Grizzle v. San Diego, County of et al
Plaintiff: Elliot Scott Grizzle
Defendant: San Diego, County of, William Gore, Smith, Kamoss, Love Lace, Goings, Brewer, Johns, Navarro, ., Fowler, Froisted, De La Torre, Gardner, Sims, Seely, Oliver, Hepler, Cole, McKemmy, Gallegas, Martinez, Bullock, ., Vargas,, Zepeda, Gonzalez, ., White, Ramos, De La Cruz, Huerta, M. Ellsworth, Bass, Olsen, Mendoza, Agnew, Cerda, Warren, Stratton, Epps, Mondragon, Barrios, Camalleri, J.D. Williams, Moon, Newlander, Davida, Price, Bravo, Leon, Rios and John Doe 1-25
Case Number: 3:2017cv00813
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Peter C. Lewis
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Allow Plaintiff's Attendance Virtually via Zoom or Telephone at Mandatory Settlement Conference (Doc. No. 169 ). The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application. Separately, the Court obser ves Plaintiff failed to provide advance notice of his instant filing to Chambers in violation of this Court's Civil Chambers Rules VI. Compliance with all applicable rules, including Chambers Rules, is mandatory. Future non-compliance may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/11/2022. (tcf)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 156 Joint Motion to Vacate or Continue Pretrial Deadlines; and (2) Fifth Amended Scheduling Order. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 4/6/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ruth Be rmudez Montenegro. The Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 8/12/2022. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 9/2/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/8/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/15/2022. (tcf)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Denying without Prejudice Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; and (2) Denying without Prejudice Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [Docs. 146 , 151 ]. The parties may reapply for a sealing order on or before 3/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/8/2022. (tcf)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER (1) Denying Defendants' Motion for Bifurcation, Expedited Evidentiary Hearing, and Entry of Judgment; and (2) Denying as Moot Defendants' Motion to Vacate or Continue the Pretrial Deadlines [Docs. No. 144 , 145 ]. The Court sua sponte grants Defendants fourteen (14) calendar days to file supplemental briefing, if any, should Defendants wish to address exhaustion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 1/10/2022. (tcf)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 137 Defendants' Motion to Compel further Responses to Written Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: (1) The MTC as to RFA Nos. 1-5 is DENIED AS MOOT; (2) The MTC as to Interrogatory Nos. 1-3, 5, 8, 11, 14 , 17, 20, and 23 is DENIED; (3) The MTC as to Interrogatory No. 4 and 6 is GRANTED; (4) The MTC as to Interrogatory Nos. 9, 12, 15, 18, 21, and 24 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff must supplement his responses no later than 8/24/2021; (5) The MTC as to RFP Nos. 1-48 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must serve amended responses no later than 8/24/2021; (6) Defendants' request for reasonable expenses incurred in bringing this MTC, comprising of attorney's fees in the amount of $1,442.10, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 8/10/2021. (tcf)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: (1) Granting 141 Joint Motion to Extend Discovery-Related Pretrial Deadlines; and (2) Fourth Amended Scheduling Order. The Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 4/6/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 4/14/2022. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 5/5/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/12/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 6/21/2021. (tcf)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Setting Briefing Scheduling Re: 137 Defendant's Motion to Compel further Responses to Written Discovery. Plaintiff is provided until April 28, 2021, to timely file a response to the Motion. Defendants are not required to file a reply. The Motion will be submitted on the papers. Unless otherwise requested by the parties or the Court, no formal argument will be heard and no personal appearances are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 4/19/2021. (tcf)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER: (1) Granting 134 Joint Motion for Continuance; and (2) Third Amended Scheduling Order. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 2/9/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. A Memoranda of Contentions of Fact an d Law is due by 2/25/2022. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 3/17/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/24/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 3/12/2021. (tcf)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: (1) Granting 130 Joint Motion for Continuance; and (2) Second Amended Scheduling Order. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 12/15/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. A Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 1/7/2022. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2022. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/3/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/18/2021. (tcf) (Main Document 131 replaced and NEF regenerated on 2/18/2021) (tcf). Modified to reflect correct fact discovery date on 2/18/2021 (tcf).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting 128 Defendants' Application to Take Remote Deposition of Plaintiff Elliot Scott Grizzle, an Incarcerated Person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/3/2021. (tcf)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: (1) Denying 124 Joint Motion to Continue as Moot; (2) Granting 125 Joint Motion to Continue; and (3) First Amended Scheduling Order. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 10/20/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 11/5/2021. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 12/9/2021. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/16/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 12/2/2020. (tcf)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: (1) Overruling Objections, (2) Adopting Report and Recommendation, and (3) Granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motion to dismiss and strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 111 , 116 , 117 , 118 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/17/2020. (jpp)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: (1) Overruling Objections, (2) Adopting Report and Recommendation, and (3) Granting in part and denying in part the moving Defendants' motion to dismiss. (ECf Nos. 93 , 97 , 99 , 100 ). Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/27/2019. (jpp)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 98 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Joinder Into Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Aaron Boorman Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2019. Replies due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 07/08/2019.(mme)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 93 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 4/7/2019. Replies due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 3/07/2019.(jpp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER (1) Adopting In Part and Rejecting in Part 74 Report and Recommendation; (2)Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/3/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of U.S. Magistrate Judge re Defendant County of San Diego's 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Objections to R&R are due by 5/4/2018. Replies are due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 4/20/2018.(mpl)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: (1) Adopting in Part 63 Report and Recommendation; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 55 Motion to Dismiss. The Court adopts in part the R&R, (ECF No. 63 ), grants Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF No. 55 ) , as to Defendants Brewer, Camalleri, Cole, Davida, M. Ellsworth, Epps, Froisted, Hepler, Huerta, Johns, LoveLace, LoveLace, McKemmy, Mondragon, Moon, Navarro, Newlander, Oliver, Olsen, Sims, Warren, and White without prejudice, and denies Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Sheriff Gore for Plaintiff's first and third claims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/3/2018. (mpl)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties on or before 11/27/2017. Any reply to the Objections shall be served and filed on or before 12/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 11/8/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal Shall to Effect Service. It is ordered that the Watch Commander of the SDCJ, or his designee is ordered to collect from prison trust account $ ;30.58 initial filing fee assessed, if those funds are available at the time this Order is executed, and to forward whatever balance remains of the full $350 owed in monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the prece ding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/31/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grizzle v. San Diego, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Scott Grizzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love Lace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navarro, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froisted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKemmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullock, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vargas,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camalleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?