Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court v. U.S. Congress et al
Plaintiff: Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court
Defendant: U.S. Congress, Ben Sasse, David Scott, Buddy Carter, Joe Wilson, Governor Jay Nixon, Lisa Murkowski, Ben R. Lujan, Richard Nugent, Paul D. Tonko, Morgan Griffith, Andy Harris, Bob Casey, Jr., Curt Clawson, Governor Dan Malloy, Steven Palazzo, Gary Palmer, Evan Jenkins, Rob Portman, Elise Stefanik, Mia Love, Mario Diaz-Balart, Albio Sires, David Loebsack, Governor Nathan Deal, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Steve Cohen, Governor Kate Brown, Greg Walden, George Holding, Pete Aguilar, John Shimkus, Garret Graves, John Conyers, Jr., Charles W. Dent, Steve Stivers, Jim Risch, Kelly Ayotte, Brett S. Guthrie, Kathy Castor, Ron Wyden, Paul A. Gosar, John Boozman, Glenn W. Thompson, Eric Swalwell, Associate Justice Stephen G. Breyer, John Does, Pedro Pierluisi, Kevin Cramer, Mac Thornberry, Kathleen Rice, Nancy Pelosi, Tom Price, Governor Gina Raimondo, Randy Neugebauer, Scott Rigell, Sean Patrick Maloney, Juan Vargas, Blake Farenthold, Brad Sherman, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Bob Corker, Pat Tiberi, Will Hurd, Debbie Stabenow, Gus M. Bilirakis, Steve Israel, Mike Lee, Janice Hahn, Tom McClintock, John Moolenaar, Elijah Cummings, Chief Justice John G. Roberts, Jr., Kyrsten Sinema, Mike Crapo, John Ratcliffe, Kristi Noem, Brian Higgins, Timothy J. Walz, Lee Zeldin, Bob Goodlatte, Chris Gibson, Roger Wicker, Rod Blum, Jim Costa, Governor C.L. Butch Otter, Robert Pittenger, Cory Gardner, Ron DeSantis, Al Green, Steve Chabot, Gregg Harper, Erik Paulsen, Maxine Waters, Raul R. Labrador, Tom Udall, Linda Sanchez, Frank LoBiondo, Ami Bera, Governor Doug Ducey, Joni Ernst, Governor Greg Abbott, John Hoeven, David G. Reichert, Kirsten Gillibrand, Raul Grijalva, Eliot Engel, Tom Carper, Jeff Merkley, Bill Flores, Governor Mike Pence, Cheri Bustos, Governor John Kasich, Jim Inhofe, Ron Kind, Lucille Roybal-Allard, David Cicilline, Governor Jack Dalrymple, Dave Brat, Orrin Hatch, Daniel Webster, Rand Paul, Governor Jack Markell, Associate Justice Anthony M. Kennedy, Billy Long, David Valadao, Governor Andrew Cuomo, Scott Peters, Frederica Wilson, Chris Stewart, Dave Trott, Niki Tsongas, Gary Peters, Carolyn Maloney, F. James Sensenbrenner, Tom MacArthur, James Comer, Governor David Ige, Patrick T, McHenry, Katherine Clark, Jerry Moran, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Ann Kuster`, Rick Nolan, Associate Justice Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Alma Adams, Governor Steve Bullock, Peter DeFazio, Seth Moulton, Rick Larsen, Steve Scalise, Stephen Fincher, Lamar Smith, Governor Eddie Calvo, Susan Collins, David Jolly, Ted Poe, Robert C. Scott, Trent Kelly, Dan Benishek, Harold Rogers, Bishop Rob, Andy Barr, Marco Rubio, Marcy Kaptur, Beto O'Rourke, John Thune, Mike Enzi, Charles W. Boustany, Jr., Elizabeth Warren, Paul Cook, Jamie Herrera Beutler, Joyce Beatty, Warren Davidson, Scott Tipton, Governor Dennis Daugaard, David Young, Roy Blunt, Jeff Denham, Dan Newhouse, Trey Gowdy, Amy Klobuchar, Fred Upton, Cedric Richmond, Mike Thompson, Marsha Blackburn, Johnny Isakson, Dwight Evans, Mike Bishop, Governor Asa Hutchinson, Jared Huffman, Kay Granger, Governor Terry Branstad, Denny Heck, Al Franken, Doug Collins, Pat Roberts, Governor Larry Hogan, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Susan W. Brooks, Governor Mary Fallin, G.K, Butterfield, Governor Bill Haslam, Tim Ryan, Tom Reed, John Katko, John J. Duncan, Jr., Mimi Walters, Gregory W. Meeks, Alex Mooney, Mark Meadows, Joe Donnelly, Governor Sam Brownback, Jeff Sessions, Madeleine Bordallo, Jason Smith, Chris Coons, Jim Bridenstine, Pete Sessions, Todd Young, Stephen F. Lynch, Governor Pat McCrory, Steve Knight, Markwayne Mullin, Governor Bruce Rauner, Justin Amash, Ted Lieu, James E. Clyburn, Glenn Grothman, Sean P. Duffy, Marcia L. Fudge, Heidi Heitkamp, Ed Markey, Jim Renacci, Donald Norcross, Mark Walker, Stacey Plaskett, Kevin Yoder, Rosa L. DeLauro, Mark Sanford, Tom Graves, Mike Quigley, Walter B. Jones, Jim Himes, Associate Justice Clarence Thomas, Austin Scott, Donna F. Edwards, Lois Capps, Angus King, Tim Scott, Jackie Speier, Joseph R. Pitts, Colleen Hanabusa, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Devin Nunes, Jeb Hensarling, Tipton Scott, Jim McDermott, Mark Takano, Robert J. Wittman, Bruce Poliquin, Kurt Schrader, Ann Wagner, Norma Torres, Debbie Dingell, Duncan D. Hunter, Tulsi Gabbard, Governor John Hickenlooper, James McGovern, Governor Rick Scott, John Mica, Associate Justice Sonia Sotomayor, Donald Trump, Joe Barton, Keith Rothfus, Ted Cruz, Mark Kirk, Mike Rogers, Richard Shelby, Ed Perlmutter, Robert Brady, Martin Heinrich, Sheldon Whitehouse, Tom Emmer, Ted Deutch, Barry Loudermilk, Tony Cardenas, Leonard Lance, Chuck Schumer, Jeff Duncan, Richard Hudson, U.S. President, Brad Ashford, Governor Bill Walker, Roger Williams, Donald Payne, Jr., U.S. Supreme Court, Bill Huizenga, Robert Aderholt, Adam Kinzinger, Pat Meehan, Salmon Matt Gregorio, Governor Bobby Jindal, Hakeem Jeffries, Bernie Sanders, Sam Johnson, Richard Hanna, Brian Babin, Jim Langevin, Kevin Brady, Mark DeSaulnier, Doug LaMalfa, Shelley Moore Capito, Governor Maggie Hassan, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Christopher S. Murphy, Don Beyer, Suzan DelBene, Tom Cole, Rob Bishop, Michael E. Capuano, Barbara Lee, John Carter, Chuck Grassley, Michael Turner, Lamar Alexander, James Lankford, Bob Dold, Kenny Marchant, Tammy Duckworth, Patrick Murphy, John Fleming, Grace Napolitano, Ben Cardin, Ryan Zinke, Diana DeGette, Jose E. Serrano, Diane Black, Gerald E. Connolly, Mark Amodei, Darrell Issa, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Governor Paul Lepage, Louie Gohmert, Ron Johnson, Ryan Costello, Chuck Fleischmann, Jim Cooper, Amata Radewagen, Loretta Sanchez, Ander Crenshaw, Keith Ellison, John Barrasso, Jack Reed, French Hill, Claire McCaskill, Collin C. Peterson, Bob Gibbs, Julia Brownley, Doug Lamborn, Adam Schiff, Nita Lowey, Thomas Massie, Michael K, Conaway, Robin Kelly, David Perdue, Dianne Feinstein, Majority Leader Mitch McConnell, Mike Honda, Peter Visclosky, Steve Womack, Governor Susana Martinez, Lindsey Graham, Steny H. Hoyer, Dan Coats, Matt Salmon, Dana Rohrabacker, Xavier Becerra, Randy J. Forbes, Adam Smith, Alan Grayson, Henry Cuellar, Tammy Baldwin, Corrine Brown, Vern Buchanan, John Lewis, Governor Steven L. Beshear, Tom Cotton, Ann Kirkpatrick, John A. Yarmuth, John Culberson, Sam Farrar, Chellie Pingree, Joe Heck, Governor Matt Mead, Jerrold Nadler, Daniel Donovan, Ted Yoho, Bill Johnson, Robert E. Latta, Bobby L. Rush, Renee Ellmers, Richard E. Neal, Anna G. Eshoo, Susan Davis, Harry Reid, Governor Nikki Haley, Don Young, Jan Schakowsky, Steve Pearce, Steve Russell, Governor Charlie Baker, Peter J. Roskam, Terri A. Sewell, Mo Brooks, Robert Woodall, Mazie K. Hirono, Danny K. Davis, Ruben Gallego, Luke Messer, Patrick Leahy, Daniel S. Sullivan, Darin LaHood, Barbara Comstock, Tom Marino, John Carney, Governor Chris Christie, Scott Perry, Mick Mulvaney, Henry C. Johnson, Jr., Mark Warner, Lynn A. Westmoreland, Bill Nelson, Alcee L. Hastings, Jeff Miller, Marc Veasey, Emanuel Cleaver, Frank Guinta, Jason Chaffetz, Nydia M. Velazquez, Ken Buck, Karen Bass, Jeanne Shaheen, Brenda Lawrence, Bruce Westerman, Randy Weber, Governor Pete Ricketts, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Pete King, Frank Pallone, Jr., Governor Phil Bryant, Brendan Boyle, Mike Bost, Mike Rounds, Mike Simpson, Carlos Curbelo, Mike Kelly, Patty Murray, Charles B. Rangel, Gwen Moore, Todd Rokita, Jackie Walorski, Associate Justice Elena Kagan, Trent Franks, Alan Lowenthal, Governor Tom Wolf, Mike Doyle, Ralph Abraham, Tim Huelskamp, Michael T. McCaul, John Cornyn, Governor Earl Ray Tomblin, Governor Terry McAuliffe, Judy Chu, Sheila Jackson Lee, Governor Brian Sandoval, Ken Calvert, Sam Graves, Raul Ruiz, Deb Fischer, Zoe Lofgren, David Joyce, Bill Posey, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr., David Schweikert, Yvette D. Clarke, Jeff Flake, Joaquin Castro, Mike Coffman, Martha McSally, Chris Collins, Cresent Hardy, Governor Peter Shumlin, Jerry McNerney, Pat Toomey, William Clay, Jr., Dennis Ross, Suzanne Bonamici, Reid Ribble, Sherrod Brown, Daniel Lipinski, Mark Pocan, Barbara Milulski, Bennie G. Thompson, Gwen Graham, John Delaney, Bill Cassidy, Steve King, Steve Daines, John Kline, Rick Allen, Debbie Schultz Wasserman, Chris Van Hollen, Governor Jay Inslee, Cynthia M. Lummis, Robert Hurt, Frank Lucas, Tim Walberg, William Keating, Michael Burgess, Jody Hice, Governor Rick Snyder, Rick Crawford, Derek Kilmer, Mary Does, Jon Tester, Andre Carson, Pete Olson, Tim Kaine, Sander Levin, Rodney Davis, Governor Scott Walker, Kevin McCarthy, Speaker Paul D. Ryan, Joseph Crowley, Tim Murphy, David Vitter, Barbara Boxer, Chris Smith, Dick Durbin, Thad Cochran, Governor Gary Herbert, Virginia Foxx, Scott DesJarlais, Jeff Fortenberry, Jared Polis, David Rouzer, Ruben Hinojosa, Filemon Vela, Peter Welch, Thom Tillis, Phil Roe, David Price, Earl Blumenauer, Tom Rice, Associate Justice Samuel Anthony Alito, Jr., Jim Jordan, David McKinley, Joe Courtney, Brian Menendez, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Luis Gutierrez, Randy Hultgren, Lloyd Doggett, Elizabeth Esty, Tom Rooney, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Cory Booker, Lois Frankel, John McCain, Dina Titus, Adrian Smith, Doris O. Matsui, Brian E. Schatz, Candice Miller, Richard Blumenthal, Louise Slaughter, John Garamendi, John P. Sarbanes, Governor Mark Dayton, John B. Larson, Mike Pompeo, Marlin Stutzman, Bill Shuster, Governor Robert Bentley, Richard Burr, Joe Manchin, III, Bill Foster, Grace Meng, Brad Wenstrup, Governor Edmund Brown, Vicky Hartzler, Maria Cantwell, Bill Pascrell, Jr., Betty McCollum, Matthew Cartwright, Gregorio Sablan, Michael Bennet, Gene Green, Larry Buschon, Scott Garrett, Dean Heller, Bonnie Watson Coleman, Daniel Kildee, Lou Barletta, Lynn Jenkins and Ed Royce
Case Number: 1:2016cv01490
Filed: December 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 82 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** COVER SHEET (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 81 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** LETTER (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 80 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** ACTS OF HIGH TREASON (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 79 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** FAKE LAW & FAKE COURTS (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 78 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** WRIT MANDAMUS (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 77 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** DEMOCRACY -v- REPUBLIC. (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 76 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019.*** FILE ON DEMAND UNDER PENALTY OF LAW (khr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 75 ***REJECTED by Order of the Court dated October 4, 2019*** LETTER (khr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER: Since its last Text Order docketed in this action, Dkt. No. 72 ("August 23, 2019 Text Order"), the Court has received numerous submissions in violation of the September 29, 2017 Bar Order, Dkt. No. 60 ("Bar Order"), which requires Plaintiff to obtain permission from the Court to file additional papers in this closed action. These submissions do not warrant a response by Defendants and will not be recognized by the Court. If Plaintiff does not pick up his submissions made subsequent to the August 23, 2019 Text Order from the James T. Foley Courthouse within 30 days of this Order, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to dispose of them. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on October 04, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 73 ***REJECTED BY ORDER OF THE COURT DATED AUGUST 23, 2019 *** - WRIT MANDAMUS TO ALL CLERKS AND VARIOUS OTHER DOCUMENTS. (khr)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER: On August 19, 2019, Plaintiff submitted a voluminous filing in violation of the September 29, 2017 Bar Order, Dkt. No. 60, which requires Plaintiff to obtain permission from the Court to file additional papers in this closed action. This submission does not warrant a response by Defendants and will not be recognized by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to pick up his August 19, 2019 submission within 30 days of this Order. Should Plaintiff fail to pick up this submission within the allotted time the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to dispose of it. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on August 23, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE titled "Information" filed on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court dated 1/24/2019. (jmb) Modified on 1/29/2019 to correct the title of the document. (jmb)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: On September 29, 2017, the Court barred plaintiff Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, from filing any additional papers in this action. Dkt. No. 60 ("Bar Order"). Plaintiff has nevertheless continued to submit filings in this action, in violation of the Bar Order. Docket. Until further order of the Court to the contrary, no submissions by Plaintiff shall be recognized by the Court. Submissions by Plaintiff do not warrant response from any defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 19, 2018. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
May 24, 2018 Filing 69 SHOW CAUSE document and Memorandum of Law filed by Petitioner Michael Hammer on behalf of the Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, Pro Se. (jmb)
May 18, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE titled "Show Cause" filed by Petitioner Stephen Scot Gregerson on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
May 14, 2018 Filing 67 SHOW CAUSE document filed with attached Affidavit of "Petitioner" Stephen Scot Gregerson and Memorandum of Law Non-Judicial Foreclosures and mailing envelope. (jmb)
April 11, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Forclosure, titled "SHOW CAUSE" filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, regarding petitioner Valtair Souza, with Affidavit and Memorandum of law and mailing envelope. (jmb)
April 11, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Forclosure, titled "SHOW CAUSE" filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, regarding petitioner Heriot D. Boyles, Jr., with Affidavit and Memorandum of law and mailing envelope. (jmb)
February 20, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE: Document titled "Indictment" filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, Pro Se. Clerk notes that this is a Closed Case, no action to be taken. (jmb) (Aattachments were also received on 2/20/2018 but weren't added until 3/13/2018 due to a delay in scanning: #1 Supporting Evidence - Attachment 1, #2 Supporting Evidence - Attachment 2) (jmb)
November 2, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of FILE ON DEMAND filed by Petitioner Crystal Mack, on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
November 2, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE of FILE ON DEMAND filed by Petitioner Elliot Roman Rodriguez, on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
November 2, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of FILE ON DEMAND filed by Petitioner Randall A. Gronewold, on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 BAR ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the motions filed by plaintiff Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court for a writ of mandamus (Dkt. No. 54) and orders to show cause (Dkt. Nos. 5559) be STRICKEN from the record. On August 17, 2017, the Court ordered that the Plaintiff is not allowed to file any additional papers in this action without prior permission of the Court. (Dkt. No. 50) Plaintiff has neither requested nor received permission to file its most recent motions. Plaintiff is hereby BARRED from making further submissions in this action without prior written approval from the Chief Judge of the Northern District of New York. Plaintiff is advised that additional filings in this action without permission from the Chief Judge may result in an order enjoining Plaintiff from all future filings in this District. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on September 29, 2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
September 26, 2017 Filing 59 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Jeffrey W. Smiles on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause relief regarding Non Judicial Tax Foreclosure, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
September 26, 2017 Filing 58 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Fareed Sepehry-Fard on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause relief regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Foreclosure, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
September 26, 2017 Filing 57 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Randall A. Grondwold on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause relief regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Foreclosure, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
September 26, 2017 Filing 56 Letter Motion filed by Petitioners Sergio Paul and Norma Rodriguez on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause relief regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Foreclosure, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
September 26, 2017 Filing 55 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Deborah Foster on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting for Show Cause relief regarding Non Judicial Mortgage Foreclosure, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
September 11, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus Show Cause or Act, filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 File on Demand Notice, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: This action was closed on July 17, 2017. Dkt. Nos. 36 ("Order"), 37 ("Judgment"). Plaintiff has neither appealed nor moved for reconsideration of the Court's Order. Docket. Nonetheless, Plaintiff continues to submit motions in this closed action. E.g., Dkt. Nos. 41-42, 45-49. Plaintiff's latest submission is a motion for an order to show cause against two non-parties, a Wisconsin state judge and what appears to be a home mortgage company. Dkt. No. 52 ("Motion"). Even if this case had not been closed, the Motion would be improper. But this case is closed, and so the Motion is doubly improper. The Clerk is therefore instructed to STRIKE Plaintiff's August 18, 2017 submission (Dkt. No. 52). If Plaintiff wishes to pursue new claims against new parties, it is free to commence a new action. But it is not free to burden the Court with its continued disregard of the simple fact that this action is closed and Plaintiff has failed to seek relief from the Court's Judgment through an appeal or an appropriate motion under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court will not consider any future filings unless authorized by an applicable rule or statute. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on August 25, 2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
August 18, 2017 Filing 52 ***STRICKEN***Letter Motion filed by Randy Lee Paul on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, requesting a cease of all Non Judicial Mortgage Foreclosure submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb) Modified on 8/25/2017 (sas).
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER : In furtherance of the Text Order to Strike dated August 17, 2017, Dkt. No. 50, the Clerk is directed to return to Plaintiff the DVD-R Disc filed as Dkt. No. 49. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 8/18/2017. (Copy served via regular mail along with Return of DVD-R Disc)(mgh)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER TO STRIKE: Despite the fact that this case was closed on July 17, 2017, Plaintiff continues to file submissions. See Dkt. Nos. 45-49. This case remains closed, and Plaintiff's submissions are improper. The Clerk is instructed to STRIKE Plaintiff's submissions dated August 2, 2017, and August 8, 2017, Dkt. Nos. 45-49. Plaintiff is advised that no further submissions will be accepted without prior permission of the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on August 17, 2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
August 10, 2017 Filing 49 ***STRICKEN***DVD-R Disc (Titled "911 Investigation Video") filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court submitted with the #48 Notices. {Disc on file with the Clerk in the Albany Clerk's Office, not available for electronic view} (jmb) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sas).
August 10, 2017 Filing 48 ***STRICKEN***NOTICE OF GRAND JURY REPORT REGARDING CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION: filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 File on Demand, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jmb) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sas).
August 2, 2017 Filing 47 ***STRICKEN***Motion submitted by Grand Jury Foreman on behalf of Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause Relief, references Petitioner Joseph Robert Eskel, submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jmb) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sas).
August 2, 2017 Filing 46 ***STRICKEN***Motion submitted by Grand Jury Foreman on behalf of Sovereigns of the Court requesting Show Cause Relief, references Petitioner Byron Gashler,submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jmb) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sas).
August 2, 2017 Filing 45 ***STRICKEN***Motion from Grand Jury Foreman on behalf of Sovereigns of the Court requesting Writ of Mandamus Relief submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Motion - Sent to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart) (jmb) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sas).
July 28, 2017 Filing 44 U.S. Postal RETURN RECEIPT received as to Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court served on Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court re 36 Text Order Dismissing Case #37 Judgment. (hmr)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: On July 19, 2017, Plaintiff moved for an order to show cause. Dkt. No. 38. The Court instructed the clerk to strike Plaintiff's submission because this case was closed on July 17, 2017. Dkt. No. 39. Apparently undeterred, Plaintiffs submitted two additional motions for orders to show cause on July 26, 2017. Dkt. Nos. 41, 42. This case remains closed, and Plaintiff's submissions are improper. The clerk is instructed to STRIKE Plaintiff's July 26 submissions, Dkt. Nos. 41, 42. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 27, 2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas,)
July 26, 2017 Filing 42 ***STRICKEN***MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury - Petitioner Elliot Roman Rodriguez.(hmr) Modified on 7/27/2017 (sas).
July 26, 2017 Filing 41 ***STRICKEN***MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury - Petitioner Asulu Williams.(hmr) Modified on 7/27/2017 (sas).
July 19, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court titled "Grand Jury Indictment for Concealment." (jel, )
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: On July 19, 2017, Plaintiff moved for an order to show cause. Dkt. No. 38. The Court dismissed Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice on July 17, 2017, Dkt. No. 36, and judgment has been entered for Defendants, Dkt. No. 37. This case is now closed, and Plaintiff's submission is improper. The clerk is instructed to STRIKE Plaintiff's July 19 submission, Dkt. No. 38. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 19, 2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(sas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 38 ***STRICKEN***MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury - Petitioner Messiah Johnson..(hmr) Modified on 7/19/2017 (sas).
July 17, 2017 Filing 37 JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Congress, U.S. President, U.S. Supreme Court, Adam Kinzinger, Adam Schiff, Adam Smith, Adrian Smith, Al Franken, Al Green, Alan Grayson, Alan Lowenthal, Albio Sires, Alcee L. Hastings, Alex Mooney, Alma Adams, Amata Radewagen, Ami Bera, Amy Klobuchar, Ander Crenshaw, Andre Carson, Andrew Cuomo, Andy Barr, Andy Harris, Angus King, Ann Kirkpatrick, Ann Kuster`, Ann Wagner, Anna G. Eshoo, Anthony M. Kennedy, Asa Hutchinson, Austin Scott, Barbara Boxer, Barbara Comstock, Barbara Lee, Barbara Milulski, Barry Loudermilk, Ben Cardin, Ben Sasse, Ben R. Lujan, Bennie G. Thompson, Bernie Sanders, Beto O'Rourke, Betty McCollum, Bill Cassidy, Bill Flores, Bill Foster, Bill Haslam, Bill Huizenga, Bill Johnson, Bill Nelson, Bill Pascrell, Jr, Bill Posey, Bill Shuster, Bill Walker, Billy Long, Bishop Rob, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Blake Farenthold, Bob Casey, Jr, Bob Corker, Bob Dold, Bob Gibbs, Bob Goodlatte, Bobby Jindal, Bobby L. Rush, Bonnie Watson Coleman, Brad Ashford, Brad Sherman, Brad Wenstrup, Brenda Lawrence, Brendan Boyle, Brett S. Guthrie, Brian Babin, Brian Higgins, Brian Menendez, Brian Sandoval, Brian E. Schatz, Bruce Poliquin, Bruce Rauner, Bruce Westerman, Buddy Carter, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, C.L. Butch Otter, Candice Miller, Carlos Curbelo, Carolyn Maloney, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Cedric Richmond, Charles B. Rangel, Charles W. Boustany, Jr, Charles W. Dent, Charlie Baker, Chellie Pingree, Cheri Bustos, Chris Christie, Chris Collins, Chris Coons, Chris Gibson, Chris Smith, Chris Stewart, Chris Van Hollen, Christopher S. Murphy, Chuck Fleischmann, Chuck Grassley, Chuck Schumer, Claire McCaskill, Clarence Thomas, Colleen Hanabusa, Collin C. Peterson, Corrine Brown, Cory Booker, Cory Gardner, Cresent Hardy, Curt Clawson, Cynthia M. Lummis, Dan Benishek, Dan Coats, Dan Malloy, Dan Newhouse, Dana Rohrabacker, Daniel Donovan, Daniel Kildee, Daniel Lipinski, Daniel Webster, Daniel S. Sullivan, Danny K. Davis, Darin LaHood, Darrell Issa, Dave Brat, Dave Trott, David Cicilline, David Ige, David Jolly, David Joyce, David Loebsack, David McKinley, David Perdue, David Price, David Rouzer, David Schweikert, David Scott, David Valadao, David Vitter, David Young, David G. Reichert, Dean Heller, Deb Fischer, Debbie Dingell, Debbie Schultz Wasserman, Debbie Stabenow, Dennis Daugaard, Dennis Ross, Denny Heck, Derek Kilmer, Devin Nunes, Diana DeGette, Diane Black, Dianne Feinstein, Dick Durbin, Dina Titus, Don Beyer, Don Young, Donald Norcross, Donald Payne, Jr, Donald Trump, Donna F. Edwards, Doris O. Matsui, Doug Collins, Doug Ducey, Doug LaMalfa, Doug Lamborn, Duncan D. Hunter, Dwight Evans, Earl Blumenauer, Earl Ray Tomblin, Ed Markey, Ed Perlmutter, Ed Royce, Eddie Calvo, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Edmund Brown, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Elena Kagan, Elijah Cummings, Eliot Engel, Elise Stefanik, Elizabeth Esty, Elizabeth Warren, Emanuel Cleaver, Eric Swalwell, Erik Paulsen, Evan Jenkins, F. James Sensenbrenner, Filemon Vela, Frank Guinta, Frank LoBiondo, Frank Lucas, Frank Pallone, Jr, Fred Upton, Frederica Wilson, French Hill, G.K, Butterfield, Garret Graves, Gary Herbert, Gary Palmer, Gary Peters, Gene Green, George Holding, Gerald E. Connolly, Gina Raimondo, Glenn Grothman, Glenn W. Thompson, Grace Meng, Grace Napolitano, Greg Abbott, Greg Walden, Gregg Harper, Gregorio Sablan, Gregory W. Meeks, Gus M. Bilirakis, Gwen Graham, Gwen Moore, Hakeem Jeffries, Harold Rogers, Harry Reid, Heidi Heitkamp, Henry Cuellar, Henry C. Johnson, Jr, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Jack Dalrymple, Jack Markell, Jack Reed, Jackie Speier, Jackie Walorski, James Comer, James Lankford, James McGovern, James E. Clyburn, Jamie Herrera Beutler, Jan Schakowsky, Janice Hahn, Jared Huffman, Jared Polis, Jason Chaffetz, Jason Smith, Jay Inslee, Jay Nixon, Jeanne Shaheen, Jeb Hensarling, Jeff Denham, Jeff Duncan, Jeff Flake, Jeff Fortenberry, Jeff Merkley, Jeff Miller, Jeff Sessions, Jerrold Nadler, Jerry McNerney, Jerry Moran, Jim Bridenstine, Jim Cooper, Jim Costa, Jim Himes, Jim Inhofe, Jim Jordan, Jim Langevin, Jim McDermott, Jim Renacci, Jim Risch, Joaquin Castro, Jody Hice, Joe Barton, Joe Courtney, Joe Donnelly, Joe Heck, Joe Manchin, III, Joe Wilson, John Barrasso, John Boozman, John Carney, John Carter, John Conyers, Jr, John Cornyn, John Culberson, John Delaney, John Does, John Fleming, John Garamendi, John Hickenlooper, John Hoeven, John Kasich, John Katko, John Kline, John Lewis, John McCain, John Mica, John Moolenaar, John Ratcliffe, John Shimkus, John Thune, John A. Yarmuth, John B. Larson, John G. Roberts, Jr, John J. Duncan, Jr, John P. Sarbanes, Johnny Isakson, Jon Tester, Joni Ernst, Jose E. Serrano, Joseph Crowley, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Joseph R. Pitts, Joyce Beatty, Juan Vargas, Judy Chu, Julia Brownley, Justin Amash, Karen Bass, Kate Brown, Katherine Clark, Kathleen Rice, Kathy Castor, Kay Granger, Keith Ellison, Keith Rothfus, Kelly Ayotte, Ken Buck, Ken Calvert, Kenny Marchant, Kevin Brady, Kevin Cramer, Kevin McCarthy, Kevin Yoder, Kirsten Gillibrand, Kristi Noem, Kurt Schrader, Kyrsten Sinema, Lamar Alexander, Lamar Smith, Larry Buschon, Larry Hogan, Lee Zeldin, Leonard Lance, Linda Sanchez, Lindsey Graham, Lisa Murkowski, Lloyd Doggett, Lois Capps, Lois Frankel, Loretta Sanchez, Lou Barletta, Louie Gohmert, Louise Slaughter, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Luis Gutierrez, Luke Messer, Lynn Jenkins, Lynn A. Westmoreland, Mac Thornberry, Madeleine Bordallo, Maggie Hassan, Marc Veasey, Marcia L. Fudge, Marco Rubio, Marcy Kaptur, Maria Cantwell, Mario Diaz-Balart, Mark Amodei, Mark Dayton, Mark DeSaulnier, Mark Kirk, Mark Meadows, Mark Pocan, Mark Sanford, Mark Takano, Mark Walker, Mark Warner, Markwayne Mullin, Marlin Stutzman, Marsha Blackburn, Martha McSally, Martin Heinrich, Mary Does, Mary Fallin, Matt Mead, Matt Salmon, Matthew Cartwright, Maxine Waters, Mazie K. Hirono, Mia Love, Michael Bennet, Michael Burgess, Michael Turner, Michael E. Capuano, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Michael K, Conaway, Michael T. McCaul, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Mick Mulvaney, Mike Bishop, Mike Bost, Mike Coffman, Mike Crapo, Mike Doyle, Mike Enzi, Mike Honda, Mike Kelly, Mike Lee, Mike Pence, Mike Pompeo, Mike Quigley, Mike Rogers, Mike Rounds, Mike Simpson, Mike Thompson, Mimi Walters, Mitch McConnell, Mo Brooks, Morgan Griffith, Nancy Pelosi, Nathan Deal, Niki Tsongas, Nikki Haley, Nita Lowey, Norma Torres, Nydia M. Velazquez, Orrin Hatch, Pat McCrory, Pat Meehan, Pat Roberts, Pat Tiberi, Pat Toomey, Patrick Leahy, Patrick Murphy, Patrick T, McHenry, Patty Murray, Paul Cook, Paul Lepage, Paul A. Gosar, Paul D. Ryan, Paul D. Tonko, Pedro Pierluisi, Pete Aguilar, Pete King, Pete Olson, Pete Ricketts, Pete Sessions, Peter DeFazio, Peter Shumlin, Peter Visclosky, Peter Welch, Peter J. Roskam, Phil Bryant, Phil Roe, Ralph Abraham, Rand Paul, Randy Hultgren, Randy Neugebauer, Randy Weber, Randy J. Forbes, Raul Grijalva, Raul Ruiz, Raul R. Labrador, Reid Ribble, Renee Ellmers, Richard Blumenthal, Richard Burr, Richard Hanna, Richard Hudson, Richard Nugent, Richard Shelby, Richard E. Neal, Rick Allen, Rick Crawford, Rick Larsen, Rick Nolan, Rick Scott, Rick Snyder, Rob Bishop, Rob Portman, Robert Aderholt, Robert Bentley, Robert Brady, Robert Hurt, Robert Pittenger, Robert Woodall, Robert C. Scott, Robert E. Latta, Robert J. Wittman, Robin Kelly, Rod Blum, Rodney Davis, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Roger Wicker, Roger Williams, Ron DeSantis, Ron Johnson, Ron Kind, Ron Wyden, Rosa L. DeLauro, Roy Blunt, Ruben Gallego, Ruben Hinojosa, Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Ryan Costello, Ryan Zinke, Salmon Matt Gregorio, Sam Brownback, Sam Farrar, Sam Graves, Sam Johnson, Samuel Anthony Alito, Jr, Sander Levin, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr, Scott DesJarlais, Scott Garrett, Scott Perry, Scott Peters, Scott Rigell, Scott Tipton, Scott Walker, Sean P. Duffy, Sean Patrick Maloney, Seth Moulton, Sheila Jackson Lee, Sheldon Whitehouse, Shelley Moore Capito, Sherrod Brown, Sonia Sotomayor, Stacey Plaskett, Steny H. Hoyer, Stephen Fincher, Stephen F. Lynch, Stephen G. Breyer, Steve Bullock, Steve Chabot, Steve Cohen, Steve Daines, Steve Israel, Steve King, Steve Knight, Steve Pearce, Steve Russell, Steve Scalise, Steve Stivers, Steve Womack, Steven Palazzo, Steven L. Beshear, Susan Collins, Susan Davis, Susan W. Brooks, Susana Martinez, Suzan DelBene, Suzanne Bonamici, Tammy Baldwin, Tammy Duckworth, Ted Cruz, Ted Deutch, Ted Lieu, Ted Poe, Ted Yoho, Terri A. Sewell, Terry Branstad, Terry McAuliffe, Thad Cochran, Thom Tillis, Thomas Massie, Tim Huelskamp, Tim Kaine, Tim Murphy, Tim Ryan, Tim Scott, Tim Walberg, Timothy J. Walz, Tipton Scott, Todd Rokita, Todd Young, Tom Carper, Tom Cole, Tom Cotton, Tom Emmer, Tom Graves, Tom MacArthur, Tom Marino, Tom McClintock, Tom Price, Tom Reed, Tom Rice, Tom Rooney, Tom Udall, Tom Wolf, Tony Cardenas, Trent Franks, Trent Kelly, Trey Gowdy, Tulsi Gabbard, Vern Buchanan, Vicky Hartzler, Virginia Foxx, Walter B. Jones, Warren Davidson, Will Hurd, William Clay, Jr, William Keating, Xavier Becerra, Yvette D. Clarke, Zoe Lofgren against Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (sas)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER: On June 14, 2017, the Court dismissed Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) without prejudice because Plaintiff, which appears to be an organization composed of thousands of members across the United States, was improperly proceeding without a lawyer. Dkt. No. 27 ("June Order") at 3-4. The Court gave Plaintiff thirty days to obtain counsel and warned that if it failed to do so, the Court would dismiss the action with prejudice. Id. While Plaintiff has filed several documents with the Court since the June Order, no lawyer has appeared on its behalf, and it has not requested an extension of time to obtain counsel. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this action with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 17, 2017. (Copy served via regular and certified)(sas)
July 12, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury as Next Friend of Randy Lee Paul. {Envelope attached}.(rep)
July 12, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury as Next Friend of Petitioner Robert Geral Overheul and Sharon Dawn Covey Overheul. {Envelope attached}.(rep)
July 12, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury as Next Friend of Frederick J. Nuzzo. {Envelope attached}.(rep)
July 12, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE/MEMORANDUM OF LAW: Filed by the Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury as Next Friend of Petitioner Theron Jay Marrs. {Envelope attached}. (rep)
June 26, 2017 Filing 31 Letter Motion from Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court for Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting issuance of a Writ of Error Coram Nobis submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jmb)
June 21, 2017 Filing 30 Certified Mail Return Receipt regarding service of the #27 Order, sent to Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
June 15, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Governor A. Cuomo, NYS. Senate Majority Leader John J. Flanagan and NYS Assembly Speaker Carl E. Heastie filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
June 15, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lawrence K. Baerman, Clerk of Court filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECISION AND ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and it is further ORDERED, that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, it must obtain counsel within thirty days of this Decision and Order; and it is further ORDERED, that if Plaintiff fails to obtain counsel within thirty days, the Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) shall be dismissed with prejudice, without further order of the Court. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on June 14, 2017. (Copy served via regular and certified)(sas)
June 12, 2017 Filing 26 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Thomas G. Williams on behalf Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting an Order to Show Cause be issued, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 25 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Felicia Collins on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting an Order to Show Cause be issued, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 24 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Janice M. Jackson on behalf Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting an Order to Show Cause be issued, submitted to Judge Larence E. Kahn. (jmb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 23 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner D'Annie Isra El on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting an Order to Show Cause be issued submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 22 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner Thomas Lee Anderson, on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting for an Order to Show Cause to be issued, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
June 12, 2017 Filing 21 Letter Motion filed by Petitioner John Walter Sprouse on behalf of Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting an Order to Show Cause be issued, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. (jmb)
May 15, 2017 Filing 20 Document titled "INFORMATION BRIEF CLARIFYING THIS EXTRAORDINARY PROCEEDING": filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
April 19, 2017 Filing 19 SECOND SUPPLEMENT to the #16 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, with various attachments. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of the Common Law, #2 Memorandum of Law in support of standing, #3 Mailing Envelope - Post Marked 4/17/2017) (jmb)
April 19, 2017 Filing 18 FIRST SUPPLEMENT to the #16 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, with various attachments. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - post marked 4/17/2017) (jmb)
April 19, 2017 Filing 17 Letter Motion from John D. Hoggan, Jr. for Ralph Abraham, Alma Adams, Robert Aderholt, Pete Aguilar, Lamar Alexander, Samuel Anthony Alito, Jr, Rick Allen, Justin Amash, Mark Amodei, Brad Ashford, Kelly Ayotte, Brian Babin, Tammy Baldwin, Lou Barletta, Andy Barr, John Barrasso, Joe Barton, Karen Bass, Joyce Beatty, Xavier Becerra, Dan Benishek, Michael Bennet, Ami Bera, Don Beyer, Gus M. Bilirakis, Mike Bishop, Rob Bishop, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr, Diane Black, Marsha Blackburn, Rod Blum, Earl Blumenauer, Richard Blumenthal, Roy Blunt, Suzanne Bonamici, Cory Booker, John Boozman, Madeleine Bordallo, Mike Bost, Charles W. Boustany, Jr, Barbara Boxer, Brendan Boyle, Kevin Brady, Robert Brady, Dave Brat, Stephen G. Breyer, Jim Bridenstine, Mo Brooks, Susan W. Brooks, Corrine Brown, Sherrod Brown, Julia Brownley, Phil Bryant, Vern Buchanan, Ken Buck, Michael Burgess, Richard Burr, Larry Buschon, Cheri Bustos, G.K, Butterfield, Ken Calvert, Maria Cantwell, Shelley Moore Capito, Lois Capps, Michael E. Capuano, Tony Cardenas, Ben Cardin, John Carney, Tom Carper, Andre Carson, Buddy Carter, John Carter, Matthew Cartwright, Bob Casey, Jr, Bill Cassidy, Kathy Castor, Joaquin Castro, Steve Chabot, Jason Chaffetz, Judy Chu, David Cicilline, Katherine Clark, Yvette D. Clarke, Curt Clawson, William Clay, Jr, Emanuel Cleaver, James E. Clyburn, Dan Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Coffman, Steve Cohen, Tom Cole, Chris Collins, Doug Collins, Susan Collins, James Comer, Barbara Comstock, Michael K, Conaway, Gerald E. Connolly, John Conyers, Jr, Paul Cook, Chris Coons, Jim Cooper, Bob Corker, John Cornyn, Jim Costa, Ryan Costello, Tom Cotton, Joe Courtney, Kevin Cramer, Mike Crapo, Rick Crawford, Ander Crenshaw, Joseph Crowley, Ted Cruz, Henry Cuellar, John Culberson, Elijah Cummings, Carlos Curbelo, Steve Daines, Warren Davidson, Danny K. Davis, Rodney Davis, Susan Davis, Peter DeFazio, Diana DeGette, Rosa L. DeLauro, Ron DeSantis, Mark DeSaulnier, Nathan Deal, Suzan DelBene, John Delaney, Jeff Denham, Charles W. Dent, Scott DesJarlais, Ted Deutch, Mario Diaz-Balart, Debbie Dingell, John Does, Mary Does, Lloyd Doggett, Bob Dold, Joe Donnelly, Daniel Donovan, Mike Doyle, Tammy Duckworth, Sean P. Duffy, Jeff Duncan, John J. Duncan, Jr, Dick Durbin, Donna F. Edwards, Keith Ellison, Renee Ellmers, Tom Emmer, Eliot Engel, Mike Enzi, Joni Ernst, Anna G. Eshoo, Elizabeth Esty, Dwight Evans, Blake Farenthold, Sam Farrar, Dianne Feinstein, Stephen Fincher, Deb Fischer, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Jeff Flake, Chuck Fleischmann, John Fleming, Bill Flores, Randy J. Forbes, Jeff Fortenberry, Bill Foster, Virginia Foxx, Lois Frankel, Al Franken, Trent Franks, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Marcia L. Fudge, Tulsi Gabbard, Ruben Gallego, John Garamendi, Cory Gardner, Scott Garrett, Bob Gibbs, Chris Gibson, Kirsten Gillibrand, Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Louie Gohmert, Bob Goodlatte, Paul A. Gosar, Trey Gowdy, Gwen Graham, Lindsey Graham, Kay Granger, Chuck Grassley, Garret Graves, Sam Graves, Tom Graves, Alan Grayson, Al Green, Gene Green, Salmon Matt Gregorio, Morgan Griffith, Raul Grijalva, Glenn Grothman, Frank Guinta, Brett S. Guthrie, Luis Gutierrez, Janice Hahn, Colleen Hanabusa, Richard Hanna, Cresent Hardy, Gregg Harper, Andy Harris, Vicky Hartzler, Alcee L. Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Denny Heck, Joe Heck, Martin Heinrich, Heidi Heitkamp, Dean Heller, Jeb Hensarling, Jamie Herrera Beutler, Jody Hice, Brian Higgins, French Hill, Jim Himes, Ruben Hinojosa, Mazie K. Hirono, John Hoeven, George Holding, Mike Honda, Steny H. Hoyer, Richard Hudson, Tim Huelskamp, Jared Huffman, Bill Huizenga, Randy Hultgren, Duncan D. Hunter, Will Hurd, Robert Hurt, Jim Inhofe, Johnny Isakson, Steve Israel, Darrell Issa, Sheila Jackson Lee, Hakeem Jeffries, Evan Jenkins, Lynn Jenkins, Bill Johnson, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Henry C. Johnson, Jr, Ron Johnson, Sam Johnson, David Jolly, Walter B. Jones, Jim Jordan, David Joyce, Elena Kagan, Tim Kaine, Marcy Kaptur, John Katko, William Keating, Mike Kelly, Robin Kelly, Trent Kelly, Anthony M. Kennedy, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Daniel Kildee, Derek Kilmer, Ron Kind, Angus King, Pete King, Steve King, Adam Kinzinger, Mark Kirk, Ann Kirkpatrick, John Kline, Amy Klobuchar, Steve Knight, Ann Kuster`, Darin LaHood, Doug LaMalfa, Raul R. Labrador, Doug Lamborn, Leonard Lance, Jim Langevin, James Lankford, Rick Larsen, John B. Larson, Robert E. Latta, Brenda Lawrence, Patrick Leahy, Mike Lee, Barbara Lee, Sander Levin, John Lewis, Ted Lieu, Daniel Lipinski, Frank LoBiondo, David Loebsack, Zoe Lofgren, Billy Long, Barry Loudermilk, Mia Love, Alan Lowenthal, Nita Lowey, Frank Lucas, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Ben R. Lujan, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Cynthia M. Lummis, Stephen F. Lynch, Tom MacArthur, Carolyn Maloney, Sean Patrick Maloney, Joe Manchin, III, Kenny Marchant, Tom Marino, Ed Markey, Thomas Massie, Doris O. Matsui, John McCain, Kevin McCarthy, Claire McCaskill, Michael T. McCaul, Tom McClintock, Betty McCollum, Mitch McConnell, Jim McDermott, James McGovern, Patrick T, McHenry, David McKinley, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Jerry McNerney, Martha McSally, Mark Meadows, Pat Meehan, Gregory W. Meeks, Brian Menendez, Grace Meng, Jeff Merkley, Luke Messer, John Mica, Jeff Miller, Candice Miller, Barbara Milulski, John Moolenaar, Alex Mooney, Gwen Moore, Jerry Moran, Seth Moulton, Markwayne Mullin, Mick Mulvaney, Lisa Murkowski, Christopher S. Murphy, Patrick Murphy, Tim Murphy, Patty Murray, Jerrold Nadler, Grace Napolitano, Richard E. Neal, Bill Nelson, Randy Neugebauer, Dan Newhouse, Kristi Noem, Rick Nolan, Donald Norcross, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Richard Nugent, Devin Nunes, Beto O'Rourke, Pete Olson, Steven Palazzo, Frank Pallone, Jr, Gary Palmer, Bill Pascrell, Jr, Rand Paul, Erik Paulsen, Donald Payne, Jr, Steve Pearce, Nancy Pelosi, Mike Pence, David Perdue, Ed Perlmutter, Scott Perry, Gary Peters, Scott Peters, Collin C. Peterson, Pedro Pierluisi, Chellie Pingree, Robert Pittenger, Joseph R. Pitts, Stacey Plaskett, Mark Pocan, Ted Poe, Bruce Poliquin, Jared Polis, Mike Pompeo, Rob Portman, Bill Posey, David Price, Tom Price, Mike Quigley, Amata Radewagen, Charles B. Rangel, John Ratcliffe, Jack Reed, Tom Reed, David G. Reichert, Harry Reid, Jim Renacci, Reid Ribble, Kathleen Rice, Tom Rice, Cedric Richmond, Scott Rigell, Jim Risch, Bishop Rob, John G. Roberts, Jr, Pat Roberts, Phil Roe, Harold Rogers, Mike Rogers, Dana Rohrabacker, Todd Rokita, Tom Rooney, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Peter J. Roskam, Dennis Ross, Keith Rothfus, Mike Rounds, David Rouzer, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Ed Royce, Marco Rubio, Raul Ruiz, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Bobby L. Rush, Steve Russell, Paul D. Ryan, Tim Ryan, Gregorio Sablan, Matt Salmon, Linda Sanchez, Loretta Sanchez, Bernie Sanders, Mark Sanford, John P. Sarbanes, Ben Sasse, Steve Scalise, Jan Schakowsky, Brian E. Schatz, Adam Schiff, Kurt Schrader, Debbie Schultz Wasserman, Chuck Schumer, David Schweikert, Austin Scott, David Scott, Robert C. Scott, Tim Scott, Tipton Scott, F. James Sensenbrenner, Jose E. Serrano, Jeff Sessions, Pete Sessions, Terri A. Sewell, Jeanne Shaheen, Richard Shelby, Brad Sherman, John Shimkus, Bill Shuster, Mike Simpson, Kyrsten Sinema, Albio Sires, Louise Slaughter, Adam Smith, Chris Smith, Jason Smith, Lamar Smith, Adrian Smith, Sonia Sotomayor, Jackie Speier, Debbie Stabenow, Elise Stefanik, Chris Stewart, Steve Stivers, Marlin Stutzman, Daniel S. Sullivan, Eric Swalwell, Mark Takano, Jon Tester, Clarence Thomas, Bennie G. Thompson, Glenn W. Thompson, Mike Thompson, Mac Thornberry, John Thune, Pat Tiberi, Thom Tillis, Scott Tipton, Dina Titus, Paul D. Tonko, Pat Toomey, Norma Torres, Dave Trott, Donald Trump, Niki Tsongas, Michael Turner, U.S. Congress, U.S. President, U.S. Supreme Court, Tom Udall, Fred Upton, David Valadao, Chris Van Hollen, Juan Vargas, Marc Veasey, Filemon Vela, Nydia M. Velazquez, Peter Visclosky, David Vitter, Ann Wagner, Tim Walberg, Greg Walden, Mark Walker, Jackie Walorski, Mimi Walters, Timothy J. Walz, Mark Warner, Elizabeth Warren, Maxine Waters, Bonnie Watson Coleman, Randy Weber, Daniel Webster, Peter Welch, Brad Wenstrup, Bruce Westerman, Lynn A. Westmoreland, Sheldon Whitehouse, Roger Wicker, Roger Williams, Frederica Wilson, Joe Wilson, Robert J. Wittman, Steve Womack, Robert Woodall, Ron Wyden, John A. Yarmuth, Kevin Yoder, Ted Yoho, David Young, Don Young, Todd Young, Lee Zeldin, Ryan Zinke requesting Plaintiffs Pleadings Be Stricken and the Matter Be Dismissed Without Prejudice submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hoggan, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Lawrence K. Baerman, Clerk of Court, filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
March 23, 2017 Filing 15 DOCUMENT TITLED "INFORMATION", with a sub title on that document that reads "Crime To Intercept" dated 3/20/2017 filed by Grand Jury Foreman (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
March 16, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 8, 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(5) Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2017 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 4/4/2017 Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/10/2017. filed by Andrew Cuomo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Santandrea with Exhibits 1-2 Attached, #3 Appendix of Unreported Cases, #4 Declaration of Service Via Regular Mail Upon Pro Se Plaintiff) (Dague, C.)
March 10, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF TABLE OF CONTENTS: filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, Pro Se, updated on 3/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Response to AG's Letter, #2 Exhibits to Response, #3 Exhibits, #4 List of Defendants', #5 Affidavit of Service, #6 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: On February 10, 2017, Defendant Andrew Cuomo filed a Letter Request seeking an extension of time to file an Answer to the Complaint in this matter. Dkt. No. #10 . Based upon the reasons set forth in Defendant's submission, the request is GRANTED and Defendant Andrew Cuomo shall file a response to the Complaint on or before March 16, 2017. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/7/2017. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff by regular mail). (mab)
February 23, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Hoggan, Jr on behalf of Ralph Abraham, Alma Adams, Robert Aderholt, Pete Aguilar, Lamar Alexander, Samuel Anthony Alito, Jr, Rick Allen, Justin Amash, Mark Amodei, Brad Ashford, Kelly Ayotte, Brian Babin, Tammy Baldwin, Lou Barletta, Andy Barr, John Barrasso, Joe Barton, Karen Bass, Joyce Beatty, Xavier Becerra, Dan Benishek, Michael Bennet, Robert Bentley, Ami Bera, Don Beyer, Gus M. Bilirakis, Mike Bishop, Rob Bishop, Sanford D. Bishop, Jr, Diane Black, Marsha Blackburn, Rod Blum, Earl Blumenauer, Richard Blumenthal, Roy Blunt, Suzanne Bonamici, Cory Booker, John Boozman, Madeleine Bordallo, Mike Bost, Charles W. Boustany, Jr, Barbara Boxer, Brendan Boyle, Kevin Brady, Robert Brady, Dave Brat, Stephen G. Breyer, Jim Bridenstine, Mo Brooks, Susan W. Brooks, Corrine Brown, Sherrod Brown, Julia Brownley, Vern Buchanan, Ken Buck, Michael Burgess, Richard Burr, Larry Buschon, Cheri Bustos, G.K, Butterfield, Ken Calvert, Maria Cantwell, Shelley Moore Capito, Lois Capps, Michael E. Capuano, Tony Cardenas, Ben Cardin, John Carney, Tom Carper, Andre Carson, Buddy Carter, John Carter, Matthew Cartwright, Bob Casey, Jr, Bill Cassidy, Kathy Castor, Joaquin Castro, Steve Chabot, Jason Chaffetz, Judy Chu, David Cicilline, Katherine Clark, Yvette D. Clarke, Curt Clawson, William Clay, Jr, Emanuel Cleaver, James E. Clyburn, Dan Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Coffman, Steve Cohen, Tom Cole, Chris Collins, Doug Collins, Susan Collins, James Comer, Barbara Comstock, Michael K, Conaway, Gerald E. Connolly, John Conyers, Jr, Paul Cook, Chris Coons, Jim Cooper, Bob Corker, John Cornyn, Jim Costa, Ryan Costello, Tom Cotton, Joe Courtney, Kevin Cramer, Mike Crapo, Rick Crawford, Ander Crenshaw, Joseph Crowley, Ted Cruz, Henry Cuellar, John Culberson, Elijah Cummings, Carlos Curbelo, Steve Daines, Warren Davidson, Danny K. Davis, Rodney Davis, Susan Davis, Peter DeFazio, Diana DeGette, Rosa L. DeLauro, Ron DeSantis, Mark DeSaulnier, Suzan DelBene, John Delaney, Jeff Denham, Charles W. Dent, Scott DesJarlais, Ted Deutch, Mario Diaz-Balart, Debbie Dingell, John Does, Mary Does, Lloyd Doggett, Bob Dold, Joe Donnelly, Daniel Donovan, Mike Doyle, Tammy Duckworth, Sean P. Duffy, Jeff Duncan, John J. Duncan, Jr, Dick Durbin, Donna F. Edwards, Keith Ellison, Renee Ellmers, Tom Emmer, Eliot Engel, Mike Enzi, Joni Ernst, Anna G. Eshoo, Elizabeth Esty, Dwight Evans, Blake Farenthold, Sam Farrar, Dianne Feinstein, Stephen Fincher, Deb Fischer, Michael G. Fitzpatrick, Jeff Flake, Chuck Fleischmann, John Fleming, Bill Flores, Randy J. Forbes, Jeff Fortenberry, Bill Foster, Virginia Foxx, Lois Frankel, Al Franken, Trent Franks, Rodney Frelinghuysen, Marcia L. Fudge, Tulsi Gabbard, Ruben Gallego, John Garamendi, Cory Gardner, Scott Garrett, Bob Gibbs, Chris Gibson, Kirsten Gillibrand, Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Louie Gohmert, Bob Goodlatte, Paul A. Gosar, Trey Gowdy, Gwen Graham, Lindsey Graham, Kay Granger, Chuck Grassley, Garret Graves, Sam Graves, Tom Graves, Alan Grayson, Al Green, Gene Green, Salmon Matt Gregorio, Morgan Griffith, Raul Grijalva, Glenn Grothman, Frank Guinta, Brett S. Guthrie, Luis Gutierrez, Janice Hahn, Colleen Hanabusa, Richard Hanna, Cresent Hardy, Gregg Harper, Andy Harris, Vicky Hartzler, Alcee L. Hastings, Orrin Hatch, Denny Heck, Joe Heck, Martin Heinrich, Heidi Heitkamp, Dean Heller, Jeb Hensarling, Jamie Herrera Beutler, Jody Hice, Brian Higgins, French Hill, Jim Himes, Ruben Hinojosa, Mazie K. Hirono, John Hoeven, George Holding, Mike Honda, Steny H. Hoyer, Richard Hudson, Tim Huelskamp, Jared Huffman, Bill Huizenga, Randy Hultgren, Duncan D. Hunter, Will Hurd, Robert Hurt, Jim Inhofe, Johnny Isakson, Steve Israel, Darrell Issa, Sheila Jackson Lee, Hakeem Jeffries, Evan Jenkins, Lynn Jenkins, Bill Johnson, Eddie Bernice Johnson, Henry C. Johnson, Jr, Ron Johnson, Sam Johnson, David Jolly, Walter B. Jones, Jim Jordan, David Joyce, Elena Kagan, Tim Kaine, Marcy Kaptur, John Katko, William Keating, Mike Kelly, Robin Kelly, Trent Kelly, Anthony M. Kennedy, Joseph P. Kennedy, III, Daniel Kildee, Derek Kilmer, Ron Kind, Angus King, Pete King, Steve King, Adam Kinzinger, Mark Kirk, Ann Kirkpatrick, John Kline, Amy Klobuchar, Steve Knight, Ann Kuster`, Darin LaHood, Doug LaMalfa, Raul R. Labrador, Doug Lamborn, Leonard Lance, Jim Langevin, James Lankford, Rick Larsen, John B. Larson, Robert E. Latta, Brenda Lawrence, Patrick Leahy, Mike Lee, Barbara Lee, Sander Levin, John Lewis, Ted Lieu, Daniel Lipinski, Frank LoBiondo, David Loebsack, Zoe Lofgren, Billy Long, Barry Loudermilk, Mia Love, Alan Lowenthal, Nita Lowey, Frank Lucas, Blaine Luetkemeyer, Ben R. Lujan, Michelle Lujan Grisham, Cynthia M. Lummis, Stephen F. Lynch, Tom MacArthur, Carolyn Maloney, Sean Patrick Maloney, Joe Manchin, III, Kenny Marchant, Tom Marino, Ed Markey, Thomas Massie, Doris O. Matsui, John McCain, Kevin McCarthy, Claire McCaskill, Michael T. McCaul, Tom McClintock, Betty McCollum, Mitch McConnell, Jim McDermott, James McGovern, Patrick T, McHenry, David McKinley, Cathy McMorris Rodgers, Jerry McNerney, Martha McSally, Mark Meadows, Pat Meehan, Gregory W. Meeks, Brian Menendez, Grace Meng, Jeff Merkley, Luke Messer, John Mica, Jeff Miller, Candice Miller, Barbara Milulski, John Moolenaar, Alex Mooney, Gwen Moore, Jerry Moran, Seth Moulton, Markwayne Mullin, Mick Mulvaney, Lisa Murkowski, Christopher S. Murphy, Patrick Murphy, Tim Murphy, Patty Murray, Jerrold Nadler, Grace Napolitano, Richard E. Neal, Bill Nelson, Randy Neugebauer, Dan Newhouse, Kristi Noem, Rick Nolan, Donald Norcross, Eleanor Holmes Norton, Richard Nugent, Devin Nunes, Beto O'Rourke, Pete Olson, Steven Palazzo, Frank Pallone, Jr, Gary Palmer, Bill Pascrell, Jr, Rand Paul, Erik Paulsen, Donald Payne, Jr, Steve Pearce, Nancy Pelosi, Mike Pence, David Perdue, Ed Perlmutter, Scott Perry, Gary Peters, Scott Peters, Collin C. Peterson, Pedro Pierluisi, Chellie Pingree, Robert Pittenger, Joseph R. Pitts, Stacey Plaskett, Mark Pocan, Ted Poe, Bruce Poliquin, Jared Polis, Mike Pompeo, Rob Portman, Bill Posey, David Price, Tom Price, Mike Quigley, Amata Radewagen, Charles B. Rangel, John Ratcliffe, Jack Reed, Tom Reed, David G. Reichert, Harry Reid, Jim Renacci, Reid Ribble, Kathleen Rice, Tom Rice, Cedric Richmond, Scott Rigell, Jim Risch, Bishop Rob, John G. Roberts, Jr, Pat Roberts, Phil Roe, Harold Rogers, Mike Rogers, Dana Rohrabacker, Todd Rokita, Tom Rooney, Ileana Ros-Lehtinen, Peter J. Roskam, Dennis Ross, Keith Rothfus, Mike Rounds, David Rouzer, Lucille Roybal-Allard, Ed Royce, Marco Rubio, Raul Ruiz, C.A. Dutch Ruppersberger, Bobby L. Rush, Steve Russell, Paul D. Ryan, Tim Ryan, Gregorio Sablan, Matt Salmon, Linda Sanchez, Loretta Sanchez, Bernie Sanders, Mark Sanford, John P. Sarbanes, Ben Sasse, Steve Scalise, Jan Schakowsky, Brian E. Schatz, Adam Schiff, Kurt Schrader, Debbie Schultz Wasserman, Chuck Schumer, David Schweikert, David Scott, Rick Scott, Robert C. Scott, Tim Scott, Tipton Scott, F. James Sensenbrenner, Jose E. Serrano, Jeff Sessions, Pete Sessions, Terri A. Sewell, Jeanne Shaheen, Richard Shelby, Brad Sherman, John Shimkus, Bill Shuster, Mike Simpson, Kyrsten Sinema, Albio Sires, Louise Slaughter, Adam Smith, Chris Smith, Jason Smith, Lamar Smith, Adrian Smith, Sonia Sotomayor, Jackie Speier, Debbie Stabenow, Elise Stefanik, Chris Stewart, Steve Stivers, Marlin Stutzman, Daniel S. Sullivan, Eric Swalwell, Mark Takano, Jon Tester, Clarence Thomas, Bennie G. Thompson, Glenn W. Thompson, Mike Thompson, Mac Thornberry, John Thune, Pat Tiberi, Thom Tillis, Scott Tipton, Dina Titus, Paul D. Tonko, Pat Toomey, Norma Torres, Dave Trott, Donald Trump, Niki Tsongas, Michael Turner, U.S. Congress, U.S. President, U.S. Supreme Court, Tom Udall, Fred Upton, David Valadao, Chris Van Hollen, Juan Vargas, Marc Veasey, Filemon Vela, Nydia M. Velazquez, Peter Visclosky, David Vitter, Ann Wagner, Tim Walberg, Greg Walden, Mark Walker, Jackie Walorski, Mimi Walters, Timothy J. Walz, Mark Warner, Elizabeth Warren, Maxine Waters, Bonnie Watson Coleman, Randy Weber, Daniel Webster, Peter Welch, Brad Wenstrup, Bruce Westerman, Lynn A. Westmoreland, Sheldon Whitehouse, Roger Wicker, Roger Williams, Frederica Wilson, Joe Wilson, Robert J. Wittman, Steve Womack, Robert Woodall, Ron Wyden, John A. Yarmuth, Kevin Yoder, Ted Yoho, David Young, Don Young, Todd Young, Lee Zeldin, Ryan Zinke (Hoggan, John)
February 16, 2017 Filing 10 Letter Motion from C. Harris Dague for Andrew Cuomo requesting Thirty Day Extension to Answer Deadline and Other Relief submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Letter Request)(Dague, C.)
January 23, 2017 Filing 9 JUDICIAL NOTICE: filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (jmb)
January 20, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: for service of the Table of Contents & Supporting Exhibits served upon the Various Governors as noted on 1/17/2017, filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Second Affidavit of Service - Served upon the President, Chief Justice Roberts and Various Justices as noted on 1/17/2017 #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
January 20, 2017 Filing 7 TABLE OF CONTENTS: filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court in further support of the #1 Complaint, and #5 Letter Motion from Unified United States Common Law Grand Jury Foreman for Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting that the Clerk Show Cause by what authority the Clerk may charge for Justice and the exercising of their unalienable rights and/or return the money. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents - Part 2, #2 Copy of Summons, #3 Supporting Exhibits - Part 1 of 2, #4 Supporting Exhibits - Part 2 of 2, #5 Mailing Envelope) (jmb)
January 19, 2017 Filing 6 UNITED STATES ATTORNEY NOTICE: filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court, with attached mailing envelope. (jmb)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE from Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court requesting that the Clerk Show Cause by what authority the Clerk may charge for Justice and the exercising of their unalienable rights and/or return the money. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Summons with Information Redress of Grievances, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jmb) Modified on 1/25/2017 (mab).
December 16, 2016 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Plaintiff on 12/16/2016. (mgh)
December 16, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mgh)
December 14, 2016 Filing 2 FILE ON DEMAND by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court (mgh)
December 14, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB010155) filed by Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Jury, Sovereigns of the Court v. U.S. Congress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Congress
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Sasse
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Carter
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Wilson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jay Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Murkowski
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben R. Lujan
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Nugent
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Tonko
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Griffith
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Harris
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Casey, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Clawson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Dan Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Palazzo
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Palmer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Jenkins
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Portman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Stefanik
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mia Love
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Diaz-Balart
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albio Sires
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Loebsack
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Nathan Deal
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Luetkemeyer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Cohen
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Walden
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Holding
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Aguilar
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shimkus
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garret Graves
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Conyers, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Dent
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Stivers
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Risch
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ayotte
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett S. Guthrie
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Castor
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Wyden
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Gosar
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boozman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn W. Thompson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Swalwell
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Justice Stephen G. Breyer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Pierluisi
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cramer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac Thornberry
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Rice
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Price
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Gina Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Neugebauer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Rigell
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Patrick Maloney
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Vargas
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Farenthold
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Sherman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy McMorris Rodgers
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Corker
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Tiberi
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Hurd
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Stabenow
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus M. Bilirakis
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Israel
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lee
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Hahn
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McClintock
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moolenaar
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elijah Cummings
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice John G. Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyrsten Sinema
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Crapo
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ratcliffe
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Higgins
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Walz
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Zeldin
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Goodlatte
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gibson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wicker
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Blum
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Costa
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor C.L. Butch Otter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Pittenger
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Gardner
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron DeSantis
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Green
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Chabot
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Harper
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Paulsen
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Waters
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul R. Labrador
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Udall
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sanchez
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank LoBiondo
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ami Bera
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Doug Ducey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Ernst
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hoeven
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Reichert
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Gillibrand
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Grijalva
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Engel
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Carper
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Merkley
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Flores
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Mike Pence
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Bustos
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor John Kasich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Inhofe
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Kind
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille Roybal-Allard
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cicilline
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jack Dalrymple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Brat
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orrin Hatch
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Webster
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rand Paul
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jack Markell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Justice Anthony M. Kennedy
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Long
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Valadao
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Andrew Cuomo
Represented By: C. Harris Dague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Peters
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederica Wilson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Stewart
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Trott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niki Tsongas
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Peters
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Maloney
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. James Sensenbrenner
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom MacArthur
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor David Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick T, McHenry
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Clark
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Moran
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Holmes Norton
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Kuster`
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Nolan
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Justice Ruth Bader Ginsburg
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Adams
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Steve Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter DeFazio
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Moulton
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Larsen
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Scalise
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Fincher
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Smith
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Eddie Calvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Collins
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jolly
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Poe
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Kelly
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Benishek
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Rogers
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop Rob
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Barr
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Rubio
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcy Kaptur
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beto O'Rourke
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thune
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Enzi
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Boustany, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Cook
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Herrera Beutler
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Beatty
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Davidson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Tipton
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Dennis Daugaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Young
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Blunt
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Denham
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Newhouse
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Gowdy
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Klobuchar
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Upton
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Richmond
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Thompson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Blackburn
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Isakson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Evans
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Bishop
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Huffman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Granger
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Terry Branstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny Heck
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Franken
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Collins
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Roberts
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Larry Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ileana Ros-Lehtinen
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan W. Brooks
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Mary Fallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.K, Butterfield
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Bill Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Ryan
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Reed
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Katko
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Duncan, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mimi Walters
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory W. Meeks
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Mooney
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Meadows
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Donnelly
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Sam Brownback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sessions
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeleine Bordallo
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smith
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Coons
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Bridenstine
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Sessions
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Young
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Lynch
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Pat McCrory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Knight
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markwayne Mullin
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Bruce Rauner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Amash
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Lieu
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Clyburn
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Grothman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean P. Duffy
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia L. Fudge
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Heitkamp
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Markey
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Renacci
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Norcross
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Walker
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Plaskett
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Yoder
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa L. DeLauro
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sanford
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Graves
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Quigley
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter B. Jones
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Himes
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Justice Clarence Thomas
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna F. Edwards
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Capps
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus King
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Speier
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Pitts
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Hanabusa
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Kennedy, III
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Nunes
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeb Hensarling
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tipton Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McDermott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Takano
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Wittman
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Poliquin
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Schrader
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Wagner
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Torres
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Dingell
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan D. Hunter
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsi Gabbard
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor John Hickenlooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McGovern
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Rick Scott
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mica
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Justice Sonia Sotomayor
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Barton
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Rothfus
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Cruz
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kirk
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Rogers
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shelby
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Perlmutter
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Brady
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Heinrich
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Whitehouse
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Emmer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Deutch
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Loudermilk
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Cardenas
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Lance
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schumer
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Duncan
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hudson
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. President
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Ashford
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Bill Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Payne, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Supreme Court
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Huizenga
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Aderholt
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kinzinger
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Meehan
Represented By: John D. Hoggan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times |