Holley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs, Noel Flores, Carlos Proctor, Wanda Stokes James, Shane Priddy, Richard O'Quain, Margaret Beacham, Khaliq Muhammad, Hector Manuel Bedoya, Kyle Malone, David Zajac, William Saunders, Anthony Tyrone Jackson, David Maloney, Christian Torres, Duane Lewis, Anthony B. Wilson, Laquisha Park, Ruby Altameemy, Rodger Brunson, Robert Sackett, Antiqua Shirley, Mark D. DeCosta, Stephen Duane Miller, Wilton Towe, Bradley McDonald, Renne Black, Dinah Hardy, DAvid O'Neal Bozeman, Grace Marie Thomas, Michael Tribble, Patricia Ann Briley, Curtis Pritchett, Colette Eva Gilmer, Millicent Yvette Foster, Claudio Moreira, Scott Wascher, Cynthia Durant, Barry Weatherley, Kenneth Taroy, Aloysius William Reiter, Alvin Washington, Adrian Holley, Tamara Perry, Christine Cope, Demetrius Waters, Dennis Phillips, Jermaine Carter, Jerry Miller, Shaylene S. Johnson, Mel M. Allen, Clarence E. Southall, Jr., Earl Roberts, Martin W. Cooper, John Lee Pullen, Dameco Gates, David Johnson, Kevin McQuay, Herbie D. DeHorney, Dwayne Ross, Melvin Snoddy, Tony Hooker, Anthony Adams, Daniel Schenske-Shelton, Kent Horen, Raymond McNary-Willis, William Patterson, Jr., Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr., Shajuana Pope, Patricia Michelle Fields, Mark David Killeen, Matthew Yale, Kenyon Detai Belyeu, Michael Williams, Willie Daniel Turner, Victor Williams, Annette Cannon Johnson, Andrew Gudgel, Latanga Sparks, Phyllis Malone, Ronnie A. Powers, Kelly Gardner, Daryl Lindsay, Tammy Frazier, Kimberly Porter, Antonio Lavelle Jackson, Gergory Allan Myers, Georgia Elaine Tanner, Marisa Dubose, Rhonda Faye Cook, Wayne Albert Sage, Emily Jean Butler, Gloria Lynn Green, Raymond Pressley, Dushawn Walker, Maurizio Marchese, Troy Oberholtzer, Darryl Flammer, Sabrina Dooley, Mark Williams, Kenneth Smith, Faykeita Dunbar Wearing, Nicholas Jones, Ronald Alan Conner, Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith, Levine Levingston-Jones, Lela Wilson, Juan Villarreal, Sr., Tony Martin, Marcus McCoy, Darron Barnes, Roderick Eugene Cooper, Katina Hall, Brandon Sledge, Elizabeth Anne Flournoy, Jamal Loranso Smith, Deshawn C. Mitchell, Stacey Cook, David Gonzales, John Doe, 1, Stephen Calhoun, Emmanuel Desire, Daniel J. McClean, Antonio Kincey, Gilbert James, Kelvin McCall, Peter Parmenter, Russell Seelye, Kathi Ray, Trevyon Willis, Cynthia Lorraine Spears, Douglas Leroy Phipps, Matthew Jon Crenshaw, D'Andre L. Hale, Richard Mooney, Robert Lee Davis, Jr., Jermaine Fleming, Brian Maxey, Felipe June Quiambao, Bettie Jean Thomas, Barry Todd Moses, Earl Roberts, III and Trevyon Paul Ryan Willis
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06972
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons filed by Anthony Adams, Mel M. Allen, Ruby Altameemy, Darron Barnes, Margaret Beacham, Hector Manuel Bedoya, Kenyon Detai Belyeu, Renne Black, DAvid O'Neal Bozeman, Patricia Ann Briley, Rodger Brunson, Emily Jean Butler, Stephen Calhoun, Jermaine Carter, Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr, Ronald Alan Conner, Rhonda Faye Cook, Stacey Cook, Martin W. Cooper, Roderick Eugene Cooper, Christine Cope, Matthew Jon Crenshaw, Robert Lee Davis, Jr, Mark D. DeCosta, Herbie D. DeHorney, Emmanuel Desire, Sabrina Dooley, Marisa Dubose, Cynthia Durant, Patricia Michelle Fields, Darryl Flammer, Jermaine Fleming, Noel Flores, Elizabeth Anne Flournoy, Millicent Yvette Foster, Tammy Frazier, Kelly Gardner, Dameco Gates, Colette Eva Gilmer, David Gonzales, Gloria Lynn Green, Andrew Gudgel, D'Andre L. Hale, Katina Hall, Dinah Hardy, Adrian Holley, Tony Hooker, Kent Horen, Anthony Tyrone Jackson, Antonio Lavelle Jackson, Gilbert James, Wanda Stokes James, Annette Cannon Johnson, David Johnson, Shaylene S. Johnson, Nicholas Jones, Mark David Killeen, Antonio Kincey, Levine Levingston-Jones, Duane Lewis, Daryl Lindsay, Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith, Kyle Malone, Phyllis Malone, David Maloney, Maurizio Marchese, Tony Martin, Brian Maxey, Kelvin McCall, Daniel J. McClean, Marcus McCoy, Bradley McDonald, Raymond McNary-Willis, Kevin McQuay, Jerry Miller, Stephen Duane Miller, Deshawn C. Mitchell, Richard Mooney, Claudio Moreira, Barry Todd Moses, Khaliq Muhammad, Gergory Allan Myers, Richard O'Quain, Troy Oberholtzer, Laquisha Park, Peter Parmenter, William Patterson, Jr, Tamara Perry, Dennis Phillips, Douglas Leroy Phipps, Shajuana Pope, Kimberly Porter, Ronnie A. Powers, Raymond Pressley, Shane Priddy, Curtis Pritchett, Carlos Proctor, John Lee Pullen, Felipe June Quiambao, Kathi Ray, Aloysius William Reiter, Earl Roberts, III, Dwayne Ross, Robert Sackett, Wayne Albert Sage, William Saunders, Daniel Schenske-Shelton, Russell Seelye, Antiqua Shirley, Brandon Sledge, Jamal Loranso Smith, Kenneth Smith, Melvin Snoddy, Clarence E. Southall, Jr., Latanga Sparks, Cynthia Lorraine Spears, Georgia Elaine Tanner, Kenneth Taroy, Bettie Jean Thomas, Grace Marie Thomas, Christian Torres, Wilton Towe, Michael Tribble, Willie Daniel Turner, Juan Villarreal, Sr, Dushawn Walker, Scott Wascher, Alvin Washington, Demetrius Waters, Faykeita Dunbar Wearing, Barry Weatherley, Mark Williams, Michael Williams, Victor Williams, Trevyon Paul Ryan Willis, Anthony B. Wilson, Lela Wilson, Matthew Yale, David Zajac (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Elaine Pole (Pole, Debra) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS re #20 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. Motion to dismiss due by 1/25/2019. Responses due by 3/11/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 Declaration of Joshua E Anderson in Support of #20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed byGilead Sciences, Inc.. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 Certification of Interested Entities or Parties filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gilead Sciences, Inc. for Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Eugene Anderson (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia Ann Degen (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Calhoun, Darron Barnes, Mark Williams, Kelly Gardner, Ruby Altameemy, Patricia Ann Briley, Brian Maxey, Shaylene S. Johnson, Bradley McDonald, Douglas Leroy Phipps, Georgia Elaine Tanner, Cynthia Lorraine Spears, Levine Levingston-Jones, Gloria Lynn Green, Mel M. Allen, Christian Torres, Rhonda Faye Cook, Mark David Killeen, Daniel Schenske-Shelton, David Gonzales, Antonio Kincey, Khaliq Muhammad, Matthew Yale, Raymond McNary-Willis, Jerry Miller, Dameco Gates, William Patterson, Jr, Roderick Eugene Cooper, Grace Marie Thomas, Bettie Jean Thomas, Wayne Albert Sage, Laquisha Park, Hector Manuel Bedoya, Kenneth Smith, Noel Flores, Margaret Beacham, Kenyon Detai Belyeu, Jamal Loranso Smith, John Lee Pullen, William Saunders, Tamara Perry, Brandon Sledge, Adrian Holley, Latanga Sparks, Richard Mooney, Victor Williams, Barry Weatherley, Kathi Ray, Robert Lee Davis, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Flournoy, Colette Eva Gilmer, Willie Daniel Turner, Peter Parmenter, Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith, Tony Hooker, Scott Wascher, Kimberly Porter, Claudio Moreira, Melvin Snoddy, Stacey Cook, Dwayne Ross, Anthony B. Wilson, Michael Williams, David Maloney, Ronnie A. Powers, Dinah Hardy, Andrew Gudgel, Darryl Flammer, Jermaine Carter, Christine Cope, Anthony Adams, Cynthia Durant, Kyle Malone, Russell Seelye, Millicent Yvette Foster, Kelvin McCall, Kenneth Taroy, Herbie D. DeHorney, Renne Black, Rodger Brunson, Matthew Jon Crenshaw, Patricia Michelle Fields, Antiqua Shirley, Robert Sackett, Martin W. Cooper, Raymond Pressley, Earl Roberts, III, Marisa Dubose, Kevin McQuay, Trevyon Paul Ryan Willis, Shane Priddy, Emily Jean Butler, David Zajac, Jermaine Fleming, Michael Tribble, Antonio Lavelle Jackson, Dennis Phillips, Faykeita Dunbar Wearing, Gilbert James, Duane Lewis, Carlos Proctor, Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr, Katina Hall, Juan Villarreal, Sr, Wanda Stokes James, Mark D. DeCosta, Ronald Alan Conner, Daniel J. McClean, Wilton Towe, Nicholas Jones, Stephen Duane Miller, Curtis Pritchett, D'Andre L. Hale, Sabrina Dooley, Lela Wilson, Kent Horen, Troy Oberholtzer, Demetrius Waters, Gergory Allan Myers, Tammy Frazier, Felipe June Quiambao, Shajuana Pope, Deshawn C. Mitchell, Clarence E. Southall, Jr., Dushawn Walker, Barry Todd Moses, Phyllis Malone, Annette Cannon Johnson, Marcus McCoy, David Johnson, Aloysius William Reiter, Maurizio Marchese, Anthony Tyrone Jackson, Emmanuel Desire, Richard O'Quain, DAvid O'Neal Bozeman, Alvin Washington, Daryl Lindsay, Tony Martin. All Defendants. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/21/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Anne F. Johnson, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12867084) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12867054) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Adams, Mel M. Allen, Ruby Altameemy, Darron Barnes, Margaret Beacham, Hector Manuel Bedoya, Kenyon Detai Belyeu, Renne Black, DAvid O'Neal Bozeman, Patricia Ann Briley, Rodger Brunson, Emily Jean Butler, Stephen Calhoun, Jermaine Carter, Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr, Ronald Alan Conner, Rhonda Faye Cook, Stacey Cook, Martin W. Cooper, Roderick Eugene Cooper, Christine Cope, Matthew Jon Crenshaw, Robert Lee Davis, Jr, Mark D. DeCosta, Herbie D. DeHorney, Emmanuel Desire, John Doe, 1, Sabrina Dooley, Marisa Dubose, Cynthia Durant, Patricia Michelle Fields, Darryl Flammer, Jermaine Fleming, Noel Flores, Elizabeth Anne Flournoy, Millicent Yvette Foster, Tammy Frazier, Kelly Gardner, Dameco Gates, Colette Eva Gilmer, David Gonzales, Gloria Lynn Green, Andrew Gudgel, D'Andre L. Hale, Katina Hall, Dinah Hardy, Adrian Holley, Tony Hooker, Kent Horen, Anthony Tyrone Jackson, Antonio Lavelle Jackson, Gilbert James, Wanda Stokes James, Annette Cannon Johnson, David Johnson, Shaylene S. Johnson, Nicholas Jones, Mark David Killeen, Antonio Kincey, Levine Levingston-Jones, Duane Lewis, Daryl Lindsay, Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith, Kyle Malone, Phyllis Malone, David Maloney, Maurizio Marchese, Tony Martin, Brian Maxey, Kelvin McCall, Daniel J. McClean, Marcus McCoy, Bradley McDonald, Raymond McNary-Willis, Kevin McQuay, Jerry Miller, Stephen Duane Miller, Deshawn C. Mitchell, Richard Mooney, Claudio Moreira, Barry Todd Moses, Khaliq Muhammad, Gergory Allan Myers, Richard O'Quain, Troy Oberholtzer, Laquisha Park, Peter Parmenter, William Patterson, Jr, Tamara Perry, Dennis Phillips, Douglas Leroy Phipps, Shajuana Pope, Kimberly Porter, Ronnie A. Powers, Raymond Pressley, Shane Priddy, Curtis Pritchett, Carlos Proctor, John Lee Pullen, Felipe June Quiambao, Kathi Ray, Aloysius William Reiter, Earl Roberts, III, Dwayne Ross, Robert Sackett, Wayne Albert Sage, William Saunders, Daniel Schenske-Shelton, Russell Seelye, Antiqua Shirley, Brandon Sledge, Jamal Loranso Smith, Kenneth Smith, Melvin Snoddy, Clarence E. Southall, Jr., Latanga Sparks, Cynthia Lorraine Spears, Georgia Elaine Tanner, Kenneth Taroy, Bettie Jean Thomas, Grace Marie Thomas, Christian Torres, Wilton Towe, Michael Tribble, Willie Daniel Turner, Juan Villarreal, Sr, Dushawn Walker, Scott Wascher, Alvin Washington, Demetrius Waters, Faykeita Dunbar Wearing, Barry Weatherley, Mark Williams, Michael Williams, Victor Williams, Trevyon Paul Ryan Willis, Anthony B. Wilson, Lela Wilson, Matthew Yale, David Zajac.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 01:30 PM. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12855887). Filed by Stephen Calhoun, Darron Barnes, Mark Williams, Kelly Gardner, Ruby Altameemy, Patricia Ann Briley, Brian Maxey, Shaylene S. Johnson, Bradley McDonald, Douglas Leroy Phipps, Georgia Elaine Tanner, Cynthia Lorraine Spears, Levine Levingston-Jones, Gloria Lynn Green, Mel M. Allen, Christian Torres, Rhonda Faye Cook, Mark David Killeen, Daniel Schenske-Shelton, David Gonzales, Antonio Kincey, Khaliq Muhammad, Matthew Yale, Raymond McNary-Willis, Jerry Miller, Dameco Gates, William Patterson, Jr, Roderick Eugene Cooper, Grace Marie Thomas, Bettie Jean Thomas, Wayne Albert Sage, Laquisha Park, Hector Manuel Bedoya, Kenneth Smith, Noel Flores, Margaret Beacham, Kenyon Detai Belyeu, Jamal Loranso Smith, John Lee Pullen, William Saunders, Tamara Perry, Brandon Sledge, Adrian Holley, Latanga Sparks, Richard Mooney, Victor Williams, Barry Weatherley, Kathi Ray, Robert Lee Davis, Jr, Elizabeth Anne Flournoy, Colette Eva Gilmer, Willie Daniel Turner, Peter Parmenter, Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith, Tony Hooker, Scott Wascher, Kimberly Porter, Claudio Moreira, Melvin Snoddy, Stacey Cook, Dwayne Ross, Anthony B. Wilson, Michael Williams, David Maloney, Ronnie A. Powers, Dinah Hardy, Andrew Gudgel, Darryl Flammer, Jermaine Carter, Christine Cope, Anthony Adams, Cynthia Durant, Kyle Malone, Russell Seelye, Millicent Yvette Foster, Kelvin McCall, Kenneth Taroy, Herbie D. DeHorney, Renne Black, Rodger Brunson, Matthew Jon Crenshaw, Patricia Michelle Fields, Antiqua Shirley, Robert Sackett, Martin W. Cooper, Raymond Pressley, Earl Roberts, Marisa Dubose, Kevin McQuay, Trevyon Willis, Shane Priddy, Emily Jean Butler, David Zajac, Jermaine Fleming, Michael Tribble, Antonio Lavelle Jackson, Dennis Phillips, Faykeita Dunbar Wearing, Gilbert James, John Doe, 1, Duane Lewis, Carlos Proctor, Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr, Katina Hall, Juan Villarreal, Sr, Wanda Stokes James, Mark D. DeCosta, Ronald Alan Conner, Daniel J. McClean, Wilton Towe, Nicholas Jones, Stephen Duane Miller, Curtis Pritchett, D'Andre L. Hale, Sabrina Dooley, Lela Wilson, Demetrius Waters, Kent Horen, Troy Oberholtzer, Gergory Allan Myers, Tammy Frazier, Felipe June Quiambao, Shajuana Pope, Deshawn C. Mitchell, Clarence E. Southall, Jr., Dushawn Walker, Barry Todd Moses, Phyllis Malone, Annette Cannon Johnson, Marcus McCoy, David Johnson, Aloysius William Reiter, Maurizio Marchese, Anthony Tyrone Jackson, Emmanuel Desire, Richard O'Quain, DAvid O'Neal Bozeman, Alvin Washington, Daryl Lindsay, Tony Martin. (Attachments: #(1) Attachment A - Notice Letter, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 11/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holley et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Flores
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Proctor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Stokes James
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Priddy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard O'Quain
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Beacham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaliq Muhammad
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Manuel Bedoya
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Malone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zajac
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Saunders
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tyrone Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Maloney
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Torres
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Lewis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony B. Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquisha Park
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Altameemy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Brunson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sackett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antiqua Shirley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark D. DeCosta
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Duane Miller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton Towe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley McDonald
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renne Black
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinah Hardy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAvid O'Neal Bozeman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Marie Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tribble
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Briley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Pritchett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colette Eva Gilmer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millicent Yvette Foster
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Moreira
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wascher
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Durant
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Weatherley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Taroy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloysius William Reiter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Washington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Holley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Perry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Cope
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Waters
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Phillips
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Carter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Miller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaylene S. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel M. Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Southall, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin W. Cooper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Pullen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameco Gates
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McQuay
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbie D. DeHorney
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Ross
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Snoddy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hooker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Adams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Schenske-Shelton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Horen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond McNary-Willis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Patterson, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Monroe Cobbett, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shajuana Pope
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Michelle Fields
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark David Killeen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Yale
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyon Detai Belyeu
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Daniel Turner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Cannon Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gudgel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanga Sparks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Malone
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie A. Powers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Gardner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Lindsay
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Frazier
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Porter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lavelle Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gergory Allan Myers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Elaine Tanner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Dubose
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Faye Cook
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Albert Sage
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Jean Butler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lynn Green
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Pressley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dushawn Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurizio Marchese
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Oberholtzer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Flammer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Dooley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faykeita Dunbar Wearing
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Alan Conner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ann Malcom-Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levine Levingston-Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Villarreal, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Martin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus McCoy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darron Barnes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Eugene Cooper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina Hall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Sledge
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Anne Flournoy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Loranso Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshawn C. Mitchell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Cook
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gonzales
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe, 1
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Calhoun
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Desire
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. McClean
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Kincey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert James
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin McCall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Parmenter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Seelye
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathi Ray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevyon Willis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Lorraine Spears
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Leroy Phipps
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jon Crenshaw
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre L. Hale
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mooney
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Fleming
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Maxey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe June Quiambao
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettie Jean Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Todd Moses
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Roberts, III
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevyon Paul Ryan Willis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Represented By: Debra Elaine Pole
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?