UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. GOOGLE LLC
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF GEORGIA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, TERRITORY OF GUAM, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF VERMONT, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WYOMING and STATES OF ILLINOIS, CALIFORNIA, COLORADO, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, HAWAII, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW YORK, NORTH CAROLINA, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, AND WASHINGTON
Defendant: GOOGLE LLC
Petitioner: AMAZON.COM, INC., APPLE INC., DUCK DUCK GO, INC., T-MOBILE USA, INC., MICROSOFT CORPORATION, GROUPM WORLDWIDE LLC, ORACLE CORPORATION, SONOS, INC., AT&T INC., STATE OF WISCONSIN, CERENCE, INC, GEORGE LOEWENSTEIN, KLAUS M. SCHMIDT, PAUL HEIDHUES and AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE
Respondent: BOOKING HOLDINGS INC. and YELP INC.
Not Classified By Court: STATE OF MICHIGAN and STATE OF CALIFORNIA
3Rd Party Defendant: NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC, COMCAST CORPORATION and SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Interested Party: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Case Number: 1:2020cv03010
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 617 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on July 19, 2023; Page Numbers: 1-43. Date of Issuance: July 20, 2023. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2023.(wz)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 7/19/2023. Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2023. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 616 STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 615 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Dahlquist on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dahlquist, David)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Ryan on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Ryan, Thomas)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On June 28, 2023, the court ordered Google to produce for in camera review its proposed redactions to the Hold Memoranda. Order, ECF No. 608. Google has complied with the court's Order, and upon review, the court is satisfied with Google's proposed redactions, which received input from the court. Accordingly, Google shall produce to Plaintiffs the redacted versions of the Hold Memoranda approved by the court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/13/2023. (lcapm2)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Carla J. Baumel terminated. (Baumel, Carla)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER amending the [108-1] Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/11/2023. (lcapm2)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Joint MOTION for Order to Reset Dates Related to Resolving Confidentiality Disputes Prior to Trial by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrmann, Karl)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER setting the schedule for trial proceedings in this matter. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/30/2023. (lcapm2)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 609 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 28, 2023; Page Numbers: 1-41. Date of Issuance: June 29, 2023. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William P. Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2023.(wz)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' #591 #592 and Google's #593 Position Statements on Google's Litigation Hold. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/28/2023. (lcapm2)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 6/28/2023. Status Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 4:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. A further status conference and hearing re Third Party Testimony is set for the afternoon of 8/11/2023 via videoconference. The parties shall file their submissions by 8/9/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 607 SEALED MOTION filed by STATE OF COLORADO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff States' Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a status conference on June 28, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/26/2023. (lcapm2)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Memorandum in opposition to re #605 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 604 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #601 Sealed Document (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 603 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 602 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 601 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 600 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Reply in Support of their Supplemental Response to Certain Questions of the Court at Oral Argument to #589 Sealed Document by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sealed), #2 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Attorney Henry Cornillie terminated. (Cornillie, Henry)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 598 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Schleef on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schleef, Eric)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Jones on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jones, Matthew)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 596 NOTICE of Appearance by James Thomas Greene on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Greene, James)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerrie J. Freeborn on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Freeborn, Kerrie) (Main Document 595 replaced on 5/18/2023) (zed).
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 594 REDACTED DOCUMENT- RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF STATES SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO CERTAIN QUESTIONS OF THE COURT AT ORAL ARGUMENT to #587 Sealed Document by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schmidtlein, John)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MEMORANDUM re #586 Order by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 592 MEMORANDUM re #586 Order by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MEMORANDUM re #586 Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herrmann, Karl)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 590 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Response to Certain Questions of the Court at Oral Argument to #584 Sealed Document, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 589 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #584 Sealed Document, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 588 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #477 Sealed Document,,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Pls. Ex. 22), #2 Exhibit (Pls. Ex. 24), #3 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 587 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #584 Sealed Document, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' #495 and #496 Motions for Sanctions. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/27/2023. (lcapm2)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 585 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Goerlitz on behalf of STATE OF IOWA (Goerlitz, Noah)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 584 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 583 REDACTED DOCUMENT- to #578 Sealed Opposition by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 582 REDACTED DOCUMENT- to #577 Sealed Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted Version))(Herrmann, Karl)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 581 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Sanctions and Response to Notice of Play Litigation Order to #576 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 580 TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 13, 2023; Page Numbers: 1-276. Date of Issuance: April 14, 2023. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/5/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2023.(wz)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Summary Judgment Hearing held on 4/13/2023. Arguments heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #508 and #509 motions for leave to file amicus briefs. The court hereby exercises its discretion and accepts the amicus briefs of the American Antitrust Institute [508-2] and the Behavioral Economists [509-1]. The court recognizes that, as a result of the timing of this decision, Google has not had the opportunity to respond to the arguments of amici. Google may request the opportunity to respond in writing, but from the court's perspective, additional briefing is not needed to understand Google's positions or to elucidate the matters addressed by amici. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/11/2023. (lcapm2)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Summary Judgment Hearing set for 4/13/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Courtroom 25 will serve as the overflow courtroom and is located on the fourth floor of the annex. The public access line will not be connected for this hearing. (zjd) Modified on 4/11/2023 (zjd).
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER setting the schedule for the summary judgment hearing on April 13, 2023. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/10/2023. (lcapm2)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 578 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by STATE OF COLORADO. re #576 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 577 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #576 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 576 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 575 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions Against Google, LLC and an Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Appropriate Relief to #572 Sealed Reply, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (Redacted), #8 Exhibit H (Sealed), #9 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the following Motions to Seal: #416 #417 #418 #419 #420 #424 #425 #443 #495 and #496 . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/4/2023. (lcapm2)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 574 REDACTED DOCUMENT- to #571 Sealed Reply,, United States' Reply in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions Against Google LLC by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53, #2 Exhibit 54, #3 Exhibit 55, #4 Exhibit 56, #5 Exhibit 57, #6 Exhibit 58, #7 Exhibit 59, #8 Exhibit 60, #9 Exhibit 61, #10 Exhibit 62, #11 Exhibit 63, #12 Exhibit 64, #13 Exhibit 65, #14 Exhibit 66, #15 Exhibit 67, #16 Exhibit 68, #17 Exhibit 69, #18 Exhibit 70)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE of Rule 37(e)(2) Sanctions Against Google LLC by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 572 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #496 Sealed Motion (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sealed), #2 Exhibit B (Sealed), #3 Exhibit C (Sealed), #4 Exhibit D (Sealed), #5 Exhibit E (Sealed), #6 Exhibit F (Sealed), #7 Exhibit G (Sealed), #8 Exhibit H (Sealed), #9 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 571 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #495 Sealed Motion,,,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53, #2 Exhibit 54, #3 Exhibit 55, #4 Exhibit 56, #5 Exhibit 57, #6 Exhibit 58, #7 Exhibit 59, #8 Exhibit 60, #9 Exhibit 61, #10 Exhibit 62, #11 Exhibit 63, #12 Exhibit 64, #13 Exhibit 65, #14 Exhibit 66, #15 Exhibit 67, #16 Exhibit 68, #17 Exhibit 69, #18 Exhibit 70, #19 Certificate of Service)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 570 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #522 Sealed Reply, #569 Sealed Order (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 569 SEALED ORDER granting #567 SEALED MOTION. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/20/2023. (zjd)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #480 Sealed Document,,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' corrected Counterstatement of Material Facts, #2 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 567 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #565 SEALED MOTION. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/20/2023. (zjd)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 566 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Sanctions to #529 Sealed Opposition,, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 565 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 564 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Schneider on behalf of STATE OF MONTANA (Schneider, Anna) (Main Document 564 replaced on 3/17/2023) (zed).
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 563 MOTION to Substitute Matthew Ford by STATE OF ARKANSAS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute)(Ford, Matthew)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 562 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Michael Ford on behalf of STATE OF ARKANSAS (Ford, Matthew)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #563 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Matthew M. Ford will be the attorney of record for the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/16/2023. (lcapm2)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 561 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to #523 Sealed Reply, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiff States' Statement of Material Facts, #2 List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 117-118, #4 Exhibit 119, #5 Exhibit 120-122)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 560 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to #522 Sealed Reply, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts, #2 List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 130-131, #4 Exhibit 132)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 559 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Statement of Material Facts as to Which There Is No Genuine Issue in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment to #428 Sealed Document, #434 Sealed Document,,, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7-9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11-15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17-20, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 22-48, #14 Exhibit 49, #15 Exhibit 50-63, #16 Exhibit 64, #17 Exhibit 65-73, #18 Exhibit 74, #19 Exhibit 75, #20 Exhibit 76, #21 Exhibit 77, #22 Exhibit 78, #23 Exhibit 79, #24 Exhibit 80, #25 Exhibit 81, #26 Exhibit 82, #27 Exhibit 83-92, #28 Exhibit 93, #29 Exhibit 94, #30 Exhibit 95, #31 Exhibit 96-101, #32 Exhibit 102, #33 Exhibit 103, #34 Exhibit 104, #35 Exhibit 105-116)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 558 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #478 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 103 (Redacted - Part 1 of 2), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 103 (Redacted - Part 2 of 2))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 557 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #483 Sealed Document,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 284-290 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 292-293 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 294 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 295-299 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 300 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 301 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 308 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 309 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 310 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 311 (Redacted), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 312 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 313 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 314 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 315-317 (Sealed), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 318 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 319 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 556 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #492 Sealed Document,,, #482 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 232-233 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 234 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 236-242 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 243 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 244 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 245 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 246 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 247-248 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 249 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 251-254 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 255 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 256 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 257-258 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 264 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 265-269 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 270 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 272 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 273 (Sealed), #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 274 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 275-276 (Sealed), #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 277 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 278 (Sealed), #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 279 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 280 (Sealed), #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 283 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 555 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Statement of Material Facts as to Which There Is No Genuine Issue in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment to #423 Sealed Document, #429 Sealed Document,, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2-7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9-29, #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31-129)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #492 Sealed Document,,, #481 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 189-209 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 210 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 211 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 212 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 213 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 214-220 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 221 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 222 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 223 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 224 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 225 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 226 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 230 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 231 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #480 Sealed Document,,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 149 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 150 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 151-154 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 155 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 156 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 157 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 158-164 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 165 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 166-169 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 170 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 171-174 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 175 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 176 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 177-178 (Sealed), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 179 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 180 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 181 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 182 (Redacted), #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 183 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 184-188 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #479 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 106 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 107 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 108-110 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 111 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 112-116 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 117 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 118 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 119 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 120 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 121-129 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 130 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 131 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 132 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 133 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 134-135 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 137-140 (Sealed), #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 142-145 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 146 (Sealed), #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 148 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #492 Sealed Document,,, #478 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 063 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 064 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 066-067 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 068 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 069-070 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 072-076 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 077 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 078-081 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 083 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 084 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 085 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 086 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 087-092 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 093 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 094-097 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 098 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 099 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 100 (Redacted), #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 101 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 102 (Redacted), #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 104 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 105 (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Jonathan Baker to #517 Sealed Reply by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 549 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael Whinston to #516 Sealed Reply, by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #477 Sealed Document,,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 001-002 (Sealed), #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 003 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 004 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 005 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 006 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 007 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 008 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 009 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 010 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 014 (Redacted), #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 015 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 019-020 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 022-024 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 025 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 026 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 028 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 029 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 030 (Sealed), #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 045-060 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 061 (Redacted), #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 062 (Redacted))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 547 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael A. M. Davies to #515 Sealed Reply by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 546 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Exhibits to Defendant's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Christine M. Hammer to #416 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 545 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Christine M. Hammer to #514 Sealed Reply, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 544 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #480 Sealed Document,,,,, #479 Sealed Document,,,,, #483 Sealed Document,,,, #477 Sealed Document,,,,, #492 Sealed Document,,, #482 Sealed Document,,,,, #476 Sealed Opposition, #481 Sealed Document,,,,, #478 Sealed Document,,,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues - Redacted, #2 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts - Redacted, #3 Plaintiffs' List of Exhibits)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #463 Sealed Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sealed), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - D (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 542 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #462 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D (Sealed), #2 Exhibit E (Redacted), #3 Exhibit F (Redacted), #4 Exhibit G (Redacted), #5 Exhibit H (Redacted), #6 Exhibit I (Redacted), #7 Exhibit J (Redacted), #8 Exhibit K (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #461 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Sealed), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - D (Sealed), #4 Exhibit E (Redacted), #5 Exhibit F (Redacted), #6 Exhibit G - I (Sealed), #7 Exhibit J (Redacted), #8 Exhibit K - L (Sealed), #9 Exhibit M (Redacted), #10 Exhibit N - Q (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #443 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #521 Sealed Reply, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 539 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #424 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #520 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Sealed), #3 Exhibit C (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D (Redacted), #5 Exhibit E (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F (Redacted), #7 Exhibit G (Redacted), #8 Exhibit H (Redacted), #9 Exhibit I (Redacted), #10 Exhibit J (Redacted), #11 Exhibit K (Redacted))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #420 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #519 Sealed Reply, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B (Sealed), #2 Exhibit C (Redacted), #3 Exhibit D - E (Sealed), #4 Exhibit F (Redacted), #5 Exhibit G - H (Sealed), #6 Exhibit I (Redacted), #7 Exhibit J - L (Sealed))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 537 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Exhibits to Plaintiff States' Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs Expert Jonathan Baker. Ex. A-H to #498 Redacted Document, #460 Sealed Opposition, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M, #6 Exhibit N, #7 Exhibit O, #8 Exhibit P-R)(Sallet, Jonathan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 536 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Exhibits to Plaintiff States Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgement to #470 Sealed Document,,, #466 Sealed Document,,, #471 Sealed Document,,, #468 Sealed Document,,, #469 Sealed Document,,, #467 Sealed Document,,, #472 Sealed Document,, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 132, #2 Exhibit 133, #3 Exhibit 134, #4 Exhibit 135-145, #5 Exhibit 146, #6 Exhibit 147-149, #7 Exhibit 150, #8 Exhibit 151-155, #9 Exhibit 156, #10 Exhibit 157-158, #11 Exhibit 159-161, #12 Exhibit 162-164, #13 Exhibit 165, #14 Exhibit 166, #15 Exhibit 167-168, #16 Exhibit 169-170, #17 Exhibit 171, #18 Exhibit 172-173, #19 Exhibit 174, #20 Exhibit 175-179, #21 Exhibit 180-182, #22 Exhibit 183, #23 Exhibit 184-189, #24 Exhibit 190-192, #25 Exhibit 193-195, #26 Exhibit 196-197, #27 Exhibit 198, #28 Exhibit 199-201, #29 Exhibit 202-205, #30 Exhibit 206-209, #31 Exhibit 210, #32 Exhibit 211-222, #33 Exhibit 223-224, #34 Exhibit 225-235, #35 Exhibit 236, #36 Exhibit 237, #37 Exhibit 238, #38 Exhibit 239-240, #39 Exhibit 241, #40 Exhibit 242-243, #41 Exhibit 244-246, #42 Exhibit 247-248, #43 Exhibit 249, #44 Exhibit 250-252, #45 Exhibit 253, #46 Exhibit 254-255, #47 Exhibit 256-261)(Sallet, Jonathan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 535 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edward A. Fox to #521 Sealed Reply, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 534 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Exhibits to Plaintiff States' Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgement to #470 Sealed Document,,, #466 Sealed Document,,, #471 Sealed Document,,, #468 Sealed Document,,, #469 Sealed Document,,, #467 Sealed Document,,, #472 Sealed Document,, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11-12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17-19, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 21-22, #12 Exhibit 23-27, #13 Exhibit 28, #14 Exhibit 29-30, #15 Exhibit 31, #16 Exhibit 32-37, #17 Exhibit 38, #18 Exhibit 39, #19 Exhibit 40, #20 Exhibit 41, #21 Exhibit 42, #22 Exhibit 43, #23 Exhibit 44, #24 Exhibit 45, #25 Exhibit 46-54, #26 Exhibit 55-57, #27 Exhibit 58-72, #28 Exhibit 73, #29 Exhibit 74-80, #30 Exhibit 81-83, #31 Exhibit 84, #32 Exhibit 85, #33 Exhibit 86, #34 Exhibit 87, #35 Exhibit 88, #36 Exhibit 89-90, #37 Exhibit 91, #38 Exhibit 92, #39 Exhibit 93-99, #40 Exhibit 100-101, #41 Exhibit 102-112, #42 Exhibit 113, #43 Exhibit 114-116, #44 Exhibit 117-118, #45 Exhibit 119-121, #46 Exhibit 122, #47 Exhibit 123, #48 Exhibit 124-126, #49 Exhibit 127, #50 Exhibit 128-131)(Sallet, Jonathan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 533 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ronald T. Wilcox to #520 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 532 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Randolph E. Bucklin to #519 Sealed Reply, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 531 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Response to Google's Statement of Material Facts to #499 Redacted Document, #465 Sealed Opposition, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 530 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Statement of Material Facts to #499 Redacted Document, #465 Sealed Opposition, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 529 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #495 Sealed Motion,,,, #496 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Text of Proposed Order, #20 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 528 TRANSCRIPT OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on March 3, 2023; Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance: March 6, 2023. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2023.(wz)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Scheduling Conference held via videoconference on 3/3/2023. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Memorandum in opposition to re #509 Motion for Leave to File, filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Memorandum in opposition to re #508 Motion for Leave to File filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Frasher on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA (Frasher, Ryan) (Main Document 525 replaced on 3/3/2023) (zed).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 4:15 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Winsor Hereford on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Hereford, Elizabeth)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a remote scheduling conference on March 3, 2023, at 4:15 p.m. before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/28/2023. (lcapm2)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 523 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 Motion for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiff States' Statement of Material Facts, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 117, #4 Exhibit 118, #5 Exhibit 119, #6 Exhibit 120, #7 Exhibit 121, #8 Exhibit 122, #9 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 522 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 Motion for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 STRICKEN AND DELETED PURSUANT TO #569 SEALED ORDER.....Response to Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 130, #4 Exhibit 131, #5 Exhibit 132, #6 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John) Modified on 3/22/2023 (zjd).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 521 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #443 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P, #5 Exhibit Q, #6 Exhibit R, #7 Exhibit S, #8 Exhibit T, #9 Exhibit U, #10 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 520 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #424 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl); Modified docketing event at the request of counsel on 2/28/2023 (ztth).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 519 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #420 Sealed Motion (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 518 NOTICE of Appearance by Conor J. May on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (May, Conor)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 517 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #419 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 516 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #418 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 515 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #417 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 514 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC re #416 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 513 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Motion for Sanctions Against Google, LLC and an Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Appropriate Relief to #496 SEALED MOTION filed by STATE OF COLORADO by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Sealed), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C (Sealed), #6 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 512 REDACTED DOCUMENT- United States' Motion for Sanctions Against Google, LLC and an Evidentiary Hearing to Determine Appropriate Relief to #495 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sanction Google And An Evidentiary Hearing To Determine The Appropriate Relief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 7 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 8 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit 9 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit 10 (Sealed), #13 Exhibit 11 (Sealed), #14 Exhibit 12 (Sealed), #15 Exhibit 13 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit 14 (Sealed), #17 Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #18 Exhibit 16 (Sealed), #19 Exhibit 17 (Sealed), #20 Exhibit 18 (Sealed), #21 Exhibit 19 (Sealed), #22 Exhibit 20 (Sealed), #23 Exhibit 21 (Sealed), #24 Exhibit 22 (Sealed), #25 Exhibit 23 (Redacted), #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43 (Sealed), #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47 (Sealed), #50 Exhibit 48 (Sealed), #51 Exhibit 49 (Sealed), #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51 (Sealed), #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF UTAH. Attorney Tara Pincock terminated. (Pincock, Tara)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rosengart on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Rosengart, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs by PAUL HEIDHUES, GEORGE LOEWENSTEIN, KLAUS M. SCHMIDT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wardenski, Joseph)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 508 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMERICAN ANTITRUST INSTITUTE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief)(Bradish, Kathleen)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Wardenski on behalf of GEORGE LOEWENSTEIN, KLAUS M. SCHMIDT, PAUL HEIDHUES (Wardenski, Joseph) (Main Document 507 replaced on 2/27/2023) (zed).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 506 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google's Motion for Summary Judgment to #476 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 505 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael A.M. Davies to #463 Sealed Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 504 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Christine M. Hammer to #462 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 503 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael Whinston to #461 Sealed Opposition, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 502 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edward A. Fox to #475 Sealed Opposition, by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 501 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Testimony of Professor Randolph E. Bucklin to #474 Sealed Opposition, by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 500 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ronald T. Wilcox to #473 Sealed Opposition by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 499 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Google LLC's Motion for Summary Judgement to #465 Sealed Opposition, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 498 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States Opposition to Googles Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs Expert Jonathan Baker to #460 Sealed Opposition, by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #497 Motion for an Extension of Time to Oppose the Motions Filed on February 10 and 12, 2023. Defendant Google's oppositions to Plaintiff United States' Motion #495 and Plaintiff States' Motion #496 shall be due on or before March 10, 2023. Plaintiffs' replies shall be due on or before March 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/16/2023. (lcapm2)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #495 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #496 SEALED MOTION filed by STATE OF COLORADO by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 496 SEALED MOTION filed by STATE OF COLORADO (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service)(Sallet, Jonathan)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 495 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sanction Google And An Evidentiary Hearing To Determine The Appropriate Relief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEBRASKA re #491 Sealed Document . (Conrad, Joseph)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 493 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEBRASKA re #490 Sealed Document . (Conrad, Joseph)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 492 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #480 Sealed Document,,,,, #477 Sealed Document,,,,, #482 Sealed Document,,,,, #476 Sealed Opposition, #481 Sealed Document,,,,, #478 Sealed Document,,,,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 (Attachment 1), #2 (Attachment 2), #3 (Attachment 3), #4 (Attachment 4), #5 (Attachment 5), #6 (Attachment 6), #7 (Attachment 7), #8 (Attachment 8), #9 (Attachment 9), #10 (Attachment 10), #11 (Attachment 11), #12 (Attachment 12), #13 (Attachment 13), #14 (Attachment 14), #15 (Attachment 15), #16 (Attachment 16), #17 (Attachment 17), #18 (Attachment 18), #19 (Attachment 19), #20 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 491 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Sallet, Jonathan)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 490 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Sallet, Jonathan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 489 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #462 Sealed Opposition, #463 Sealed Opposition, #461 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 (Attachment 1), #2 (Attachment 2), #3 (Attachment 3), #4 (Attachment 4), #5 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE of Change of Address by Russell P. Cohen (Cohen, Russell)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #487 NOTICE of Change of Address by John A. Jurata, Jr (Jurata, John).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/15/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 2/10/2023 (zbaj).
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE of Change of Address by John A. Jurata, Jr (Jurata, John)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayme L. Weber on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA (Weber, Jayme)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEBRASKA re #468 Sealed Document,,, #470 Sealed Document,,, #467 Sealed Document,,, #469 Sealed Document,,, #466 Sealed Document,,, #471 Sealed Document,,, #472 Sealed Document,, #465 Sealed Opposition, . (Conrad, Joseph)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 484 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEBRASKA re #460 Sealed Opposition, . (Conrad, Joseph)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 483 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 284, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 285, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 286, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 287, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 288, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 289, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 290, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 292, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 293, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 294, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 295, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 296, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 297, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 298, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 299, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 300, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 301, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 308, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 309, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 310, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 311, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 312, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 313, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 314, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 315, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 316, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 317, #28 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 482 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 232, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 233, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 234, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 236, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 237, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 238, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 239, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 240, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 241, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 242, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 243, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 244, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 245, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 246, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 247, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 248, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 249, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 251, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 252, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 253, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 254, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 255, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 256, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 257, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 258, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 264, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 265, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 268, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 269, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 270, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 272, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 273, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 274, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 275, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 276, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 277, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 278, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 279, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 280, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 283)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 481 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 189, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 190, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 191, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 192, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 193, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 194, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 195, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 196, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 197, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 198, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 199, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 200, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 201, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 202, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 203, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 204, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 205, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 206, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 207, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 208, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 209, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 210, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 211, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 212, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 213, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 214, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 215, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 216, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 217, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 218, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 219, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 220, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 221, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 222, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 223, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 224, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 225, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 226, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 230, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 231)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 480 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 149, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 150, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 151, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 152, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 153, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 154, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 155, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 156, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 157, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 158, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 159, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 160, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 161, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 162, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 163, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 164, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 165, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 166, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 167, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 168, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 169, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 170, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 171, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 172, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 173, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 174, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 175, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 176, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 177, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 178, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 179, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 180, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 181, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 182, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 183, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 184, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 185, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 186, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 187, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 188)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 479 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 106, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 107, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 108, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 109, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 110, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 111, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 112, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 113, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 114, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 115, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 116, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 117, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 118, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 119, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 120, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 121, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 122, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 123, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 124, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 125, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 126, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 127, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 128, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 129, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 130, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 131, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 132, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 133, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 134, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 135, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 137, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 138, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 139, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 140, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 142, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 143, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 144, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 145, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 146, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 148)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 478 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 063, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 064, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 066, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 067, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 068, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 069, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 070, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 072, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 073, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 074, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 075, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 076, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 077, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 078, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 079, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 080, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 081, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 083, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 084, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 085, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 086, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 087, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 088, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 089, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 090, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 091, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 092, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 093, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 094, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 095, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 096, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 097, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 098, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 099, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 100, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 101, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 102, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 103, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 104, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 105)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 477 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #476 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 001, #2 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 002, #3 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 003, #4 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 004, #5 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 005, #6 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 006, #7 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 007, #8 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 008, #9 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 009, #10 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 010, #11 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 014, #12 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 015, #13 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 019, #14 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 020, #15 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 022, #16 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 023, #17 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 024, #18 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 025, #19 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 026, #20 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 028, #21 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 029, #22 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 030, #23 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 045, #24 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 046, #25 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 047, #26 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 048, #27 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 049, #28 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 050, #29 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 051, #30 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 052, #31 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 053, #32 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 054, #33 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 055, #34 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 056, #35 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 057, #36 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 058, #37 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 059, #38 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 060, #39 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 061, #40 Exhibit - Pls. Ex. 062)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 476 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #421 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts (Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues), #2 Statement of Facts (Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #443 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #420 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #424 Sealed Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 472 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 241, #2 Exhibit 242, #3 Exhibit 243, #4 Exhibit 244, #5 Exhibit 245, #6 Exhibit 246, #7 Exhibit 247, #8 Exhibit 248, #9 Exhibit 249, #10 Exhibit 250, #11 Exhibit 251, #12 Exhibit 252, #13 Exhibit 253, #14 Exhibit 254, #15 Exhibit 255, #16 Exhibit 256, #17 Exhibit 257, #18 Exhibit 258, #19 Exhibit 259, #20 Exhibit 260, #21 Exhibit 261)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 471 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 201, #2 Exhibit 202, #3 Exhibit 203, #4 Exhibit 204, #5 Exhibit 205, #6 Exhibit 206, #7 Exhibit 207, #8 Exhibit 208, #9 Exhibit 209, #10 Exhibit 210, #11 Exhibit 211, #12 Exhibit 212, #13 Exhibit 213, #14 Exhibit 214, #15 Exhibit 215, #16 Exhibit 216, #17 Exhibit 217, #18 Exhibit 218, #19 Exhibit 219, #20 Exhibit 220, #21 Exhibit 221, #22 Exhibit 222, #23 Exhibit 223, #24 Exhibit 224, #25 Exhibit 225, #26 Exhibit 226, #27 Exhibit 227, #28 Exhibit 228, #29 Exhibit 229, #30 Exhibit 230, #31 Exhibit 231, #32 Exhibit 232, #33 Exhibit 233, #34 Exhibit 234, #35 Exhibit 235, #36 Exhibit 236, #37 Exhibit 237, #38 Exhibit 238, #39 Exhibit 239, #40 Exhibit 240)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 470 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 161, #2 Exhibit 162, #3 Exhibit 163, #4 Exhibit 164, #5 Exhibit 165, #6 Exhibit 166, #7 Exhibit 167, #8 Exhibit 168, #9 Exhibit 169, #10 Exhibit 170, #11 Exhibit 171, #12 Exhibit 172, #13 Exhibit 173, #14 Exhibit 174, #15 Exhibit 175, #16 Exhibit 176, #17 Exhibit 177, #18 Exhibit 178, #19 Exhibit 179, #20 Exhibit 180, #21 Exhibit 181, #22 Exhibit 182, #23 Exhibit 183, #24 Exhibit 184, #25 Exhibit 185, #26 Exhibit 186, #27 Exhibit 187, #28 Exhibit 188, #29 Exhibit 189, #30 Exhibit 190, #31 Exhibit 191, #32 Exhibit 192, #33 Exhibit 193, #34 Exhibit 194, #35 Exhibit 195, #36 Exhibit 196, #37 Exhibit 197, #38 Exhibit 198, #39 Exhibit 199, #40 Exhibit 200)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 469 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 121, #2 Exhibit 122, #3 Exhibit 123, #4 Exhibit 124, #5 Exhibit 125, #6 Exhibit 126, #7 Exhibit 127, #8 Exhibit 128, #9 Exhibit 129, #10 Exhibit 130, #11 Exhibit 131, #12 Exhibit 132, #13 Exhibit 133, #14 Exhibit 134, #15 Exhibit 135, #16 Exhibit 136, #17 Exhibit 137, #18 Exhibit 138, #19 Exhibit 139, #20 Exhibit 140, #21 Exhibit 141, #22 Exhibit 142, #23 Exhibit 143, #24 Exhibit 144, #25 Exhibit 145, #26 Exhibit 146, #27 Exhibit 147, #28 Exhibit 148, #29 Exhibit 149, #30 Exhibit 150, #31 Exhibit 151, #32 Exhibit 152, #33 Exhibit 153, #34 Exhibit 154, #35 Exhibit 155, #36 Exhibit 156, #37 Exhibit 157, #38 Exhibit 158, #39 Exhibit 159, #40 Exhibit 160)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 468 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 82, #3 Exhibit 83, #4 Exhibit 84, #5 Exhibit 85, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92, #13 Exhibit 93, #14 Exhibit 94, #15 Exhibit 95, #16 Exhibit 96, #17 Exhibit 97, #18 Exhibit 98, #19 Exhibit 99, #20 Exhibit 100, #21 Exhibit 101, #22 Exhibit 102, #23 Exhibit 103, #24 Exhibit 104, #25 Exhibit 105, #26 Exhibit 106, #27 Exhibit 107, #28 Exhibit 108, #29 Exhibit 109, #30 Exhibit 110, #31 Exhibit 111, #32 Exhibit 112, #33 Exhibit 113, #34 Exhibit 114, #35 Exhibit 115, #36 Exhibit 116, #37 Exhibit 117, #38 Exhibit 118, #39 Exhibit 119, #40 Exhibit 120)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 467 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit 61, #22 Exhibit 62, #23 Exhibit 63, #24 Exhibit 64, #25 Exhibit 65, #26 Exhibit 66, #27 Exhibit 67, #28 Exhibit 68, #29 Exhibit 69, #30 Exhibit 70, #31 Exhibit 71, #32 Exhibit 72, #33 Exhibit 73, #34 Exhibit 74, #35 Exhibit 75, #36 Exhibit 76, #37 Exhibit 77, #38 Exhibit 78, #39 Exhibit 79, #40 Exhibit 80)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 466 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF COLORADO re #465 Sealed Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 465 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by STATE OF COLORADO. re #426 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff States' Statement of Material Facts, #2 Plaintiff States' Response to Google's Statement of Material Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica N. Onyema on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Onyema, Veronica)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #417 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 462 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #416 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 461 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #418 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Text of Proposed Order, #19 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by STATE OF COLORADO. re #419 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AT&T INC.. Attorney Matthew Guice Aiken terminated. (Aiken, Matthew)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 458 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF ARIZONA. Attorney Michael S. Catlett terminated. (Bernheim, Robert)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bernheim on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA (Bernheim, Robert) (Main Document 457 replaced on 1/16/2023) (zed).
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 456 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF IDAHO. Attorney Brett Talmage DeLange terminated. (DeLange, Brett)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 455 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Edward A. Fox and Memorandum In Support to #443 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted))(Herrmann, Karl)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 454 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ronald T. Wilcox and Memorandum In Support to #424 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted))(Herrmann, Karl)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 453 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Randolph E. Bucklin and Memorandum In Support to #420 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted))(Herrmann, Karl)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 452 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Google's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment to #427 Sealed Document by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 451 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Google's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment to #422 Sealed Document by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 450 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Jonathan Baker to #419 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 449 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael Whinston to #418 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 448 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion to Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Michael A.M. Davies to #417 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 447 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Christine M. Hammer to #416 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF ARKANSAS. Attorney David A.F. McCoy terminated. (McCoy, David)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Matt Schock terminated. (Schock, Matt)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Statement of Facts, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #442 SEALED MOTION. Plaintiffs may file under seal a corrected version of Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion, ECF No. #425 . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/23/2022. (zjd)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Herrmann, Karl)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 NOTICE Regarding Evidentiary Hearings in Connection with Daubert Motions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Herrmann, Karl)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 NOTICE Regarding Evidentiary Hearings in Connection with Daubert Motions by GOOGLE LLC (Schmidtlein, John)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Trent Gray on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Gray, Sara)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Appearance by Keaton Lynn Barnes on behalf of STATE OF ARKANSAS (Barnes, Keaton)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF TEXAS. Attorney Kelsey Paine terminated. (Paine, Kelsey)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 82, #3 Exhibit 83, #4 Exhibit 84, #5 Exhibit 85, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92, #13 Exhibit 93, #14 Exhibit 94, #15 Exhibit 95, #16 Exhibit 96, #17 Exhibit 97, #18 Exhibit 98, #19 Exhibit 99, #20 Exhibit 100, #21 Exhibit 101, #22 Exhibit 102, #23 Exhibit 103, #24 Exhibit 104, #25 Exhibit 105, #26 Exhibit 106, #27 Exhibit 107, #28 Exhibit 108, #29 Exhibit 109, #30 Exhibit 110, #31 Exhibit 111, #32 Exhibit 112, #33 Exhibit 113, #34 Exhibit 114, #35 Exhibit 115, #36 Exhibit 116, #37 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit 61, #22 Exhibit 62, #23 Exhibit 63, #24 Exhibit 64, #25 Exhibit 65, #26 Exhibit 66, #27 Exhibit 67, #28 Exhibit 68, #29 Exhibit 69, #30 Exhibit 70, #31 Exhibit 71, #32 Exhibit 72, #33 Exhibit 73, #34 Exhibit 74, #35 Exhibit 75, #36 Exhibit 76, #37 Exhibit 77, #38 Exhibit 78, #39 Exhibit 79, #40 Exhibit 80)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit 103, #4 Exhibit 104, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 107, #8 Exhibit 108, #9 Exhibit 109, #10 Exhibit 110, #11 Exhibit 111, #12 Exhibit 112, #13 Exhibit 113, #14 Exhibit 114, #15 Exhibit 115, #16 Exhibit 116, #17 Exhibit 117, #18 Exhibit 118, #19 Exhibit 119, #20 Exhibit 120, #21 Exhibit 121, #22 Exhibit 122, #23 Exhibit 123, #24 Exhibit 124, #25 Exhibit 125, #26 Exhibit 126, #27 Exhibit 127, #28 Exhibit 128, #29 Exhibit 129, #30 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 76, #2 Exhibit 77, #3 Exhibit 78, #4 Exhibit 79, #5 Exhibit 80, #6 Exhibit 81, #7 Exhibit 82, #8 Exhibit 83, #9 Exhibit 84, #10 Exhibit 85, #11 Exhibit 86, #12 Exhibit 87, #13 Exhibit 88, #14 Exhibit 89, #15 Exhibit 90, #16 Exhibit 91, #17 Exhibit 92, #18 Exhibit 93, #19 Exhibit 94, #20 Exhibit 95, #21 Exhibit 96, #22 Exhibit 97, #23 Exhibit 98, #24 Exhibit 99, #25 Exhibit 100)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53, #4 Exhibit 54, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Exhibit 56, #7 Exhibit 57, #8 Exhibit 58, #9 Exhibit 59, #10 Exhibit 60, #11 Exhibit 61, #12 Exhibit 62, #13 Exhibit 63, #14 Exhibit 64, #15 Exhibit 65, #16 Exhibit 66, #17 Exhibit 67, #18 Exhibit 68, #19 Exhibit 69, #20 Exhibit 70, #21 Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit 72, #23 Exhibit 73, #24 Exhibit 74, #25 Exhibit 75)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Exhibit 43, #19 Exhibit 44, #20 Exhibit 45, #21 Exhibit 46, #22 Exhibit 47, #23 Exhibit 48, #24 Exhibit 49, #25 Exhibit 50)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #426 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC re #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Text of Proposed Order, #15 Certification, #16 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Text of Proposed Order, #21 Certification, #22 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certification, #13 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certification, #10 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Brian Corrigan on behalf of STATE OF MONTANA (Corrigan, Christian)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on November 28, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-45. Date of Issuance: December 2, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchas ed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2023.(wz)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER denying Defendant's #397 Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of DOJ Plaintiffs' Untimely Disclosed Expert. For the reasons stated on the record during the November 28, 2022 hearing, Defendant's motion is denied. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2022. (lcapm2)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER regarding page limits for summary judgment briefs. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2022. (lcapm2)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER regarding the filing of public redacted versions of papers filed under seal in connection with summary judgment or Daubert motions. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2022. (lcapm2)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER. The Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order #108 and #263 is further amended so that the deadline to file any Daubert motions regarding experts Prof. Catherine Tucker and Prof. Kirsten Martin is extended to December 19, 2022, or ten days after the completion of the depositions of Prof. Tucker and Prof. Martin, whichever is later. The deadline to file all other Daubert motions remains December 12, 2022. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2022. (lcapm2).
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 11/28/2022. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
November 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order)(Herrmann, Karl)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/28/2022 at 4:15 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary William Biesanz on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (Biesanz, Zachary)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The hearing set for Friday, November 18, 2022 at 1:00 PM is hereby vacated. The courtroom deputy will contact the parties to schedule a new hearing date. (zjd)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hafenbrack on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hafenbrack, Joshua) (Main Document 408 replaced on 11/15/2022) (znmw).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER granting U.S. Plaintiff's #404 Expedited Motion to Permit Two Attorneys to Examine Edward A. Fox. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/10/2022. (lcapm2)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Memorandum in opposition to re #404 Motion for Discovery, Opposition to DOJ Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow a Divided Examination of Dr. Fox filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Christopher VanDeusen terminated. (VanDeusen, Christopher)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Motion to Permit Two Attorneys for U.S. Plaintiffs to Examine Edward A. Fox and Memorandum in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Discovery Expedited Motion to Permit Two Attorneys for U.S. Plaintiffs to Examine Edward A. Fox and Memorandum in Support Thereof by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael); Modified on 11/10/2022 (ztth).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #403 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Motion to Permit Two Attorneys for U.S. Plaintiffs to Examine Edward A. Fox and Memorandum in Support Thereof. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (ztth)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Google LLC shall file any opposition to U.S. Plaintiffs' #404 Expedited Motion to Permit Two Attorneys for U.S. Plaintiffs to Examine Edward A. Fox by November 11, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/10/2022. (lcapm2)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 REPLY to opposition to motion re #397 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC re: Untimely Disclosed Expert filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a post-discovery status conference on November 18, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. If the parties believe that a hearing is needed on the pending motion to exclude #397 , or a status conference is otherwise needed prior to November 18, 2022, they shall contact chambers to schedule such hearing. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/25/2022. (lcapm2)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Memorandum in opposition to re #397 Sealed Motion Exclude filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At the request of the parties, the status conference scheduled for October 14, 2022, is vacated. The court will notify the parties of a future status conference date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/13/2022. (lcapm2)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by David A.F. McCoy on behalf of STATE OF ARKANSAS (McCoy, David)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Google's Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of DOJ Plaintiffs' Untimely Disclosed Expert to #397 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie W.L. Martin on behalf of STATE OF UTAH (Martin, Marie)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF NEVADA. Attorney Marie W.L. Martin terminated. (Newman, Michelle)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Frances Jowers on behalf of STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Jowers, Mary) (Main Document 394 replaced on 9/16/2022) (zed).
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT OF TUTORIAL PRESENTATION PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on September 8, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-287. Date of Issuance: September 13, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2022.(wz)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Abigail Leah Smith terminated. (Smith, Abigail)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Tutorial Presentation held on 9/8/2022. Status Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 02:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam T. Severt on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Severt, Adam)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Erica Lee Fruiterman terminated. (Fruiterman, Erica)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 24, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-52. Date of Issuance: August 25, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2022.(wz)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER entering Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' #376 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports of Edward A. Fox and Mark A. Israel. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/24/2022. (lcapm2)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports of Edward A. Fox and Mark A. Israel to #382 Sealed Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Joint Status Report by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 2:30 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta shall now proceed via videoconference. The parties are instructed to use the Zoom credentials provided by the courtroom deputy. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Google's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports to #384 Redacted Document, by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #376 Sealed Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #376 Sealed Motion, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Cornillie on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Cornillie, Henry) (Main Document 380 replaced on 8/15/2022) (zed).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Thomas P. DeMatteo terminated. (DeMatteo, Thomas)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #377 Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Briefing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports of Edward A. Fox and Mark A. Israel. The court is unavailable next week to resolve the pending motion to compel, so expedited briefing will not result in a quicker resolution. Google shall respond to the #376 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports of Edward A. Fox and Mark A. Israel by August 15, 2022. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief by August 19, 2022. The court and the parties tentatively agreed to a status conference on August 24, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall appear on that time and date so the court can address the #376 Motion to Compel and any other issues in dispute. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/9/2022. (lcapm2)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Memorandum in opposition to re #377 Motion to Expedite Briefing of DOJ Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MOTION to Expedite Briefing of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data Cited in Expert Reports, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Schwartz on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Schwartz, Michael)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF ARIZONA. Attorney Christopher M. Sloot terminated. (Sloot, Christopher)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Diane Rebecca Hazel terminated. (Hazel, Diane)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on July 14, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-54. Date of Issuance: July 19, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cour t reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2022.(wz)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jake Marvin Shields terminated. (Shields, Jake)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Opposition to DOJ Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Report of Edward A. Fox by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #368 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Report of Edward A. Fox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 7/14/2022. Status Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on July 14, 2022, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: (1) United States Plaintiffs may take further deposition testimony from Paul Gennai for up to 4 hours; Anna Kartasheva for up to 1 hour; James Kolotouros for up to 4 hours; Jamie Rosenberg for up to 4 hours; and Philipp Schindler for up to 1.5 hours. (2) Colorado Plaintiffs may take further deposition testimony from Richard Holden for up to 2 hours and Andy Miller for up to 2 hours. (3) United States Plaintiffs and Colorado Plaintiffs make take further deposition testimony from Prabhakar Raghavan for up to 3.5 hours and Hal Varian for up to 4 hours, with such time to be allocated as determined by Plaintiffs. (4) Plaintiffs' #368 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Report of Edward A. Fox is granted in part. The #263 Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order entered on December 6, 2021, is amended to reflect that Plaintiffs' deadline to serve their rebuttal expert report(s) to the Edward A. Fox report is extended by 14 days to 74 days after service of opening reports, or August 19, 2022. (5) The parties shall appear for a status conference on August 24, 2022, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/14/2022. (lcapm2)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Report of Edward A. Fox by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Report of Edward A. Fox, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF TEXAS. Attorney Bret Fulkerson terminated. (Fulkerson, Bret)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Sharp on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Sharp, Margaret)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF INDIANA. Attorney Erica S Sullivan terminated. (Sullivan, Erica)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF CALIFORNIA. Attorney Adam Miller terminated. (Miller, Adam)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 17, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-71. Date of Issuance: June 21, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cour t reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2022.(wz)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 6/17/2022. Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2022. Status Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on June 17, 2022, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: (1) Plaintiffs shall identify the witnesses they wish to re-depose on or before July 8, 2022. (2) The parties shall file a joint status report on July 12, 2022. (3) The parties shall appear for a status conference on July 14, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10. (4) The parties shall appear to deliver a tutorial presentation on relevant factual background to the court on September 8, 2022, starting at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Each side is allotted three hours. (5) Google shall produce up to 200 additional linked-to documents that Plaintiffs may identify on a case-by-case basis no later than September 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/17/2022. (lcapm2)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Joint Status Report by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF COLORADO. Attorney Erin L. Shencopp terminated. (Shencopp, Erin)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin P. Snider on behalf of STATE OF NEBRASKA (Snider, Colin)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER regarding production deadline, motion to compel deadline, and evidentiary cut-off date. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report in advance of the status conference scheduled for June 17, 2022, on June 15, 2022. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/25/2022. (lcapm2)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The next status conference will proceed in-person on June 17, 2022 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schmidtlein, John)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF IOWA. Attorney Max Merrick Miller terminated. (Miller, Max)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #354 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Propose an Evidentiary Cut-off Date and a Deadline for Motions to Compel. The parties shall file their proposal(s) on or before May 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/18/2022. (lcapm2)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Propose an Evidentiary Cut-Off Date and a Deadline for Motions to Compel by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on May 12, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-82. Date of Issuance: May 13, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from t he court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2022.(wz)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 5/12/2022. The parties shall propose an evidentiary cut-off date and a deadline for motions to compel by 5/17/2022. Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2022. The next status conference will take place on 6/16/2022 at 3:00 PM or 6/17/2022 at 3:00 PM. The hearing time will be finalized at a later date. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For the reasons stated during the status conference held on May 12, 2022, #317 #326 Plaintiffs' Motion to Sanction Google and Compel Disclosure of Documents Unjustifiably Claimed by Google as Attorney-Client Privileged is denied. Google is ordered, however, to ensure that all of the "silent-attorney emails" at issue in the Motion have been re-reviewed to the same extent as the sample of 210 emails provided to the court for its in camera review. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/12/2022. (lcapm2)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 NOTICE of Change of Address by John E. Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce A Pashler on behalf of STATE OF IOWA (Pashler, Bryce) (Main Document 349 replaced on 5/9/2022) (zeg).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney John Paul Foley terminated. (Foley, John)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Christi Foust on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA (Foust, Christi) (Main Document 347 replaced on 4/28/2022) (zeg).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF NEW YORK. Attorney John D. Castiglione terminated. (Castiglione, John)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY Pursuant to the Court's April 12, 2022 Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael) Modified docket event/text on 4/21/2022 (zeg).
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by GOOGLE LLC (Schmidtlein, John)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Racine on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Racine, Rachael)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' #342 Joint Status Report, the status conference scheduled for April 19, 2022, is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/19/2022. (lcapm2)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (McKinley, Matthew)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 TRANSCRIPT OF DISCOVERY HEARING RE THIRD-PARTY DISPUTE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 14, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: April 18, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2022.(wz)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachael A. Racine, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9175149. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waszmer, Wendy)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #340 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rachael A. Racine is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/15/2022. (lcapm2)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Discovery Hearing re Third Party Dispute held via teleconference on 4/14/2022. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MICROSOFT CORPORATION. Attorney Haley P. Tynes terminated. (Tynes, Haley)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing re Third Party Dispute set for 4/14/2022 at 8:45 AM via teleconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Counsel shall use the dial-in information provided by the courtroom deputy. Members of the public or media may access the proceedings by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties may submit any authority they believe supports their respective positions as to the court's inherent authority to sanction pre-litigation conduct and Google shall produce a sample of "silent attorney" emails for the court's in camera review by 4/19/2022. (zjch, )
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER regarding #317 Plaintiffs' Motion to Sanction Google and Compel Disclosure of Documents Unjustifiably Claimed by Google as Attorney-Client Privileged. The parties may submit any authority they believe supports their respective positions as to the court's inherent authority to sanction pre-litigation conduct by April 19, 2022. Google shall produce a sample of "silent attorney" emails for the court's in camera review by April 19, 2022. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/12/2022. (lcapm2)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Oral Argument/Status Conference held on 4/8/2022. Status Conference tentatively set for 4/19/2022 at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. A further Status Conference is set for 5/12/2022 at 3:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public or media may access the hearing(s) by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE/ORAL ARGUMENT PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 8, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-75. Date of Issuance: April 8, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2022.(wz)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Sommer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sommer, Christine)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Sanction Google and Compel by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Meagan K. Bellshaw, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 48, #13 Exhibit 49, #14 Exhibit 50, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 54, #17 Exhibit 55, #18 Exhibit 56, #19 Exhibit 57, #20 Exhibit 58, #21 Exhibit 59, #22 Exhibit 60)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by Catharine Sydnie Wright on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wright, Catharine)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Courtroom Change: The Oral Argument/Status Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 1:00 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta will now proceed in Courtroom 12. Members of the public or media may attend the hearing in-person or access the proceedings by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd) Modified hearing type on 4/6/2022 (zjd).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by William Elliott Ridgway on behalf of APPLE INC. (Ridgway, William)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Lillian Okamuro on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Okamuro, Lillian)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #317 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 48, #13 Exhibit 49, #14 Exhibit 50, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 54, #17 Exhibit 55, #18 Exhibit 56, #19 Exhibit 57, #20 Exhibit 58, #21 Exhibit 59, #22 Exhibit 60, #23 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William E. Ridgway, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9142063. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPLE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Ridgway, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sunshine, Steven)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #329 Non-Party Petitioner Apple Inc.'s Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Ridgway. Attorney William Ridgway is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/31/2022. (lcapm2)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Opposition to Motion to Sanction and Compel to #327 Sealed Opposition,, by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by GOOGLE LLC. re #317 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Motion to Sanction Google and Compel to #317 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sanction Google and Compel (Redacted Version), #2 Text of Proposed Order (Redacted Version), #3 Declaration (Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted Version), #8 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 8 (Redacted Version), #12 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 22 (Filed Under Seal), #26 Exhibit 23 (Filed Under Seal), #27 Exhibit 24 (Filed Under Seal), #28 Exhibit 25 (Filed Under Seal), #29 Exhibit 26 (Filed Under Seal), #30 Exhibit 27 (Filed Under Seal), #31 Exhibit 28 (Filed Under Seal), #32 Exhibit 29 (Filed Under Seal), #33 Exhibit 30 (Filed Under Seal), #34 Exhibit 31 (Filed Under Seal), #35 Exhibit 32 (Filed Under Seal), #36 Exhibit 33 (Filed Under Seal), #37 Exhibit 34 (Redacted Version), #38 Exhibit 35 (Redacted Version), #39 Exhibit 36 (Redacted Version), #40 Exhibit 37 (Redacted Version))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: In light of the parties resolving their discovery dispute, the hearing set for March 16, 2022 at 4:15 PM is hereby vacated. (zjd)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Daniel Abram on behalf of STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (Abram, Joshua)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #324 Transcript was entered in error as duplicate to docket entry #323 . (zeg)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on March 9, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: March 14, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2022.(wz) Modified on 3/15/2022 (zeg).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The status conference currently scheduled for March 16, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. is rescheduled for 4:15 p.m. on that same date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/14/2022. (lcapm2)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on March 9, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: March 11, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2022.(wz)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Johnson Palmer on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Johnson Palmer, Anne)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anne Johnson Palmer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9097151. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne Johnson Palmer in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Popofsky, Mark)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #321 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Anne Johnson Palmer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/10/2022. (lcapm2)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 3/9/2022. Status Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 4:30 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. All briefing for the pending motion to compel and for sanctions is due by 4/1/2022. Oral Argument set for 4/8/2022 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Yeager on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Yeager, Christopher)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Joint STATUS REPORT of March 4, 2022 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 A (Redacted Version), #2 B (Redacted Version), #3 C (Redacted Version), #4 D (Redacted Version))(Herrmann, Karl)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Black on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Black, Martin)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Sanction Google and Compel, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Martin J. Black, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9085761. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin J. Black in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Vincent)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #316 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Martin J. Black is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/7/2022. (lcapm2)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Herrmann, Karl)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Parris on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Parris, Mark) (Main Document 314 replaced on 3/4/2022) (zeg).
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Jurata, Jr on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Jurata, John)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark S. Parris, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-9083018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Parris, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tynes, Haley)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #312 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mark S. Parris is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/4/2022. (lcapm2)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Chul Pak on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Pak, Chul)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Sessions on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Sessions, Justina)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sommer on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Sommer, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #306 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael S. Sommer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/28/2022. (lcapm2)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #308 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Chul Pak is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/28/2022. (lcapm2)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #307 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Justina K. Sessions is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/28/2022. (lcapm2)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #305 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Gaffney on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Gaffney, Paul).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 3/7/2022. (znm) Modified on 2/28/2022 (znm).
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Chul Pak, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9067137. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chul Pak In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waszmer, Wendy)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justina K. Sessions, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9067113. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justina K. Sessions In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waszmer, Wendy)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael S. Sommer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9067082. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Sommer In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Waszmer, Wendy)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Gaffney on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Gaffney, Paul)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by Youlin Yuan on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Yuan, Youlin)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell P. Cohen on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Cohen, Russell)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lloyd Larrabee on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Larrabee, Matthew)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Robert Davis on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Davis, Allen)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER regarding the exchange of identities of third-party witnesses that may be called at trial. The court has adopted the "more likely" standard favored by Plaintiffs to ensure flexibility in making third-party designations so far out from trial, but it has placed a 40-person/entity cap per side to promote a meaningful set of third-party designees who can be deposed before the close of discovery. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/21/2022. (lcapm2)
February 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Chapman on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Chapman, Julia)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julia E. Chapman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9054316. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia E. Chapman in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Vincent)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew L. Larrabee, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9054252. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew L. Larrabee in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Vincent)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #297 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Julia E. Chapman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 2/18/2022. (lcapm2)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #297 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew L. Larrabee is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 2/18/2022. (lcapm2)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE re #294 Redacted Document Google's February 8 Submission filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Cohen, Vincent)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Defendant Google LLC's Statement Regarding a Dispute Involving Third Party Discovery of Microsoft by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Russell P. Cohen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9052102. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell P. Cohen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ray, Amy)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #293 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Russell P. Cohen is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 2/17/2022. (lcapm2)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff States' Response to Google LLC's Statement Regarding A Dispute Involving Third-Party Microsoft to #283 Sealed Document by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Conrad, Joseph)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 REDACTED DOCUMENT- U.S. Plaintiffs' Position Statement Regarding a Discovery Dispute Involving Discovery of Microsoft by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Herrmann, Karl)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Marvin Shields on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Shields, Jake)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on February 11, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-71. Date of Issuance: February 14, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purcha sed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2022.(wz)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER amending the #98 Stipulated Protective Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/11/2022. (lcapm2)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 2/11/2022. The parties are to meet and confer and submit a proposal regarding an exchange of the identities of witnesses and entities that may be called at trial by 2/16/2022. Google's response to United States Plaintiffs' letter regarding Topic 3 of the November 30(b)(6) notice is due by 2/18/2022. Plaintiffs' next non-data 30(b)(6) notice is due by 2/22/2022. The status conference originally scheduled for April 7, 2022 has been vacated and rescheduled to April 8, 2022 at 2:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The next status conference will take place on March 9, 2022 at 11:00 AM via videoconference. Members of the public or media may access the hearings by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Herrmann, Karl)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #282 Non-Party Microsoft Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Materials Under Seal. Having considered the relevant Hubbard factors, the court finds that an initial sealing of Microsoft's filing is warranted. Microsoft shall file an appropriately redacted version of its filing by February 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/10/2022. (lcapm2)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STATE OF NEBRASKA re #281 Sealed Document (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Conrad, Joseph)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Vincent)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Kara Bellshaw on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bellshaw, Meagan)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Matthew Yost on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Yost, Brian)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF TENNESSEE. Attorney Jeanette Pascale terminated. (Pascale, Jeanette)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER entering Proposed Order, ECF No. 275-1, regarding third party Microsoft's compliance with subpoenas issued in these matters. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/13/2022. (lcapm2)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Proposed Order by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) Modified docket event/text on 1/14/2022 (zeg).
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on January 7, 2022; Page Numbers: 1-70. Date of Issuance: January 10, 2022. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2022.(wz)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 1/7/2022. Proposed Order due by 1/12/2022. Supplements to Initial Disclosures due by 1/14/2022. Joint Status Reports due by 2/8/2022, 3/4/2022, and 4/4/2022. Status Conferences set for 2/11/2022 at 11:00 AM, 3/9/2022 at 11:00 AM, and tentatively for 4/7/2022 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel of record. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Philip Maurer on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Maurer, Aaron)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thorn Matlack on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Matlack, William)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF ARIZONA. Attorney Dana Vogel terminated. (Vogel, Dana)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Ryan M. Sandrock terminated. (Sandrock, Ryan)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Gloria K. Maier on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Maier, Gloria)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on December 6, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-49. Date of Issuance: December 7, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchase d from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2022.(wz)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER amending the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order, ECF No. 108-1, to include a paragraph on the obligation of recipients of a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice or subpoena to serve their responses and objections to such notice or subpoena within ten days. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/28/2021. (lcapm2)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER to bifurcate proceedings. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/6/2021. (lcapm2)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER amending the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order, ECF No. 108-1, to extend fact discovery and subsequent deadlines. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/6/2021. (lcapm2)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 12/6/2021. Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on December 6, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: (1) the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 15, 2021, updating the court on the status of the November 30(b)(6) notice; and (2) on or before December 22, 2021, Google shall provide Plaintiffs with a schedule identifying the witnesses who will address the topics from the November 30(b)(6) notice that will be addressed by live testimony, which topic(s) each witness will address, and the dates each witness is available for deposition. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 12/6/2021. (lcapm2)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Filing (1) Competing Proposed Orders to Bifurcate Proceedings, and (2) Joint Proposed Order to Modify the Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT OF JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on November 30, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: December 1, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2022.(wz)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 11/30/2021. Proposed Orders due by 12/3/2021. Status Conferences set for 12/6/2021 at 2:00 PM, 1/7/2022 at 11:00 AM, and 2/11/2022 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Bartels on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bartels, Sarah) (Main Document 260 replaced on 12/2/2021) (zeg).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher VanDeusen on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (VanDeusen, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Members of the public or media may access the status hearing set for 11/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. (zjd)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM re #257 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Conrad, Joseph)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. At the request of the United States, the status conference scheduled for November 30, 2021, shall proceed in a hybrid fashion in Courtroom 10. If counsel for any party wishes to appear in person, they may but are not required to do so. Given this late change, the court will not require any counsel, in particular for the Colorado Plaintiffs, to appear in person. Counsel for Google and lead counsel for the Colorado Plaintiffs shall notify the courtroom deputy whether they intend to appear in person or remotely. Counsel for third parties need not appear in person. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/24/2021. (lcapm2)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. If Google and Yelp have not reached an agreement as to their discovery dispute by November 16, 2021, they shall submit simultaneous briefs of no more than ten pages (excluding exhibits) by November 24, 2021, so that the court can take up the matter at the hearing scheduled for November 30, 2021. Google and Yelp shall file a notice on November 17, 2021, advising whether they have resolved their dispute. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/12/2021. (lcapm2)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
November 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Google and third party Yelp shall file an additional Joint Status Report concerning their dispute by November 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/7/2021. (lcapm2)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties in United States v. Google shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by November 11, 2021, concerning issues arising from the October 6 Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, including, if needed, a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/3/2021. (lcapm2)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Murdock-Park, Erin)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Amit P. Mehta is hereby vacated. The Court has been notified that the discovery issue has been resolved. (zjd)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on October 28, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-84. Date of Issuance: October 29, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchase d from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2022.(wz)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on October 28, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings: (1) Plaintiffs and third party Samsung shall appear for a Status Conference to discuss the status of their remaining discovery issues on November 1, 2021, at 2:00 p.m.; (2) Defendant and third party Yelp shall file a Joint Status Report updating the court on the status of remaining custodian issues on or before November 4, 2021; and (3) United States Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file a Joint Status Report regarding issues relating to the previously completed Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, including a briefing schedule if necessary, on or before November 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/29/2021. (lcapm2)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for video proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 10/28/2021. Status Report by Google and Yelp due by 11/4/2021. Discovery Hearing set for 11/1/2021 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zgdf)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Amisha R. Patel on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Patel, Amisha)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent H. Cohen, Jr on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Cohen, Vincent)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Position Statement of Plaintiffs' Request for the Court to Compel Discovery from Samsung Electronics America, Inc by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Position Statement Concerning Discovery Dispute with Plaintiffs by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Arteaga, Juan)
October 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Foley on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Foley, John) (Main Document 243 replaced on 10/20/2021) (zeg).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Conrad, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Position Statement of Plaintiffs' Request for the Court to Compel Discovery from Samsung Electronics America, Inc., #3 Appendix A, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 REPLY to opposition to motion re #228 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF YELP, INC. CUSTODIAN (Redacted) filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Position Statement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Arteaga, Juan)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeane A. Thomas on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Thomas, Jeane)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Keith McKinley on behalf of STATE OF NEBRASKA (McKinley, Matthew) (Main Document 237 replaced on 10/15/2021) (zeg).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Arteaga on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Arteaga, Juan)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Victoria Debernardis on behalf of SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. (Debernardis, Alexis)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Juan A. Arteaga, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8797590. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juan A. Arteaga, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Debernardis, Alexis)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #233 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Juan A. Arteaga is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 10/13/2021. (lcapm2)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF MICHIGAN. Attorney Wisam Naoum terminated. (Mertens, Scott)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Allen Mertens on behalf of STATE OF MICHIGAN (Mertens, Scott)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by YELP INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Dixon, Douglas)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States and third party Samsung Electronics America, Inc. shall file by October 14, 2021, briefs of no more than ten pages (excluding exhibits) setting forth their respective positions as to their discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/8/2021. (lcapm2)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Colorado Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 15, 2021, updating the court on their progress concerning issues related to the recently held Rule 30(b)(6) data deposition. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/8/2021. (lcapm2)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Conrad, Joseph)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF YELP, INC. CUSTODIAN (Redacted) by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED MOTION filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy) Modified docket event/text on 10/6/2021 (zeg).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward John Bennett on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Bennett, Edward)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on September 28, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-84. Date of Issuance: September 30, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purc hased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2021.(wz)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER amending the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order, ECF No. 108-1, to include a sentence on the obligation of the parties and third parties to respond to deposition notices and subpoenas within seven days to discuss in good faith a mutually agreeable time and location for depositions. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/28/2021. (lcapm2)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 9/28/2021. Status Report due by 10/6/2021. The next status conference is reset to 10/28/2021 at 3:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel of record. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (zjd)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's #214 Motion for Protective Order is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated on the record during the September 28, 2021, status conference. The court denies the Motion insofar as it seeks a single comprehensive Rule 30(b)(6) notice by October 15, 2021. Plaintiffs shall issue a Rule 30(b)(6) notice by November 1, 2021, and another notice by January 14, 2022. Plaintiffs may issue one additional data 30(b)(6) notice. Plaintiffs shall endeavor to craft their 30(b)(6) notices on discrete subjects and seek to avoid redundancies with their depositions of fact witnesses. The court grants in part the Motion to narrow the timeframe for the topics covered in the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. The Rule 30(b)(6) topics shall be limited to the time period between 2005 and the present. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/28/2021. (lcapm2)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the September 28, 2021, status conference, on or before October 6, 2021, the Colorado Plaintiffs and Defendant shall submit a Joint Status Report updating the court on the three issues identified by the Colorado Plaintiffs relating to the recently held Rule 30(b)(6) data deposition and whether the court's intervention will be required. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/28/2021. (lcapm2)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Google and third party Yelp shall brief the issue relating to production of documents from a proposed custodian raised in their #222 Joint Status Report according to the following schedule: (1) Google will submit its opening brief by October 1, 2021; (2) Yelp will submit its opposition by October 8, 2021; and (3) Google will submit its reply by October 13, 2021. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to seven double-spaced pages (excluding exhibits), and Google's reply shall be limited to five double-spaced pages. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/27/2021. (lcapm2)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (zjd) Modified hearing time on 9/27/2021 (zjd).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF MISSOURI. Attorney Kimberley G. Biagioli terminated. (Biagioli, Kimberley)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 REPLY to opposition to motion re #214 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L. Shencopp on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Shencopp, Erin)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF ILLINOIS. Attorney Erin L. Shencopp terminated. (Shencopp, Erin)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Memorandum in opposition to re #214 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding the 30(b)(6) data deposition by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Conrad, Joseph)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Charles Smurzynski on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Smurzynski, Kenneth)
September 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall brief the following two issues -- (1) the number of Rule 30(b)(6) notices that Plaintiffs may serve without leave of court and the dates by which those notices should be served; and (2) the appropriate date range for the topics specified in Plaintiffs' July 9 notice -- according to the following schedule: (1) Google shall file its opening brief by September 13, 2021; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their response brief by September 17, 2021; and (3) Google shall file its reply by September 22, 2021. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to ten double-spaced pages (excluding exhibits), and Google's reply shall be limited to seven double-spaced pages. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/12/2021. (lcapm2)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Kenney on behalf of YELP INC. (Kenney, Ellen)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Google and non-party Yelp shall file a Joint Status Report by September 14, 2021, advising whether there remain any disputed issues concerning Yelp's response to Google's document subpoena. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/7/2021. (lcapm2)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Yelp Inc. by GOOGLE LLC. (Waszmer, Wendy)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Dixon on behalf of YELP INC. (Dixon, Douglas)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Microsoft by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 9, 2021, as to their progress on terms concerning Plaintiffs' July 9 Rule 30(b)(6) deposition notice. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/3/2021. (lcapm2)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DUCK DUCK GO, INC.. Attorney Megan Gray terminated. (Gray, Megan)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ellen C. Kenney, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8706504. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by YELP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Consolino, Serine)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Douglas J. Dixon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8706490. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by YELP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Consolino, Serine)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Serine Consolino on behalf of YELP INC. (Consolino, Serine)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Louise Maxeiner on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Maxeiner, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 31, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-106. Date of Issuance: September 1, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchas ed from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2021.(wz)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #205 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ellen C. Kenney is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 9/1/2021. (lcapm2)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #204 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Douglas J. Dixon is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta 9/1/2021. (lcapm2)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 8/31/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REDACTED DOCUMENT- JOINT STATUS REPORT OF GOOGLE AND BOOKING HOLDINGS to #198 Sealed Document by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Microsoft (Redacted Version) by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report of Google and Microsoft (Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit Google's Exhibit A (Redacted Version), #3 Exhibit Google's Exhibit B (Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 1 (Redacted Version), #5 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 3 (Redacted Version), #7 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 4 (Redacted Version), #8 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 5 (Redacted Version), #9 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 7 (Redacted Version))(Schmidtlein, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on August 31, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings: (1) On or before September 3, 2021, Defendant will submit to the Colorado Plaintiffs available date(s) in September for the data deposition of a 30(b)(6) witness. (2) On or before September 15, 2021, Defendant and the Colorado Plaintiffs will submit to the court a Joint Status Report concerning any issues relating to the data deposition. (3) On or before September 3, 2021, Defendant and third party Microsoft will submit a Joint Status Report updating the court on the status of remaining discovery issues. (4) On or before September 3, 2021, Defendant and non-party Yelp will submit a Joint Status Report updating the court on any remaining issues with respect to search strings and custodians. (5) The parties shall appear for telephonic status conferences on the following dates: September 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m.; October 29, 2021, at 3:00 p.m.; and November 30, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report in advance of those hearings on September 24, 2021; October 26, 2021; and November 23, 2021, respectively. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information. Members of the public may access the conference by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/31/2021. (lcapm2)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #196 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/31/2021. (lcapm2)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 RESPONSE re #195 to Defendant Google LLC's Statement regarding Disputes Involving Compliance with Subpoenas Issued to Certain Third Parties (Redacted) filed by BOOKING HOLDINGS INC.. (Razi, Sara) Modified to add link on 9/7/2021 (znmw).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BOOKING HOLDINGS INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Razi, Sara)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 REDACTED DOCUMENT- STATEMENT REGARDING DISPUTES INVOLVING COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO CERTAIN THIRD PARTIES to #190 Sealed Document by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Position Statement of U.S Plaintiffs Request for the Court to Compel Discovery from Apple, Inc. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-B (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-C (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3-D (Redacted), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3-E (Redacted), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3-F (Redacted), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3-G (Redacted), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3-H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 3-I (Redacted), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 3-J (Redacted), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 3-K (Redacted), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 3-L (Redacted), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 3-M (Redacted), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 3-N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 3-O)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BOOKING HOLDINGS INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Razi, Sara)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Young Razi on behalf of BOOKING HOLDINGS INC. (Razi, Sara)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 11:00 AM will proceed via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube.(zjd)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER provisionally granting Non-Party Booking Holdings Inc.'s #193 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The court provisionally grants Non-Party's motion to seal, even though the motion does not set forth any justification for sealing. By September 2, 2021, Booking Holdings shall amend its motion to support sealing, in whole or in part, and submit a redacted version of its Response for the court's consideration. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/30/2021. (lcapm2)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery (Redacted Version) by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Waszmer, Wendy)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Google's Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Google's Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Microsoft's Exhibit 7, #10 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Hoeplinger on behalf of STATE OF MISSOURI (Hoeplinger, Stephen)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #182 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal and #184 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The United States Plaintiffs shall file redacted versions of their Position Statement and Exhibits, as proposed by third party Apple in ECF No. #184 . Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/27/2021. (lcapm2)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Joint STATUS REPORT of the United States and Non-Party Apple Inc. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE Regarding Non-Party Petitioner Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Under Seal and U.S. Plaintiffs' Request for the Court to Compel Discovery from Apple Inc. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by APPLE INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support US Position Statement, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 3-B, #5 Exhibit 3-C, #6 Exhibit 3-D, #7 Exhibit 3-E, #8 Exhibit 3-F, #9 Exhibit 3-G, #10 Exhibit 3-I, #11 Exhibit 3-J, #12 Exhibit 3-K, #13 Exhibit 3-L, #14 Exhibit 3-M)(Sunshine, Steven)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Hammond on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hammond, Matthew)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Joint Status Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Jesus Manuel Alvarado-Rivera terminated. (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT OF DISCOVERY HEARING VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 19, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-60. Date of Issuance: August 20, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2021.(wz)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 8/19/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER granting #164 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #176 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; and granting #178 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/19/2021. (lcapm2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the discovery hearing held on August 19, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings: (1) non-party Apple will provide deconstructed hit reports for the top five remaining disputed search strings (by hit volume) to the United States by August 23, 2021. Apple and the United States will meet and confer about the disputed remaining search strings by August 25, 2021, and they will submit to the court a Joint Status Report concerning those search strings by August 26, 2021. (2) Apple will complete substantial production of its response to the United States' subpoena for records by September 30, 2021. (3) The United States will submit to Apple a revised list of codename requests, limiting its request to 35 subject matters or inquiries, by August 23, 2021. Apple will submit to the United States responses to that list by August 30, 2021. (4) The parties will appear for the status conference already scheduled for August 31, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., prepared to update the court on these matters. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/19/2021. (lcapm2)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States, after consulting with non-party Apple, shall by August 26, 2021, file a proposed redacted version of its Position Statement (including exhibits), which is presently filed under seal at ECF No. #178 . See Stipulated Protective Order, ECF No. #98 , at 21 ("Upon or after filing any paper containing Highly Confidential Information or Confidential Information, the filing Party shall file on the public record a duplicate copy of the paper that does not reveal Highly Confidential Information or Confidential Information."). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/19/2021. (lcapm2)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 8/19/2021 at 10:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy has circulated connection information to counsel. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (zjd)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support US Position Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3-B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3-C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3-D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3-E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3-F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 3-G, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 3-H, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 3-I, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 3-J, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 3-K, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 3-L, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 3-M, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 3-N, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 3-O)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STATUS REPORT by APPLE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Redacted), #6 Exhibit F)(Sunshine, Steven)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by APPLE INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sunshine, Steven)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of APPLE INC. (Lent, Karen)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #174 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Karen Hoffman Lent is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/17/2021. (lcapm2)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 10:00 AM via video before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjch)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Karen Hoffman Lent, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8669884. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPLE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cameron Gower on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Gower, Richard)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The hearing previously scheduled for August 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m., will now be held at 10:00 a.m. on the same date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/16/2021. (lcapm2)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States and third party Apple shall submit their respective briefs, of no more than ten pages (excluding exhibits), concerning their discovery dispute by August 17, 2021. The parties shall hold August 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. for a hearing, subject to change. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/13/2021. (lcapm2)
August 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Google and non-party Microsoft shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 27, 2021, which updates the court on whether any disputes remain and, if so, sets forth their respective positions on such disputes. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/08/2021 (lcapm2).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Joint STATUS REPORT of Google and Microsoft by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara E.V. Trager on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Trager, Lara)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on July 30, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-83. Date of Issuance: August 2, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cou rt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2021.(wz)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 7/30/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status hearing held on July 30, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: 1) Google and non-party Microsoft shall submit a status report on or before August 6, 2021, which updates the court on the status of their negotiations over document custodians and, if necessary, proposes a date for a hearing on the issue; and 2) on or before August 9, 2021 and August 20, 2021, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report outlining their positions as to any remaining disputes over privilege in advance of the depositions noticed for August 12 and September 14, respectively. The parties need not file such report if there are no remaining issues in dispute in advance of the relevant deposition. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/30/2021. (lcapm2)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STATUS REPORT by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Redacted))(Simons, Caroline)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STATUS REPORT Regarding Disputes Involving Compliance with a Subpoena to Microsoft by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. DeMatteo on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (DeMatteo, Thomas)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta will now proceed in Courtroom 16. Members of the media may watch a livestream of the hearing in Overflow Courtroom 19.(zjd)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 11:00 AM will proceed before Judge Amit P. Mehta in Courtroom 10. The courtroom deputy has circulated connection information to counsel appearing remotely. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. Alternatively, members of the media may watch a livestream of the hearing in Overflow Courtroom 8. (zjd)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery (Redacted Version) by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Status Report, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Simons, Caroline)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Ballou on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Ballou, Brendan) (Main Document 162 replaced on 7/30/2021) (zeg).
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Edward Herrmann on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Herrmann, Karl)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Molle Maddox on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Maddox, Claire)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Kunal Janak Choksi on behalf of STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (Choksi, Kunal)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF NEBRASKA. (Conrad, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' respective Status Reports, ECF Nos. #156 , #157 , the hearing scheduled for July 14, 2021, to address discovery disputes with third parties is hereby vacated. If there remain unresolved disputes with third parties ripe for the court's consideration, the involved party shall set forth its position in the Status Report due on July 27, 2021, and the third party shall file its position by that date as well, so the court can address the matter at the hearing scheduled for July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/12/2021. (lcapm2)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STATUS REPORT Regarding Disputes Involving Compliance with Subpoenas Issued to Third Parties by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,,, Third-Party Discovery Disputes filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Simons on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Simons, Caroline)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caroline Simons, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-8578261. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tynes, Haley)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley P. Tynes on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Tynes, Haley)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #154 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Caroline Simons is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/6/2021. (lcapm2)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L McGinnis on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (McGinnis, Matthew)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 29, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-48. Date of Issuance: June 30, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249; Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/21/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2021.(wz)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 6/29/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status conference held on June 29, 2021, the court orders the following with respect to further proceedings in this matter: 1) the court will hold a hearing to resolve outstanding disputes involving third-party subpoenas on July 14, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. via videoconference; in advance of that hearing, by July 9, 2021, the parties and relevant third parties shall file statements outlining their positions as to the issues in dispute; 2) the parties in the Colorado Action shall file a Joint Status Report on or before July 14, 2021, updating the court on progress with respect to the Plaintiff States' data requests; and 3) the parties shall appear for status conferences on July 30, 2021 and August 31, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. In advance of those conferences, by July 27 and August 27, respectively, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report that (1) summarizes the state of discovery and (2) identifies any issues, and the parties' respective positions, that will be raised at the upcoming status conference. Any party wishing to attend the status conferences via videoconference may do so by coordinating with the courtroom deputy in advance of the hearing. Members of the public or media may access the conferences by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/29/2021. (lcapm2)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew L. McGinnis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8561048. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew L. McGinnis in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Popofsky, Mark)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta will proceed via videoconference. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (zjd)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #150 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Matthew L. McGinnis is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/28/2021. (lcapm2)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF COLORADO. (Sallet, Jonathan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Materials Under Seal. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/11/2021. (lcapm2)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials under Seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 JOINT STATUS REPORT by STATE OF COLORADO. (zjd)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Colorado Plaintiffs and Google shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 16, 2021, which updates the court on their information requests, including, as necessary, position statements on unresolved disputes. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/11/2021. (lcapm2)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla J. Baumel on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Baumel, Carla) (Main Document 143 replaced on 6/7/2021) (zeg).
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on May 27, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-58. Date of Issuance: May 28, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/18/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021.(wz)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER amending the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order, ECF No. 108-1, to include a paragraph on the sharing of materials across cases. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/27/2021. (lcapm2)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Lee Fruiterman on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Fruiterman, Erica)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt Schock on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Schock, Matt)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via videoconference on 5/27/2021. Joint Status Report by the parties in the Colorado action due 6/10/2021. Joint Status Report by all parties due 6/24/2021. Status Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection to counsel of record. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce MacKenzie on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (MacKenzie, Michael)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B Frank on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Frank, Matthew) (Main Document 137 replaced on 5/27/2021) (zeg).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Olson on behalf of STATE OF IDAHO (Olson, John)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference has been set for 5/27/2021 at 1:00 PM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy has circulated connection information to counsel. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube.(zjd)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Safty on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Safty, Graham)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on April 30, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-42. Date of Issuance: May 3, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2021.(wz)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear via videoconference for status conferences on May 27, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. and June 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. In advance of those conferences, by May 24 and June 24, respectively, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report that (1) summarizes the state of discovery, and (2) identifies any issues, and the parties' respective positions, that will be raised at the upcoming status conference. The courtroom deputy will circulate connection information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the conferences by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/30/2021. (lcapm2)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 4/30/2021 via videoconference. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STATE OF TEXAS. Attorney Kim Van Winkle terminated. (Van Winkle, Kim)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 11:00 AM via videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy has circulated connection information to counsel. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the Court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747 or by visiting the #Court's YouTube channel. Only the audio will be livestreamed on YouTube. (zjd)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 23, 2021, which updates the court on the status of discovery and whether any issues remain in dispute, and if so, the parties' positions as to those issues. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/19/2021. (lcapm2)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #128 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel has refiled said pleading in Docket Entry #129 . (eg)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Cavanaugh, Jr on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Cavanaugh, William) (Main Document 129 replaced on 4/5/2021) (zeg).
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Bruce Sallet on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Sallet, Jonathan) (Main Document 128 replaced on 4/5/2021) (zeg). Modified on 4/6/2021 (eg).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on March 30, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-78. Date of Issuance: April 1, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fr om the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2021.(wz)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 3/30/2021 via videoconference. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER amending the Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order, ECF No. 108-1, to include deadlines for third-party subpoenas. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/30/2021. (lcapm2)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the status hearing held on March 30, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2021, that updates the court on the status of discovery and whether any issues remain in dispute, and if so, outlines the parties' positions as to those issues. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/30/2021. (lcapm2)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Arlen Aguilar Aldape on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Aguilar Aldape, Diana) (Main Document 125 replaced on 3/30/2021) (zjf).
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery (Redacted Version) by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by GOOGLE LLC(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Heleringer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY (Heleringer, Philip)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Sloot on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA (Sloot, Christopher) (Main Document 121 replaced on 3/25/2021) (ztd).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re: #118 the parties' Joint Status Report. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/23/2021. (lcapm2)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Vogel on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA (Vogel, Dana) (Main Document 119 replaced on 3/24/2021) (zeg).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Joint STATUS REPORT by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA, STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TENNESSEE, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF WYOMING, TERRITORY OF GUAM, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Search Proposal, #2 Exhibit Google's Search Proposal)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties in the consolidated actions shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by March 18, 2021, which updates the court on their progress concerning search protocols and search terms. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/11/2021. (lcapm2)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties in the consolidated actions shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by March 10, 2021, which updates the court on their progress concerning search protocols and search terms. Also, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 26, 2021, which (1) summarizes the state of discovery, and (2) identifies any issues, and the parties' respective positions as to those issues, to be raised at the status hearing scheduled for March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/8/2021. (lcapm2)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Ryther on behalf of STATE OF UTAH (Ryther, Scott)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Materials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jensen, Elizabeth)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #114 the United States' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Materials. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/1/2021. (lcapm2)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on February 25, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-56. Date of Issuance: February 26, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2021.(wz)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #112 Status Report, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event. (eg)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 2/25/2021 via teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2021. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Supplemental STATUS REPORT on Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/26/2021 (zeg).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The United States shall submit a copy of the Requests for Production discussed in the Parties' Joint Status Report, ECF No. #111 , via e-mail to the law clerk by 9:30 a.m. on February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/24/2021. (lcapm2)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Joint STATUS REPORT on Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jensen, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties in these consolidated actions shall by February 23, 2021, file a Joint Status Report that (1) summarizes the state of discovery, and (2) identifies any issues, and the parties' respective positions, that will be raised at the upcoming status hearing. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/16/2021. (lcapm2)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint of State of Colorado, et al. by GOOGLE LLC.(Schmidtlein, John)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Linh K Tran on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Tran, Linh)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER entering AMENDED SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See the attached Order and Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/3/2021. (lcapm2) (Attachments: #1 Amended Scheduling and Case Management Order)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy W.H. Waszmer on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Waszmer, Wendy)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall submit Word versions of their Proposed Case Management Orders, Exhibits A and B to the parties' #105 Joint Status Report, via e-mail to the law clerk by 12:00 p.m. on February 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/2/2021. (lcapm2)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order for Discovery Coordination)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Case Management Order by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidtlein, John)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Catlett on behalf of STATE OF ARIZONA (Catlett, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ANSWER to #94 Amended Complaint, by GOOGLE LLC.(Schmidtlein, John)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie L. Deblieux on behalf of STATE OF LOUISIANA (Deblieux, Stacie) (Main Document 101 replaced on 1/28/2021) (zeg).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' #102 Joint Request for Extension of Time to Submit Status Report. The parties in the Colorado matter shall file a Joint Status Report regarding a modified Case Management Order on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/27/2021. (lcapm2)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on January 21, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-54. Date of Issuance: January 25, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal o r purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2021.(wz)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery procedure. This Order supersedes the #86 Stipulation and Order entered on December 21, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/21/2021. (lcapm2)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER entering Stipulated Protective Order. This Order supersedes the #84 Stipulated Protective Order entered on December 21, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/21/2021. (lcapm2)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Parrell D. Grossman on behalf of STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA (Grossman, Parrell) (Main Document 97 replaced on 1/22/2021) (zeg).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 1/21/2021 via teleconference. Status Conferences set for 2/25/2021 at 11:00 AM via teleconference, 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10, and 4/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel of record for the teleconference hearing. Members of the public may access the teleconference hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting a schedule for further proceedings in this consolidated matter. The State Plaintiffs in State of Colorado v. Google, shall begin making their initial production of the investigative file, as set forth in paragraph 7 of the Case Management Order, by no later than February 4, 2021. Furthermore, the parties in the Colorado matter shall file a supplemental Joint Status Report regarding a modified Case Management Order on or before January 27, 2021. The parties shall appear for telephonic status conferences on the following dates: February 25, 2021, at 11:00 a.m.; March 30, 2021, at 11:00 a.m.; and April 30, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information. Members of the public may access the conference by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/21/2021. (lcapm2)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Joint STATUS REPORT by STATE OF COLORADO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Stipulated Protective Order_, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery Procedure)(Sallet, Jonathan)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE AMENDED COMPLAINT by COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF WISCONSIN, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOOGLE LLC filed by STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF ARKANSAS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA.(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #92 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct case information. (eg)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. Please see the attached Standing Order No. 21-3, signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell, In Re: Procedures for the Filing, Service, and Management of Highly Sensitive Documents. (zjd)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Istrail on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Istrail, Lee) (Main Document 92 replaced on 1/15/2021) (zeg). Modified on 1/15/2021 (eg).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Hanson on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Hanson, Amy)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE Regarding Rule 12 Motion by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidtlein, John)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE. See the attached Notice for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/8/2021. (lcapm2)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Cases Consolidated. Case 20-3715 has been consolidated with case 20-3010, pursuant to an Order entered 01/07/2021. From this date forward, all pleadings should be filed in lead case 20-3010. Parties are advised NOT to elect the spread text option when filing in ECF. (eg)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint, Amended Pleadings, and Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2021. Fact Discovery shall conclude on 3/22/2022. Opening Expert Disclosures due by 4/21/2022. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/20/2022. Reply Expert Reports due by 8/9/2022. Expert Discovery shall conclude on 9/23/2022. Motions for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions due by 10/24/2022. Oppositions due by 12/8/2022. Replies due by 1/9/2023. Motions in Limine due by 8/1/2023. Oppositions due by 8/15/2023. Joint Submission due by 8/22/2023. This docket entry serves to enter deadlines into the CM/ECF database. Please refer to the #85 Scheduling and Case Management Order for full details. (zjd)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on December 18, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-82. Date of Issuance: December 22, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021.(wz)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOOGLE LLC.(Schmidtlein, John)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery procedure. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2020. (lcapm2)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2020. (lcapm2)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER entering Stipulated Protective Order. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/21/2020. (lcapm2)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Miller on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Miller, Adam)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Wang on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Wang, Brian)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan R Carter on behalf of STATE OF ARKANSAS (Carter, Johnathan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 12/18/2020 via teleconference. Submission due by 1/19/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 1/20/2021. Status Conference set for 1/21/2021 at 11:00 AM via teleconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel of record. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the telephonic status conference held on December 18, 2020, the court sets the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) the parties shall submit amended versions of the Proposed Protective Order and Case Management Order to chambers by 12:00 p.m. on December 21, 2020; and (2) the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on January 21, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2020. (lcapm2)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b)(1)(B), the motions to intervene filed by the states of California, Wisconsin, and Michigan, ECF Nos. #69 and #75 , are hereby granted. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint incorporating the amendments detailed in the intervening states' motions on or before the deadline for amending the pleadings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/18/2020. (lcapm2)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE re #69 MOTION for Joinder of Prospective Plaintiff State of California as Plaintiff, #75 MOTION for Joinder Prospective Plaintiff States of Wisconsin and Michigan for Joinder as Plaintiffs in the Instant Action filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Michael Purkey Goldstein on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Goldstein, Jeremy Michael)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Wisam Naoum on behalf of STATE OF MICHIGAN (Naoum, Wisam)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula L. Blizzard on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Blizzard, Paula)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Joinder Prospective Plaintiff States of Wisconsin and Michigan for Joinder as Plaintiffs in the Instant Action by WISCONSIN, STATE OF (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Prospective Plaintiff States of Wisconsin and Michigans Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Joinder as Plaintiffs, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Moving Parties States of Wisconsin and Michigans Motion for Joinder, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Cooley, Gwendolyn)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Gwendolyn Jean Cooley on behalf of WISCONSIN, STATE OF (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Cooley, Gwendolyn)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE Non-Parties' Position Statement on the Parties' Stipulated Protective Order by AT&T INC. re #72 Meet and Confer Statement (Limarzi, Kristen)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance and Reply Memorandum filed in MDL 2981 by STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI (Attachments: #1 Reply Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Proof of Service)(eg)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus) Modified event title on 12/16/2020 (znmw).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Creighton on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Creighton, Susan)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/18/2020. (zjd)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed ESI Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed CMO Order)(Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Joinder of Prospective Plaintiff State of California as Plaintiff by STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting State of California's Motion for Joinder as Plaintiff)(McCauley, Ryan)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Google LLC shall respond to State of California's motion for joinder, ECF No. #69 , by no later than December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/11/2020. (lcapm2)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Colette Connor on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Connor, Colette)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Friel on behalf of ORACLE CORPORATION (Friel, John)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on December 2, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-72. Date of Issuance: December 4, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal o r purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2021.(wz)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lynch on behalf of COMCAST CORPORATION, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Lynch, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Joseph Burke on behalf of COMCAST CORPORATION, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Burke, Arthur)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 12/2/2020 via teleconference. Revised Proposed Protective Order due by 12/14/2020. Third-Party Submission(s) due by 12/15/2020. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY Submission in Support of Protective Order filed by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(eg)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Lynch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7902398. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMCAST CORPORATION, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lynch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Arthur J. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7902315. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMCAST CORPORATION, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arthur J. Burke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Lynch, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Lynch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Arthur J. Burke, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by COMCAST CORPORATION, NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arthur J. Burke, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Solomon, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Kipling on behalf of T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Kipling, Michael)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie A. Walter on behalf of T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Walter, Marjorie)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on November 18, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-40. Date of Issuance: December 1, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2021.(wz)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The court denies #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. Counsel has not paid the $100 fee required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Once the payment is confirmed, the court will reconsider the motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2020. (lcapm2)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #55 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Submission Regarding Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2020. (lcapm2)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Lynch is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2020. (lcapm2)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Arthur J. Burke is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2020. (lcapm2)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The court denies #59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. Counsel has not paid the $100 fee required by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Once the payment is confirmed, the court will reconsider the motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2020. (lcapm2)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Submission in Support of Protective Order by GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of PO, #2 Exhibit 1 Danaye-Elmi Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 Kollios Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Supplemental Information re MDL No. 2981 by J. JACKSON PAIGE (zrdj)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Ceara Limarzi on behalf of AT&T INC. (Limarzi, Kristen)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE Non-Party DuckDuckGo's Position Statement on Protective Order by DUCK DUCK GO, INC. (Gray, Megan)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Non-Party Position Statement Regarding the Proposed Protective Order by GROUPM WORLDWIDE LLC re #34 Supplemental Memorandum (Sadowski, James)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE Non-Parties' Position Statement on the Protective Order by AT&T INC. (Aiken, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Hart Pepper Martin on behalf of STATE OF MISSISSIPPI (Martin, Elisabeth) (Main Document 49 replaced on 11/20/2020) (zeg).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Rancour on behalf of APPLE INC. (Rancour, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE (Non-Party Apple Inc.'s Position Statement on Protective Order) by APPLE INC. re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, (Sunshine, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Sunshine on behalf of APPLE INC. (Sunshine, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kristen C. Limarzi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7861480. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen C. Limarzi, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aiken, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kristen C. Limarzi is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/20/2020 (zjd).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by James Donald Sadowski on behalf of GroupM Worldwide LLC (Sadowski, James)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Friel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7855120. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ORACLE CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Friel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nickelsburg, Stephen)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Friel is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/19/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/20/2020 (zjd).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael E. Kipling is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/18/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/20/2020 (zjd).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 11/18/2020 via teleconference. Modified Rule 16.3 Statement due by 12/11/2020. Telephonic Status Conferences set for 12/2/2020 at 11:00 AM and 12/18/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER entering the following schedule, as discussed at the November 18, 2020 telephonic status hearing: (1) the parties shall appear for a telephonic status hearing to discuss the pending protective order on December 2, 2020, at 11:00 a.m.; (2) the parties shall meet and confer in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3, and submit a joint statement that includes proposals for a case management order on or before December 11, 2020; and (3) the parties shall appear for a telephonic status hearing to resolve any disputes raised in the parties' statement and to set a schedule for further proceedings in this matter on December 18, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/18/2020. (lcapm2)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Marjorie A. Walter is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a).#Click here for instructions Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/18/2020. (lcapm2) Modified on 11/20/2020 (zjd).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael E. Kipling, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7847414. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael E. Kipling, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Helgi)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Marjorie A. Walter, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7847350. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marjorie A. Walter, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Helgi)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Parker on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (Parker, Richard)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald F. Wick on behalf of DUCK DUCK GO, INC. (Wick, Ronald)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Maxman on behalf of DUCK DUCK GO, INC. (Maxman, Melissa)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Gray on behalf of Duck Duck Go, Inc. (Gray, Megan) Modified on 11/17/2020 (zjd).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Balikian on behalf of T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Balikian, Russell)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Helgi C. Walker on behalf of T-MOBILE USA, INC. (Walker, Helgi)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Status Report filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Comparison of Parties' Proposals)(Dintzer, Kenneth)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Proposed Protective Order)(Schmidtlein, John) Modified event title on 11/17/2020 (znmw).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE VIA TELECONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on October 30, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-44. Date of Issuance: November 12, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2021.(wz)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Non-Party Position Statements due by 11/20/2020. (zjd)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Nickelsburg on behalf of ORACLE CORPORATION, ORACLE CORPORATION (Nickelsburg, Stephen)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Jurata, Jr on behalf of Sonos, Inc. (Jurata, John)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Statements on Protective Order by AT&T INC. (Aiken, Matthew)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Wilkie Ray on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Ray, Amy)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Guice Aiken on behalf of AT&T INC. (Aiken, Matthew)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Non-Parties' Request for Additional Time to File Position Statements on the Protective Order, ECF No. #28 . Any non-party wishing to make its views known with respect to the proposed protective order shall make its filing by November 20, 2020. Such filing shall be no more than seven, double-spaced pages. Neither the parties nor the third parties need include hyperlinks in their submissions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/11/2020. (lcapm2)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica S Sullivan on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA (Sullivan, Erica)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.l(b) of PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407. by J. JACKSON PAIGE (zrdj)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #24 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to submit position statements outlining their respective positions on the disputed terms of a protective order, not to exceed ten pages, on or before November 13, 2020. Third parties wishing to be heard on the disputed terms of the protective order may also submit position statements, not to exceed seven pages, on or before November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/9/2020. (lcapm2)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Position Statements due by 11/13/2020. (zjd)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOGLE LLC. (Schmidtlein, John)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Glenn McLellan on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (McLellan, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by R. S. Palmer on behalf of STATE OF FLORIDA (Palmer, R.) (Main Document 22 replaced on 11/5/2020) (zeg).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W Mattioli on behalf of STATE OF MONTANA (Mattioli, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca McCormack Hartner on behalf of STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Hartner, Rebecca)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Paine on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Paine, Kelsey)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Van Winkle on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Van Winkle, Kim)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bret Fulkerson on behalf of STATE OF TEXAS (Fulkerson, Bret)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leroy Barnhart on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA (Barnhart, Scott)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Alan Michaloski on behalf of STATE OF INDIANA (Michaloski, Matthew)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held via teleconference on 10/30/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2020. Defendant's Notice due by 11/13/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures due by 11/20/2020. Status Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:30 AM via teleconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: (1) the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 6, 2020, which updates the court on the status of a protective order; (2) Defendant shall notify the court on or before November 13, 2020, of how it intends to respond to #1 the Complaint; (3) the parties shall appear for a telephonic status hearing on November 18, 2020, at 11:30 a.m.; and (4) the parties shall exchange their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before November 20, 2020. Initial disclosures shall be for attorneys' eyes only unless and until a protective order is in place or the court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2020. (lcapm2)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberley G. Biagioli on behalf of STATE OF MISSOURI (Biagioli, Kimberley)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Clark on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY (Clark, Justin)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chaim Alexander Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cohen, Chaim) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/29/2020) (zeg).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Skjelborg Jensen on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jensen, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Sandrock on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sandrock, Ryan)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin M. Rubinstein on behalf of All Defendants (Rubinstein, Franklin)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 10:00 AM Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Samuel Popofsky on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Popofsky, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status hearing on October 30, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The courtroom deputy shall circulate dial-in information. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2020. (lcapm2)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE LLC (Schmidtlein, John)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Schmidtlein on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Schmidtlein, John)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE. GOOGLE LLC waiver sent on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/19/2020. (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesus Manuel Alvarado-Rivera on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Alvarado-Rivera, Jesus)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE LLC filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ztnr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. GOOGLE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Johnathan R Carter
Represented By: David A.F. McCoy
Represented By: Keaton Lynn Barnes
Represented By: Matthew Michael Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Stacie L. Deblieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: R. S. Palmer
Represented By: Lee Istrail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Kelsey Paine
Represented By: Kim Van Winkle
Represented By: Bret Fulkerson
Represented By: Margaret Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Kimberley G. Biagioli
Represented By: Stephen M. Hoeplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Mark W Mattioli
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Anna Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Elisabeth Hart Pepper Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Rebecca McCormack Hartner
Represented By: Mary Frances Jowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Justin Clark
Represented By: Philip Heleringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jesus Manuel Alvarado-Rivera
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Dintzer
Represented By: Chaim Alexander Cohen
Represented By: Michael Glenn McLellan
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Purkey Goldstein
Represented By: Elizabeth Skjelborg Jensen
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: Jake Marvin Shields
Represented By: Matthew C. Hammond
Represented By: Richard Cameron Gower
Represented By: Thomas P. DeMatteo
Represented By: Brendan Ballou
Represented By: Christopher VanDeusen
Represented By: Claire Molle Maddox
Represented By: Diana Arlen Aguilar Aldape
Represented By: John Paul Foley
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Karl Edward Herrmann
Represented By: Lara E.V. Trager
Represented By: Meagan Kara Bellshaw
Represented By: Sarah Bartels
Represented By: Adam T. Severt
Represented By: Catharine Sydnie Wright
Represented By: Christine Sommer
Represented By: Lillian Okamuro
Represented By: Joshua Hafenbrack
Represented By: Sara Trent Gray
Represented By: Kerrie J. Freeborn
Represented By: Matthew Robert Jones
Represented By: Michael Rosengart
Represented By: James Thomas Greene
Represented By: Veronica N. Onyema
Represented By: Eric Schleef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Scott Leroy Barnhart
Represented By: Matthew Alan Michaloski
Represented By: Erica S Sullivan
Represented By: Christi Foust
Represented By: Ryan R. Frasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Abigail Leah Smith
Represented By: Diane Rebecca Hazel
Represented By: Jonathan Bruce Sallet
Represented By: Steven M. Kaufmann
Represented By: William F. Cavanaugh, Jr.
Represented By: Carla J. Baumel
Represented By: Erica Lee Fruiterman
Represented By: Erin L. Shencopp
Represented By: Matt Schock
Represented By: Conor J. May
Represented By: Elizabeth Winsor Hereford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: Joseph Conrad
Represented By: Matthew Keith McKinley
Represented By: Colin P. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]