St Juste, Jr, Andrew Stafford, Brandon Stanford, Timothy Stanley, Alisa Stansbury, Denise Stares, Christine Stark, Elijah Starms, Terri Stasik, Cristal Staunton, Steven Steadman, Autumn Steele, Crystal Steele, Laurie Steelman, Ciena Steinbeck, Daniel Steinbecker, Jeffrey Steinberg, Charles Steinman, Melissa Stemen, Karina Stephens, Nictaye Stephens, Amanda Stevens and John Stevens. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 196 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Monnize Sobrinho, Seiwaa Sofala, Collin Sohn, Jocelyne Solares, Darla Solis, Kelly Solomon, Lee Solomon, Justin Song, Tai Song, Valentine Soposky, Joey Sorce, Jonathan Sorensen, Amanda Sorg, Juan Soria, Gustavo Soriano, Yaya Sorrel, Mayo Sosa, Paul Sosa, Jessica Sosbee, April Soto, Courtney Soto, Danny Soto, Juan Soto, Mylee Soto, Rudy Soto, Sara Soto, Rayan Soueidan and Tida Soun. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 195 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Laquita Smith, Latorrance Smith, Laurence Smith, Matthew Smith, Meca Smith, Melanie Smith, Monte Smith, Nancy Smith, Richard Smith, Robert Smith, Rondrea Smith, Roxiann Smith, Russell Smith, Serrenity Smith, Shanra Smith, Shawn Smith, Shuanta Smith, Sierra Smith, Stephanie Smith, Stephanie Smith, Tiffany Smith, Wayne Smith, James Smokes, Michael Smoot, Taleigha Sneed, Dean Snelson, Mycole Snider, Shannara Snodgrass, Tiffany Snook, Tiffany Snow and Mindy Snyder. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 194 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Christine Smith, Christopher Smith, Daniel Smith, Darrell Smith, Delaine Smith, Demarcus Smith, Desiree Smith, Douglas Smith, Edward Smith, Eula Smith, Gregory Smith, Jasmine Smith, Jasmine Smith, Jasons Smith, Jennifer Smith, Jeremy Smith, Jervere Smith, Jimmy Smith, John Smith, Jonathon Smith, Karla Smith, Kayla Smith, Keaira Smith, Kent Smith, Kristina Smith, Krystle Smith and Lance Smith. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 193 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Simon Sioni, Aunirban Sircar, Christine Sirias, Logan Sisco, Christine Situmeang, Sokhim Siv, Rita Sivongxay, Sierra Skelton, Bryaun Skinner, Maurianna Skinner, Wyatt Slate, Vinay Slathia, Lisa Slattery, Deandre Sloan, Elizabeth Sloan, John Sloane, Joshua Slusher, Jasmyne Small, Ashleigh Smalley, John Smart, Tanisha Smart, Adambrant Smith, Althea Smith, Annette Smith, Anthony Smith, Anthony Smith, Ashley Smith, Brenna Smith, Carlton Smith and Carol Smith. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 192 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sonia Singh, Eric Singler, Danielle Singleton, Kye Singleton, Rashida Singleton, Lexi Sinker and Elena Sinulingga. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 191 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Osvaldo Silva, Veronica Silva, Joseph Silvia, Ramy Silyan, Krista Simanovich, Wayne Simard, Belal Simjee, Asim Simmons, Breeanna Simmons, Malika Simmons, Stasea Simmons, William Simmons, Don Simms, Gevargiz Simon, Jaylinn Simone, Craig Simpson, Elster Simpson, Tabatha Simpson, Unique Simpson, Kendric Sims, Tashawna Sims and Heather Singh. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 190 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Vijay Sheth, Harrison Shi, Justice Shields, Kristi Shields, Tyler Shields, Kimber Shilpetski, Duncan Shimojima, Ebony Shine, Kevin Shirley, II, Brittany Shober, Lawrence Shoffner, Kasra Shokravi, Sagar Shrestha, Stephanie Shuff, William Shuster, Spencer Siddens, Taylor Sides, Aldair Silva, Alexus Silva, Andrew Silva, Christopher Silva, Frank Silva, Jaime Silva, Kelly Silva, Mario Silva, Marlene Silva and Matthew Silva. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 189 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Audrey Severy, Marissa Seybert, Nicole Seymore, Khalid Shahin, Ayuque Shaikh, Khachik Shakhpazyan, Paolo Shamoon, David Shank, Michael Shannon, Abdullah Shariff, Jennifer Sharpe, Lorna Jean Sharrard, Christopher Shaw, Tyral Shaw, Eric Shawula, Sharla Shelby, Chelsea Shelton, Weiwen Sheng, John Shepherd and Damian Sheradd. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 188 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Justin Schultz, Neill Schutzer, Connor Schwab, William Schwartz-Doyle, Nathaniel Scobie, Hasani Scott, Lakeisha Scott, Marie Scott, Samantha Scott, Zoe Searle, Johnny Ray Seastrunk, Tyrel Seawell, Kayla Seay, Sean See, Shaun Seeram, Kaila Segarra, Rondie Sellers, Stone Selseth, Kelly Selvidge, Michelle Senart, Loire Sendejas, Ryan Sensenig, Chanalisa Sera, Brittani Serna, Tricia Serranilla, Juan Serrano, Angelica Sesma, Tyrone Session and Kristina Sevcik. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 187 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jordan Schneider, Lillian Schoenbeck, Jacob Schor, Lauren Schorr, Brandy Schreiner, Michael Schuda and Dana Schultz. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 186 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michelle Sanford, Zoey Sanford, Rufai Sani, Arthur Santamaria, Juan Carlos Santana, Rocco Santana, Elizabeth Santiago, Kumonique Santiago, Danielle Santilli, Hosea Santos, Logan Sanzeri, Hemang Saraiya, Mark Sardina, Renier Sarmiento, Kevin Savage, Diana Savala Thibeau, Jerald Sayson, Joshua Scally-Smith, Anthony Scamaldo, Rebecca Scarbrough, Melanie Scarpati, Damion Scates, Clarence Schaaf, Tyan Schess, Taylor Scheuneman, Albert Schindler, Brittany Schissler, Roxanne Schmidt, Demitrius Schmitt and Jacob Schneider. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 185 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jose Sanchez, Karen Sanchez, Manuel Sanchez, Marcus Sanchez, Mercedes Sanchez, Oscar Sanchez, Victor Sanchez, Victor Sanchez, Michelle Sanchz, Dakota Sandak, Amanda Sanders, Ashalla Sanders, Chantell Sanders, Nicholas Sanders, Theareasa Sanders, William Sanderson, Brianna Sandoval, Darian Sandoval, Jonathan Sandoval, Sasha Sandusky and David Sandvoss. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 184 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Loren Sajona, Anais Sakaoghli, Rebecca Salari, Jesus Salas, Monica Salas, Francisco Salazar, Josie Salazar, Makayla Salazar, Miguel Salazar, Stephanie Salazar, Jonathan Salcido, Luis Saldado, Elizabeth Saldivar, Gerardo Saldivar, Frank Salgado, David Salihi, Diana Salinas, Monica Salinas, Theresa Salinas, Andrew Salvador, Chris Salvador, Frankie Samorarandon, Sean Sampsell, Keshawn Sampson, George Samtamaria, Analise Sanabria, Nathan Sanbeck, Jenna Sanceda, Adam Sanchez, Arthur Sanchez, Christopher Sanchez, Eloy Sanchez, Gabby Sanchez, Guadalupe Sanchez, Jacqueline Sanchez, Jan Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Sanchez, Jorge Sanchez and Jose Sanchez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 183 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Brandon Russell, Dana Russell, Danielle Russell, Desiree Russell, William Russell, Brendan Russell-Holcomb, Ashley Russom, Desiree Ruvalcaba, Daniel Sabin, Jessica Sacks, Jason Sadik, Bryanna Saechao, Nathan Saechao, Esam Saeed, Chris Saenz, Leyla Saghafi, Maria Ynez Sagun, Abanob Said, Theresa Said, Zakaria Said, Joey Saidian, Manuchekhr Saidov, Bianca Sainz-Smith and Boback Sajadpour. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 182 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sherry Rosner, Cheylyn Ross, Jameelah Ross, Jordan Ross, Kayanna Ross, Peter Ross, Ula Ross, Lindsay Roush, Randi Roush, Althea Roy, Dylan Royal, Matthew Rubalcaba, Bettina Ruffalo, Lecretia Ruffin, John Ruffinelli, Frank Rugnetta, Paul Ruhl, Seyannah Ruhland, Daniel Ruiz, Jorge Ruiz, Jose Ruiz, Manuel Ruiz, Vincent Ruiz, Felipe Ruiz, Jr, Brian Rumas, Michael Runyan and Christopher Rurner. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 181 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Edgar Reginaldo, Andy Roman, Kristina Romanchuk, Brittany Romano, Roman Romano, Vincent Romanos, Jacob Romero, Jaime Romero, Matthew Romero, Nadine Romero, Nicholas Romero, Richard Romero, Steven Romero, Sean Romich, Wendy Ronberg, Mia Rondone, Gage Rorhstein, Emilio Rosadillo, Albert Rosales, Reginaldo Rosario, Juan Rosas, Robert Rosbaugh, Ana Rose, Michael Rose and Brittany Rosenberg. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 180 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Griffin Roessler, Fondell Rogers, Kathryn Rogers, Lafresha Rogers, Nikolas Rogers, Roberta Rogers, Tyresha Rogers, William Rogers, Francisco Rojas, Juan Rojas, Juan Rojas, Trini Rojas and Adyn Romahn. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 179 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Hugo Rodriguez, Jacinto Rodriguez, Jessica Rodriguez, Jesus Rodriguez, Jim Rodriguez, Jose Rodriguez, Kenneth Rodriguez, Laura Rodriguez, Lisa Rodriguez, Macayla Rodriguez, Miguel Rodriguez, Natasha Rodriguez, Oscar Rodriguez, Peter Rodriguez, Priscilla Rodriguez, Rey Rodriguez, Shannon Rodriguez, Troy Rodriguez, Veronica Rodriguez, Vicky Rodriguez, Amber Rodriquez and Jorge Rodriquez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 178 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Brittany Rodriguez, Cesar Rodriguez, Chantelle Rodriguez, Eric Rodriguez, Eric Rodriguez, Erik Rodriguez, Evan Rodriguez, Eviney Rodriguez, Frank Rodriguez, Guadalupe Rodriguez and Gustavo Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 177 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Shequia Robertson, Erik Robillard, Kareem Robin, Cody Robinett, Brandon Robinson, Brandon Robinson, Damon Robinson, Donna Robinson, Kathryn Robinson, Latashia Robinson, Lateesha Robinson, Maya Robinson, Navell Robinson, Sheri Robinson, Tiffany Robinson, Tracey Robinson, Laura Robles, Zachary Roblyer, Jabar Robotham, Alex Rocha, Cynthia Roche, Eamon Roche, Ajay Rochester, Kimberly Rochette, Charlette Rodgers, Barbara Rodrigue, Ahiezer Rodriguez, Alejandro Rodriguez, Angel Rodriguez, Austin Rodriguez and Brianna Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 176 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Neville Robateau, Aaron Robbins, Aleena Robbins, Carlos Robbins, David Robbins, Bobbie Roberson, Michael Roberson, Bawana Roberts, Sarah Roberts, Ke'Ira Robertson and Sarah Robertson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 175 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Shabrea Riley, Trevor Riley, Vanessa Riley, Joyce Rincon, Steven Ring, Natalie Ringger, Daniel Rios, Jillian M Rios, Marissa Rios, Shanika Riser, Alberta Rivas, David Rivas, Jose Rivas, Kenneth Rivas, Sara Rivas, Alex Rivera, Alice Rivera, Alicia Rivera, Anthony Rivera, Carmen Rivera, Elijah Rivera, Lyzbeth Rivera, Manuel Rivera, Mireya Rivera, Roi Rivera and Carmen Rizo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 174 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Thomas Richards, Adrienne Richardson, Keith Richardson, Matthew Richardson, Travarr Richardson, Brandon Richardson Scott, Christopher Rickert, Nisa Ricks, Rex Ricks, Kimberly Ricks-Sponberg, Jose Rico, Loretta Riddle, Leon Ridgle, Jamie Rieger, Ezequiel Riesgo, David Riley, Lekischa Riley and Pamela Riley. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 173 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Angel Reyes, Carissa Reyes, Desiree Reyes, Jason Reyes, Lupe Reyes, Marcel Reyes, Mark Reyes, Michael Reyes, Shawnna Reyes, Tyler Reyes, Mg Reyes D, Jeison Reyesbobadilla, Davell Reynolds, Hope Reynolds, Courtney Rheams, Alexander Rhee, James Rhodes, Nicole Rhodes, Sirvaunte Rhodes, Markita Rhyne, John Ribera, Adrianna Riccio, Sky Rice, Candace Rich, John Richard, Terriayn Richard, Bishop Richards, Jordan Richards, Sarah Richards and Savonah Richards. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 172 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Stacie Refeld, Monique Regalado, Jane Regitz, Abdul Rehman, Jenni Reichert, Jaycee Reid, Kelly Reid, Taj Reid, Louis Reille, Silvia Reina Gutierrez, Rocky Relph, Sasha Rene, Adrian Renes, Angela Renison, Jacob Reno, Amy Renteria, Mallori Resendez, Gilbert Reveles, Kimberly Revilla, Michelle Revolorio and David Rey. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 171 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Yosira Reategui, Patricia Rebello, Tambra Recek, Gabrielle Recto, Amanda Redfern, Remington Redfern, Angelica Redman, Erica Redmon, Gregory Redmond, Jr, Ashlee Reed, Cynamin Reed, Howard Reed, Jessica Reed, Malcolm Reed, Ronisha Reed, Sharieff Reed, Tamara Reed, William Reed, Kieysha Reedom, Waddella Reese, Michael Reeves and Sherrill Reeves. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 170 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Ricardo Ramirez Bravo, Carlos Ramirez-Fabian, Jessica Ramirez-Jefferson, Johnathon Ramos, Jose Ramos, Joseph Ramos, Mario Ramos, Linda Ramsey, Michael Randle, David Randolph, Andy Rangel, Mark Rangel, Jonathan Rank, Robert Rank, Patrik Rara Eun, Rhonda Ravega, Patricia Rawlinson, Ashlee Ray, Chris Ray, Sean Ray, Mike Rayter, Derek Rea and Luis Rea. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 169 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Alan Ramirez, Alfredo Ramirez, Anita Ramirez, Brenda Ramirez, Brenda Ramirez, Carlos Ramirez, Carlos Ramirez, Christian Ramirez, Christina Ramirez, Erick Ramirez, Jessie Ramirez, Joel Ramirez, Johnny Ramirez, Jose Ramirez, Juan Ramirez, Leonardo Ramirez, Norma Ramirez, Rhiannon Ramirez, Shawn Ramirez and Silas Ramirez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 168 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Melissa Rafalowski, Shawn Raft, Sam Raheb, Khalid Rahim, Jeff Railey, Tabriz Raimey, Nicholas Rainwater, Jonathan Rambo, Michelle Rambo, Manuel Ramires and Adelina Ramirez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 167 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Ashley Pritchard, Vincent Pritchard, Brenda Proetel, Martin Prospere, Kendric Prudhomme, Aaron Pruett, Jalaysia Pryor, Prince Pryor, Kelvin Pugh, Krashawn Pugh, Skye Pugh, Erik Pulido, Tiondda Pullum, Timothy Purtell, Mohammad Rasool Qasim, Abdulwadood Qazi, Jesus Quair, Alexis Quijano, Herman Quillion, William Quincy, Manuel Quinn, Aurora Quinonez, Abraham Quintanilla, Rigoberto Quintanilla, Israel Quintas, Misael Quintero, Victoria Quisenberry, Melinda Rabb, Chelsea Rabe, Ryan Racanelli, Jonathan Rachal and Angela Rael. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 166 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Breanna Porchia, Ernesto Porras, Derek Porter, Dezmon Porter, Koral Porter, Nicole Porter, Mario Portilla, Anthony Portillo, David Portillo, Kevin Portillo, Jaime Posada, Mike Potashnik, Orlando Pote, Mia Potter, Krystle Powell, Tonisha Powell, Jennifer Powers, Christopher Prades, Hector Prado, Robert Prado, Siva Prasad, Ronico Pratt, Caitlyn Pratte, Luis Preciado, Orlando Preciado, Yoel Preda, Tyler Pressdee, Jacob Pressman, Christine Presto, Michele Prevost, Christin Price, Freddie Price, Tiffany Price, Tyisha Price, Ryan Prichard, Shaniessa Prichett, Denese Pride, Joshua Priebe, Alfonce Prince, Johnna Principato, Mike Principato and Allison Priole. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 165 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Eryn Polk, Sidney Polk, Larry Pollard, Becky Pollock, Alfredo Ponce, Vicente Ponce, Dustin Ponciano, Brian Poole, Kennedy Poole and Sundeep Pooni. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 164 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Curtis Pierce, Emily Pierce, Michael Pierce, Sue Pierre, Shannon Pierson, Bridgette Piggee, Mary Pilapil, Nicole Pilgrim, Sherine Pimenta, Jacquelynne Pina, Jesse Pineda, Maikol Pineda, Jesus Pinelo, Ronald Piner, Brenda Pinkevich, Nathan Pinkney, Marquisha Pinkston, Sidney Pinn, Roberto Pinon, Jerry Pinsoneault, Dalena Pinuelas, Kimberly Pipes, Simone Pirtle, Matthew Piston, James Pitillo, Hailee Pitsley, Allen Pitta, Jr, Jamilo Pitts, Amber Pluma, Monica Pluma, Jessica Plummer, Wesley Plunk, Anthony Poblete and Randall Pogue. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 163 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michael Petriccione, Angela Petro, Ariela Petruescu, Johnathon Petruescu, Jordan Pettitt, Gentris Pettway, Jamie Pettway, Corinne Phair, Hang Pham, Thomas Pham, Vi Pham, Brian Phan, Elliott Phares, Bill Phillips, David Phillips, Demetrius Phillips, Gerald Phillips, Jon Phillips, Kurtis Phillips, London Phillips, Stephen Phillips, Saengamphay Phommasane, Paula Phommounivong, Niccole Phylow, Jerrard Pichon, Joshua Pickering, Kimberly Picos, Joseph Piedilato and Christian Pieratt. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 162 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jonathan Perez, Jorge Perez, Joseph Perez, Joshua Perez, Jovanni Perez, Julia Perez, Katie Perez, Lupe Perez, Marina Perez, Michael Perez, Michael Perez, Oscar Perez, Sergio Perez, Stephanie Perez, Teresa Perez, Victoria Perez, Zachary Perez, Carina Perez-Mcdaniel, Johnnie Perie, Matthew Perkins, Mikiea Perkins, Terry Pernell, David Pernick, Anthony Perrault, Michael Perrin, Phillip Perrin, Martin Perry, Pattriana Perry, Shanice Perryman, Anthony Pesce, Tian Pescion, Silva Petani, Christopher Peters, Laterrius Peters, Promise Peters, Richard Petersen, Camesha Peterson and Lajuanma Peterson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 161 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Stephanie Payan, Brandon Payne, David Payne, Shauntisha Payne, Tiffany Payne, Renita Payno, Jose Paz, Julie Pearce, Janee Pearl, Kaitlin Pearson, Kendra Pearson, Stevan Pearson, Ethan Peck, Kai Pedersen, Melissa Pedersen, Tiffany Pedraza, Mafa Pedro, Leslie Peete, Joshua Peevyhouse, Kimberly Pegg, Faustino Pelayo, Jonathan Pena, Juan Pena, Valerie Pena, Simona Penrose, Alex Peraza, Patricia Pereida, Michael Pereira, Alejandro Perez, Brandon Perez, Daniel Perez and Diego Perez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 160 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Ian Parise, Victor Park, Alexis Parker, Shane Parker, Shawn Parker, Theresa Parker, Jacqueline Paroyan, Brandon Parrott, Rana Partoe, Karentessie Pasion, Ziporah Paskman, Nicholas Passell, Jennifer Patchin, Jayden Patel, John Patrick, Ariana Patterson, Darla Patterson, Derrick Patterson, Kiara Patterson, Matthew Patterson, Michael Patterson, Passion Patterson, Robert Patterson, Samantha Patton, Christian Paul, Cory Paul, Eric Paul, Kala Pauley and Chris Pavao. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 159 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Fernando Palacios, Moises Palacios, Daniel Palenchar, Wynter Palmer, Michael Palomba, Sherice Pamilton, Thomas Pangelinan, Dominic Paniccia, Donald Pannell, Kwasi Papafio, George Pappas, Antonio Pardo, Albert Parga and Devon Parhms. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 158 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Nicholas Osborne, Lanely Osorio, Brian Osterhout, Erin Osterlind, Majjilee Osuagwu, Daniel Otey, Felipe Ovalle, Raemen Owens, Sheilacy Owens, Kojo Owusu-Manu, Antonio Oyarzabal, Jalen Pace, Jesus Pachecano, Wojciech Paciorek, Alyssa Padgett, Michael Padgett, Armando Padilla, Charlene Padilla, Joshua Padilla, Tanya Padilla, Alanah Padilla-Harris, Angela Padron-Campos, Andrew Pagani, Ashley Page, Demariee Page, Niema Page, Tamara Paige and Christine Palacios. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 157 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Namat Oriakhil, Danielle Orlando, Bryan Oropeza, Danny Orosco, Jessarela Orozco, Julian Orozco, Moises Orozco, Adam Orsatti, Anthony Ortega, Charisse Ortega, Desmond Ortega, Joel Ortega, Taren Ortega, Tony Ortega, Valentino Ortega, Jonathan Ortega Miranda, Sheena Ortez, Christina Ortiz, Daisy Ortiz, Leonard Ortiz and Roberta Osako. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 156 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Brigitte Olguin, Eugenio Olguin, Dalesha Olison, Dijonee Oliva, Javon Olivas, Minerva Olivas, Mareia Oliveira, Brian Oliver, Felicia Oliver, Kira Oliver, Mikal Oliver, Randy Oliver, Cecelia Olmos, Michael Oltz, Debbie Oluokun, Angel Omara, Zain Omran, Christine Oneal, Spain Oneal, Erin Oneil, Chadwell O'Neill, Dustin Orabona, Marco Ordoez and George Orellana. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 155 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jameelah Norris, Ronnisha Norris, Zenobia Norris, Anthony North, Miles Norton, Lewis Nowosad, Elie Nseir, Lynn Nuebel, Diego Nunez, Remedios Nunez, Sergio Nunez, Kathy Nunley, Michael Nusbaum, Matt ONeill, Scott Obremski, Darren Obrien, Lee Obrien, Yaritza Ocampo, Andrew Ochoa, Jennifer Ochoa, Katherine Ochoa, Mahmoud Odeh, Keith Odett, Dareatha Odom, Ozioma Ogele, Elizabeth Oglesby, Amber Ojan, Daniel Ojeda, Juan Ojeda, Jr, Boris Okhman and Leo Okhman. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 154 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Vinh Nguyen, Samantha Nicholas, Craig Nickerberry, Christopher Niehaus, Gabriel Nieto, Christian Nieves, Raul Nieves, Anthony Nino, Azejaon Nixon, George Njoroge, Danielle Noah, Noah Noblado, James Noble, Zoe Noelle, Taeyong Noh, Heidi Nolan, John Nolan, Jeffrey Noon, Michael Noon, Jason Norcross, Ricard Nordeng, Joleen Nordstrom, Per Norgo, Jose Noriega, Tiffany Noriega, Latoya Norman and Nickolas Norman. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 153 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jason Newton, Andy Nguyen, Anh Nguyen, Ashley Nguyen, Deborah Nguyen, Hoa Nguyen, Kevin Nguyen, Micaela Nguyen, Phi Nguyen, Quan Nguyen, Sidney Nguyen and Tony Nguyen. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 152 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Axel Navarro, Christopher Navarro, Genesis Navarro, Lourdes Navarro, Derrick Neal, Jabahri Neal, James Neal, Karyn Neal, Lindsay Neal, Philip Neal, Corina Needham, Nick Negoescu-Sanchez, Fernando Henrique Negri, Christopher Neil, Dora Neill, Nicole Neisler, Lanissa Nelson, Leland Nelson, Ronald Nelson, Marie Nelson Gamble, Sandra Nemore, Michael Nepomuceno, Edward Nerey, Tavarus Nesbitt, Georges Nesim, Mary Neves, Marie Nevins, Tiffany Newby, Matthew Newman, Tareema Newsone and Charmaine Newton. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 151 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Latasha Murray, Latoya Murray, Michael Murray, Kiesha Murry, Alecia Myers, Tiffany Myers, Sam Nabard, Justin Nadal, Karen Nagel, Dashiel Nagy, Johnny Nakata, Michael Nalevanko, Bryan Nankee, Eric Nans, Chanthi Naophiankham, Galo Naranjo, III, Desiree Nason, Mohamed Nasreldin, Ashraf Nasser, Mokhtar Nasser, Prudencio Naungayan, Eddie Nava, Angelica Navar, Abraham Navarro, Abraham Navarro and Anastasia Navarro. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 150 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Ailyn Munoz, Desiree Munoz, Eduardo Munoz, Elizabeth Munoz, Jenna Munoz, Jessica Munoz, Jose Munoz, Juan Munoz, Joe Munoz Valdivia, Samuel Munoz, Maria Murillo, Michael Murillo, Vincent Murillo, Carole Murphy, Deon Murphy, Gregory Murphy, Kevin Murphy, Trevor Murphy, Joseph Murr and Joseph Murr. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 149 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Elias Moya, Melanie Moyotl, Isa Mubarak, Lisa Muela, Ansar Muhammad, Jermael Muhammad, Mary Mukes, Brennen Mulcahy, Kayla Munday, Jesus Munguia, Erica Muniz and Alan Munguia. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 148 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Johnny Moreno, Luis Moreno, Mary Moreno, Michael Moreno, Quentin Moreno, Amanda Morgan, Jacob Morgan, Nicole Morgan, Destiny Morlet, Cody Morley, Alletisha Morris, Chad Morrow, Tallal Moshrif, Dawna Mosley, Sharde Mosley, Douglas Moss, Jennifer Moss, Sabrina Moss, Javier Mota, Adalberto Mottu, Samnang Mou, Theresa Mounphoxay, Bryce Mouser and Marquize Mouton. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 147 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kendrick Moore, Chris Moore, Dakquari Moore, Hunter Moore, Jessany Moore, Jesse Moore, Micah Moore, Sierra Moore, Sylvannah Moore, Valerie Moore, Ashley Moorefield, Shiretha Moppin, Brian Morales, Daniel Morales, Glenda Morales, Jonathan Morales, Jose Morales, Melissa Morales, Melissa Morales, Michelle Morales, Renee Morales, Roni Morales, Stephanie Morales, David Moran, Mario Morataya, Audrie Moreno, Dennise Moreno, Elio Moreno, Erika Moreno, Frank Moreno, Gia Moreno, Israel Moreno, Jaime Moreno and Jeanette Moreno. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 146 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Maria Molony, Daisy Monae, Adam Monahan, Alberto Moncada, Angel Moncada, Lenny Mondragon, Jamie Moniz, Matthew Monroe, Nichelle Monroe, Bryan Montalvo, Miguel Montano, Edwin Montealegre, Jose Montes, Michelle Montes, Olivia Montes, Spencer Montes, Luke Montgomery, Mike Montgomery, Ben Montoya, Emmeli Montoya, Erica Montoya, Frank Montoya, Nataliya Montoya, Richard Montoya, Steve Monvoisin, Jennifer Monzon, Gordon Mooc and Kendrick Moon. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 145 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Latoya Misouria, Laquesha Mitchell, Malinda Mitchell, Markelle Mitchell, Ron Mitchell, Sharell Mitchell, Jonathan Mitchelson, Reynete Mixon, Robert Mizuhara, Sasun Mkrtumyan, Sandra Moad, Felisha Mock, Joseph Modica, Floydale Moffitt, Abdalla Mohamed, Khadija Mohamed, Ahmad Mohammad, Atal Mohammad, Gabriel Mohr, Daniel Molina, Jill Molina, Margaret Moline and Patrick Molnar. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 144 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Leah Miller, Lindsey Miller, Machella Miller, Marissa Miller, Nicole Marissa, Shawn Miller, James Milligan, Jennifer Milligan, Adrienne Millow, Erica Mills, Giles Mills, Kamisha Mills, Madonna Milton, Marvette Mims, Shameka Min, Angela Mineros, Bailey Mingo, Ricky Miniano, Daniel Minn, Michelle Minnifield, Kellie Minor, Jessica Minster, Taher Miqdady, Felipe Miranda, Shannon Mirsadjadi, Noah Mirski, Parsa Mirzaagha and Rosely Misailegalu. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 143 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Brandon Miller, Brett Miller, Corey Miller, Darryl Miller, David Miller, Elizabeth Miller, Heidi Miller, Jasmine Miller, Kenneth Miller, Korey Miller, Krystal Miller, Kyle Miller and Kyle Miller. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 142 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Mayra Mendoza, Peggy Mendoza, Monique Menendez, Liang Meng, Ihab Merabet, Danielle Mercado, Jorge Mercado, Patrick Mercado, Jerald Mergerson, Ryan Merlo, Stephanie Meroni, Brian Merrick, David Merrick, Kailey Mesquita, Mariel Meyer, Megan Meyer, Chey'Na Micciche, Peter Michel, Carl Mickens, Dawson Midgette, Cory Miinch, Hilario Mijares, Jacob Mileham, Brittney Miles, Ryan Miles, Nathan Millan, Wanda Millberry and Amanda Miller. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 141 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Latina Mcvay, Elizabeth Mcvicker, Omahr Mead, Bryan Medeiros, Akili Medina, Amanda Medina, Daniel Medina, Andrew Meechan, Connor Meehan, Jasmine Meighan, Andrew Meissner, Christopher Mejia, Eklyn Mejia, Miguel Mejia, Saophong Mekdara, Mikhail Melaku, Franklin Melendez, Jean Gabriel Melendez, Victor Melendez, Daniel Melendrez, Brooke Melhorn, Haykaz Melkonyan, Mark Mellingen, Tiffany Menard, Pedro Mendes, Adam Mendez, Paola Mendez, Duvan Mendoza, Eugene Mendoza, Ferdy Mendoza, Joovana Mendoza, Judith Mendoza, Luis Mendoza, Luis Mendoza and Luis Mendoza. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 140 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Heather Mcguire, Dwayne Mcintyre, Kyle Mckasty, Aaron Mckee, Ryan Mckenney, Rodney Mckenzie, Ladiamond Mckinley, Jodi Mckinney, Mercedes Mckinney, John Mckinnon, Mitchell Mckinnon, Tyrone Mcknight, Shane Mclaughlin, Anastasia Mclelland, Nathaniel Mcleroy, Richard Mcmichael, Sherrie Mcmihelk, Floyd Mcmillan, Jermal Mcmillian, Mila Mcneely, Christie Mcnew, Keeona Mcnutt, Kaitlin Mcquaid, Anita Mcreynolds, Timothy Mcrorey and Brian Mcspadden. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 139 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jeff Mcdowell, Kourtney Mceachin, Raymond Mcelroy, Ryan Mcgarrigle, James Mcgary, Douglas Mcgee, Lynda Mcgee, Raynisha Mcgee, Jennifer Mcgoldrick, Deja Mcgough, John Mcgowan, Justin Mcgrath and Jaclyn Mcguinness. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 138 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kyle Mccarty, Dana Mcchristion, Heather Mcclure, Jukayla Mccombs, Christopher Mcconnaughey, Aaron Mcconnell, Josef Mcconnell, Jacquelyn Mccool, David Mccorkle, Jonathan Mccormick, Randi Mccown, Daishs Mccoy, Lawrence Mccoy, Michael Mccracken, Michele Mccracken, Sean Mccrane, Jr, Robin Mccray, Jermaine Mccrossin, Nathan Mccuistion, Aubray Mccullough, Carnetha Mcdaniel, Charlotte Mcdaniels, Austin Mcdermot, Davon Mcdonald, Gabriel Mcdonald, Kyrie Mcdonald and Anna Mcdowell. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 137 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michael Matsumoto, Reginald Matthews, Claire Mattis, Brandy Maughs, Latasha Mauldin, David Mauri, John Maxey, Michael Maxwell, Miranda Maxwell, Adam May, Danny May, Robert May, Michael Maye, Christian Mayer, Tania Mayer, William Mayer, Erik Mayhew, Crystal Mayne, Lester Mayo, Sean Mayo, Amber Mays, Trusten Mays, Aleksandr Mazo, Elizabeth Mazur, Devon Elizabeth, Sean Mcallister, Mariah Mcbride, Latoya Mccaleb, Brielle Mccall, Kelley Mccallum, Jonathon Kelley and Michael Mccarten, II. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 136 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Thomas Mason, Thomas Mason, Teran Massengill, Stephanie Massey, Tanner Massoth, Ryan Master, Felicia Mastroluca, Darren Masuda, Gurmit Singh Masute, Andres Mata, Ignacio Mata, Michele Ignacio, Kate Mathews, Leonardo Matracchi and Bashar Matrix. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 135 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Joe Martinez, Jorge Martinez, Mark Martinez, Mayra Martinez, Michael Martinez, Natalie Martinez, Oscar Martinez, Paul Martinez, Pedro Martinez, Priscilla Martinez, Renee Martinez, Stephanie Martinez, Tristan Martinez, Yancy Martnez, Jonatan Javier Martinez Arroyo, Mercedes Martin-Hightower, Michael Martini, Angelique Martyn, Alex Martynovich, Julie Martz, Tommy Mascotti, Brandy Mason, Deanna Mason, Jenae Mason and Ronald Mason. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 134 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Lena Martin, Megan Martin, Tamicia Martin, Urfia Martin, Adriana Martinez, Adriana Martinez, Alejandra Martinez, Alfred Martinez, Amber Martinez, Brittany Martinez, Chad Martinez, Christopher Martinez, Christopher Martinez, Cuyler Martinez, Daina Martinez, Dave Martinez, Emmanuel Martinez, Ernesto Martinez, Gabriel Martinez and Jennifer Martinez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 133 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Bradley Marispini, Alexander Markel, Brittany Markham, Michael Markham, Sandra Markham, Janee Markland, Morgan Markowitz, Amber Marley, Andre Marley, Jennifer Marlow, Julius Marmolejo, Kathryn Maroney, Alexis Marquez, Brianna Marquez, Chelsea Marquez, Michael Marquez, Michael Marroquin, Matthew Marsh, Sean Marshall, Alana Martin, Anthony Martin, Cynthia Martin, Darnell Martin, Delillian Martin, Felipe Martin, Irene Martin, Kiefer Martin and Kristhine Martin. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 132 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Francis Manipol, Vahe Mankerian, Susan Mann, Patrick Mannella, Leah Manning, Amanda Manning-Gorremans, Innah Mansaray, Siune Mansoorian, John Mansour, Austin Mantanona, Jiana Mantilla, Katherine Manwill, Maria Manzano Segovia, Jim Manzo, Trung Mao, Ayanna Mapp, Alicia Marcel, Dajauna Marcella, Rebecca March, Alexis Marengo, Hector Mariano, Josephine Maric, Pedro Marijuan, Radine Marin, Keanu Marino and Selena Marion. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 131 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Daniel Maldonado, Samantha Maldonado, Suzanne Maldonado, Albert Malik, Roshan Maloney, Matthew Malto, Bryan Mama, Krystal Mama, Daniel Manahan, Jonathan Manalastas, Margarita Mancilla, Jessie Angelo Mandapat, Benjamin Manger and David Manikad. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 130 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Veronica Mabalot, George Macdufd, Gabriel Machain, Luis Macias, Ruben Macias, Daniel Maciel, Anthony Mack, Carmen Mack, Shyvonne Mack, Nicholas Mackay, Laquisha Mackey, Timothy Mackey, Clarinda Maclean, Drew Maconachy, Keira Maddas, Isabella Madrid, Kevin Maestas, Elizabeth Maffey, Courtney Maffitt, Servando Magadan, Amy Magallanez, Adrienne Magana, John Magana, Christina Mago, Joven Magos, Roshan Mahabali, Jeremy Mahabir, Christian Mai, Tyler Mai, Rebecca Maier, Joel Maisonet, Ryan Maker, Kevin Maksimenko, Christian Malaspina, Diana Malcolm and Andrew Maldonado. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 129 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Gregory Lucious, Stiina Luedtke, Marcos Luis, Jose Luis Vargas, Ryan Lujan, Julianne Luker, Adolfo Luna, Amanda Luna, Chris Luna, David Luna, Edgar Luna, Javier Luna, Leonardo Luna, Ruben Luna, Ruben Luna, Christopher Luna-Sparks, Jacky Luo, Ana Luque, Ernestine Lussow, Eric Lutin, Alex Luu, Antonio Luz, Darlene Ly, Kristin Lybarger, Armoni Lyles, Sharon Lyles, Johann Ma and Anthony Maalouf. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 128 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Shon Loya, Michael Loyd, Aileen Lua, Manuel Lucas Jr, June Lucero and Elias Lucio. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 127 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Noel Lopez, Pablo Lopez, Patricia Lopez, Reina Lopez, Ricardo Lopez, Silvia Lopez, Silvia Lopez, Stephanie Lopez, Venus Lopez, Veronica Lopez, Victoria Lopez, Xiomara Lopez, Yaritza Lopez, Yaury Lopez, Yuniel Lopez, Eduardo Lopez Jr, Elijah Lord, Steven Lord, Marilda Lorenzi, Jose Lorenzo, Stephen Lorito, Brandon Louis, Kimberly Louis, Jameila Louisville-Tatum, Javier Lovato, Latasha Love, Nicole Love, Joel Lovelady, Ilysah Love-Smith, Alex Lowder-Himmel, Bradley Lowe, Jason Lowe, Brian Lowks and Marcia Loya. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 126 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Cynthia Lopes, Tracielopes Lopes, Adam Lopez, Benjamin Lopez, Carlos Lopez, Christopher Lopez, David Lopez, Donnita Lopez, Elvira Lopez, Freddy Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Guadalupe Lopez, Hayden Lopez, Hipolito Lopez, Joey Lopez, Jose Lopez, Joseph Lopez, Karen Lopez, Lena Lopez, Leo Lopez, Lorenzo Lopez, Luz Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mayra Lopez and Nancy Lopez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 125 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Paige Logan, Terri Logan, Justin Lohorn, Daniel Lomas, Alfred Lombardelli, Jaime Lomeli, Johnathan Lomeli, Christina Lona, Adam London, Danny Long, Lasheinate Long, Leeonni Long, Mark Long, Tyler Long and Dalton Longley. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 124 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: James Lincoln, Daryl Lindayag, Brian Lindbergh, Mark Lindbergh, Luis Lindo, Joshua Lindstrom, David Lipe, Ross Lipschultz, Anna Lisech, Earl Littlejohn, Johnathan Littlewhirlwind, Iemaima Liu, Umanga Jessica Liyanage, Joann Lizarraga, Joe Liziaga, Janaiah Lloyd, Megan Lloyd, Macson Lo, Jared Lockett, Rommel Lockett, Dominique Lockhart, Royce Lockridge, Sheila Locks-Lee, Paul Loeb, Johnny Loera, William Loew, Jacquie Loewe and Karysa Lofgren. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 123 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jerrod Lesure, Alanna Leukuma, Buford Lewis, Jasmine Lewis, Jennifer Lewis, Kathryn Lewis, Latasha Lewis, Linda Lewis, Luke Lewis, Marquez Lewis, Matthew Ryan Lewis, Micah Lewis, Mone Lewis, Noah Lewis, Satira Lewis, Tiffany Lewis, Tyler Lewis, Stacy Lewison, Moriah Leyba, Alex Leyva, Cameron Lgutierrez, Christopher Li, Allan Liang, Jessica Libenson, Frank Licher, Jonah Lilly, Jane Lim, Charlene Limen, Erven Limon and Anthony Limpus. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 122 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Tassiana Lee, Tyreonica Lee, Yazzming Lee, Robert Lee-West, Monica Lefevre, Daniel Leflore, Joseph Legaspi, Eddy Leiva, Megan Leiva, Richard Leiva, Eugene Lelgant, Heather Lemaster, Mala Lemnah, Jerice Lemons, Karen Lemus, Brendan Lenhart, Rachel Leo, Jesus Leon, Rafael Leon, Staci Leonard, Triya Leong, Thomas Leopold, Alexander Leos, Francis Lerma and David Lester. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 121 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Enrique Laso, Iisha Latimore, Rodney Latin, Jacob Lau, Keven Lau, Aleksey Lavor, Khyber Law, Brittney Lawless, Iris Lawrence, Otani Lawrence, Vivian Lawrence, Sharawn Laws, Taishawn Laws, Diane Lawwill, Jennifer Lay, Jennelle Layne, Layones Layones, Alan Lazenby, Cavin Le, Nancy Le, Xuan Le, Chandler Le Francis, John Leach, Andres Leal, Ruby Leali, Marco Leano, Robert Leano, Robert Ledbetter, Angela Lee, Dong Jun Lee, Edward Lee, Edward Lee, Felix Lee, Marvin Lee and Matthew Lee. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 120 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Octavia Landix, Jade Landon, Dawn Lane, Walter Lang, Chantelle Lankford, Alex Lansaw, Joel Lanuza, Jason Laplante, Jason Laporte, Brittany Lara, Christina Lara, Joaquin Lara, Joshua Lara, Kendall Lara, Melissa Lara, Stephanie Lara, David Larkins, Jalaney Lars, Christopher Larson, Tayler Larson and Bassem Lasheen. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 119 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Siuchun Kung, Ferris Kurdi, Rama Kushendarsyah, Victor Kuzmenko, Alex La Forge, Bernardo Labansat, Hailey Labar, Skyler Labat, Ambrocha Lacey, Damien Lacy, Simone Lacy, Brandon Ladell, Jet Ladomade, Jenna Lafferty, Harmony Lafleur, Audrey Lagarde, Alex Lagrassa, Brandi Lahara, Tina Lajes, Tam Lam, Patrick Lamb, Travon Lamberson, Jodie Lambert, John Lambert, Diego Lamprea, Kayla Lampson, Renoir Land, Shunnika Land and James Landers. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 118 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Daniel Kogan, Hannah Kokos, Amanda Kolar, Carmel Kolbrener, Jason Komen, Aleksandr Kon, Nima Kormi, Idayana Kornelias, Susan Kosaka, Wilfried Kouadio, Ara Koulayan, Kimberly Kozak, Avo Kozukarayan, Yahor Kramko, Emily Kraudel, Dana Krieger, Dillon Krull, Tamara Krupchak, James Krygier, Julien Krzyzosiak, Leah Kuester, Joseph Kuhn, Leslie Kukuk and Eric Kamei. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 117 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sarah Kimbrough, Sarah Kimzey, Kimber Kinard, Daniel Kincaid, Jeff King, Tinierra King, Matthew King Ringo, Sherrell Kingsberry, John Kingsley, Sierra Kinney, Brianna Kirby, Josh Kirk, Irene Kirkman, Kathleen Kirkpatrick, Brendan Kirkpatrick-Mckee, Michael Kirkwood, Alex Kirya, Melissa Kishel, Scott Kissinger, Ratana Kith, Sarah Klapheck, Breanna Klein, Lauren Klein, David Kleitch, Anna Kleyman, Michael Kleymenov, Cynthia Klingelfuss, John Kloman, Sheila Kloth, Zachary Knoles, Joseph Ko, Nicholas Ko, Jason Koche, Julian Koehne and Jeffrey Koenig. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 116 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kaylee Khamphady, Maqsood Khan, Tariq Khan, Waseem Khan, Nho Waseem, Naseeb Khaznadar, John Khbeis, Chandan Khinda, Daryush Khodadadi-Mobarakeh, Shadi Khoury, Annahita Kianpour, Nykeya Kilby, Delores Kilgore, Linda Killingbeck, Arnold Kim, Daniel Kim, Daniel Kim, David Kim, Edwin Kim, Haera Kim, Kisung Kim, Michael Kim, Si Hyung Kim, Kyle Kimberling and Lakeisha Kimbrough. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 115 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Alicia Kaye, Pamela Kaylor, Cherie Kean, Myisha Kee, Jessica Keenan, Armin Keihani, Marian Keith Johnston, Jeff Keller, Evette Kelley, Taylor Kelly, David Kemp, Jordan Kemp, Lorelei Kempski, Deidra Kendrix, Christopher Kennedy, Xaviera Kennedy, Breana Kenney, Lewis Kent, Elizabeth Keough, Steven Kepple, Jonathan Kerry, Mher Kesheshian, Lauren Key, Marcus Keymel, Marwan Khalaf, Said Khalef and Mehran Khalili. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 114 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Denise Juarez, Michael Juarez, Alexander Julian, Verna Julian Reimonenq, Mark Juloya, Melinda Jurado, Kaylin Jurgenson, Caleb Juvera, Kia Kaeni, Hagob Kafkadjian, Arpan Kafle, Khyra Kahn, Lasty Kaikhoune, James Kamara, Brandon Kametani, Wyatt Kane, Ellen Kang, Erica Kanzler, Ryan Kaplan, Michael Karan, Sameerah Karim, Julia Karobkoff, Serkey Karoglanian, Joshua Karst, David Karzian, Loren Kasenberg, Justine Kasper, Peter Katalaris, Rafael Kato, Krista Katsirebas and Shilyn Kaufman. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 113 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Gabriella Jones, Jakalah Jones, James Jones, Jasmine Jones, Joel Jones, Joki Jones, Juneyana Jones, Kelsey Jones, Maurice Jones, Monisha Jones, Nekia Jones, Reunald Jones, Ronnisha Jones, Shannon Jones, Stephannie Jones, Tribecca Jones, Whitmond Jones, William Ryan Jones, Shannon Jones Kawiecki, Marguerite Jordan, Yeshua Jordan, Melissa Jose, Akillah Joseph, Joelle Joseph, Michael Joson and Troy Joyner. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 112 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byPostmates Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theane Evangelis, #2 Appendix of Exhibits A-J to T. Evangelis Declaration, #3 Declaration of Ashley Campbell, #4 Appendix of Exhibits A-B to A. Campbell Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Evangelis, Theane) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 111 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Terence Johnson, Tyler Johnson, William Johnson, Rhonda Johnson Pawnell, John Johnson Smith, Dashanae Johnson-Smith, Jahquache Johnson-Smith, Jasleen Johnson-Smith, Shauntea Johnson-Smith, Adam Jones, Aric Jones, Dara Jones, Debra Jones, Dustin Jones, Elessice Jones and Ellis Jones. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 110 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kashay Johnson, Kaya Johnson, Kyle Johnson, Lashona Johnson, Lillian Johnson, Lionel Johnson, Maude Johnson, Maurice Johnson, Michael Johnson, Michael Johnson, Nakkita Johnson, Patrick Johnson, Richard Johnson, Ruby Johnson, Ryan Johnson, Sherri Johnson, Tamal Johnson, Tanya Johnson and Tasha Johnson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 109 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jamie Jeter, Acacia Jett-Smith, Syed Muhammed Ali Jilani, Jesika Jimenez, Juan Jimenez, K Jimenez, Krystal Jimenez, Mariana Jimenez, Miguel Jimenez, Oscar Jimenez, Robert Jimenez, Roy Jimenez, Si Jimenez, III, Albert Jimnez, Brian Johannsen, Toni Johns, Tresire Johns, Aaron Johnson, Al- Nisa Johnson, Allix Johnson, Amanda Johnson, Anthony Johnson, Antonio Johnson, Ashley Johnson, Brandon Johnson, Cameron Johnson, Christa Johnson, Curtis Johnson, Dana Johnson, Deanna Johnson, Deshawn Johnson, Dyvon Johnson, Geoff Johnson, Gerald Johnson, Janary Johnson, Janice Johnson, Jefree Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Jennifer Johnson and John Johnson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 108 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Krysta Jacobson, Rory Jarvis, Domecia Jasper, Mani Javaherian, Robert Javinett, Eric Jefferson, Jnai Jefferson, Myles Jefferson, Aaron Jeffries, Jaquieria Jenkins, Michelle Jenkins, Amber Jennings and Willie Jennings. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 107 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Judge James, Kary James, Maria James, Nelson James, Nicholas James, Shelby James, Tanisha James, Michael Jameson, Jamshid Janbahan and Ronaldo Jaramillo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 106 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Danielle Jackson, Deajhane Jackson, Desiray Jackson, Donnell Jackson, Drickey Jackson, Elana Jackson, Eric Jackson, Gerard Jackson, Jahmilla Jackson, James Jackson, Jonathan Jackson, Justin Jackson, Krishna Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Lexus Jackson, Michelle Jackson, Micalia Jackson, Nicholas Jackson, Noah Jackson, Paris Jackson, Ronetta Jackson, Tamanika Jackson, Tiffany Jackson, Tracy Jackson, Ty Jackson, Ysrael Jackson, Andy Jacobo, Ebony Jacobs, Reighanna Jacobs, Krysta Reighanna, Rena Jacquez, Ebrahim Jadidizadeh, Joseph Jaehnig, Shayna Jai, Manuel Jaime, Salazar Jaime, Nason Jaimes, Brysha James, Derrick James and Joshua James. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 105 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Carlos Ibarra, Jorge Ibarria, Andres Icaza, Jimmy Idrees, Iyobosa Ighedosa, Isabel Ignacio, Obinna Ikerionwu, Constance Ilg, Henry Immel, Jessikah Ingley, Kristyn Ingram, Shannon Ingram, Zafar Iqbal, Tito Iraheta, Tresor Irumva, Sumoyyah Irving, Christine Isaman, Hanna Ishchenko, Louis Isman, Evgeny Ivanov, Jackie Ivey, Benjamin Jay Jabagat, Angela Jackson, Benjamin Jackson, Brandi Jackson, Colin Jackson and Crystal Jackson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 104 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Mark Huerta, Robert Huerta, Angelina Huertas, Jason Huff, Nathan John Huggay, Miltwon Hughes, Nicolas Huizar, Joshua Huml, John Humphrey, Carl Hunt, Erika Hunt, Kristen Hunt, Candace Hunter, Jeanette Hunter, Joseph Hunter, Krystal Hunter, Rashawnn Hunter, Squally Hunter, Totiannah Hunter, Orion Hurst, Oscar Hurtado, Yasmine Hussein, Michael Huston, Shaless Huston, Timothy Hutchens, Branden Hutchins, Ethan Hutchins, Jayme Hutchins, Manuela Hutchinson, Alexandria Hutner, Vinnie Huynh, Danny Hwang and Michelle Hylton. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 103 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Nicole Howard, Raymond Howard, Ted Howard, James Howell, Annita Howze, Ryan Hoy, Joseph Hsia, Jingkang Huang, Shi Hao Huang, Ivan Huaracha, Carmen Hubbard, Gabriel Hubbard, Corey Huber, Talia Hudgens, Jessica Hudnall and Chloe Huerta. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 102 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Deborah Holden-Grogan, Jose Holguin, Dawna Holland, Elvin Holland, Jessica Holland, Pierre Holland, Richard Holland, Aaron Hollandsworth, Collind Holliday, Kristina Hollingshead, Lisa Hollinquest, Latisha Holloway, Taylor Holloway, Wesley Holloway, Jayvonne Holman, Lorraine Holman, Jarecka Holmes, Michael Holmes, Bryawna Holmes-Ludwig, Andrew Holmgren-Willdover, India Holoman, Rick Holte, Meredith Homan, Konstantin Hook, Tony Hooker, Sarah Hoolihan, Heather Hooper, Meko Hootselle, Sahmaad Hopkins, Mckenzie Hopper, Tierra Hopper, Mohammad Hoque, Akiel Horn, Matthew Hornbuckle, Kevin Horne, Larissa Horvath, Roland Horvath, Willie Ej Hoskins, Amanda Howard, Chris Howard, David Howard and Joshua Howard. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Tashanna Hester, Louis Hew, Auther Hewitt, Ryan Hewitt, Jon-Michael Hice, James Hickey, Cb Hickman, Christopher Hicks, David Hicks, Davion Hicks, Rhonda Higdon, Aaron Hill, Christal Hill, Corelle Hill, Courtney Hill, Eugene Hill, Gary Hill, Stephanie Hill, Brittany Hillard, Keshawn Hillard, Brenna Hills-Wilson, Isamu Himura, Markedia Hinds, Jalen Hines, James Hinojos, Thanakon Hinphanthuket, Joshua Hinson, Lindsey Hitchens, Bryan Hiyas, Lanny Ho, Nikki Hoard, Lindsay Hobson, Kellin Hodge, Jason Hodges, Justin Hodges, Precious Hodges, Brian Hoffman, Jonathan Hoffman, Robert Hoffman, Samuel Hogan and Spencer Hohl. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 100 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jacob Hernandez, Jesus Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Jose Hernandez, Liesa Hernandez, Max Hernandez, Miriam Hernandez, Omar Hernandez, Oscar Hernandez, Ruben Hernandez, Samuel Hernandez, Samuel Hernandez, Sergio Hernandez, Uriel Hernandez, Veronica Hernandez, Yvonne Hernandez, Zena Hernandez, Astrid Hernndez, Nicolas Hernandez Neira, Judith Hernandez-Arechiga, Brittany Herndon, Elizabeth Herrera, Luis Herrera, Moises Herrera, Landon Herrin, Messiah Herron, Hunter Hertel, Tomaz Heru and Brittany Hervey. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 99 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Meaghan Hellmers, Sylvian Hemus, Brandi Henderson, Danielle Henderson, Everette Henderson, Nicole Henderson, Karen Hendrickson, Joshua Hendrix, Susana Heng, Tommy Henley, Allie Henry, Breeaunna Henry, Dallen Henry, Sallie Henry, Samantha Henry, Hancy F Henry Jr, Dravon Henson, Michael Henson, Yeng Her, Ryan Heras, Ehren Herguth, Alexis Hernandez, Anthony Hernandez, Cesar Hernandez, D Bruno Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Daniel Hernandez, Desirae Hernandez, Dominic Hernandez, Erick Hernandez, Erika Hernandez, Hector Hernandez, Hector Hernandez and Herbert Hernandez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sandra Hayhurst, Leticia Haynes, Shawn Haynes, Daniel Hea, Danielle Heaney, Chris Heang, Reginald Heard, Timothy Hearl, Carly Heath, Andrew Heavenridge, Justin Heberling, Christina Heckert, Leif Hedenskoog, Ashley Heil, Heather Hela and Jeffrey Helligar. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 97 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Cherie Harris, Christoper Harris, Corey Harris, Darryle Harris, Kiara Harris, Richard Harris, Sarah Harris, Shauna Harris, Shireen Harris, Stephany Harris, Tatiana Harris, Tenecia Harris, Trescia Harris, Ashley Harrison, Lisa Harrison, Matthew Harrison, Andrew Hart, Jasaun Hart, Kevin Hart, Jeff Hartman, Amanda Hartsuiker, Eric Harutnian, Andrew Harvey, Christa Harvey, Sara Harvey, Koki Hasegawa, Jonathan Hatanian, Frederick Hattley, Deane Haught, Joseph Haus, Jason Hawes, Jenna Hawes, Caitlin Hawkins, Francesca Hawkins, Adream Hayes, Javier Hayes, Kayla Hayes, Melissa Hayes, Nyreisha Hayes, Ralleda Hayes and Regina Hayes. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Darrell Hampton Jr, Sang Yoon Han, Thomas Handzlik, Melissa Haney, Stevan Hange, Charles Happi, Eric Hardy, Pete Hargraves, Jeffery Hargrew, Shawniece Hargrove, Joseph Harlin, Nathaniel Haroonian, William Harp, Alajah Harper, Alexis Harper, Christopher Harper, Collier Harper, Jennifer Harper, Justin Harper, Laquiche Harrell, Aden Harris, Andrew Harris and April Harris. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 95 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Yvonne Hale, Maggie Hales, Shawn Halfacre, Cassy Halford, Mario Halim, Angelica Hall, Anita Hall, Breanna Hall, Cynthia Hall, Haven Hall, Krystal Hall, Samuel Hall, Ahmad Samim Hamid, Yama Hamid, Dominic Hamilton, Marina Hamilton, Nadia Hammades, Brandon Hammel, Brittany Hammett, Tanya Hammond, Latoya Hammonds, Kevin Hampton and Shanae Hampton. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 94 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Rodyr Guimaraes, Yan Guimaraes, Yiquan Guo, Benjamin Guterry, Stephanie Guth, Sasha Guthmiller, Grant Guthrie, Alexander Gutierrez, Blanca Gutierrez, David Gutierrez, Edson Gutierrez, Evelin Gutierrez, Freddy Gutierrez, Giovanni Gutierrez, Michelle Gutierrez, Vincent Gutierrez, Christina Guttormson, Jennifer Guyse, Alisha Guzman, Bryan Guzman, Edgar Guzman, Sarah Guzman, Austin Ha, Josh Haar, Sam Haas, Laura Haase, Natasha Habash, Taha Hachim, Douglas Hachiya, Justin Hada, Rania Haddad, Zachary Haeberlein, Andrew Hafer, David Hahn, Hanibal Haile, Harry Hains, Ara Hakobyan and Hassan Halaoui. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 93 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michael Greffin, Madison Gregor, Gezille Gregorio, Jeremiah Gregorio, Johanna Gregory, Sean Gregory, Amandeep Grewal, Darnell Grey, Ron Grey, Steven Grey, Vanessa Griewing, Carolyn Griffin, Keith Griffin, Raydell Griffin, Viktoria Grigoryan, Denzel Grigsby, Alexander Grimaldi, Jasmine Grisby, Eli Gritz, Stephen Groff, Jared Grogan, Michelle Grossman, Yehoshua Grossman, Amanda Groth, Adam Gruber, Melanie Grunwald, John Guan, Iris Guardado, Shelia Gueringer, Brayan Guerra, Daniel Guerra, Margarita Guerra, Gerardo Guerrero, Jason Guerrero, Stacie Guess, April Guevara, Michael Guevara, Clayton Guild, Daniela Guillen and Michael Guillory. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 92 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Charles Goulet, Seena Gowa, Vanessa Gowett, Daysia Grace, Alfred Gracia, Marco Gracian, Jesse Graham, Marc Graham, Nick Graham, Leticia Granados, Baldimir Granillo, Devin Grant, Abijah Gray, Bobby Gray, Forrest Gray, Xaudia Gray, Quondrel Grays, Dante Green, Dommonique Green, Jheron Green, Tanisha Green, Jahmal Greene, Phillip Greene, Rasheedah Greene, Todd Greene, Valerie Greene, Angelo Greenwood, Destiny Greenwood and Kris Greer. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 91 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Aaron Gonzales, Albert Gonzalez, Andres Gonzalez, Andres Gonzalez, Audry Gonzalez, Carlos Gonzalez, Christian Gonzalez, Daniel Gonzalez, David Gonzalez, Dylan Gonzalez, Edgar Gonzalez, Efrain Gonzalez, Gerald Gonzalez, Hector Gonzalez, Javier Gonzalez, Juan Gonzalez, Laura Gonzalez, Luis Gonzalez, Maria Gonzalez, Radine Gonzalez, Rene Gonzalez, Samantha Gonzalez, Sonya Gonzalez, Stevie Gonzalez, Vanessa Gonzalez, Timothy Goode Jr, Annette Goodman, Dorian Goodman, Tiera Goodman, Colin Goodson, Carolyn Goodspeed, Noelle Gordon, Toriano Gordon, Bill Goswick, Kirsten Goudeau and Alex Gouge-Schajer. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 90 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Roy Samuel Golingan, Crystal Gomez, Fernando Gomez, Guadalupe Gomez, Karina Gomez, Kimberly Gomez, Luis Gomez, Mayra Gomez, Monica Gomez, Noah Gomez, Rudy Gomez, Victor Gomez, Yeimy Gomez, Jovany Gmez, Aaron Jovany, Consuelo Gonzales, Jeanine Gonzales, Jessica Gonzales, John Gonzales, Matthew Gonzales, Tanya Gonzales and Adiel Gonzalez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Mark Gittner, Lehua Gladden, Anton Glamb, Danny Glenn, Stacey Glover, Marcos Godinez, Gerardo Godoy, Jessica Godoy, Josh Goepel, Martin Goes, Brian Goett, Luciano Goff, Ezra Gold, Jakub Goldas, Brian Goldfield, Celina Goldsmith and Jenna Goldstein. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Vallemond German, Cherelle Gerrald, Devon Gertner, Kristin Gesualdo, Leo Gettleson, Devin Getty, Gayane Gevorkyan, Mohammad Ghanem, Ali Ghasemi, Andrea Giamanco, Darlene Gianni, Becky Gibson, Kenneth Gibson, Jason Gilbert, Amir Gilic, Gregory Gill, Kevecia Gill, Leah Gillen, Ernest Gillett, Leah Gillette, David Gilliam, Aisha Gilmore, Joseph Gilmore, Melinda Gilmore, Sharron Gilmore, Tayron Giovani, Jasmin Gipolan, Louis Gipson, Damien Girdler and Miani Giron. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 87 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kristina Garza, Natanael Garza, Regina Gartrell, Regina Garza, Maribel Gasca, Crystal Gaskill, Joseph Gaskins, Karen Gasparian, Tamu Gasper, Abdul Gassama, Mabel Gastelum, Nickolas Gates, Scott Gates, Will Gates, Lulu Gatica, Jaime Gaucin, Jessica Gauthreaux, Sandra Gaviria, Youssif Gayed, Jda Gayle, Kari Gaylord, Fitsum Gebremichael, Caleb Gebrewold, Timothy Geirk, Elilita Geletu, Stuart Gelin, Samuel Gemette, Ashley Genther, Justin Gentile, Alex George, Darren Gephart and Artur Gerbel. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 86 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Stephanie Garcia, Tina Garcia, Victor Garcia, Walter Garcia, Yesenia Garcia, Kevin Garciamendez, Desmond Gardner, Maysea Gardner, Jorge Garibay, Ronit Hillary Garjy, Samir Garnaj, Roberto Garner, Brian Garrett, Cassie Garrett, Tyler Garrett and Zachery Gartman. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 85 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Armando Garcia, Ashley Garcia, Daniel Garcia, Diana Garcia, Edgardo Garcia, Efren Garcia, Esther Garcia, Frankie Garcia, Gabriel Garcia, Gina Garcia, Issac Garcia, Jaclyn Garcia, Jessie Garcia, Jesus Garcia, Jonathan Garcia, Jose Garcia, Josefa Garcia, Josh Garcia, Joshua Garcia, Juliana Garcia, Liliana Garcia, Louis Garcia, Luis Garcia, Mark Garcia, Martha Garcia, Melody Garcia, Monica Garcia, Nicholas Garcia, Omar Garcia, Oscar Garcia, Paul Garcia, Raymond Garcia, Raymond Garcia, Rebecca Garcia and Sergio Garcia. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 84 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jhay Gambol, Jasmine Gamell, Austin Gansert, Nakeila Garamella, Alisa Garber, Alex Garcia, Alex Garcia and Ansony Garcia. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 83 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jason Gallegos, William Gallien, Troy Gallineau, Irma Gallo, Janeth Gallo, Shakira Galva, Matthew Galvan, Sara Galvez and Erron Gamble. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michele Fraser, Ahjahman Frazier, Alexander Frazier, Cherish Frazier, Natia Frazier, Michelle Freed, William Freeland, Ariana Freeman, Daniel Freeman, Elizabeth Freeman, Ketia Freeman, Gabrielle Freitas, Michael Freiwirth, Juliet Frew, Nicholas Frick, Brett Friedmann, Alec Frost, Sheryl Fry, Cynthia Frye, Jami Frye, Christina Fuchs, Brittany Fucili, Fern Fuentes, Victor Fuentes, Rachelle Fuentez, Samantha Fulcher, Fulladosa Fulladosa, Ashleigh Fuller, Johnathan Fuller, Decina Funches, Simone Fuqua-Redd, Kirby Furbeyre, Carlos Gabriel, Amanda Gaeta, Thomas Gaff, Lisa Gailey, Iyana Gaines, Michael Gaither, Antonio Galarza, Mary Ann Galiendes, Mathew Galindo, Patricia Galindo, Robert Gallagher, Sean Michael Gallagher and Tristan Gallardo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Vikki Fowble, Amber Fowler, Brittaney Fox, Robin Fox, Timothy Fox, Yan Fox, Darnell Fraley, Ashley Frame, Erick Franca, Brenden Francis-Winchester, Aja Franco, Cassandra Franco, Michael Franco, Sarah Franco, Theodoro Franco, Virliana Franco, Madison Frankhouser, Branden Franklin, Dewayne Franklin, Katrina Franklin, Zayjon Franklin, Brittanie Franklin, Elise Franks and John Franks. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 80 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Queen Ford, Renee Ford, Travis Ford, Candice Fordham, Star Foreman, Tasha Foreman, Jeffrey Forney, Michael Forte, Yvonne Forte-Holmes, Michael Fortenberry, Eder Fortis, Salvacion Fortuna, William Foss Jr, Corwin Foster, Lanette Foster, Mike Foster and Vernisha Foster. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 79 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Cicely Fleming, David Flinders, Ken Flinn, Clifford Flippo, Russell Flisk, Susano Florentino, Arnulfo Flores, Carlos Flores, Donte Flores, Edgar Flores, Gina Flores, Jennifer Flores, Jessie Flores, Joseph Flores, Michael Flores, Pablo Flores, Randy Flores, Shawn Flores, Kyla Flowers, Malaysia Flowers, Chris Fluke, Jeremy Fodor, Christopher Fonseca, Dallas Fonseca, Gail Fontelera, Angel Ford and Krystal Ford. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 78 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Francisco Ferreira, Jason Ferrell, Jeremy Ferrick, Leopoldo Fielding, Bryan Fields, Darryl Fields, Devonte Fields, Lamont Fields, Tomica Fields, Brandon Fierro, Alexander Fierro-Clarke, Liliana Figueroa, Manuel Figueroa, Rachel Filbeck, Brendan Filice, Rona Fillmore, Rain Fingerhut, Lafacesus Finley, Darquis Fisher, Jessica Fisher, Tawana Fisher, Doretha Fisher-Gentile, Elliott Fitzgerald, Crystal Flaherty, Marcey Flahiff and Casey Flammond. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 77 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Robert Farisyan, Lisa Farr Jagodzinski, Paige Farris, Ben Farrokhi, Dymond Farrow, Seth Faryniarz, Paul Fauntleroy, Nicole Faustino, Saul Fausto, Nicholas Fazekas, Jul Feather, Nicholas Fedail, Lucas Fehring, Kyle Felder, Tyaira Felder, Kevin Feleo, Rhonda Felix, Skyler Felix, Jessica Felo, Nicole Feltus-Vanderpool, Jacob Ferderer, David Ferguson, Kelly Ferguson, Teresa Ferguson, Chelyssa Fernandes, Brian Fernandez, Dexter Fernandez, Raelyn Fernandez, Leoni Fernando, Shane Fernbaugh and Lisa Ferns. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Robert Estefani, Cesar Estela, Dorreyn Ester, Alan Estrada, Sasha Ethridge, Jazmyne Eure, Alfonso Evans, Alithia Evans, Cory Evans, Fatima Evans, Jessica Evans, Kareem Evans, Olesha Evans, Rebecca Evans, Tyson Evans, Valerie Evans, Jamila Evora, Jakobi Ewart, Travis Eyk, Stacey Fagan, Kariem Fahmy, Kenneth Fairley, Cynthia Fait, Tashemia Fambro, Maged Fanous, Edmund Fanthorpe, James Farag, Christina Faragalla, Angelita Farias, Cynthia Farias and Jessie Farias. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 75 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Dan Ellsworth, Jonathan Ellsworth, Dylan Elnajjar, Ahmed Elsharkawy, Victor Eltanal, Dominique Emanuel, Iesha Emanuel, Annika Embry, Cassandra Emery, Marcus Emery, Nicholas Emina, Jake Endres, Michelle Engebretson, Omar English, Duane Ennis, Kathleen Erdmann, Justin Erickson, Antwon Erving, Roderick Erwin, William Erwin, Matthew Escalante, Martha Escalera, Vickee Escalera, Sharlyn Escamilla, Stacy Escamilla, Robert Escobar, David Escobedo, Albert Espalin, Claudia Espinoza, Diana Espinoza, Gary Espinoza, Leonardo Espinoza, Rachel Espiritu, James Esqueda, Brianna Esquivel, William Essex and Justin Estavillo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 74 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Frawn Earl, Lesly Earnest, Michelle Easley, Taylor Easley, Angela Eason, Jason Eason, Jacqueline Eaton, Rosalyn Eaton, Brandon Eberhardt, Cory Echevarria, Chanda Eckert, Jonathan Eckmann, Vincent Eclavea Jr., Allen Edgerson, Cassandra Edilloran, Simone Edley, Jason Edmond, Austin Edmondson, Clint Edwards, Elvin Edwards, Jared Edwards, Matthew Edwards, Nila Edwards, Rodney Edwards, Megan Eejima, Kevin Eghbali, Jennifer Egley, Emmanuel Egwuonwu, Morde Ehrenfeld, Trevor Eichler, Danny Eissa, Jahngeer Ejaz, Mohamed Elhosainy, Demetrius Elias, Joseph Elias, Brittany Elliott, Matthew Ellis, Rynette Ellis, Geneva Ellison and Meika Ellison. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jose Duran, Nicholas Duran, Kendal Durham, Victor D'Vita, Rochelle Dye and Ebony Earl. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 72 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Tyler Dornbos, Constance Dorough, Demetria Doss, Kenneth Douglas, Sabrina Douglass-Salmons, Jamesse Dowell, John Doyle, Ayla Dozier, Heather Drain, Angela Drake, Elicia Drayton, Jude Drechsler, Matthew Dreuth, Christiaan Drew, Ian Drew, Mitchell Dreyer, Adam Driggers, Krystle Dubose, Ateliah Duburg, Julian Ducatenzeiler, Christina Duchemin, Eve Duchene, Simerya Ducksworth, Frank Ducreux, Bonnie Dudley, Bentley Duke, Nicholas Dukovan, Joshua Duncan, Nicholas Duncan, Wilda Duncan, Banika Duncan-Claybon, Jeri Dunford, Catherine Dunkins, Tessa Dunlap, Leticia Dunn, Dominique Dunning, Opal Dunton, Bryan Duong, Alexander Duran and Francisco Duran. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Dominic Dickinson, Russell Dickinson, Christopher Diego, Katie Dieterly, Janita Diggins, Gerald Diggs, Richard Dillman, Felicia Dillon, Sarah Dillow, Dustin Diodato, Richard Dion, Destiny Dismuke, Alex Distefano, Sidney Dixon, Jeremy Dmytryshyn, Yen Do, Jason Doan, Chrystine Dodd, Ebony Dodson, Pierre Dogbo, Stephanie Dolenga, Tania Domingue, Jennifer Dominguez, Richard Don, Tanner Donahue, Elia Donaldso, Scott Donko, Joe Donnelly, Matthew Donovan, Matthew Donovan, Belynda Dorado, Fabian Dorantes, Destiny Dorham and Samuel Dormitorio. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jasmine Dennis, Vernaya Dennis, George Denny, Daniel Dent, Kyneitria Deramus, Cedrikk Derico, Kanaan Dern, Raj Desai, Belinda Deslouches, Nicholas Detone, Joseph Devine, John Devlin, Abisha Devonish, Jazmine Dew, Amanda Dewitty, Tierney Dezarn, James Di Giacomo, Abdoul Jaila Diallo, Karim Diao, Alejandro Diaz, Angel Diaz, Cedric Diaz, Edgar Diaz, Edgar Diaz, Gilbert Diaz, Jasmine Diaz, Marylou Diaz, Ruben Diaz, Christian Diazleal, Elizabeth Diazleal, Ashley Dickelman, Marvin Dickerson and Raiven Dickerson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 69 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jesus Delgado, Jesus Delgado, Jose Delgado, Steve Delo, Cheyenne Delph, Kristine Delrosario, Jesus Delucio, Amanda Demaray, Joanna Demarco, Gabriel Demetro, Chris Demille, Diana Demming, Chauncey Denham, Ricky Denney, Asia Dennis and Collin Dennis. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Allen Day, Austen Day, Jamaury Day, Mark Williamson Dayrit, Yvette De Alba, Aubrey De Brocky, Manuel De Gonzalo, Justine De La Cruz, Maricela De La Cruz, Leilani De La Pena, Marlon De La Torre, Janean De Lena, Melissa De Leon, Michael De Leon, Rudy De Leon, Richard De Los Reyes, Matthew Dean, Stacy Deanelder, Travis Deangelis, Andrew Deans, Farid Debit, Mohammed Debit, Karalyn Deboer, Steicyrlens Decarde, Keyasha Decoud, Lendel Deguia, Jill Dehart, Lindsey Deily, Brianna Deisler-Hicks, Nicholas Dejesus, James Carter Del Rosario, Gilberto Del Toro, Anthony Del Valle, Joacquin Delacruz, Monica Delaney, Steven-Paul Delara, Diana Deleon, Amy Delgado, Felix Delgado, Hector Delgado and Ian Delgado. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 67 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Danthony David, Kim David, David Davila, George Davila, Jose Davila, Adam Davis, Casey Davis, Charrice Davis, Darnell Davis, Geoffery Davis, Jakob Davis, Jennifer Davis, Jesseka Davis, Lamicka Davis, Lashelle Davis, Nichole Davis, Nicole Davis, Rico Davis, Ruth Davis, Ryan Davis, Tashina Davis, Temekisa Davis, Tremayne Davis, Waset Davis, Johnathan Davis Ii, Nevada Davoode, Chris Dawkins and Chanee Dawson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 66 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Elizabeth Curry, Stephanie Curtis, Tara Curtis, Hunter Cutting, Shikara Daan, Tamara Dadivas, Oren Dagan, Danny Dagher, Alessio Dalterio, Sherry Dalton, Marvin Dalumpines, Jessica D'Amico, Dawn Damm, Eric Dandridge, Annam Dang, Tam Dang, Crystal Daniels, Lettie Daniels, Scott Daniels, Sharon Daniels, Nicole Dankins, Mario Danova, Darren Darby, Shane Darden, Jasmin Dardon, Dazhon Darien, Rebecca Darknell, Darby Darling, Dorrance Darling, Chris Darr, Isaiah Daste-Haynes, Aj Daugherty, Aundrea Dava and Kambiz Davarifard. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 65 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jonathan Cruz, Jordan Cruz, Kaitlyn Cruz, Sally Cruz, Samuel Cruz, Amber Cuahutle, Jensen Cubacha, Luis Cubias, Santiago Cuellar, Eduardo Cuevas, Michael Cuff, Ney Culqui, Brandi Cummings, Chad Cummins, Kevin Cummins, Aaron Cumpton, Aaron Cunningham, Danton Cunningham, Edward Cunningham, Lesli Cunningham, Sherrie Cunningham, Corey Cunningham-Foster, Dallas Cupp, Raymond Curiel, Blake Curl, Michael Curran, Angel Curry and Cheyenne Curry. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Travis Crawford, Dominique Crawley, Gideon Crawley, Heather Creamer, Brittany Crenshaw, Benjamin Crespo, John Criollo, Rosalyn Crisafi, Megan Crisp, Candace Crittle, Malaina Croft, Tricia Crongeyer, David Crosby, Danielle Cross, Desamona Crowder, Christopher Cruce-Montana, Wesley Crum, Mary Crutchfield, Brittney Cruz, Bruno Cruz, Christina Cruz, Ivan Cruz and Jesse Cruz. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Postmates Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 62 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Mark Costello, Coston Coston, Raymond Cota, Jazzmin Cotterell, Marcella Cotton, Chris Cottrell, Robyn Couch, Jessica Coughlin, Mardell Council, Desiray Cousin, Lashae Cousin, Allysia Covarrubias, Alexander Cowan, Ray Cowan, Vincent Cowart, Joseph Coyne, Louis Cozzolino, Diiymilea Crafton, Cylk Craig, Kristi Craig, Natalie Craig, April Craighead, Valencia Cranshaw, Ramon Cravin and Morrel Crawford. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 61 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Judilee Cordova, Lydia Cordova, Leah Corona, Lizette Corona, Y Coronado, Marcos Coronel, Daniel Corpuz, Diana Corrales, Ivan Corrales, Jenny Correa, Mark Cortes, Pedro Cortes, Annette Cortez, Damian Cortez, Destainy Cortez, Michael Cortez, Daniel Cortinez, Robin Costales and Claire Costanza. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 60 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michael Conde, Amiee Conn, Alan Conrad, Elizabeth Consunji, Aaron Contreras, Emmanuel Contreras, Ilene Contreras, Antonio Contreras Jr, Elizabeth Conway, Malik Conway, Shawn Cook, Shayla Cook, Noah Cookson, Michelle Cooley, Christopher Coon, Jennifer Coontz, Alexander Cooper, Cerena Cooper, Sylvia Cooper, Joseph Coran, Anjelica Corbett, Annie Laine Cordell, Viengdavanh Cordero, Darling Cordon and Roger Cordon. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 59 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jeff Colburn, Anthony Cole, Jamar Cole, Kimberly Cole, Leslie Cole, Ryan Cole, Krystal Colegrove, Janea Coleman, Kimberly Coleman, Jason Coles, Dawn Collins, Jessica Collins, Jewelene Collins, Lakeisha Collins, Larry Collins, Rochelle Collins, Steve Collins, Erin Colocado, Celia Colon, Lindsey Colosey, Mackenzie Colt, Tony Colvin, Sandra Combee, Artesia Combs, Kelsey Comick, Monet Commer, Marvin Conant and Sergio Concha. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 58 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Fiona Cleary, Jessica Clements, Jennifer Clifton, Cheyenne Clipps, Candi Clovis, Loan Co, Cherish Coar, John Cobb-Adams, Monica Cobbins, Daniel Cobo, Benjamin Cochran, Philip Cockrell, Johnbosco Codio, Melissa Coe, Danny Coello, Blake Coffey, William Coffey, Jeremy Cofield, Karly Cogswell, Rebecca Cohenricioli and Michael Colbert. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 57 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Lucas Chung Hong, Gabriel Cilluffo, Ricteisha Citizen, Rineisha Citizen, Shaun Clagg, Omahar Clariday, Anna Clark, Brandon Clark, Geno Clark, Jamal Clark, Marina Clark, Michael Clark, Michael Clark, Rebecca Clark, Robert Clark, Tiffany Clark, Cameron Clark Chambliss, Dquan Clarke, Steve Clarke, Matilde Claros, Gian Claudio and Lexa Clay. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 56 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jeremy Chapman, Hugh Charles, Ahmad Chatman, Jasmine Chatman, Consafos Chavarin, Adonay Chavez, Arlene Chavez, Cesia Chavez, Chelsea Chavez, Jose Chavez, Sharon Chavez, Valerie Chavez, Jason Check, Elizabeth Cheeves, Chayar Cheikhmous, William Chen, Timoiya Chennault, Ryan Cheo, Jennifer Chester, Jonathan Chestnutt, Nok Cheung, Patrick Chiang, Darrell Childs, Lydia Childs, Chikezie Chima, Bahareh Chiniforoushan, Jermaine Chism, Krystal Chitty, Phillip Cho, Jan Choe, Kilwoung Choi, Tae Young Choi, Farhad Choksy, Jesse Chong, Mahwish Choudhry, Vann Chourng, Jorge Chrisman, Scott Christiansen, Isabellah Christo, Brittany Chu, Saiman Chu, Aminmorn Chuengmankong, Ikem Chukwudifu, Hurticine Chukwudire and Rose Chumacero. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Dennise Catto, Erick Catuira, April Caudillo, Tarcisio Cavalcante, Courtney Cavanagh, Marcos Cavazos, Randall Cavers, Jean Cayabyab, Frank Cazares, Guillermo Centella, Rebecca Cerda, Peter Cerep, Danae Cervantes, Jorge Cervantes, Stephanie Cervantez, Justin Cha, Brandon Chacon, Kimberly Chadwick, Somer Chambers, Andrew Chand, Jasmine Chandra, Sanjini Chandra, Kasey Chaney, Richard Chaney, Johnny Chang, Allen Channel and Daniel Chapman. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 54 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Judy Case, Brittani Casey, Kym Cashen, Alejandro Casillas, Rosa Casillas, Kara Caspillo-Collins, David Cassells, Joel Castaneda, Sallie Castaneda, Christian Castello, Jesse Castellon, Arthur Castillo, Jacqueline Castillo, Joshua Castillo, Manolo Castillo, Norma Castillo, Oscar Castillo, Rachel Castillo, Rhianna Castillo, Ricardo Castillo, Vincent Castillo, Faith Casto, Alex Castro, Gabriela Castro, Peter Castro, Jorge Catalan, Gregory Catania, Damon Catao, Kevin Catarella and Dewayne Cathey. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 53 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Josie Carrillo, Juan Carrillo, Mary Carrillo, Jasmine Carrion, Timothy Carrizales, Frank Carroll, Holly Carroll, Tommy Carson, Jennine Carston, Beverly Carter, Juanita Carter, Markashia Carter, Miachela Carter, Shaharazaad Carter, Tamika Carter, Chardenae Cartwright, Nicholas Caruso and J Caruthers. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Michelle Carolan, Cameron Carr, La Quesha Carr, Abraham Carranza, Brianna Carranza, Shannon Carranza, Shawn Carranza, Shauna Carreon, Angel Carrera, Hernan Carrera, Jennifer Carrera, Angel Carretino, Michael Carrieri, Anthony Carrillo and Jesse Carrillo. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Enrique Cano, Levina Cano, Oscar Cano Jr, Phillip Canta, Carlos Canton, Frank Cantoran, Anetra Cantrell, Kevin Cantu, Louis Cantwell, David Capablanca, Chris Capron, Greg Caramella, Brian Carbajal, Ricardo Carcamo, Lucas Cardena, Cindy Cardenas, Wilson Cardenas, Christopher Cardinelli, Caroline Cardona, Sandra Cardona, Rocio Cardoza, Veronica Cargill, Jonathan Carino, Ernest Carithers, Amanda Carlisle, Luis Carlos, Robert Carmona and Moises Caro. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Austin Cameron, Julia Cameron, Anthony Campbell, Becky Campbell, Earnie Campbell, Odari Campbell, Robert Campbell, Scott Campbell, Angela Campos, Denita Campos, Gabriel Campos, Jennifer Campos, John Campos, Jorge Campos, Jose Campos, Sandra Campos, Anthony Canady, Joshua Canady, Betsy Canal, Francesco Canas, Jessica Canche, Thomas Candia, Jc Cannegieter and Kierra Cannon. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: David Callaway, Laurie Callaway, Charles Calleja, Cardell Calloway, Eulonda Calloway, Annabel Camacho, Baltazar Camacho, Darcy Camacho, Holly Camacho, Marcos Camacho, Adan Camarena and Carina Camberos. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Christopher Bustamante, Jason Bustos, Kelesheun Butler, Renee Butler, Robert Butler, Shannon Butler, Jarrod Butt, Robyn Byes, Julian Byles, Beverly Bynum, Ryan Byrd, Andrew Byrum, Dalen Cabano, Jewel Cabigas, Brittnee Cable, Jose Cabra, Ronald Cabral, Saul Cabral, Danny Cabrera, Jasmine Caceres, Michael Cadena, Seville Cain, Chloe Caldasso-Smith, Anthony Calderon, Carlos Calderon, Michael Calderon, Nicole Calderon, Kaia Caldwell, Jeremy Caley, Erica Call, Mike Callahan, Issac Callahand and Karina Callahand. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Durrell Burdette, Marilyn Burge, Arrington Burghardt, Sharon Burian, Alex Burke, Patrice Burke, Joshua Burkhart-Carson, Shauntahja Burks, Kevin Burman, Frank Burmeister, Jordon Burnett, Jason Burney, Chris Burns, Louissin Burns, Roland Burns, Sasha Burns, Shaquita Burns, Aaron Burris, Darrel Burris, Preston Burris, Patricia Burrola, Keldren Burt, Lola Burt, Anthony Burton, Ryan Burton, Desirae Bush and Eric Bush. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Walter Bryant, Alyssa Buchanan, Sara Buchanan, Amanda Buck, Andrew Buenaventura, Janicarose Buensuceso, Adam Buhl, Mark Bullard, Quina Bullock, Gurgen Buniatyan, Tiffaney Bunn and Jeff Bunnell. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Marqueteta Brown, Michael Brown, Michelle Brown, Nisha Brown, Peter Brown, Quintina Brown, Robert Brown, Rose Brown, Shaina Brown, Shannon Brown, Shounta Brown, Sonja Brown, Sydney Brown, Tavia Brown, Henry Brown Iii, Alex Browne, Lisa Broyles, Benjamin Bruce, Garrett Bruce, Jenny Brugueras, Taylor Brumfield, Kendra Brumley, Lee Brundidge, Darius Bruner, Carlton Brunner, Athanassios Brunson, Nashawnda Bryan, William Bryan, Angel Bryant, Ebony Bryant, Kenneth Bryant and Odeirre Bryant. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jason Brown, Jemal Brown, Jon Brown, Joseph Brown, Kathleen Brown, Kenneth Brown, Kimberly Brown, Kristen Brown, La Tonya Brown, Lashone Brown, Latoya Brown, Lorreena Brown, Marcelles Brown, Marcus Brown and Mark Brown. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Carlos Brionez, Hector Briseno, Gerardo Brito, Travis Britton, Uriel Carlos Brizuela Martinez, Richard Brody, Sasha Broer, Robert Brooke, Bencia Brooks, Danielle Brooks, Jay Brooks, Joshua Brooks, Jeff Brose, Ashley Broussard, Alex Brown, Alytino Brown, Andre Brown, Anthony Brown, Brenae Brown, Chaka Brown, Deera Brown, Drew Brown, Ebony Brown, Gregory Brown, Heather Brown and Heather Brown. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: re Branch, Linda Brangwyn, Michael Brascom, Jodi Braund, Daniel Bravo, Vanessa Bravo, Jeffrey Brawley, Ashley Breaux, Courtney Brechemin, Scott Brennan, Theresa Brent, Brittney Brewer, Danielle Brewer, Rodney Brewer, Alton Brewster, Angelo Briceno, Dyrek Bridges, Melissa Bridges, Rayne Bridges, Greg Bridgewater, Breeanna Briggs, Anthony Bright, Deborah Bright, Dylan Brigode, Dawn Brim and Tanisha Brinkley. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Dariene Bolds, Machelle Bomenka, Ryan Bonds, Crystal Booher, Marie Booker, Felicia Boone, Debra Boos, Jodice Booth, Andrea Bortis, Derek Bourdess, Anderson Bouwens, Carla Bowen, Monika Bowers, Jawann Bowie, Nicole Bowls, Teena Bowman, Shontay Boxx, Alex Boyd, Catherine Boyd, Dmitri Boyd, Shiwishi Boyd, Trina Boyd, Tyshana Boyd, Alyna Boyer, Connor Boyer, Trevor Boyer, Amanda Boyett, David Boyle, Juan Bracamontes, Melanie Bracero, Qmariae Brackens, Daniel Bradford, Jamaal Bradix, Angela Bradley, Kelso Bradshaw, Lauren Brady and Thomas Brager. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Arjun Bista, Avishek Bista, Jacob Bjorseth, Chelsea Black, Monique Black, Nolan Blackman, Shavione Blackshear, Jason Blackshire, Ava Blackwell, Col Blackwell, Keiyana Blackwell, Nichole Blackwell, Demetrius Blair, Daron Blakely, Denise Blanchette, Deanna Blanco, Usa Blanco, Shauwn Bland, Latosha Blanks, Ashley Blannon, Dennis Bloodsaw, Tanya Blue, Jessica Blum, Ryan Blye, Catherine Bob, Elliot Bocchieri, Emile Bodnar, Paul Bodner, Nicholas Boesch, Jonathan Bogart, Jarrett Bohanna and Sadiq Bolden. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Brian Bertrand, Karter Bessey, Alyssa Best, Adrien Bestion De Camboulas, Karina Bettis, Cornelius Betts, Daniqua Betts, Brandon Beulick, Divyesh Bhakta, Krishnakumar Bhakta, Austin Bhardwaj, Jason Bibiano, Victoria Bichanich, Clifford Biddle, Markeisha Biggers, Brianca Biggom, Ivan Bigirimana, Felicia Billingslea, Joshua Bills, Alisha Bing, Geneva Binion, Derrick Birdsong, Brett Birmingham, Cody Bishop, Jocelyn Bishop and Michael Bishop. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Justin Bennett, Laurie Bennett, Lopez Benjamin, Marissa Bennett, Maya Benton, Richard Bentulan, Christie Berberian, Matthew Berg, Jeffrey Berganza, Anita Berger, Daniel Berilla, Leonid Berkovich, Angela Berlfein, Dessa Bernabe, Tieraney Bernard, Michael Bernardo, Alec Bernstein, Daniel Berry and Teresa Bertolini. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Hysaune Beemon, Matthieu Begay, Raymond Beginyan, Davit Beglaryan, Daoud Beituni, Lilia Bekker, Sheryl Bekstrom, Azure Belcarris, Daniel Belcher, Stephanie Belcher, Brianne Bell, Carlotta Bell, George Bell, Jameel Bell, James Bell, Kumiko Bell, Lauren Bell, Shamar Bell, Sylvia Bell, Toby Bell, Vaquientha Bell, Austin Belles, Jose Bello, Dorian Beltram, Abe Beltran, Felipe Beltran, Jocelyn Beltran, Kristen Beltran, Karina Beltran-Hernandez, Seifeddine Ben Frej, Jasson Bender, Tara Bender, Clayton Bendigkeit, Deidre Benedict, Harlee Bengford, Joshua Benitez and Leon Benitez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Reddish, Marquel) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Pedro Barrionuevo, Alina Barrios, Kelly Barron, Phillip Barron, Alyssa Barrows, Ashot Barseghyan, Anthony Bartley, Diego Bartolome, Chet Baskerville, Safal Basnet, Dantwan Bass, Otis Bassett, Brooke Bastiaans, Wiiliam Bastidas, Luis Basulto, Chante Bates, Kyle Bates, Maile Bates-Guerrero, Ariunsaikhan Batkhuyag, Brelan Bavis, Lee Baxter, Sepehr Bayani, Zachariah Bayne, Youssef Bayrem, Mariah Beadles, Alvin Beal, Tamarah Beales, Kayla Bean, Christa Beasley, Jonathan Beaucicaut, Jacob Beavers, Michael Becerril and Daniel Becker. (This is a text-only entry.) (Reddish, Marquel) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Cesar Barajas, Tejendra Baral, Archie Baranoff-Lesnovski, Elizabeth Barba, Marcos Barba, Demetrius Barbary, Michaela Barber, Savannah Barber, Tyjuan Barber, William Barbour, Donald Barjas, Evan Barker, Ryan Barksdale, Corey Barnes, Leanna Barnes, Mikeala Barnes, Myya Barnes, Brandi Barnett, Brandy Barnett, Cameron Barnett, Dominique Barnett, Kierre Barnett, Trini Baron, Jason Barr, Riley Barrad, Joshua Barragan, Karen Barragan, Anna Barraza, Eduardo Barraza, Jesse Barraza, Gabriel Barrera, Anne Barrett, Katherine Barrett, Steven Barretto, Joseph Barrile and Maverick Barrington. (This is a text-only entry.) (Reddish, Marquel) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Adrian Baltazar, Adeniyi Bamiro, Alana Banks, Annette Banks, Geana Banks, Victoria Banks, Alisa Banta and Tymon Bapp. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Erika Ayitiah, Ronne Renee Babcock, Corinne Bachaud, Karen Bachta, Nick Badii, Cheikh Badji, Lisa Baetz, George Baeza, Ichkhan Bagdassarian, Sevak Baghramyan, Lillian Bahribek, Alvin Bailey, Andrea Bailey, Anthony Bailey, Chris Bailey, Jasmine Bailey, Matthew Bailey, Arlena Bain, Christopher Baines, Gurprit Bains, Paulmichael Bair, Angela Baker, Bernie Baker, Dean Baker, Jacquon Baker, Patrick Baker, Rachel Baker, Sean Baker, Spenser Baker, Stephen Baker, Tamra Baker, Twaneisha Baker, Vicky Baker, William Baker, Nick Bakopoulos, Jan Balashov, Tony Balderas, Alexa Baldwin, Dominick Baldwin, Steven Baldwin, Elise Baldwin-Hilliard, Farrah Balitaan, Jordan Ball, Steve Ball and Mellissa Ballard. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Mahmoud Ateyeh, Roza Atikyan, Aliyah Atkinson, Christena Atkinson, Walid Atmar, Hameza Attia, Gregory Audiss, Tiffany Augustine, Rebecca Auguston, Jason Aula, Taylor Aune, Ashley Aust, James Austin, Rasheeta Austin, Sharekia Austin, Rommel Austria, Clyde Autin, Jennifer Averhoff, Jimia Avery, Alejandro Avila, Danny Avila, Jaqueline Avila, Stephanie Avila, Elisa Aviles, Michael Avilez, Jennifer Avina, Theo Awdng, Edwin Ayala, Kim Ayala, Melissa Ayala and Tina Ayala. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Elma Arizmendi, Soroush Arjomandi, James Arlow, Oscar Armendarez, Nestor Armenta, Ciji Armstead, Alyssa Armstrong, Jason Armstrong, Mitch Arnold, Shaun Arnold, Richardo Arnoux, Marty Arps, Alexis Arreguin, Angela Arrington, Josiah Arrington, Garsha Arristos, Guillermo Arroyo, Lisa Arroyo, Jesse Arteaga, Andrew Arthur, Ghazi Aryan, Yoniki Asa, Beckie Ash, Corey Ashburn, Adam Assad, Todd Aston, Dion Asuncion and Eric Atchison. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sarah Andrada, Antonio Andrade, Jose Andrade, Mary Andral, Lashan Andrews, Timothy Andrus, Shayanne Andujar, Noah Andujo, Defonzo Angeam, John Robert Angel, Nadine Anguiano, Andrea Ania, Christian Anozie-Onyemepu, Jack Apelbaum, James Apostol, Joshua Appiah, Jan Aquino, Justin Aquino, Miguel Aquino, Rehannon Aragon, Monique Aranda, Xavier Arangure, Nicole Arbucklr, Mariz Arcangel, James Arce, Vincent Archie, Danielle Archuleta, Kianna Archundia, Freddy Arcos, Brandon Arebalos, Jessica Arellano, Carolyna Arevalo Herrera, Breanna Argarin, Crystal Argueta, Jasmine Argueta, Pedro Argueta and Juan Ariza. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Lisa Alvarez, Valerie Alvarez, Fernando Alvim, Christina Alvis-Correa, Catrina Alviso, Nursultan Alzhanov, Amira Amaar, Anthony Ambartsoumian, Eric Amega, Nick Amer, Jessica Amezcua, Kunal Amin, David Amitai, Hillary Ammon, Felix Amora, Jassmine Amos, Natalia Ananyeva, Raquel Anaya, Jesus Andazola, Anthony Anderson, Bradley Anderson, Charita Anderson, Corey Anderson, David Anderson, Desiree Anderson, Gwendolyn Anderson, Jamori Anderson, Kayla Anderson, Latishe Anderson, Travis Anderson and Yamilb Anderson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Kendrix Allen, Khadija Allen, Lindsay Allen, Lydia Allen, Monique Allen, Montez Allen, Mychal Allen-Conway, Rachel Allison, Mazen Alloush, Yousef Almasri, Kevin Almendares, Elizabeth Almendarez, Erin Almengor, Eric Almero, Martin Almonaci, Erica Almond, Desmond Almonte, Nina Alonso, Stanislav Alpert, Hussein Alqwtari, John Alsop, Arthur Alvarado, Eduardo Alvarado, Eric Alvarado, Linda Alvarado, Gerald Alvarado Iii, Christian Alvarez, Efren Alvarez, Elyanna Alvarez, Jhoselin Alvarez, Jose Alvarez and Joseph Alvarez. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Joseph Alise, Mitchell Allan, Julia Allard, Anastasia Allen, Brittany Allen, Cameron Allen, Deandra Allen and Glen Allen. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Frank Alcazar, Gerardo Aldana, Merrill Alegado, Roman Alejandro, Saul Aleman, Angel Alexander, Delphina Alexander, Jennifer Alexander, Lavelle Alexander, Marla Alexander, Shakeil Alexander, Vontiesha Alexander, Ramon Alfaro, Raul Alfaro, Loai Alfarran, Jason Alfonso, Christie Alford Schaefer, Abdullah Ali and Md Wazed Ali. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Zubair Ahmad, Shahab Ahmadpanah, Ayaz Ahmed, Linda Aiello, Jennifer Ailey, Arnel Ainza, David Ajam, Andrea Akanmu, Traci Akens, Anthony Akers, Cameron Akers, Robyn Akers, Kian Akhiary, Adrian Alanis, Rodolfo Alarcon, Tonya Alarcon, Yesenia Alarcon-Villalta, Omar Alaya, John Alba, Ricardo Alba, Modesto Albano, Jonathan Alcabes, Jose Alcantara and Marcos Alcaraz. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Carlos Aguilar, Eric Aguilar, Fabio Aguilar, George Aguilar, Ingrid Aguilar, Luv Aguilar, Mayra Aguilar, Oscar Aguilar, Raul Aguilar, Eduardo Aguilera, Erica Aguilera Guzman, Christian Aguirre, Joshua Aguirre and Hafiz Ahmad. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Sekenna Adkins, Candace Adler, Shanice Adside, Christiann Adtkins, Aifala Afusia, Henry Agapito, Angela Agazaryan, Robert Agozino, Albert Agudo, Alejandro Aguilar and Antonio Aguilar. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Jose Adame, Christopher Adams, Christopher Adams, Japaul Adams, Maurice Adams, Sandy Adams, Jordan Adamson, Shannon Adcock and Mueez Adigun. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration, and have been added to this case: Anthony Abe, Ibtam Abedeen, Samuel Abels, Alexandria Abernathy, Derrick Abernathy, William Abernathy, Jordan Aberra, Melissa Abeyta, Hassib Abi Rafeh, Josie Abilez, Shante Abner, Tatiana Aboites, Najma Abubakar, Jorge Abreu, Samuel Aceituno, Esteban Acevedo, Martha Acevedo, Alejandro Acosta, Michael Acuna and Fernando Adame. (This is a text-only entry.) (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Marquel Reddish.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Travis Lenkner.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Keller.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 Renotice motion hearing re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (7/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland before Judge Saundra B. Armstrong) filed byAdriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/5/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 06/05/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Marquel Reddish. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13402520.) filed by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reddish, Marquel) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Travis Lenkner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13402479.) filed by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lenkner, Travis) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Ashley Keller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13402366.) filed by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 #Electronic filing error. All Petitioners listed in Exhibit A of the #1 Petition to Compel Arbitration must be listed on the face of the docket.To add additional parties use the following event: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Notice of Additional Parties. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams.. (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Postmates Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Tom Kayes in Support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byAdriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Ashley Keller in Support of #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byAdriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Jamal Adams. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Chambers before Judge ABC. Responses due by 6/17/2019. Replies due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adriana Aaron, Hector Abad, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott, Shafy Abdelazim, Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Christopher Adams, Postmates Inc. (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitration against Postmates Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13400234). Filed byBasem Jamal Abdelkhaleq, Hector Abad, Stephen Abdou, Tyrie Abdul-Hameen, Adriana Aaron, Shafy Abdelazim, Ralph Abbate, Charles Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Custis, Keith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Postmates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrie Abdul-Hameen
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hector Abad
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ralph Abbate
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamal Adams
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shafy Abdelazim
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Basem Jamal Abdelkhaleq
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Abdou
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adriana Aaron
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Abbott
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Usa Blanco
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Garibay
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janita Diggins
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jasmine Diaz
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Acuna
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd Greene
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aleksandr Umanskiy
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elliot Bocchieri
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Estella Taylor
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roi Rivera
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lavelle Alexander
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cuyler Martinez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josie Salazar
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Mack
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Arebalos
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garsha Arristos
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dave Martinez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isabella Madrid
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Esqueda
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melody Summers
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessarela Orozco
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cheree Winston
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Shank
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Clements
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Leflore
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick Erwin
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zoe Noelle
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Squally Hunter
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Tempchin
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darren Gephart
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trusten Mays
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carly Heath
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Brody
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Taeyong Noh
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Gouge-Schajer
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonatan Javier Martinez Arroyo
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Huerta
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Ybarra
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fitsum Gebremichael
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pauline Thomas
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanisha Green
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Smith
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Turner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Hernandez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Stoces
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eduardo Aguilera
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Audiss
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Hafer
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cameron Lgutierrez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armin Keihani
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roman Romano
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Kerry
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dajauna Marcella
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Hogan
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tashelle Tarver
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roger Cordon
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Annette Goodman
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dominick Baldwin
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lashae Cousin
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Espinoza
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessany Moore
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Petriccione
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ateliah Duburg
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tashanna Hester
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel Maisonet
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kunleg Tshering
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Collin Summers
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juliet Frew
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis D. Lenkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth Rodriguez
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darby Darling
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Phillips
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Herbert Hernandez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martha Escalera
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jemal Brown
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victoria Quisenberry
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Mejia
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dewayne Franklin
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milan Tett
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Annahita Kianpour
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Said Khalef
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alyna Boyer
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carmel Kolbrener
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michele Strom
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jon Phillips
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachary Haeberlein
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shilyn Kaufman
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicholas Sanders
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cory Paul
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan Mann
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jasmine Jones
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elizabeth Santiago
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyreonica Lee
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Flisk
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney Edwards
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Po Ung
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Silvia Reina Gutierrez
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Yen
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela Berlfein
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tina Stokes
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Groff
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sun Young Urasaki
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zohar Tito
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amanda Gaeta
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Temekisa Davis
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alexis Marquez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Jeffries
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Parsa Mirzaagha
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Josh Goepel
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joki Jones
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Koenig
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer Powers
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Tayun
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond Garcia
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Silvia Lopez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Luna
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Hoffman
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Briana Vick
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marina Villareal
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Arturo Torres
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kathleen Erdmann
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shane Wielinga
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Barksdale
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rachelle Fuentez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Carrieri
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Annika Embry
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Sandoval
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Austin Mantanona
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Lutin
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alejandro Avila
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theresa Mounphoxay
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Johnson
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vanessa Gowett
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachary Perez
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Miles
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ayaz Ahmed
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Savannah Barber
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Lopez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Krishnakumar Bhakta
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Delo
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex George
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diiymilea Crafton
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chandler Le Francis
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Prichard
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hosea Santos
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theodoro Franco
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheryl Fry
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesseka Davis
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shannon Rodriguez
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Debbie Oluokun
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esequiel Tapia
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landon Wilson
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Venus Lopez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Gonzalez
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ajay Rochester
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Khalid Shahin
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joel Ortega
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanya Blue
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Consafos Chavarin
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Krystle Dubose
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: June Lucero
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nick Graham
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cynthia Frye
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tanisha James
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rashida Singleton
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tiffany Wallace
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Travis Lenkner
Represented By: Marquel P Reddish
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Represented By: Keith Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]