Scott, et al v. City of New York, et al

Plaintiff: Robert A. Marini, Joseph J. Marko, Alphonse J. Marrazzo, Richard Marte, Greg Martinez, Leonel Martinez, Ramon Mazara, Kevin J. Mazza, Matthew J. McAteer, James W. McCrain, Brendan McGinn, Stephen G. McKenna, Lawrence McKinney, John T. McLoughlin, Cheryl McQueen, Carol P. Meagher, Mark A. Melendez, Sergio Melofiro, Salvador Menendez, Mariela Merced, Regina M. Meyer, James Michailidos, Peter J. Minarczyk, Dewkoemar Mohan, Derek Miller, Timothy Molen, Linda Moorer, Anthony P. Morales, Raul Morales, Jr., Raymond Moritz, Tanya Moritz, Elizabeth Moulterie, Aliyah Muhammad, Richard J. Napolitano, Brian Natoli, Darren Oakes, Juan C. Ojeda, Maryanne O'Keefe, Jeanine O'Malley, Herbert Oquendo, Scott Orski, Alex Ortiz, Luigi Ospina, Daniel J. Palumbo, Clifford Parks, Vanessa M. Paulino, Edward D. Paynter, Juan J. Pena, Raudo R. Pena, Tracey A. Pendarvis, Mario R. Penta, Robert A. Perez, Christopher J. Petrizzi, Ronald K. Phillips, Robert D. Picaroi, Gilbert Pierre-Louis, Luigi Pinello, Michael A. Pisano, Jose A. Pizarro, Michael O. Plaitis, Lawrence Plummer, Michael J. Ponticelli, Neil Prasad, Aimee D. Puliga, Stephen C. Puliga, Edwin Ramirez, Hansa V. Randall, Robert ReBovich, Henrietta Reeves, Peter J. Reph, Dennis Riggins, Fred Rivera, Norberto Rivera, Pedro E. Rivera, Martitza Robles, Daisy Rodriguez, Leonides Rodriguez, Nivia Rodriguez, William K. Roe, Edward Rosado, Vilma L. Rosario, Anthony Rosser, Richard J. Ryan, Scott Ryan, Thomas J. Ryan, Thomas P. Ryley, Bernado Salaman, Luis A. Samont, David Sanabria, Miguel Sanabria, Venus Santiago, Michael A. Sanzone, Michael Jay Saxe, Daniel J. Sbarra, Kevin Scanlan, Michael Schuierer, Michael Schwartz, David Schweickert, John Scomillio, Steven Scordato, Raymond G. Senenfelder, Daniel W. Sharkey, Michael E. Sheil, Gerald R. Sherlock, Kevin C. Sills, Jack Sinatra, Edward R. Sinclair, Richard K. Sinclair, Anthony Singleton, Noah Slackman, Benjamin Smith, Karen Smith, Kristine M. Smith, Richard J. Soisson, William Solimine, Anthony John Spagna, David Speer, Charles A. Spruill, Phillip A. Stern, Laura Stremel, Crystal D. Summers, Sheival Surujballi, Michael P. Tafero, Terry Targia, Glen J. Tarmey, Edward J. Taveras, Thomas E. Tergesen, Margaret Thomas, Marvin Thomas, Ruben A. Ticas, Raymond I. Tirado, Eric S. Tobkes, Martin Toczek, Kenneth M. Tomeo, Robert V. Tonry, Frank Tornetti, Luis Torres, Miguel A. Torres, Jose L. Trinidad, Christian F. Trischitta, Carl D. Urbina, Damon R. Uzzle, Armando Vanegas, Ivan Villalba, Miyoshi Vital, Jason Vitale, Donald F. Wegman, Alfredo Wells, John P. Whelan, Shelby White, Darryl Williams, Scott Williamson, James Winckowski, Charisse Woods, Thomas F. Woods, Frank Yannucci, Juan Zubizarreta, Gary W. Aaronson, Felix Alicea, Christopher J. Asam, Jyan Badillo, Drew Bailey, Patrick Barry, Gary A. Bartunek, Jose M. Bercerril, Annika Boney, Paul E. Bookman, Jr., David K. Buxbaum, Trevor Cameron, David Carman, Autuam Carr, Randy Chancey, David C. Chin, Michael Ciron, John F. Clanay, Robert John Clark, Cynthia Clayton, Jeffrey J. Cline, Mary Elizabeth Clogan, Patrick Connolly, Michael Connors, Louis A. Contini, Javier M. Cordero, Mario Corletto, Alvaro A. Couto, Jeffrey L. Curcie, John W. Deachman, Alex Delassalle, Frank J. Delia, Robert C. DelPrete, Angelo J. DeLustro, Edgar T. Bragg, Charles W. Brunke, Henry Burkhardt, Lawrence Burkhardt, Michelle Burkhardt, Keith Brand, Lewis Denton, Renee Dunbar, Neil T. Eckert, James Egan, James Elliott, William Erdman, Laurence F. Farrell, David Fenty, Carmine Feola, James Flynn, William Foley, Marcelo J. Gallina, James Gampel, German Garcia, Laura Garris, Robert W. Gauthier, Jude Gebhart, Hugo German, II, Deborah D. Gillespie, Richard Giordano, Richard J. Goff, Jr., Scott Griczewiuz, Joseph Haddock, Jr., Robert Haley, James C. Hanley, John Hanley, Keith Haughton, Brian E. Heerey, Richard J. Hembury, Scott G. Hennessy, Tamara Hill, Marli M. Hnatko, Daniel J. Howell, Thomas Hughes, William Hunziker, Frederick Inman, Robert M. Isernia, Cheryl Ives, Reginal Jean-Raymond, Gregory Jefferson, Brenda L. Jimenez, Eurosia Joseph, Glenn Joyce, Sean O. Joyce, Karyn Julich, Albert D. Kaufmann, John Kay, Thomas W. Keller, Christopher Klein, Tsu-Yong Ko, Peter J. Krauss, Henry J. Kreush, Michelle Lambert, James Lamur, Rosemary LaPorte, Kevin J. Lavelle, Kevin Lazar, William Lazar, Victor Leandry, Christopher M. Lee, Terence Lee, Christopher P. Lesiewicz, Carol Ann Liguori, Rocco Loccisano, Patricia Lucci, Glenn F. Lynch, Howard T. Lyons, Patrick Lyons, Kenneth L. Mackey, John A. Magee, Richard Mahepath, Arlene Maldonado, Sean M. Maloney, Salvatore Maniscalco, Vincent J. Mannion, Sebastian Mannuzza, Lawrence P. Marenstein, Cancel Maritza, Fredrick J. Martin, Robert J. Martin, Michael A. Massett, Frank Mazzocchi, Suzanne M. McEnaney, Timothy J. McInerney, Leopold A. McLean, Moses P. McPhine, Gerson Mejia, Gino P. Mencaroni, Gerrard P. Kleinfelder, Jr., Thebin R. Lohr, Paul R. Messina, Michael Moore, Carlos A. Morales, William Morales, Jr., Anthony J. Morante, Kim Morgan, Maureen D. Morgan, Mark Mrakovcic, Stephen Muhlenbruck, Chris Mullane, Johnny Ng, Michael P. O'Brien, Joseph O'Neil, Jane Oralis, Sean O'Rouke, Michael A. Ortiz, Angel Ortiz, Jr., Ilker Ozuk, Dana C. Palomo, Joan Perkins, Jason H. Perry, Roy A. Pilot, Paul M. Pimenta, Mike Radosta, Paul Raggi, Fernanda Ramos, Jose Ramos, Anthony Randazzo, Carmine Randazzo, Brian T. Reich, Ronald Resko, Erami Rivera, Oscar Rivera, Luis A. Robles, Jr., Luis Raul Rodriguez, Patrick J. Rooney, Moises R. Rosario, Thomas R. Ruriani, Thomas J. Sackett, Francesco A. Sambuco, Raymond L. Sanchez, Frank Santeramo, Donald M. Schneider, Stephen A. Schnitzer, Roland P. Sehne, Joseph Sessa, Ruth Sharma, Anthony L. Smalls, John C. Sondey, Raymond Stein, Brian P. Sullivan, David Sullivan, Richard Szubinski, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Glenn Adelson, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Eleanor Adjei-Burnett, Carrie Ann Adomeit, Mark Afanasewicz, Viviana Agasto, William Aguirre, Richard Agustini, John Ahlf, Dorothy Aiello, Olajumoke Ajasa, John C. Albarano, Frank Albergo, Richard A. Alequin, Jeffrey M. Alicea, Cortney Allen, Timothy C. Allen, Jason Allison, Patrick Allison, Patrick Almonor, Pedro Almonte, Donald J. Anderson, Kareem J. Anderson, Anthony Andreano, Lief K. Andreassen, Ceil Andriola, Frank P. Angelone, Shadene L. Anthony, Thomas F. Antonetti, Michael J. Antonucci, Arnold V. Aprea, Stella Ardizzne, Joe X. Arguello, IoAnnis Argyros, Joseph Arias, Teron E. Armstrong, Keith Arndt, Joseph E. Aronsen, Wilfredo J. Arroyo, Guillermo Arrubla, Christopher J. Adam, Rafael Astacio, Michael Athanasio, Craig Atkinson, Robert Auberger, Antoinette J. Augustus Miller, Richard Averso, Marro Aviles, Dominick Avitabile, Robert Aylmer, Steve Azzopardi, Charles Bacon, Nick Badolato, Angelo Baez, Jeffrey Bahm, Catherine Bahno, Shahid N. Baig, Brian Balser, Martin A. Banghart, Angelo Barone, Gregory J. Barone, Guillermo Barr, Michael J. Barra, Roberto I. Barrezueta, William J. Bartel, Nicholas J. Basile, Lawrence Baskerville, Michael Bassen, Paul D. Bauer, Marcia K. Baughan, Louis A. Bavaro, Joseph A. Beadle, Steven Beatty, Jose M. Becerril, Guy A. Becker, Manuel Begawen, Thomas P. Beirne, Bernard Belkys, Robert Benejan, Paul Baque, Darren Benn, Mervin K. Bennett, William V. Bennett, Calvin Bent, Monty Berger, Timothy M. Berger, Joseph Bermardi, James J. Bernard, Peter Bernard, Morsal W. Betts, Edward L. Beurnier, Edward Bilardi, Darren T. Billerbech, Matthew J. Bilotti, Kevin Bischoff, Brett Bishop, LaTonja Bishop, Christopher M. Blair, Gordon Blake, Daniel Blanco, Howard J. Blennau, Thomas Blieka, Michael A. Blissutt, Jr., Zenobia D. Bly, Dessmond Bodon, Theresa Boeninghens, Gavin Bollinger, Laura Bollmann, Steven Bolten, Andrew Bonadio, Robinson Bonilla, Scott K. Boning, Michele Bonne-Annee, Joseph Michael Bonner, Brian C. Booth, Victor Borg, Trevor Bosco, Anthony C. Botta, Edgard Bourdon, Michael J. Bourgeois, Keith M. Bowling, Rodney Boyce, Willis Boyce, James B. Boyle, James P. Boyle, Dawn K. Braccio, Kevin Bradley, Brendan Brady, Mark A. Brady, Michael S. Brady, Steven Brandow, Edward G. Braun, John W. Breitfeller, Stephen J. Breitfeller, Michael P. Bresnahan, Robert D. Brinkerhoff, Dennis B. Broderick, John E. Brown, Keith Brown, Patrick Brown, Frantz A. Brown-Kennerly, Victor M. Bruno, II, Donna M. Bryan, Andrew Bryant, Jr., Arthur R. Bryant, Jr., Eaton G. Bryce, Mark J. Buchalski, Paul M. Buchys, Edward C. Buddin, David Burges, Ronaldo Burke, Keith A. Burkitt, Gary J. Buro, Kenneth A. Burrows, Michael A. Busso, Matthew Butler, Richard Buttermark, Patrick Buttler, Derrick Bynoe, James N. Byrne, Michael R. Byrnes, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Anthony Cacace, Anthony Cacioppo, Jonathan Cade, Jammie Cafaro, Shane A. Cafaro, Anthony Calda, Jr., Charles Caliendo, Anthony Calma, Jr., Cosmo Camilliti, Angelo E. Campanella, Lori Campell, John F. Campos, Martin F. Candia, Jr., James Cantore, Todd Caplette, Audrey P. Capra, Angela M. Caracciolo, Lisa Carano, Madeline Carlo, Richard L. Carlough, Alfredo Carmona, Linda Carney, Vincent N. Carney, Edward W. Carr, Richard Carragher, Sam Carrasquillo, Carolyn Carrington, Dominic N. Carro, Heather Carro, James Carroll, Sahyli Casanova, Frank Cascello, Giovanni Cascio, Christopher M. Casey, Kenneth Casey, Richard Cassetta, Brendan Cassidy, Matthew Castel, Nancy L. Castro, MariAnn Catalanotto, Gina M. Catoggio, James V. Cattrano, Bilma Caussade, Frederick W. Cavanagh, Kathleen Ceccarelli, Jason Cenizal, Pete Cepeda, Heather Cerulli, Joong-Sik Chae, Lisa Chambers, Justin Chimienti, Kenny Chin, Edwin Y. Ching, Robert Christel, Edwin Chu, Peter D. Ciaccio, Paul Ciampi, Edgar Ciar, Paul A. Ciccarello, Joseph Cipriano, Richard Citelli, Frank P. Clark, Robert Clarke, Howard Clavin, Stephen Clifford, Michael J. Cocelti, Adam C. Cococcia, Daniel Coffey, Stephen Coffey, Francis Gary Coffran, Mary Beth Colby, Michael J. Coleman, Robert Coletta, Caridad C. Collazo, Ernesto Collazo, Jr., Daniel Collins, Peter Collins, Angie D. Colon, Dwight Colon, Edward Colon, Efrain Colon, Jose A. Colon, Elsie Conde, James T. Connolly, Randi Consiglio, Kevin Conzone, Robin Copney, Jeremiah J. Corbett, Manuel A. Cordedro, Andrew Corkhill, Anthony W. Corona, Jonn Costanzo, Peter L. Coste, Michael A. Costello, Mitchell Coto, Christopher Covatti, Andre Crandon, William L. Creech, Kirsten Leigh Cremonini, Walter Crevoiserat, George W. Cristino, Dennis J. Critton, Donna E. Crockett, Thomas M. Cronin, Annette Crosson, Timothy J. Crowley, Benjamin Cruz, David Cruz, Nelson Cruz, Raphael Cubisino, James A. Cuccienllo, Robert F. Cuccio, Andres Cuevas, Peter Cullen, Richard J. Cummings, Thomas M. Cunningham, Carmine Curcio, Robert Curcio, Ryan Curley, Richard Curto, Salvatore Cutaia, Felice D. Cutaldo, Vincent Cutler, John Zesilla, Angel Torres, Paul Sulzbach, William Sullivan, Todd A. Sessa, Miguel Santiago, Ann E. Riffas, Brian Plunkett, Christopher N. Painton, Dennis Migliore, Jennifer Matteucci, Shawn McCartney, Steven Manco, David Maligioinada, Emily Lopez, Jack J. LoBiondo, Adrian E. La Pene, Robert Keiley, Kevin F. Keenan, James M. Irwin, Kent Frezzell, Tyrone A. Forde, Jose Figueroa, Sylvia Faison, Thomas Donohue, Andrew Caradonna, James Bell, James Atanacio, Stephanie Winslow, Patrick Touhy, John Tennant, Gangaram Samrha, Jose Rosado, Annette Rivera, Luis Reed, Louis Pomponio, Guillermo Moncada, Patrick Miller, Vincent Martinelli, John Marcantonatos, John Lunt, Brian Lormel, Aidia Lebron Forestier, Mark Holder, Geoffrey Hernandez, John Drouin, Nicholas Dibrino, Manuel Cuenca, Damarys Carrillo and Robert A. Szoyka
Case Number: 1:2002cv09530
Filed: November 27, 2002
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Shira A Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973....The attached list of cases having been pending for more than three years, all presently contemplated proceedings having been completed, and there having been no action for more than twelve months, there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain these files as open for statistical purposes, the Clerk is instructed to complete a JS-6 closing report for each case. Nothing contained in this minute order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of these matters, and should further proceedings in them become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this minute order had not been entered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/5/2013) (djc)
June 13, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger, for Settlement. Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz no longer referred to the case. (pgu)
June 13, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu)
April 10, 2012 Filing 337 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LORIE ALMON, ESQ., PETER WALKER, ESQ. AND JEREMI CHYLINSKI, ESQ. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/10/2012) (laq)
April 5, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Thomas Philip Puccio to E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint and 23 Amended Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (laq)
July 28, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. #336 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Thomas Philip Puccio : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (ka)
July 27, 2011 Filing 336 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (Letter brief following remand). Document filed by Carl Alayon.(Puccio, Thomas) Modified on 7/28/2011 (ka).
June 16, 2011 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #335 USCA Mandate. (nd)
June 15, 2011 Filing 335 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #321 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Paul M. Infante, Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timothy J. O'Connell, Eugenio Torriente, Garry Karbiner, Robert Williams, Timothy Howell, K
May 24, 2011 Filing 334 USCA OPINION as to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott, et al. USCA Case Number 09-3943-cv(L), 09-5232-cv(xap). Accordingly, we VACATE the district court's order reinstating Puccio's attorney's fees, and REMAND the case to the district court so that it may allow Puccio to submit a new application for attorney's fees based exclusively on official court records as set out above. The district court is further instructed to apply to those hours it finds substantiated in such records the hourly rate of $550 as previously determined by the court, which we hold is reasonable. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 05/24/2011. (nd)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #321 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Scott, et al, #308 Notice of Appeal filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department, #310 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department USCA Case Number 09-3943-cv(L), 09-5232-cv(xap). By per curiam opinion dated December 1, 2010, this Court vacated the District Court's decision as to Thomas P. Puccio's fee application, and remanded the case to the District Court for clarification of its decision and additional findings of fact as necessary. The opinion directed the parties to inform this Court by letter within 21 days of the District Court issuing its decision if either side wishes to continue with this appeal. The District Court having issued a new decision on March 9, 2011, and the appeallant-cross-appellee having submitted a letter on March 18, 2011 requesting reinstatement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the mandate in this case is hereby recalled and the appeal is reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. (nd)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: #100031 Accordingly, the parties are directed to notify the Clerk of the Court, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, if either side wishes to continue the appeal and thereby restore jurisdiction with the Second Circuit. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/2011) (js) Modified on 3/14/2011 (ajc).
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from James M. Lemonedes, dated 12/2/2010, re: I submit this letter in response to a call from your scheduling clerk, Mr. James Reily, concerning additional submissions required by the recent Second Circuit decision regarding the issue of Mr. Puccio's fee application. Mr. Puccio and I have agreed to the following schedule for the submission of any additional papers on this issue: Mr. Puccio's papes due by Friday, January 7, 2011, and my response due by Friday, January 14, 2011. Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the Court approve this briefing schedule. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is hereby So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/7/2010) (lnl)
December 2, 2010 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #330 USCA Mandate,,. (nd)
December 2, 2010 Filing 330 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #321 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Scott, et al, #308 Notice of Appeal filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department, #310 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department USCA Case Number 09-3943-cv(L), 09-5232-cv(xap). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED for further procedures in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/01/2010. (nd)
December 1, 2010 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #329 USCA Order. (nd)
December 1, 2010 Filing 329 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to #321 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Paul M. Infante, Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timothy J. O'Connell, Eugenio Torriente, Garry Karbiner, Robert Williams, Timothy Howell, Keith W Ga
May 28, 2010 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #328 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal. (nd)
May 27, 2010 Filing 328 MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timot
March 17, 2010 Filing 327 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for #308 Notice of Appeal filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #310 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York USCA Case Number 09-3943-cv(L); 09-5232-cv(XAP), 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
March 9, 2010 Filing 325 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Georgia Pestana dated 7/21/09 re: City of New York submits this letter outlining the topics that the City proposes to address in its sur-reply to plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees to address the new matter raised in their reply papers. (mro)
February 9, 2010 Filing 326 LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Georgia Pestana dated 9/1/09 re: Defendants write in response to Thomas P. Puccio;s August 28, 2009 letter requesting that this Court reconsider the portion of the 8/25/09 decision regarding his entitlement to attorney's fees. Mr. Puccio's arguments for reconsideration are not persuasive and his request should be denied. (mro)
February 9, 2010 Filing 324 LETTER: addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Thomas P. Puccio dated 8/28/2009 re: In light of the foregoing I ask the Court to reconsider its further reduction of party's award by 20%. Mr. Puccio submits that when the clarification he has now had the opportunity to supply to the Court is taken into consideration, this reduction is unfair and not warranted by the facts. Moreover, I suggest to the Court that his good faith in making the submission with its limitations carefully noted does not warrant a sanction. (js)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 STIPULATION TO AMEND DOCKET SHEET: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, BY ANDbetween the respective parties that these documents and thisstipulation will be filed with the District Court so that saiddocuments can be docketed. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/8/2010) (js)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER:#98379 Plaintiffs reasonably believe that the risk of losing on appeal with respect to decisions rendered in their favor by this Court outweighs any benefits that might be gained by an appellate victory. Because this case involves many questions of first impression - including the meal period issue - the outcome of the appeal is all the more difficult to predict. It is fair for the parties to forego their appeals and to settle on terms largely established by the jury. For the foregoing reasons, the Court approves the proposed settlement. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/21/2009) (jpo) Modified on 12/23/2009 (eef).
December 18, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Hearing held on 12/18/2009. Decision reserved. (mro)
December 18, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #321 Notice of Cross Appeal. (nd)
December 18, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #321 Notice of Cross Appeal.(nd)
December 17, 2009 Filing 321 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #307 Memorandum & Opinion,, #309 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Edmund P. Murphy, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Jose Cruz, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Willia
December 14, 2009 Filing 320 BRIEF Report On Plaintiffs' Response To Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Edmund P. Murphy, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Jose Cruz, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson, M
December 10, 2009 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO MANUALLY RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Thomas Puccio to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. #312 Notice of Cross Appeal. This document is not filed via ECF. (kkc)
November 17, 2009 Filing 319 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Settlement. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Edmund P. Murphy, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Jose Cruz, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson,
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER, that the Court hereby enters the following schedule with respect to these proceedings: 1. Plaintiffs' counsel shall mail notice of the Fairness Hearing and this scheduling Order to plaintiffs at their most recent known addresses, and shall otherwise undertake reasonable efforts to notify plaintiffs, by no later than November 17, 2009. 2. Plaintiffs counsel shall file and serve a memorandum addressing the merits of the proposed settlement by no later than November 17, 2009. 3. The deadline for individual plaintiffs to submit any objections or comments regarding the proposed settlement, and to notify plaintiffs' counsel of their intent to appear at the Fairness Hearing, is December 11, 2009. 4. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file and serve any objections, comments or notices received from individual plaintiffs by December 14, 2009. 5. The Fairness Hearing shall be held on December 18, 2009 at 2:30 PM. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/13/09) (pl)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER: The Court hereby enters the following schedule with respect to these proceedings: Plaintiffs' counsel shall mail notice of the Fairness Hearing and this scheduling Order to plaintiffs at their most recent known addresses, and shall otherwise undertake reasonable efforts to notify plaintiffs, by no later than November 17, 2009. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file and serve a memorandum addressing the merits of the proposed settlement by no later than November 17, 2009. The deadline for individual plaintiffs to submit any objections or comments regarding the proposed settlement, and to notify plaintiffs' counsel of their intent to appear at the Fairness Hearing, is December 11, 2009. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file and serve any objections comments or notices received from individual plaintiffs by December 14, 2009. The Fairness Hearing shall be held on December 18,2009 at 2:30 PM. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/9/2009) (jpo)
November 4, 2009 Appeal Remark as to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timothy J. O'Connell, Eugenio Torriente, Ga
November 4, 2009 Filing 316 USCA ORDER REINSTATING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to #305 Notice of appeal, filed by plaintiffs, #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York USCA Case Number 09-3317-cv(L), 09-3353-cv(XAP). A mandate having issued in error on 10/28/2009 for the above captioned matter, it is hereby ordered that the mandate in this case is recalled, restoring jurisdiction to this court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 11/3/2009. (nd) Modified on 11/4/2009 (nd).
November 4, 2009 Filing 315 TRUE COPY AMENDED ORDER of USCA as to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal filed by Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timothy J. O'Connell, Euge
October 29, 2009 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: #314 USCA Mandate. (nd)
October 29, 2009 Filing 314 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimenez, Paul Cillo, Maximin Wilson, Timothy J. O'Connell, Eu
October 28, 2009 Filing 313 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal filed by Roy Schmahl, George Velez, Marc Leuzzi, David Cadunzi, Regina A. Miranda, Stephen Brooks, Thomas J. Brennan, James Donnelly, John Haas, John Stabbing, Cynthia Donaldson, Janet O'Keefe, Allen Bailey, Jr., Devon Anderson, Colin Austin, Stephen Seidel, Nancy Foster, Evan Sonfist, Michael Sowa, Noreen Veltri, Eurosia Joseph, Michael Lutlcy, Robert Picone, Anita V. Jackson, Gregory Chavous, James C. Lamb, Daniel G. Prunty, Valerie Guzman, Carmine Feola, John F. Smith, Barry Bryon, Steven Enrique, Joseph J. Kearney, Thomas Mitchell, Carol F. Froehlich, Henry F. Leon, Robert F. Norton, James Paliotta, Gary G. Mausberg, Steve Paskoff, Carl Anthony Dyer, Myron Coleman, Karen Gibbs, Cornelius Bartley, Frank A. DiGraziano, Nathalie Pacifico, Michael J. Guglielmo, Stephen E. Saunders, Kevin P Buehler, William G. Gattis, Michael Segarra, Douglas Hartmann, John C. Martin, Pinkie V. Fraser-Barry, Michael C. Robbert, Mervin C. Turnbull, Christopher J. Adam, Thomas Lamardo, Richard J. Thornton, Dominic Pazmino, Mayser Alijader, Thomas P. Beirne, Paul Chaves, Janine Grace, Albert Maisonet, John A. Clark, Gerald R. Sherlock, Anastacio Roxas, Glenn Joyce, Kenneth M. Quick, William Maiurro, Bernard E. Hamlett, Shahid N. Baig, Thomas Hogan, Michael Stiso, Jr., James Randolphe, Vincent A Andre, Patrick Dwyer, Jason Leiterman, Charles Dittrich, Mark A. Wirth, Frederick Inman, James E. Lafferty, Jerrold H. Lutz, Drew Bailey, Peter Kelly, Jr., Edward Clavin, John Borrero, Myles P. Prior, Rochell Eutsay, James Bell, David C. Chin, Ebony Washington, Shaun Persaud, William A. Bourguignon, Robert W. Brown, Alex Litwenak, John Daugherty, Keith Jones, Jeanine O'Malley, Jaime Gonzalez, Vincent Lee, Matthew Kielczewski, Robert D. Ferguson, Gilbert Vega, John Kennedy-Etheridge, Patrick T. Giblin, Jammie Cafaro, Ronald Liautaud, Raymond Rigby, Brendan P. Shovlin, Edward Reiman, Robert Germani, Richard P. Sullivan, John M. Pizzano, Kristen Melville, Anthony Rosser, Carol Orleman, Patrick L. LaScala, Margaret A. Sullivan, George Acevedo, Kathy Fripp, Timothy Galloway, Frederick Davis, John W. D'Erasmo, Bobby Fuentes, Pamela Lambright, John Gambino, Heriberto Santiago, Felix Alicea, Eric Fiorelli, James R. Palmer, Jesus Gomez, Michael R. Byrnes, Rochelle Sanders, Don M. Johnson, Michael C. Dixon, Maria Cooper, Eric Romero, Anthony Novellino, Bruce A. Babington, Jean Guiney, Joseph Bellomo, William McDaniel, David M. Muir, Mark Mrakovcic, Latoshia R. Smalls, Luis Reed, Joseph Scaletta, Darren T. Billerbech, Hiram Ramos, Mark Annstrong, Chris Campbell, Daniel Hernandez, Jr., Drew V. Palmer, Robert P. Karl, Russell C. King, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Bobbie D. Lewis, David Collado, Catherine Courtney, Brian M. Wimpelberg, Martin Davis, John Kay, Christopher Paradise, Vincent Catania, Richard Dixon, James B. Boyle, Joseph A. Rao, Gordon Blake, John T. Russo, Steven M. Discepolo, Jacqueline Colon, Vincent Maggiore, Nicholas Pribish, Frank Garofalo, Roslyn Blackwell, Joseph Marchitell, Sylvia Faison, Mitchell Gross, Raymond P. Fuscaldo, Gregg Melita, Anthony DiMenna, Edward Steinmacher, Kenneth J. Lursen, Michael McManus, Joseph P. Diglio, Joseph Costanza, Eduardo J. Arias, Christopher Trivino, Lawrence Paniccia, Oscar A. Polanco, Michael E. Sheil, Erlene Wiltshire, Mary Ellen Donohue, Patrick Logan, Damon R. Uzzle, Laura DelGuidice, Nicholas DiPalo, Kevin Nolan, Carlet Auguste, Thomas Ormond, Michael Downes, Ronaldo Burke, Robert Amaniera, George Arce, Sandra Rivera, Diana Rosario, Catherine Felipe, James Duncan, Jr., Edward Anderson, John P. Sweat, Jimmie R. Moore, III, William J. O'Grady, Michael P. Hoehl, Mark L. Zimmerman, Louis Rosenthal, Christopher J. Ballacra, Latonia Jenkins, Keith Wendler, Robert Capolongo, Ngai Wong, Norman Quinones, Steven Wengert, Victor Borg, Jeffrey G. Ramer, Lawrence P. Lundt, William Simens, Megaly Hernandez, Brian D. Fusco, Patrick Touhy, Jonathan M. Dubroff, Gregory K. Weck, Stefanie Hirschhorn, Kevin Scanlan, John R. Iles, Luigi Ospina, Jon Landolfi, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Viola Adrien, Phyllis Spencer-Laird, Rosario Evola, Emilio Santiago, Michele McNaughton, James Abrahamsen, Christopher L. Van, Lori Campell, Louis Brinkskelle, Edwin Ramirez, III, Frank Rizzo, Arthur H. Martin, Jr., Chris Gonzalez, Vanessa Cabrejos-Perez, Robert Elferis, Leticia Long, John Carey, Linda Phillips, Elizabeth Hurtado, Faziool Shafi, Suzanne McIlwaine, Darryl Williams, Donald Pirune, David Osbourne, Nicholas Rizzi, Kevin P. Ford, Rocco Loccisano, Steve Fernandez, Robert Marshall, Armand Tasca, Michael J. Collins, John Verrilli, John S. Mejia, Peter Kiescheuer, Vincent J. Fittipaldi, Alexander Montanez, Napoleon Morales, Eladio Quiles, Michael E. Fox, Willie J. Brown, Matthew Vogt, Michele J. Kost, Dino Puglia, Scott Miller, Laura Bollmann, Kevin Lazar, Thomas Travers, Randolph B. Evans, Paul S. Ladisa, Timothy J. Crowley, Keith Silardi, Ralph Aponte, Scott McMillin, Daniel Bensimon, Tonya Marshall, Gina Maria Ernandez, Russell L. Jung, Anthony Milo, Jacqueline Tyson, Stanely P. Fadoul, Jawad M. Naeil, Donald Lander, John Alexander, Ana Cabrera, Joseph Catuosco, James E. Cuesta, Marc Black, Kevin Joyce, Peter Bernard, Danielle Sheehan, John Hammond, Patrick J. Foran, Patricia Murcia, Louis Accardi, James F. Conk, James M. Knight, Lisa Aviles, Michael J. Antonucci, Donald G. Hostomsky, Warren K. Brown, Colleen Erin Walsh, James Fritz, Khan Tariq, Keith Burtt, Kathleen Price-Skrzypek, James Barreto, Susan Stewart, Pierre Maximilien, Linda Gillespie, Gerard A. Hayden, Robert M. Ehmer, Steven Blaine, Dessmond Bodon, Anthony F. Tabacco, John A. Abraham, Anthony Parone, Mark Meyer, Tiffany K. Campbell, Robert Barrett, Luis A. Delgado, Andres C. Mahecha, John Hanley, Erin Nolan, Hansa V. Randall, Edward Rauba, Louis Ramos, James Lamur, Gregory A. Rodriguez, Timothy S. Murphy, Edwin Caban, Jr., Alberto Ortiz, Salvatore Grippi, Pedro Rivera, Michaele Drapaca, Efrain Colon, Paul Doty, William Torres, Walter M. Moussou, Robert Aylmer, Dimas Cortez, III, Donna M. DeLustro, Michael S. Brady, Jack Conway, Tara Raggi, Helen Hoffman, Christopher Ciejka, Dominic Sabio, Peter Segreti, Paul F. Muschitiello, Joseph F. Caliguri, Alessio Bono, Mark Dipilato, David Raczka, Michael L. Pohl, Anthony Scandariato, Edwin Ramirez, Gerard Murphy, Theresa Marchia, Frank Garafano, Eugene P. Moffutt, Michael J. Biaggi, Paul DiGirolamo, Miguel Arocho, Jr., Antonio PaPallo, Carl A. Soreco, Ivelisse Chico, Donna McGroder, Adam Levine, Michael Dougherty, Patrick Solomita, Dennis M. Taggart, Lorraine M. Reiss, Thomas R. Galanek, Edgard Bourdon, Patrick Venditto, Robert Gonzalez, Joseph Lemm, Oswaldo Carrion, Thomas Yensy, Robert C. DiBiase, Robert F. Baguiao, Richard Jacobsen, Giovanni Furio, Paul Ciampi, MariAnn Catalanotto, James Dooley, Catherine Butler, Mark J. Satalino, Willy Cancel, Jr, Paul Critti, Suzanne Johnson, Michele K. Rodriguez, Maryanne O'Keefe, Frank Esposito, James Marston, Douglas W. Hermann, Scott Hyndman, Eric M. Castagliola, Keith Ferrana, Peter Hoeflinger, Brian Jabloner, Richard A. Quinland, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Jemmel, Robert Maldonado, Michael Quigley, William J. Panzella, Zenobia D. Bly, Robert Ayala, Eric Johnson, Derek Andreone, Peter Dwyer, George Triantis, Christopher Wakely, Frederick Williams, James R. Ellerby, Jr., Keith T. Bryan, Calvin Robinson, Michael Parle, Glenn Ganzenmuller, Fredrick W. Davenport, Joseph S. Francois, Patricia Hedderson, Tyrone A. Forde, Kenneth Singleton, Alex L. DuBeau, Lourdes Rivera, Christopher Negron, Kenneth C. Fuchs, Mark M. Lederman, Jerusalem Fernandez, Joseph Torres, Sergio Coppola, James Ropenus, Gregory P Greiner, Vincent Cutler, Christine Hazel, Edward F. Koehler, Raymond J. Badami, Thomas O'Brien, Scott A. McKenna, Joseph W. Carillo, Demetrios Maurice, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Daniel Slezak, Jean Moreno, Eric Harvey, Jose Cruz, Shawn McCartney, Linares Israel, Joseph M. Morgan, Vincent Lotito, Sadrina L. Osborne, Nicholas Michalakis, Scott T Brand, James J. Bernard, Francesca Kyriakou, Gerard Marrale, Keith Livingston, George Goulart, Roberto Coppola, Kevin Port, Renato M. Lari, Samuel Brenner, Daniel Perez, Anthony Gavin, Luis M. Calden, Kevin Cannon, Denise A. Juliano, Gerard O'Dwyer, Jr., Ernest W. Bohringer, Jason DeAngelis, Margaret A. Miranda, Dominick Avitabile, Dana Coopersmith, Ivan L. Cortes, Nicholas Blanchard, JJoseph Augello, Michael A. Servino, Kenneth Schnetzler, Annette Crosson, Kimberly A. DeCicco, Michael Cocozziello, Paul R. Brown, Anthony E DePellegren, Andrew Sperbert, Raul Morales, Jr., Edwin A. Sepulveda, Seth Druckner, Joan Perkins, Zaven J. Sava, Umberto Guardino, Derek L. Ramos, Jeff Staniland, Brian E. Heerey, Robert J. Neretich, James J. McLaughlin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Kevin Sefcik, Michael Ginty, John Contento, Deborah Lagrasta, Edward Washington, Kurt Albertson, John P. McGovern, Eric M. Berrios, Alex Ortiz, Kenneth Schenck, Joseph McLaughlin, Christopher M. Gahn, Steven Nunzaito, Tammy Vitale-Weisberg, Michael J. Patrone, Milton R. Sanchez, Christopher J. Acquilino, Christopher Owen, Thomas V. Rau, Carlos J. Colon, John P. Ryan, Curtis Peterson, Epifanio Dobbs, Richard Aponte, Wut K. Woo, Michael Bums, Joseph Deo, Kevin Kenny, Manual D. Coredero, Frank Gallagher, Migdalia Cortes, Thomas P. Gironda, Kevin Cerar, Frank Knight, Ryan McGauley, Christopher Weidner, Thebin R. Lohr, Gerard Pacella, Stephen A. Gager, Roger Andino, Isaiah Spearing, Valerio Vacentini, James A. Talbot, Paul Dunas, Patrick T. McGovern, Scott Carson, Claribel Nunez, Paula Spence, Tyrone Dux, Joseph T. Lombardi, John Marcantonatos, Scarolina McGuire, Peter J. Greves, Colin Kaletsky, Jose G. Garcia, Jerome K. Foy, Robert Crozier, Albert R. Acierno, Joseph Pipitone, Frederic J. Barone, Michael Venckus, Dashawn Martin, Ravi Jamindar, Francis P. Devereaux, Edgar Serrano, Ben Russo, Robert Anderson, John Joseph Ondreicka, Teddy Rouzinos, Gregory Apostolatos, Kevin M. Connors, John T. Chiam, Michael McConico, James T. Bergamine, Rafael Jimene
October 1, 2009 Filing 312 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Cross Appeal. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson, Mary Wilson
September 21, 2009 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #310 Amended Notice of Appeal. (nd)
September 21, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #310 Amended Notice of Appeal. (nd)
September 21, 2009 Filing 310 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: #308 Notice of Appeal, #307 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (nd)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: #98057 re Thomas P. Puccio motion for reconsideration of the attorney's fees awarded for his representation of plaintiffs: Puccio was awarded attorney's fees of $515,179.28. This is not an ungenerous award, albeit for six years of work. No further award is warranted. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/18/09) (cd) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jab).
September 21, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #308 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
September 21, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #308 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
September 18, 2009 Filing 311 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Gary A. Orseck dated 9/16/09 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs write to advise the Court that the parties have reached an agreement that would bring the case (including appeal) to a close.Should the Court determine to review the proposed agreement, plaintiffs respectfully request that it set: (1) a date in the near future for a fairness hearing; (2) a date in advance of the hearing by which plaintiffs' counsel shall file a memorandum discussing the merits of the proposed settlement; and (3) a date by which individual plaintiffs may file written concerns or appear regarding the proposed settlement. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request for schedule a fairness hearing is hereby denied. This Court has been divested of jurisdiction to conduct such a hearing. Plaintiffs should petition the Second Circuit for authorization for conduct such a hearing in this Court. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/17/09) (tro)
September 17, 2009 Filing 308 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #307 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 700254. (nd)
September 16, 2009 USCA Case Number 09-3317(L), 09-3353 from the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit assigned to #306 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York, #305 Notice of Appeal.(nd)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPINION AND ORDER:#97961 For reasons further set forth in said Order, plaintiffs will be awarded total attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $4,328,194.38 ($1,629,649.60 for A&V $2,183,365.50 for Robbins Russell; and $515,179.28 for Puccio). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/25/09) (db) Modified on 8/28/2009 (eef).
August 25, 2009 Received returned mail Mail was addressed to John T. Brennan Law Offices of John T. Brennan 26 ourt Street Suite 710 Brooklyn, New York 11242 and was returned for the following reason(s): Attempted-Not known. (jab)
August 6, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #306 Notice of Cross Appeal. (tp)
August 6, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #306 Notice of Cross Appeal. (tp)
August 5, 2009 Filing 306 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL from #292 Judgment. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 696541. Copies mailed to attorney(s) of record: Law Offices of Thomas P. Puccio; Aitchison & Vick, Inc.; Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber, LLP; and Law Offices of John T. Brennan. (tp)
August 3, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #305 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
August 3, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: #305 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
July 30, 2009 Filing 305 NOTICE OF APPEAL from #292 Judgment. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Edmund P. Murphy, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Jose Cruz, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson, Mary Wilson, Brian D. Woh
July 17, 2009 Filing 304 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Thomas P. Puccio in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Taaffe, Damon)
July 17, 2009 Filing 303 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of William Aitchison in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Taaffe, Damon)
July 17, 2009 Filing 302 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Gary A. Orseck in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taaffe, Damon)
July 17, 2009 Filing 301 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Taaffe, Damon)
July 10, 2009 Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by City of New York. (Greenfield, Blanche)
July 10, 2009 Filing 299 DECLARATION of Georgia Pestana in Opposition re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Greenfield, Blanche)
July 1, 2009 Filing 297 DECLARATION of Thomas P. Puccio in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Puccio, Thomas)
June 30, 2009 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/23/09 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (pl)
June 30, 2009 Filing 296 DECLARATION of William Aitchison in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taaffe, Damon)
June 30, 2009 Filing 295 DECLARATION of Gary A. Orseck in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3)(Taaffe, Damon)
June 30, 2009 Filing 294 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs.. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Taaffe, Damon)
June 30, 2009 Filing 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Taaffe, Damon)
June 30, 2009 Filing 292 JUDGMENT #09,1243 in favor of plaintiffs against City of New York in the amount of $ 900,000.00. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/30/09) (Attachments: #1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
June 22, 2009 Filing 291 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas McRae. New Address: Sing Sing Correctional Facility, 354 Hunter Street, Ossining, New York, 10562,. (pl)
June 1, 2009 Filing 290 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Andrez Carberry dated 5/29/2009 re: Requesting an extension of time to submit a proposed final judgment reflecting both compensatory and liquidated damages, until June 15, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: The parties request for an extension is hereby granted. The parties shall submit a proposed final judgment reflecting both compensatory and liquidated damages by June 15, 2009. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/29/2009) (jpo)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 OPINION AND ORDER #97499: As has so often been the case, the proper calculation of damages lies somewhere between the figures propounded by each set of advocates. As the parties now have intimate knowledge of each others' damages calculations - and the instructions of this Court - they are ordered to meet and confer to establish the proper sum of compensatory damages. The parties must then submit a proposed final judgment reflecting both compensatory and liquidated damages by June 1, 2009. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/8/2009) (jpo) Modified on 5/12/2009 (mro).
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER:# 97456 For the reasons set forth in this order, I decline to find that defendants acted in good faith and hold that plaintiffs are entitled to liquidated damages in equal amounts to compensatory damages resulting from the chart claim and the regular rate claim. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/24/09) (mme) Modified on 4/30/2009 (jab).
April 24, 2009 Filing 288 LETTER addressed to Jugdge Shira A. Scheindlin from James M. Lemonedes dated 4/24/09 re: counsel for defendant's write pursuant to the Court's direction to present dfts' position on the final damage calculations for the regular rate and the chart claims in this case. Document filed by Joseph Abbruzzese, City of New York, City of New York.(pl)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Seyfarth Shaw LLP. dated 3/20/09 re: Defendants request a brief extension, until March 30, 2009, to file their letter brief, of no longer then 5 pages, with plaintiffs submitting an opposition letter brief, of no longer than five pages, on or before April 10, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is hereby granted the parties shall report to the Court by April 10, 2009 concerning damages calculations. Briefing concerning liquidated damages is due for defendants on March 30, 2009 and for plaintiffs on April 10, 2009 No further extensions will be Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/20/09) (js)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD: (1) The record in the above-captioned action is hereby supplemented pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(e) to include the following email communications and other substantive correspondence between the parties and the Court, copies of which are annexed hereto at Tabs I through 36. (2) The Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to make the appropriate entries on the docket sheet to reflect the supplementation of the record. (3) Nothing in this Stipulation and Order shall be deemed to constitute a waiver of the parties' right to seek further supplementation of the record at a later time. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/5/09) (db)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER:# 97148 For the reasons described above, time spent by officers caring for police dogs must be included in calculations of the regular rate of pay. However, the regular rate of pay must be determined based on an non-overtime work period of no more than 171 hours. Plaintiffs' expert's damages calculations should be altered to confirm with this holding. The Court will conduct a one-day hearing to resolve any remaining damages issues on March 12, 2009, beginning at 10 a.m. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/27/09) (djc) Modified on 3/2/2009 (jab).
January 13, 2009 Filing 281 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 26, 2008 and December 1,2,3, 2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
January 13, 2009 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 19,20,21,24,25, 2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
January 13, 2009 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 3,10,12, 2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
January 13, 2009 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on November 13,14,17,18, 2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
January 9, 2009 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/15/2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dnd)
January 7, 2009 Filing 282 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/15/08 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (tro)
December 8, 2008 Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/7/2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (D'Avanzo, Daniel)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 96822 For the reasons described above, the premium portion of the double payment for working on a scheduled vacation day is neither credited against FLSA obligations nor included in the regular rate calculation. Plaintiffs' expert's damages calculations should be altered to conform with this holding. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/2/2008) (jmi) Modified on 12/8/2008 (jab).
November 24, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremi L. Chylinski on behalf of City of New York, New York City Police Department, City of New York, New York City Police Department (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Chylinski, Jeremi)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 OPINION AND ORDER #96795: The jury will be instructed in conformance with the rulings herein. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/22/08) (tro) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mro).
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #96766: For the foregoing reasons, the jury shall be instructed that the NYPD may choose to offer or order overtime to particular police officers based on an officer's past selection of cash versus compensatory time as compensation for overtime. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/18/2008) (jpo) Modified on 11/20/2008 (mro).
November 17, 2008 Filing 272 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Taaffe, Damon)
November 17, 2008 Filing 271 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department, City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Almon, Lorie)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 269 OPINION AND ORDER #96755: For the reasons set forth herein, plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is granted. Upon reconsideration of its 11/10/08 opinion and order, the Court holds that the semi-annual holiday payments are not creditable against FLSA obligations. However, the Court adheres to the holdings that non-FLSA compensatory time is creditable against FLSA obligations and that the NYPD may choose to count compensatory time before it counts cash overtime when determining which overtime hours should be treated as non-FLSA and which are subject to FLSA protections. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/13/08) (tro) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mro).
November 11, 2008 Filing 268 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O'Keefe, Margaret O'Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O'Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O'Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson, Mary Wilson, Brian D. Wohl, Tanya Wood, Henry V. Xiques, James Yard, Edwa
November 10, 2008 Filing 267 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(Taaffe, Damon)
November 10, 2008 Filing 266 TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(Whitman, Robert)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 OPINION AND ORDER #96749: For the reasons set forth in this order, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment concerning damages on the chart claim and the regular rate claim is denied. Plaintiffs are ordered to recalculate damages in accordance with the principles established in this opinion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (docket no. 241). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/10/08) (mme) Modified on 11/13/2008 (mro).
November 7, 2008 Filing 264 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Sheindlin from Damon W. Taaffe dated 11/6/08 re: Counsel requests that they be allowed to bring cellular telephones, laptop computers, and wireless modems into the courthouse for use during the Scott trial. ENDORSEMENT: The parties request is hereby granted. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/6/08) (mme)
November 5, 2008 Filing 270 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 31, 2008 10:00 a.m. before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (mro)
November 4, 2008 Filing 263 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Concerning Damages on Counts III and IV. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 Second Supplemental Report of Murray S. Simpson, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit #2 Desposition of Joseph Lodispoto)(Taaffe, Damon)
November 3, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Jury Trial began on November 3, 2008. Trial continued on November 10-14, 17-21, 24, 26; December 1-3. The Trial concluded on December 3, 2008. Total Trial days:16. (mro)
October 30, 2008 Filing 262 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Concerning Damages on Counts III and IV. Document filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York. (Carberry, Andrez)
October 29, 2008 Filing 261 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York.(Carberry, Andrez)
October 29, 2008 Filing 260 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York.(Carberry, Andrez)
October 29, 2008 Filing 259 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Preliminary Jury Instructions A & B and Proposed Final Jury Instruction No. 10)(Taaffe, Damon)
October 27, 2008 Filing 258 WITNESS LIST. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service of Defendants' Revised Proposed Witness List)(Whitman, Robert)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 OPINION AND ORDER #96687: For the reasons set forth in this order, plaintiffs motions in limine are denied. Defendants motions in limine are granted in part and denied in part. The clerk of the court is directed to close these motions (Docket Nos. 218, 220, 221, and 222). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/27/08) (mme) Modified on 10/28/2008 (mro).
October 21, 2008 Filing 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ralph Carter, regarding service of the Declaration of Lorie E. Almon (Docket Entry # 255) served on counsel for all Plaintiffs on October 20, 2008. Service was made by First-Class Mail. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (Whitman, Robert)
October 20, 2008 Filing 255 DECLARATION of Lorie E. Almon in Opposition re: 222 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by New York City Police Department, City of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lorie E. Almon - NYPD Pilot Survey Frequency Report (pgs. 1-36), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lorie E. Almon - NYPD Pilot Survey Frequency Report (pgs. 37-74), #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lorie E. Almon - CD-Rom (index only by ECF))(Whitman, Robert)
October 16, 2008 Case Designated ECF. (mme)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER The above-captioned action shall be referred to the Courts Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") system, and the undersigned hereby consent to the electronic service and filing of all papers. The parties agree to comply with the Court's rules regarding ECF. The Clerk of the Court shall enable ECF in the above-captioned action. The counsel listed in this stipulation and order shall receive ECF notifications of all filing in this action. This stipulation may be executed in several counterparts, each of which shall serve as an original as against any party who signed it, and all of which taken together shall constitute one and the same document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/16/08) (mme)
October 9, 2008 Filing 253 DECLARATION of Damon W. Taffe in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Scott, et al. (tro)
October 9, 2008 Filing 252 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Scott, et al. (tro)
October 8, 2008 Filing 251 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Damon W. Taaffe in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (db)
October 8, 2008 Filing 250 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (db)
October 6, 2008 Filing 249 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Preclude Defendants from Offering the Expert Testimony of Christopher Erath, Ph.D., regarding whether the NYPD Enforces a Cap on Cash Overtime. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (djc)
October 6, 2008 Filing 248 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for an Order Precluding Defendants from Arguing that Plaintiffs' Claims for Unpaid FLSA Overtime are Attempts to Circumvent the Collective Bargaining Agreements. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (djc)
October 6, 2008 Filing 247 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 222 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Richard J. Aalbue, Jr., et al. (All Plaintiffs) (djc)
October 6, 2008 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/25/2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (jn)
October 6, 2008 Filing 240 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/25/2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (jn)
October 3, 2008 Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott et al. (cd)
October 3, 2008 Filing 245 DECLARATION of Damon Taaffe in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott et al. (cd)
October 3, 2008 Filing 244 DECLARATION of Keenan Scott in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott et al. (cd)
October 3, 2008 Filing 243 DECLARATION of Murray Simpson in Support re: 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan et al. (cd)
October 3, 2008 Filing 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment Concerning Damages on Counts III and IV. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, Robert Davison, Michael C. DeMartino.(cd)
October 3, 2008 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Andrez Shumree Carberry to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Appearance, Document No. 233. This case is not ECF. (db)
October 3, 2008 Filing 239 DECLARATION of Christopher Erath, Ph.D. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Lorie E. Almon in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Damages on Counts III and IV.. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 237 DECLARATION of Victoriz Steinmetz in Support re: 218 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 236 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 218 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 235 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Damages on Counts III and IV. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 234 DEFENDANTS' COUNTER STATEMENT PURSUANT TO Local Civil Rule 56.1. Document filed by City of New York, City of New York. (jmi)
October 3, 2008 Filing 233 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrez Shumree Carberry on behalf of City of New York, New York City Police Department (Carberry, Andrez) Modified on 10/6/2008 (db).
October 1, 2008 Filing 232 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE to Motion re: 221 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Joseph Abbruzzese, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, James F. Adams, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Barbara D. Abreu, Robert Accurso, Gary W. Aaronson, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Christopher J. Adam, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, Paul Adams, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Salvatore J Accardi, Ernesto Aceredo, Sebastian Acosta, Warren T. Adamson. (pl)
September 29, 2008 Filing 231 RESPONSE to Motion re: 218 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (djc)
September 26, 2008 Filing 230 DECLARATION of Christopher Erath, Ph.D. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 26, 2008 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 221 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 26, 2008 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Robert S. Whitman. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 26, 2008 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 220 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 26, 2008 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 222 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 26, 2008 Filing 225 DECLARATION of Lorie E. Almon in Opposition re: 222 MOTION in Limine. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (dle)
September 25, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/30/2008. (jfe)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 223 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #216 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Keenan M. Scott. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's motion is hereby denied with leave to file a motion for summary judgment concerning damages in Counts III and IV by September 30, 2008. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion. (Docket No.223). So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/25/2008) (jfe)
September 15, 2008 Filing 222 MOTION in Limine to Exclude evidence or argument relating to the SRBI Survey. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(djc)
September 15, 2008 Filing 221 MOTION in Limine to preclude Defendants from offering the expert testimony of Christopher Erath, Ph.D., Regarding whether the NYPD Enforces a Cap on Cash Overtime. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(djc)
September 15, 2008 Filing 220 MOTION in Limine to preclude defendants from arguing that plaintiffs' claims for unpaid overtime are attempts to circumvent the collective bargaining agreements. Document filed by All Plaintiffs.(djc)
September 15, 2008 Filing 219 NOTICE of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Witnesses. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (djc)
September 15, 2008 Filing 218 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Documents and Witnesses. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department.(djc)
September 11, 2008 Filing 223 MOTION for Reconsideration of the re; #216 Court's denial of summary judgment on the damages element of plaintiffs' regular rate claim (Count IV. Document filed by Plaintiffs'.(ae)
September 8, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz: Settlement Conference held on 9/8/2008. (tro)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION AND ORDER # 96438 denying 190 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiff motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part, and defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied in full. The Clerk of the Court of directed to close these motions (docket numbers 190 and 193). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/28/2008) (jmi) Modified on 8/29/2008 (tve).
August 27, 2008 Filing 217 DECLARATION of John E. Kanganis. Document filed by New York City Police Department. (jmi)
August 5, 2008 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/28/08 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/3/08) (rw)
July 1, 2008 Filing 213 REPLY in Support re: 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Joseph Abbruzzese, Chris Agoglia, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, James F. Adams, Viola Adrien, Jmes R. Agugliano, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, James A. Added, Vincenzo Adduci, Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Stephen Agosta, Barbara D. Abreu, Robert Accurso, Gary W. Aaronson, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Glenn Adelson, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Eleanor Adjei-Burnett, Carrie Ann Adomeit, Mark Afanasewicz, Viviana Agasto, William Aguirre, Christopher J. Adam, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, Paul Adams, Louis Addimando, Robert Addona, James Afanacio, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Salvatore J Accardi, Ernesto Aceredo, Joseph Agati, Anthony Aggate, Sebastian Acosta, Warren T. Adamson. (pl)
June 30, 2008 Filing 212 REPLY Appendix of Evidentiary Materials in Furher Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York. (djc)
June 30, 2008 Filing 211 SUPPLEMENTAL LOCAL CIVIL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS. Document filed by City of New York. (djc)
June 30, 2008 Filing 210 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by City of New York. (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 209 LETTER addressed to Clerk of the Court from Damon Taaffe dated 6/9/2008 re: Enclosed for filing in the above-captioned matter are: (1) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in the Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs' Response to Defenfants' Rule 56.1 Statement; (3) the Supplemental Declaration of Damon W. Taaffe and exhibits thereto; (4) the Declarations of Thomas Guterbock, Michael Biaggi, Stacey Simone, and Raymond Tirado; and (5) the Certificate of Service.. Document filed by Richard Aponte, Raymond Cassar, Douglas J. Appel, Brian A. Armida, Steven Aversano, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D' Ambrosio, Robert D' Amodio, Gary D' Andrea, Neil D' Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Louis C. Amen, Vincent Aprea, Michael Castellano, Carlos A. Cortes, Yolanda Cotto, John Cousins, Gerald Credezzi, Anna Maria Crisano, Anthony Cuoco, Steven Daniels, Raul Del Pozo, Lee Desposito, Joseph Dimeo, Alfonso DiMino, Brian E. Donnelly, Robert Dorrian, Ernest B. Dorvil, Warren Duryea, Jr, Glenn S. Edmonds, James R. Ellerby, Jr, Michael Emanuel, John Espey, Raul Espinet, Mark A. Esposito, Thomas H. Fariwa, Mary A. Faughnan, James Edelstein, Vincent Falsitta, Jr, Joseph Faughnan, Christopher Favale, Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Timothy Aiken, Robert Albertson, Mark Allia, Chintua E. Alozie, Anthony Ambnosini, Keith N. Ames, III, Michele C. Antoniato, Gregory Apostolatos, Kostantinos Apostolatos, Ronald S. Archer, David Arroyo, Paul Asfazadour, Christopher Aull, Ginger Avery, Rafet Awad, Werner Ay, Bruce A. Babington, Joseph Badalamente, Rocco Badalato, Joseph Balise, John T. Courtenay, Catherine Courtney, Anthony Croce, David Crouthamel, Christina Crugnale-Allia, Theresa Cruz, James E. Cuesta, Richard Cunzo, Kendall W. Currie, Kenneth Daly, Willie Daniel, Stephen A. Darby, Derrick A. Davis, Gail D. Davis, Craig DeFranzo, Eric S. Delman, Donna DelMonaco, Toni-Lynn DeLorenzo, Donna M. DeLustro, Jason N. Dendy, John Denton, Andrew Destefano, William DeWitt, Warren Deyak, Charles Diaz, Joseph DiDomenico, Joseph S. DiGaetano, Anthony DiGiouanna, Paul DiGirolamo, Timothy R. Dillon, John C. DiMeola, David Dinkelacker, Barbara A. DiSclafani, John J. Dolphin, Jimmy Donggilio, Donna Davis, Thomas J. Donnarumma, Maryvonne Donnelly-Wilson, John Drago, Christopher Drake, Rosemary Duque, Ruben D. Duque, Robert M. Ehmer, Sean Emery, Steven Enrique, James V. Esposito, Edward Estepa, Clint Etwarroo, Randolph B. Evans, Paul K. Eversman, Matthew G. Fauvell, Michael Erickson, Joseph Abbruzzese, Chris Agoglia, Jabded Ahmed, James Ainslie, Joseph Alejandro, Scott Alessy, Thomas Alexander, Titus Alexander, Julio Alicea, Luis Alicea, Virginia Alier, Ana Almonte, Roberto Almonte, Alexis Anderson, Hubert Antoine, Luis Arias, Miguel Arocho, Jr, Amari Arroyo, Elizabeth Arroyo, Robert Ascione, JJoseph Augello, Enrique Aviles, Jeanne Ayala, Robert Ayala, Michael Bahrenburg, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, James F. Adams, Viola Adrien, Jmes R. Agugliano, Kurt Albertson, Joseph P. Alcuri, Robert Alejo, Digna L. Aliperti, Serina Allman, Michael Armocida, Kenneth Avila, Ivy P. Bailey, Eric M. Castagliola, Ivan L. Cortes, Sento Costa, Daniel T. Cotter, Gerald R. Coyle, Peter Crane, Maricruz Crespo, Robert Crozier, Alexander Cruz, Ceferino Cruz, Melchor Cruz, Joel Cummings, Stacey Cunneen, Kathleen Curnyn, Peter J. Curran, Anthony Cusimano, Robin D'Avilar, Mark A. Davis, Martin Davis, Doreen Debattista, Carla DeBlasio, Josephine DeFino, Evelyn A. DeJesus, Colin Delaney, Donald Delfino, Thomas DeLorenzo, Michael DeLuca, Jeanette DeLucia, Debra DeMarino, John DePasquale, Robert DeRosa, Vincent DeSantis, Johnny Diaz, Robert C. DiBiase, Derrick S. Dillard, Charles Dittrich, Ralph P. DiVirgilio, Julio Dobles, James Dobry, John C. Donohue, Jr, Daniel Donza, James B. Dorney, Thomas J. Doyle, Audra Driscoll, Donna Duffy, Pawel Dziewiecki, James Ecker, Dorothea C. Edmonson, Dale G. Edwards, John J. Egan, Jonah Eisenberg, Robert Elferis, Thomas J. Ellis, Raymond Engen, Sirin Ereifej, Michael Eschmann, Carl Esposito, Frank Esposito, Doreen A. Faherty, Joseph D. Falli, Erik Farbman, Kassem Fares, Beth Farrell, William R. Faustner, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, James A. Added, Vincenzo Adduci, James Aitken, Carl Alayon, Joseph P. Albertini, John Alexander, Lora Algotti, Thomas J. Alps, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Andrew Amplo, Eric L. Anderson, Ely Arav, Robert Arnold, April M. Arocho-Mercedes, William Arons, Albert R. Acierno, Samuel Arrayo, Angel Arrieta, Michael Aruty, Carlet Auguste, Margarita Ayala, William G. Azbino, William Badala, Steven R. Badlu, David Baez, Allen Bailey, Jr, Junto C. Acosta, Jeffrey Bailey, William Baker, Robert W. Ball, Nora Ahmed, Thomas Ailman, James J. Alexander, Donald G. Allen, Robert Amaniera, Mark Amato, Edward Anderson, Joseph L. Cassar, Kevin Costello, Edgar Cotto, Richard Crociata, Juan Cruz, Madeline Cruz, William Anthony, Thomas Aquila, Karen Arena, Timothy Askin, Dennis J. Cosgrove, Marc P. Costa, Mark R. Cousins, James Cox, Janette Crespo, Monica Cruz, Wilfredo Cruz, Johnny Cuevas, Colin Austin, Christopher S. Cuiffo, Charles Curcio, Louis E. Curti, Kevin Cutalanotto, Kathryn M. D'Andrea, Michael Dansky, Debbie E. Davios, Tracy Day, Louise DeFilippis, Thomas Avery, James Deighan, Leslie DeJesus, Louis Del Maestro, Angelica Delgado, Dominick A. DeLorento, Gerard V. DelPrete, Elizabeth Devalle, Frank DeMasi, William J. DeMauro, Steven Demoleas, Edward Azueta, Kevin DeName, Martin Dennehy, Frank DePrimo, Nicholas DeRenzo, Louis A. DeRespirnis, Jr, Daniel M. Devaney, Gerard Devine, Franklyn P. Diaz, Luis H. Diaz, Kenneth Dickerson, John Azzarello, Anthony DiCristoforo, Michael J. DiGeorgio, Anthony DiMenna, Linda A. DiMeo, Luciano Dinatale, Edward J. Dingman, Anthony T. DiSimone, Brian T. Doherty, John J. Doherty, Stace Domagala, Thomas Bacon, Daniel Donaldson, Timothy Donnelly, James Dooley, Roland J. Dorcean, Jeffrey Dougherty, JoAnne Dowd, Michaele Drapala, Kevin P. Driscoll, Timothy Duffy, Brenda Bacote, Peter Duke, Miguel A. Duran, Jr, Ramon A. Duran, Timothy Drew, Manuel Cruz, Albert R. Culmone, Colleen Curran, Joseph Daniele, Donna Da Silva, Arthur S. Davis, Arman Baksh, Lisa R. Davis, Ronald Davis, William J. Davis, Timothy Decker, Seraphim C. Dela Cruz, Joseph Delduca, Daniel Delgado, Robert W. Deluca, Peter Desosih, Henry Di Franco, Robert Divosse, Michael P. Dodd, Robert Drayton, Mary Dreyer, Thomas P. Driscoll, John Drzal, David Earley, Steven Eckert, Riccardo Errico, Santa Espinal, Deborah Esposito, William Estes, Luis J. Estevez, James Eyester, Stanely P. Fadoul, Lawrence Falisi, Michael J. Falsetta, George Falto, Gerard Eckert, John James Edgar, Jeffrey Ehlers, Donald Ehret, John Ehrmam, Edward Eilenberger, John Eliadis, Wilbert Elias, Michael Emanuele, Daniel G. Emsworth, Brian Erbis, Edwin Espinosa, Dennis Estwick, Michael Fagan, Christine Famiglietti, Carl Faulcon, Kevin Faria, Carlos Faulkner, Michael Cassidy, Dawn Castellano, John Castellanos, Joseph Castiglione, Joseph Costanza, Keith J. Costanzo, Eugene T. Coughlin, Paul C. Cox, Jose J. Criollo, Joseph P. Cromwell, Michael Cuccaro, Saverio Cuda, Anthony Curatolo, Joshua Czyz, John W. D'Erasmo, Pierre R. Daguizan, Brian Daly, Dennis N. Darcy, Eric Dargenio, Ylli Dautaj, Charles E. Davie, III, Silvia Davis, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, Robert Albano, Darrell Anderson, Thomas W. Davis, Marvin Arce, Eduardo J. Arias, Paul Arrigo, Lisa Assante, David B. Atkinson, John V. Augeri, Henry O. De La Cruz, Daryl Deixler, Luis A. Delgado, Joseph Delorenzo, Gerard Castiglione, Jose DelRosario, Paul Cortright, Carlos Cosme, George Costoso, Dominick DelVecchio, Dameion Cox, Anthony Cracchiolo, Robert Critelli, Nancy C. Cromwell, Jeanne M. Crosby, James J. Crowley, Alvin Cruz, Rose Cuoco, Leszek A. Dadura, Christopher D'Amico, Eugene DeMar, Frederick Davis, Lance L. Davorell, Thomas DeFonte, Richard DeFresco, Aramis Delgado, Paul DeNunzio, Andrew J. DeSimone, Warren DeTemple, Randal DiCicco, Christopher Demuro, John W. DiDio, Joseph P. Diglio, Nicolas M DiPardo, Troy L. Doiley, Christian T. Doran, Michael Dougherty, Daniel L. Drago, Alex L. DuBeau, Tanya Duhaney-Sanduro, Wendy R. Earls, David Graham Denton, Renee Echel, Mitchell Eisenberg, Martin Fahy, Stenen J. Famiglietti, Melinda Fasano, John J. Fatum, Joseph Deo, Thomas DePalo, Frederick E. Derenthal, III, Michael DeRose, Thomas DeSena, Mario DesRuisseaux, Richard Diana, Richardo Diaz, Timothy Diaz, Frank A. DiGraziano, Frank DiGregorio, Daniel DiPiazza, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Stephen DiVito, Epifanio Dobbs, George L. Doerner, Julia Dombrowski, Cynthia Donaldson, James Donnelly, William J. Donohue, Robert Doremus, Edward Dougherty, Tammi Doyle, Robert Dreeben, George Duonocere, Tyrone Dux, Michael S. Dwyer, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Stephen Agosta, Melissa A. Eger, Marc Alvarez, Romano Amleto, Victor A. Appel, Dominick Apuzzo, George Arce, Harold J. Astree, Maria Ayala, Dorothy Bachop, James L. Bahamonde, John Elliott, Valerie Baialardo, Christopher J. Ballacra, Lyndon Elliott, Qaizad Engineer, Trisha Ensley, Anthony Esposa, Migdalia Cortes, George T. Couluris, Nandini N. Couluris, Timothy J. Cronin, Robert Cropsey, Nelson J. Cruz, Jr, Ramon Cruz, Jr, John D. Czulada, Michael L.
June 10, 2008 Filing 208 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Damon W. Taaffe in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Richard J. Aalbue, Jr. (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 207 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Plaintiffs' Richard J. Aalbue, Jr., et al....; (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by all plaintiffs Richard J. Aalbue, Jr., et al... (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 205 DECLARATION of Thomas M. Gutterbock in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Plaintiffs Richard J. Aalbue, Jr., et al. (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 204 DECLARATION of Michael Biaggi. Document filed by Michael J. Biaggi. (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 203 DECLARATION of Stacey Simone made at the request of attorneys. Document filed by Stacey Simone. (djc)
June 10, 2008 Filing 202 DECLARATION of Raymond Tirado at the request of counsel for the plaintiffs. Document filed by Raymond I. Tirado. (djc)
June 9, 2008 Filing 201 COUNTER STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 56.1. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (pl)
June 9, 2008 Filing 200 APPENDIX OF EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department.(pl)
June 9, 2008 Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (pl)
May 19, 2008 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #189 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 5/13/08, Receipt Number 650441. (Quintero, Marcos)
May 16, 2008 Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of Keenan M. Scott (jmi)
May 16, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #189 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
May 13, 2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: #197 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Damon William Taaffe for Richard T. Callahan, Kenneth J. Camenzuli, Kevin G. Campbell, Frederick J. Campion, Terrence Cane, Kevin Cannon, David J. Canter, Peter Caridi, Brian J. Carr, Steven Carrano, Richard Aponte, Oswaldo Carrion, Scott Carson, Ferdinand Casa, Raymond Cassar, Vincent Castro, Joseph Cavaliere, Thomas Cavuto, Michael P. Celentano, Thomas Cerbone, Brian Champion, Douglas J. Appel, Stephan Chan, Lisa Chapman, Gesner Charles, John ChioDi, Steven C. Chionski, John F. Chucha, Elizabeth Ciaravino, John Ciarcia, Louis C. Ciccolella, Paul Cillo, Brian A. Armida, John Clarke, Elizabeth Collins, David Colon, Richard Communiello, Kevin Concannon, Kevin M. Connors, Farrell Conroy, Robert E. Conti, Dana Coopersmith, Roberto Coppola, Steven Aversano, Vincent Corapi, Cesar Antonio Cordero, Danny Cortes, Kevin F. Cottingham, Joseph M. Cotugno, Kevin Cox, Leonard Crawford, Angel A. Creagh, Heriberto Crespo, Steven Cruz, Thomas Baldwin, Mauricio Cuartas, Vincent D', Ambrosio, Robert D', Amodio, Gary D', Andrea, Neil D', Esposito, Patrick Daddio, Roger Damm, Fredrick W. Davenport, Harry Davila, Michael P. Davis, Shawn Bassarath, Israel Deida, Gabriel Della, Thomas DelVecchio, Daren D. DeMarco, Francis P. Devereaux, Michael DeVita, Michael Devivo, Michael O. Diamond, Anthony Diaz, Faith Diaz, Wilworth Benjamin, Nick DiBallo, Robert Dibbs, Lawrence DiBlasi, Michael DiCecco, John Digregorio, Anthony M. DiMarco, Jason Di Palma, Michael C. Dixon, Richard Dixon, Mary C. Doherty, William Berques, Daniel Donohue, John Donohue, Richard M. Dotterman, Philip R. Doweney, William Doyle, Kenneth Dulberg, Paul Dunas, James Duncan, Jr, Patrick Durkin, Patrick Dwyer, Eric M. Berrios, Rachell Dwyer, Jeremy Eagan, Monica Ealey-Spann, Eric Egan, Anthony Elor, Thomas Erickson, Alexis Fabre, Christopher Fantini, Eric K. Fawcett, David Feliciano, Kevin Beslity, Louis C. Amen, Emil Feliciano, Matthew J. Ferrigno, Roger S. Field, Patrick Fitzgerald, Robert E. Fitzsimmons, Brian Fleischmann, Jacquelyn Ford, Todd A. Forsberg, Cameron S. Foster, Craig Foster, Vincent Bilotti, Christopher Fowler, John Fox, Santiago Francisco, James Fritz, Carol Froehlich, Giovanni Furio, Anthony Fusaro, Vincent M. Gaglione, Beanand Gallagher, Timothy Galloway, Marc Black, Russell T. Gandt, Donald R. Gannon, Abraham R. Garcia, Marcy Garcia, Marino Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Jr, Frank Garofalo, James R. Gatto, Kenneth Gazzami, Thomas Gee, Sean Boyle, Dustin Genco, Stephen Gerwer, Karen Gibbs, Margaret Gibson, Maria Gilsenan, Michael Gleason, David J. Gomes, Keith Gomez, Jose Gonzalez, Piero Gonzalez, Sean Boyle, Robert Gould, John Grady, Anthony J. Greco, James P. Greene, Philip William Grella, Scott Greshman, Kevin Gross, Gabriel Guerrero, Edwin Gutierrez, Sean M. Hale, Daniel P. Brier, Lisette Hallahan, Martin J. Halligan, Pamela Harris, Steven Hasman, Raymond J. Hawkins, Christine Hazel, Goenia Hector-Johnson, Theresa Heery, Trina Heffner, Joseph Heid, Stephen Brooks, David A. Henderson, Justino Henriquesgomez, Lyndon Henry, James S. Herbison, Daniel Hernandez, Jr, Jimmy Ho, Joseph S. Hodge, Helen Hoffman, James M. Hom, Christina M. Honan, Warren K. Brown, Donald G. Hostomsky, Richard Huang, Darren F. Hue, Michael Hughes, Chungyoon Huh, Michael Hunger, Scott Hunter, Guillermo D. Intriago, Donna A. Jarvis, Sharon Jenkins, Carolyn R. Bryson, Matthew Jeszeck, Don M. Johnson, Lawrence Johnson, Nicole Joseph, Edgar Juarbe, Erik Kaaveland, Charles F. Kee, III, John Kehoe, Peter Kelly, Jr, Robert Kennedy, John Bunce, John Kenny, Khyume Kham, Peter Kiescheuer, Ann A. Kilcommons, Kelly Kilfeather, Darlene Kingston, Kenneth M. Knight, Linda Knorpp, Frank C. Kolanovic, James Koschmerl, Derrick Byrne, Vincent Aprea, Andrew Kryger, Michael Labozzetta, George Laburda, Georgeann LaGrippo, Franking Lai, Leonard Lantz, Julio Lara, Michael Laudonio, Russell A. Lawry, Neal Leclerc, Brian B. Byrnes, Richard Lee, Andrew M. Leeb, Richard Legarda, Terrence Lagardy, Finbarr T. Leighton, Danny D. Lem, Anne Leo, James Leo, Barbara A. Leonard, Douglas Lerner, Edwin Caban, Jr, Molly Levans, Bobbie D. Lewis, Walter Lipscomb, Keith Livingston, Donna M. Livoti, Antionetta S. Lombardi, Leticia Long, Carmine Longo, Benny Lopez, Raquel A. Lopez-Colon, Jennifer L. Calabro, Craig A. Lotito, Shondu Lowrance, George Lujack, Jerrold H. Lutz, Rhonda F. Lynch, William J. Lynch, Patrick Macklin, James Madigan, Anthony Maher, David Maldonado, Joseph D. Calise, Joseph Maldonado, Raymond Maldonado, Ricardo Maldonado, David Mancini, Thomas Mangiaracina, Christopher Manzi, Michael J. Marinello, Joseph S. Marino, Thomas M. Marino, Adrian Marrero, Stephen Cambria, Jr, John Marrone, Robert Marshall, James Marston, John C. Martin, Joseph J. Martin, Andres Martinez, Guy Mastrande, Matthew A. Matkovic, Jennifer Matos, Brian Mattison, Jose Capella, John E. Maxim, John Maxly, Terrence McCarrick, Alison McCarthy, Michael R. McCarthy, Sean P. McCarthy, Anthony McCrystal, William M. McDonald, John M. McDonald, Jr, Robert McEachern, Robert Caputo, Ryan McGauley, James, Thomas N. McHale, Ainsley McIntyre, Carlton McKenney, Diane McLaughlin, Flynn McLean, Thomas A. McMahon, Peter W. McMann, Kevin Mehrman, Michael Castellano, Russell Meinken, Mark L. Mekler, Madeline Melendez, Louis P. Melisi, Norma Mendez, Anthony A. Mercado, Daisy Mercado, William Mercado, Jr, Guy Merolla, David Merrill, Alvaro Castro, Marian Messina, Christopher Milano, Scott Milne, John Mitchell, John Moceo, Dennis Molina, Edwin E. Mondezie, Jr, Timothy Monzert, Chris Moragas, Felix J. Morales, Daniel T. Cavanagh, Cassius N. Bennett, Gary Morales, Giovanni Morales, Jose A. Morales, Thomas M. Moran, Gary L. Moratti, Christopher Mormino, Frank Mortillo, Michael J. Mullick, Jr, Carmen S. Mundo, Tyrone Munn, Carl A. Cespedes, Gary Murphy, Howard Murphy, James Murphy, Jenny Musse, Miguel Musse, Darryl Mack, Hugh D. MacKenzie, Roger Mackie, John P. Maderik, Brian F. Madigan, Moses Charles, John T. Magnotti, Yumatee Maharaj-Singh, Edwin J. Maher, Denise P. Mahlmann, MaryAnne Maiorano-Schmitt, Albert Mammon, Joseph P. Mangiaracina, Elaine Maniaci, Joseph Manzello, Keith Maresca, Keith Chen, Gary L. Mariner, Robert F. Marks, Thomas Marrinan, Dashawn Martin, Derrick M. Martin, Jose A. Martinez, William Martinez, Patrick Mascarini, Denise Matias, Christopher G. Matz, Joseph J. Ciampa, Pierre Maximilien, Jeffrey Mayo, Kevin McCaffrey, Daniel J. McCann, Gerald McCoy, Robert McGee, Kevin M. McGevna, Thomas P. McGillicuddy, Michael McGovern, John McGowan, John Ciuppo, Thomas J. McHale, Bruce V. McIntyre, Roxanne McKay-Chung, Philip A. McManus, Scott McMaster, John McMonagle, Daniel J. McNeil, David Medina, Vincent Medordi, Anthony J. Mei, Anthony F. Colauesto, Jennifer Melore, Sheila Merritt, Joseph V. Mesita, Mark Meyer, Michael Michezini, Laretha Miller, Rodney Mitchell, Ricardo H. Miyamoto, Vincent Moccio, Eugene P. Moffutt, Andre Colclough, Christopher Moll, William Montafia, Jimmie R. Moore, III, Napoleon Morales, Rosa M. Morales, Christopher Morris, John Mortimer, John P. Mullinax, Lisa Murphy, Thomas V. Murphy, Crystal R. Collins, Elizabeth Medina, Edmund P. Murray, Christopher Negron, Ricardo Nenadich, Andrew J. Neumann, Gerard P. Neumann, Thomas H. Noguera, Erin Nolan, Robert F. Norton, Jose O. Colon, Michael T. Nutley, Joseph F. Oggeri, Janet O', Keefe, Margaret O', Keefe, Anthony Olivieri, Debra O', Neill, Rafael Orozco, Sadrina L. Osborne, Patricia A. O', Sullivan, Carol W. Otto, Maria Cooper, Michael J. Ciampo, James Paliotta, Amanda Palmenta, James R. Palmer, Stephen G. Panarese, Louis Pannone, Antonio PaPallo, Anthony A. Papiro, Daniel Parker, Matthew Paules, Eileen Pecora, Carlos A. Cortes, Frank P. Pellegrino, Jr, Magdalena Pereira, Miguel A. Perez, Frederick Perkinson, Shaun Persaud, Nikki L. Phillips, Mitchell Podgorsky, Shawn Ponder, Pete Preller, Quin Prioleau, Yolanda Cotto, Miguelina Puello, Paul J. Quinn, Leonard Radakovic, Louis Ramos, Carl Randazzo, Raymond Rau, Lori L. Reese, Terence Reilly, Pedro Reyes, John Ricci, John Cousins, Mitzy A. Rich, Shawn J. Ricker, Wendy M. Rincon, Stephen J. Rindos, Monica Rios, Adrian Rivera, Carl Rivera, Doris Rivera, Jorge L. Rivera, Russell T. Rivera, Gerald Credezzi, Michael C. Robbert, Vicente R. Rodriguez, Wilberto Rodriguez, Victor M. Rodriguez Rivern, Marcus Rollins, Richard A. Ruggero, Vincent M. Rusanelli, Michelle Rusnock, Andrew M. Russian, Raymond Russo, Anna Maria Crisano, Brian J. Rutherford, Thomas Nagel, George Parker, Maureen A. Parks, Erin P. Reilly, William Rivera, Robert Salvadori, Joeselyn Sanabria, Jr, Alex R. Sanchez, Jose L. Sanchez, Milton R. Sanchez, Steven Sanchez, Amalia Sanchez-Teixeira, Richard R. Sanders, Rochelle Sanders, Ivan Santiago, Keith Sawyer, Thomas Sax, Michael Scaparro, Salvatore Scaturro, Anthony Cuoco, Gregg E. Schreiber, Allan Schule, Kevin Sefcik, Stephen Seidel, Gary Sellars, Richard Seta, Julio C. Silva, Jr, Peter A. Silverio, Robert Silvestri, William P. Simmons, Steven Daniels, Justin Slater, Frederick J. Smith, Sylvia M. Smith, Thomas Smith, Patrick Solomita, Michael P. Sotira, Santiago Soto, John Spaccaforna, Thomas P. Speed, John Stabbing, Raul Del Pozo, James P. Stack, LaTavia Steele, Mark Steinhaven, Rosie Stembridge, Matthew C. Storms, John M. Suarez, John Suarez, Robert P. Sullivan, Roy L. Sullo, Bridget M. Swenson, Lee Desposito, John N. Ciotola, Joseph M. Szaniszlo, Joseph Tarsio, Michael D. Tates, Jose Tavarez, Denise R. Taylor, John Tegeler, Brian Theophilus, Gerold Timoney, Christopher J. Tolan, Craig M. Tomasino, Joseph Dimeo, Harry Torres, Eugenio Torriente, Leonardo Tortorici, Joseph Tricarico, Koscuisko A. Trisano, Thomas G. Turner, Josh Ulan, Vincent Urgo, Curtis F. Valley, Serice Vaughan, Alfonso DiMino, Ivan J. Vazquez, Peter Vdaric, Anthony Velez, Lisamarie Velotta, Nelly Viera, Charles I. Volpe, Jr, James M. Vroman, Eileen Walker, James Walsh, Kevin Walsh, Brian E. Donnelly, Jonette J. Warren, Charles Weber, Kurt Weber, Keith Wendler, Joseph F. Wendling, Kenneth W. Wengert, Charles Wessel, Meriel White, Stacey White, Christopher Whitford, Robert Dorrian, Robert D. Williams, Robert L. Williams, Jr, Davon Wilson, Mary Wilson,
May 12, 2008 Filing 196 DECLARATION of Damon W Taaffe in Support re: 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Joseph Abbruzzese, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Barbara D. Abreu, Robert Accurso, Gary W. Aaronson, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Salvatore J Accardi, Ernesto Aceredo, Sebastian Acosta, et al. (pl)
May 12, 2008 Filing 195 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS NOT IN DISPUTE. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Timothy Aiken, Joseph Abbruzzese, Chris Agoglia, Jabded Ahmed, Titus Alexander, Julio Alicea, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, Viola Adrien, Kurt Albertson, Robert Alejo, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Pat Acri, James A. Added, Lora Algotti, James J. Alexander, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Barbara D. Abreu, Gary W. Aaronson, Felix Alicea, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Viviana Agasto, William Aguirre, Olajumoke Ajasa, John C. Albarano, Jeffrey M. Alicea, Gerard A. Alfano, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, Paul Adams, Robert Addona, Herold P. Alexis, Gabriel G. Alfonso, Gerlad J. Alicea, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Ernesto Aceredo, Sebastian Acosta, et al. (pl)
May 12, 2008 Filing 194 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Timothy Aiken, Robert Albertson, Mark Allia, Joseph Abbruzzese, Chris Agoglia, Jabded Ahmed, James Ainslie, Joseph Alejandro, Scott Alessy, Thomas Alexander, Titus Alexander, Julio Alicea, Luis Alicea, Virginia Alier, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, James F. Adams, Viola Adrien, Jmes R. Agugliano, Kurt Albertson, Joseph P. Alcuri, Robert Alejo, Digna L. Aliperti, Serina Allman, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, James A. Added, Vincenzo Adduci, James Aitken, Carl Alayon, Joseph P. Albertini, John Alexander, Lora Algotti, Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, Nora Ahmed, Thomas Ailman, James J. Alexander, Donald G. Allen, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, Robert Albano, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Stephen Agosta, Barbara D. Abreu, Robert Accurso, Gary W. Aaronson, Felix Alicea, Raymond R. Alexander, III, Mayser Alijader, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Glenn Adelson, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Eleanor Adjei-Burnett, Carrie Ann Adomeit, Mark Afanasewicz, Viviana Agasto, William Aguirre, Richard Agustini, John Ahlf, Dorothy Aiello, Olajumoke Ajasa, John C. Albarano, Frank Albergo, Richard A. Alequin, Jeffrey M. Alicea, Cortney Allen, Timothy C. Allen, Jason Allison, Patrick Allison, Christopher J. Adam, Gerard A. Alfano, All Plaintiffs, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, Paul Adams, Louis Addimando, Robert Addona, James Afanacio, Sixto Alamo, Herold P. Alexis, Gabriel G. Alfonso, Gerlad J. Alicea, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Salvatore J Accardi, Ernesto Aceredo, Joseph Agati, Anthony Aggate, James Alberici, Beltran Alemany, Loida Alicea, Sebastian Acosta, Warren T. Adamson, Brett Allen, Dwayne A. Allen, Orlando Almestica. (pl)
May 12, 2008 Filing 193 MOTION for an order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Azab Abdelalim, Julio Acevedo, Timothy Aiken, Robert Albertson, Joseph Abbruzzese, Chris Agoglia, Jabded Ahmed, James Ainslie, Joseph Alejandro, Scott Alessy, Thomas Alexander, Titus Alexander, Shawn Abate, Theresa Abbazia, Dennis Acampora, George Acevedo, James F. Adams, Viola Adrien, Jmes R. Agugliano, Kurt Albertson, Joseph P. Alcuri, Robert Alejo, Richard J. Aalbue, Jr, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Dean Abruscato, Thomas Accardo, Thomas J. Acito, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, James A. Added, Vincenzo Adduci, James Aitken, Carl Alayon, Joseph P. Albertini, John Alexander, Lora Algotti, Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, Nora Ahmed, Thomas Ailman, James J. Alexander, William J. Aberger, James Abrahamsen, Robert Albano, James C. Abenante, Louis Accardi, Stephen Agosta, Barbara D. Abreu, Robert Accurso, Gary W. Aaronson, Felix Alicea, Raymond R. Alexander, III, Joseph Abbattista, Paul Abraham, Kenneth Abruzese, Brigitte L. Adams, Glenn Adelson, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Eleanor Adjei-Burnett, Carrie Ann Adomeit, Mark Afanasewicz, Viviana Agasto, William Aguirre, Richard Agustini, John Ahlf, Dorothy Aiello, Olajumoke Ajasa, John C. Albarano, Frank Albergo, Richard A. Alequin, Christopher J. Adam, Gerard A. Alfano, Twanda Abernathy, Luis Abramson, Paul Adams, Louis Addimando, Robert Addona, James Afanacio, Sixto Alamo, Herold P. Alexis, Gabriel G. Alfonso, James R Abbananto, Tariq Abdullah, Salvatore J Accardi, Ernesto Aceredo, Joseph Agati, Anthony Aggate, James Alberici, Beltran Alemany, Sebastian Acosta, Warren T. Adamson.(pl)
May 9, 2008 Filing 192 APPENDIX OF EVIDENTIARY MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (pl)
May 9, 2008 Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (pl)
May 9, 2008 Filing 190 MOTION for an order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 for Summary Judgment, w/attch. Rule 56.1 Stmt. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department.(pl)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Damon William Taaffe for keenan M. Scott, et al admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/7/2008) (mme)
April 16, 2008 Filing 188 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Gary A. Orseck by Keenan M. Scott (jmi)
April 11, 2008 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/02/08 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER that both parties shall produce expert reports on payroll data no later than 3/24/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/13/08) (cd)
March 13, 2008 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/21/2008 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama)
March 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE, counsel shall appear for a pre motion conference regarding class certification on 3/31 at 3:30. All dispositive motions, motions challenging expert designation and motions regarding class certification, shall be served no later than 4/30/08; all opposition papers served no later than 5/30/08; all reply papers, if any, served no later than 6/13/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/4/08) (cd)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER, the parties having appeared before the Court for a status conference on 2/21/08, the production of the memo books of the representative plaintiffs shall occur no later than 3/10/08, and other discovery rulings as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/25/08) (cd)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Lorie Almon dated 2/13/08 re: On behalf of Defendants, we write to request a 90 day adjournment of some or all of the deadlines contained in the Scheduling order. A number of delays in the completion of discovery have necessitated such an adjournment. ENDORSEMENT: A conference to discuss these issues is scheduled for February 20 at 2:30 p.m. So Ordered., ( Status Conference set for 2/20/2008 at 02:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/14/08) (js)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 2/7/08 re: that at a 2/1/08 conference call, you directed that I propose language for an Order requiring all Representative Plaintiff to produce their memo books. Plaintiffs believe that the attached language faithfully incorporates your Honor's direction during out call. ENDORSEMENT: The Court has considered the parties' submissions and proposed Orders and has concluded that production of memo books to NYPD supervisors would be logistically awkward. Therefore, the memo books should be produced to Plaintiffs' counsel. Nevertheless, the Court concludes that the NYPD should bear the costs for time and money for of reproducing the memo books. Thus, as set forth in an Order issued this date, Plaintiffs counsel can provide the books to Defendants' counsel for copying. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/14/08) (pl)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER; that the Representative Plaintiffs shall provide their original documents, or copies of those documents, dating back to 1999 to Plaintiffs counsel, who will then provide them promptly to Defendants counsel. Defendants counsel shall copy any originals provided to them, and return them promptly to Plaintiffs counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/14/08) (pl)
January 25, 2008 Filing 179 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Robert S. Whitman dated 1/18/08 re: Counsel responds to Plaintiff's letter about an ostensible "discovery dispute" that they chose to raise with this Court. ENDORSEMENT: If not provided prior to Ms. Flythe's return, the answers shall be provided by Ms. Flythe by no later than February 9, 2008. The Court deems this an admission that certain police officers are required to remain within radio contact. Respond to the question assuming it is asking about this practice occurring in at least some precincts. Produce those documents by no later than February 1, 2008. Make follow-up 30(b)(6) witnesses availability by February 6, 2008. If you need clarification on deposition subjects, speak to Plaintiffs' counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 1/25/08) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
January 11, 2008 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/20/07 before Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (bw)
January 4, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz: Discovery conference held on 1/4/2008. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and counsel for dft(s) present. (ja)
December 26, 2007 Filing 177 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Lorie Almon dated 12/26/2007 re: request a two-day extension of time until 12/28/2007 to respond to the 12/20/2007 letter from Tom Puccio to Judge Scheindlin. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 12/26/2007) (jar)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Thomas Puccio dated 12/20/07 re: counsel for plaintiffs request that the Court enter several discovery orders described herein. ENDORSEMENT: Although counsel chose not to send this letter, or even a copy this letter, to this Court, Judge Scheindlin did and, consistent with the referral to this Court for general pretrial supervision, this Court will address the matters raised herein. Defendants shall provide a response by 12/26/07. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 12/20/07) Copies mailed by chambers.(dle)
December 20, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz: Discovery conference held on 12/20/2007. (ja)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 9/5/07 re: informing the Court of the status of plaintiffs discovery requests. ENDORSEMENT: As determined at the conference on this date, plaintiff is hereby granted leave to take the proposed Rule 30(b)(6) documents. The parties shall make a good faith effort to narrow the scope of the depositions, as suggested at the conference. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 9/20/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers on 9/21/07.(kco)
September 20, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Discovery Conference (telephone) held on 9/20/2007. (pl)
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery shall be completed by 2/29/08. Exchange of Expert Reports concerning pay data due 12/1/07. Depositions of Experts identified pursuant to para.6.a due 1/15/08. Exchange of all other expert reports due 1/31/08. Depositions of Experts identified pursuant to para.6.c due 2/29/08. A pre-motion conference regarding potential dispositive motions set for 3/10/08 at 4:30 p.m. Dispositive Motions and Motions regarding Class Certification are due by 3/31/08. Trial shall commence on 9/16/08. Motions due by 3/31/2008. Deposition due by 2/29/08. Discovery due by 2/29/2008. Ready for Trial by 9/16/2008. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/17/07) (db)
August 27, 2007 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on August 8, 2007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (gca)
August 24, 2007 Filing 172 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lorie Elizabeth Almon on behalf of City of New York, New York City Police Department. New Address: Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10018, 212 218-5500. (Almon, Lorie)
June 19, 2007 Filing 171 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Robert S. Whitman dated 6/13/07 re: a response to Mr. Oreseck's letter of June 8. ENDORSEMENT: Three months to produce sample documents is unacceptable. The City has hired outside counsel to litigate this case, so outside counsel must assist on gathering the documents if the police department is incapable of doing so within a reasonable period of time. The samples should be produced by 7/10/2007. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 6/15/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers(kco)
June 19, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Discovery Hearing held on 6/19/2007. (tro)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Darrell Bush dated 6/12/07 re: I am writing to you today to inform you that I just received my package and the summons paper is dated, 5/23/07. Which leaves me no time at all to mail out my summons within the time lines already set-up, I am asking to be granted an extension of the 20 days date to complete the summons and mail them out. ENDORSEMENT: I'm not sure what you have in mind their is no 20 day limit for completion of summons and mailing just do it as soon as conveniently as possible. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 6/15/07) (js)
June 4, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Telephone Conference held on 6/4/2007. (jar)
April 27, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Discovery Hearing held on 4/27/2007. (dle)
April 25, 2007 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/11/2007 before Judge Theodore H. Katz. (jp)
April 11, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Telephone Conference held on 4/11/2007. (jco)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 2/20/07 re: Counsel writes to report unresolved issues. Defendants shall produce responsive documents, as described in paragraph 2 above, by March 12, 2007. Deposition dates for the next five deponents shall be provided by 3/5/07. Draft responses and/or comments on the proposed stipulations shall be provided by 3/9/07. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/27/07) (jco)
February 13, 2007 Filing 167 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Robert S. Whitman dated 2/8/07 re: Defendants write to respond briefly to the letter from Plaintiffs' counsel of earlier today; By 2/16/07, the parties are to confer and are to make a good faith effort to address the issues raised in Mr. Oveck's letter of 2/8. Any issues that cannot be resolved should be presented to the Court by 2/21/07. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/13/07) (ae)
December 4, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2006. Pretrial Discovery Conference. For Plaintiff(s): Gary Orsek, Thomas Puccio, Damon Taffe. For Deft(s): Lorie Almon, Peter Walker, Rosemary Joyce. (jar, )
November 28, 2006 Filing 166 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 11/22/06 re: regarding the schedule for depositions to be taken by plaintiffs.The parties submit this proposed discovery plan without prejudice to their rights to take further discovery after this initial period, or to dfts rights to take depositions of plaintiffs or for either party to seek additional documents as appropriate in view of the survey's progress. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 11/27/06) (pl, )
November 8, 2006 MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: Discovery conference held. (djc, )
October 5, 2006 Filing 165 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katz from Gary Orseck dated 9/27/06: the schedule set forth above shall be observed by the parties when good casue is shown. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 10/4/06) (cd, )
July 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 164 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND RELEASE (PROTECTIVE ORDER); regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 7/20/06) (kco, )
June 27, 2006 MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: (Discovery Conference via) Telephone conference Held (djc, )
April 26, 2006 Filing 163 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Gary A. Orseck, dated April 25, 2006; re: counsel requests that the court set another date for the parties to report their progress. Provide an update on June 30, 2006. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 4/26/06) (djc, )
March 24, 2006 Filing 162 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Lorie Almon dated 3/22/06 re:.... update the status report by April 25, 2006. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 3/23/06) (djc, )
February 2, 2006 Filing 161 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Lorie Almon dated 1/30/06 re: update regarding the "pretest" stage of the parties' survey of plaintiffs in the referenced case. The next status report shall be submitted by 03/20/06. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 1/31/06) (djc, )
December 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Theodore H. Katz from Lorie Almon dated 11/30/05. ENDORSEMENT: Submit the next status report on January 30, 2006. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 12/2/05) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(js, )
October 18, 2005 Filing 159 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 10/14/05. ENDORSEMENT: A status Report on the pretest shall be submitted by 11/30/05. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 10/17/05) (js, )
September 26, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2005. (db, )
September 16, 2005 Filing 158 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Lorie E. Almon dated 4/11/05 re: The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Charles Jackson and Brendan Sweeney as counsel for defendants from the docket for the above mentioned case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/9/05) (kco, )
August 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER; the Court having conferred with the parties, hereby amends its 6/26/05 memorandum endorsed order. The parties shall have until 9/16/05 to attempt to agree on the substance of the survey to be administered to purported class members. As agreed, a telephone conference will be held on 9/26/2005 at 2:00 PM. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 8/30/05) (kco, )
July 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 7/25/05 re: response to Your Honor's 7/7/05 order directing the parties to submit a proposed schedule for completion of all class-related discovery. The substance of the survey shall be agreed upon by no later than 8/31/05, and distributed by no later than 9/12/05. The parties shall notify the Court when the distribution occurs and shall indicate how long class members have been given to complete and return the surveys (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 7/26/05) Copies mailed by Chambers.(yv, )
July 25, 2005 Filing 155 CONSENT TO JOIN CLASS. Document filed by Robert A. Szoyka.(ae, )
July 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Gary A. Orseck dated 7/13/05 re: requesting that the Court permit the parties to submit propsed scheduling order by 7/22/05. The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 7/14/05) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(kw, )
July 8, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Interrogatories due by 8/26/2005. (db, )
July 8, 2005 Filing 153 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Lorie Almon dated 7/1/05 re: the Court will allow defendants until 8/26/05 to provide the interrogatory responses. The parties should confer and submit a proposed schedule for completion of all class-related discovery by 7/15/05. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 7/7/05) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db, )
June 27, 2005 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/8/2005 @11:00am before Judge Theodore H. Katz. (lb, )
June 20, 2005 Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/8/2005 @ 11:00am before Judge Theodore H. Katz. (lb, )
June 8, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theodore H. Katz : Settlement Conference held on 6/8/2005; case in which a settlement conference was held in court before a Magistrate Judge. (jma, )
May 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial. Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/10/05) (db, )
May 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute re: letter attached. Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/6/2005) (jsa, )
April 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER that any and all of plntfs' Post-Complaint claims are deemed to be subsumed within, and are the subject of, the Amended Complaint, as further set forth in this document. With respect to the claims alleged in the Five Counts, this stipulation and Agreement does not serve to reopen the op-in process to permit the filing of consents by additional persons to join this action, which opt-in period period closed on 1/15/04, and no consents fld after 1/15/04 shall be deemed timely, other than consents fld by undercover officers, which consents are timely only if fld within 90 days of service. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/31/05) (cd, )
December 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 91058 re: 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by City of New York,, New York City Police Department,. For the reasons further set forth in this Order, defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/27/04) (yv, )
December 27, 2004 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 146 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/27/04, Receipt Number 529825. (sac, )
December 13, 2004 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 146 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle, )
December 13, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Gary A. Orseck for plaintiffs admitted Pro Hac Vice in connection with this action and that he shall abide by the provisions of the Local Rules of this court in all respects and be subject to the disciplinary jurisdiction of the court in accordance with Local Rule 1.5. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/30/04) (dle, )
December 1, 2004 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 145 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco, )
December 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER, Gary A. Orseck shall be and hereby is admitted pro hac vice in connection with this action and that he shall abide by the provisions of the Local Rules of this Court in all respects and be subject to the disciplinary jurisdiction of the Court in accordance with Local Rule 1.5. So Ordered.(Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/29/04) (jco, ) Modified on 12/27/2004 (ae, ).
November 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER Any and all communications, including but not limited to oral and written questions, answers, comments, proposals, notes, drafts and edits (hereinafter, "Communications"), made between defendants' Survey Professional(s) and plaintiffs' Survey Profession(s) in connections with and in furtherance of the Survey Development Process, shall not be subject to discovery, and need not be revealed or produced pursuant to any written or oral discovery demand. In addition, any and all communications made between counsel for a party and the Survey Professional(s) retained by that same party, which are made in connection with and in furtherance of the Survey Development Process, shall not be subject to discovery, and need not be revealed or produced pursuant to any written or oral discovery demand, etc. as further set fourth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/12/04) (jco, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (kw, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Lawrence S. Robbins in Support re: 141 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott, et al. (kw, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Keenan M. Scott. (kw, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Lorie E. Almon, Esq. in Support re: 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (kw, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (kw, )
November 15, 2004 Filing 138 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to FRCP 12(c) in part with respect to Counts 3,4 and 5 of the Amended Complaint. Annexed Declaration of Brendan Sweeney. Document filed by City of New York, New York City Police Department. (kw, )
October 21, 2004 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/9/2004 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.(Gonzalez, Jose)
October 12, 2004 Filing 137 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on February 3, 1999 before Judge Robert Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 136 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on February 2, 1999 before Judge Robert L. Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 135 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on March 17, 1999 before Judge Robert L. Cohen. (Vo. 1 of 2 - attached)(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 134 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on February 18, 1999 before Judge Robert Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 133 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on February 17, 1999 before Judge Robert Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 132 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on March 15, 1999 before Judge Robert L. Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 131 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on March 4, 1999 before Judge Robert L. Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 130 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, New York, Case Number 1408/97, held on (date not indicated) before Judge Honorable Robert H.Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 129 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the State Supreme Court, County of Bronx, Case Number 1408/97, held on February 4, 1999 before Judge Hon. Robert Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
October 12, 2004 Filing 128 STATE COURT TRANSCRIPT of proceedings in the Supreme Court, County of Bronx, Case Number 1408/97, held on March 22, 1999 before Judge Hon. Robert L. Cohen.(djc, ) Modified on 10/26/2004 (djc, ).
July 28, 2004 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/9/2004 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.(jmi, )
July 8, 2004 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Robbins on behalf of all plaintiffs (db, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 124 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on June 11, 2004 served Christian T. McBrearty, "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" by mail to Christian T. McBrearty at last known address; (djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on November 13, 2004 of the "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" by hand in New York NY on the noted undercover officers employed by the NYC Poloice Dept, identified herein by their unercover officers numbers; On November 18, 12003, caused a true an dcorrecto cop of the "notice to Potnetial Plaintiffs by hand in NY on noted undercover officers employed by the NYC Police Dept., identified herein by their undercover officer numbers; (djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on March 3, 2004 of the "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" served by hand in New York, NY on the noted undercover officers employed by the NYC POlice Dept, identified herein by their undercover officer numbers as noted herein. (djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" served by hand on November 19, 2003 in New York, NY on the noted undercover officers employed by the NYC Police Dept, identified herein by their undercover officer numbers;(djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" on December 9, 2003 by hand in Brooklyn, NY on the following unercover officers identified herein by their undercover officer numbers; On December 10, 2003 also caused and true and correct copy of the Notice to Potential Plaintiffs to be served by hand in Brooklyn, NY on the noted undercover officers employed by the NYC Police Dept., identified herein by their undercover officer numbers; On December 11, 2003, caused true and correct copy of the Notice to Potential plaintiffs, served by hand in Brooklyn, NY on the noted undercover officers emplooyed by the NYC POlice Dept., identified herein by their undercover officer numbers. (djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of "Notice to Potential Plaintiffs" by hand in NY on the undercover officers employed by the NYC Police Dept., identified herein by their undercover officer numbers as listed in this Affidavit on April 1, 2004. (djc, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of notice to potential plaintiffs served on undercover officers employed by the New York City Police Department identified herein on 10/23/03. Service was made by hand. Document filed by City of New York. (dle, )
June 23, 2004 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 90257; for the reasons set forth on this Opinion, defts motions to dismiss Count One and to join the Unions are denied. Conference set for 7/9/2004 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/2004) (jp, )
June 2, 2004 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 116 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (dle, )
June 2, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The applicant, Mark A. Crabtree, may appear pro hac vice in this case upon payment of the appropriate fee. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/1/04) (dle, )
May 28, 2004 Filing 115 PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE To Defendants' Motion To Join Plaintiffs' Unions As Necessaey Non-Aligned Parties. Document filed by City of New York. (jmi, )
May 28, 2004 Filing 114 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW Of Defendants The City of New York And The City of New York Police Department in Support re: 112 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) To Join Plaintiff's Unions As Necessary, Non-Aligned Parties re: Document filed by City of New York. (jmi, )
May 28, 2004 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW Of Defendants The City of New York And The City of New York Police Department in Support re: 112 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) To Join Plaintiff's Unions As Necessary, Non-Aligned Parties. Document filed by City of New York. (jmi, )
May 28, 2004 Filing 112 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) To Join Parties Pursuant To Fed. R. CIV. P. 19(a). Document filed by City of New York. (jmi, )
May 19, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Lorie E. Almon dated 5/19/04 re: Counsel for defendants write to request that the Court extend the NYPD's time to submit its reply papers in support of its motion to join plaintiffs' Unions as Necessary. Defendants' request is hereby granted. NYPD's time to submit its reply papers in support of its motion to join plaintiffs' unions necessary non-aligned parties is extended from 5/21/04 to 5/28/04. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/19/04) (jco, )
March 19, 2004 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/23/04 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.(ja, )
March 18, 2004 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 23, 2004 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.(jw, )
March 5, 2004 Filing 108 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Dismiss Count I of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (laq, )
March 5, 2004 Filing 107 DEFENDANTS THE CITY OF NEW YORK AND THE NEW YORK CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING 207(O)(5) OF THE FLSA. (laq, )
March 5, 2004 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANTS' THE CIYY OF NEW YORK AND THE NEW YORK CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DIMISS COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. (laq, )
March 5, 2004 Filing 105 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING SECTION 207(O)(5) OF THE FLSA. (laq, )
March 5, 2004 Filing 104 REPLY to DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING SECTION 207(o)(5) OF THE FLSA. Document filed by Richard J. Aalbue Jr., Gary W. Aaronson, Shawn Abate, James R Abbananto, Joseph Abbattista, Theresa Abbazia, Joseph Abbruzzese, Azab Abdelalim, Tariq Abdullah, James C. Abenante, William J. Aberger, Twanda Abernathy, Glenn Abolt, Paul Abousamra, John A. Abraham, Paul Abraham, James Abrahamsen, Luis Abramson, Barbara D. Abreu, Dean Abruscato, Kenneth Abruzese, Dennis Acampora, Louis Accardi, Salvatore J Accardi, Thomas Accardo, Robert Accurso, Ernesto Aceredo, George Acevedo, Julio Acevedo, Albert R. Acierno, Thomas J. Acito, Junto C. Acosta, Sebastian Acosta, Christopher J. Acquilino, Pat Acri, Christopher J. Adam, Brigitte L. Adams, James F. Adams, Paul Adams, Warren T. Adamson, James A. Added, Louis Addimando, Robert Addona, Vincenzo Adduci, Glenn Adelson, Vincent J. Adinolfi, Eleanor Adjei-Burnett, Carrie Ann Adomeit, Viola Adrien, James Afanacio, Mark Afanasewicz, Viviana Agasto, Joseph Agati, Anthony Aggate, Chris Agoglia, Stephen Agosta, Jmes R. Agugliano, William Aguirre, Richard Agustini, John Ahlf, Jabded Ahmed, Nora Ahmed, Dorothy Aiello, Timothy Aiken, Thomas Ailman, James Ainslie, James Aitken, Olajumoke Ajasa, Sixto Alamo, Carl Alayon, Robert Albano, John C. Albarano, Frank Albergo, James Alberici, Joseph P. Albertini, Kurt Albertson, Robert Albertson, Joseph P. Alcuri, Joseph Alejandro, Robert Alejo, Beltran Alemany, Richard A. Alequin, Scott Alessy, James J. Alexander, John Alexander, Raymond R. Alexander III, Thomas Alexander, Titus Alexander, Herold P. Alexis, Gerard A. Alfano, Gabriel G. Alfonso, Lora Algotti, Felix Alicea, Gerlad J. Alicea, Jeffrey M. Alicea, Julio Alicea, Loida Alicea, Luis Alicea, Virginia Alier, Mayser Alijader, Digna L. Aliperti, All Plaintiffs, Brett Allen, Cortney Allen, Donald G. Allen, Dwayne A. Allen, Timothy C. Allen, Mark Allia, Jason Allison, Patrick Allison, Serina Allman, Orlando Almestica, Patrick Almonor, Ana Almonte, Pedro Almonte, Roberto Almonte, Chintua E. Alozie, Judith Alphonso, Thomas J. Alps, Ron Als, Joseph S. Alt, Carmelo J. Alvarez, Desi Alvarez, Marc Alvarez, Marc Alvarez, Robert Amaniera, Ramon Amaro, Mark Amato, Anthony Ambnosini, Louis C. Amen, Keith N. Ames III, Romano Amleto, Andrew Amplo, Wilson Anaya, Jean-Paul Ancion, Alexis Anderson, Darrell Anderson, Devon Anderson, Donald C Anderson, Donald J. Anderson, Edward Anderson, Eric L. Anderson, Kareem J. Anderson, Kirk Anderson, Robert Anderson, Trina Anderson, Roger Andino, Pedro Andion Jr., Joseph A. Andre, Peter Andre, Vincent A Andre, Anthony Andreano, Lief K. Andreassen, Michael A. Andreo, Derek Andreone, Jason Andreula, Michael Andrews, Michael D. Andriano, Ceil Andriola, Thomas J. Andry, Anthony Anesta, Frank P. Angelone, Bryan Angerer, Joseph A. Angerome, Frank Anglisano Jr., Mark Annstrong, Michael Annunziata, Mike Annunziata, Phil Anschick, Peter Anselmo, Castronova Anthony, Miranda Anthony, Nathaniel Anthony, Shadene L. Anthony, Victor Anthony, William Anthony, Hubert Antoine, Nicholas Antonelli, Thomas F. Antonetti, Michele C. Antoniato, Michael J. Antonucci, Steven Aparicio, Ralph Aponte, Richard Aponte, Gregory Apostolatos, Kostantinos Apostolatos, Douglas J. Appel, Victor A. Appel, Tracy L. Applewhite, Arnold V. Aprea, Vincent Aprea, Dominick Apuzzo, Thomas Aquila, Ely Arav, George Arce, Marvin Arce, Bruce Arch, Ronald S. Archer, Stella Ardizzne, Karen Arena, Robert J. Arenella, Joe X. Arguello, IoAnnis Argyros, Eduardo J. Arias, Joseph Arias, Luis Arias, Brian A. Armida, Michael Armocida, Teron E. Armstrong, Keith Arndt, Robert Arnold, Towanna Arnold, Miguel Arocho Jr., April M. Arocho-Mercedes, William Arons, Joseph E. Aronsen, Samuel Arrayo, Angel Arrieta, Paul Arrigo, Amari Arroyo, David Arroyo, Elizabeth Arroyo, Jose Arroyo II, Richard Arroyo, Wilfredo J. Arroyo, Guillermo Arrubla, Michael Aruty, Christopher J. Asam, Robert Ascione, Paul Asfazadour, Timothy Askin, Lisa Assante, Rafael Astacio, Harold J. Astree, James Atanacio, Michael Athanasio, Craig Atkinson, David B. Atkinson, Peter Attina, Robert Auberger, JJoseph Augello, John V. Augeri, Carlet Auguste, Antoinette J. Augustus Miller, Christopher Aull, Colin Austin, Steven Aversano, Richard Averso, Ginger Avery, Thomas Avery, Kenneth Avila, Enrique Aviles, Lisa Aviles, Liza Aviles, Marro Aviles, Victor Aviles, Dominick Avitabile, Rafet Awad, Werner Ay, Edwin Ayala, Jeanne Ayala, Margarita Ayala, Maria Ayala, Robert Ayala, Robert Aylmer, William G. Azbino, Edward Azueta, John Azzarello, Steve Azzopardi, Bruce A. Babington, Sueann M. Bachmann, Dorothy Bachop, Charles Bacon, Thomas Bacon, Brenda Bacote, William Badala, Joseph Badalamente, Rocco Badalato, Raymond J. Badami, Jyan Badillo, Steven R. Badlu, Nick Badolato, Alison L Baez, Angelo Baez, David Baez, Guillenilo Baez, Anthony Baglione, Robert F. Baguiao, James L. Bahamonde, Jeffrey Bahm, Catherine Bahno, Gregory Bahrenburg, Michael Bahrenburg, Valerie Baialardo, Shahid N. Baig, Allen Bailey Jr., Drew Bailey, Ivy P. Bailey, Jeffrey Bailey, Lennox Bailey Jr., William Baker, Arman Baksh, Thomas Baldwin, Joseph Balise, Robert W. Ball, Christopher J. Ballacra, John Ballantyne, Brian Balser, Richard Balsone, A. Balu, Joseph I. Balzano, Martin A. Banghart, Kenneth W. Banker, Michael J. Banks, Clevelan Bannister, Danilo Bannister, Paul Baque, Martin F. Baranski, James J. Baratta, John C. Barberi Jr., Jordan Barbutz, David J. Barca, Brian T. Barcheski, Kenneth J. Baribault, Michael J. Barker, Nicholas Barnard, Chanda Barnes, Gerald Barnett, Angelo Barone, Frederic J. Barone, Gregory J. Barone, John Barone, Guillermo Barr, Michael J. Barra, Benito Barreiro, James Barreto, Brian J. Barrett, Patrick Barrett, Robert Barrett, Roberto I. Barrezueta, Paul Barrios, Damon K. Barriteau, Michael D. Barron, Robinson T. Barronda, Bernard Barrow, Jovany G. Barrow, Ann Barry, Patrick Barry, William J. Bartel, Brian Bartler, Cornelius Bartley, Harriet Bartomeo, Gary A. Bartunek, Joseph Baruso, David Bases, Nicholas J. Basile, Lawrence Baskerville, Shawn Bassarath, Michael Bassen, Daniel Bastardo, John Batanus, Devon Batignani, Braulio Batista, Gerald Batista, Jose A. Batista, Letty Batista, Soraya Batista, Tiffany Batista, Tito Batson, Joseph Battista, Edward Bauer III, Paul D. Bauer, Marcia K. Baughan, Michael Bauks, Christopher S. Baumann, Louis A. Bavaro, Nick Bavas, Robert Bayer, Harold R. BeHar, Joseph A. Beadle, William H. Beale, Carl Beard, Steven Beatty, William Beaury, Jose M. Becerril, William T. Beck, Guy A. Becker, Thomas E. Bedell, Tinel Bedford, Vickie Bedore, William K. Beeker, Arthur Beekman, Christopher Beer, Manuel Begawen, John R. Begg, William Behan, Andrew Beirne, Thomas P. Beirne, Albert Belcher, Domewic Belfiore, Dady Belfort, Bernard Belkys, James Bell, Lisa Bell, Mary A. Bell, Thomas Bell, Luis A. Bellapianta, John A. Bellington, Joseph Bellomo, Frank T. Bellotti, Carmine Belmonte, Jeffrey Belyea, Jean-Claude Benamou, Carmen Benavides, Steven Bendelson, Brian M. Benedict, Robert Benejan, William Beneventano, Peter Bengard, Lemuel Benitez, Wilworth Benjamin, Darren Benn, Brandon Bennett, Cassius N. Bennett, Mervin K. Bennett, Tanya Bennett, William V. Bennett, Richard Bennick, Daniel Bensimon, Michael P Benson, Ron Bensoy, Calvin Bent, Kevin Bentancourt, Gina Bentivegna, Antoinetta R. Benvenuto-Boyd, Luis A. Berancourt, John Berberian, Jose M. Bercerril, James T. Bergamine, Steve Bergen, Monty Berger, Timothy M. Berger, Robert Jean Berl, Philip C Berlingo, Joseph Bermardi, Heriberto Bermlidez, Jules C. Bernadotte, Brandon Bernard, James J. Bernard, Peter Bernard, Valdemar Bernardes, William A. Bernitt IV, Lee D. Bernstein, William Berques, Eric M. Berrios, Joseph Bertone, Kevin Beslity, Bonnie Best, Pablo Best, Morsal W. Betts, Christopher J. Betz, Edward L. Beurnier, Ramon Beveraggi, Joseph Bey, Gerard Beyrodt Jr., Anawd Bhoj, Michael J. Biaggi, John Biagini, Nicholas P. Biancoviso, Robert Bicchetti, Gerold G. Bierker, Darrell Biggs, Edward Bilardi, Philip Bilello Jr., James T. Biller, Darren T. Billerbech, Peter Billitteri, Michael Billotto, Matthew J. Bilotti, Vincent Bilotti, Warren C. Binford, Pelocka Binns, Vincent Biondollilo, Joseph Birbiglia, Byron Birdsong, Raymond T. Birmingham, Kevin Bischoff, Brett Bishop, Dawn Bishop, John S. Bishop, LaTonja Bishop, Michael John Bishop, Dennis Bittar, Michael Bivona, Marc Black, Matthew A. Black, Richard Black, Brian J. Blackman, Roslyn Blackwell, Steven Blaine, Christopher M. Blair, Gordon Blake, Nicholas Blanchard, Howard Blanck, Daniel Blanco, Dexter G. Blanding, Richard J Blasi, Timothy E. Blasko, Jeffrey Blaustein, Brian Blazer, Michael Blendo, Howard J. Blennau, Thomas Blieka, Michael A. Blissutt Jr., Lawrence J. Block, Zenobia D. Bly, Lucia Bodden, Dessmond Bodon, Michael B. Boehm, Theresa Boeninghens, Maureen Bogart, Hugh Bogle, James Bogliole, Janine A. Bohan, Wayne R. Bohm, Ernest W. Bohringer, Maureen Bolembach, Gavin Bollinger, Laura Bollmann, Steven Bolten, Andrew Bonadio, Denise Bonaventura, Joseph Bonaventura, Richard Bond, Rose M. Bond, Edward Bonda-Rira, Roberto Bonet, Annika Boney, Anthony Bonilla, Damasa Bonilla, Dennis Bonilla, Frank Bonilla Jr., Robinson Bonilla, Scott K. Boning, Craig Bonn, Michele Bonne-Annee, George Bonner, James Bonner, Joseph Michael Bonner, Edward Bonnie, Alessio Bono, Robert Bonomo, Neil J. Bontempi, George Bonura, Paul E. Bookman Jr., Brian C. Booth, Erick Borak, Brian Borbee, Denise A. Borchick, Victor Borg, Dorothy Borgese, Vincent Borgia, Christopher Borinla, Kenneth J. Boris, Peter J. Borowski, John Borrero, Raymond M. Borzon Jr., Trevor Bosco, Scot H. Bosselman, JASON Laurence Botler, Anthony C. Botta, Alan Bottega, Edgard Bourdon, Steven G. Bourekas, Michael J. Bourgeois, William A. Bourguignon, Thomas Bourne, Robert M. Bourque, James Bove, Christopher Bowden, Gary B. Bowen, Edward J. Bowler, Keith M. Bowling, Emmanuel T. Bowser, Michael J. Boyce, Rodney Boyce, Willis Boyce, Darren Boyd, Craig E. Boyer, Theodore Boyiantzis, Michael J. Boylan, Brian M. Boyle, James B. Boyle, James P. Boyle, John P. Boyle, Sean Boyle, Dawn K. Braccio, Robert James Bracero, Barry Bradley, Christopher Bradley, Kevin Bradley, Bre
February 13, 2004 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW regarding 207(o)(5) of the FLSA. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (db, )
January 23, 2004 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/23/2004. (tp, )
January 15, 2004 Filing 102 CONSENT TO join action. Document filed by Stephanie Winslow, Patrick Touhy, John Tennant, Michael Silva, Gangaram Samrha, Jose Rosado, Annette Rivera, Luis Reed, Louis Pomponio, Guillermo Moncada, Patrick Miller, Vincent Martinelli, John Marcantonatos, John Lunt, Brian Lormel, Aidia Lebron Forestier, Mark Holder, Geoffrey Hernandez, John Drouin, Nicholas Dibrino, Manuel Cuenca, Damarys Carrillo.(dle, )
January 15, 2004 Filing 101 CONSENT TO join action as plaintiffs. Document filed by John Zesilla, Angel Torres, Paul Sulzbach, William Sullivan, Todd A. Sessa, Miguel Santiago, Ann E. Riffas, Brian Plunkett, Christopher N. Painton, Dennis Migliore, Jennifer Matteucci, Shawn McCartney, Steven Manco, David Maligioinada, Emily Lopez, Jack J. LoBiondo, Adrian E. La Pene, Robert Keiley, Kevin F. Keenan, James M. Irwin, Robert Garcia, Kent Frezzell, Tyrone A. Forde, Jose Figueroa, Sylvia Faison, Thomas Donohue, Andrew Caradonna, James Bell, James Atanacio.(dle, )
January 15, 2004 Filing 100 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Almonte, Alex, Anderson, Joseph, BBarber Jr., Richard, L.Barbour, Keith, EBarone, Ernest, GBlack, David, WBoller, Glenn, ABoone, Edwin, TBoyce, Kevin, FBrown, Kevin, B.Bruestle, Maria, CCabell, Curtis, Canberg, Matthew, DCarrasquillo, Richard, Caserta, Frank, Chapman, Cathy, Coccodrilli, Richard, Collins, John, AColon-Cisneros, Adela, Conte, Christina, MConwell, James, ACreegan, Wesley, JCruz, Alberto, Cruz, Melanie, Daragjati, Michael, GDelgado, Gary, ADewar, Richard, Diaz, Erik, Diaz, Julian, RDiGiorgio, Anthony, Doktor, Virginia, ADonelan, Kevin, PFehsal, Michael, JFelice, Michael, Ford, Kimberly, RGarcia, Angelo, LGargano, Christopher, Glatz, Daniel, Grieve, Paul, SGriffin III, Dennis, MichaelGunn, George, AHaber, Gary, CHart, Raymond, MHempstead, Michael, EHirsch, Neil, Hogan, Terrance, PHoy, John, PHurley, James, RIntriago, Juan, FJones, Denise, AJusino, Elizabeth, Kane, Robert, FKeegan, Thomas, JLago, Juan, CLamonica, Robert, ALettieri, Dominick, DLiotta, Thomas, JMaher, Jane, MMartindale, Michelle, LMateo, Manuel, McDonald, George, PMcKay, Patrick, AMilligan, Derrick, EMilligan, Lenna, DMora, Cesar, O'Connor, Diane, EOtt, Patrice, MPacello, Ross, APaddock, Janice, LPadilla, Radames, Pala, William, Pan, Joseph, APayne, Jerry, LPedevillano, Marc, Penaherrera, Pablo, FPerez-Tado, Joellen, Rodriguez, Kenneth, Rodriguez, Mario, Roman, Pepito, Roscher, James, TSantanastaso, Michael, Sawyer, Harold, LSeaton, Stephanie, ASimco, Stephane, JSimon-Collier, Nefer, ASorrentino, Nicholas, ASorrentino, Philip, AStankevicius, Frank, JStella, Kenneth, Stewart, Rosalyn, GTaylor, Clark, ATheir, Paul, J.Thompson, Craig, MTomlinson, Christine, ETrennes, Edward, DTrent, Lance, STulloch, Bruce, AVailes, Zena, RVan Pelt, Robert, WVeltri, Joseph, Vera, Amalio, Williams, Jeremiah, SWojcik, James, MZafrani, Richard, MZerilli, Robert, P. (rag, )
January 13, 2004 Filing 99 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Abreu, Juan, LAlesia, Anthony, PAltieri Jr., Joseph, Alvarado, Anastacio, Amador, Jaime, AAmitrano, Alice, Anaya Jr., Jose, LAndryuk, John, JArce, Heraldo, Arena, Michael, RAshworth, Stephen, JAvallone, Dominick, JAvery, Derrick, AnthonyBahrenburg, William, HBeuttenmuller, Steven, CBeyrer, Brendan, PBing, James, IBoes, Allen, FBonacci, Michael, ABrady, Jane, EBroadus, Cherise, DBroadus, Timothy, Brutus, Sheldon, Bryce Jr., Charles, JBuckley, Anna, MBurgess, Delores, RCamarena, Rance, ACameron, Paul, VCampbell, Todd, DCarrano Jr., Martin, A.Carrion, Louie, ACarway, John, Casserly, Robert, WCastillo, Wilfredo, Chan, Christopher, LChan, Kenny, Chan, William, SChang, Kengming, Chiofalo, Christopher, JCilluffo, Frank, Clarke, Jean, MCobian, Caridad, MCollegio, Richard, Connors, Kevin, EContino, Jason, SContino, Jeeffrey, Cook, Michael, RCostin, John, SCross, Dominic, M.Cross, Erik, R.Cuce, David, Cuddy Jr., John, FCurbelo, Rafael, Daily, William, JDalton, Christopher, DeAngelis, Frederick, Deen, Dawn, KDeering, Shannon, CDeevy, Timothy, JDeJesus, Angel, MDemarco, Anthony, Depra, Jesus, VDiaz, Joel, CDiDomenico, Francis, ADiPaolo, Joseph, ADragone, Lisa, SDuffy, Martin, MDwyer, Andrew, Edwin Jr., Robert, JEhrichs, Roy, SEldridge, Bryan, CElter, Stephen, MFelten Jr., Thomas, PFernandez, Jeanette, MFiorentino, Ralph, JFlippen, Wesley, AForuria, Rosemarie, Francis-Moment, Grace, AFranzese, Paul, Francis AlexanderFranzitta, Jack, ThomasGadson, Richard, MGagliardi Jr, Louis, FGarduno, Ivy, Geoffrion Jr., Ronald, Gerald, David, EGiarro, Christopher, JGodfried, Jason, T.Goldberg, Edward, CGorman, Keith, Gould, Michael, JGrasso, Joseph, Greene, Devon, J Gross, John, PGuthrie, Judith, AGuzman, Erick, AHansen, Lucas, RHarvin, David, BHassler, Peter, JHatzoglou, Peter, DHenriquez, Elba, NHernandez, Jose, RHess, Patricia, AHicks, Gerard, WHines, Shynell, MHopkins, Thomas, JHuckemeyer, Michael, PImbert, Sidney, Iovine, Frank, AJoassainte, Joseph, AJones, Kevin, LJordan, Edmund, Joshi, Ankur, GKane, Timothy, Kendall, Melvin, AKlang, Eric, Laurendi, Loretta, Lavine, Charles, JLeary, Andrew, DLeontis, Robert, JLetizia, Christopher, JLewis, James, ELockwood, Eugene, JLombardo, Stephen, Lopez, Elmer, OLopez, Johnny, Lowe, Stephanie, ILukowsky, Brian, Madden, Adela, DMalloy, Ellen, AMaloney, Kevin, JMangan, John, GMartin, Chanae, TMartinez, Rubin, Martinez, Stephanie, Matos, Melvin, McDonald, Denise, AMcGrath, Debra, McGuire, Stephen, EMcLaurin, Alan, CMeadows, Christopher, SMercado, Robinson, GMetaxas, Valsamakis, Mezzatesta, Richard, AMiah, Harun, Migliaro, Gerald, Miller, David, MMiller, Joseph, LMoncayo, Francisco, JMoore, Deborah, CMoore Kellman, Sharon, CMoreira, Eric, Morel, Wendy, Morelli, Christopher, DMoss, Michael, GMulvihill, Marie, AMurphy, Thomas, JNazario, Adam, O'Connor, Michael, AO'Hare, Michael, AOlmo, Richard, PO'Neill, James, EOrazem, Carol, JOrtiz, Edgar, Otis, Charles, Pacheco, Luis, APadilla, Cynthia, Patterson, Lori, APaye, Richard, TPayne, Lateef, SPertgen, David, APeters, John, MPhillpotts, Carolyn, APolanco, Sandy, MPolanscak, Stefania, Pyne, John, Reddington, Michael, ARhoden, Kyle, KRiello, Robert, Rios, Luis, ERittmon, Regina, Rivas, Stephen, FRivera, Robert, ORodgers II, Kevin, JRodriguez, Doel, Rodriguez, Juan, RRogers, Burchell, WRohack, John, TRosado, Raymundo, Rosa-Martinez, Adelaide, Roth, Philip, BRykert, Christopher, JSanchez, David, Sanchez, Steve, Santiago, Maria, ESantos, Erlyn, RSchliessman, Kenneth, PSchroeder, John, Sciacca, Steven, GSeaman, Jason, MSeidel, Erik, PSelock, William, ASexton, Richard, GSinatra, Michael, Smallwood, Carolyn, Smith, William, DSorrenti, Peter, NStarling, Adriane, MSteiner, Jacqueline, MSteiner, William, WStembridge, Karen, E.Stiskin, Michael, ASuarez, Kevin, WSuter, Gail, JSweeney, Michael, JTaggart, Kathleen, MTaormina, Salvator, FTaylor, Diane, ETaylor, William, Teeter, Anthony, MTejada, Carmen, JThomas, Ronald, SThompson, Anne, PTobon, Jorge, ATompos, Stephen, JTorres, Judy, Torres, Manuel, Tribble Jr., Nathaniel, Valcich, Mark, NVallely, Kim, MVaughan, Jude, TVerrios, Alexander, Villacres, Beirut, Vranick, Steven, PWang, Geoffrey, Weingartner, Eril, JWelch, Wayne, MWellbrock, Brian, LWhelan, Paul, KWilliams, Gerald, SWilliams, Saundra, Wyatt-Shiver, Renee, Young, Trent, JZayas, Jorge. (rag, ) Modified on 1/22/2004 (rag, ).
December 24, 2003 Filing 98 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Arce, Keith, RAssenzio, Thomas, Brosnan, Owen, Carinci, Steven, JDeFilippo, Michael, Dominguez, Hugo, AFuentes, Jerry, Gong, Raymond, CHernandez, Magdelaine, Hoenscheid, Philip, JHumphreys, Michael, FLauler, Kevin, JLovett, John, CMcDonald, Thomas, JMcMillin, Michael, RMelian, Raudo, JPetroglia, Anthony, Przybycien, Jan, Rivas, Alejandro, JRivera, Annie, Rodriguez, Jose, SRong, Chris, ZSantiago, Madeline, Wendelken, Richard, WWillisch, Kenneth, F. (rag, )
December 16, 2003 Filing 97 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Becker Jr., Ronald, GBrennan, Thomas, FBucca, Robert, JChi, Tom, BCohen, Ronald, SCoor, Jr., Floyd, ADeJimenez, Lazaro, AEllerin, Paul, EFazio, Joseph, Hall, Carnegie, KHaughton, Ronald, Hoarle, Timothy, FJones Jr., Richard, Keenan, Michael, FKelleher, James, ELeibowitz, Leslie, HLutz, Charles, AMunoz, George, Payne, Anthony, BRosado, Osvaldo, Saenz de Viteri Jr., Jose, RSmallwood, Ronald, Smith, Christopher, KVeloz, Roberto. (rag, )
December 9, 2003 Filing 96 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Agugliaro, Steven, Alu, Stephen, RBarrett, Edward, RBlack, Timothy, G.Bleier, Frank, PBodner, Teresa, MBreiner, Gerald, TBrock, Wayne, Carmona, Marco, ACiaburri, Michael, JCooper, Sandra, PCordero, Luis, RCordova, Manuel, ACorrea, Manuel, Coutinho, Armando, Cruz, Gabriel, D'Ambrogio, Michael, CDenezzo, Gary, PDent, Joseph, G.DeSimone, Gaetano, MDiFrancisco, Michael, JEvans, Reginald, E.Finkelstein, Martin, HFlaherty, John, JFlores, Ivelisse, Giovingo, Carlo, WilliamGranick, Michelle, EGuele, Frank, DHeritier, Oscar, Hernandez, Julius, Horsford, Cedricka, SIsaacson, Philip, JJenkins, Michael, SKenary, Michael, JKing, Danny, Kraft, Kurt, PLopez, Miriam, Lynagh, Terence, PMalerba, Christopher, DMayes, Cynthia, McDermott, Suzanne, IreneMcKee-Giovingo, Theresa, AnnMcLaughlin, James, BMinogue, Evan, MNiemczyk, Leon, FPensa, Scott, VPietrunti, Philip, JPotter, Vivian, FRichardson, Timothy, Rivera-Diaz, Damaris, Rodriguez, Carlos, JRomano, Clare, ESamuels, Eric, RSantoro, Joseph, ASantos, Yajaira, EScheuermann, Lori, AnnSentowski, David, JSequeira, Jaime, Strauss, Scott, PTedeschi, James, AToner, Thomas, JTozzi, Kenneth, MVargas, Jimmy, Vazquez, Frank, WVilaseca, Ramon, Walker, Peggy, AnnWells, Michael, G.Yekhpairian, Sevan, H. (rag, )
November 26, 2003 Filing 95 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Arce, Keith R.; Hernandez,Magdelaine; King, Thomas G.; Marquez, Barbaro.(rag, )
November 24, 2003 Filing 94 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Bradshaw, Deirdre, MBrock, Walter, HHuttunen, Jorma, KKalisky, Alan, MKiah, Adolph, Marini, Vincent, MOlofson, Brian, RRodriguez, Carlos, JRosich, Ricky, Spears, Stephen, PTaverna, John, RVelez, Mervin, A. (rag, )
November 21, 2003 Filing 93 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Bushman, James, EButler, Raymond, MCunningham, Michael, OdenPadilla, Melvin, Race, Donovan, Thompson, Alberta, J. (rag)
November 20, 2003 Filing 92 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Clark, Tracey, A Ryan, Michael, T. (rag)
November 19, 2003 Filing 91 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Warner, Peter P. (rag)
November 18, 2003 Filing 90 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Alex, Gwendolyn, RArocho, Gregory, Bailey, Desmond, PCallow, Daniel, LChildress-Alford, Stacey, Cremin, Cornelius, PDel Valle, Jose, A.Dinnigan, James, MGarcia, John, FGondry, Nicole, EHickson, Wallace, EHillel, Yeshiya, R. BennKurtz, Robert, CNorris, Kenneth, Thorn, Aaron, LThrasher-Thorn, Dayshanna, GVixamar, Bernice, MWasilewski, Thomas. (rag)
November 17, 2003 Filing 89 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Agueros, Julie, AAlagna, Michael, BAlgieri, Michael, DAssante, Salvatore, J.Baboolal, Richard, Bamundo, Lawrence, RBarr, Lisa, MBarry, Christopher, MBrassil, Gail, PBrosnan, John, GCamilo, Gilberto, Campanelli, Jacqueline, Carway, John, Cattano, Anthony, Clark, George, FColban, Kevin, Colon, Richard, Cooper, Robert, LCorcoran, James, Corcoran, Patrick, JCrader, Clarissa, TCruz, Eric, GCzaja, Gerard, E.Deckert, Michael, JDeLuca, Vincent, DeQuevedo, Cynthia, Derbyshire, Valerie, ADermitzakis, Emanuel, EDiaz, Kenneth, ADiPierro, Victor, Doring, Mark, Dougherty, Brian, Douglas, Christopher, JDriscoll, Timothy, JEdwards, Douglas, JEldridge, Caryn, EFay, John, PFlorez, Vincent, Frawley, Stephen, BGarmendez, Edward, Geoghan, Brian, Gonzalez, Jr., Ruben, Gorham, Kevin, Greene, Michael, TGreenwood, Michael-Paul, SGuella, Emanuel, Habersham, Todd, Hand, Doreen, Hardman, Arnold, EHardman, Sharon, THarrington, Timothy, Harrison-Moreia, Donna, Harsche, Thomas, Heard, Rodney, Henderson, Howard, LHenderson, Matthew, Hernandez, Bernard, Hilaire, Reginald, Huber, Andrew, JHull, Jr., Daniel, JJulien, Darrell, Kenny, Danielle, NKocher, John, JLeddy, Noel, F.Lee, Norman, Lembke, John, Liguori, Vincent, MLoCurto, David, Lopez, Ruben, QLopez, Angel, Mackie, William, Macy, Craig, MMagliente, Jill, AMagwood, Dawn, EMahonez, Johnny, Maloney, Kevin, J.Martin, Crystal, LMartinez, Trinidad, Martini, Richard, Mattera, Lisa, McCarthy, Sean, PMcGowan, Brian, MMcKeon, Vincent, TMcLaughlin, Shawn, FMeagher, Tara, LMecseri, Brian, L.Mendez, Harry, Menze, Edward, FMercado, Chianne, MMiller, Robert, J.Miller, Kenneth, Morelo, Dionisio, Mullen, Brian, MMurray, Timothy, CNiskanen, Lucas, O'Leary, Patrick, Orski, Steven, Ortiz, Richard, Palam, Michael, SPappas, John, TPeguero, Alexander, Perchenok, Tatiana, Perez, Elizabeth, Perez, Pedro, CPetkus, Edward, MPlunkett, Michael, PPotavin, Charles, APowell, Thomas, JReyes, Anthony, Rickford, Christopher, DRidge, John, JRivera, Abner, Robinson, Horace, Rodgers, Paulette, Rohan, Patrick, Rosado, Janet, Sadler, Carlotta, MSalvador, Marjorie, Sanchrez, Enrique, RSantersiro, Alfred, Schlereth, Lauren, MSessa, John, S.Silverstein, Ralph, ASipp, Timothy, JSodaro, John, ESolt, Donald, RSperzel, Brian, Sposito, Steven, R.Stefanski, Tom, Swords, Liam, Tarquinio, Glenn, Torain, Stanley, E.Tornin, Reinold, OTorres, Eli, STorres, Richard, Turner, Carolyn, EUrbonas, Walter, JVanderBeek, James, Venezia, Robert, JVillarreal, Victor, SVitale, Norman, JVonHof, Brian, JWagers, Steven, Watts, Selvin, Webb, Roger, FWhite, Steve, Whiteman, George, Winkler, Marc, WWong Sing, Sean, GZak, Michael. (rag)
November 10, 2003 Filing 88 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Amthor, Christine, Annunziata, Frank Jude, SAntonacci, Richard, JArciold, James, JBaez, Richard, JBeharry, Tell, Boerner, LeeAnn, Brigande, Vincent, CBrowne, Randy, Burns, Andrew, CCampione, Girolamo, SCarrubba, Philip, JCasal, Augustine , FCastro, Joseph, AClark, Cassandra, JCoard, Journall, Crawford, John, FCruz, Joseph, Daly, Michael, JDandridge, Antoine, Dorado, Cesar, AEnright, Charles, PEsposito, Michael, PFeltham, Michael, AFeo, Domenick, Fermin, Carlos, MFriscia, Robert, IGaghan, Donald, Gonzalez, Gerard, RGrizopoulos, John, Hannigan, Catherine, AHarsch, Kenneth, JHastings, John, Hugasian, Michelle, AHughes, Michael, Johnson, Robert, R.G.Kamalic, John, AKaminaris, Andreas, Kefalas, George, JKitching, Tselanee, Krasnov, Felix, Kurtz, Thomas, FLang, William, Lew-Hugh, Angela, Lynster , Scott , Malone, Marva, EMarte, Jacqueline, CMartinez, Carmen, Martinez, Donna, AMaturo, Russell, AMcHenry, Shanee, CMiele, Joseph, J.Miller, Marilyn, MMiller, Walter, Mitchell, Keri, AMkwanazi, Mark, Mott, James, DMurphy, Richard, MNolan, Jr., Joseph, FOrtiz, Fannie, Owens, Joseph, RRamoutar, Gurudeo, Riley, Bernita, ARivera, Daniel, IRivera, Gilbert, Robinson, Carl, MSanduro, Alfred, Santino, Tommaso, Scali Jr., Edward, JSexton Jr., Herman, ISimone, Penelope, MSmith, Robert, ESoldano, Nicholas, Stewart-Perry, Qunda, N Stiell, Kenneth, EStratmann, Harry, ETaeza, Allan, BThomas, David, AThomas, Francis, XToscano, Michael, PVargas, Ivan, West, Robert, JWilkins, Peter, EWilliams, Gordon, Yeung, Alan. (rag)
October 30, 2003 Filing 87 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Algieri, Michael, DAlmonte, Ervin, JAntezana, Anthony, AArini, Michael, PAssereto, Miguel, Austin, Sherman, ABach, Charles, EBagonyi, Gregg, EBaker, Garnett, ABarsamian, Dikran, Bavolar, Stephen, JBeckford, Frederick, LBonner, Johnnie, Boothe, Paulette, CBowens, Jerry, Bozeman, Steven, JBrehm-Omerza, Lauren, Brinkley, Stefanie, RCaceres Jr, Enrique, Cain, John, WCamporeale, Paul, DCarter, Douglas, JCasey, Michael, SCasserly, Eugene, PChase, Richard, DChilds, Iris, MClarke, Markland, KClarke, Raymond, C.Claxton, Marquez, Cody, Patrick, SCollier, Michelle, Cordero, Vismal , Cottage, Marc, ACoveney, Anna, MCox, Lavern, RCucco III, Enrico , Damian, Kim, LDaughtry-Hinkson, Veda, DDegnan, Matthew, Del Rossi, Francis, DDeStefani, Susan, DDiGiovanni, Salvatore, Divaris, Nicholas, Ehresman, Ralph, Evans, Gerard, CFaison, Khadija, OFay, John, PFitch, Charles, FFlanagan, John, Fletcher Jr, Charles, WinferdFuller, Rodney, EGallagher, Daniel, TGarcon, Lesly, Gardner, Marva, CGarland, Sean, EGellard, Douglas, GGessler Jr, Paul, MGill, Michael, AGomez, Edwin, Graves, Donnell, RGraves, Gregory, HGulotta, Anthony, Hannagan, John, GHarap, William, JHennessy, William, THernandez, Christian, RHeron, Natasha, LHickey, Thomas, AHilton, Allison, Hough, Steven, RHoward, Dennis, JHuber, Andrew, JHudson, Julius, EJohn, Donna-Marie, AJones Jr, Julian, CJordan, Edward, CJordan, Robert, FJoyce, Brian, PJugraj, Noel, VKafka, Henry, DKalbacher, Brian, PKeck, Wai, YeeKhan, Mohammad, ShahzadKim, Sung, DukKotowicz, Anthony, WKriklava , Thomas , Kuhl, Martin, WLaCova, Salvatore, JLaGattuta, Michael, ALahm, Richard, KLatanzio, John, LeSane, Solomon, VLessard, Joseph, JLettieri, Daniel, GLettieri, Maryann, NLeyton, Michael, TLiakos, Andrew, JLindgren, Leif, GLittle, Brian , L Lloyd, Paul, Lovendahl, Scott, GMacInness, James, SMagwood, Dawn, EMajor, Cornelia, Marino, Laura, AMarino, Thomas, AMartin, Jose, EMartinelli, Vincent, Martinez, Richard, RMartinez, Trinidad, Matzelle, Robert, May, Bruce, McCarthy, Sean, ThomasMcCarty, Gerard, McLaughlin, Thomas, GMcMahon, Maureen, AMcManus, Terence, Mercado, Altagracia, GMercado, Anthony, Michel, Brian, CMikes, Maria, LMikes, Stephen, EMiller, Nellie, JMiller, Norman, AMiller, Thomas, CModell, Andrew, Monaghan, Brian, FMorales, Lewis, Murphy, Dennis, PMurray, Michael, Murray, William, JNarraez, Rasheem, RO'Brien, Robert, PO'Carroll, Joseph, ROffermann, Daniel, EO'Pharrow Sr., Kwani, BPacheco, Carlos, FPacheco, Heriberto, Pagan, Israel, Panzarella, Phillip, APapasodero, Vincent, AParker, Genee, LPascarelli, Frank, JPastalove, Robert, EPetrillo, Michael, Phillips, Raymond, EPoeggel, Kerry, APritchard, Michael, TRahman, Mashud, Reidy, Robert, Richardson, Joseph, RRivera, Enrique, Rodriguez, Gerardo, JRodriguez, Jennie, MRodriguez, Jesus, MRodriguez, Louis, ERyan, Christopher, PSamoskevich, David, JSamuel, Mabel, RSanchez, Angel, MSantana, James, AlbertSantiago, Richard, BSantoro, Deborah, Scott, Jahn, RSinclair, Kenneth, MSmart, Linda, MSmith, Hugh, BSmith, Raymond, KSmith, Shawn, LSpillane, Thomas, GSprolling, Jennifer, OStanulis, Ronald, ESuero, Elvis, LTaylor, Vernon, CTesoriero, John, Thompson, Graig, OTobias, Kevin, RTorres, Jason, Torres, Jose, FTrudden, Michael, PTurck, Thomas, JVance Jr., Bennie, EVazquez, Jose , L Vega, Wilfredo, Venezia, Wayne, AVinciguerra, Robert, Walsh, Timothy, AWashington, Shirley, JWeiss, Stacy, LWhite, Katherine, CWigdor, Michael, Wilson, Margaret, Yakowenko, Mary-Jo, Young, Larry, RZlonkiewicz, Roman. (rag)
October 21, 2003 Filing 86 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Arroyo, Jose, EBaez, David, Barbour, Donald, RBenitez, Michael, Berlanga, Christopher, EBisogna, Joseph, JBlair, Deryk, BBohn, Christopher, MBoyle Jr, Patrick, JBrown, Maureen , T Bumpars, Pamela, DBush, Dennis, EButt, Bruce, MCafero, Michael, JCaggiano, Anthony, JCampbell, Colin, Carter, Jesse, Castillo, Shirley, CCastle, Robert, GCockerham, Kevin, Collins, Stephen, Corrigan, Janine, CCundari, Michael, VCunningham, Gerard, FCureton, Sammie, LCurry, Suzette, RD'Amodio, Robert, De Jesus-Fletcher, Jenny, DeJesus, Rafael, DeJesus Jr, Jose, FD'Elia, Jack, JDeSio, Jeffrey, Diaz, Aurelio, DDickens, Martin, GDonadelle Jr, Aubrey, FD'Ulisse, Laura, CEsposito, Steven, DFarrell, Donna, MFeaster, Kimberly, LFelipe, Jeffrey, Finucane, Michael, JFischetti, John, MFleary, Davidson, EFlores, Kenneth, Forcelli, Peter, JForero, Mario, FernandoFrasca, Salvatore, LGarifo, Anthony, Gasperetti, Robert, TGibson, James, CGoffredo, Albert, VGonzalez, Orlando, Gonzalez, Philip, Gonzalez, Rose, MGordon, Anthony, SGrant, Kevin, JGreco, Alberto, RGuerriero, Lisa, RGut Jr, Albert, JGuzzo, John, Hanna, Nadirah, NHarmon, Patrick, THayes , Darryl, Heavey, Joseph, Hicks, Richard, SHindi, Oren, Holmes, Joseph, Jimenez, Olga, Jones Jr, Julian, CKennedy, William, JKirk, Stephen, MLehner, Vincent, WLettieri, Catherine, MLevandoski, John, JLevy, Michael, JLopez, Angel, RMacBride, William, TMantilla, Edward, Martinez, Elizabeth, McKeon, Donna, MMeroni, John, Meyer, Joseph, AMichel, Mario, Miranda, Pablo, Mojica, Kevin, Molina, Ivan, EMolloy, John, JMorris Jr., Thomas, FMugavero Jr, Nicholas, Mulcahy, Kevin, M.Mullen, Thomas, DMustafa, Bahir, SNegron, Rose, MNessenthaler, James, LNewman, Paul , Nielsen, James, JNieves, Abad, Nusser, Stacey, WOcana, Andano, DavidPagan, Miguel, Palazzo, Jamie, MPedrosa, Branden, Peyton, Brian, MPiazza, Christopher, JPolidoro, Richard, Pomerance, Lisa, GPortelli, Mark, APowers, Devin, FProscio, Charles, JPryce, Martin, JRafferty, Daniel, AReynolds, Michael, Ricci, Alfred, PRivera, Israel, Rizzo, Steven, JRoberts, Teresa, VRodriguez, Stella, Rosati, John, JRuckel, Patricia, ASabatino, Robert, MScarangella, Philip, ESchnitzenbaumer, Kurt, MSchwarz, Anthony, JShaw, Carlton, Shaw, Reuben, ESiclari, Joseph, GSiegel, Andrew, ISinger, Brian, MSlizewski, Kenneth, JSmith, Ann Marie, Sobolewski, Joseph, MSolares, Luz, MSonera, Juan, ASpennicchia, Anthony, CStancik, Richard, MStassi , Brian , RSuarez, Martin, STalleur, Nicole, TTannuzzo, Joseph, Tapia, Debbie, ATarulli, Michael, Teague, Kristin, LThatcher, Timothy, GTorchio, Jorma, DTorpey, Brian, JTorres, Manuel, Valentin, Osvaldo, Vance, Edward, DVarga, Andrew, SVeloz, Javier, Vigada, David, PWall, John, PWalsh, Walter, Ward, Toris, KWeaks-Kane, Sabrina, RWhite, James, TWhite, Thomas, AWilliams, Angela, RWindsor, Mary, EWinwood, Richard, RWrieden, Michael, MZarek, Karl, JZorrilla Sr, Ysaac , L. (rag)
October 10, 2003 Filing 85 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Abagnale, Laurie, AnnAbel , David , Acosta, Bernardo, Alleyne, Tara, DAmatulle, Marissa, MAmatulle, Pasquale, Baez, Herminio, Beaury, Francis, Bill, Brian, GBlake, Bernard, Brosnan, George, Brownworthy, Steven, RButler, Kim, BClarke, Robert, CClarke, Zenobia, AClarke Jr, Clifton, CCollazo, Priscilla, Collazo, Yvette, Colon Jr, Fernando, LConway, Edgar, FCorrea, Harris, Cotes, Luis, NCotter, Joseph, Cunningham, Christopher, Cuttler, Jason, JDel-Llano, Raul, Dersarkissian, Gary, KFair, Tanisha, AFarren, Justin, Fazio, Frank, WFessel, Richard, SFilippidis, Peter, GFisher, Darryl, EFitzgerald, Charles, FFong, Albert, Freedman, Randy, CFreeman, Ronald, BFrey, Malaika, Gallagher, Scott, EGallo, Joseph, NGaluppi, Robert, AGamble, John, OGarriga, Harry, Geberth, Vernon, AGiambalvo, Craig, Girani, John, JGrau, Steven, PGutierrez, Franky, Gwillym, Richard, JHartigan, Richard, AHennessy, John, WHiggins, Brian, AHill, Richard, FHorgan, William, GImperato, Vincent, Jackson, Joseph, JJohnson, Robert, LKaufman, Seth, AKelly, Laura, AKong, Kenneth, Lavelle, Francis, PLawrence, Madeline, CLefkowitz, Logan, JLinarello, Peter, JMackie, Gregory, Maldonado, Paul, JMalone, Bernard, GManara, Marc, Mancuso, Louis, GMarin, Hector, RMartin, Donald, LMartinez, Edward, Mazzei, Marc, AMcBride, Charles, WMcCauley, Patricia, McClure, John, MMcCormack, Joseph, PMcCormack, William, DMcCullough, John, RMcDonald, Shawn, TMcKenna, Michael, SMcLoughlin, Patrick, JMecalianos, Robert, Moeller, Donald, AMontagna, Christopher, AMonteverde, Michael, Moore, Kenneth, CMunn, Andrew, LMurphy, Kevin, JMusto, Michael, EMyers, Cheryl, SNeckin, Ian, HNelson, Jenny-Ann, O'Sullivan, Kevin, PParris, Michelle, PatriciaPassarella, Frank, APerry, Pauline, VPeters, Michael, JRaber, Theresa, MRazzo, Marcelo, IRecker, Madeline, MRepetti Jr., George, LRivera, George, MRivera, Miriam, ERodriguez, Kevin, ARohan, Warren, WRollins, James, ARoman, Ruben, Rooney II, James, PRose, Robert, RRuggiero, Michael, ERyan, Lauren, Schwerner, Evan, LScott, Phillip, AShirreffs, Daniel, RSlade-Reliford, Zelue, ESmith, Stephen, JSteckmeister, Gerald, AStefanakos, Steven, CSteinmann Jr, Robert, WStevens, Patricia, ASutton, James, ESweeney, Diane, Tancredi, John, RThomas, Simone, DTorres, Enrique, HTorres, Juan, RUlrich, James, AVargas, Brenda, IVarshavskiy, Yevgeniy, Viar, Paul, AVitale, John, FWaldron, Edward, TWalser, Beverly, RWard, Shalay, AWestcott, Michael, White, Francis, BWholey, John, JWilliams, Christopher, RWilliams, Wade, JWilson, Angelica, MWinter, Robert, WWolfthal, Marvin, Wright, Shaulene, A. (rag)
October 2, 2003 Filing 84 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Acevedo, Madeline, Acheson, Ronald, J;Agron, Jose, J;Ahmad, Will, ; Alipramdini, Josephine, E;Amoroso, Christopher, John; Anzelino, John, T;Aquino, Donald, D;Arborn, Christopher, J; Aspinwall, John, S;Barone Jr, John, ;Bastidas, Richard, A; Bellavista, Steve, ;Bergamo, Michael, F;Bilella, Robert, ; Bissessar, Rajendra, R;Bjornstad, Michael, V;Boluk, Kevin, T;Bottarini, Alejandro, R;Boyette, Charles, ;Boylan, Ann, J; Bressack, Mark, N;Brooks, Frederick, A;Brooks, Yehudah, J; Burchard, Troy, M;Byrne, Timothy, ;Calise, Jennifer, A; Campbell, Elliott, N;Caraballo, Elvin, E;Caroleo, Raffaele, V;Carpentieri, Paul, D;Carrieri, Michael, J;Castillo, Carlos, A;Checo, Juan, C;Chhe, Kowa, K;Chiaccheri, Louis, ; Chianese, David, ;Chianese, Thomas, E;Clarke, Bernadine, ; Coan, Daniel, J;Colon Jr, Jose, A;Concepcion, Yolanda, ; Cordero, Edwin, ;Cortes, David, ;Crisci, Salvatore, R; Crowe, Brenden, D;Cunningham, Dwight, M;Curtis, John, J; Curto, Salvatore, F;Del Toro, Jose, R;Deleon, Allan, R; Deodato Jr, John, J;Diaz, Brenda, I;DiGiacomo, Frank, ; DiMasi, Patrick, J;Dougherty, Thomas, A;Downes, Robert, M; Duffy, John, ;Duggan, Mary, Rita;Duncan-Brandon, Sabrina, L; Echavarria, John, M;Ellis-Hamid, Brenda, F;Ellsworth, Eric, J;Encarnacion Jr, Zoilo, ;Ewart Jr, Vincent, J;Failla, Joseph, C;Failla, Michael, C;Feaggins, Renee, ;Feliciano, Angel, L;Feliciano Jr, Carlos, J;Ferrara, Jeffrey, J; Flatley, Brian, M;Flynn, John, A;Foerst, Jerry, M;Formica, Salvatore, ;Foster Sr., Jeffrey, R;Fragola, Raphael, C; Freeman, Malcolm, X;Friedrich, Peter, G;Galasso, Peter, A; Galbo, Vincent, J;Gant, Errol, ;Garcia, Richard, ;Garcia, Rosa, M;Gault, Robert, ;Gavan, Robert, J;Gentile, Robert, J; George, Brian, ;Gilbride, Thomas, A;Gilroy, Daniel, J; Gomez, Deyanira, A;Gonzalez, David, ;Gonzalez, Mario, K; Gonzalez Jr, Daniel, L;Gordon, Kenrick, L.;Gorsky, Michael, E;Grogan, Robert, B;Guardino, Louis, ;Halbohn, Dean, Joseph; Hall, Daniel, R;Halversen, Kevin, W;Handibode, John, T; Handley, Thomas, P;Hanrahan, Matthew, D;Harper, Dana, C; Hartman, Michael, ;Heaney, John, F;Hegarty III, James, J; Henzel, Steven, M;Hernandez, Cruz, M;Hernandez, Harold, ; Herrera, Cynthia, ;Herwerth, Arno, T;Hoy, Ann, L;Hughes, Todd, ;Hynes, Kevin, W;Jacobsen, Ronnie, G;James, Charles, A;Johnson, Paul, ;Jones, Caroline, M;Jones, Teresa, M;Kaim Sr, Patrick, M;Kaveney, Josh, T;King-Mayfield, Nina, M;Ko, Ivan, ;Kornegay, Derekson, ;Krzyck, James, A;Landgrover, Kenneth, E;Lane, Edward, H;Larkins Jr, Quinton, ;Lavin, Peter, A;Lawrence, Steven, P;Leone, Robert, J;Lewis, Omar, J;Lombardo, Thomas, ;Lopez, Anthony, ;Louie, James, T; Lovelace, Thomas, R;Lozano, Nicola, ;Luback, David, F; Lucas, Darryl, ;Lynagh-DeStasio, Sandra, A;Lynn, Gary, D; Macaluso, Leonard, ;Macolino, Charles, A;Maraj, Larry, ; Marino, Jennifer, L;Marquette, Robert, F;Martin, Sean, ; Martinez, Alfred, ;Martinez, Pedro, ;Marvin, Erik, R; Mashkov, Pavel, D;Matthews, George, J;McAllister, Thomas, J; McCluskey, Aedan, J;McConnell, James, R;McDermott, Sean, P; McGillivray, John, F;McGinley, William, C;McGregor, Clint, A;McKenna, John, T;McLaughlin, Michael, J;McLaughlin, Shawn, F.;McMahon, Thomas, M;McNally, William, P;Mecabe, Richard, A;Meilak, Carol, L;Melendez, Rafael, ;Mellett, Arlene, P;Mendez, Maritza, ;Miro, Christopher, L;Monaco, Roger, G;Montalvo, Otto, O;Moschetta, Joseph, S;Mottola, Alexander, ;Mullan, MaryKate, ;Mullens, Patrick, D;Muniz, Ferdinand, ;Murphy, Kevin, J;Murphy, Michael, J;Myers, David, John;Nasta, Rocco, J;Natale, Dennis, D;Nevels, Kareema, ;Nieves, Valois, ;Nivar, Alexander, J;Ober, Erik, W;O'Brien, James, ;O'Brien, Richard, M;Ockovic, Richard, W; O'Connor, Michael, ;Oliver, Barbara, A;O'Malley, Thomas, J; Orange Jr, William, D;Ortiz, Edgardo, ;Padua, Anthony, J; Pagona, James, J;Pasqualone, Robert, G;Paszel, Robert, ; Paternostro, Anthony, M;Patsos, Donna, M;Pedone, Mark, M; Peitler, Steven, J;Pellegrino, Thomas, V;Peragallo, Joseph, ;Peralta, Carlos, J;Pereira, Janet, ;Perez, Samuel, J; Perez, Victor, I;Perno, Joseph, Thomas;Phillips Jr, Alwyn, A;Pierre, Micheal, A;Plude, Marshall, J;Polidoro, Victor, ; Priola, Leo, V;Puccio, Lawrence, C;Puglissi, John, P;Puhl, Michael, L;Pulzone, Michael, ;Purcell, Robert, M;Quinn, James, ;Quiros, Antonio, ;Raganella, Anthony, J;Ragione Jr, Raymond, C;Rahaniotis, Peter, S;Ramos, Jose, C; Randall-Williams, Michelle, D;Reilly, David, ;Revels, Terrence, A;Richard, Sandra, ;Richards, Vonetta, ;Riendeau, Paul, M;Rivers, Cecelia, ;Robinson-Hewitt, Sharon, ; Rodriguez, Anthony, ;Rodriguez, Jose, M;Roldan, David, ; Roman Jr, Felipe, A;Romanski, Christopher, John;Rooney, John, ;Rosado, Annette, ;Ross, Kevin, G;Rothman, Scott, F; Rueckert, Christian, H;Ruggio, Serge, F;Ryan, Gregory, C; Sanchez, Myrna, ;Santos, Addys, M;Sawyer, Rosemary, D; Scalogna, Joseph, ;Scheferston, Charles, M;Schellenberg, Jody, C;Schilling, Michael, F;Schuh, Christian, ; Scianimanico, John, T;Seabrook, James, A;Sehen, Steven, P; Separ, Michael, J;Simona, Roberto, ;Singletary, Kenneth, I; Smigiel, Joseph, C;Smith, Bryan, W;Sorrentino, Stanley, P; Specht, James, K;Stallone, Joseph, S;Stewart, Dillon, H; Strub, Wayne, R;Suarez-Markowski, Frances, ;Suazo, Angel, O; Sullivan, John, L;Susco, Matthew, A;Talavera, Giovanni, ; Tampellini, James, ;Tapia, Randy, ;Taylor, Daniel, T; Taylor, Robert, G;Tengco, Ruben , Edsel D.;Tesoriero, Stephen, M;Thomas, Donna, A;Thornton, Mary, E;Tierney, James, J;Tillery, Tonya, M;Tillotson, Joseph, ;Timoney, Patrick, C;Tolerico, Mark, T;Tonnessen, Daniel, L;Toro, Bedell, ;Torres, Donna, L;Torres, Frank, ;Turski, Josef, P; Valenzano, Michael, E;Vasquez, Jose, M;Vecchione, Louis, J; Ventrella, Frank, J;Vignola, Anthony, C;Vogel, Colleen, B; Vojtek, Miroslav, M;Wall, John, A;Wallen, Michael, A;Walsh, Michael, A;Ward, Gregory, S;Wawrzonek, Carl, A;Welsh, Joseph, T;Welsh, Michael, J;Welz, Keith, M;Wetzel, Robert, J;Willis, Maurice, F;Wilson, Marcovan, ;Wilson, Sounia, D; Wineglass, Izola, V;Wingate, John, M;Wong, Matthew, ; Woodard, Gerard, J;Worthington, Mark, R;Young, Robert, J; Zapata, Fausto. (rag)
September 24, 2003 Filing 83 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Madouros, Georgia, AMaguire, John, TMahon, Brian, PMahon, John, Maio, Gary, AMaisonet Jr, Raul, JMalagon, Luis, Maldonado, Jose, Maldonado, Juan, AMaldonado, Yvette, MMaloney, Kevin, MMandella, Daniel, JMandli, Murtaza, MMantone, Kenneth, JMarcantonatos, Helen, Martin, Jean, CatherineMartinez, Doris, WMartinez, Julio, CMartinez, Luis, AMastandrea, Maria, VMatamoros, James, BMayes, Michael, CMazzarelli, Paul, DMcCann, Robert, McCarroll, Kevin, MMcCauley, Kathleen, AMcConville, Joseph, KMcCormick, Caren, LMcDermott, Matthew, TMcHugh, Francis, McLean, Althea, MMcManus, Steven, VMcManus, Thomas, PMcNamara, Stephen, GMcWalters, Thomas, OMeans, Linda, RMehling, William, FMelfi, Luciano, CMellett, Kevin, AMendez, Wanda, IMendez, William, Menell, Raymond, JohnMenze, Matthew, PMilano, Victor, RMiller, Christopher, AMiniter, Matthew, Miranda, Daniel, Miranda Jr, Eriberto, Mitchell, Michael, JMonaghan, John, JMoore, John, Morales, Sandra, Moran, Shane, Morgan, Andrew, CMorrill, Julie, LMoya, Medardo, EMulligan, Sean, CMurriel, Renee, AMusarra, Anthony, JMusto, Charles, ENagy, George, SNarvaez, Michael, ANasca, Ronald, SNazario, John, Neal, Paul, WNicolosi, Thomas, JNoonan, John, BNovellano, Andrew, JO'Connell, David, MO'Connell, John, MO'Connor, Brian, O'Dea, Joseph, BOliveri, Paul, SOlsen, Robert, AO'Neill, Brady, EOrdonez, Tammie, Oreckinto, Thomas, FO'Regan, Elizabeth, BO'Rourke, Thomas, MOrtiz, Dwayne, Ortiz, Jamie, Ortiz, Jorge, AO'Sullivan, Brian, Otten, Kimberly, AOwens-Page, Ella, MOxley, William, RPal, Victor, KPalmiotti, Michael, AParadiso, Joseph, FParker, Kevin, BPascullo, Vito, Patterson, Michael, CPaulino, Victor, JPayano, Wascar, APaynter, Kevin, JPellegrino, Peter, JPellizzi, Vincent, JPena, Cecilio, APenn, Kelvin, BPerez, Gilbert, RPerez, Hector, MPeterson, Parnell, Petrucci, John, MPickel , Damien , Pidoto, Joseph, LPierri, Jason, Pierro, Nicholas, Piparo, Josephine, APlaza, Doris, BPoccia, Joseph, Polichetti, Dino, APorter, William, TPrioleau, Anthony, EProkesch, William, Pulizzi, Vincent, FPullano, Joseph, RQualliotine, Russell, JQuinones, Niurca, Rabinowitz, Edward, Ramos, Elvin, LRamos, John, Ramos, Jose, MRamos, Raymond, DRandall, Charles, HReekie, Robert, Rendo, Anthony, Reyes, Ana, LReyes, Juan, Reynolds, Kevin, PRicks, Aisha, RRios, Jesus, MRizzo, Heidi, Rodeschin, Peter, JRodriguez, Hector, LRodriguez, Joseph, ARodriguez, Michael, Rojas, Alfonso, Roller, Joseph, JRolon, David, Roman, Maribel, Rooney, Antoinette, RRoper-Lindsey, Faye, JRoque, Yolanda, Rosado, Jose, Rosario, Noel, Ruis, John, Russell, Daniel, JRyan, Alan, TSabando, George, LSabella, Thomas, Salvodon, Marie, SSambhu, Gangaram, Sandano, Michael, ASander, Lorelei, Sangare, Deborah, ASantiago, Pedro, JSaunders, Doreen, MSavage, Robert, ESavage, Roger, JScarfone, Richard, JSchaefer, James, WSchmidt, Charles, JSchmidt, Matthew, RSchneider, Robert, Schreiner, George, GSchwartz, Jason, EScola, Anthony, JScott, Gerald, Scurro, James, VSeigerman, David, PSena, Judith, Sena, Michael, RShepherd, Carl, DShine, Peter, TSiatsis, Michael, JSinclair, Jennifer, PSmalls, Curtis, ESmith, Russell, Soave, David, MSobel, Arthur, RSolages, Philippe, Sostre, Marlene, Speirs, Richard, ASpencer, Peter, ASpicciatie, Joseph, MStoll, Brian, FSwartz, Deborah, Sylvester, Shelley, ASylvestre, Raphael, Tarricone, Steven, PTate, Myrtis, MTateosian, Henry, STaylor Jr, Warren, Testa, Edward, MTheofield, Christopher, MThomas, Marie, Thomas, Michael, Thomas, Robert, Thompson, Keri, LTimothy, John, Tirado, Radames, Todd, Thad, JToro, Juan, JTorres, Isabel, ITorres, Steven, JTrapani, Paul, JTrubia, John, JUske, Joseph, HVega, Jose, MWagner, Craig, EdwardWalsh, Robert, JWhite, Merle, CWhite, Patrick, JWilliams, Charles, AWinter, Timothy, KWischhusen, Michael, JWoodall Jr, John, Wright, Derek, WYeh, Kevin, SYohe, Nicholas, JZimms, Patrick, KZitofsky, Daniel, MZotter, Rudy, A. (rag)
September 24, 2003 Filing 82 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Abbruzzese, Michael, JAbreu, Mike, Acosta, Francisco, Adrian, Sandra, YAlcaraz, Esteban, Allen, Gwendolyn, Allen III, Clifford, RAlonzo, Michael, JAmbery, George, EAnaya, Mark, RAnthony, Joseph, PArana, Richard, Argano Jr, Daniel, AArgenzio, Darren, Arzaga, Adrian, PAsencio-Nunez, Awilda, Ayala, Rodrigo, Baez, Rafael, Baker, Anthony, Bard, James, WBardong, Timothy, GBarry, Michael, JBavolar, Thomas, FBeichert, Peter, JBella-Funfgeld, Christine, MBeltran, Angelica, CBenjamin, Yvonne, EBerger, Steven, JBermonty, Emilio, Bermudez, Henry, Bernstein, Erik, TBerrios, Eric, MBetance-Fontanez, Maria, LBetancourt, Gerardo, Bishop, Ryan, JBorland, William, JBourke, Brian, MBourne, Trevor, WBracero-Lozada, Elizabeth, Braun, Christine, MBraun Jr, Theodore, LBreen, Thomas, FBrennan, James, PBrice, Melissa, ABrodala, William, Brodman, Craig, Broner, Jeffrey, WBrown, Joanne, Brown, Julius, CBrown, Troy, Bruce, Donald, WBrunder, Jason, MBucknor, Roxroy, FBuffa, Diane, Burkart, David, ABurke, Lawrence, Burnett, Darryl, AButler, Sandra, JCachola, George, Cagle, Gary, DCalandra, Paul, JCalemine, Danny, Camacho, Steven, Carlson, Arthur, HCarlson, John, Carollo, Frank, Carrion, Isidro, RCastro, Robert, ACastro, Trazzau, Castronuovo, Joseph, AChacon, Aura, EChiofalo, Anthony, BChisholm, William, RCirigliano, Stephen, PClark, Colleen , XClarke, Felix, LCollazo, Carmen, Colon, Delia, Colon, Jose, AColon, Rolando, Colon, Rosabel, Condon, Christopher, TConroy, James, GCora, Caroline, Corcillo, Kim, MCornacchio, Charles, RCoyle, Michael, Cregan, Brian, DCrimi Jr., Jerome, Curbelo, Damaris, Cutrona, John, ND'Agnese, Alan, RDamian, Sean, MDaniel, Eugene, MDaniel-Bey, Dawud, Dantino, Luigi, Davis, Jacqueline, LDavis, Leo, Deak, Peter, SDean, Michael, JDeFabrizio, Frank, VDeluca, Joseph, SDeMonte, Anthony, DeZago, Philip, JDi Brino, Nicholas, JDiemer, Peter, KDiGennaro, Dominic, DDiGennaro, Joseph, CDiNatale, Frank, DiPalma, Joseph, DiPinto, Gina, RDoherty, David, RDoherty, Dorothea, JDolan, Michael, JDonaldson, Sandra, JDonnelly, Brian, JDonnelly, Kathleen, MDonohue, Sean, JDorfman, Frank, JDowling, Gerard, VDowling, Jeffrey, JDowns, Scott, Drain, Sean, GDuggan, Rick, Easton, Matthew, GEckert, Richard, TEllis, Richard, MEnos, Wendy, EEsposito, Lucio, Falcon, Angelique, Fallone, Robert, SFerdinando, Joseph, Fezza, Joseph, PFigueroa, Carmen, Figueroa, David, Figueroa, Marie, NFisher, Keith, WFitzpatrick, Daniel, EFlaherty, Deidre, AFleming, Anthony, WFlynn, Brendan, Ford, Franklin, SFoster, Margarette, AFranciosa, Albert, Fratila, Marius, OFye, Leigh, DGallitelli, Robert, MGalloway, Frederick, AGalvin, Christine, AGardner, Gayle, Garvey, Curtis, DGasparre, Joseph, LGaughran, Timothy, GGeise, Jeffrey, JGeorge, Douglas, RGeraci, Anthony, JGermano, Frank, JGieser, Robert, HGildea, Kevin, TGiustino, Joseph, CGlossza, Stephen, RGonzalez, Anthony, Gormley, Kevin, PGraciani, Raquel, Green, Maureen, AGronowski, Michael, SGuevarra-Francis, Chenenne, MGuglielmo, Stephen, PGutierrez, Raymond, Guzman, Gerard, SHaagenson, Drew, WHagan, Brendan, PHall, Albert, LHall, Bridget, LHall, Matthew, BHallenbeck, Thalia, RHandel Jr, Charles, JHapper, Adam, MHarrington, Christopher, JHarris, Kelisha, RHarrison, Cassandra, Hawkins, George, FHaynia, William, EHearn, Gary, PHennig , Blaine , Henriquez, Gullermina, Herbert Jr, Hugh, THernandez, George, Hernandez, Manuel, Herrschaft, Robert, RHess, Aaron, MHildebrand, Craig, MHill, Harry, Hill, Thomas, CHines, Darrin, Hofelich, Lisa, AHogan, Barbara, JHolland, Nathaniel, Hoppe, Mark, JHoulihan, Michael, Hughes, Ryan, PIgneri, Anthony, TerryItzkowitz, Leo, Jackson, Derek, AJackson, Tracy, CJacobsen, Wanda, IJacovino, William, DJames-Reid, Amryl, SJanec, Stephen, TJarecki, Jane, MJaszczak, John, JJavier, Jonathan, EJew, Barbara, Jimenez, Martha, EJohnson, Terrance, SJones, John, AKane, Gregg, TKazlauskas, Jerome, JKeck, Anthony, JKehoe, Kevin, JKelly, Janine, MKern, Cindyann, Kessler, James, MKimkowski, Thomas, Kinardi, Masio, DKissoon, Joseph, Klein, Edward, LKlose Jr, Paul, JKnight-Howard, Aretha, LKostanoski, Keith, AKraft, Harvey, AKroll, Kenneth, Lashley, Rosemary, SLattanzio, Ronald, JLauterborn, Theodore, Lawson, Arnold, SLee, James, Lemp, Edward, JLeonard, Maria, Lepore, Linda, LLevitsky, Peter, LLiselli, Joseph, DLopes, John, Lopez, Walter, JLucas, Lionel, GLuke, Brian, MLuyando, Rafael, ALyon, Kelly. (rag)
September 17, 2003 Filing 81 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Pagan, Michael, Palumbo, Richard, Papa, Ruth, Patrick, Randi, DaraPatterson, Sheila, MPaulino, Jesus, APecoraro Jr, Robert, HPedersen, Steven, SPenney, Keith, MPerchinelli, Joseph, RPerez, Joseph, PPerez Jr, Miguel, APetro, Paul, JPfeuffer Jr, William, RPhillips, Elmer, Picardi, Ellen, RPierce, Jamie, RPizzo, Christopher, JPizzuto, Paul, RPlanakis, Anthony, Polanco, James, Pons, Valerie, APoust, Brian, JProscia Jr, Anthony, CQuiles, Jacqueline, Quinn, William, Raab, James, ERamos, Dorian, GRandazzo, John, Rapisarda II, Alonzo, Rashkovsky, Leonid, Recco, Louis, Reddington, Patrick, JRibar, Kevin, JRiccardi, Robert, JRichardson, Isaac, RRicketts, Ian, BRijo, Francisco, PRiordan, John, MRiservato, Michelle, Rivera, Alberto, Rivera, Awilda, Rivera, David, Rivera, Dennis, Rivera, Hector, LRivera, Irene, Rivera, Jim, Rivera, Jose, LRivera, Linda, Rivere, Eric, Roberts, Denia, ARobles, Edgar, Robles, Lorenza, Rodriguez, Bianey, Rodriguez, Davie, Rodriguez, Michael, ARodriguez, Rebecca, Rodriguiez, Wanda, Roman, Anthony, Roman, Louis, ERoman, Luis, FRosado, Karry, Rosario, Anthony, Rosario III, Angelo, Rosenberg, Craig, LRosiak, David, LRowe, Christopher, PRubio, Nilda, YRussell, Pamela, DRusso, Frank, TRusso, John, ARyan, Daniel, Ryan, James, TRyan, Joseph, PSacco, Brian, NSammarco, John, PSamudio, Mario, ASan Andres, Jose, VSanchez, Miguel, ASanichara, Ramesh, Sannasardo, Robert, DSanseverino, Anthony, Santiago, Elliot, Saulnier, Wayne, Savva, Andreas, DScarfone, Michael, Schimmel, John, LSchoenacher, Gerard, Schub, William, CSchupp, John, CSchwizer, Jonas, WScordino, Dawn, MScreen, Christopher, RSeda, Susana, Seeger, William, JSelvaggi Jr, Anthony, Semins, Elaine, Senzamici, John, JShanhai, Peter, Sheehan, Flerida, Sheridan, Andrea, MSims, Daryl, ASingh, Jaipaul, Skyers, Auldwyn, FSmith, Hoay, JSmith, Loretta, Smith, Randy, ASmith Jr, Joseph, FSmolensky, Glen, DSokoloff, Kevin, JSparacio, Joseph, VSpinelli, Peter, Springman, Steven, JSquibb, Michael, JStadelman, Henry, VStanley, Brian, JStassi, Joseph, BSteininger, Karl, IStromski, Andrew, LSulaiman, Negma, HTaliercio, Anthony, Tansey, Robert, ETari, Richard, ETaylor, Edward, GTello, Hector, ATeneriello, Michael, ETennissen, John, RTesta, Joseph, EThaler, Andrew, MThomas, Carlos, ATice, Michael, JTingue, Moise, Tomlinson, Wally, GTorres, Joseph, ATorres, Roberto, LTowers, Jennifer, MTsoi, Peter, Tuccio, Andrew, TTucker, Colette, ATully, Favell, Tully, John, MTymo, Walter, Ulrich, Thomas, GUmpthery, Reginald, Vahey, Matthew, FValentin, Jose, Valentin, Julio, AValle, Erwin, Valle, Jose, CValle, Linda, Van den Ende, Jan, LVana, Andrew, CVargas, Mercedes, Vasquez, Shemalisca, MVasquez, Stephanie, AVassallo, John, MVaughan, Kenny, TVazquez, Gilberto, Velasquez, Jimmy, Velez, David, Velez, Nelson, Vendra, Carmelo, Venezia, Marco, AVidal, Bruno, GVihervuori, Pirjo, TVillafane Jr, Nelson, Viola, Anthony, Virella, Mariano, Virola, Sonia, Vitagliano, Anthony, SVosler, Robert, GVuksanovich, Mark, Walker, Matthew, BWalker, Sylvia, LWalko, Michael, EWalsh, Gregory, WWalsh, Matthew, HWalsh, William, EWard, Brendan, PWard, Matthew, DWashington, Ernest, Weiss, Melanie, LWelsh, Robert, EWenzel, Wayne, Werber, Patrick, VWestcott, Mark, Wetterhahn, David, PWihlborg, Douglas, JWilcox, Neilie, OWilliams, Charles, HWilliams, James, VWilliams, Kevin, PWilliams, Shantel, Williams, Steven, AWilliams-Gross, Joanne, Wilson, Penney, Wilson, Thomas, RWittleder, Joseph, MWnek, John, JWnuk, Kazimierz, Wolf, William, JWoodson, Simone, AWright, James, Yasso, Michael, Yee, Eugene, Young, Robert, PYoung, Wayne, NZaffarese, Margaret, Zagajeski, Stephen, EZaino, John, VZarnock, David, Zasa, Robert, DZayas Jr, Joseph, AZimmerli, Pierre, G. (rag)
September 17, 2003 Filing 80 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Gallego, Nelson, Gallo, Vincent, MGarcia, Dolly, MGarcia, Jeffrey, Garcia, Jill, CGattus, Raymond, Gaynor, James, Geigel, Luis, Gerena, Anna, VGerstein, Seth, Giaculli, Joseph, FGianesses, Nicholas, MGianni, Joseph, SGill, Noreen, Giordano, Rocco, JGiovanniello, Jeanne, MGiuduce, Antonello, OGomez, Leonardo, GGonzalez, Adolfo, Gonzalez, Eddie, Gonzalez, Edgar , Gonzalez, Harry , Goodell, Erik, AGoodner, Denise, AGorman, Patrick, FGrandstaff, Norman, LGrant, Eugene, Green, Gregory, AGreene, Nevyanta, MGrennan, Mindy, MGrillo, James, RGrimm, Virginia, Grobasky, Kenneth, TGross, Jacob, Guerrero, Andres, Guglielmo, Louis, Gulenyan, Laura, Gurrera, Stephen, Gutierrez, Evelin, Hall, Catherine, SHanges, Steven, PHarmon, Lloyd, KHarris, Alonzo, Harrison, Rodney, SHayden, Steven, EHefner, Michael, RHeller, Terrence, MHendricks, Lenno, Henry, Marilyn, LHernandez, Christine, Hernandez, Ernest, Hernandez, Victor, Hill, Matthew, JHinds, Walter, JHines, Steven, WHines, Walter, JHoffman, Glenn, AHogg, Daniel, THoglund, Claire, THolmes, Andre, CHoran, John, GHoward, Theodora, EHughes, Christopher, THughes, James, MHuman, Joseph, AHunter, Jason, WHuntley, Kathleen, MHyland, Kerry, AIannuzzi, Edmond, RIlund, Brian, MInfante, Pedro, Intartaglio, Robert, AIsgro, Jeffrey, PIsler, Clarence, Isnora, Gescard, FJackson, Raymond, Jackson, Robert, AJackson-Bellejambe, Stephanie, DJacobson, Craig, SJames, Trina, RJannetti, Dominick, JJohnson, Marcus, TJohnson, Ophelia, Johnson, Wayne, AJohnstone, Sean, PJones, Joseph, VJones, Selinda, CJordan, Joseph, EJordan, Philip, JJust, Scott, MKaplan, Louis, JKaplan, Roy, AKapp Jr., Bruce, EKarim, Tawanna, LKelly, Andrew, MKhan, Mohammed, GKhealie, Nyya, MKiesche, Stephen, JKilleen, Jill, EKim, Brian, JKnoerzer, Sean, PKraljic, John, MKresback, Joseph, EKrolick, James, Kui, Zoltan, Kukla Jr., Thomas, FKunz, Edward, DLaGarenne, James, PLaLumia, Louis, SLanflisi, James, MLang, Vincent, LLange, Roy, CLawrence, Mark, ALennon, Richard, JLettieri, James, SLicurse, Donald, GLiguori, Michael, PLinehan, Martin, JLloyd, Vance, LLocurto, Richard, JLopez, Pedro, JLopreato, Louis, ALouis-Sohan, Kurinne, MLove, Darryl, GLucero, Nelson, ELugo, Alberto, Luparello, Ronald, FLupkovich, John, ALynch, Kelly, JLynch, Vincent, TMabry, Dawn, CMaccio, John, VMaddalena, Michael, JMaher, Daniel, DMaher, Susan, Mahoney, David, CMaier, John, Maldonado, Michael, Maldonado, Miguel, AManco, Vincent, JMaras, Saby, AMarchand, Gary, Marciano, Steven, DMarkoski, Stephen, JMartens, David, SMartinez, Jose, AMartinez, Miguel, Mastandrea, Joseph, AMatteo, Troy, LMazzara, Craig, EMazzaro, Annie, MMcBride, Brian, PMcCaffery, Thomas, JMcCarthy, Kevin, JMcClernon, Brian, CMcCormick, Daniel, PMcDonough, Kerian, CMcGough, Christopher, AMcGovern, Michael, CMcGuire, Scott, EMcManahan, Debby, LMcMillan, Robert, McNair, Marie, EMcNair, Ronald, LMcSweeney, John, AMedina, Deborah, Medina, Eric, Medina, Fernando, LMedina, Leslie, Medina, Maria, TMendez, Kevin, Mendez, Rene, Merino, Jacob, AMetski, Raymond, JMeyer, Christopher, JMeyer, David, CMeyers, Paul, LMiller, Christopher, EMineo, Domenick, AMole, Nathan, DMolinari, Mark, CMondone, Paul, MMonegro, Johanny, Montan, Socrates, FMontanez, Pablo , M Montello, Richard, SMoore, Ezra, Moore, Michael, Morales, Arleen, Morales, Julio, Morales, Linda, JMorawek, Julie, MMoutopoulos, Constantine, Mulcahy, Sean, BMullen, Brian, JMulligan, Robert, KMulzac, Henry, CMunoz, Leonardo, JoseMurphy, Deirdre, CNarra, Trent, RNatal, Zayda, INeal, Thomas, LNeary, William, GNelson, Alice, MNelson, David, JNeubauer, Tracey, LNiepert, Kenneth, RNoe, Norbert, KNunes, Joseph, MNunez, Jose, ANunez, Rudy, AO'Brien, Michael, DOcasio, Patricia, AO'Grady, James, GO'Hanlon, Frances, MO'Keefe, Kevin, Olano, Reinaldo, NOlavarria, Ruben, Oliver, Michael, TOlmeda, Kevin, Olownia, Thomas, JO'Malley, Thomas, MOndrick, David, WOrion, Pierre, Orlando, Lillian, Orsini Jr., Vincent, AOrtiz, Joebin, Ortiz, Jose, AOrtiz, Lewis, Ortiz, Maria, EOrtiz, William, O'Sullivan, Derek, LO'Sullivan, John, Otero, Rosa, DOtero Jr., Angel, LuizO'Toole, Michael, JOverton, Troy. (rag)
September 17, 2003 Filing 79 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by:Abell, Edward, JAcosta, Facelis, JAfridi, Azam, KAguirre, Marilyn, Ahearn, Sean, MAlbanese, Richard, AAliberti, Stephen, JAllen, Clifford, MAllie, Asmat, Almeida, Fernando, LAlston, Peter, JAnderson, Bryan, GAnderson, Douglas, WAnderson, Gary, HAndrade, Vincent, Angilletta, Alberto, Anglada , John , Angst, Patrick, FAnnibale, Charles, JApper, Mitchell, IArienta, Stephen, RArnold, Bruce, AArroyave, Jimmy, LArroyo, Anna, LArroyo, Madeline, Ashmeade, Karen, BAskin, Daniel, JAugustin, Yanick, MAustin Jr., Daniel, CAviles, Evelyn, Aviles Jr., Robert, Badillo, Reinaldo, Balaj, Daniel, ZBaldwin, Ryan, Baloy, Romeo, BBalsan, Jason, GBarbee, Anthony, JBarbier, Derek, WBarcus, Ronald, JBarese Jr, Vincent, NBarrett, Stephen, WBayne, Howard, JBeach, Leticia, RBecht, Timothy, GBellomo, Salvatore, Benoit, Phillip, WBerardi, Rocco, ABerish, Joshua, BBeritan, Jorge, LBerlanga, Rafael, Bernardo, Pasquale, Berrios, Robert, Berry, Richard, JBeutel, David, JBianco, Tara, LBirch, Michael, ABlasini, Angel, LBoder, Matthew, CBodolato, Richard, JBoeckmann, Rainer, JBolak, Laura, JBonanno, Michael, JBonds, Dwayne, EBonelli Jr., Ralph, TBordonaro, Paul, TBorges, Mariano, OBorkowsky, Steven, ABowden, Gerard, JBowler, Matthew, MBoyd, Sean, SBoylan, Michael, TBranch, Edward, MooreBrautigam, William, PBravo, William, ABrestle, Albert, WBrinson, Joseph, Brooks, Shannon, DBrown, Angela, CBrown, Diane, Brown, Ralph, CBrown, Stacie, ABruno, Adam, PBryant, Trina, RBullard, Craig, VBullock, Thomas, ABurke, Michael, DBurkhardt, Marc, DByrne, Robert, LCaban, Nayda, ICabrera, Marjorie, JCacace, Fred, Cafaro, Rosario, Callagy, John, JCalzaretta, Rachel, LCamiolo, Anthony, Canavan, Christopher, MCanavan, Joseph, VCapozziello, Theodore, PCappello, Michael, JCarbo, Salvatore, JCarillo, Kim, MCarollo, Anthony, JCarpentieri, Jason, ECarradero-Torres, Betty, Carraro, Andrew, MCarrasco, Christian, Carrington, Wanda, DCarson, Andrew, FCasey, Thomas, PCasley, Sabrina, Cassillo, Anthony, JCastillo, Michael, ACastro, Carlos, ACastro, Paula, MChan, Philip, Chiusano, Michael, CChocallo, Robert, GChu, Yen, PCino, Charles, VCiprian, Madelyn, Ciulo, Philip, SClarke, Kenneth, SCoccia, Robert, JCoccia, Robert, LCole, Michael, RCollazo, Jorge, LuisCollein, Russell, HCollins, Arthur, JCollins, Lisa, AColombo, Vincenzo, JColon, Ernesto, Colon, Omar, Colon Jr, Felix, JCompetiello, Gaetano, Conklin, Robert, JConnelly, Keith, FConnor, Anthony, Conti, Alfred, PConway, Thomas, JCoons, Douglas, PCopertino, Andrew, Cordero, Cruz, ECordero, Rolette, RCordova, Luis, RCorrea, Luis, Corry, Daniel, PCouchon, William, JCoyle, John, PCruz, Freddy, Cruz, Migdalia, Cuadra, Michael, Cummings, Peter, MCusumano, Michael, PaulCutrufo, Grace, GCuza, Felipe, LD'Alessio, John, JDaly, Brian, Danglade, Darrin, MDaniels, Janice, Dash, Stanley, Dauge, Vincent, Davios, Michael, De La Rosa, David, ADeBono, Arthur, RDeCanio, Patrick, JDeFranco, Gregory, JDeJesus, Victor, Dejesus, Wanda, Delfino, Joseph, Delgado Jr, Julio, EDellavalle, Anthony, JDellomo, Timothy, MDeMaria, Frank, RDeMeco, Patrick, JDenis, Jean-Marc, Denning, Edward, DePalo, Brian, DD'Esposito, Vincent, DeVaney, Alan, RDevita, Michael, JDiamond, Martin, J.Diaz, Milton, PDiBrizzi, Michael, ADifiano, Joseph, JDiletto, Mario, DiLisio, Gianpaolo, Dillon, Timothy, JDinaso, Joseph, TDiorio, John, PDisch, Jodi, LDocherty Jr, James, JDominguez, Josette, Dominicci, Shaun, Donahue, Michael, CDonnelly, Matthew, TD'Onofrio, John, WDonohue, James, NDonohue, Thomas, FDonovan, Kathleen, SDoyle, Arthur, JDrakopoulos, Jimmy, Drew, Daniel, TDroskoski, Bradley, WDuda, Valerie, MDuester, Donald, JDunton, Colleen, MEaton, Mark, AEdmond, Charles, IEfstathiadis, Efstathios, Ehresman, Angelo, JEkert, William, JElcock, Michael, CEng, Bruce, LEnsminger, Vernon, Erickson, Susan, TErler, Richard, LEsoff, Donald, JEsposito, Michael, Estrada, Brian, CEstrella, Jose, MFabara, Carlos, AFalcaro, Michael, AFaranda, Anthony, CFarid, Kappa, BenFarina, Mia, GFasano, Eric, Fasano, Richard, Favale, Joseph, JFeliciano, Joseph, Feliz, Katherine, BFernandez, John, Fields, Aarkieam, RFields, Michelle, SFigliozzi, Joseph, TFigurski, Edward, JFinck, Michael, JFindlay, Alicia, AFischer, William, FFischman, Joseph, Flaherty, Michael, GFlammia, Anthony, SFlechaus, Kim, JFleckenstein, Robert, Fleming, Finbarr, JFlowers, Roxon, Flynn, Thomas, GFoley, Michael, AFoley, Patricia, MFonrose, Selwyn, MFonvil, Simone, Forrester, Kruythoff, SFortune, Christine, MFox, Brian, PFranco, Dio, JFranklin, Steven, Fraser, Thomas, AFrederick, Eric, Freeman, Sharnell, DFreyeisen, Fredrick, G. (rag)
September 17, 2003 Filing 78 WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT TO Add Party Plainttiffs by: Lambert, Thomas. (rag)
September 9, 2003 Filing 77 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: , Carmen, RMaldonado, Samuel, Maloney, David, Mangan, John, TManning, Brian, LManno, Jacqueline, GMarchese, Vincent, Marrin, Brian, CMarshall, John, Martinez, Melba, Masterson, Christopher, Mateyaschuk, Scott, WMazzeo, Melissa, AMcCann, James, MMcCants, Lashawn, McElroy, Richard, CMcGeean, Charles, PMcGuigan, Edward, CMcKelvey, Michael, JMcKenna, Philip, MMendez, Marc, AMercado, Benigno, Mercado, Maribel, Mevo, Victor, AMinghillo, Michael, Minoia, Anthony, TMistretta, Eric, TMonaco, Lorraine, JMontalbano, Peter, LMontella, Peter, GMontero, Emer, Montuori, Joseph, RMoore, Syntheria, FMoran, Michele, Morgan, Michael, WMorman, Natalie, EMorrison, Scott, CMottershead, Cheryl, LMoy, Kent, Mulligan, Diana, Mundy, Shawna, L.Murphy, Cynthia, DMurphy, Frank, PMurphy, Matthew, Murphy, Michael, PMurtagh, John, PNatal-Zimmer, Zoraida, CNaumann, Edmund, BNavarra, Christopher, FNelson, Carmen, NNg, John, Nicholls, James, DNicolosi, Joseph, TNieves, Ernesto, Nieves, Rosalina, Nunez, Johnny, RNunez Jr, Luis, JNunziato, John, LNuzzo, John, MO'Brien, Kevin, AO'Connell, Christopher, WO'Donnell, Matthew, EO'Halloran, Iris, JO'Halloran, Michael, JO'Kane, James, TOliveras, Sonia, Ollis, Thomas, LOrellana, Johnny, AOrfanos, James, NOrtiz, Margaret, MOsgood, Thomas, JOttaka, Andrew, MPadinha, Jose, APalermo, Nancy, SPalermo Jr., Jamie, Palmisano, Russell, Paluszkiewicz, Richard, JPappace, Donald, Pardo, Darren, WParis, David, Pattilio, Anthony, Pava, Carlos, APaverman, Robert, Peralta, Susie, Perez, Carmelo, Perna, Carl, JPetrizzo Jr., Michael, JPhotos, James, Picarelli, Toni, AnnPierre, Mathieu, WPineiro, Luis, APisano, Thomas, JPolignone, Martin, RPortes, Francisco, TPowers, Eileen, MPrice, Kevin, VPrince, Gail, TPuglia, Joseph, AQuinones, Marlene, Quinones Jr, Wilfredo, Raggo, Clifford, ARahman, Waliur, Ramirez, Benjamin, Ramos, Julio, ARattigan, Martin, PRead, Luis, Reddin, Brian, JosephRedmond, Joseph, VReed, Eric, PReid, Kenyair, PRepetto , Julio , Rhodus, Debora, MRiley, John, WRivera, Jessica, MRivera, Jose, ARivera, Luis, Rivera, Manuel, ARivera, Marie, TRivera-Ramos, Diana, Roberts, Karen, MRobinson, John, JRobinson, Thomas, VRobles, Jose, ERocanello, Catherine, ARoche, Pedro, LRodriguez, Eugenio, Rodriguez, Frank, Rogers, James, RRoman, Jorge, Romero, Carlos, JRosa, Noel, Rosario, Nesquelma, Rosenberg, Evan, MRoske, Mara, ERoss, David, WRothman-Restaino, Joy, BRothschild, Harold, JSalgado, Juan, Salomon, Daphina, FSanchez, Miguel, Santiago, Andrew, Sapienza, Richard, MSchmerwitz, Herbert, PSchneider, Charles, CSchomaker, Frank, Schwager, Marni, MScibico, Joseph, RScorcia, John, Scott, Jada, Seguinot, Anthony, Seguinot, Shelley, ASezen, Semih, Sheldon, Michael, Sheppard, Kenan, JSien Jr., Tjia, TSigue, Jean, ESimantov, Eirit, Skotak, George, GSlade, Steven, GSliman, Alan, P.Smallwood, Faith, SSoto, Herman, Soto, Wilfredo, Stafford, Ronald, WStaffu, Christopher, Stasi, Marc, ASteiner, Matthew, Stewart, Michael, GStone, Kevin, WStraus, Richard, JSwann, Wayne, ESzachacz, Walter, ATalavera, John, ATam, Nelson, Tamburri, Olga, ITancredi, Anthony, Thomas, Hayden, CThomas, Marvin, Thomas, Philip, ETitterton, Michael, KTitza, Robert, MTolentino, Anthony, TTorres, Anthony, MTorres, Damaso, DamienTorres, Ivette, MTripi, Seth, PTrotta, Joseph, JTurchio, Mario, Turner, Brian, KTurner, George, JValenza, Daniel, MValle, Deirdre, AVasquez, Angel, RVazquez, Grace, LVega, Louis, FVelez, Daniel, Villa, Joseph, LVilorio, Pedro, NVinals, Jose, Vinella, Steven, ZViola, Christopher, AVroom, Charles, CWagner, John, FWaldron, Steven, JWatson, Brandon, AWeber, Matthew, CWharton, John, CWhitehurst-Williams, Maria, MWickers II, Bruce, JWilliams, Kevin, AngeloWilliams, LeRoy, CWilliams, Michelle, AWilson, Madeline, C.Zaborowski, John, FZanis, William, LZecca, Louis, FZitano, Philip, MZizza, Frank, VZuvic, John, Frank. (rag)
September 9, 2003 Filing 76 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Acosta Jr, Fernando, Addeo Jr., Arthur, PAdrion, Annmarie, Agelis, Peter, AAguayo, Edna, Alanis, Kevin, Albarano, Damian, AAlexandre, David, Ali, Donna, RAllen, Equashia, VAlvarado Jr., David, Alves, John, FAnderson, Andrea, EAndino, Niurka, AAntonacci, David, JArevalo, Fabio, AAtherley, Lana, Attari, Anoopam, Avitto, Joseph, ABaguiao, MaryEllen, Bailey, Niecee, Bannon-Albarano, Tara, TBarba, John, JBarrett, Michael, RBarry, Tanya, OBarton, Patrick, TBavaro, Vincent, DBeasley, Valrie, KBecker, John, EBellieo, John, Beneduce, Joseph, JBenitez, Juan, ABennett, Thomas, KBerke, Arthur, Bisiani, Scott, VBland, Venisia, EBlum, Darren, DBoesch, Barbara, JBona, Steven, LBonanno, Anthony, JBonheur, Monode, Borawski, Brian, KBozzonetti, Robert, EBrassil, James, JBrenna, Michael, FBrennan, Morgan, DBrittain III, Edward, WBroadnax, Barbara, Brown, Patrick, LBruen, Christine, Byrne, William, JCambridge, Donald, CCammarata, Michael, ACampbell, Telatha, Cantafio, Andrea, Canty, Diane, ZCapodice, Andrew, SCaputo, Joseph, ACarter III, Thomas, Carty, John, Cascione, Stephen, Cassagnol, Alix, TCassidy, Susan, MCastillo, Omar, ACataldo, Felice, DCavendish, Craig, Charles, Georges, JChilds, Andrew, LChon, Haksoo, Cicio, Nicholas, CCisak, Daniel, MClemenza, Robert, AColgan, George, J.Collins, Nancy, Colon, Alejandro, Colon, Erwin, FColucciello, Michael, Connor, Sean, AConroy, Bryan, ACook, Barbara, HCopney, Spencer, LCortes, Roddy, Cortes, Wilfredo, Cortez, Raymond, Costello, Brendan, JCozzi, Anthony, CCrook Jr, Robert, RCrose, Jon, Cross, Denise, MCruz, Jose, LCulcleasure, Georgianna, Curran, Kimberly, LCurry, Josephine, Dalessandro, Jason, Daly, Denise, Daniels, Victor, Dee, Michael, EDelacruz, Kirsix, AD'Elia, Anthony, Deligio, James, DeMarco, Peter, JDemartino, Dean, MDeMatteo, Gregg, Dembinski, Thomas, JDempsey, Thomas, MDenis, Brian, ADePutron, Michael, DeVito, John, Diaz, William, EDigena, Stephen, FDiLemmo, Janice, MDileo, Frank, SDiMartino, Vincent, JDisla, Victor, ManuelDometiza, Dexter, BDonarumma, Angelo, JDonello, Marc, ADong, Lauren, JDorrian, Raymond, FDorsey, Teresa, EDowling, Edward, JDrogan, Thomas, Duernberger, Donald, LDurkel, Valerie, EDwyer, Kenneth, JEchel, Salvatore, JElliott-O'Leary, Stacey, AEmbser, Walter, JEspino, Nadiana, AEstepa, Blanca, IFagan, James, MFassert, Michael, CFehn III, Peter, CFeldman, Daniel, JFelician, James, CFeliciano, Diego, Feliciano, Maria, DFernandez, Joseph, Fernandez, Nelson, Ferri, Albert, MFigueroa, Shirley, Finneran, Brian, JFinnerty, Jennifer, AnnFitzpatrick, Thomas, FFlagg, Wayne, CFlatley, Patrick, DFlores, Eric, DFlynn, Pamela, YFoisey, Keith, JFolks, Marcella, Francois, Hans, DFrangipane, Richard, JFrawley, John, FFuchs, James, TGarcia, Fausto, Garcia, Franklin, Garcia, Magdalene, Garofalo, Angela, MGarvin, Gregory, Gatto, Sharon, RGeldmacher, Michael, RGiangiobbe, Michael, JGibbs, Michael, JGier, Jeffrey, Gilchrist, Ryan, PGirdusky, James, WGismondi, Guy, JGivner, Harold, Gomez, Maria, EGomez, William, AGonzalez, Christopher, AGonzalez, Marcus, AGonzalez, Pedro, FGordon, Robert, SGorman, Christopher, JGraffagnino, Keith, JGrahn, Edward, TGrattan Jr., Paul, DGray, Tucker, XGreenburg, Johanna, Gribbon, Christopher, Guerra, Marivel, Guida, Matteo, JGulotta, Anthony, Gutierrez, Julio, CGuy, Michelle, Hackney, Bashim, BHale, Stephen, Hanna, Joseph, MHannan, Daniel, THarkins, Walter, EHarrop, Robert, CHarvin, Shaquan, LHeagney, Robert, MHefner, Richard, AHelly, Colleen, RHernandez, Ruben, DHernandez, Saleemah, Herold, Scott, VHerrera, Alejandro, Hirdt, Thomas, PHo, Michael, CHolland, Brian, EHolmes, Norris, BHolmes, Yvette, AHood, Laurence, IHoward, Duane, THughes, Madella, Humiecki, Richard, AHyland, Annette, HInglese, Vincent, PJaccard, John-Paul, Jackson, Keith, Jackson Jr., Alfred, Jacob, Steve, BenJames, LeRoi, Jenkins, Timothy, AJohnson, Kevin, Johnson, Richard, TKarimzada, Mohammed, Kelly, Douglas, MKelly, Liam, SKhan, Dawn, AKissik, Christopher, Ko, Fee, Kosmaty, Maciej, LaMantia, Darrin, JLanham, Mildred, CLanzillotta, Anthony, NLaudicino, Robert, ALawston, David, Lentz, Damon, DLenze, William, RLePage, Joseph, JLevine, Dorothy, JLewis, Scott, RLiang, William, Liciaga, Mayra, Liharevic, Iso, Linder, Michael, JLindsey, John, ALiverpool, Bryan, JLlaurado, Emma, MLoccisano, Rocco, ALodato, Michael, RLoFrese Jr, Robert, JLomax, Richard, KLopez, Freddy, FLopez, Israel, Lora, Mario, ELynch, Kevin. (rag)
September 4, 2003 Filing 75 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: MacAneney, John, CMachado, Michael, JMachado, Oniel, Macken, Emmett, PMadrigal, Jose, LMaggor, Matthew, AMalito, Richard, JMancini, Robert, Manzella, Anthony, BMapps-Whitmore, Valeria, DMaresca, Anthony, JMarinaccio, Carl, Marino, Joseph, Marrone, David, Marten, Thomas, CMartin, James, PMartucci, George, Masi, Kevin, GMasone, Thomas, JMassey, Daniel, HMasters, James, PMata, Eleodoro, JMayor, Fernando, RMcCadden, Joseph, WMcCarthy, Thomas, PMcCray, Wanda, McDermott, Patrick, McDonald, William, CMcGann, John, TMcGrail, John, PMcGrath, Caroll, JMcGrouther, Ian, McInnis, Michael, PMcKenna, Richard, VMcKenzie, Janet, FMcKeon, Paul, McMahon, Jay, JMcVicar, William, HMeade, John, JMelillo, Joseph, NMellone, Paul, SMendoza, Eric, SMeyer , William , KMichael, Kerrissa, SMidwood, Lisa, MMileski, John, EMiller Jr., John, JMiranda, Betsy, Miskanic, Edward, JosephMontague, Kathleen, BMontez, Efrain, Morales, Delvis, RMorales, Doris, Morales, Wilbert, Morano, Mary, LMorrison, Anne Marie, EMoss, Ronald, PMuniz, Eliu, Muniz, Raul, RMunoz, Allison, Murphy, Thomas, JMusso, James, PMyers-Punnette, Yvette, Napolitano, Jaclyn, FNasso, Dominick, MNavas, Daniel, Nemeth, Mandor, WNevins Jr., Daniel, JNewelt, Marc, JNewman, Kevin, JNeysmith, Howard, PNg, Phillip, WNicoletti, Thomas, ANicotra, Joseph, CNogol, Eduard, PNonnenmann, Mark, SNowak, Robert, JNunziato, Michelle, ANusser, Edward, BO'Connor, Michael, O'Mara, William, O'Neill, Thomas, MOrtiz, John, AOrtiz, Luis, AOttley, Joel, APabon, Jose, APabon, Orlando, Pacella, Frank, MPanico, Susan, MPapa, Frank, Papeo, Darin, Pappas, Kathy, Patterson, Vincent, BPeralta, Ruben, Perez, Dionicio, Perez, Eddie, Perez, Jose, APerez, Manuel, Perrault, Adam, GPerry, Michael, APerry, Robert, MPetersen, Ralph, EPetraro, Santo, JPinero, Jaime, LPinkall, Steven, Plonczynski, Damon, RPodber, Michael, JPolizzi, Salvatore, Popolizio, Michael, APupo, Christopher, MPutterman, Gary, SQuinn, William, GQuirk, Michael, JRamirez, Ricardo, Reichel, Mark, PReid, Carlos, Reuther, Carolyn, Revans, David, JReyes Jr, Anibal, Ribustello, Anthony, JRios, Carolyn, Rivera, Danny, ARivera, Emily, IRivera, Wilfred, Rivera Jr., Josue, MRizzuti, Nicholas, Roach, Timothy, ScottRoberts, Michael, IRobson, Brent, JRodriguez, Albert, Rodriguez, Peter, ORogers, Peter, JRollins, Felita, YRooney, Kevin, PRosero, Katherine, Ruiz, Eric, Rush, Daniel, ERusso, Michael, Ryan, Michael, GSalas, Ramon, ASalcedo, Felix, MSalerno, Sara, Salinas, Liz, KSambataro, Frank, Sanchez, Israel, Santerelli Jr, Gennaro, JSchindlar, Curt, JSchulze, Donna, MScott, Daniel, JScott, Susan, ASegnini-Galante, Gisela, MSegreto, Michael, DSeligson, William, NSerrano, Ivette, Seymour, Wendel, NShah, Syed, MShaughnessy, James, LSiderakis, Harris, GSilk, Audrey, Silva, Joseph, MSkowronski, Walter, JSmith, Alfredo, TSmith, Steven, PSodano, Jerry, Sola, Rene, RSonnenberg, Wilma, Sosa, Joseph, ASpezio, Eric, Stafford, Desmond, GStanley, Paul, NStevens, Thomas, RStevens, William, LStewart, Gail, HStukonis, Peter, CSuarez, Eloy, ASuhrhoff, Robert, RSullivan, Kevin, MSummers, Robert, Surillo, Jason, ESusi, Anthony, JSzalkowski, Jeffrey, RTaute Jr, Richard, JTavarez, Ruth, DTaylor, Richard, Thomas, Sheila, JThompson Jr, Robert, Tierney, Andrew, JTierney, Patrick, ATimmons, Brian, STirado, Nicole, Torres, Danny, Torres, Fernando, Torretta, David, MTosado, Virna, Trance, Michael, Triolo, Joseph, FTunick, Daniel, ATuozzolo, Paul, JTuttle, Kevin, MUnger, Joseph, TValentin, Teodoro, Valenza, Steven, JVargas, Bernabe, Vargas, Betty, Vargas, Sharon, CVasquenz, Edward, JVaughn, Julius, EVeaz, Richard, Vega, Janette, Velez, Marcy, AVernaci, John, Villanueva, Jose, EVitiello, Francine, MVolturo, Charles, Walters, Jamie, MWard, Jonnette, JWarren, John, DWeber, David, SWelch, Glen, LWells, Scott, PWelsch, Peter, JWhalen, Mark, AWhite, Brian, Wiley, Rick, FWilliams, Lanese, AWillis, Angela, CWilson, Daniel, SWilson, Giovanni, NWilson, Michael, JWindsor, Michael, Wingate, Daniel, DWisniewski, Bruce, MWitcoski, Charles, Xhidija, Adriatik, Zambrana Jr, Justino, Zittel, Peter, JZwickis, Robert. (rag)
September 4, 2003 Filing 74 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Abenanti, Lawrence, AAcompora, Lizabeth Adams, Corey, IAdorno, Israel, Agosto, William, Ahmetaj, Shkelzen, Albertelli, James, RAlexander, Latisha, MAlforo, Rolando Alicea, Ruben, DAlvarez, Francisco, IAmsterdam, John, PAndersen, Mark, JAragones, Alice, Arcati, Michael, AArdisana, Karl Arocho, Alvin Atamyildiz, Rosa, EAtiles, Luis, Augustine, Jennifer, AAviles, Anthony, Ayala Jr, Daniel, Ayers, Donette, YAzzato, Kerri, ABadamo, Robert, TBadillo, Fernando, Bahm, Christine, VBalcan, Tony, JBarnes, Karen, EBartoldus, Anton, JBaskinger, Andrea, Baumeister, John, HBeitz, Christopher, JBelmonte, Michael, Bershad, Andrew, Beyers, Ada, MBiberaj, Sokol, Biehl, Michael, JBizzarro, Dominick, Blainey, Neil, JBlittner, Seth, HBoccio, Vincent, Bohringer, Peter, EBonziglia, Kathryn, RBorda, Stephen, LBorelli, Anthony , Brandon, Edward, PBrathwaite, Mark, ABrennick, Robert, FBrigman, Bryant, Brink, David, LBrock, Keith, RBrophy, Thomas, GBruton, Kyle, JBurgess, Warrick, LBurgos, Jose, MBurke, Michelle, CBurke, Thomas, JCalderon-Rivera, Sergio, Cannizzaro, Christopher, JCantiello, Gregory, PCardin-St. Vil, Tiffany, ACardona, Joseph, M.Carey, Charles, FCarey, Donna, PCarlozzi, Christine, JCarmody, Michael, GCaruti, Paul, TCasey III, Otis, TCassidy, Patrick, MCavanagh, Thomas, JCea, Brian, JCeballos, Gloria, ACeli, Francis, AChampagne, Colleen, MChan, Christopher, WChang, Won, JunCillo, Graziano, Citarella, Richard, Clark, Marvin, Clerge Jr, Fernand, EColangelo, Richard, Collazo, Jose, Collazo, Roberto, Conlon, Sean, JConversano, Christopher, RCordova, Nelson, MCordts, John, FCornea, Alberto, NCorrea, Jimmy, Courtney, Bridget, ACoyne, Anthony, Crowley, Timothy, JCruz, Roberto, Cucinello, Eugene, JCuello, Marcello, FCurcio, Eric, JCutrone, Elizabeth, PDaly, Michael, CD'Amico, Thomas, Daniels, Anthony, Davis, Dwayne, De Vito, Michael, GDela Cruz, Jesus, MDelgado, Joe, Deluca, Nicholas, ADeMarco, Michael, DePasquale, Dina, MDepetris, David, ADeRienzo, Dennis, CDevine, Eugene, MDiaz, Fanny, ADigiovanna, Anthony, VDiMatteo, Matthew, DioDonet, Francisco, ADiPreta, Joseph, LDivirgilio, Matthew, JDixon, Ivory, GDonnelly, Daniel, PDonnelly, Lawrence, Doolan, Robert, Downey, John, MDrayton, Michael, NDunworth, John, FDurante, Joseph, ADurkin, Kenneth, Dwornik, Julian, MEcheverria, Robert, Edwards, Christopher, JEhmer, John, HEisner, William, AEstepa, Erik, Estevez, Javier, GEvans, Michael, WEverett, Duane, MFagan, James, DFarragher, Michael, Fatale, Matthew, RFernandez, Jovanny, RFerraro, Edward, MFerrer, Christopher, RFiacco, Michael, JFiorella, John, PFitzgerald, Patrick, KFlanagan, Tracy, AFlareau, David, JFleming, Christopher, JFleming, William, JFlores, Harry, PFlynn, Denise, AFontana, Vincent, JFrances, Miguel, AFranco, Joseph, Franks, Thomas, JFrazier, Larry, TFriedman, Michael, SGalvin, James, FGarcia, Jose, Geisler, Jodi, RGentile, Joseph, PGiardiello, Vincent, JGibbs, Andrew, Girdusky, Michael, AGiuga, Vincent, JGoldreyer, Michael, TGonzales, Albert, JGonzalez, Humberto, Gonzalez, Nick, Gordon, Robert, JGrant, Maurice, EGray, Glenn, NGreenleaf, Robert, SGribben, Rose, EGuadagno, Anthony, JGyuro, Josephine, AHackett, Eugene, PHanlon, Anthony, RHarper, Lawrence, Harper, Yaphet, DHarris, David, AHernandez, Hugo, Hernandez, Michael, Hillery, Andrew, JHockenjos, Robert, SHoffman, Robert, AHolland, Richard, Hracs, Richard, JHufnagle, John, MHughes, Cassie, MHunt, Avia, VHussameldin, Haitham, Iadevaio, Anthony, Iaquinto, Thomas, GIsola, William, PJanow, Thomas, MJohnson, Joseph, JJoyce, Kerry, TKaminski, Steve, Kautzsch, Karl, HKealy, John, AKearney, James, DKeller, Anthony, CKelm, William, Kenny, Margaret, MKilpatrick, John, EKimmins, Scott, PKing, Nathaniel, Klein, Christopher, W.Kmech, William, GKrech, Marika, AKrokondelas, John, AKubat, Lorne, LLagana, Angelo, JLaguer, Alberto, Landau, Lynne, RLane, Garrett, PLang, Timothy, MLange, Maggie, Layne, Joseph, CLeifer, Alan, Lenz, William, GLeonardi, David, MLetterese, Frank, ELittles, John, London, David, Lopez, Myrlton, Lora, Raphael, ALoughlin, Kenneth, PLouis-Juste, Edgard, Lovett, Troy. (rag)
August 25, 2003 Filing 73 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Acevedo, Michael, ; Afanasewicz, Peter, ;Altieri, Frank, ;Anderson, Douglas, ; Arbeeny, Christopher, ;Argaluza, Robert, ;Austin, Jennifer, Aylward, Joseph, M;Badia, Mario, J;Baer, Eileen, ;Baker, Paul, ;Barnes, Erin, ;Barry, Donald, ;Barulich, Michael, ; Battaglia, Eric, ;Bautista, Milton, ;Benitez, Hipolito, R; Berger-Marcelle, Nicole, ;Bernadotte, Jules, C;Betcher, Thomas, A;Biondi, David, ;Bishop, Derrick, ;Bonventre, Frank, ;Bott, Kenneth, ;Brabham, Christopher, Scott;Brady, Francis, ;Brezinski, Jeffrey, J;Brock, Joseph, T;Brosnan, John, G;Brunjes, Richard, J;Bryne, Thomas, M;Cabrera, Bernice, ;Cai, Timothy, ;Calle, Julio, ;Capellini, David, W; Carboine, Colleen, ;Carolan, Sean, C;Carranza, Oscar, ; Carter III, Thomas, ;Caruso, Michael, ;Casazza, Ronald, ; Castillo, Cesar, ;Cayenne, Jonathan, ;Celestino, Henry, ; Centa, Alida, ;Ciuccio, Thomas, ;Clark, David, ;Clark, Sharon, ;Colon, Darrell, ;Colon, Reinaldo, ;Commisso, Vincent, ;Corniel, Enrique, A;Cortelli , Christian , ; Cortez, Jose, G;Costello, Janelle, ;Craigg, Sandra, L;Cruz, Edward, ;Cruz, Luis, A;Cunningham, Kevin, A;Cuozzo, Angelo, P;Curtis, Alison, ;Curtis, Leah, S;Daley, Nicketria, ;Daly, Peter, ;Dandridge, Kirk, ;Day, Maureen, A;Deachman, John, W; Delgado, Manuel, ;DeMarino, Debra, ;DeMarzo, Felice, ; DeMeo, Dario, ;Destin, Frenel, S;Deveraux, Paul, ;Diaz, Aaron, ;Diaz, LoAnna, ;DiMuzio, Jon, ;Dinalal, Chandradat, K DiNunno, John, ;Dolcimascolo, Joseph, ;Dugan, Thomas, F; Duran, Jorge, L;Dyce, Leonard, ;Ehrlein, Tyler, W;Eqbal, Syed, ;Esbri, Yasmin, I;Espino, Gissette, ;Faccilonga, Sean, A.;Fahey, Daniel, ;Falanga, Louis, A;Fantauzzi Jr, Jose, ; Ferrante, Vincent, A;Ferraro, Thomas, ;Ferreiras, Roberto, ; Fink, Cory, ;Flete, Raymond, A;Flood, Eric, P; Garcia, Lisa, ;Garcia, Sharon, ;Gaudio, Michael, ;Gill, Martin, G.;Gilroy, Brian, J;Gonzalez, Elizabeth, ;Graziano, Maria, R;Grieco, Lisa, R;Guarelia, David, ;Guerra, Alain, ; Guerrero, Angel, A;Guzzetta, Keith, ;Hardy, Elliott, ; Haymer, Carl, ;Heldt, Michael, A;Hernandez, Ralfi, ;Herold, Robert, L;Heuser , John, R ;Hidalgo, Carlos, ;Hirsch, Erik, ;Hoban, Brian, K; Hockney, Scott, D;Holzman, Ian, S;Howell, Michael, ;Hughes, Justin, F;Hughes, Sean, ;Iaboni, Paul, ; Incerto, Frank, ; Iuculano, Thomas, ;Izzo, John, ;Jackson, Mary, K;Jacob, Frank, ;Jimenez, Elizabeth, ;Jimenez, Ricardo, ;Jones, Dashawn, L;Kasyjanski, James, ;Kelly, Noreen, P;Kenny, Brian, E;Kenny, Christopher, ;Kenny, Kathleen, ;King, Rhonny, S;Knight, Kevin, W;Korabel, Jonathan, P;Kosinski, Glenn, ;Kwasnaza, Thomas, ;LaBarbara, Michael, ;LaJoie, Michael, ;Lamberti, Joseph, ;Lang IV, George , M;Larkin, Devin, ;Laszewski, Michael, ;LaVeglia, Angelo, ;Lazar, William, ;Lee, David, H;Lee, Demetrios, ; Lee, Yong, S; LeGoff, Ronald, ;Lennon, James, ;Little, Colen, J;Liverani, Nicholas, ;Livingston, Dana, ;Loperena, Kerby, D;Lopez Jr, Felix, ;Luedtke, John, ;Lugo, Willie, ; Luna, Mauro, F; Macias, Jorge, ;Madison, Scott, W;Maes, Norman, ;Maisonet, Carlos, R;Majett, Todd, ;Mancini Jr., Robert, ;Manfra, Michael, ;Mangiamele, Vincent, R;Manion, Richard, J; Marchello, Kenneth, D;Marcia, Joseph, ;Marino, Joseph, ; Marquiss, Wayne, T;Martinez, John, A;Martinez, Joseph, ; Marto, Ronald, ;Marty, Maritza, ;Matos, Eladio, ; McCabe, Ian, ;McCabe, Michael, ;McCarthy, Lawrence, F; McGarvey Jr, Robert, ;McGloster, Jill , H ;McGrade, William, ;McGrane, Kenneth, ;McGuire, Michael, P;McKenzie, Rohan, ;McKeon, Robert, W;McKoy, Raymond, A;McLaughlin, Brian, ;McLeod, Latoya, N;McVay, Errol, S;Medina, Jose, ; Medina, Rosa, ; Melendez, Luis, M;Mentor, Winslow, J;Mercer, Timothy, J; Mikokski, Thomas, ;Milazzo, Joseph, J;Mills, Derek, ; Miranda, Flavio, ;Modlin, Joseph, B;Morales, Peter, ;Moran, Carlos, J;Moya, Angel, ;Muentes, Carlos, ;Muhammad , Yusuf , ;Mulero, Mildred, D;Mullane, Bryan, J;Mullane, Pamela, ; Munroe, Denise, ;Murphy, Carmen, G;Murphy, Charles, ; Muschitiello, Christine, ;Mushorn, Keith, ;Nemes, Michael, D Nguyen, Minh, ;Nunez, Elvin, ;Obdyke, Christopher, ;Oquendo, Joseph, E;O'Sullivan, Robert, P; Panaricllo, Matthew, ; Parisen, Michael, J;Parker, Ernest, L; Parkins, Bruce, ; Parsons, Christopher, ;Pastroski, Robert, ; Patterson, Colin, ;Patterson, Rosezena, ;Pedersen, Colen, A; Perez, Fermin, ;Phillips, Mona, ;Pizzolo, Vincent, J;Plaia, Vito, ; Porti, Daryl, ;Poturica, Chris, ;Powell, Tyrone, C; Proscia, Thomas, G;Purack, Brian, ;Pusic, Matthew, ; Quigley, Joey, ; Raehse, John, ;Ramirez, Rachael, ;Ramos, Jose, L;Ramos, Sarae, ;Redrick, Paula, Simone;Reece, Gavin, Audie;Rike, Kenneth, ;Riley, Kelly, ;Rivera, Isaias, ; Rivera, Luis, ; Roberts, Paul, J;Rodriguez, Arminda, ; Rodriguez, Steven, ; Roman, Wakisha, ;Rossello, Manuel, ; Ruggiero, Gianni, ; Ruiz, Annette, ;Saavedra-Norbeck, Valerie, ;Sacco, John, D; Sagginario, Anthony , ;Salgado, Jose, ;Salva, John, ; Samartino, Stephen, J;Sanna, John, W; Sawyer, Fredrick, M; Schwicke, Kenneth, ;Seward, Timothy, ; Shannon, James, M; Shatinsky, Thomas, J;Silberman, David, M; Silva, Harold, ; Silva, Julio, ;Sim, Marcel, ;Sime, Nicolas, A;Simpkins, Sharon, ;Singleton, Demetria, ;Skrzypek, Edward, J;Smith, Kenyon, ;Soave, Mark, ;Stavropoulos, Chris, ;Stevens, William, J;Stewart Jr, Donald, A;Symister, Sarcanda, ; Telesky, John, W.;Tobias, Daniel, ;Tocco, Alessandro, ; Toledo Jr, Pedro, ;Torres, Alexander, ;Torres, Edwin, ; Troiano, Victor, ;Trupul, Timothy, ;Tumminelli, Patricia, L; Turchio, Michael, ;Twomey, John, J;Valdivia, Gerard, F; Vanible, Lysa, ;Vasquez Sr, Donald, ;Vazquez, Edwin, ;Vega, Carlos, E;Vella, Joseph, ;Ventre, Nicola, ; Vezzi, Anthony, Vitellio, John, J;Ward, Christopher, W; Weldron, Edward, T; Wendler, Joseph, P;White, Debra, G; Williams, Dexter, L; Williams, Wendell, ;Wise, Timothy, R; Wong, Alexander, ; Wong, Tony, ;Yankovich, Willy, ;Yoo, Young, C;Young, Daniel, A. (rag) Modified on 09/03/2003
August 13, 2003 Filing 72 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Ahearn, Brian, LAitola, Christopher, Alexandre, Barthold, Alvarez, Julio, Arnow, Alyson, EBartnik, Edward, T.Bartoli, Alex, Bentivegna, Michael, Bethel, Herbert, Binetti, Frank, E.Brant, Walter, Burgos, Harold, Calabria, Michael, Caradonue, MaryRose, Casale, Stephen, J.Celestin, Johnny, Clarke, Sophia, Commorato, Joseph, Connolly, Dennis, Coppola, Nicholas, Corso, Carlo, Daire, Tonya, N.Dilbert, Ezra, Dito, Jeffrey, O.Donoghue, Brian, Emeli, Jospehine, Ferguson, Sandra, Ferrentino, Victoria, Fonseca, Herbert, Forde, Wayne, Furman, Stan, Gaines, Scott, Gerry , Edward , R Griffin, James, MGriffin, Nancy, Guest, Sherry, Hall, Kurt, M.Henry, Gary, E.Ippolito, Santo, M.Isaacs, Nadia, Jimenez, Rafael, Kammer, Jeffrey, M.Karl-Otto, S., Kavanagh, Kevin, A.King, Thomas, J.LaFave II, Jeffrey, J.Lawrence, Stephen, F.Lefferman, Scott, Litrell, Randall, Lukas, Frank, MacCormack, Brendan, Maldonade, Luis, P.McCarthy, Robert, F.McDonald, Conrad, McDowell, Bobby, R.McKeon, Jennifer, McLoade, Timothy, Medina, John, D.Meindl, George, AMiot, Reginald, Nandoo, Michael, Nicolosi, Michael, O'Connor, Kenneth, Ortega, Victor, A.Paone, John, Parlo, Matthew, J.Powell, Donnell, J.Prisinzano, Anthony, JamesReardon, Alan, JRicci, Matthew, Rios, Jimmy, Rodriguez, Peggy, Rodriguez Jr., Peter, Rolek, Paul, Sala, Christopher, Salas, Manuel, Samuels, Fredwray, Sarlo DeRosa, Margaret, Sarracino, Guadalupe, Seeger, Christopher, Shea, Marie, Smith, Paula, Spadaccini, Michael, Such, Alan, Svercel, Daniel, Thompson, Kenneth, Torres, Joseph, Velazquez, Daniel, Vitale, Paul, A.Walker-Wilson, Lenise, Walsh, Sean, C.White, Gerard, Wilson, William, H.Wolfolk, Ronda, M.Woods, Gerald, J. (rag)
August 4, 2003 Filing 71 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs Abrahams, Wayne, RAcevedo, Michael, AAllen, Jerome, Alvarado, Karla, Ambrosino, Susan, AAmendolare, William, Badillo Jr., Angel, Bakioglu, Metin, Batista, Nelson, Baumgardt, Jean, A.Beazer, William, D.Blackman, Anthony, Bollon, Gregory, Bowden, Jonathan, Bracken, Tim, MBrowne, Richard, HBrunner, Keith, Byrd-Gibbs, Tracie, ACalvo, Peter, Carney, William, Carradero, Wilfredo, Castillo, Victor, MChaparro , Joselito , Clark Jr, Ezell, Clisti, John, EColeman, Teresa, Concannon, Brian, Cook, Richard, JCooney, George, Cordero Jr., Anthony, PCorio, Anthony, Corridan, Michael, Cruz, Andrew, SDeBlaiso, William, Deftereos, Christos, CDellaccio, Charles, Deynes, Vincent, DiBartolo, Michael , Dixon , Christopher , S Dousmanis, Nick, Dunn, Michael, R.Dunninger, Lee, Dunston Greaves, Penny, Edelman, Richard, Erickson, Kara, LFallace, Kelly, Fisher, Joseph, Fogg, James, Forsyth Jr., David , J Gerena, Nixaliz, Golembeski, Erik, Grigas, Joseph, Halley, James, Harnett, Robert, THoffman, Jamey, Hudec, John, Iorio, Joseph, JJackson, James, Johnson, Anthony, Kerins, Paul, L.Latture, Karen, Lema, John, A.Magnussen III, Erik, MMancini, Robert, JMarmolejos , Geovanny , R Maselli, Frederick, Matos, Jamellette, McCabe, William, McKenna, Keri, AnneMcLaine, Sean, McVeigh, Francis, JMejia, Edilio, AMercado , Adam , Mitchell, Cameron, A Mitchell, Debra, Murray, Paul, Nandoo, Anthony, Narvaez, Gabriel, Nash, Latitia, TNesfield, William, Noll , Thomas , O'Donnell, Charles, AOrtiz, Juan, Perez, Daniel, Pinkney, Shirley, Pizzonia, Vincent, JProvidence, Lyndon, Reid, Alan, C.Reivers, Conway, A.Richardson, Keith, Ryan, Wesley, C.Sak , Richard , J Sanger, John, JSantos, Brenda, LSimone, Charles, Smith, William, Stanley, Timothy, HStanley, William, CStocklmeier, Robert, Stora, Victor, NSullivan, Lawrence, RTafe, John, STrovato, Salvatore, Tullo, John, FrankTurner, Joseph, AVargas, Pedro, Vazquez, Diana, Venditto, Anthony, PWaldron, William, RWarren, William, TWhite, Preston, BWhitten, Peter, BWoods, Susan, PZogbi, Joseph. (rag)
July 11, 2003 Filing 69 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Acosta, Juan, PAdaszewski, Edward, SAgro, Angelo, Alesi, Donald, Almonte, Kubel, ABarnes, Gwendolyn, Behringer, Edward, JBillelo, James, Bizzaro, Joseph, Blandeburgo, James, PBresnihan, Patrick , J Bros, John, Butera, Gerard, Byrnes, Daniel, RCalderon, Evelyn, Camilleri, Brian, JCarano, Lisa, Carroll, Jeffrey, TChambers, David, J Colon, David , C Cooper, Joseph , P Coppola, James, MCorrea , Madelline , Cortese, Cory, Costello, Nancy, Curran Sr, Terence, ADalton, Robert, Danca, Gregory, Dandola, John, WDecker, Michael, DeLancey, Karen, DeStefano, Gennaro, Devlin, John, JDiPippo, Ronald, Eighrey, Brian, Ellis, Joseph, Farrell, Kieran, Finnegan, Noreen-Kate, Frawley, Michelle, S.Freeman, Kevin, Gallagher, Patrick, FGonzalez, Max, Green, Naeemah, SGrossman, Robert, CGuiheen, Peter, THamber, Barry, Holmes , Michael , Hylton, Mark, Iannone, Christopher, AInguaggiato, Mario, Jackson, Ryan, Jarvis, Peter, GLester, Zelda, LoPresti, Gene, JLoSchiavo , William, JMaldonado, Mildred, Maric, Franco, Marx, Michael, PMejia, Porfirio, Mendez, Yolanda, Milien, Elie, LMorales, Heriberto, Moran, John, CMoussa, Atef, SMullady , Michael , J.Nunez, Dana, JPauls, Monique, Pilnacek , Dolores , S Porter , Robert , Potter, Kurt, Rahn, Gerard, Riker, Kenneth, Roche, Sean, P Rodriguez, Ferdinand, Romano, George , Rowe, Christopher, JRuiz, Juan, Santiago, Edwin, Senisi, Joseph, Sing, Deonarine, KSpencer, Janine, MStaffa, Vincent, FStarks Sr, Richard, Stuart Jr, Robert, LSullivan, Dennis, Sutherland, Sharon, Tibbs, Gerard, JToolan, Timothy, Torres, Jose, RToth, Joseph, van Heemstede Obelt , Henry , J Vargas, Jose, LVelazquez, Ginger, Velez, Yadira, Viennas, Penny, Vigiano , Kathleen , Weeks, Ronald, JWilson, Derek, Wolfrom, Andrew, DYurcsak, Louis, A. (rag)
July 3, 2003 Filing 70 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of May 23, 2003. (dt)
July 3, 2003 Filing 68 CONSENT TO Add Party Plaintiffs by: Acuna, George, Adams, Bianela, CAdams, Victor, Agugliaro, Anthony, Alequin, Jose, RAlfiero, Daniel, LAllan, Scott, Alvarez, Domingo, Ambro, Emil, Andrade, Eleanor, DAndreala, Michael, Angotta, James, Arale, Jeff, Arnold, Edward, Baez, Jose, Barone, John, PBarone, Meagan, Barry, Kevin, BBazile, George, SBedirhanoglu, Kaan, Bermingham, Philip, Birzin, Michael, Boylan, Patrick, ABrinson, Kenneth, SCabrera, Maria, Cagno, David, Caitano, Richard, Calabrese, Carlo, Callahan, Lawrence, RCallender, Dale, Calvelli, Kevin, Campo, Brian, Capria, Michael, SCarducci, James, Carr, Nadine, Carter, Lynette, Castrillon, John, Cavaioli, Donald, DavidChin, George, JChizmadia, Richard, Coffey, Christopher, Collazo, Nelson, Cooley, Reginald, Costanz, Nicholas, Coviello Jr, John, FCrawford, Derek, GD'Aiuto, Charina, Daniello, Christopher, ADavis, Morna, Diaz, John, Diviny, Timothy, JosephDixon, Carl, Encarnacion, Pedro, REstrada, Esteban, Evans, Donald, AFeliciano, Angel, Ferber, Michael, AFermin, Hugo, Fermin, Richard, Ferrier-Caitano , Dawn , M Fischer, Kenneth, Formica, Glen, Franklin, Dwayne, QFrazier, Lisa, Gaynor, Deborah, Gfrerer, Richard, Giannetti, Christopher, Godfrey, Michele, Goldstein, Scott, AGonzalez, Jorge, LGonzalez, Leila, Gottciss, Benjamin, Grove, Charles, TGuerra, Diane, Guidice, Joseph, Haas, Scott, Hamilothoris, John, Hargrove, Shirlette, Healy, Jeffrey, Hiergesell, David, Howe, Edward, AHuston, Gary, Hyland, Steven, PIaboni, Robert, Jacoberger, John, James, Rogelio, AJasmin, Roger, Jones, Jeffrey, Jones, Ralph, AJones, Stephen, FKarl, Eric, Kay, Roger, BKerrigan, Paul, Kikel, Mark, JKlein, Andrew, JKoerner, John, FKrill, Vincent, J.Kurilenko, Thomas, Lacetera, Thomas, PLaMazza, Gaetano, GLennon, Donald, PLeo, Nicholas, Lisa Jr, James, CLivingston II, Robert, BLupo, Michael, JohnMaio, Vincent, Manico, Owen, Manning, Gregory, MMaria, Ruben, Martin, Linda, Martinez, Noel, Mauro, James, McCarrick, Bryan, McGuckin, Brian, McInerney, James, JMcMahon, William , J McManus, Carol, McMurry, Christopher, McTigue, Terence, JMirabile, Robert, Moccia, Michael, JMullane, Kevin, MMulqueen, Michael, DMunnelly, Terence, Murphy, Gregory, SMyia, Robert, MO'Brien, Robert, MOcasio, Janet, O'Challaghan, Timothy, Ochoa, Eduardo, AO'Neill, Christopher, Ortiz, Leonardo, Parisi, Joseph, Patrick, Keecha, Payne, Danyal, Payne, Malcolm, Pena, Byron, LPerez, Lori-Ann, Perez, Manuel, A.Perez, Richard, Perez, Sammy, Petersen, Shawn, Pinto, Jack, Plapinger, Brett, Poggiali, Gary, JPolanco, William, JPurcell, Scott, TRagsdale, Albert, Rama, John, Ramos, Miguel, Raymond, Sharon, Rice, Kyle, Riggio Jr, Michael, Rodriguez, David, Rodriguez, Melvin, Rodriguez, Raymond, Rosenthal, Jill, Ross, Travis, Rubbiero, Gianni, PRudden, John, Ruizpena, Anthony, Rutherford, Richard, Salles, Steve, Sanabria, Abraham, JSantiago, Edna, MSantiago, Franklin, Schultz, Adam, Sekela, Christopher, PShanahan, Kevin, Sherlock, Ralph, Sherman, Jason , RShortell, Michael, ASingh, Sunil, Small, Edmund, JSmart , Anderson , DSmith, Stephen, ASontos, Jose, Soto, Socrates, NStaniszewski, Mark, Staten, Claude, AStein, Maribel, Stein, Mitchell, Stein, Scott, Sterling, Jennifer, Taliento, Michael, JTantillo, Frank, Taveras, Angel, Thompson, Kenneth, Tirelli, Daniel, JTirpak, Jeffrey, LTrentacosta, Edward, Troppmann, Thomas, WUsher, Ellen, Valentin, Peter, JValentine, Christopher, JVargas, Alejandra, Vasconi, Danny, Velez, David, Velez, Wilfredo, Vieira, Joshua, RVishnudat, Indira, DVon Bartheld, George, LWallace, William, Wasilewski, Walter, CWasser, Deborah, Wasser, Eric, Weghorst, William, AWells, Richard, Wilton, Wayne, TZapata, Richard. (rag)
July 1, 2003 Filing 67 CONSENT TO Join Party Plaintiffs by:Alicea, Francisca, ; Amato, Gerard, ;Bennett, Hiram, ;Benowitz, Cory, ;Buckley, Thomas, ;Cardenas, David, ;Castle, Christopher, J;Cea, Ronald, G;Charles, Joanne, ;Cintron , Waldemar , ;Colon, Ellie, ;Cooper, Kelly, D;Corti, Darrell, ;Dawson, Eric, ; Degnan, James, P;Devito, John, A;Fantauzzi, Nicholas, ; Faulhaber, Craig, ;Flores, Jose, ;Fotino , Joseph , M ; Friedman, Elaine, ;Funaro, Anthony, G;Gallen, John, ;Goin, Jacques, O;Goldsborough, Brian, R;Gorton, Garrett, ; Guerrero, Lenin, ;Guerrero, Tina, M;Guzman, Betsy, ; Harnischfeger, David, ;Hinds, Barry, ;Hoffman, Joseph, ; Hunt, Daniel, ;Huwer, Christopher , J ;Jones, Reginald, C; Lagrasta, Kirk, S;Lambert , Thomas , A ;Layden, William, ; Lenihan, Judith, M;Leonard, Mary, ;Maguire, Patrick, ; Maisonet, John, ;Martin, Angel, R;Martin, Troy, ;Mauro, Vito, S;McDonald, Eddie, J;Meehan, Brian, R;Miller , Steven , ;Monaghan, Thomas, ;Morales, David, ;Morales, David , V ; Mullane, Daniel, J;Nafpliotis , Nickolas , ;Navarrete, Jorge, W;Newton, James, A;Ostrowski, Greg, T;Perez, Jerfhy, M;Portalatin, Edgar, ;Primus Jr., Henry, E;Reao, Jose, ; Reid, Kevin, P;Rooney, Kevin, ;Rosendary-Phillips, Rosetta, H;Rubino, Michael, ;Santiago, Alfred, ;Simon, Ana, ;Sinnott, Ray, ;Soler, Chad , S;Soto, Lourdes, ;Stagnitta, Salvatore, Swanson, Steven , A ;Teta, Mark, ;Torres, Anthony, ;Torres, Gamaliel, ;Troy , Kerry , ;Vanger, Alan, P;Vaughn, Loretta, A.;Vaughn, Robbie, L;Warren, Michael, ;Winters, Lawrence, F.(rag) Modified on 07/02/2003
June 11, 2003 Filing 65 CONSENT TO Join Party Plaintffs by: Abousamra, Jennifer, Abreu, Isidro, Acosta, Mario, Adalberto, Rodrigues, Addison, Rodney, Aguirre, Alexis, Albenga, Karl, Alexander, Debbrea, Alexander, Robert, Alexis, Eric, Alfredsen, James , E Allcroft, John, PAllocca, Michael, Anderson, Kim, Angel, Rodriguez, IAnzalone, Richard, LAracena, Alexandra, Arroyo, Lorrie, ABalsamo, Steven, ABarba, Romauldo, Batson, Michelle, Bercarich, John, EBharat, Roberto, ABianco, John, Blum, Aaron, RBonsignore, Edward, Booras III, Thomas, ABovil, Pierre, FBowen, Kelly, JBraun, Richard, RBrennan, John, FBrennan, Matthew, R.G.Broccolo, Anthony, Brown, Andre, MBrown, Donny, Bunster, Joseph, MCaballero, Felix, Caccamo, Glen , SCamacho, Louis, Campson, Paul, LCanady , Patrice , Cantwell, Kathleen, LCapodieci, Lorraine, Carrasquillo, Jose , M Castillo, Lois, ACava, Mark, Chambers, Sean, Cheek, Carla, Cirone, Brian, Clark, Dennis, Coleman, Sean, HCollazo, Heriberto, Colon-Flores, Marlene, RConnolly, Peter, PConway, Richard, FCorbalis, Gwendolyn, Corbett, Patrick, JCraven, Todd, Creegan, Thomas, PCrespo, Israel, Crisci, Steven, PCrowe, Brian, Damante, Kendra, Davis, Brian, PDe Los Santos, Andre, Dedios, Miguel, Deegan, Eric, JDeGreburis, Michael, Denice, Robert, Devereaux, Edward, Devino, Marie, Dippolito, Steven, ADolon Jr, Michael, JDoonan, Debra , L Dorado, Douglas, Doyle, Christopher, RDroz, Thomas, Dubester, Steven, Durkin, Thomas, MEhrlich, Sharon, Ellis, Brad, WEllis, Mark, Emanuel, Michael, Engel, Gregory, Erwig, Timothy, Fallace, John, Fehn, John Paul, CFerguson, Bernard, Fernandes, Jose, AFernandez, Caroline, Fernandez, Richard, Fitzpatrick, Joseph, Fitzsimons, Michael, Flavin, Helen, Flynn, Daniel, Forino, Christopher, Frederick, Keithlyn, Freel, Edward, Fuoco, Nancy, Gallo, Michael, Garcia, Edward, Garcia, Michael, Glover, Kalomo, Gomez, Manuela, Gonzalez, Sandy, PGonzalez, Thomas, EGonzalez, Victor, Grant, Ronald, DGuarino, Michael, AGueren, Daniel, JGuli, Michael, Hahnenfeld, Susan, Hale, Joseph, RHalpin, Jacqueline, Harmon, Charles, Harsch, Eric, M.Hassett, Patrick, Healy, Dennis , Heimink, Thomas, Herrera, Luis, Hines, Robert, RHores, Eric, Horun, Nicholas, Houanche, Mirandelle, Hussey, Daniel, JIglesias, Adolfo, Joss, Christine, MKardiasmenos, Kostas, Karnbach, Gregory, Keller, Michael, PKelly, James, Kenney, Marguerite, AKenny, Jon, PKeppler, Gregg, Kim, Ki Soo, Kindred, Karl, Kloper, Leo, MKomis, Spiros, Kraft, Timothy, AKrajeski, Walter, Krebs, Kevin, EKrind, Flora, Krutys, Christopher, Landers, William, JLanoce, Steven, KLaRoche, Anthony, Law, Reginald, DLech, Stephen, Lee, Michael, JLevy, David, Locke, Kenton, Lombardi, Anthony, LLong, Kenneth, Loscalzo, Anthony, Lucia, Phillip, Luppino, David, Macaluso, Anthony, Malhotra, Danish, Mann, Dennis, VMante, Timothy , Marines, Luis, MMastrande, Andrew, JMastrantoni, Jesse, JMatone, Michael, McAuliffe, Joseph, MMcCann, Paul, MMcCauley, Thomas, McClenahan, Kevin, McDermitz, Michael, McDonagh, John, PMcGrane, Thomas, GMengani, Edward, JMiceli, Joseph, GMitchell, Barrington, Mobley-Adams, Tiffany, Morell, Edward, Mortimer, Michael, Muia Jr, Arturo, Munoz, Alex, Murphy, Chris, Murphy, James, Murray, Chris, Nazario, Jose, RNazario, Peter, Neary, Brian, Net, Norma, GNickey, Arnold, VNielson, Franklin, JNocella, Frederick, Nunez, Harold, FObdyke, Richard, Ohanian Jr, Thomas, O'Keefe, Kevin, Ortega, Emilio, Osonitsch, Jeffrey, Otero, Richard, Owens-Johnson, Juanita, Oyola, Efrain, Paris, Hassan, Peralta, Natalia, Perez, Dante, Perez, Edwin, Perillo, Ronald, Philantrope, Rulx, Pierre, Heurtelou, Polanco, Ruben, DPolicastri, Edward, JPollock, Brian, Powell, Bryon, TQuinlan, Scott, Raffo, Paul, MRath, George, RReed, Robin, Reilly, Adrian, SRichardson, George, Rivera, Ann, MarieRobinson, Ronald, BRobledo, Jay, RyanRocco , Christopher , R Rodriguez, Joseph, Rosa, David, Rosa, Sandy, Rosario, Edwin, Russo, Jeffrey, RSainten, Keith, Salemi, Robert, Samer, Sukkarieh, Santana, Irene, Santiganez Jr, Juan, CSaporito, William, Scandale, Philip, Scarglato, Philip, Schmahix, Michael , Schmidt, George, LSchroeder, John, Schurr, Philip, CScott, Thorance, Serviss, Eric, Sheridan, Peter, Sideris, James, Sifonte, William, MSinger, Adam, MSitaras, Konstandinos, Small, Christopher, ASmith, Joseph, ASmith, Richard, Sondey, Daniel, FSowinski, Arthur, PSparks, Peter, Spellman, John, Spies, Timothy, Stewart, Jennifer, AStone, Iraina, Suddler, Carlton, Suriel, Wilberto, Tavernier, Augusto, LTelinbacco Jr, Anthony , Tessitore, Angelo, Tighe, John, Travis, Christopher, MTurco, Louis, Unterweiser, Scott, Vaber, Christopher, BValle, Mario, Vargas, Elizabeth, Vass, Yussef , R Vazquez, Linda, Veras, Neils, HVitale, Louis, FVon Diezelski, Matthew, JWalker, Dave, FWallen, Kenneth, OWarta, Dwayne, Waterman, Thomas, WWeiss, Peter, Wendler, J., M.Williams, Donald, Wilson, Charlie, LWong, Kai, FWyatt, Anthony, Young, Glendora, MYoung, Willis, Yurko, Kimberly. (rag)
June 3, 2003 Filing 66 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of April 2, 2003. (dt)
June 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER, regarding procedures that will govern the handling of "Confidential Materials" . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (kw)
June 2, 2003 Filing 63 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: LLaGala, Raymond, LaRegina, Thomas, LaRosa, Jeffrey, LaRossa, James, ALaTorre, Peter, RLawler, James, PLawson, Neil, Lee, Joon Hee, Leighton, Richard, HLemos, Joseph, Leon, Omar, MLevine, Arthur, Levy, Patrick, Lindao, James, Linehan, Patrick, Lingeza, Matthew, Liz, Santos, DLoBello, Philip, Lockel, Christopher, ALonghitano, Anthony, Looney, Michael, D.Loor, Walter, Lopez, Cynthia, LoRusso, Richard, Lundy, Anthony, Lutz, Clayton, JLynaugh, Erik, Lynch, Michael, PMacri, Thomas, Maddrey, Steven, Maldonado, Carmelo, Maldonado, Jannina, MMandracchia, Vincent, Manning, Brian, JManning, Michael, Manzi, Chad, Marino, Leonard, SMartinez, Cecil , Martinez, Orlando, Massinillo, Paul, Mathew, Biju, Mathew, Nelson, Mauer, Michael, McCarthy, FinBarr, McCollough, Charmaine, KMcDermott, Kevin, McHugh, Robert, JMcKay, Anthony, EMcKeegan, Ronald, JMcQuade, Melissa, Medina, Carlos, DMeichsner, Brian, Meichsner, Nancy, Melendez, Richard, EMennella, Andrew, JMerceds, Richard, Metro, Todd, Meyer, Paul, Miller, Randin, SMills, Juanita, Montan, Dinorah, MMontana, Michael, AMontreuil, Brett, Moore, Sherod, OMoran, Michael, Moran, Michael, Moreno, Juan, CMorgan, Philip , Mosley-Laurence, Thametha, LMullane, Christopher, Mulligan, Sean, Muniz, Clifford, Murphy, James, GerardMurphy, Michael, Murphy, Patrick , JMurray, Willus, Nacke, Thomas, PNavarro, Irene, Nazzaro, Joseph, JNeale, Anthony, LNeff, Michael, Neumann, John, Neuwirth-Vreeland , Denise , Niksa, Thaddeus, ANinivaggi, James, FNolan, John, PNoone, Michael, Nurse, Michael, WNutter, Robert, O'Brien, Candice, O'Brien, James, EO'Brien, Kenneth, Ocasio, Marco, AO'Donnell, Glenn, MO'Donnell, Michael, O'Donohoe, Terence, Olaiya, Korede, O'Reilly, John, JOrellana, Flavia, AOrtega, Louis, Ortiz, Nancy, Ortiz, Robert, Ozley, Kim, Paccione, Angelo, Padilla, Raymond, Paese, Joseph, Page, Gary, Palumbo, Frank, Parham, Titus, TParker, Attawa, CPastrana, Edwin, Patel, Neelam, Paulsen, Erik, Penchensici, Mark, JPerez, Laura, MariePerillo, Dina, RPhillips, Ryan, Phojanakong, Medhi, KPierrenoel, Jean, APinard, Randolff, SPisano, Joseph, MPolanco, Louis , A.Pomilla, Francesco, Poulos, Maria, Preisner, Scott, Prendergast, Edward, Prince Jr, Robert, WPriolo, Anthony, Proce, Kenneth, Psomas, Anne, MPutney, Robert, JQuinn, Jaqueline, MQuinn, John, ERamos, Angel, Ramos, Nancy, MRapp, William, Rasa, Nicole, LRefo, Adriana, Reimer, Timothy, Reinecke, Michael, WReres, Paul, KReynoso, Duice, MRichardson, Maurice, Ricks, Darryl, Rios, Daniel, Rivas, Victor, MRivera, Roberto, Rivera, Wendell, Rivera Jr, Reinaldo, Rizza, Marco, Robedee, Gerard, SRoberts Jr, John, WRobinson, Toya-Gail, ARodiguez, Carmen, Rodriguez, Jeffrrey, ARomano, Dominick, ARooney, Matthew, Rooney, Sean, JRosco, Michael, Ruch, Lynne, Ruggieri, John, Ruggiero, Thomas, Ruocco, Michael, Ryan, Matthew, Ryder, James, JRyder, Joseph , JSaigado, Jose, MSalice, Michael, Salvesen, Joanne, Salvesen, John, Sanchez, Carlo, Sanchez, Susan, Santacroce, Christopher, MSantiago, Herman, DSantiago, Wendy, Santos, Douglas, Sanzone, Michael, Savlan, Joseph, Schatz, Nancy, Schelberger, Kristine, Schiefer, Thomas, Schillaci, Charles , Schuettinger, Kathleen, Schuierer, Michael, Scotto, Tim, Seda, Daniel, MSedeniussen, Eric, Seeger, William, Selitto, Joseph, Sellers, Joyce, NShaloo, James, Shannon, Christopher, Shannon, Darrell, Shark Barry, Yvette, Shaw, Kenneth, SShea, Michael, Smith, Eric, ASmith, Francis, XSmith, Pepe, ASoderman, Eric, ASoler, Sharon, Sosa, Evelyn, Sparrow, Edward, Starks, Demetria, Sterlacci, John, Stines, Timothy, MStoeckert, Kevin, Streffacio , Patrick , Strong, Kevin, Surber, Theresa, AngelaTabachnick, Christopher, Tabeek, Donna, Tapia, Wilton, Teiner, Christopher, Terry, William, Thomas, Juliette, Thompson, Tyrone, PTimchenro, Yelena, Timmons, Carmen, Tomasulo , Stephen , Toscano, Ray, Treanoz-Cabanas, Leslie, Tulloch, Taneese, T.T.Twist, Thomas, Tyler Jr, Randolph, Valdez, Edwin, Van Wie, James, Vargas, Manuel, Vaughan, James, MVazquez Jr, Edwin, Vazquez , Eric , Walaitis, William, GWard, Michael, GWeber, Michael, Weissman, Maureen, Werman, Susan, White, Duane, Williams, Jeanetta, WWilliams, Lancet, Williams, Ronald, AWillis, Arturo, AWilson, Jacqulyn, MWoods, John, BWunsch Jr, Andrew, JWyatt, Nancy, Yarusso, Richard, MYat, David, Yee, Jack, Zajda, Mamianne, Zaloff, Samuel, Zena III, Carlos, WZiel, Shawn, LLaGala, Raymond, LaRegina, Thomas, LaRosa, Jeffrey, LaRossa, James, ALaTorre, Peter, RLawler, James, PLawson, Neil, Lee, Joon Hee, Leighton, Richard, HLemos, Joseph, Leon, Omar, MLevine, Arthur, Levy, Patrick, Lindao, James, Linehan, Patrick, Lingeza, Matthew, Liz, Santos, DLoBello, Philip, Lockel, Christopher, ALonghitano, Anthony, Looney, Michael, D.Loor, Walter, Lopez, Cynthia, LoRusso, Richard, Lundy, Anthony, Lutz, Clayton, JLynaugh, Erik, Lynch, Michael, PMacri, Thomas, Maddrey, Steven, Maldonado, Carmelo, Maldonado, Jannina, MMandracchia, Vincent, Manning, Brian, JManning, Michael, Manzi, Chad, Marino, Leonard, SMartinez, Cecil , Martinez, Orlando, Massinillo, Paul, Mathew, Biju, Mathew, Nelson, Mauer, Michael, McCarthy, FinBarr, McCollough, Charmaine, KMcDermott, Kevin, McHugh, Robert, JMcKay, Anthony, EMcKeegan, Ronald, JMcQuade, Melissa, Medina, Carlos, DMeichsner, Brian, Meichsner, Nancy, Melendez, Richard, EMennella, Andrew, JMerceds, Richard, Metro, Todd, Meyer, Paul, Miller, Randin, SMills, Juanita, Montan, Dinorah, MMontana, Michael, AMontreuil, Brett, Moore, Sherod, OMoran, Michael, Moran, Michael, Moreno, Juan, CMorgan, Philip , Mosley-Laurence, Thametha, LMullane, Christopher, Mulligan, Sean, Muniz, Clifford, Murphy, James, GerardMurphy, Michael, Murphy, Patrick , JMurray, Willus, Nacke, Thomas, PNavarro, Irene, Nazzaro, Joseph, JNeale, Anthony, LNeff, Michael, Neumann, John, Neuwirth-Vreeland , Denise , Niksa, Thaddeus, ANinivaggi, James, FNolan, John, PNoone, Michael, Nurse, Michael, WNutter, Robert, O'Brien, Candice, O'Brien, James, EO'Brien, Kenneth, Ocasio, Marco, AO'Donnell, Glenn, MO'Donnell, Michael, O'Donohoe, Terence, Olaiya, Korede, O'Reilly, John, JOrellana, Flavia, AOrtega, Louis, Ortiz, Nancy, Ortiz, Robert, Ozley, Kim, Paccione, Angelo, Padilla, Raymond, Paese, Joseph, Page, Gary, Palumbo, Frank, Parham, Titus, TParker, Attawa, CPastrana, Edwin, Patel, Neelam, Paulsen, Erik, Penchensici, Mark, JPerez, Laura, MariePerillo, Dina, RPhillips, Ryan, Phojanakong, Medhi, KPierrenoel, Jean, APinard, Randolff, SPisano, Joseph, MPolanco, Louis , A.Pomilla, Francesco, Poulos, Maria, Preisner, Scott, Prendergast, Edward, Prince Jr, Robert, WPriolo, Anthony, Proce, Kenneth, Psomas, Anne, MPutney, Robert, JQuinn, Jaqueline, MQuinn, John, ERamos, Angel, Ramos, Nancy, MRapp, William, Rasa, Nicole, LRefo, Adriana, Reimer, Timothy, Reinecke, Michael, WReres, Paul, KReynoso, Duice, MRichardson, Maurice, Ricks, Darryl, Rios, Daniel, Rivas, Victor, MRivera, Roberto, Rivera, Wendell, Rivera Jr, Reinaldo, Rizza, Marco, Robedee, Gerard, SRoberts Jr, John, WRobinson, Toya-Gail, ARodiguez, Carmen, Rodriguez, Jeffrrey, ARomano, Dominick, ARooney, Matthew, Rooney, Sean, JRosco, Michael, Ruch, Lynne, Ruggieri, John, Ruggiero, Thomas, Ruocco, Michael, Ryan, Matthew, Ryder, James, JRyder, Joseph , JSaigado, Jose, MSalice, Michael, Salvesen, Joanne, Salvesen, John, Sanchez, Carlo, Sanchez, Susan, Santacroce, Christopher, MSantiago, Herman, DSantiago, Wendy, Santos, Douglas, Sanzone, Michael, Savlan, Joseph, Schatz, Nancy, Schelberger, Kristine, Schiefer, Thomas, Schillaci, Charles , Schuettinger, Kathleen, Schuierer, Michael, Scotto, Tim, Seda, Daniel, MSedeniussen, Eric, Seeger, William, Selitto, Joseph, Sellers, Joyce, NShaloo, James, Shannon, Christopher, Shannon, Darrell, Shark Barry, Yvette, Shaw, Kenneth, SShea, Michael, Smith, Eric, ASmith, Francis, XSmith, Pepe, ASoderman, Eric, ASoler, Sharon, Sosa, Evelyn, Sparrow, Edward, Starks, Demetria, Sterlacci, John, Stines, Timothy, MStoeckert, Kevin, Streffacio , Patrick , Strong, Kevin, Surber, Theresa, AngelaTabachnick, Christopher, Tabeek, Donna, Tapia, Wilton, Teiner, Christopher, Terry, William, Thomas, Juliette, Thompson, Tyrone, PTimchenro, Yelena, Timmons, Carmen, Tomasulo , Stephen , Toscano, Ray, Treanoz-Cabanas, Leslie, Tulloch, Taneese, T.T.Twist, Thomas, Tyler Jr, Randolph, Valdez, Edwin, Van Wie, James, Vargas, Manuel, Vaughan, James, MVazquez Jr, Edwin, Vazquez , Eric , Walaitis, William, GWard, Michael, GWeber, Michael, Weissman, Maureen, Werman, Susan, White, Duane, Williams, Jeanetta, WWilliams, Lancet, Williams, Ronald, AWillis, Arturo, AWilson, Jacqulyn, MWoods, John, BWunsch Jr, Andrew, JWyatt, Nancy, Yarusso, Richard, MYat, David, Yee, Jack, Zajda, Mamianne, Zaloff, Samuel, Zena III, Carlos, WZiel, Shawn. (rag)
June 2, 2003 Filing 62 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Abramson, Ross, Ackerman, Michael, Aiello, Jason, JAlbertsen, Mark, Albrecht, Eric, PAlden, Christopher, TAmbrosio, Carmine, Andersen, Robert, EAnderson, Kevin, TAnderson, Walter, JAnderson, William, GAnderson, Yvette, Appio, James, MArchacki, Timothy, Arhakos, Nicholas, Armao, Michael, Aubin-Pino, Shirley, Baiera, John, ABaldi, Anthony, Balloy, Christopher, Balsano, Christine, VBarbera, Anthony, ABarile, James , J Barratt, John, Barresi, Vito, JBarry, Erin, JBartling, Susan, Bauso, Louis, JBeaton, Anthony, Becker, Keith, NBeckles, Aslyn, ABenaim, Charlie, Berentsen, Thomas, JBernal, David, Blake, Ritchard, Blakely, Lyndon, WBobal, Michael , J Bonilla, Jesus, EBosland, Robert, Bowden, Walter, EBoykin, Mary, CBoyle, Michael, NBoyle, Thomas, Brambach , Joseph , Breen, Patrick, ABrennan, Joseph, GBriscoe, Thomas, RBrown, Marvel, Buckley, William, Budimlic, Nikolas , NBurke, Joseph, Burke , Brian , WByrd-Vazquez, Vanessa, Cabanillas, Jeffrey, Cabrera, Danixon, ACafarella, John, BCahalan , Andrew , JCalandro, Paul , D Caldero, Brenda, LCallaghan, Daniel, Camera, Richard, Campbell, James, ECapers, Cheryl, Cardona, Michael, Carey, Valarie, Carmicheal, Kenneth, Caro, David, Carra, Steven, JCarreras, Annmarie, Caruana, James, CCasola, Anthony, Castrillon, John, Castro, Nancy, Catania, Karen, Cayenne, David, PCentrone, Michael, CChapman, Matthew, JCharlson, Shawn, Charneco, Elizabeth, Cheek, Edward, KChisholm, Angela, Choy, Yolanda, Chu, Migdalia, Cirincione, Thomas, MCirminello, Frank, Cirocco Jr, Louis, Clarke, Shellian, ACole, Melissa, DColeman, James, EColonna, Emanuel, JColuccio, Ralph, JConlon, Madeline, LConsidine, Sean, Contorno, Raymond, Conway, William, MCordova, Joseph, Cortelli, Christian, Cortes, Hugo, Cortez, Victor, M.Cotto, Gabriel, Cotty, Debra, LCrean, Thomas, Cuffaro, Philip, Cunningham, Kensington, GDaigneault, Joseph, Dailey, Michael, FDailey , Timothy , J Dalton, Tanasha, Dalton, Veronica, MD'Arcio, Louis, SDecker, David, DeFelice, Douglas, PDeJoseph, Lawrence, DellaValle, Dennis, Dellilo, Patrick, GDeSantis, Thomas, Devine, Michael, JDiaz, Pedro, Dickens, Vivian, CDiMurro III, Vincent, Diz, Ronald, DDonnelly, Stephen, Dotterman, Troy, Edwards, Diane, Elliot, Leyland, DEmburey, William, Epps, Carleton, MEspinel, Robert, WEsposito, Alison, AEstevez, Jesus, Ettienne, Vaughn, Falotico, James, CFamulari, Charles, AFang, Wang, Farrell, Kenneth, Faulhaber , Henry, Fay, Lucia, Fegel, Richard, Fernandez, Anthony, E.Ferrado, Michael, Ferrara, Anthony, Ferrari, Allen, CFerrari, Robert, Ferri, Albert, DFigueiredo, Angela, LFigueroa, Alfredo, Finnegan, James, JFinnerty, Laurence, DFisher, Mindy, Flynn, Edward, JForbes, Ronny, MFoy, Alwyn, Freeman, Michael, Freuola, Joseph, AFriedrich, David, JFrizalone, Carrie, Furby, Tyrone, Gallagher, Shawn, FGalletta, Benjamin, Gamble, Gamiel, AGammons, Allison, Garay, Gene, Garcia, Derrick, Garcia, Justin, EGarmendia, David, NGarridy III, Edward, JGaschler, John, MGavin, Finley, JGellman, Jack, Gerth, Bonnie, Gibiino, Maria, LGilman, William, Giuliani, Loretta, MGiuliani, Paul, Godas, Richard, Gogarty Jr, Raymond, EGonzalez, Marcelino, Grant, Robert, EGraulich-Cox, Corinna, AGreene, Stephen, JGrimmett, Adam, Guardyane, Michael, Guerrero, Marisol, Gutierrez, Eddy, MGutierrez, Yolanda, Guy Etzbert, Louis-Jean, Guy-Barnes, Tiffani, Haines, AnnMarie, Hamilton, Pete, JHamlett, Paul, Hance, Michael, JHansen, Michael, Harris, David, LHaynes, John, Healey, James, Hennessy, David, Hepp, Greg, Herlihy, Donald, FHernandez, Ralfi, AHerrera, Fredy, Hickey, James , P Hill, Daniel, Hill, Scott, Hirsch, Bradley, Hoefenkrieg , Stephen , Hoenninger, Matthew, Hoffman, Frederick, Howard, William, AHudecek, Glenn, DHynes, Brian, Ibroci, Naim, Innace, Christopher, Irvin, Robin, Jacob, Kathleen, Jacobs, Lincoln, Jagmohan, Chandrapaul, Jaikissoon, Shaun, DJames, Octavio, LJeanty, Aramus, Jefferson, Tina, Job, Petlyn, Joel, David, Johnson, Derek, Johnson, Ralph, Johnston , Lawrence , Joseph, Reginald, EJun, Peter, CharlesJunta, Joseph, PKambosoulis, George, Kane, Joan, MKarikari-Awere, K., Kearney, Brian, Kearns, John, AKearns, William , CKelly, Francis, Kim, Dennis, King, Steven, King, Jr., Charles, RKinney, Stephen, DKlein, Glen, Knight Jr, Clyde, Korn, Michael, Kraynak, Richard, JKrecic, Carlo, Kuhn, Bryan. (rag)
May 23, 2003 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (sac)
May 20, 2003 Filing 61 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Acosta Jr., Tomas, Addesso, Caron, JoAgoglia, Christopher, Agosto, Sonia, Agugliaro, Frank, Alfaro, Axel, Alvarez, Ruben, Amaniera, Charles, Andujar, Joseph, AAntoniadis, Emil, Arfi, Mary, M.Armand, Yves, MArteaga, Daniel, Attilio, Christopher, Baez, Alex, W.Barbieno, Charles, Bardash, Grigoriy, Barile, Rosemary, Barto, Donald, Baudille, Michael , Baumann, Christopher, Bazile, Pierre, Bedell, William, EBedford, LeRoy, Benjamin, Fayriece, Bents, August, JBersch, Brandon, Bessler, Michael, Black, Vincent, J.Blakes, Brandon, Bogdanowicz, Edward, Bonser , Jerome , TBouzada, Peter, NBowe, Edward, DBrady, Timothy, Branch, James, Breslin, David, PBrijmohan, Perry, Broadwell, David, Browder, Carmella, Brownley, Latonya, Budnick, Michael, Burgess Jr., Joe, H.Burke, Eustace, Busacca, John , B Butler, Michael, LByrne, Patrick, CCabassa, Nereida, Caesar, Christopher, Caldero Jr, Miguel, ACamacho, David, Capizzi, John, JCapogrosso Jr , Frank , P.Carrasquillo, Luis, ACastano, Yesenia, Cerce, Michael, GChin, Brian, KChin, Kai Yin, Chisem, Tomico, Chong, Jorge , Ciavola, Michael, AClarke, Olayinka, Close, Selwdyn, VColasanti, Christopher, Conway Jr, Purcell, MCoscette, Patrick, HCox, Tynese, Creta, Scott, Cristino, Mark, Curtis, Tracy, LeeDaab, Alan, RD'Angelo , Joseph , DeBoer, Brian, JDeLello, Christine, MDelgado, Vilma, RDelPriore, Michael, DeMaio, Adam, DeMeola, Andrew, Denave, Michael, Desrochers, Michael, DeStefano, Richard, Diaz, Jimmy, Diaz, Joseph, ADorta, Mildred, Dowling, Ralph, Duncanson, Sandra, Erdman, Robert, CEsparra III, Antonio, Fanning, Timothy, Farley, Catherine, Farley, Robert, Fasanella, Thomas, MFeliciano, John, Ferguson, DaPhne, Fitzpatrick, John, Flanagan, Michael, Fountaine, Kevin, Francis, Diana, MFrancis, Matthew, Frey, Sean, Fulginiti, James, JFuller, Ray, Fundaro, Joanne , Fuoco, Elena, Gallagher , Bernard , Garcia, Wilfred, Gasperi, Robert, EGermer, Otto, Giangrasso, John, Gil, Randolph, Gil, Vicente, A.Gillis, Kathleen, MGiudice, Randy, Goines, Corey, Gombert, Christine, LGomez, Chiffon, EGomez, Kathleen, PGonzalez, Richard, AGough, Patrick, JGourgue Jr, Luckner, Gregory, Nancy, MGuercio, Debra, Guido, Scott, Gulizio, Peter, Handle Jr, William, PHanigan, Michael , KHarper, Barbara, Harris, Gale, AHarris, Lance, Hartman, Richard, Herrmann, Steve, Hickey , Thomas , Hill, Shawn, PHilliard, Mordicie, Hillicke, James, PHolmes, Jean, Howie, Daniel, Hueter, Chris, SHuether, Richard, AHurley, Kevin, MIazzetti, Heidi, Iazzetti, Paul, Iuculano, James, JJaques, Deborah, AJenkins, Francine, Jiles, Rodney, Johnson, Allen, Johnson, James, Joshua, Gelono, Karen, Charles, Katz, Richard, FKeag, Maureen, EKear , Thomas, JKelleher, Ann Marie, Keller, George, RKeller, Michael, GKennedy, Stephen, Kenney, Robert, Kirshy, Mitchell, JKiyar, Yalcin , BKnapp, Rickie, Koch, Gary, LKokeas, Louis, Koller, Joseph, Komp, Joseph, HKoumides, Steve, Kurtzman, Andrew, Laburda, Monica, JLagrasta, David, Langstrand Sr, Gregory, BLaVolpe, Louis, MLee, David, HLee, Yu, KLewis, Missie, Leyden, Brian, MatthewLooney, Brendan, Lopez, Jose, MLopez, Tessie, Lorenzo, Anthony, VLuces, Clarise, Lugo, Gaudys, ELundquist, Marissa, Lynch, Christopher, WLynch, Wayne, E.Mango, Louis, Manzella, John, Manzi, Joseph, RMartinez, Alfonso, Martinez, Louis , Martinez, Sonia, IMauter, James, Mayers, Catherine, NMays, Tamika, McArdle , Peter , McAvoy, Jeffrey, SMcColgan, Elizabeth, CMcCoy, Douglas, McGovern, James, CMcGovern, Lawrence, PMcGrade, John, DMcHugh, Brian, TMcKearney, Brian, McNamara, Patrick, JMcNicholas, Christopher, TMcSorley, James, AMcSweeney, Maria, LMeachan, Michael, Melidones, Diane, Mendyk, Steven, JMercer, Gary, Merensky, Louis, JMiller, Jonathan, RMiller, Joseph, Miller, Thomas, WMilton, Kenneth, Miranda, Alvaro, Mitchell, Morrieal, Molina, Angel, LMolina, Daniel, Moore, Maura, JMoore, Ronald, JMorel, Carlo, AMorel, Kilvio , AMorel, Sammy, AlbertoMorrison, Sean, Mortimer, James, Morton, Thomas, Moustakas, Steve, Mullalley, Dennis, Murphy, Gavin, MMurphy, Michael, KMurphy, William, FNarvaez, Tyra, Negron, Lisa, ANegron, Robert, Ng-Montalvo, Sze Sze, Noonan, Patrick, Noto, Kenneth, M.Nunez, Jody, MO'Hanlon, Daniel, Oliveras, Gabriel, Ollivierre, Nimrod, OOmorjan, Kristina, O'Sullivan, Deirdre, Padilla, Richard, Pancir, Steven, GPapallo, Anthony, Passamenti, John, TPaulauskas, Carol, Peixoto, Samuel, SPenalo, Jacqueline, Perez, Iris, APerillo, Joseph, CarlPevrino, Daniel, RPhillip, Kyna, Pichardo, Jose, RPipanski, Bart, MPolite, Joseph, Pollard, Mark, Rado, Paul, Rail, Thomas, PRamirez, Abel, Ransome, Suzanne, C.Reyes, Hubert, Reynolds, George, SRichardson, Doris, Riley, Byron, Riordan, John, Ripp, Christopher, Rivera, Jose, LRivera, Rafael, Rodriguez, Henry , Romero, Benita, Ryan, Peter, Sabato, John, Safford, Simone, S.Safuto Sr, Jason, Salvato, Daniel, JSamuel, Morgan, RSanchez, Juan, JSantiago, Crystal, CSantoro, John, ASarosy, Brian, Sattali, Jeffrey, Schaefer, Karl, HSchenck , Mark , Schwaner, Joseph, T.Schwartz, Michael, Scuderi, Charles, Sedor, Scott, WSeemangall, Richie, Seery, Patrick, JSegarra, Luis, Segarra , Ivette , Sekela, Carmen, Sheahan, Richard, MSheahan, Thomas, JSilvestri, Philip, Simeone, Michael, Simone, Jason, Singleton, Darrell, KSkarka, Beth, ASkrapits, Justin, LSkretch, Timothy, JSmith, Samantha, Soria, Victor, Soto, Bernice, Speciale, Thomas, JSt Louis, Charles, SStabach, Joseph, Stebbins, Robert, Steele , Wayne , Steffenson, Amy, Steinberg, David, A.Stewart, Keith, Stryker, Keith, Sullivan, Michael, Tavarez, Emmanuel, Testa, Vincent, Theofel, Christopher, Thompson, Paul, A.Tibbatts, Eddie, Tillwitz, Robert, Tiwari, Vishwanath, Toro, Alex, Torres, Grace, Torres, Orlando, Trimmer, John, Trinidad, Leticia, Troncoso, Arnaldo, VTrovese, Frank, Tyree, Charles, PTyrell, Richard, Valenti, Donn, Valenti, Mario, Varvaro, Theresa, JVarvaro, Vincent, JVazquez, Elizabeth, Vedral, William, JVelardi, Edward, EVeliz, Omar, Von Dietsch, Kurt, Waite, Jonathan, Waithe, Cecil, AWakely, Christopher , Walker, Derrick, Walsh, James, Walsh, James, FWhite, Paul, CWilliams, Clyde, WWilliams, Gerald, WWilson, John, PWinfield, Jeffrey, A.Wojciechowicz, Joseph, Woods, Mark, Xhani, Shpeyim, Zabo, Donna, Zaino, Paul , A Zapata, Victor, PZoltan, Farkas, Acosta Jr., Tomas, Addesso, Caron, JoAgoglia, Christopher, Agosto, Sonia, Agugliaro, Frank, Alfaro, Axel, Alvarez, Ruben, Amaniera, Charles, Andujar, Joseph, AAntoniadis, Emil, Arfi, Mary, M.Armand, Yves, MArteaga, Daniel, Attilio, Christopher, Baez, Alex, W.Barbieno, Charles, Bardash, Grigoriy, Barile, Rosemary, Barto, Donald, Baudille, Michael , Baumann, Christopher, Bazile, Pierre, Bedell, William, EBedford, LeRoy, Benjamin, Fayriece, Bents, August, JBersch, Brandon, Bessler, Michael, Black, Vincent, J.Blakes, Brandon, Bogdanowicz, Edward, Bonser , Jerome , TBouzada, Peter, NBowe, Edward, DBrady, Timothy, Branch, James, Breslin, David, PBrijmohan, Perry, Broadwell, David, Browder, Carmella, Brownley, Latonya, Budnick, Michael, Burgess Jr., Joe, H.Burke, Eustace, Busacca, John , B Butler, Michael, LByrne, Patrick, CCabassa, Nereida, Caesar, Christopher, Caldero Jr, Miguel, ACamacho, David, Capizzi, John, JCapogrosso Jr , Frank , P.Carrasquillo, Luis, ACastano, Yesenia, Cerce, Michael, GChin, Brian, KChin, Kai Yin, Chisem, Tomico, Chong, Jorge , Ciavola, Michael, AClarke, Olayinka, Close, Selwdyn, VColasanti, Christopher, Conway Jr, Purcell, MCoscette, Patrick, HCox, Tynese, Creta, Scott, Cristino, Mark, Curtis, Tracy, LeeDaab, Alan, RD'Angelo , Joseph , DeBoer, Brian, JDeLello, Christine, MDelgado, Vilma, RDelPriore, Michael, DeMaio, Adam, DeMeola, Andrew, Denave, Michael, Desrochers, Michael, DeStefano, Richard, Diaz, Jimmy, Diaz, Joseph, ADorta, Mildred, Dowling, Ralph, Duncanson, Sandra, Erdman, Robert, CEsparra III, Antonio, Fanning, Timothy, Farley, Catherine, Farley, Robert, Fasanella, Thomas, MFeliciano, John, Ferguson, DaPhne, Fitzpatrick, John, Flanagan, Michael, Fountaine, Kevin, Francis, Diana, MFrancis, Matthew, Frey, Sean, Fulginiti, James, JFuller, Ray, Fundaro, Joanne , Fuoco, Elena, Gallagher , Bernard , Garcia, Wilfred, Gasperi, Robert, EGermer, Otto, Giangrasso, John, Gil, Randolph, Gil, Vicente, A.Gillis, Kathleen, MGiudice, Randy, Goines, Corey, Gombert, Christine, LGomez, Chiffon, EGomez, Kathleen, PGonzalez, Richard, AGough, Patrick, JGourgue Jr, Luckner, Gregory, Nancy, MGuercio, Debra, Guido, Scott, Gulizio, Peter, Handle Jr, William, PHanigan, Michael , KHarper, Barbara, Harris, Gale, AHarris, Lance, Hartman, Richard, Herrmann, Steve, Hickey , Thomas , Hill, Shawn, PHilliard, Mordicie, Hillicke, James, PHolmes, Jean, Howie, Daniel, Hueter, Chris, SHuether, Richard, AHurley, Kevin, MIazzetti, Heidi, Iazzetti, Paul, Iuculano, James, JJaques, Deborah, AJenkins, Francine, Jiles, Rodney, Johnson, Allen, Johnson, James, Joshua, Gelono, Karen, Charles, Katz, Richard, FKeag, Maureen, EKear , Thomas, JKelleher, Ann Marie, Keller, George, RKeller, Michael, GKennedy, Stephen, Kenney, Robert, Kirshy, Mitchell, JKiyar, Yalcin , BKnapp, Rickie, Koch, Gary, LKokeas, Louis, Koller, Joseph, Komp, Joseph, HKoumides, Steve, Kurtzman, Andrew, Laburda, Monica, JLagrasta, David, Langstrand Sr, Gregory, BLaVolpe, Louis, MLee, David, HLee, Yu, KLewis, Missie, Leyden, Brian, MatthewLooney, Brendan, Lopez, Jose, MLopez, Tessie, Lorenzo, Anthony, VLuces, Clarise, Lugo, Gaudys, ELundquist, Marissa, Lynch, Christopher, WLynch, Wayne, E.Mango, Louis, Manzella, John, Manzi, Joseph, RMartinez, Alfonso, Martinez, Louis , Martinez, Sonia, IMauter, James, Mayers, Catherine, NMays, Tamika, McArdle , Peter , McAvoy, Jeffrey, SMcColgan, Elizabeth, CMcCoy, Douglas, McGovern, James, CMcGovern, Lawrence, PMcGrade, John, DMcHugh, Brian, TMcKearney, Brian, McNamara, Patrick, JMcNicholas, Christopher, TMcSorley, James, AMcSweeney, Maria, LMeachan, Michael, Melidones, Diane, Mendyk, Steven, JMercer, Gary, Merensky, Louis, JMiller, Jonathan, RMiller, Joseph, Miller, Thomas, WMilton, Kenneth, Miranda, Alvaro, Mitchell, Morrieal, Molina, Angel, LMolina, Daniel, Moore, Maura, JMoore, Ronald, JMorel, Carlo, AMorel, Kilvio , AMorel, Sammy, AlbertoMorrison, Sean, Mortimer, James, Morton, Thomas, Moustakas, Steve
May 12, 2003 Filing 60 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Lajara, Carlos, ; Lancaster, Tahesi, ;Lancia, Marlo, B.;Landers, Paul, ; LaPaugh, William, ;Lauria, David, ;Lauterbach, Robert, ; Lavin, James, J.;Leatty, Sean, ;LeBlanc, Donald, C;Lee, Allan, ;Lee, Kevin, ;Levinstein, Seth, ;Lewis, Donald, F; Lewis, Emmett, ;Lewis-Quinlan, Kimbley, ;Lipnicky, Nancy, J.;Liranzo, Jose, A;Long, Kathleen, ;Lopez, Gerson, ;Lopez, Inez, ;Lopez, Nelson, ;Lubin, Suze, ;Lupo, Frank, ;Mackey, Daniel, ;MacNear Jr, Stanley, ;Makowski, Anthony, J.; Malizia, Louis, G;Mallol, Gabrielle, R.;Manley, Keith, R; Manning, George, C;Manning, Robert, M;Manning, Thomas, E.; Manzelle, Michael, ;Maraglio, Nicholas, L;Marchitelli, Joseph, ;Marcovici, Stephen, ;Marone, John, ;Marousek, Frank, L;Martin, Corina, ;Martin III, William, G.;Martinez, Angel, E;Martinez, Joe, ;Mason, Anthony, Peter;Mastrovito, Michael, F.;Matos, David, ;Matsen, Michael, ;Mauro, James, ; Mayo, Timothy, A;Mazzei, Gary, T;McCarthy, David, W; McCarthy, Robert, ;McClure, Sarah, ;McDonald, Mark, ; McDonald, Scott, J;McLaughlin, Patrick, M;McNerney, Michael, P;Meadows, Richard, A.;Medina, Richard, ;Meegan, Patrick, G;Meilman, Andrew, ;Melendez, Carlos, D;Melendez, Dario, ;Melendez, Jorge, L;Melendez, Ramon, ;Mendez, Carl, ; Merrick, Vance, D;Miller, Juliette, ;Miller, Richard, ; Miller, Robert, C;Mills, DeMona, C;Mitchell, Alice, ; Modell, Daniel, A;Molinari, Tracey, ;Molino, Nicholas, ; Montalvo, Francisco, ;Montalvo, Luis, ;Montesquiev, Alex, ; Montrevil, Cira, ;Mooney, Diana, L;Moore, Anthony, W; Morales, Lourdes, M;Morales, Oscar, W;Moran, John, E; Moreno, Michael, ;Morland, Denis, C;Morris, Terrence, ; Morrissey, Jared, J;Moukazis, Nicholas, ;Mulzet, Frank, J; Munoz, Marcos, ;Murphy, Edward, J;Murphy, James, E;Murphy, Stephen, S;Murray, William, J;Musick Jr, Robert, M; Nakashima, Jennifer, Y;Nau, Michael, E.;Neff, Martin, T.; Newberry, Brian, Scott;Newman, Richard, ;Nickens, Ron, ; Nieves, Lissette, ;Niskanen, David, ;Nobile, Robert, A.; Nyborg Torres, Lili, ;O'Brien, Joseph, ;O'Connell, Patrick, ;O'Connor, Charles, M;O'Hare, Christopher, ;O'Kane, Mary, M; O'Neill, Kevin, J.;O'Neill, Simone, P;Ortiz, Edwin, ;Ortiz, Jorge, David;Ortiz, Jose, L;Ortiz, William, ;O'Sullivan, Anne, N;Overton, Darrell, ;Oyola, Israel, ;Pabon, Jessica, ; Paccione, Nicholas, ;Paganucci, Vincent, ;Paglino, Carmine, A;Paholek, Karen, E;Paolucci, John, ;Pearo Jr., Robert, P.; Pecini, Sandra, M;Pedone, Michael, A;Pellegrino, Michael, ; Pena, Richard, ;Pepe, Louis, ;Peralta, Miguel, ;Peralta, Omar, ;Perez, George, ;Perez, Odalis, M;Perez, Ronald, ; Perez, Yvonne, ;Pernice, Craig, ;Perodin, Paul, ;Petti, Raffaele, ;Pincus, Howard, ;Pinsent, Wayne, T.;Pizzullo, Van, ;Portalatin, Carlos, ;Portis, Valarie, ;Potvin, Noreen, M;Pratt, Sean, ;Prendamano, Londy, ;Presta, Michael, ;Pryor, Jeffrey, M.;Puleo, Peter, N;Quevedo, Luis, L;Quimby, Jonathan, P.;Quinn, Michael, ;Randall, Frank, D; Rascelles, Brian, L;Ratynski, Kevin, ;Raupp, Richard, C; Recher, Vincent, ;Reese, Jacy, ;Reeves, Tia, S;Regalbulz, Joseph, ;Reina, Donna, E;Repisarda, Mark, A;Richards, Robert, ;Richardson, Jorita, L.;Rivera, Jose, ;Rivera, Michael, ;Robbins, Kenneth, ;Roberts, David, ;Rocco, Joseph, ;Rochez, Jorge, ;Rodriguez, Anna, ;Rodriguez, Enrique, ;Rodriguez, Ernest, M;Rodriguez, Wilfredo, ;Rogan, Paul, ;Rolon, Ramon, ;Roman, John, J;Romano, Anthony, ; Rosado, Jugony, F;Rosairo, Wilfredo, ;Rosato, Anita, ; Rosenblatt, Jeffrey, ;Ross, Keith, D;Rostant, Nicole, ; Rotante, John, ;Rowe, Vincent, ;Rower, Thomas, ;Rubin, Robert, J.;Ruotolo, Peter, ;Russo, Dennis, J.;Salisbury, Janna, L;Salmieri, John, ;Salmon, Brian, J;Samone, Francis, ;Santana, Anthony, ;Santiago, Waddy, ;Sayers, Gregory, C; Scala Jr, Arthur, A;Scarlette, Rosalyn, ;Schafer, Joseph, ; Schassberger, Steven, R;Scheiner, Mark, ;Schleicher, Miyhosi, L.;Schnelle Jr, Robert, J;Schramm, James, ; Schreck, James, ;Sciacca, Daniel, ;Scollan, Patrick, ; Sefcik, Donald, E;Segota, Una, ;Seniuk, Andrew, ;Sergio, Marte, ;Shanahan, Shamus, K.;Shanley, Eric, J;Shark, Anthony, ;Sharkey, Michael, ;Shelto, Cynthia, ;Sheredos, Joseph, T.;Simms, Martha, ;Sinclair, Edward, W.;Sit, Nelson, ;Skordas, Demetrios, N;Smith, Carolynn, ;Smith, Frank, R.;Smith, Mark, A;Smith, R. Melody, ;Smith, Robin, ; Smith, Roger, ;Soden, Kim, R;Spence, Paula, ;St. John, Paul, G;Stark, Peter, G.;Steffenson, Amy, ;Stockinger, Edward, ;Sturges, Brian, ;Swanson, Ralph, ;Swepson, Lori, P.;Swystun, Juan, C.;Szabolcs, David, ;Tagliamonti, Nicholas, ;Tannazzo, Anthony, ;Tannazzo, Peter, A;Tassa, Christopher, ;Tello, Xavier, E;Tobiason, Bert, Glenn; Tomasino, Mark, ;Torres, Lissette, ;Torres, Michael, A.; Tracey, Martin, ;Tricardo, Michael, ;Trischitta, Joseph, ; Trossello, Ernest, A.;Truong, Phat, ;Tymus, Matthew, ; Valentin, Javier, ;Vallebuona, Thomas, D;Vanderpool, Joshua, S;Vega, Jose, A;Velazquez, Edward, ;Velez, Madeline, ;Velez, William, ;Ventura, Cecilio, ;Vera, William, ;Veras, Luis, O;Vicole, Frank, ;Vidal, Kelvin, ; Vigilance, Fitzroy, ;Vitale, Benedict, J;Vitelli, Dennis, ; Vuttaggio, Robert, ;Wallace, Steven, A.;Walther, Michael, ; Walton, Dana, ;Watson, Carl, ;Weinrib, Bruce, ;Werle, Eugene, L;Whelan, William, J;White, Darryl, ;White, Michael, ;Whitney, Jennifer, R.;Wike-Gray, Hazel, ; Wilkinson, Shawn, A.;Williams, Gerald, ;Williams, Ivan, R; Williams, Kevin, J;Williams, Richard, F.;Wilson, Gregory, ; Wilson, Norman, ;Wong, Rose, ;Wright, Annette, L;Wuttke, Karen, L;Yacovone, Travis, ;Yang Jr., Glenn, ;Yanni, Vincent, D;Yee, Hubert, ;Yemma, Ralph, ;Zic, Stephen. (rag)
May 12, 2003 Filing 59 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Abbene, Gerard, Acevedo, Erick, ;Acevedo, Vanessa, S;Acuna, John, ;Acuti, Edward, W;Agosto, Joseph, ;Alarcon, Johnny, E;Alavanja, Michael, P.;Almodovar, Julio, ;Almonte, Claudio, ;Alvarez, Alexander, P;Alvarez, Maria, A;Alvigi, Dante, ;Amador, Peter, James;Amarosa, Robert, H;Ancone, Gerard, M.; Andreone, Anthony, ;Antiuk, Stephen, ;Anzalone, Louis, J; Aponte, Yvette, ;Armando, Rivas, ;Armonis, Robin, L;Arnold, Towanna, ;Arp, Douglas, A;Astras, George, ;Athanasson, Theo, ;Auty III, Warren, ;Aviles, Jasmin, ;Ayala, Kenneth, ; Ayling, Maura, ;Azambuja, Dennis, ;Bache, Alan, J;Bacon, Paul, ;Bailey, James, ;Baird, Ronald, R;Balgahoom, Khadafi, ;Ballantyne, Gail, M;Baratto, Salvatore, ;Barnett, Robert, ; Basso, Gaetano, F;Bastedenbeck, Christine, ;Bastedenbeck, John, ;Battisti, Anthony, J;Bava, Robert, ;Bavuso, Joseph, ; Bayley, Jewel, ;Beecham, Lisamarie, ;Bello, Robert, ; Benintendo, Jonathan, ;Berger, Donald, W;Berrios, Dennis, ; Bieler, Leonard, M;Biscardi, Douglas, ;Black, James, ; Blake, Clinton, ;Blum Jr, Paul, ;Bodenburg, Guy, G;Bohr, Brian, ;Bonilla, Carlos, M;Botta, Anthony, M;Bourne, Robert, ;Boyle III, Donald, J;Brace, Yvette, ;Brandafino, Frank, ;Brannigan, Brian, ;Brennan, Daniel, K;Brennen, Keith, ;Bridgman, Thomas, ;Brioso, Marian, ;Brown, Daniel, S;Brown, Howell, ;Brown, Joann, ;Browne, Randy, ;Buck, John, T;Buckley, Joseph, ;Buckley, Kirth, ;Burding, Jalin, ; Burkley, Eric, J;Buscarnera, Vincenzo, ;Cabarcas, Gustano, ; Cahill, William, ;Calandra, Mark, ;Calderon, John, ; Calderon, Jose, ;Callahan, Patrick, ;Camacho, Jorge, ; Camacho, Kristopher, ;Candela, Peter, J;Caputo, Robert, ; Carlucci, Robert, J.;Carrera, Katrina, ;Carroll, James, ; Carroll, John, L.;Carroll, John, T.;Cartagena, Haydee, ; Caselli, Michael, J;Catanzaro , Thomas , ;Cavlor, Michael, ; Cawthorne, Daniel, T;Celentano , Nicholas , ;Cella, Paul, J;Centeno, Carlos, ;Cerenzio, Anthony, ;Chamorro, Anthony, ; Chandler, Jason, D;Chandless III, Ralph, W;Chartier, William, ;Chavis, Stafford, ;Chin, Christopher, ;Christa, Andre, ;Cifarelli III, Carlo, ;Clarke, Dimaine, ;Collazo, Anthony, ;Colletti, Patricia, ;Colorundo, Charlene, D; Colorundo, John, A;Comparetto, Gregg, A;Confino, Steven, ; Conk, John, R;Conway, Daniel, J;Conway, Kevin, ;Coppola, Sergio, ;Corbett, Michael, J;Cordero, Edwin, ;Correa, Christopher, ;Cortes, Wanda, I;Costello, Matthew, T;Crespo Jr, Francisco, ;Croce, Frank, A;Crook, Mark, ;Cruz, Felix, ; Cruz, Jo-Ann, ;Cruz, Ramon, ;Cunningham, Christopher, M; Cunningham, Thomas, ;Cunto, Hugo, ;Cuoco, Maria, E.; D'Albero Jr, Alfred, ;Daly, Peter, ;D'Amodio, Vincent, ; D'Andrea, Lawrence, ;D'Aniello, Annalisa, ;Davis, Edward, M; Davis, Leonard, C;Davis, Wayne, ;Dawkins, Cedric, R;Decker, Thomas, ;DeGuisto, Ronald, J;Deignan, Glen, M;DeJesus, Robert, ;Delacruz, Hector, ;Delena, Stephen, G;Delgardo, John, ;Delligatti, Lori, ;Derby, Brunilda, ;Derby, Joseph, M;DeStefano, Steven, ;DeTuro, Joseph, ;Devine, Kevin, ; Diaz, Edwin, S;Diaz, Johnny, ;Diaz, Jorge, H;Diaz, Julio, ; Dichter, Ross, ;DiFrancesco, Joseph, ;DiGiovanna, Anthony, ; Dillon, Donald, J.;Dilorenzo, Thomas, ;DiMurro, Michael, ; Dolan, Edward, ;Dominick, Jaworski, ;Donnelly, Kariann, ; Donohue, William, J;Dotres, Diego, E;Douglas, Danielle, ; Dreyer, Stephen, ;Duffy, Brian, ;Durand, Gregory, F;Early, Michael, ;Edgecombe, John, ;Edwards, John, C;Egan, Kerri, L.;Elder, James, M;Eleutice, Geneva, ;Elliott, Thomas, C.; Elton, Vanessa, L.;Entenmann, John, M;Esquerete-Cruz, Caroline, ;Estrada, William, ;Ewanitz, Andrew, ;Fabiszak, Richard, A;Faello, Joseph, L;Fagiolo, Alexander, C;Falanga, Anthony, J;Farrell, Stephen, J;Ferguson, Andrew, ; Fernandez, Fernando, ;Ferraiolo, Eugene, ;Ferro, Salvatore, G;Figoski, Peter, ;Figueroa, George, ;Finnegan, Vincent, ; Finocchiaro, Lory, ;Fisher, Randy, ;Fontana, Joseph, ; Fontanez Sr, Samuel, ;Francisco, Frank, A;Francisco, Vladimir, ;Froehlich, Dawn, ;Gagliano, Frank, L;Garcia, Jose, I;Garcia, Victor, ;Garda, Peter , C ;Gardell, Stephen, E.;Gargurevich, Antonio, ;Gazsy, Robert, F;Geraci, Michael, ;German, Juan, ;Giallanza, Thomas, ;Giarmoleo, Dominick, ;Gil, Aldo, ;Girard-Winley, Samantha, ;Giuffre, John, ;Giuffre, Michael, E;Glennon, Kellyann, E;Gomerez, Jose, ;Gonnella, David, ;Gonzalez, Benjamin, ;Gonzalez, Likircia, A;Gonzalez, Tirzah, ;Gorton, Roland, J;Grandy, Cedric, ;Greaney, Michael, J;Grullon, Carlos, ;Grupski, Robert, ;Grzejka, Christine, ;Guisao Jr., Jonas, ; Gullinello, Brian, ;Gullo, Richard, ;Guy, Kathleen, M;Hall Jr., Rudolph, B.;Hamm, Yuseff, ;Hanley, Timothy, ;Hansen, Roy, E;Harris, Michael, ;Harrison, Vanessa, E;Hartigan, Geraldine, ;Hartley, Stephen, F;Haverlin, James, D.;Healy, Kieran, J;Hegmann, Christopher, ;Hepworth, James, T.; Herasme, Reynaldo , ;Hernandez, Carlos, J;Hernandez, Luis, ; Herndon, Fred, ;Herran, Angel, ;Herrera, Selina, ;Hoban, Stephen, ;Hoffmann, Anthony, R.;Hogan, Kevin, C;Holloman, Cheryl, ;Holloway, Pamela, A;Hons, Herbert, W;Houser, Leroy, ;Houston, Kyra, ;Howard, Paul, M;Howe, Joseph, M; Huemmer, Philip, A;Hughes, Danielle, ;Hummel, Joseph, ; Iglesias, Adolfo, ;Incandela Jr, Salvatore, ;Ingber, Richard, ;Insigne, Armando, ;Intorcia, Annmarie, ;Irace Jr, Vincent, J;Ismael Jr, Alicea, ;Iurillo, Anthony, ;Jack, Donna, E;James, Ernest, ;Jerabek, James, ;Johnson, John, C; Johnston, Scott, C.;Jones, Frank, L;Jones, Tanisha, ; Jordan, Jenine, R;Joseph, Bella, ;Josue, Ramon, ;Jubran, Karam, ;Jules-Louis, Philip, ;Kaplon, Karen, ;Keane, Thomas, W;Kiefer, Christopher, D;King, Arthur, ;King, Harold, ;King, Martin, ;Kissane, Timothy, M;Klausner, Marc, ;Kloiber, Mark, F;Kolosiej, Taras, ;Kwong, Rene, M. (rag)
April 30, 2003 Filing 58 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Naso, Steven, ; Navarra, Lissa, ;Navarro, Adam, T;Nelms, James, R;Nelson, Doreen, ;Neumann, Lawrence, S;Newkirk, Lisa-Marie, ; Nichols, Leonardo , E ;Nieves, Ramon, ;Nikolopoulos, Peggy, S;Norman, David, ;Norton, John, ;Notaro, Joseph, S;Notholt, Paul, K;Nou, Therith, ;O'Brien, Timothy, G;Ocasio, Henry, ; Oclamtten, Cynthia, ;O'Connell, William, ;Odachowski, Joseph, J;O'Flanagan, Coleen, ;Ojeda, Rafael, ;O'Keefe, Albert, ;Olivier, Kertis, ;O'Neiil, Thomas, ;O'Neill, Jason, ;Ortiz, Carlos, ;Ortiz, Damien, ;Ortiz, Edwin, ; O'Sullivan, Michael, ;Otero, Wesley, ;Padillo, John, ; Palmer, Dwayne, L;Palmer, Monique, ;Pandolfi, Robert, A; Pantoja, Carlos, A;Papola, Lawrence, K;Papola, Steven, ; Paras, Eric, ;Parlow, William, ;Passantino, Joseph, ; Patterson, John, ;Pena, Bernadette, ;Pena, Rafael, ; Pennacchio, Michael, R;Pepin, Danny, ;Perez, Daniel, ; Perez, Michael, ;Perez Jr, Rigoberto, ;Perkins, Thomas, D; Perosi, Anthony, V;Peterson, Curtis, ;Petti, Robert, ; Phillips, Bret, ;Phillips, Robert, J;Picciurro, Lisa, ; Pichardo, Marcos, ;Pimentel, Christine, ;Pineiro, Jacqueline, ;Pizzo, Dominick, ;Poole, Erica, ;Porfidio, Michael, F;Porr, Michael, P;Prendergast, Paul, ;Profeta, Joseph, ;Pugh, Rodney, ;Quiles, Francisco, ;Quinn, Joseph, ; Ramirez, Troy, A;Ramirez III, Fausto, ;Ramirez-Ramos, Jeannelle, ;Rapa, Assunta, ;Rasulles, Brian, ;Reid, Rena, E; Reid, Robert, T;Reid Wiese, Karen, ;Reilly, Margaret, ; Reyes, Alberto, ;Reyes, Eddie, ;Reyes, Hanlis, ;Richards, Mary Lou, ;Richey, Moira, A.;Rivera, Felix, ;Riveria, Ivan, ;Rizzo, Frank, ;Roberson, William, C;Rocha, John, ;Rodgers, Alan, C;Rodriguez, David, ;Rodriguez, Esmeralda, ; Rodriguez, Maria, ;Rodriguez, Michael, ;Rodriguez, Oskar, ; Rodriguez, Serafin, ;Rohan, John, J;Roldan, Rogelio, ; Roman, Franklyn, ;Romanello, Anthony, ;Romano, Andrew, J; Ropenus, James, ;Rosa, Angel, L;Rosa, Julio, ;Rosa, Luis, ; Rosa, William, ;Rosado, Lisa, ;Rosado, Ramon, ;Rosado, Suzette, ;Rotondo, Richard, ;Rubio, Robert, ;Ruggiero, Giovannina, ;Ruiz, Eric, ;Ruiz, Luis, B;Russell, David, ; Russo, Anthony, J;Ryan, Sean, ;Salerno, James, ;Salmon, David, K;Sammartino, Felicia, ;San Roman, Barbara, ; Santana, Manuel, ;Santiago, Joseph, ;Santora, Gregory, ; Santos, Raul, ;Saputo, Frank, ;Sarubbi, Alexandra, ;Schack, Douglas, ;Scheer, Christine, R;Schmidt, Ronald, J;Schwarz, Daniel, ;Scott, Lauren, ;Scrivani, John , J ;Seda, Julio, A; Serio, Mario, ;Serpe, Joseph, A;Sesti, James, Richard; Shagan, Paul, ;Shannon, George, W;Shenton, Richard, G; Sherwood, Michael, ;Shiels, Malcolm, W;Shimborske, Paul, ; Silva, Darryl, M;Silverman, Harry, ;Sliman, Patricia, ; Smith, Edward, ;Smith, Lauren, M;Sommer Jr, William, J; Sosa, Migdalia, ;Spano, Matthew, D;Sparacino, Michael, ; Starrantino, Matthew, ;Strong, Jimmy, L;Stukes, Kenneth, ; Stukes, Raymond, ;Sullivan, David, ;Sullivan, Mary, ;Sykes, Arlene, ;Tates, Michael, D;Tavarone, Anthony, ;Tavella, Ralph, ;Taylor, Jesse, W;Tenore, Christopher, ;Thomson Jr, Robert, A;Thornton, Gregory, ;Tiger, Clark, S;Tighe, Maryann, ;Tirado, Jose, ;Toomey, Michael, S;Torre, Michael, J;Torres, Emmanuel, ;Torres, John, ;Trees, Jason, ;Tussie Jr, Richard, ;Valenzano, Andrew, ;Valerga, Paul, ;Van Cook, Barbara, ;Vartoukian, Richard, ;Vazquez Jr, Juan, ;Velez, Jorge, ;Vigne, Patrice, R;Villanueva, John, A;Virella Jr, Victor, J;Vita Jr, Angelo, ;Viverito, Catherine, ;Volsario, Edward, ;Vu, Peter, T;Walker, Linda, ;Walsh, Thomas, A; Watson, Joseph, ;Watson-Tobah, Nikki, ;Wells, Steven, A; White, Deirdre, ;Wild, Daniel, F;Williams, George, ; Williams, Lisa, C;Williams, Stephen, ;Wilson, Timothy, J; Wilson, Valerie, ;Wohlfarth, John, M;Wolff, Glenn, ;Wong, James, ;Woodson, Shonta, ;Wooten, Anthony, ;Wright, John, A; Wyckoff, Marisa, A;Wyss, Stephanie, ;Yang, Thomas, ;Zanet, Susan, ;Zarr, Karl, ;Zatac, Richard, J;Zeloff, Jeff, ; Zenker, Patrick. (rag)
April 30, 2003 Filing 57 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Abrams, Marc, ; Acevedo, Francisco, ;Adaszewski, Philip, A;Ahlf, Suzanne, M; Alba, Marisol, ;Albanese, Vincent, ;Albrecht, Bob, ; Alexander, James, ;Allemand, Robert, D;Alvarado III, Emilio, ;Amador, Christian, M;Amodeo, Anthony, ;Antonelli, Robert, L;Antonellis, Anthony, ;Appleton, Paul, S;Arce, Jose, Manuel;Ariano, Neil, ;Armenia, Joseph, J;Avenelt, Marilyn, M;Babsin, Ivan, ;Badillo, Francis, ;Bafundo, Gina, ;Balestrien, Louis, ;Ballester, Iris, M;Barbee-Lebour, Marcia, ;Barone, Joseph, ;Barra, Brian, T;Barrett, David, E; Barrett, Timothy, ;Basile, Carl, ;Batista, Michael, ;Beal, Arthur, ;Beatty, Walter, V;Bell, Gregory, ;Benka, Janice, G.;Bensen, James, ;Benson, Benjamin, ;Benzinger, Michael, ; Bergin, Peter, ;Bernardo, Mario, ;Bieber, Andrew, ; Blackshaw, Scott, ;Blake, Kevin, E;Bland, Robert, W; Borroni, Thomas, V;Bostwick, James, A;Brady, Christopher, ; Brady, Nicholas, ;Bragg, Vanessa, ;Braithwaite, Derek, ; Brandl, Richard, ;Braus, Sheldan, ;Breuer, Ronald, ;Brown, Brian, ;Brunetto, Ninfa, ;Butera, Joseph, ;Byrd, Gary, ; Byrne, Thomas, ;Cacavas, Thomas, ;Cadogan, Jamil, V;Caines, Charles, L;Caiola, Brian , L ;Cairone, Anthony, F;Calleja, Eric, ;Camacho, Lindy, ;Camera, Richard, ;Campbell, Theodore, B;Campo, Angela, ;Campo, Carlos, ;Cannizzaro, Frank, M;Canonico, Andrew, ;Canonico, David, M;Capato, David, A;Caraballo, Joseph, ;Caravella, Frank, ;Cariola, Richard, ;Carnabuci, Pat, ;Caruso, Frank, L;Cassano, Michael, J;Castle, Christopher, J;Casto, Luigi, M;Casvikes, Gregory, ;Celli, Eileen, F;Cerase, Andrew, T;Ceru, Robert, ; Chernoff, Scott, W;Christens, Chris, Z S;Christian, LeNard, ;Cipolli, Christopher, ;Cirigliano, Joseph, ;Clark, Anthony, ;Clark, Michael, E;Coccodrilli, William, J; Colangelo, Nicholas, ;Cole, Catherine, ;Colon, Nelson, A; Condron, Thomas, P;Conwell, Robert, ;Cooper, Jovoda, Y; Correa, Madelline, ;Cortes, Ann, ;Cosenza, Michael, ; Costleigh, Sue, ;Couto, Carlos, ;Coviello, Joseph, ;Coyle, Timothy, ;Cregan, Ann, M;Cronin, John, K;Cruz, Michelle, ; Cumenzo, Michelle, ;Cunningham, Noelle, ;Curley, Michael, ; Czerepak, Matthew, ;Dadabo, John, F;Daly, Jeremiah, J; Damato Jr, Anthony, ;Darden Jr, Kerry, E;Davis, Kevin, S;De La Cruz, Jose, A;De Marco, John, ;Decker, Maureen, Ellen; DeFeo, Patricia, A;DeJesus, Eric, ;DeJesus, Pablo, ; Delfino, Michael, ;Delgado, Marilyn, ;Delpilar, Edwin, ; DelValle, Marisol, ;Delvecchio, John, ;DeMartino Jr, Richard, ;Denesopolis, luke, ;Denver, Kelly, A;Derkasch, James, ;D'Esposito, Anthony, J;DeStefono, Gina, ;Devine , William, P;DeVirgilro, Lours, ;DiCioccio, Alfonso, ; Dieterich, Kristina, A;Dieterich, Michael, ;Doherty, James, P;Doldron, Sherena, ;Domenech, Kenneth, X;Donis, Alfredo, ; Dowd, Darren, C;Doyle, Jill, F;Duggan, Patrick, ;Durets, Dmitry, ;Easton, Lawrence, ;Ebrahi, Ellen, M;Edwards, Keith, ;Ellis, Timothy, ;Emburey, Doreen, ;Emery Jr, James, ;Engel, Christopher, A;Ennis, JaneMarie, ;Espindola, Fernando, ;Estelle Jr, Patrick, ;Estevez, Joel, D;Eua, Joseph, S;Everett, Eric, O;Fadl, Michael, C;Famighetti, Lisa, ;Famiguetti, Christine, ;Faver, Scott, ;Federico, Joseph, ;Finley III, John, ;Flores, Albert, ;Flores, Steve, ;Flores, Steven, ;Foerderer, William, ;Fontanarosa, Jay, ; Forino, Chris, ;Fox, Daniel, J;Fuelling, Edward, H; Gallichio, Francis, J;Galvin, James, ;Gammel, William, M; Garcia, Cesar, E;Garcia, Sidney, ;Garvin, Anita, E;Gaynor, Philip, E;Gazzani, Kenneth, ;George, Gumey, ;Gerardi, Michael, ;Giannetto, Joseph, C;Giglia III, John, ;Gillen, Maureen, ;Gillespie, Kevin, ;Gironda, James, F;Gomez, Richard, L;Gonzalez, Juan, A;Gonzalez, Mark, ;Gonzalez, Raul, ;Gonzalez, Theresa, ;Goris, Yokasta, A;Goulding Jr, Rodney, R;Gouzien, Nicolas, R;Grattan, Steven, ;Greco, Angel, ;Greene, Tressi, ;Greer, William, M;Gregory, Stephen, ;Grenci, Gabriel, B;Griffith, Edward, J;Grycel, Dariusz, ;Guerin, Ann, M;Gugel, Bart, ;Guidice, Michael, ; Guilfoyle, Sean, ;Guinan, Michael, ;Gulotta, Nicholas, ; Gurley, Benjamin, ;Guzman, Joseph, ;Hagan, Edward, ;Halk, Stephen, C;Hall, Steven, ;Hamilton, Robert, ;Hanley, Christopher, M;Hanlon, Feargal, M O;Harden, Justin, M; Hargett Jr, Theodore, R;Hayes, Robert, J;Heng, Sovath, ; Hernandez, Alicia, ;Hernandez, George, ;Hernandez, Ronald, ; Hewitt, Nico, ;Higgins, Michael, ;Hill, Hardy, ;Hill III, Glover, L;Hoehl, Joseph, ;Horan, David, ;Horlebein, Craig, ; Horn, John, T;Horsfield, Jean, ;Hubert, Nilda, M;Hughes, Kevin, C;Hutchings, Shawn, ;Hynes, Christopher, J;Iannazzo, John, ;Isaacs, Lystra, V;Jakubowsky , Richard , ;James, Denise, ;Jaquez-Mercado, Lourdes, ;Johnson, Brendan, ; Johnson, Larnell, ;Johnson, Michael, E;Johnson, Shirel, ; Jones, Melissa, S;Jones, Mr. Morgan, D;Joseph, Jama, Y; Joseph, Roxanne, S;Kelly, John, ;Kelly, Kevin, ;Kielb, George, G;Kienle, Scott, M;King, John, ;Kirkman, Scott, ; Knecht Jr, Robert, ;Koesterer, Dennis, W;Kolenovic, Medzit, ;Kondenar, Gregory, C;Kosmalski, Frank, ;Laffey, Brian, ; Lake, James, E;Lalli, Laura, ;Lamberto, Ramirez, ; Lamendola, James, ;Land, Solomon, ;Lang, Richard, A;Langan, Catherine, ;Langton, Michael, ;Lavelle, Richard, ;Lawlor, Robert, ;Lederman, Allen, ;Lemish, Michael, A;Lendemann, Anthony, E;Leonard, Gerard, ;Lester, Barbara, ;Lettiere Jr., Gregory, T.;Licari, Michael, J;Lieberman, Glenn, ; Lilla, James, J;Lindquist, Thalia, Simone;Lombardo, Mark, ; Lopez, Brian, A;Lorca, Miguel, ;Lowney, Brian, P;Lozano, Senia, M;Lucey, Daniel, J;Luciano, Salvatore, ;Macaluso, Frank, D.;Machate, Thomas, P;Madjarian, George, ;Mahmoud, Sufyanah, ;Maldonado, Annette, ;Maldonado, Irvin, ;Malliae, Alex, ;Mallozzi Petrizzo, Ellen, Maria;Malone, Brian, J; Manning, Paul, V;Manolangas, George, S;Marcano, Edgardo, Luis;Marchesona, Nicholas, A;Marolla, Darryl, ;Marshall, Harrington, ;Martin, Jane, C;Martinez, Fernando, ;Mascia, Anthony, ;Masso, William, ;Mayfield, Steven, D;Mazarakes, Christine, ;Mazzella, John, ;Mazzeo, John, ;McCaffery, Barbara, A;McCarthy, Kevin, P;McDonald, Cristina, ;McGowan, John, J;McHugh, Sean, ;McLarney, Denis, R;McLaughey, Brian, ;McLaughlin, Paul, C;McLee, William, ;McMillen, Patricia, ; McNair, James, B;McNamara, Brian, P;McNamee, James, G; McQuiston, Scott, ;McSweeney, Christopher, ;Medina Jr, Bolivar, ;Meehan, William, J;Mege, Jacqueline, D;Melendez, Agustin, ;Melendez, Alexander, ;Melendez, Jose, A;Mertens, Paul, ;Mickens, Allen, ;Minella, Dennis, C;Mivervini Jr, Michael, ;Montefusco, James, ;Mooney, Brian, ;Morales, Angel, ;Morelli, Joseph, ;Moseley, Phylese, ;Moses, Jay, ; Mullaly, Matthew, ;Mullarkey, Gregory, ;Mulvey, Christopher, M;Muniz, Alice, J;Munoz, Miguel, ;Murphy, Maureen, ;Murray, Ronald, G. (rag)
April 25, 2003 Filing 46 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
April 23, 2003 Filing 56 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Yabut, Dennis, ; Yanguas, Hector, R;Young, Eleanor, ;Young, Inez, ;Young, Paul, ;Young, Peter, ;Yuska, Michael, ;Zaboroff, Steve, I; Zacharias, Frank, M;Zahra, Michael, ;Zaikowski, Joseph, ; Zaleski, Christopher, ;Zapata, Christopher, R;Zara, Thomas, ;Zeiss, Diane, ;Zeoli, Mario, A.;Zeqarelli, Giovanni, ; Zevon, Robert, J;Zito, Christopher, ;Zolzer, Brian, D; Zoquier, Amauri, ;Zuefle III, Lawrence, C;Zupic, Stephen, J; Zweigbaum, Kevin. (rag)
April 23, 2003 Filing 55 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs Saladin, Robert, ; Salamone, Chris, ;Salcedo Jr, Epifanio, ;Salim, Said, ; Salony, Paul, ;Salvato, James, A;Sammartano, Michael, ; Samot, Luis, ;Sampson, Gary, ;Sanabria, Martin, ;Sanabria, Miguel, ;Sanchez, Luis, A;Sanchez, Michael, A;Santana, Carmelo, ;Santiago, Angel, L.;Santiago, Edwin, ;Santiago, George, L;Santiago, Janet, ;Santiago, Leslie, ;Santora, Anthony, ;Santos, Javier , ;Sapienza, Michael, J;Saporito, Vincent, ;Sarno, Frank, ;Sasson, Michael, ;Sauer, Matthew, ; Savage, Warren, H;Saviano, Donna, Maria;Sawers, Ron, ; Scala, Louis, ;Scalabrrno, Salvatore, V;Scanlon, Joseph, ; Scaringella, Vincent, ;Scarry, Chris, ;Schiano, Barbara, Lynn;Schiavone, John, E;Schieda, Nicholas, ;Schiller, Matthew, R;Schilling, Christopher, J;Schindlar, Daniel, ; Schindler, Matthew, P;Schmidt, Christopher, T;Schmidt, Donna, M;Schmidt, James, M;Schmidt, William, ;Schmitt, Kristoffer, ;Schneider, Christopher, E;Schneider, Ronald, ; Schuelling, Gary, P;Schuldner, Stephen, R;Schutz, Caroline, ;Schweers, William, ;Sciulli, Robert, ;Scott, Erika, A; Scott, Kay, D;Scotti, Joseph, R;Segarra, Michael, ;Seidman, Rachel, ;Seignious, Vanessa, ;Selover, Joan, ;Sena, Michael, ;Sequeira, Alexandre, G;Serrano, Anna, ;Serrano, Ivette, ;Settecasi, Frank, J;Sexton, Maria, ;Shaughnessy, Chris, ;Shea, Brian, J;Shea, Michael, J.;Shelton, Richard, ; Sheridan, Timothy, ;Sherman, Matthew, ;Shields, James, C; Shirvis, Joseph, ;Shore, Andrew, R;Shugrue, Michael, ; Shultis, Michael, Norman;Shumski, Mark, ;Siar, Evan, ; Signa, Thomas, S;Signur, David, ;Silva, Thomas, ;Singer, Matthew, J;Skinner, Christopher, ;Slaughter, Helen, ;Smith, Chandra, D;Smith, Daleich, ;Smith, Michael, ;Smith, Michael, B;Smith, Rodney, ;Smith, Shawntay, ;Smith, Thomas, X;Smith Jr, Victor, J;Smokler, Glen, ;Smyer-Young, Harriet, ;Smykowski, Christina, A;Sneed, Norma, ;Solange, Rich, ; Soler, Shawn, K;Solimine, William, A;Sondermann, Eric, ; Sonfist, Evan, ;Soricelli Jr, Robert, J;Soto, Edward, ; Sousa, Michele, ;Spaccaforno, Victor, ;Spagnuolo, Michael, V.;Sparks, Monroe, B;Sporlstra, Joel, ;Sportiello, Anthony, ;Sprouse, David, ;Stanisich, Peter, ;Stano, Dave, ;Staples, Charles, C;Stapleton, Patricia, A;Stellingburg, Nolan, ; Stellmann, Richard, G;Stewart, Joseph, ;Stimpfel, Cindy, L; Stokes Jr, Richard, C;Stone, Sean, ;Stopler, Michael, ; Strada, David, M;Strano, Joseph, ;Straub, Charles, ;Straub, Gregory, ;Stremel, Debra, ;Stremel, Richard, ;Stringer, Denise, ;Suarez, Sean, Louis;Subhan, Shuhel, M;Sullivan, Francis, M;Sullivan, James, T;Sullivan, Timothy, ;Summers , Anna , ;Surillo, Luis, M;Sutherland-Anderson, Eileen , M ; Svenelid, Darin, ;Swenson, Edward, T;Swinton, Kim, N; Sykora, Michael, ;Sylvester, Anthony, ;Szumski, Walter, P; Taha, Ana, L;Tamburrino, Frank, ;Tanner, Nick, J;Tapia, Reggie, ;Tartaglione, Mark, P.;Tartamella, John , f ;Tatar, Thomas, ;Tatesure, Thomas, ;Taverna, Robert, ;Taylor, Carol, ;Taylor, Robert, ;Teahan, Jerome, J;Tedesco, Michele, C;Tejada, Marianela, ;Tenaglia, Annmarie, ; Tercynski, Mark, A;Terraforte, Keith, ;Terrell, Shante, L ; Terzian, Richard, P;Thatcher, Russell, ;Thide, William, A; Thompson, Paul, ;Thornhill-Freeman, Michele, P;Thorson, Daniel, ;Threats, Sylvia, ;Tilman, Daniel, B;Timoney, Gerald, ;Togans, Wayne, ;Tomasi, William, ;Torrellas, Frank, ;Torres, Edgardo, ;Torres, Jorge, L.;Torres, Melisa, ;Torres, Raul, M;Torricelli, Vincent, G;Tracey, Alicia, ; Trafford, Anthony, ;Trafford, Erica, ;Trigo, Ralph, A; Troiano, Kelly, ;Troiano, Victor, C;Trypuc, Timothy, ; Tucciarelli, Pete, ;Tuckel, Robert, ;Tucker, Craig, B; Tuckett, Lyndon, F;Tunnard, Scott, ;Turchiano, Michael, ; Turnbull, Frank, ;Turner, Renee, ;Tuthill, Brian, ;Twining, Scott, ;Ubieta, William, M;Ulloa, Roy, ;Ulmer, John, ; Ulrich, Daniel, ;Urena, Jennifer, ;Urena, John, ;Vaccaro, James, ;Vairo, Thomas, ;Valarezo, Cristina, ;Valentine, Katherine, M;Valentini, Dante, ;Van Dyke, Nicholas, V; Vanegas, Armando, ;VanPutten, Norman, ;Vargas, Edwin, ; Vargas, Omar, A;Varney, Thomas, W;Vasquez, Julio, ;Vazquez, Keisha, ;Vazquez, Pedro, J;Vecchio, Richard, ;Vega Jr., Jose, M.;Vejnoska, Jay, ;Velasquez Jr, Octavio, ;Velati, Renato, ;Velazquez, Jose, A;Velazquez, Maximilian, ; Velazquez, Rafael, ;Velez, Albert, ;Velez, Jose, A;Velez, Robert, ;Ventre, Paul, ;Vera, Elisheba, J;Verbanac, Steven, ;Verde, Christopher, ;Vickery Jr, Dennis, J;Vilaine, Hyacinth, ;Vilaseca, Eunice, ;Vilchez, Edward, ;Villafane, Jaime, ;Villavicencio, Elbert, ;Violante, Erica, L;Vivona Jr, Anthony, ;Vogt, Kenneth, ;Volpe, Anthony, ;Volpe, John, ;Vorbeck, Danielle, ;Vreeland, Michael, D;Walsh, Donald, ; Walsh, Jeanine, A;Walsh, John, F;Walsh, Michael, ;Walsh, Patrick, ;Walters, Shaun, ;Ward, James, J;Ward, Keisha, M; Ward, Terrence, ;Ward, Willie, A;Wargo, Brian, ;Waring, Andrew, ;Washa, Edward, ;Washington, Phyllis, ;Wasta, Dwayne, ;Waters, Thomas, J;Watkins, Reginald, E;Weber, Thomas, E;Weekes, Anthony, ;Weilert, Brett, R;Weis, Edward, ;Wekar, Susan, ;Weletor, Michael, R;Welsch, Michael, R; Welsh, John, L;Welsome, Robert, A.;Wendt, Christopher, J; Weshner, Eric, S;West, Anthony, B.;Weston, Nicolle, M; Whalley, George , P ;Wheeler, Gerald, ;Whelan, Scott, ; Whitaker, Sheila, D;White, Christopher, J;Whitehead, Chris, ;Whitely, Maria, ;Whitwell, Floriano, ;Wilfinger, James, ; Wilhelmy, Ron, ;Williams, Ava, M;Williams, James, ; Williams, Kevin, ;Williams, Marcus, ;Williams, Nancy, E; Williams, Shirley, ;Williams, Stephen, ;Windram, John, W; Wise, Sidney, R;Wong, Kenneth, T;Wood, William, C;Wooten, Dwayne, E;Wormsley, Martin, L;Wozneak, Stephen, J;Wrenn, Gerard, D;Wright, Bernadette, ;Wright, George, ;Wrobel, Andrew. (rag)
April 23, 2003 Filing 54 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs Naboka, Peter, ; Narvaez Jr, Efrain, ;Nasierowski, Ross, A;Nasser, Ahmed, A; Natale, Elizabeth, ;Neckles, Richard, ;Nedd, LaShawn, D; Negron, Irasema, ;Negron, Nelson, ;Nelson, David, A; Newbauer, Donald, ;Newell, Elizabeth, J;Newman, John, ; Newton, Samuel, ;Ng, John, ;Ng, Kent, ;Ng, William, K; Nicholls, Theodore, ;Nichsos, Willie, Don;Nickel, Robert, ; Nieves, Lourdes, ;Nolan, Daniel, ;Noonan, Kenneth, ;Noone, Michael, L;Noto, Christopher, ;Nowicki, Robert, H;Numssen, Robert, ;Nunez, Marino, ;O'Brien, Thomas, J;Occhino, Gary, ; O'Connor, Peter, Thomas;O'Connor Jr, Thomas, J;O'Donnell, Brian, ;O'Donnell, Keith, ;O'Donnell, Manus, ;O'Dwyer, Sean, ;Oemcke, Steven, ;O'Grady, Peter, ;O'Hara, James, ; O'Keefe, Kevin, ;O'Keeffe, Cornelius, ;Okrokoto, Oghenevigho, ;Olan, Betsy, ;O'Leary, Chester, W;Olsen, Eric, ;Olsziewski, Matthew, F;O'Neil, Toni, F;O'Neill, Michael, J;Orosz, Joseph, ;O'Rourke, Daniel, L;Orozco, TraueAnn, ;Ortiz, Ruth, ;Ortiz, Yvette, ;Oscback, Thomas, J; Ostermann, Kenneth, J.;O'Sullivan, Daniel, P;O'Sullivan, John, ;Ozoria, Carmen, ;Pabey, Haydee, ;Pacheco, Ricardo, J; Padilla, Jacqueline, ;Pagan, Brian, ;Pagan, Ricardo, ; Pagano, Keith, J;Pagano, Marci, ;Paholek, Edward, ; Palladino, Ralph, ;Panzenbeck, Timothy, F;Pappalardi, Pasquole, ;Parente, Linda, ;Parisi, Andrew, M; Parker-Thompson, Shavetle, R;Parkin, Christopher, ;Pastor Jr, Pedro, R;Pastrana, Rolando, ;Patterson, Arlene, P; Patterson , Stephanie , ;Pavelchak, Daniel, ;Pearson, John, D;Pelka, Thomas, E;Pelliccea Jr, Johnny, ;Pena, Francisco, G;Pena, Joseph, Frank;Penny, Gary, ;Pentangelo, Richard, ; Pepitone, Raymond, ;Percy, Michael, ;Perez, Aida, C;Perez, Christian, ;Perez, Irma, ;Perez, Janet, L;Perez, Juan, ; Perez, Ruben, E;Perez, Xavier, ;Perez Jr, Raul, ; Perlmutter, Ernest, ;Perna, Frank, J.;Perry, Timothy, ; Persaud, Trenton, ;Persico, Joseph, ;Pesantes Jr, Sergio, M; Peterkin, Guy, ;Peters, David, B;Pfeffer, Michael, ; Philbin, Michael, T;Piazza, John, ;Piazza, Karen, ; Pichardo, Diana, ;Pichardo, Fausto, ;Piechowiak, John, ; Pieragostini, Adam, J;Pierce, Joseph, R.;Pignatelli, Richard, ;Pinto, Robert, L;Pisani, Gary, P;Pitti, Salvatore, M;Pizza, Peter, ;Pizzino, Andrew, ;Plant, Edward, ;Platania, Robert, J;Pletka, Cole, ;Plumb Jr, Robert, ;Pochat, Thierry, A;Poggio, David, ;Polak, Philip, L;Polanco, Teodoro, ;Polchinski, John, ;Pombo, Manuel, A; Pona, James, ;Pope, James, L;Porigow, Brett, D;Porolny, Michael, ;Porta, Michael, A;Portalatin, John, ;Portanova, Joseph, ;Porteus, Gerald, D;Portorreal, Yecenia, ;Potenza, Michael, ;Pouzzi, Michael, ;Pradere, Tara, ;Preiss, Kevin, M;Prendergast, Joseph, F;Prendergast, Kathryn, R;Preuss, William, J.;Principe Jr, Juan, J;Puglia, James, ;Puleo, Michael, V;Puletz, Sheryl, ;Puma, Matthew, ;Puwalski, John, ;Quigley, Daniel, J;Quinlan, Daniel, ;Quinn, Robert, ; Quintana, Julio, ;Quod, Jeffrey, ;Rabess, Curtis, J;Rahill, Cynthia , M ;Raio, James, M;Raminez Jr, Freddie, ;Ramirez, Luis, E;Ramos, Mead, ;Ramoutar, Donny, ;Raspanti, Giancarlo, ;Reale, Joseph, ;Reams, Teresa, M;Reardon, Susan, ;Reavis, Wayne, C;Rebecca, Vito, ;Rechenberger, Erich, ;Rector, James, A.;Reefer, Daniel, ;Reid, Barbara, Anne;Reilly, Patrick, J;Reinhardt, Stephen, ;Reiss, Charles, E;Rella, Lenny, ;Retances, Neftali, ;Reuss, Michael, J;Reyes, Freddy, ;Rice, Thomas, ;Richards, LaSalle, ;Riley, Merritt, R;Riordan, Brian, J;Rivera, Anibal, R;Rivera, Antonio, ;Rivera, Carlos, ;Rivera, Damian, E;Rivera, Jacqueline, ;Rivera, Ricardo, ;Rivera, Victor, ;Roach, Thomas, J;Robbins, William, V;Roberson, Wayne, L;Roberts, Joanne, N;Roberts, Larry, ;Roberts, Stephen, J;Robertson, George, ;Robinson, Dennis, A;Robledo, Eustaquid, ;Rocchio, Silverstro, ;Roche, Christopher, ; Rodman, Shaun, ;Rodriguez, Alexis, ;Rodriguez, Angelo, ; Rodriguez, Bryan, ;Rodriguez, Daniel, ;Rodriguez, Dave, K; Rodriguez, Iris, ;Rodriguez, Jesus, ;Rodriguez, Luis, R; Rodriguez, Michael, ;Rodriguez, Miguel, A;Rodriguez, Noel, ; Rodriguez, Pedro, R;Rodriguez, Petra, ;Rolon, Angel, C; Romeo, Frank, ;Romeo, Joseph, ;Ronda, Ralph, ;Rondini III, Joseph, ;Rosa, Evelyn, ;Rosa, Michael, ;Rosado, Marcos, ; Rosario, Angelo, ;Rosario, Nikkia, ;Rosario Jr, Paulino, ; Rosato, Michael, E;Rosenberg, Michael, S;Rosenvold, Jeffrey, ;Ross, David, ;Ross, Richard, A;Rossetti, Nicole, L;Rossomando, Steven, ;Rostolder, Matthew, ;Rothschild, Wayne, A;Rowland, John, P;Rubenstrunk Jr, Charles, W;Ruby, John, G;Rufano, Frank, ;Ruffino, George, ;Ruggiero, Luciano, ;Ruggiero, William, N.;Ruiz Diaz, Solangel, ; Ruocco, Mark, ;Russo, Rocco, ;Ruzzi, Michael, ;Ryan, Joanne, ;Ryan, Ronald, F;Ryan, William, ;Rynn, Kathleen. (rag)
April 23, 2003 Filing 53 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs D;Iaccino, Louis, ; Iannone, Anthony, R;Iemma, Peter, ;Igoe, Patrick, J;Immerso, Michael, ;Imsasciani, Theodore, J;Iorio Jr, John, F; Irizarry, Deborah, ;Irizarry Jr, Raul, ;Isaacs, Lawrence, K; Itjen, Cliff, ;Jackson, Collette, ;Jackson, Paul, ;Jacobsen Jr, Edward, ;Jacobson, Jeffrey, ;Jambor, Jason, ;James, Loretta, ;Jamison, Terry, ;Jamison, Todd, B;Jarnich, Anthony, P;Javier, Sharon, ;Jean-Pierre, Ralph, ;Jean-Pierre Jr., Claude, J;Jensen, Svend, A;Jeter, Talisha, ;Jett, Sharon, R;Johnson, Anita, ;Johnson, Brian, J;Johnson, John, J;Jones, Barry, A.;Jones, Michael, R;Jost, Ronald, ;Joyce, Michael, ;Jurgensen Jr, Kenneth, P;Kadel, John, W;Kafka, Eric, ;Kain, Russell, J;Kaminski, Robert, W;Kammerer, Wayne, ;Kao, David , ;Kastner, Eugene, ;Keating, Michael, ;Kelly, Christopher, N;Kelly, James, ;Kelly, Marianne, R;Kelly, Patrick, M.;Kelly, Scott, P.;Kennedy, William, ;Kenny, Roger, ;Kentish, Tonya, L;Khalil, Haytham, M.;Khan, Mohamad, S;Kidney, Ann, ;Kielbiowski, Andrezej, ;Kimmelman, Susan, ; Kirton, Tyrone, ;Klaman, Sharon, ;Klass, Denisse, ;Klausner, Mike, A;Klein, Evan, ;Klouda, George, ;Knott, Jennifer, ; Knowles, Jack, ;Kobel, Peter, ;Koblish, Justin, ;Kompass, Warren, ;Kopack, John, T.;Korotz, Michael, ;Kosik, Zbigniew, ;Koster, Paul, ;Kramer, Valerie, E;Kress, Richard, ;Kruk, Mark, A;Krupinski, Mark, ;LaBoccetta, Anthony, ;LaBoy, Harry, ;Lagattolla, James, ;Lagrasta, Anthony, ;LaMagra, Frank, M;Lambiase, Scott, ;Lambusta, Jennifer, ;Larkin, Brian, E;LaRose, Thomas, R;Larsen, Erik, ;LaSala, Donald, ; Latimore-Harp, Dorothy, ;Lauria, Jeffrey, B;Lauritsch, Annette, ;Leahey-Tamburro, Erin, ;Leahy, Robert, S;Leavey, Gregory, P;Lee, Michael, ;Lejman, Richard, M;Lennon, Michael, A.;Leo, Brian, ;Leo, Gina, ;Leong, Jimmy, W; Letizia, Michael, ;Leuthner, Steven, ;Leventeris, Stamatis, Lewis, Andrew, A;Lewis, David, A;Lewis, Merline, ;Lewis, Stephen, ;Liberti, Michael, P;Liddane, Pat, ;Lind, Joseph, J Linder, Matthew, ;Lisa, Vicki, ;Lloyd-Sealey, Michele, ; Locke, Gregory, D;Lollo, Michael, R.;Lombardi, John, ;Longo, Ralph, V;Lopez, David, ;Lopez, Hector, E;Lopez, Leyla , ; Lopez, Luis, ;Lopez Jr., Felix, ;Lora, Frankie, ;Lord, Christopher, ;Lorenzo, James, ;Loresto, Emil, J;Loughlin, Thomas, V;Loveras, Diogenes, ;Lubrano, Erik, J;Luciano, Jose, A;Luciano, Michael, Scott;Lugo, Elizabeth, ;Lugo, Hector, ;Lugo, Jeanette, ;Luhs, G. Anthony, ;Luigi, Todd, C; Luise, Michael, ;Luisi, Jon-Michael, ;Lutin, Sean, K;Lux, Matthew, ;Lydon, John, ;Lydon, Mary, E;Lynch, William, ; Lynn, Ruben, ;Lyons II, John, A;Machicote, Angelo, ;MacKay, John, D.;Madrid, Fabian, ;Maggio, Neil, M;Maggiore, Jason, ; Magnani, Kandice, ;Maguire, Michael, T;Magurno, Jason, ; Maher, Micheal, F.;Mahoney, Kenneth, J.;Maldonado, Albert, J Maldonado, Amado, ;Maldonado, Evelyn, ;Maldonado, Nancy, ; Maldon-Brown, Earlando, ;Malgieri, Kenneth, ;Maliszewski, Robert, J;Mallo, Daniel, ;Mantilla, David, ;Marcaida, Damian, ;Marchese, Vincent, J.;Marciante, Joseph, G;Marconi, Paul, G.;Margaria, John, J;Markevich, Christopher, F; Markowski, Jacqueline, ;Marski, Christopher, ;Marte, Luis, L Martin, Brian, J;Martin, Robert, P.;Martinez, Edward, ; Martinez, Lourdes, ;Martinez, Moises, D;Martinez, Nelson , L Martinez, William, ;Marulli, James, ;Maselli, Walter, ; Mason, Syretta, L;Massab, Nicholas , C ;Massey, Raymond, ; Masters, Edward, J;Masturzi, Nelson, B.;Matos, Jose, ; Mattern, John, ;Matthews, Kevin, J.;Mattison, Christopher, M Mawyin, Jose, ;May, Robert, ;Mazaroski, Maryellyn, ;Mazza, Anthony, ;Mazzilli, Michael, V;McAvee, Jeff, ;McCall, Joseph, ;McCarthy, Michael, ;McCole, Dawn, ;McCord, Sr., William, Mark;McCormack, Dorene, ;McCormick, Micheal, ; McCormick Jr., James, M;McCrosson , Suzanne , ;McCullough, Anthony, ;McDaniel, Janice, ;McDermott, Vincent, H;McGouran, Conor, B.;McGraw, Patricia, ;McGuire, James, ;McGuire, John, F.;McGuire, Patrick, J.;McHugh, John, ;McHugh, Thomas, ; McInerney, Leslie, L.;McKenna, BC, ;McKenna, Stephen, G.; McKenni, Scott, ;McKenzie, David, ;McKinnon, Jennifer, ; McKoy, Kelvin, ;McMahon, Patrick, S;McManus, Peter, ; McTague, Madelyn, G;McVey, William, ;Medina, Carlos, ; Medina, Elizabeth, ;Medina, Ramon, ;Meehan, Michael, P.; Mejil, Iris, R.;Melfi, Craig, ;Melnik, Richard, P;Mendez, Pedro, C.;Mendez, Rose, ;Menzione, Nicholas, ;Mercedes Jr, Nehemias, ;Mercier, Randal, ;Messmer, Eugene, C.;Meury, James, ;Meyer, Raymond, ;Meyer, William, F;Michael, Dealmeida, ;Mickens, Fannie, M;Micozzi, Dennis , ;Migliore, Vincent, ;Mikowski, Walter, ;Milek, Christopher, ;Milisits, Thomas, ;Miller, Taiwo, ;Milmore, Edward, J.;Milmore, Edward, W.;Milmore, Michael, T.;Minguillon, Adolf, V.; Mirabal, Jeffrey, ;Mirabal, John, F;Mistretta, Salvatore, ; Mitskaris, Loukas, ;Mlekusch, John, ;Moccadi, Michael, ; Mohlenhoff, Brett, A;Molinini, Richard, ;Moloney, Dennis, ; Monahan, Eugene, P;Moncayo, Douglas, ;Mongiello, John, ; Montalvo III, Victor, M.;Montiel, James, M.;Moody, Brenda, ; Morales, Nadill, J.;Morales Jr., Ferdinand, ;Morali, Solomon, ;Morandi Jr. , John , ;Morella, Christopher, ; Moreno, Carl, ;Moretti, Denise, ;Morgan, Gary, ;Moriarty, David, ;Moroney, John, ;Morris, Gary, ;Morse II, Richard, W; Moryc, Milena, ;Mosca, Dennis, A.;Moschetto, Matthew, ; Mosiurchak, Kevin, ;Mulitz, Mark, ;Mullaney, Denis, ; Mullins, John, K.;Munido, Ricardo, ;Murphy, Douglas, F.; Murphy, Harold, ;Murphy, Michael, C;Murphy, Patrick, J; Murphy, Timothy, I.;Murray, Jamal, ;Murray, James, J;Murray, Michael, J;Murray, Timothy, ;Murro, John, ;Myers, Michael, J Myricki. (rag) Modified on 05/05/2003
April 23, 2003 Filing 52 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs D'Allegro, Robert, ; Daly, Thomas, ;D'Arpe, Mary, E;Dascanio, Anthony, D; D'Auteuil, Darren, M;Davis , Jean , ;Davneiro, James, M; Dawson, Colm, ;Dawson, Kathleen, McGrail;Dawson, Regina, ; De Giacomo, Edward, ;De La Cruz, Elvis, J;De Leon, Pedro, L; Dean, Jossette, M;DeCaprio, Christopher, ;Deery, Michael, ; Deighan, Edward, ;DeJesus, Raymond, ;DeLaney, David, ; Deleon, Dannis, ;Delgado, Luis, F;Delgado Jr, Julio, E; Dellen, Eugene, ;Dellipaoli, Nicholas, ;Dello Russo, Giuseppe, ;Delmonico, James, ;Demaria Jr, Frank, ;DeMeo, Toni, ;Dengler, Justin, L.;DeNoia, Jeffrey, ;Derenthal III, Fredrick, E;DeRosa, Ronald, K;Desantis, Joseph, ;DeSantos, Yolanda, ;Descovich, Peter, ;Dessert, LoriAnn, ;Devane, Kevin, J;Devine, John, ;Dhawan, Rohit, ;Diaz, Cesar, ;Diaz, Franklyn, P;Diaz, Melvin, ;Diaz, Roselin, ;Diaz, Timothy, ; DiBary, Donald, G;DiBenedetto, Darren, ;DiBono, Nicholas, ; Dietrich, Suzette, ;Dillon, Thomas, J.;Dito, Myriam, ; Donnelly (Bovay), Tracy, A;Donofrio, Adam, M;Donovan, John, ;Donovan, Richard, P;Donovan, Thomas, ;Dougherty, Michael, C;Dovico, Robert, ;Dowdell III, Christopher, ;Downes, Sean, ;Dreyer, Matthew, ;Driscoll, Desiree, ;Driscoll, Kevin, ; Driscoll, Sean, ;Duffy, Daniel, J;Duffy, John, Joseph; Dugan, Cathy, H;Dugan, Thomas, W;Dumont, Brian, D.;Dunn, Martin, ;Duplessis Jr, Robert, Peter;Duran, Juan, ;Durante, Robert, R;Durrell, Ray, ;Dwyer, Kevin, F;Dybski, Thomas, ; Dyckman, Chris, ;Eberling, Nicole, ;Eckert, Karl, T; Edwards, Amelia, ;Edwards, Donn, M;Edwards, Sharon, S; Egerton, Nanette, S;Eichner, Louis, ;Eirand, Debra, A; Eivers, Joseph, ;Elias, Edwin, ;Elwood, Christopher, ; Emmanuel, Mary, ;Emmolo Jr, Gaetano, A;Enderes, Jeanmarie, ; Engeldrum, Dens, G;English-Key, Eleasa, ;Epstein, Jay, ; Erbis, Carol, J;Escobar, Daisy, ;Evans, Richard, ;Evelyn, Cameron, A;Everleth, Jennara, ;Everson, Thomas, E;Evola, John, ;Fajar, Francisco, ;Fallon, Patrick, B;Falls, Michael, G;Fasano, Vincent, A;Favara, Anthony, ;Feduniak, Michael, R;Feeley, Michael, P;Feliciano, Ediverto, ;Felipe, Carlos, M.;Fenig, Adam, ;Feola, James, ;Ferguson, Dorrin, ; Ferguson, Kyle, S;Fernandez, Efrain, ;Fernandez, Elias, J; Fernandez, Lisa, M;Ferrara, Frank, ;Ferrara, Keith, ; Ferreira, Ruben, D;Ferrell, Shaniqua, N;Ferreyra, John, ; Fiallo, Ramon, M;Fields, Dana, ;Fierro, Lee, ;Figueroa, Augustin, ;Figueroa, Troy, ;Filippi, Felipe, ;Finkelstein, Leonard, ;Fiorello, Frank, W;Fiorello, Lawrence, ;Fisher, Michael, F;Fitzgerald, Edward, ;Fitzpatrick, Michelle, ; Flore, Benjamin, L;Flores, Luis, ;Flores, Victor, A;Florio, John, M;Flynn, Michael, A;Flynn, Peter, R;Fong, Anthony, J.; Fontanez, Mickey, ;Forbes, Beatrice, T.;Fortunato, Vincent, A;Fortune, Peter, ;Fox, Brian, P;Fox, Michael, ;Frasco, Christina, ;Frauenberg, Richard, ;Friedrichs, Timothy, F; Frisone, Richard, ;Froyne, James, J;Galante, Jery, J; Gallagher, James, J;Gallagher, Patrick, J;Gallardo, Robert, ;Gallo, Joseph, M;Gambardella, Thomas, ;Ganosis, Athanasios, ;Garbutt, Deborah, ;Garcia, Claribel, P.; Garcia, Gualberto, ;Garcia, Janet, ;Garcia, Jenimarie, ; Garcia, Joseph, M;Garcia, Manuel, ;Garcia, Pedro, ;Garcia, William, ;Garcia Jr, Miguel, ;Garduno, Hector, ;Gargan, Michael, ;Gargano, Joseph, A;Gasser, Kevin, ;Gatling, Cheri, D;Gavilanes, Marco, ;Gavin, Dawn, ;Gaynor, Francis, A;Gaynor, Lorraine, ;Gentile, Steven, ;Georgia, Deanna, ; Geraci, Richard, ;Gerasimczyk, Paul, ;Gerbano, Anthony, ; Geschwild, Joseph, P;Giambrone, Eileen, ;Gibson, Claudette, ;Giglio, Dominick, ;Gil, Migdalia, ;Gilby, Daniel, ;Gill, Mary, P;Gillen, Timothy, J;Gilligan, Thomas, C;Giordano, Francis, A;Giordano, Joseph, R;Glancy, Patrick, ;Glans, Audy, ;Glass, Craig, ;Glennon, Robert, J;Glover, Kelvin, A; Godbee, James, J;Goddard, Angela, L;Golden, Thomas, J; Goldenberg, David, ;Golod, Michael, ;Golston, Tamara, ; Golub, Steven, ;Gombert, John, C;Gomez, Alfred, ;Gomez, Carlos, ;Gomez, Jesus, M;Gomez, Mary, A.;Gonsieski, Michael, ;Gonzalez, Angelo, ;Gonzalez, Anthony, ;Gonzalez, Santos, ;Gonzalez Jr, Marco, ;Gooden, Sheri, ;Gorodovich, Kenneth, ;Graci, Helene, ;Gracia, Charles, ;Graguano, Joseph, ;Graham, Benjamin, ;Graham, Douglas, L;Granahan, Matthew, ;Granato, Anthony, ;Granowski, Jeffrey, P;Grant, Richard, ;Granville, Abera, ;Grau, Robert, ;Gravius, Daniel, ;Grayson, Shcora, ;Greany, Vincent, ;Green, Elisha, ;Green, Michael , D ;Gregotowicz, Michael, ;Grella, Michael, ;Griesbacker, John, M;Griffin, Ronald, S;Griffith, Peter, ;Grigoli, Joseph, ;Groia, Frank, M;Gross, Gayle, ; Grullon, Isaias, ;Guadalupe, Elizabeth, ;Guastamacchia, Vincent, ;Gueits, Joseph, M;Guerra, Ronnie, ;Guerrero, Mansol, ;Guerrero, Yesenia, ;Guginsky, Christopher, J; Guidone, Edward, ;Gulotta, Christian, ;Gunning, Linda, M; Guthoff, Julie, ;Gutierrez, John, ;Gutierrez, Yolanda, ; Guzman, Carlos, ;Guzman, Jessenia, ;Haas, Susan, A;Haddock, Aida, ;Haga, William, ;Hahl, John, ;Haimov, Martin, ;Hall, Alicia, ;Halligan, Edward, P;Hallock, John, M;Hamilton, Regina, ;Hanglow, Patricia, ;Hannon, Edward, A;Harnisch, Laurie, A;Harris, Jeanne, L;Harris, Kurtis, ;Harris, Mark, A;Harris, Priscilla, A;Harris Bromfield, Marcia, ;Harrison, Wilburn, ;Hart, Harvin, ;Harvey, Robert, F;Harvey, Sharon, ; Havy, Scott, ;Hawthorne, Kareen, ;Hayes, Kevin, G;Haynes, Robert, M;Hazzard, Darren, W;Healy, Frank, ;Healy, William, ;Hearne, Patrina, ;Heedles, Robert, J;Held, Christopher, ; Henning, Christopher, M.;Henriquez, Erik, ;Henriquez, Julia, M;Henry, Michael, ;Henry, Richard, G;Hernaiz, Jorge, L;Hernandez, Geoffrey, ;Hernandez, Kenneth, R;Hernandez, Ray, ;Hernandez, William, ;Hernandez Jr, Petronio, ;Herpin, Alice, ;Hickman, John, P.;Hidalgo, Alfredo, M.;Higgins, Joseph, F;Higgins, Marcia, ;Hilden, Jason, ;Hochstein, Jonathan , S ;Hoffman, Lawrence, ;Hohorst, Thomas, J; Holldorf, Troy, A;Holmes, James, J;Hong, Jeffrey, J; Hopkins, Demetrias, ;Horne, Donald, J;Hower, Christopher, J; Hsieh, Peter, ;Hughes, Rosemarie, ;Hummel, Scott, W;Hurley, Keith, B;Hynes, Janet, ;Hyte, Eileen. (rag)
April 17, 2003 Filing 51 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs Raddi, Anthony, P; Radovich, David, ;Ragusa, Philip, ;Rahilly, William, J; Rahman, Sayedul, ;Ramirez, Linda, J;Ramos, George, J;Ramos, Jose, L;Ramos, Manuel, E;Rasheda, Edness, ;Rauch, Michael, ; Re, John, ;Rebecca, Daniel, ;Reece, Kenneth, ;Reese, Christopher, G;Regan, Bremdam, ;Reggio, Lillian, ;Reid, Orville, ;Reid, Thomas, ;Reid, Thomas, J;Reilly, Patrick, ; Reilly, Thomas, ;Reinecke, Timothy, ;Rempe, Michael, ; Renison, Elizabeth, ;Rentas, Steven, ;Reuther, Raymond, ; Reyes, Gloria, M;Reynolds, Christopher, ;Rhambarose, Premchand, ;Ricks, Debra, ;Rios, Joel, ;Rios, Miguel, ; Rios, Steven, ;Rispoli, Stephen, ;Rivano, Grace, M;Rivera, Edwin, ;Rivera, Iris, ;Rivera, Jeanette, ;Rivera, Jose, D; Rivera, Joseph, M;Rivera, Oscar, ;Rivera, Wilfredo, E; Rivera, William, ;Rivera Caban, Altagracia, ;Riviezzo, Peter, J;Roach, Patrick, J;Robinson, Gerald, ;Rochford, Thomas, F;Rodriguez, Arsenio, ;Rodriguez, Audrey, ; Rodriguez, David, ;Rodriguez, David, ;Rodriguez, Edgar, ; Rodriguez, Edwin, ;Rodriguez, Jacqueline, ;Rodriguez, Jeffrey, ;Rodriguez, Neil, S;Rodriguez-Frank, Milagro, ; Roelofsen, Jeffrey, ;Rogan, Peter, J;Rogers, Brian, J; Rogers, Michael, L;Roguso-Sheehan, Wanda, P;Rohrbacher, Stephen, A;Rollings, Donna, ;Roman, Santiago, ;Rosa, Alma, ; Rosado, Rocco, T;Rosario, Arnaldo, ;Rosario, Cindy, R; Rosario, Jose, ;Rosario, Josph, M;Rosas, Armando, M;Rosati, Michael, J;Roth, Paul, ;Ruiz, Jose, A;Russell, Kenneth, F; Russo, Dolores, ;Russo, Maureen, ;Russo, Roseann, ;Russo, Sr., Carl, ;Ruvolo, Joseph, N;Ryan, Charles, ;Ryan, Christopher, J;Ryan, John, P;Ryan, Michael, G;Ryan, Thomas, ;Saake, Neal, P.;Sabinsky, Eric, B.;Salamone, Raymond, ; Salazar, Rafael, V;Salmonese, Michael, ;Salvia, Victor, ; Salzberg, Scott, ;Sanabria, Tommy, ;Sanchez, Eloy, N.; Sanchez, Rafael, ;Sanchez-Teixira, Amalia, ;Santa, James, ; Santana, Jose, A;Santiago, Hector, ;Santiago, Jr., George, A.;Santomauro, Robert, ;Santomero, Scott, ;Sargente, Christopher, W;Sarnoff, Jason, M.;Sarrica, Anthony, J.; Scanlon, John, ;Scannell, Gerard, ;Scarlato, Giuseepe, ; Scarles, Stephanie, ;Scarola, Michael, ;Schaffer, Kenneth, ; Scheddin, Lawrence, ;Schmidt, George, L.;Schneider, Keith, W.;Schneider, Tina, ;Schreider, Jr., Arthur, T;Schroeder, Donald, ;Schulz, Thomas, ;Schwartz, Martin, ;Schweda, Paul, L;Schweda, Peter, T.;Schwenk, Gregory, ;Schymanski, Edward, T;Sciara, Salvatore, J;Scibilia, Domenico, ;Sclafani, Thomas, P;Sconzo, Jr., Dominick, ;Scott, Christopher, ; Scott, Kevin, A.;Scotti, Robert, ;Scruggs, Darrin, ;Scurry, Kevin, ;Sebastiano, Rosario, B.;Secreto, James, ;Sedacca, Angelo, A.;Sedlak, James, ;Segui, Edwardo, ;Seiferheld, James, ;Seiling, Michael, ;Semiday, Mark, V;Semler, Robert, W;Seney, Jeanette, V;Shalbinski, Alexander, A.;Shannon, James, P;Shea, Brian, A;Shea, Christopher, J.;Shea, Patrick, ;Sheehan, James, ;Shellman, Joseph, ;Shelton, Christopher, ;Sheridan, Gerald, Patrick;Sheridan, Michael, ; Shields, Sharon, ;Short, Thomas, J;Shorte, Edward, E; Shortell, Christopher, G.;Sidman, Lawrence, C;Siff, Dorothy, ;Sikinger, Peter, ;Silva, Carlos, A;Silva, Evelyn, ;Silvernail, Steven, D;Silvester, Edward, ;Simenauer, David, ;Simone, Joseph, ;Sin, David, ;Singh, Sukhjiwan, ; Single, Eric, C;Sixsmith, Joseph, ;Skaggs, Randall, ;Slear, Matthew, J.;Smith, Darryl, ;Smith, Edward, D.;Smith, Gerald, ;Smith, Joseph, ;Smith, Lisa, ;Solano, Abelardo, ; Spadallini, Michael, ;Spasiano, Thomas, ;Spell, Cliford, P; Spence, Stephen, ;Speranza, Frank, M;Spidle, Glen, ; Stanczuk, Wayne, ;Stanton, Joseph, A;Stanton, Karene, ; Starczewski, Alan, ;Steck, Robert, ;Steinhaven, Mark, ; Stembridge, Rosie, E;Stevens, Frank, ;Stewart, Craig, R; Stewart, Leon, ;Stewart II, Mitchell, R;Stimus, Andrew, F; Stith, Barry, R;Stone, Cheryl, ;Stone, Joshua, ;Stowe, Quinton, B;Stuhlmuller, James, ;Suma, Montgomery, E; Swenson, Tammy, L;Tabeek, George, ;Tafuro, Michael, P; Talavera, Ramon, ;Tapia, Jr., Eugene, ;Tass, J.A., ; Tauarez, Jorge, ;Taudario, Michael, ;Tavares, George, ; Taveras, John, C;Taylor, James, ;Taylor, Richard, ;Tejada, Jose, ;Telford, Charlton, J;Thaens, William, C;Thomas, Danielle, M;Thomas, Delroy, ;Thomas, Donald, ;Thompson, Ernest, ;Thornton, John, P;Thurston, Alissa, D;Tieniber, Jr., Vincent, ;Tine, Thomas, P;Tisdall, Lawrence, ; Tobiason, Barry, ;Todd, Raymond, ;Tolosi, Jr., Edward, ; Tomaselli, Philip, ;Torpey, Michael, J;Torres, Christine, ; Torres, Eric, ;Torres, Jose, ;Torres, Juan, M;Torres, Obdulio, ;Torricelli, Leonard, A;Trananse, Richard, J; Treadwell, James, ;Treglia, Jason, D;Trentini, Edward, A; Triquet, Christopher, B;Trisarnsri, Klairath, ;Tropp, Philip, ;Troy, Robert, A;Tsang, Philip, ;Tubiolo, Philip, S; Tuca, Michael, J;Tucciarone, Philip, ;Tufano, Anthony, ; Tyson, Howard, ;Tyson, Jr., Cyril, M;Uhlfelder, Diane, Alice;Ulloa, Deborah, ;Ulmer, Everett, ;Ungro, William, J; Vadala, David, ;Valdes, Paul, ;Valenti, John, F;Valentin, Rudolpho, ;Valerie, John, A;Valley, Robert, ;Vandenberg, Gregory, ;Vargas, Vincent, ;Vargas, Jr., John, ;Vartan, Harry, ;Vazquez, Judith, ;Vega, Manuel, ;Vega, Robinson, ; Velarde, Ceclilia, ;Velasguez, Nelson, ;Velez, Paul, M; Velez Ryan, Rosa, C;Ventre, Paul, ;Verdicchio, Gerald, ; Vergin, Jean, R;Vespa, Michael, M;Villa, Allen, ;Villagran, Luis, E;Villanueva, Frank, ;Virga, Steven, A;Virga, Thomas, J;Vitale, Anthony, George;Vitale, Joseph, S;Vopat, Joseph, ; Waithe, Kathleen, ;Waldhelm, Arthur, ;Walsh, Paul, ;Walsh, Steve, ;Walsh, Thomas, ;Walters, James, ;Wanamaker, William, J;Ward, Sean, ;Warta, Shawn, ;Washack, Andrew, M; Webber, John, P;Weber, Karl, ;Webster, Thomas, -; Weisenauer, Christine, ;Wells, Brian, M;Wendt, Clark, K; Weng, Raymond, ;Westcott, Dawn, ;Whalen, Peter, F;Wheeler, Roxanne, C;Whelan, Robert, W;White, Robert, J;Whitney, Neil, ;Wick, Sean, Christopher;Wickhem, Michelle, ; Wilkerson, Paul, L;Wilkerson, William, E;Williams, Cindy, ; Williams, Dennis, ;Williams, Gene, ;Williams, Jennifer, L; Williams, Michelle, ;Williams, Vanessa, ;Williamsen, Stephen, W;Willms, Alan, F;Wilson, Laverne, ;Wilson, Scott, ;Wilson, William, ;Winston, Terry, ;Winter, Charles, F; Witoshynsky, Eric, N;Witt, James, ;Witthohn, Jason, R;Wohl, Stuart, R;Wolf, Eric, ;Wolsko, Timothy, Robert;Wong, Peter, ;Woods, Daniel, R;Wray, David, A;Wright, Michael, ;Wynne, Jr., Edward, T;Yeaman, Jonathan, ;Young, Paul, ;Yu, Nelson, ;Zacarese, Lawrence, M;Zajaz, John, ;Zakzewski, Joseph, ; Zambito, Charles, J;Zaranis, John, ;Ziegler, Daniel, A; Zimmer, James, ;Zurito, Washington. (rag)
April 17, 2003 Filing 50 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs Machin, David, ; Mackey, James, M;Maddaloni, Brian, ;Maddaloni, Jean-Pierre, ;Madison, Eugene, C.;Magenheim, Michael, J;Maher, Richard, ; Mahler, Roxanne, M.;Mahon, John, ;Mahoney, Shaun, ;Mahoye, Rocky, S;Mainolfi, Michael, ;Maira, Dennis, ;Majewicz, John, L;Major, Antoinette, Y;Makinen, Brian, ;Malave, Louis, P;Malewen, Donald, ;Malhotra, Ravi, ;Malone, Jeremiah, ;Maloney, Stephen, ;Mangan, Keith, ;Marino, Joseph, ;Markunas, Edward, ;Marrero, Jennifer, A;Marsalisi, Peter, ;Martin, Frederick, J;Martin, Phyllis, M;Martinez, Greg, ;Mascarenhas, Tarshi, ;Masin, Reid, ;Mastrandrea, Nicola, A.;Matchekosky, Peter, J.;Matos, Anne, E;Matos, Eduardo, D;Mattera, Michael, ;Matthews, Angela, ;Matthews, Kevin, ;Maurice, Daniel, ;Mazzella, Aniello, ;McCabe, Michael, ;McCambridge Ralph, Eileen, T.;McCarthy, Kevin, ; McCarthy, Patrick, B.;McCarthy, Peter, M;McCarthy, Thomas, ; McClernon, Michael, G.;McCloskey, Adrian, ;McCrory, Lawrence, T;McCusker, William, W.;McDonald, Charles, S.; McDonald, Sean, C;McDonegh, Marie, ;McFadzen, Bruce, ; McGarry, Brendan, Y;McGarvey, Jr., Robert, ;McGeever, Liam, ;McGill, William, ;McGrade, William, J.;McGrath, Patrick, M.;McGrath, Robert, B.;McGuire, Joseph, J;McGuire, Richard, J;McKenna, Donald, T;McLean, Colleen, M.;McMahon, Brian, ; McNally, John, ;McNally, Peter, D;McNamara, Thomas, M.; McNellis, Sean, ;McQuade, Francis, C;McTernan, Kevin, P.; Medina, Jose, E.;Megale, Jason, ;Melaragno, Ericka, R; Melendez, Edwin, ;Melendez, James, E.;Melillo, Joseph, A; Mendez, Anthony, ;Mendez, Arlene, ;Mendez, Lionel, ; Mercado, Norbert, ;Meyer, Kevin, P;Mikowski, Kevin, J; Milano, Louis, ;Milano, Theresa, ;Milentijevic, Nick, ; Milian, Maria, ;Mill, Terry, D.;Miller, Johnny, ;Miller, Marvin, J.;Milman, Andrew, ;Milone, Ralph, J;Mingione, Alfred, ;Minogue, Dennis, M;Mirabal, Robert, ;Mirabell, Richard, ;Miranda, John, P.;Mitchell, Dane, F.;Mitchell, Fredrick, G;Mitchell III, Walter, ;Mlynaryk, Alexander, R; Moccia, Jr., Frank, V;Moccio, Salvatore, ;Moccio, Suzanne, ; Molski, Thomas, ;Montgomery, Rosemary, ;Moore, Hukm, ;Moos, Frank, J.;Morales, Carlos, ;Morales, Peter, ;Morales, Jr., George, ;Moran, James, ;Morant, Nadia, ;Moreno, Andrew, ; Moreno, Judith, ;Moreno, Kenneth, J.;Morgan, Kenneth, E.; Morgan IV, Watson, E;Morgani, Joseph, ;Morris, Barry, S; Morris, Rahim, A;Morrissey, Stephen, ;Moryzin, Nicole, ; Mosca, Eileen, A.;Moughrabie, Michael, ;Moultrie, Wanda, ; Moy, Christian, J.;Moy, Michael, ;Mraz, Michael, ;Mueller, Laura, ;Mularadelis, Jason, R;Mulhall, Martin, G.;Muller, Richard, J.;Mulroy, John, ;Munoz, Deborah, ;Munoz, Francisco, J;Murphy, Kevin, ;Murphy, Kevin, M;Murphy, Michael, ;Murray, Kieran, D.;Muskus, John, ;Myles, David, ; Myrka, William, M;Myvett, Barrington, ;Naftal, Brian, ; Napoleon, Johnny, L.;Nau, Edward, R.;Naughton, Brian, P.; Navarro, Joseph, F.;Negron, Michael, ;Negron, Robert, ; Negus, William, M;Neithardt, Michael, ;Nelson, Don, ; Newkirk, Mickel, A.;Newshan, Bryan, ;Neyland, Laurence, ; Ng, Kafai, ;Niccoll, Rachel, ;Nichols, Rance, ;Nieves, Christopher, S.;Nieves, David, ;Nieves, Hector, M.;Nieves, Michael, ;Nieves, Miriam, ;Nix, Jeffrey, ;Nizza, Daniel, L.; Nohilly, Raymond, ;Norden, Brian, ;Norris, Tyrone, ;Norum, Gerard, ;Nunez, Michelle, ;Nunziato, Lawrence, ;Nuzzi, Gregory, ;Oates, Regina, C.;O'Brien, Frankie, A;O'Brien, James, J.;O'Brien, Michael, F;O'Connor, James, ;O'Connor, Patrick, ;O'Hagan, John, B;O'Hara, Dennis, D;O'Hara, Terrence, ;O'Kane, Irene, ;O'Leary, Kieran, P.;Oliveras, Jose, M;Oliveri, Frank, ;Olson, John, ;Omorebokhae, Dolores, C;O'Neill, Brian, H.;Orellano, Miguel, ;Ortiz, Danny, ;Ortiz, Pablo, ;Ortiz, Roberto, ;O'Shea, Daniel, P.; O'Sullivan, James, ;Pabey, Aida, ;Padilla, Luis, A;Pagan, Manuel, ;Palazzco, Margaret, ;Palminteri, Anthony, ; Palmiotti, Pierre, ;Pandullo, Frank, ;Paocicco, John, ; Pape, Amy, ;Parco, Frank, G;Paredes, George, ;Park, Thomas, J;Parker, Barry, ;Parmely, Richard, ;Parrilla, Carlos, ; Payne, Jamil, ;Peck, William, R;Pelan, John, ;Pelino, Michael, M;Pena, Eduardo, ;Pena, YoHanny, ;Penalo, Jashua, ; Peralta, Johnny, ;Perciaccante, Virginia, T;Perez, Dionicio, ;Perez, Eric, G;Perez, Francisco, ;Perez, Juan, O; Perez, Norberto, ;Perez, Samuel, ;Perez, Wilfred, ; Perez-Lundy, Carmen, A;Pericone, Wesley, R;Perrone, Thomas, ;Perry, Angela, ;Petai, Stephen, ;Peterkin, Jeffrey, L; Peters, Jr., Joseph, L;Peterson, Robert, E;Petraglia, Lawrence, ;Petrozzino, Salvatore, ;Phelan, James, J;Phelan, John, G;Phelan, Stephen, ;Piccirillo, Joseph, ;Pico, Miriam, M;Picone, John, T;Pietranico, Danny, ;Pilacek, Dolores, ;Pineiro, Luis, A;Pinnock, Dean, ;Pisciotta, Michael, J;Piscopo, Mark, ;Piwowarczyk, Stephen, ;Platero, Herbert, ;Polanco, Ramon, A;Policastro, Joseph, A;Polimeni, Jack, V;Ponticelli, Michael, J;Poolt, Richard, M;Porco, Elizabeth, ;Porfidio, Anthony, T;Porrazzo, Ronald, ;Postel, Todd, ;Prince, Princess, D;Quarmby, Paul, ;Queally, Robert, ;Quic, Edson, J;Quindara, Redence, ;Quinlan, Patrick, T; Quinn, Timothy. (rag)
April 17, 2003 Filing 49 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs Eason, Kimberly, L; Eckert, Thomas, J;Edwards, Randolph, ;EdwardsSr., Marvin, T; Egan, Andrew, ;Egan, Eric, ;Egner, Arthur, J;Eisert, James, ;El Hassen, Eileen, ;Elci, Hasan, C;Ellis, Onika, E; Emanuele, John, F;Emanuele, Joseph, ;Emhardt, Richard, ; Enchautegui, Daniel, ;Ernst, Michael, W;Ernst, Warren, J; Espinoza, Stephen, I;Esposito, Gerald, P;Etienne, Henry, ; Evans, Daniel, J;Evrley, Eric, J;Exposito, Antonio, ;Faber, Jack, ;Fagan, Ronald, ;Faivus, Joseph, ;Fajar, Joseph, ; Fajardo, Christopher, ;Falci, Joseph, D;Fallon, Patrick, ; Faronda, Anthony, C;Farrell, Conroy, ;Farrell, James, ; Farrell, Michael, W;Farrell, Robert, T;Fazio, Damon, ; Federico, Paul, P;Feil, Daniel, ;Felder, Gloria, ;Felder, Victoria, S;Feliz, Nelson, ;Feratovic, Safet, ;Ferguson, Lesly, R;Fernandez, Angel, G;Fernandez, Jr., Manuel, ; Ferraiolo, Richard, A;Ferrandino, Samuel, A;Ferrara, Frank, J;Ferrara, Paul, M;Ferrara, Peter, J;Ferriolo, Jr., Vincenzo, ;Figgers, Jr., Robert, M;Figueroa, Gustavo, ; Finamore, James, ;Finucane, Damian, ;Fiore, Anthony, ; Fiske, Terrence, M;Fleischmann, Brian, ;Fleming, Elizabeth, M;Fleming, John, ;Flores, Noel, ;Foley, Brendan, ;Fontaine, Matthew, ;Fontanez, Derrick, ;Ford, William, ;Forde, James, P;Forshey, Gregory, W;Forst, Dan, ;Fragiori, Jason, ; Fragiori, Stephen, ;Frawley, Marie, ;Frazer, Kenneth, E; Frein, Kevin, J;Frettoloso, Christopher, L;Frezza, John, ; Frias, Maria, ;Friedrich, Jr., Robert, J;Fuentes, Alberto, ; Fulmore, Jerry, L;Furboter, Daniel, J;Fuseyamore, Kevin, A; Gabielsen, Brian, ;Gaday, Stephen, ;Gaffney, Cheryl, ; Gaizo, MaryAnn, ;Galia, Frank, ;Galimi, Kevin, A;Gallagher, Matthew, ;Gallagher, Jr., Thomas, J;Galletta, Charles, A; Gallicchio, Alfred, J;Gamble-James, Cathy, L;Garcia, Herman, L;Garcia, Jose, R;Garofalo, Charlotte, ;Garris, Annette, ;Gasperi, Annette, ;Gazzola, John, P;Geiger, Karl, ;Genao, Katiria, ;Gentilesco, James, ;Gerdes, Jeffrey, ; Gerken, Steven, W;Giammona, Michael, ;Giardina, Salvatore, ; Gibson, Alan, D;Gibson, Thomas, A;Gierak, James, ;Gillen, John, P;Gillen, Kathleen, R;Gillespie, Kristine, A;Giorgi, Dean, A;Glassman, Steve, ;Gmelin, Frank, J;Going, Jr., Richard, B;Goldberg, David, E;Goldenberg, Andrew, ; Gonzalez, Angel, L;Gonzalez, Carlos, ;Gonzalez, Francisco, ; Gonzalez, Jerry, ;Gonzalez, Lamont, ;Goodman, Nelly, ; Gordon, Hugh, J;Gotay, Frank, A;Gough, Donald, F;Green, Lavette, ;Green, Ramona, ;Green, Roosevelt, ;Greene, Peter, H;Gregg, Sabrina, ;Groth, Daniel, L;Guadalupe, Andrea, ; Guarnaccia, Rudolph, G;Guarriello, Michael, ;Guglielmo, Sophie, ;Guidorl, Louis, ;Guiland, Joseph, ;Gurrera, Michael, ;Hachadoorian, John, ;Hager, Mark, C.;Halinski, David, ;Hall, Robert, ;Hallinan, Thomas, P;Halloran, John, ; Halpin, Michael, ;Hamer, Robert, C;Hamerick, Steven, ; Hamilton, Michael, ;Hankinson, Robert, ;Hanly, Steve, M.; Hansen, Shawn, ;Hanson, Donald, ;Hanson, Lloyd, ;Harrigan, Dennis, ;Harris, Geraldine, ;Harrison, Ayanna, ;Harry, Robin, ;Hastings, James, R;Hawkins, Annette, S;Heaney, Richard, J;Hefferman, Daniel, E;Heitner, Jonathan, D;Heller III, Robert, D;Helmer, Tyrone, ;Hendriks, Michael, J.; Herman, Stephen, L;Herrmann, Dorothy, ;Heuer, Glenn, ; Hidec, John, ;Higham, Craig, L.;Hill, Jeffrey, ;Hilmer, Erich, ;Hiltunen, Kevin, J;Hirdt, John, M.;Hirschman, Brian, ;Hirt, Jr., Stanley, ;Ho, Jack, F.;Hochman, Dell, ; Holgerson, Gregory, J.;Holzman, Ira, ;Hom, Steven, ;Hooper, Parris, ;Horan, Frank, ;Hornung, Diane, ;Horton, Velda, E; Huot, Christin, S.;Hurley, Sean, R.;Hurwitt, Michael, ; Hyer, Robert, ;Iacovides, Brian, ;Insauto, Paul, ;Irizarry, Jeanette, ;Irizarry, Suzette, ;Irizarry, Yvette, ;Iwasiuk, George, M;Jacaruso, Denise, ;Jackman, Victor, A;Jacobellis, Christopher, ;James-Bryant, Deborah, ;Jangel, Adam, ; Jasinski, Daniel, ;Javid, Tahir, ;Jawmusik, Robert, M; Joachim, Reginald, ;John, Gregory, ;Johnson, Christopher, ; Johnson II, Howard, A.;Jones, Christopher, M.;Jones, Demetria, ;Jones, Feris, D;Jones, Gregory, ;Jones, Michael, W;Jupiter, Rashida, ;Kahn, Brian, ;Kaifler, Jr., Wayne, ; Kaletsky, Colin, ;Kalies, Drew, A;Kalinsky, Benjamin, ; Kalmanowicz, Kris, ;Kaloudakis, Constantine, ;Kanaley, Patrick, ;Kane, Michael, C;Kane, Robert, ;Karger, Ken, ; Keane, Mortimer, J;Keane, Timothy, ;Kearse, Thomas, ; Keeney, Joseph, ;Keevan, Edward, F;Keiier, Anthony, C; Kelbick, Steven, ;Kelley, Alfred, B;Kells, Patricia, ; Kelly, Patricia, M;Kelly, Ricardo, C;Kelly, Steven, P; Kemper, Lawrence, ;Kennedy, Patrick, M;Kenny, Kevin, ; Kerlix, Louis-Jean, ;Khan, Shawn, ;Kielb, David, ;King, Christopher, ;King, Kimberly, W;King, Mark, ;King, Mark, A; King, Robert, ;Kirby, Robert, ;Kloos, Steven, ;Knauss, Michael, ;Koch, Glenn, ;Kohart, Joseph, A;Korede, Olaiya, ; Korner, Chris, ;Kosiv, M., ;Kucerak, Keith, W;Kutteh, Hani, ;Kutzing, Peter, B;Labellarte, Nino, ;Labianca, Dominick, K; Lai, Fanking, ;Laible, Thomas, J;Laietta, Thomas, ; Lamanque, Donald, ;Lamarche, Jayne, ;Lamendola, Joseph, A; Landolfi, John, ;Landry, Johnny, ;Langlois, Paul, ;LaPorte, John, P;Larick, Keith, A;Lasalle, Hector, M.;Lattanzi, John, F;Laviano, Joseph, ;Leavey, George, ;Lee, Clifford, ; Lee, Kevin, M;Lee, Patrick, ;LeeChong, Kenwen, J;Lefebure, Richard, ;Leghart, James, ;Lemieux, Jarrett, J;Lenahan, Jr., Edward, H;Leonard, Brian, ;Leonard, Thomas, J; Leonardi, Thomas, A;Leone, Vincent, ;Lestingi, Tammy, ; Lestiwgi, Tammy, ;Levine, Mark, ;Lewis, Maria, M;Leydon, Kenneth, M;Lilley, Howard, J;Lim, Taejin, ;Linehan, Thomas, ;Link, Robert, K;Liotta, Joseph, ;Lippert, Dave, ;Lisa, John, ;Little, Jr., Malcom, ;Llanos, Claudia, ;Lobasso, Anthony, ;Loeffel, Debra, L;Lomando, Arthur, J;Lomangino, Joseph, ;Lombardi, Robert, J;Lopez, Alexander, ;Lopez, Jessica, A;Lopez, John, ;Lopez, Juan, A;Lopez, Richard, ; Lopopolo, Lenny, ;Loreth, Michael, G;Lozano, Guillermo, ; Lozito, Angela, M;Lucas, Patricia, ;Luciano, Edna, C; Ludwig, Carl, ;Lukowski, Denise, ;Lulifero, Richard, M; Lundberg, Christopher, J;Lundie, James, T;Lupia, Thomas, S; Lynch, Catherine, ;Lynch, Kevin, ;Lyons, Kevin. (rag)
April 17, 2003 Filing 48 CONSENT TO Join Parties by Plaintiffs: Abbate, Gregg, A.; Abbruzzese, Michael; Abenante, Carl, J.;Abranko, Madelyn,; Abreu, Wally,; Abruzzese, Frank,; Accomando, Gregory, A.; Acevedo, Luis, A; Ackley, Martin, W.; Acosta, Wilson,; Acquauiua, John, M.; Adams, Jon, W.; Adams, Tony, ;Addeo, Michael, ;Addison, Christian, Agrillo, Anthony, ;Agugliaro, Richard,;Aguirre, Jose, L.;Aiello, Joseph, Alberts, Michael, C;Albertson, Michael, ;Alequin, Hilda, E.;Alfano, Steven, ;Ali, Michael,;Alicandro, Angelo, ;Alipo, Robert,; Allen, Christopher, J;Allison, Keith,;Alloro, Andrew, ; Alves, Peggy,;Amey, Randall, ;Amorasono, Miguele, ; Andreoli, Eric,;Anitra, Tony, J. ;Anspach, Stephen, A.; Antonellis, Robert, ;Ardito, Daniel, D.;Ardito, Vito, ; Armstrong, James, W.;Arnao, Richard, ;Arnioter, Peter, V.; Arrao, Daniel, ;Arroyo, Jaime, ;Ashby, Adrian, ;Asusta, Alan, ;Atristain, Luis,; Augello, Paul, ;Austin, Lavonne, ; Avellino, Joseph, ;Aynbinder, Semyon, Baez, John, ;Bahm, Joseph,;Bailey, Daniel, A.;Baio, Michael, D.;Balducci, Francis, J.;Balleste, Juan, R.;Balogh, John, ;Balsam, Kelly,;Balsamo, Vincent, ;Banks, Michael, H.;Bany, Peter, D.;Baranowski, Michael,; Barone, Jason, P.;Barone-Bauer, Josephine, ;Barreto, Samuel, ;Barricelle, Michael, ; Bartley, John, ;Baumann, Matthew, ;Bavuso, Joseph,;Baynes, Maureen, ;Beddows, Daniel, J;Bellantone, Anthony, ; Beltrami, Bryan,; Bennet, Lawrence, J.;Bennett, Keith, ; Berge, William, ;Bergmann, Kenneth, J.;Berlin, Craig, ; Berry, Robert, J.;Bertolino, Anthony, ;Bertone, Joseph, ; Beyrer, Thomas,;Bhatti, A., ;Bianchi, Luz, I.;Bifulco, Eugene, ;Bilella, Robert, ;Biscardi, Suzanne, ;Biscardi, Suzanne, ;Bissinger, Sean,E.;Black, Thomas, J.;Blasi, Regina, ;Blethen, Andrew, ;Blomquist, Richard, W.; Blumenberg, Gillerma, T.;Bobillier, Mauricio, ;Bogalki, James, ;Bombaci, Ryan, ;Bonamo, Jr., Joseph, R.;Bonanno, Anthony, J.;Bonardi, Richard,;Booncome, Urit,;Borgi, Jr., Carl, J.;Bovo, Laurene, M Bowden, Lorraine, ;Boyle, Margaret, ;Bracero, Mike, ;Bradley, Tracy, M. Brady, Colleen, M.;Brancato, Laine, A.;Branch, Richard, ;Braun, Hermann,;Brea, Richard, ;Brech, Michael, ;Breslin, Edward, ; Brisbane, Loida, ;Brodarick, Michael, A;Brodowski, Richard, T.;Brosnan, Francis, Brotherson, Kirk, ;Brown, David, C.; Browne, Robert, P.;Brunjes, Richard, J.;Brunner, Donna,; Brussell, James,;Buccellato, Vito,;Budovsky, David,; Burke, Michael,;Burke, Thomas, J.;Burke, William, M.;Burns, Scott,; Buttigieg, Reno, J.;Bynum, Michael, A.;Caban, Joann,; Caeser, Colin,;Cainrowe, Darlene, Y;Caldero, Luis, M; Calderone, Michael, A.; Calhoun, Gary, ;Caliguri, Michael,; Calloway, Julie,;Camarda, MaryAnn,; Campagna, Daniel, ; Campbell, James, R;Campisi, Christine, M.;Campo, Michael, ; Candela, Vincent, H;Canela, Maximo, ;Capo, Jesus, M; Capobianco, Barbara,;Carambot, Louis, ;Carbonell, Frank,; Cardone, Paul, ;Carlies, Elissa,;Carlo, Joseph,;Carlucci, Anthony, ;Carpenter, Vanessa, J.;Carra, John, ;Carrillo, Anaida,;Carson, Kathleen, ;Carson, Keith, ;Carucci, Robert, ;Casesia, Anthony, ;Cassidy, Michael, S.;Castel, Paul, ; Castellano, Debra, A.;Castro, Hector, A;Caton, Jeff, ; Cavanagh, Alfred, ;Cavanaugh, Michael,;Cave, Patricia, ; Cavendish, Stephen, ;Cayne, Mark,;Cecchetti, Paul,;Cernuto, Jr, John, ;Cerulli, Heather,;Cervantes, John, R.;Cesarski, Dagmara,;Chadwick, Helen, H;Chamberlain, Brendan, T;Chan, Dennis,;Chandu, Mahaan,;Chang, Kevin, Y.H.;Chetaitis, Jeannette,;Chevins, Paul, ;Chiarelli, Vincent,; Chin, Lola, M;Chow, Byron, ;Chronis, Peter, M.;Chung, Jimmy, S; Ciccarelli, John,;Circosta, Vincent, ;Cirino, Annette, C; Clancy, Kevin,;G.;Clark, John, E;Clark, John, M.;Cochrane, Stephen,; Cohen, Marc, S.;Colarossi, John,;Colavito, Joseph, T.;Coleman, Michael,; Coll, James, L;Collins, Daniel, P.;Colon, Angel, L.;Colon, John,;Colon, John, ; Colon, Marisol,;Colon, Marisol,;Colon, Ricardo,;Condon, Steven,; Conners, Charles, ;Connolly, Christopher,; Connolly, Daniel, ;Conway, Mark, ;Conway, William, ;Cooper, Brian, K.;Coppa, Luciano,;Coppola, Joseph, ;Corbett, Robert, ;Corbisiero, Michael, ;Cordero, Cesar, E.;Corio, Daniel, J.;Corvato, Michael, A.;Corvi, Michael, ;Cosban, Robert,;Cotter, Mary, E.;Cotto, Christian, ;Coyle, Robert, H;Coyle, William, J.;Crachiola, Justin, ;Craig, Lucius, ; Crane, Peter, ;Crawford, Lerone,;Creighton, John, M;Crespo, Carlos, ;Cromwell, Neal, ;Crowley, Matthew, ;Cruger, Jr., Robert, A.;Cruz, Denyse, E;Cruz, Edwin, ;Cruz-Ramos, Cynthia, M.; Cuadrado, Yolanda, ;Cumberbatch, Todd, G; Curry, Kimberly, ;Cussmawo,; Michael, Paul;Custodio, Richard, ;D'Acunto, John,;D'Agostino, James, ;D'Alessandro, Michael, ;D'Alessandro, Robert,; D'Alto, Michael, A;Daly, Michael, G;Daly, Robert, M;D'Amico, Jamie, ; Dao, Quang, K; Darmstadt, Adam, ;D'Augusta, David, ;David, Dena, ;Davis, Aida, E;Davis, Robert,;Davis, Jr., William,;Dawber, Darrin, ; Day, John, ;De Los Santos, Luis,;De Allaume, Joseph, ;De Bellis, Jr., Joseph, ;De Bonis, Daniel, F;De Curtis, Alicia, ;De Falco, Mary, E;De Jesus, Jose, ;Delatore, Marcel, A;Delgado, Elvis,;Delgrosso, Madeline,; Dellavalle, Marco, ;De Los Rios, Alfred, ;Del Priore, Richard, ;De Luca, Steven, ;De Luise, Christopher, M;Delvalle, Geraldo,; Delvalle-Sanchez, Dawn, ;De Maria, Russell,;De Mato, Frank, J;De Morato, Joseph, A; Dengate, Raymond, ;Denton, Lisa, J; De Oliveira, Craig, ;Depoian, Lee, D D'Erasmo, Anthony, ; Deriso, Christina,;De Rubio, Christopher,;Desouza, Owen, ; Detres, Gladys, ;Devine, Kevin, R;Di Iorio, Paul, G;Diaz, Pedro, ; Diaz, Victor, ;Di Canio, Joseph, C;Di Carlantonio, John, ;Di Christina, Frank, Di Geronimo, Steven, J;Di Leo, David, J;Diliberto, Jr., Francis, S;Dillon, Paul, ;Di Maggio, Jr., Giuseppe, ;Di Marco, Salvatore,;Di Maria, Ronald, ;Di Nella, Joseph,;Di Nicola, Alain,;Di Niso, Vito,; Diorio, John,; Di Pasquale, Chris, ;Di Salvo, David, A; Dito, Phillip, G;Di Veglio, Michael,;Doerzbagher, Scott,; Dollop, Michael, ;Donahoo, Tracy,;Donato, Michael, R; Donlin, Jr., James,;Donnelly, Mark,;Dorsett, Andrew, ; Dougherty, James,;Douglas, Anthony, W;Doyle, Michael,; Dragonetti, Paul, P;Dubas, Andrew, L;Dunn, Thomas, E; Dunphy, Michael,. (rag)
April 14, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [45-1] order for Charles C. Jackson and Edward W. Bergmann to appear pro hac vice for defts City of NY and NYCPD and that a copy of this Order be served upon all counsel of record within 5 days hereof, [45-2] relief in the amount of $50.00 paid on 4/14/03 Receipt # 470172. (sb)
April 8, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, for Charles C. Jackson and Edward W. Bergmann to appear pro hac vice for defts City of NY and NYCPD and that a copy of this Order be served upon all counsel of record within 5 days hereof ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (cd)
April 7, 2003 Filing 47 Text not available.
April 2, 2003 Filing 44 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
April 2, 2003 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (jw)
March 28, 2003 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint by City of New York, N.Y.C.P.D. (Attorney Lorie E. Almon, Peter A. Walker from the Firm: Seyfarth, Shaw). Received in night deposit on 3/28/03 at 6:19 p.m. (jco)
March 25, 2003 Filing 42 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
March 17, 2003 Filing 41 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
March 14, 2003 Filing 40 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Michele A. Molfetta, dated 03/10/03; reset answer to amended complaint due for 3/28/03 for N.Y.C.P.D., for City of New York ; the conference has been re-scheduled to April 2, 2003 at 4:30 p.m. ; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies faxed by Chambers; (djc)
March 7, 2003 Filing 39 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 37 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 36 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 35 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 34 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 33 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 32 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 31 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 30 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 28, 2003 Filing 29 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 27, 2003 Filing 38 Filing of CONSENT TO Join Action (jol)
February 27, 2003 Filing 28 CONSENT TO join action (jol)
February 24, 2003 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT; JURY DEMAND; by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino (Answer due 3/6/03 for N.Y.C.P.D., for City of New York) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (sac)
February 21, 2003 Filing 27 FILING OF CONSENT TO join action by plaintiffs (yv)
February 14, 2003 Filing 22 Filing of CONSENT TO join action (yv)
February 14, 2003 Filing 19 FILING OF CONSENT TO join action (yv)
February 13, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order admitting attorney pro hac vice; William B. Aitchison and James D. Brown are admitted pro hac vice and shall be permitted to act as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Forwarded original document to Attorney Admissions Clerk. (sb) Modified on 02/20/2003
February 11, 2003 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin . (sac)
February 10, 2003 Filing 14 FILING OF CONSENT TO Join Action by Plaintiffs as set forth in this document. (gf)
February 4, 2003 Filing 26 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 4, 2003 Filing 25 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiffs hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 4, 2003 Filing 24 Pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b), plaintiff hereby file their consent to join action. (ja)
February 4, 2003 Filing 21 CONSENT TO join action, pursuant to Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, 29 USC 216(b). (ja)
February 4, 2003 Filing 20 CONSENT TO join action (ja)
February 4, 2003 Filing 17 FILING OF CONSENT TO join action by the plaintiffs as set forth in this document. (gf)
February 4, 2003 Filing 16 FILING OF CONSENT TO join action by plaintiffs as set forth in this action. (gf)
February 4, 2003 Filing 15 FILING of CONSENT TO join action by Plaintiffs as set forth in this document. (gf)
February 4, 2003 Filing 13 CONSENT TO Join Action by Albert R. Acierno, Junto C. Acosta, Nora Ahmed, Thomas Ailman, James J. Alexander, Donald G. Allen, Robert Amaniera, Mark Amato, Andrew Amplo, Edward Anderson, Peter Andre, Joseph A. Angerome, William Anthony, Thomas Aquila, Karen Arena, Timothy Askin, Colin Austin, Thomas Avery, Edward Azueta, John Azzarello, Thomas Bacon, Brenda Bacote, Arman Baksh, Joseph I. Balzano, John Barone, Patrick Barrett, Robert Barrett, Damon K. Barriteau, Joseph Baruso, John Batanus, Robert Bayer, Dady Belfort, Brian M. Benedict, Richard Bennick, Gina Bentivegna, Jules C. Bernadotte, Christopher J. Betz, Philip Bilello Jr., James T. Biller, Joseph Birbiglia, Michael Blendo, Lucia Bodden, James Bogliole, Janine A. Bohan, Maureen Bolembach, Edward J. Bowler, Emmanuel T. Bowser, Kenneth Bray, Scott V. Brenes, Thomas J. Brennan, Timothy Brennas, Paul Briscoe, Nigel W.C. Bristow, Marisol Brito, Timothy Brown, Martin P. Browne, William G. Brownell, Christine Gonzalez Bruen, Albert Brust, William Burns, Calvin L. Burton, Neida E. Cadiz, Michael Calamari, Margaret Callaghan, Neal Campbell, John Carey, Joseph Carlo, James Carron, Guillermo Cartagena, Jennifer Caruso, Frank Casaburi, Brendan Cassar, Michael Cassidy, Dawn Castellano, John Castellanos, Joseph Castiglione, Frank Castro, George Cervone, David Chiavola, Pat Chirico, David V. Ciatiello, Louis Cicatiello, Lethimyle Cleveland, James Clontz, Wesley J. Cochrane, Joseph Costanza, Keith J. Costanzo, Eugene T. Coughlin, Paul C. Cox, Jose J. Criollo, Joseph P. Cromwell, Michael Cuccaro, Saverio Cuda, Anthony Curatolo, Joshua Czyz, John W. D'Erasmo, Pierre R. Daguizan, Brian Daly, Dennis N. Darcy, Eric Dargenio, Ylli Dautaj, Charles E. Davie III, Michael P. Davis, Silvia Davis, Thomas W. Davis, Henry O. De La Cruz, Daryl Deixler, Luis A. Delgado, Joseph Delorenzo, Jose DelRosario, Dominick DelVecchio, Eugene DeMar, Christopher DeMuro, David Graham Denton, Joseph Deo, Thomas DePalo, Frederick E. Derenthal III, Michael DeRose, Thomas DeSena, Mario DesRuisseaux, Richard Diana, Richardo Diaz, Timothy Diaz, Frank A. DiGraziano, Frank DiGregorio, Daniel DiPiazza, Michael J. DiVirgilio, Stephen DiVito, Epifanio Dobbs, George L. Doerner, Julia Dombrowski, Cynthia Donaldson, James Donnelly, William J. Donohue, Robert Doremus, Edward Dougherty, Tammi Doyle, Robert Dreeben, George Duonocere, Tyrone Dux, Michael S. Dwyer, Melissa A. Eger, John Elliott, Lyndon Elliott, Qaizad Engineer, Trisha Ensley, Anthony Esposa. (sb)
January 27, 2003 Filing 12 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Michele A. Molfetta, dated 1/23/03; Defendant's request to adjourn the 1/27/03 conference is hereby granted. The conference will now be held on 2/11/03 at 4:30 p.m. . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (ae)
January 21, 2003 Filing 11 CONSENT TO join action by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino, Sebastian Acosta, Desi Alvarez, Louis C. Amen, Vincent Aprea, Cassius N. Bennett, Michael J. Ciampo, John N. Ciotola, Anthony C. Clemente, James Edelstein, Anthony Fergerson, Alice Figueroa, Patrick T. Giblin, Leslie Grant, Daryl Harris, Peter Hart, Eric Johnson, Joseph J. Kearney, Edward Kleinpeter, Douglas R. Kozlik, Fred J. Krines, Patrick Lamberson, Ronald Lang, Dana Lanzarone, Baron Lewis, Michael Luconte, Kenneth Lowy, Marcelo Luc, Robert Maldonado, Nicholas Martiny, David M. McLean, Kevin Mikalonis, Nikos Mitsinikos, Basanite Mohar, Joseph J. Monte, Alma Montes, Juan A. Ortiz, Alvin L. Pahne, Stuart Portner, Raymond Ryan, Alice Schlagler, Henry Schuhay, Aynbinder Semyon, Israel Sexton, Abbaas Shepard, Kenneth Smith, Efren Torres, Arber Uruci, Timothy Vella, Kim Vega, Edward Washington, Joseph Wilhelm, Michael Wyer, Gerard A. Alfano, Bruce Arch, Michael Calandra, John Cervenka, Michael Coppola, Jose Cruz, Robert Davison, Michael C. DeMartino, Joseph Dennis, Robert Diercks, Nicholas DiPalo, Carl Anthony Dyer, David Goldstein, Thomas Hellem, James Hursala, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Joseph Marinello, Brian McAllister, Sean A. O'Donohue, John O'Driscoll, Scott Olenick, Brian Pfisterer, Edwin Ramirez III, Richard Reinhardt, Kenneth Rinaldi, Daniel Ryan, Keenan M. Scott, Robert W. Seimer, Sean Staten, Barbara M. Taska, John Trotter, Brian M. Wimpelberg (yv)
January 14, 2003 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of Consent To Join Action by the listed individuals, by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino . (cd)
January 14, 2003 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Join Aaction by the listed individuals, by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino . (cd)
January 14, 2003 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Join action by the listed individuals, by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino (cd)
December 30, 2002 Filing 7 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Michele A. Molfetta, dated 12/27/02. Re: counsel for dft's (with consent from counsel for pltff) requests an enlargement of time until 2/10/03 to respond to the complaint. Dft's request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint is hereby granted. Dft's response is now due on 2/10/03. NO further adjournments . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (db)
December 19, 2002 Filing 6 CONSENT of employees of dft City of New York as further set forth in this consent, to join action as plaintiffs. (dle)
December 19, 2002 Filing 5 CONSENT of the employees of dft City of New York as further set forth in this filing of consent, to join this action as plaintiffs by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino (dle)
December 16, 2002 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to N.Y.C.P.D. by Lilmaria Echavarria on 12/13/02 . Answer due on 1/2/03 for N.Y.C.P.D. . (dle)
December 16, 2002 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to City of New York by Lilmaria Echavarria on 12/13/02 . Answer due on 1/2/03 for City of New York . (dle)
November 27, 2002 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gmo)
November 27, 2002 Filing 2 RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Keenan M. Scott, Thomas Logan, John Loomis, Robert Davidson, Michael C. Demartino . (gmo)
November 27, 2002 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 458384. (gmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott, et al v. City of New York, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Marini
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Marko
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphonse J. Marrazzo
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Marte
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Martinez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Martinez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Mazara
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Mazza
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. McAteer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. McCrain
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan McGinn
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G. McKenna
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence McKinney
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. McLoughlin
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl McQueen
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol P. Meagher
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Melendez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Melofiro
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Menendez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariela Merced
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina M. Meyer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michailidos
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. Minarczyk
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewkoemar Mohan
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Miller
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Molen
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moorer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony P. Morales
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Morales, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Moritz
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Moritz
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Moulterie
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliyah Muhammad
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Napolitano
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Natoli
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Oakes
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Ojeda
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne O'Keefe
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine O'Malley
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Oquendo
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Orski
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Ortiz
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Ospina
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Palumbo
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Parks
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa M. Paulino
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward D. Paynter
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan J. Pena
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raudo R. Pena
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey A. Pendarvis
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario R. Penta
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Perez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Petrizzi
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald K. Phillips
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Picaroi
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Pierre-Louis
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luigi Pinello
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Pisano
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Pizarro
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O. Plaitis
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Plummer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Ponticelli
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Prasad
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee D. Puliga
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen C. Puliga
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ramirez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hansa V. Randall
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert ReBovich
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Reeves
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter J. Reph
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Riggins
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rivera
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Rivera
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro E. Rivera
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martitza Robles
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Rodriguez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonides Rodriguez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nivia Rodriguez
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William K. Roe
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Rosado
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilma L. Rosario
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rosser
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Ryan
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ryan
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Ryan
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P. Ryley
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernado Salaman
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Samont
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sanabria
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Sanabria
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venus Santiago
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Sanzone
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jay Saxe
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Sbarra
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Scanlan
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schuierer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schweickert
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scomillio
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Scordato
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G. Senenfelder
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel W. Sharkey
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Sheil
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald R. Sherlock
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin C. Sills
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Sinatra
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward R. Sinclair
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Sinclair
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Singleton
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Slackman
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Smith
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Smith
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Smith
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Soisson
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Solimine
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony John Spagna
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Speer
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Spruill
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A. Stern
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Stremel
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal D. Summers
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheival Surujballi
Represented By: John T. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [