Walters et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: G.W.1, LeeAnne Walters, G.W.2., Rabecka Cordell, Vernita Coleman, M.D., Cynthia Ferguson-Willliams, Mary-Ashley Barker, Starla Barnefske, P.M., KJ.G., Chevella Davis, Y.A., N.C., Laloni Clark, Cherese Bransford, Lacey Case, Najah Dillard, Kenyrda Houston, Sharon Childress, Sheimyee Brown, Alma Fox, Takeia Collier, Z.B., D.I., G.B., BI.B., W.H., D.A., G.L., Geneva Cook, SJ.L., P.E., Jamie Heltzel, Q.B., T.D., A.P., P.P., Roshania Howard, A.O., Meshae Gordon, B.V., B.N.2, Annetta Allen, Kacetta Grear, Carolyn Aubrey, SCH.S., Stacy Creed, Quteka Bush, Chrie Atkins, Alyissa Dustin, Michael D. Zerka, Sad'e Gibson, E.F., Z.J., Danial Arnold, R.F., T.S., Terrie Crockett, S.C., KneKisha Bunch, Shawntele Browne, R.C., IJ.C., Ryan Hodgins, J.E., A.S., E.N., A.M., Innica Grass, E.A., P.I., Nathaniel Grover, Quenna Brown, K.F., Danyell Croom, C.I., Seneca Barnes, Amanda Burgess, Sawnte Crudup, J.K., Tichinay Brown, Daniel Gill, T.E., F.J., K.B.1, Shannon Hatfield, Willie Daniel, Crystal Handley, Jeffrey Ampy, Artis Campbell, Letisha Davis, W.D., Belinda Allen, Nadia Gibson, M.F., Shalonda Crofton, Kristine Acevedo, N.A., Taffiney Howell, A.V. 1, Q.F., Chameka Davis, Tony Deloney, Caitlyn Brennan, M.CG., L.D., Michael Cogar, Leandre Beard, Alexandria Corneilius, MJ.D., Terry Boven, Charnita Herron, RJ.R., Monica Geick, J.F., F.C., L.E., J.A., M.U., Carl Hall, Okneea Hellems, R.R., O.B., Gladys Beal, Dominysha Edelen, Sonya Austin, Lajoi Goff, S.Q., Lawrence Durrett Jr, Mayowa Alfolabi, GJ.D., M.W., M.H., Ricky Gordon, I.B., G.K., Monique Booker, K.R., Latasha Flowers, J.S., Tekisha Davis, P.T., Alma Hill, W.J., L.F., Bianca Buchanon, Iyana Al-Amin, K.AJ., J.D., T.G., C.W., A.G., Aaliyah Arrington, Dewayne Green, Donna Holmes, Misti Hanna, W.M., Heather Beach, GJ.B., W.W., J.GI., Marcia Fryer, Edward Edelen, Catiera Hill, Shirley Booker, Linda E. Smith, Stephanie Britt, Victoria Chapman, EI.T., R.P., Deaisha Greenlee, F.F., K.N., Tom Abney, C.L., Consuelo Coleman, K.G,, Laurie Frost, Sharonda Cager, Marcetta Elston, A.T., Taraina Davenport, Kenchelle Bedenfield, T.L., B.S., E.B., Larica English, Corey Baker, Lakeisha Glover, She'a Cobb, Kanisha Coleman, Lakresha Brandon, Tiffany Burnett, Tesha Frank, Shameka Dunlap, Dorlesha Barnett, Z.G., B.J., B.N.1, L.A., L.W., M.FJ., Jawanza Brown, Anthony Bostic, H.S., A.B., E.J., X.T., N.K., Tony Haywood, Chanuwan Brooks, Suzan Early, L.H., Mary Gibson, Sarah Cheeseman, Janaka Collins, R.H., Donna Greenlick, Dalia Alexis, Shaketta Brooks, Brandi Flick, Fredrick Brown, Madelyn Amy, KaRon Elston, Jessica Grams, Jodi Benedict, M.B.2, H.X., Tinisha Cephus, Stephanie Danette Bradley, T.I., T.C., Monique Bryant, Mariam Fandjalan, Dunjeanetta Darling, Ebony Hall, B.Z.1, K.M., J.Y., Magen Baker, Jacobi Gaines, Ladelia Hampton, Steve Deloney, Lonise Coulter, F.B., Bradley Helms, G.J., Lin Coley, D.D., Carlos Duane Sparks, JOhnetta Allen, Delgarto Greene, K.L., B.D., B.M., P.H., Trisha Hill, C.A., Anika Anderson, shenika Hamilton, RI.C., Dominque Green, Jessica Brackins, J.N., B.E.2, Leandre Crosby, Amie Dinnan, E.R., V.A., Shayla Boose, K.D., Rosalinda Guerrero, L.C., Laqueta Durrett, E.H., C.T., I.A., A.B.1, Shaniya Brown, Jacqueline Carr, Darwin C Evans, Carrie Green, Emma Cunningham, Mohamed Djire, Francine Boone, Lucritia Allen, H.H., Onaka Cross, P.K., C.F., K.J., Jill Groves, C.H., Stephan Flowers, Z.V., Talita Hill, O.C., T.M., Carli Bolley, LI.F., RJ.H., Kirklynn Briggs, Maresa Gillespie, Kamilah Hampton, A.C., G.P., Kimberly Carradine, A.K., Latora Cooley, Danielle Chapman, JJ.T., N.T., C.R., N.G., Janice Broadnax, Krystal Dismuke, Justis Gonzales, Kenya Franklin, R.B., Jennifer Barnett, D.H., S.J., L.R., Erika Glover, L.M., Aneisha Evans, A.A.3, N.R., Matangela Hopkins, Lasoyna Gossett, Latoria Cross, T.B., Satoria Carroll, Shawrica Bell, Derek Davis, Chereese Green, X.W., N.A.2, Crystal Callway, V.O., G.N., Jerome Flood, I.J., Lisa Davidson, Lisa Gilbert, Cameron Carroll, Joseph Belin, A.H., Darlene Harden, Anthony Glen Bowling, B.Z., Charley Howell, Gregory Harrison, H.D., Dequarus Dudley, F.D., Dewayne Bedenfield, Julius Hester, M.B., M.M., T.A., Sharondra Foard, J.CI., Cassandra Evans, M.J., Tracey Gordon, K.P., Mark Edwards, B.A., Taylor Clary-Genella, Danjuma Greer Sr., C.D., Kamala Blount, Brittnie Gardner, S.A., Shavonne Brown, D.G., ZENA ATOU, Shakeisha Herbert, Brenda Holmes, P.C., M.V., H.WJ., S.T., K.B., J.T., G.T., H.B., Heather Eastman, Chantal Cox, AJ.M., N.V., I.G., Vincent Conn, J.L., Stacy Fluty, Kapresha Barber, W.V., Mary Howe, JJ.C., Melanie Diehl, Shalonda Golden, GI.A., Jacquline Clark, S.F., Latricia Crane, H.U., S.H., H.J., Delandra Boone, P.S., N.J., Jerry Carter, K.S., Goldie Alomar, C.C., Joys Anthony, Kimberly Frost, Alvera Cobb, AMY BOYD, Tarnisha Briggs, Barbara Bailey, L.L., A.D., T.F., Aquielle Clark, A.J., Teaonia Halford, B.T., Jocelyn Brandon, Amanda Engelmann, H.E., Z.D., Taniya Dawson, J.J., C.K., Vanessa Davis, L.B., D.T., Andre Brandon, Mistie Broughton, Tia Duncan, Shaquilla Hearns, F.R., Gwendalyn Collins, C.J., Kyla Hart, David Gray, NI.C., D.C., Debra Altheimer-Richardson, Jacquetta Barefield, MI.F., Z.C., Hebony Caldwell, Simone Chambry, Derisa Grear, D.W., MI.H., Tiffany Brown-Spencer, Jackie Fells, D.M., R.S., Raushawnda Harper, G.M., Lanay Clark, H.R., E.T., Jessica Godfrey, Shayla Ecker, Amber Heilig, Tanya Barnett, Tiffany Drake, TerriLynn Brown, B.K., Marlon Gillespie, B.E., J.H., Hannah Groves, Teaira Anthony, Angela Garner, Chelon Daniels, Robert Fordham, S.R., Rotika Holiday, KIRA BARNES, Michael Fordham, Tatyonna Handley, G.Z., Kayairra Beard, Lisa Harman, Irving Crowder, Nichole Bovee, Laura Ball, G.S., RI.M., S.L., Sajer Cureton, Cherry Brown, Cora Cathey, O.H., T.H., S.Z., Alonzo Goodman, J.G., Tanayah Fisher, Z.M., Somoya Brown, E.L.2., C.G., R.G., Nicole Allen-Nelson, Cianna Batson, Katrina Hart, W.A., EI.J., C.S., S.B., Tondalaya Coffee, Joyceland Fisher, Tanesha Brown, SD.J., Ashley Estrada, Antoinette Brown, K.G., Crystle Davidson, Shaniquia Gilbert, H.M., A.E., Sarah Hester, A.N., DaReisha Bobo, Clara Broom, Deetta Bright, KJ.J., B.H., H.T., Joesy Gindlesperger, Chamika Bates, Marquice Finley, Porchia Brown, Erika Barton, April Eubanks, H.L., C.M., Z.A., Shaquesha Burrell, D.S., Evreika Fields, L.G., V.R., E.W., Litricia Couch, D.L., Mawiyah Burns, PJ.K., D.B., Keith Horton, Martina Burton, Gardell Haralson, E.K., JASON COULTER, B.I., Shaquita Hamilton, Keiarah Green, Sonceria Ford, Dashira Balknight, Jessica Helms, Unique Fisher, Shameka Browne, A.MJ., G.D., Kimberly Gaddy, C.B., L.S., Sara Bell, Nicole Adams, Shannon Clark, V.N., Samara Horne, Britnay Cavazos, Steven Brown, K.C., Patricia Bush-Brown, Samone Bell, Leondris Davis, Christopher Buzzard, Kevin Holland, Tennille Anderson, Tierika Green, Timothy Bell, TJ.S., R.K., Brooke Garrison, Clinique B-Wallace, R.E., Joewillie Broadnax, Lawana Hillard, E.L., S.G., Jacqulyn Douglas, Reekila Harrison-Dudley, E.D., Lydia Gamboa, M.P., Sharika Gary, Q.H., Z.R., G.R., Pearlena Glenn, B.N., Sharell Brown, ASHLEY BRAND, Lindsey Goss, S.E., Jessica Horne, J.M., Shivone Darby, S.K., Audrey Ferguson, M.E., T.R., S.D., M.K., Capitola Ashley, Annette Hollins, Sandra Goolsby, Totiona Hardaway, Samantha Denison, J.P., J.W., Lance Ford, Mercedes Guzman, W.S., Kyna Edwards, E.S., FI.S., Marria Daniels, Brittney Barker, B.R., Z.S., D.F., Janay Coleman-Sanders, A.L., P.B., A.F., B.GW., P.J., Yolanda Brown, Junetta Christian, Michael Garland, BJ.D., J.C., Tiseema Hall, W.E., Robert Brown, A.Y., Emerald Boyd, I.M., O.J., B.D.1, Teresa Boom, G.E., O.D., Shareka Howard, D.N., Lachandra Griggs, Cynthia Callaway, Sharonda Curry, H.F., Kanisha Holmes, M.A., Dewaun Bell Jr., Robert Harris, K.GJ., A.W., Kenosha Gatewood, DJ.G., Langene Griffin, F.E., Iva Corthion, M.T., Cherish Cowan, Audra Bell, Meghan Galliway, DJ.C., B.B., C.BJ, G.F., P.W., Billy Gorden, R.A., JJ.G., Keyla Cooper, Kimberly Hoffman, N.M., Meggan Deshazer, R.W., M.G., H.A., Tiffany Edmonson, B.C., Delores Davis, Dana Broadnax, T.T., Shemica Harper, Thomas Brown Sr., Akera Davis, Di'Anndra Davis, Bianca Forster, F.L., Sheila Hopkins, D.J., K.H., Shanai Britten, Qwedra Evans, M.C., TJ.M., Vita Arrington, A.R., BJ.C., Fred Anthony III, Alyssa Brown, Kishon Davis, Dezrelon Gaddy, Jeffrey Curl, Willie Davis, U.B., Denise Alexander, Renzellous Brown, Shanice Buchanon, N.H., Genise Horton, T.W., Angelique Crandell, C.E., D.R., C.P., A.A., Jessica Getter, La'Porcha Blueitt, G.C., Mariah Hilliard, M.L., Chloe Bell, F.G., M.S., Yolanda Collins, T.F.1, Carlyn Abron, Mercades Dixon, Ali Griffith, Manuel Davis, Debra Campbell, Pertrina Coolden, J.B., G.A., S.S., Laquisha Burnett, Cedric Barry Sr. and Dessarea Crayton
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2020cv12726
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Matthew F Leitman
2 Judge: Judith E Levy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Water Infrastructure Bonds White Paper) (Walker, Renner)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #15 STIPULATION. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss extending time to respond by All Plaintiffs (Walker, Renner)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.M., C.W., D.S., E.W., J.K., J.L., J.T., L.P., N.G., T.Z., TJ.S., W.C., CHINIKA YOUNG, Margaret Yearby, Kamika York, Nakia Young, Shanay Young, Shantaja Young, Shaquarius Young, Yvonne Young, Janea Young-Brooks, Melissa Zann. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.G., G.A., LI.J., RI.G., S.W., W.M., Alea Wright, Lasonja Wright, Lovie Wright, Saquanda Wright, Telisha Wright, Velma Wright. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs H.E., J.R., M.WJ., W.E., Michael Woolfolk, Maureen Woolworth, Torrie Wortham. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.W., D.W., G.A., J.K., J.K., W.S., Latana Woods, Shamica Woods, Jodie Woodworth. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs E.H., M.J., M.T., Leanna Woodley. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.W., Dallche WIlson. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs E.W., Trisha Winer. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs K.C., SI.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.W., R.A., T.W., T.W., Tyisha Thomas, W.K., Gabriel Wilson, Thomas Wilson, Z.W., Z.W.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant D.W., Plaintiffs K.W., M.W., TJ.M., Clara Wilson. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.A., D.W., D.W., E.W., H.R., J.W., L.W., M.W., S.W., T.W., W.K., WJ.D., Lisa Williams Inman, Catessa Willie, Kira Willingham, Sheila Willis, Sonya Willis, Tashaya Willis, Alicia Wilson, Ashley Wilson, Daniel Wilson, Keiana Wilson, Tyisha Wilson, Z.D., Z.D., Z.D., Z.T.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.C., D.M., H.R., H.W., J.N., J.W., J.W., K.T., K.T., K.T., K.T., L.C., L.W., M.T., M.W., M.W., S.D., T.P., W.A., W.K., Bennie Williams, Brenda Williams, Candice Williams, Jamarte Williams, Kimberly Williams, Mallory Williams, Shirley Williams, Tia Williams, Tiffany Williams, Lewis Williams II, Z.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.V., D.W., D.W., E.S., G.J., G.W., I.B., J.C., J.F., J.W., K.C., K.T., L.W., LJ.R., M.S., N.H., S.D., S.W., V.B., V.B., W.K., Adia Wheeler, Alisha Wheeler, Danielle Wheeler, Lawrence White, Sade White, Tavares White, Jamilya Whitner, Anita Wickham, Ariel Wiggins, Angela Wilborn, James Wilborn Sr, Anita Williams, Latonia Williams, Latress Williams, Savoyia Williams, Tailiah Williams, Z.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 20, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.A., G.L., G.W., J.J., J.M., J.M., J.T., K.W., K.W., L.M., M.N., T.W., A.JI., A.W., W.K., Jeanet Watson, Jacqueline Weaver, Jessica Webber, Dustin Wefel, Alicia Weidman, Yemisi Wells, Trishanda Wesley, Kamesha Westbrook, Kinyon Westbrook, Defendant L.W.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 19, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.W., C.W., D.G., D.G., D.G., E.R., F.G., G.W., G.W., H.F., H.W., J.E., J.E., J.F., K.N., K.WI., L.B., L.R., M.W., N.W., O.T., R.H., R.N., R.R., R.W., R.W., RI.W., RJ.N., S.J., S.R., S.W., S.W., T.W., W.S., Lashonna Wallace, Dominique Walls, Candice Walters, LeeAnne Walters, Thomas Wandrey, Angela Ward, Antwan Ward, Gerald Ware, Lakreesha Ware, Cynthia Warren, Lynetta Warren, Catherine Washington, Jessica Washington, Kenyoda Washington, Ramona Washington, Ronald Washington, Ronald Washington, Shanika Washington, Trenay Washington, Venita Washington, Kenyetta Waterford, Z.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 19, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.S., C.J., C.K., C.T., C.V., D.V., F.W., H.M., H.S., J.J., J.M., J.W., K.I., K.J., K.W., L.J., L.W., M.S., M.W., S.S., S.U., S.U., S.W., S.W., S.W., T.A., T.S., T.U., Earthly Upchurch, V.D., V.M., VJ.J., Michelle Vanderhagen, Johnnie Vary, Terri Vaughn, Robert Vickers, Loretha Vincent, Gerald Vincent Irvin, Danessa Violette, W.B., W.J., W.J., W.W., Melissa Waddell, Cierra Wade, Mikki Wade, Sharonda Wade, Sheena Wade, Cassidy Wade Harrison, Phillip Wadsworth, Tracey Waite, Artelia Walker, Diandre Walker, Kevin Walker, Rochelle Walker, Shaquille Walker, Sheree Walker, Tequila Walker. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 19, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.B., C.B., C.T., C.T., D.J., D.S., D.T., E.X., EI.R., G.T., J.D., J.G., K.B., K.T., L.P., M.B., M.D., M.T., M.T., R.J., R.K., S.B., S.D., T.A., T.B., T.B., T.C., T.C., T.C., T.H., T.J., T.T., T.T., T.W., Sheena Tipton, Kaitlyn Tobin, Malikah Todd, Lauren Travis, Latavia Trice, Stephanie Tripp, Amara Tripplett, Sylvia Tripplett, Aleen Trumbo, Alvinia Trumbo, Tamekia Tucker, Michelle Turner, Tracey Turner, Donald Turner II, Teaqua Turnipseed, Christina Tyler, General Tyler, Sakoya Tyler, Stephanie Tyler, W.A., W.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Unpublished Michigan District Court Docket) (Gabel, Louis)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs BI.D., C.W., E.K., E.T., J.S., J.T., J.W., K.S., N.S., R.W., S.T., T.J., T.K., T.N., Sarita Thompson, Sianne Thompson, Sifus Thompson, Davida Thornton, Tiffany Thornton, Euleen Thorton, Ikea Tillis, Shomari Tillis, Eric Tillman, W.D., W.E., Y.A.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs E.R., G.T., J.T., Kristen Thompson, Monique Thompson, Z.T.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.C., D.T., G.T., J.G., J.G., J.S., J.T., JJ.G., JJ.G., K.T., K.T., L.T., S.T., T.J., T.J., TI.H., Lakeisha Thomas, Samantha Thomas, James Thomas Jr, Brianna Thompson. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.T., D.H., D.T., G.T., J.C., J.S., J.T., Ernest Kristy, M.J., M.Z., S.C., S.T., S.T., T.T., KRISTY THOMAS, Amber Tedhams, Apricott Teed, Levolia Thames, Bobbie Theodore, Anaesha Thomas, April Thomas, Debony Thomas, W.M., Z.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.R., E.H., G.T., J.L., M.S., N.T., Q.D., S.P., T.G., T.M., Ashley Taylor, Grace Taylor, Shade Taylor, Shalonda Taylor, Shimesha Taylor, Brittany Teague, Qualimetra Teat, Z.E.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.B., E.S., E.S., H.C., K.H., K.S., M.B., M.M., N.E., N.E., N.H., P.K., P.K., P.K., Jessica Strong, Katrina Strong, Tanisha Summers, Kendralia Sweeney, Marisa Sweeney, Ryanesha Swims, Kristen Szabo, T.J., T.K., T.M., Tracy Talcott, Sierra Talton, Theresa Tanner, Blake Taylor, Grace Taylor, Keona Taylor, Tiesha Taylor. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs J.S., K.A., K.S., KJ.A., L.S., L.S., M.S., SR.S., Kenn Starnes, Curtis Steele, Avian Stephens, Damonasha Stephens, Andre Stephenson, Monique Stevenson, Ashley Stewart, Dajaneke Stockman, Rachela Stockman, T.P., T.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.S., D.N., E.S., E.S., G.S., I.F., I.S., J.S., K.S., L.A., L.T., M.H., M.H., M.S., S.T., Jasmine Snow, Debra Soto, Lynnette Spears, Shantara Spicer-Johnson, Amanda Spooner, Krystal Spooner, Sharita Stacks, Jenny Staggs, Rachel Stanley, Shatoya Starks, T.P., T.S., V.H., W.S., Z.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.S., D.B., D.T., J.B., J.B., J.L., J.S., J.S., M.E., M.M., M.M., N.H., R.J., S.M., Andonia Smith, Breaunna Smith, Deandre Smith, Kadeja Smith, LaQuisha Smith, Shanqunique Smith, Dondrell Smith Sr., Tawanna Smith-Simmons, T.W., Z.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 18, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.J., D.T., DJ.T., J.R., J.S., J.S., J.S., J.W., J.W., J.W., R.C., R.T., S.E., S.N., Amanda Smith, Briona Smith, Felicia Smith, Jojuana Smith, LaQuisha Smith, Laquita Smith, Tamara Smith, Tasha Smith, Veleta Smith, T.J., T.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.B., J.J., J.J., J.J., L.S., S.A., S.G., S.M., Ashley Sisco, Jessica Slade, Laketra Slaughter, Marilyn Slaughter, Jojuana Smith. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.J., D.S., E.S., H.T., J.M., K.H., N.J., S.W., Abby Simmonds, Deandrea Simon-Shields, Vanita Singleton-Hill. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.S., J.S., J.S., L.R., O.C., S.B., S.S., John Shorez, Latrina Shoup, Clifton Shultz. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.S., M.S., RJ.W., Darryl Shoemo, Stacia Shoemo. (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs S.K., Chushana Sheared, Martiquo Sherrod. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.R., D.D., G.B., J.S., J.S., S.D., S.L., S.M., SJ.S., Spencer Sharkey, Stephanie Sharp, Cyara Sharpe, KayCi Shaw, W.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs M.S., P.D., S.J., Amy Scroggins, Tilisa Scroggins, Katara Sealey, Josephine Seay, Michael Shaker, TI.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs J.A., J.S., J.S., R.Z., R.Z., S.O., Bobby Sawyers, Chad Schlosser, Angel Schmidt, Kayla Schwind, Chiquita Scott, B.D., B.D., Z.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.J., D.L., K.A., K.B., K.C., K.L., M.B., M.B., Edsel Sanders, Shina Sanders, Michelle Santiago, Keyaira Saundars, T.S., W.A., W.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.A., C.D., C.D., C.W., H.S., J.R., J.R., J.R., J.R., K.J., K.J., K.R., K.T., K.W., K.W., K.W., L.D., L.S., M.K., M.M., Nicole S Marshall, R.C., R.C., R.J., R.R., R.R., R.T., RI.T., Johnny Roberts Jr., Carrie Robinson, Coretha Robinson, Shayla Robinson, Torrey Robinson I, Tonya Rogers, Vanessa Romero, Amanda Ross, Jamanda Ross, Sharese Ross, Shana Rowser, Regina Rudd, Denise Ruff, Dinah Ruff, Latasha Ruff, S.F., S.M., S.R., S.R., S.W., Sheena Saldana, Korethea Sanders, Vanita Sanders, T.R., W.K., Z.R.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs B.L., B.R., C.J., C.M., D.J., D.J., D.P., G.R., G.R., G.S., I.J., J.H., J.R., J.R., K.D., K.M., K.R., K.R., K.S., L.R., L.R., L.R., L.S., M.H., M.H., M.R., M.S., O.T., R.D., R.M., Keanion Randolph, Terry Randolph, Denise Rankin, Ashley Rau, Sarah Raymond, Thelma Redwine, Angielic Reed, Sheley Rembert, Gilbert Reyna, Tia Reyna, Lakeiya Rice, Markel Rice Sr, Sheila Richard, Kimberly Richardson, Latifa Riddick, Laquesha Riggs, Diar Riley, Andre Rison, S.J., S.M., S.R., T.S., V.R., X.R., Z.R.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 17, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.P., D.P., E.B., FJ.J., G.J., HJ.P., I.J., I.J., J.J., J.L., J.P., J.P., J.P., J.P., M.A., M.P., M.Z., N.J., P.E., P.P., Kenyun Pittman, Lashari Pitts, Monica Pointer, Sheila Pollard, Shawnette Poole, Vivian Pope, Carron Powell, Carylynn Prescott, Ashley Price, Simmone Price, Ashleigh Prieur, Hannibal Prince Sr, Sequoya Prince-Dantzler, Alisha Pringle, Trisha Pringle, Autumn Proffitt, Jackie Putney, Deangelia D. Quintana, R.A., R.A., R.E., ShaRhonda Railsten, Lonniesha Rainey, S.A., S.N., S.P., S.S., T.E., T.N., W.K.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.T., C.T., C.T., D.T., J.H., J.P., J.P., J.W., K.J., L.P., M.M., M.P., M.W., N.P., N.R., P.H., David Penn, Tiara Peoples, Jessica Peppler, Barbara Perry, Jeanette Perry, Naomie Perry, Gloria Perry-Walker, Daniel Perryman, Abony Person, Robin Person, Alexandria Philpots, Derek Pickens, Maria Pina, Jessica Pintacura, W.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs C.F., C.P., D.O., K.P., M.C., M.O., M.P., M.R., NJ.P., O.M., P.M., TIFFANY PARSONS, ALISHA PATTON, Danielle Parker, Noah Patton, Sirrita Payne, Demetria Payton, Shanay Payton, Gatora Peeples, Michael Penn, S.A., S.P., S.S., T.P., V.M., A.C., A.C., AJ.F.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Sade Nelson, A.N., Stephanie Nettles, N.D., J.G., Shedonn Newell, A.B., Purcessine Nichols, C.Z., C.Z., Z.C., Z.C., C.Z., Z.C., Erin Nord, C.J., Dayna Norton, S.C., Andre O'Daniel, Jr, O.S., D.T., Dominique O'Neal, A.G., D.G., Napolean Odom, O.O., Q.O., Shelby Offord, N.S., C.S., S.N., J.K., K.S., Mitaya Ogburn, T.R., Matthew Oliveto, O.E., Crystal Ollie, J.W., Stephanie Ollie, O.C., Breona Oney, A.W., Shana Orso, K.K., W.B., N.B., Tasha Osborne, T.O., Kierra Oudenago, O.M., O.M., Janika Owens, Z.M., D.S., Cortney Paige, E.P., L.C., Z.C., Sherry Palmatier, L.P., E.P., Micah Parker, M.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Alicia Morreau, L.H., Joel Morris, L.M., M.L., L.M., L.M., LI.A., Kiesha Morris, T.E., J.H., H.K., William Mosley, M.M., W.M., A.M., Ashley Mosley, A.T., A.H., Randy Moss, M.V., J.M., R.M., Robin Moton-Raheeq, K.H., S.H., Julous Moye, A.M., Carice Moye-Briggs, J.M., A.J., W.E., E.W., J.B., J.B., C.B., Sarah Mulholland, M.L., Mynette Mull, S.M., Ashley Murdaugh, J.M., L.M., Sheandra Nance, M.N., Asha Napier, A.T., LaQuanda Neal, T.C., D.P., D.P., M.P., Cary Neely, N.A., Cerone Neely, A.N., Jaquita Nelson, B.Q., R.B., Tiffany Nelson, K.N., Cecilia Nelson, C.K.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tynice Miller, S.J., Sherona Miller, T.W., J.M., Demita Miller, M.D., Destini Miller, A.A., M.J., A.S., J.J., A.A., Barbara Mitchell, C.B., Narvell Moffett, M.M., Aleantra Montgomery, WJ.W., B.M., Ciara Montgomery, Z.M., R.M., Nina Moore, T.W., Eric Moore, R.M., MM.E., Daniya Moore, A.F., N.F., M.K., D.C., A.D., Amy Moore, S.T., L.N., Keri Moore, S.A., O.L., Raymond Moore Jr., B.M., Nicolas Morales, D.M., D.M., A.M., Laquisha Morgan, L.M., N.M., J.D., Tawanna Morgan, Z.M., N.J., Karen Morgan, A.M., A.M., S.A., Kyrie Morgan, B.Z., L.E., Talieka Morgan, Q.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Jeneyah Mcdonald, J.M., J.M., J.M., Jeremy Mcdowell, M.J., M.J., Duane McFadden, D.J., Annyonne McGee, C.M., Monica McGee, M.M., Eugene McGee Jr, MI.E., Amanda McGrath, M.S., M.D., Porsche McGuire, W.E., VB.C., G.C., Tracey McLaurin, D.M., Rodnesha McLaurin, B.A., Quaninsha McNeal, A.W., M.A., Monica Medrano, M.W., Aasiyah Meeks, A.M., Tracy Messenger, R.M., J.M., Stenisha Metcalf, K.M., C.M., Brittany Michaud, A.M., A.M., A.K., A.K., Shaniece Mickens, J.H., Gabrielle Miguel, A.M., J.M., J.M., M.M., M.J., Kizzy Miles, H.K., Nina Miles, A.T., Ramonda Miller, M.J., Erica Miller, J.M., J.M., Carrie Miller, M.L., Summer Miller, A.M., Lawrence Miller, M.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs D.M., Jessica Matthews, G.D., Shambria Mayers, M.S., Ceia Mays, A.K., Teela Mays, K.B., Moneke Mayweather, S.R., Anton McBride, A.M., K.M., Cindi McBroom, P.G., Alex Mccarty, H.W., Gabrielle McClain, K.W., K.W., Jada Mcclain, D.W., Melissa Mccovery, M.J., C.D., L.M., Ethal McCovery, K.W., N.L., Victoria McCree, I.C., Porscha McCullough, J.N., D.B., Pamela McDaniel, T.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Deshna Marshall, M.S., Dayquichiesa Martin, D.J., Laquisha Martin, S.M., Katrine Martin, S.W., Suquondra Martin, M.K., D.W., M.M., Joline Martin, E.P., W.S., D.P., M.D., M.P., Michael C Martinez, A.M., J.M., Sonya Mason, N.M., Temetrese Massey, R.D., Dayna Mater, D.M., Teri Matthess, J.D., L.D., Robert Matthews, D.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs A.L., A.L., A.L., C.L., M.L., E.L., Andrea Loyd, D.L., Sandra Lusane, S.L., S.L., S.L., Michael Lyle, L.C., SHAVON LYNN, C.D., T.C., R.J., Dawn M. Scott, S.B., Stephanie Macon, S.W., D.M., Sha'Coria Macon, J.W., Hollie Maguire, L.M., Taliah Malik, MC.J., MC.J., Taquita Malloy, J.M., Dashawn Malone, M.A., Bridgette Mancour, N.C., J.C., I.C., S.C., C.C., Shannon Manning, C.M., Alisha Manning, M.J., D.B., S.B., M.J., T.M., J.M., Deidra Mansfield, L.M., M.H., LJ.S., E.S., Andrea Manuel, A.K., Adrianna Marks, J.R., K.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tiarra Lee, M.M., L.M., M.L., Jimmie Lee Scruggs, K.T., J.S., John Lee Webb, W.J., Christina Legrand, L.T., Justine Leibing, A.K., Thomas Leonard, H.N., H.M., B.C., B.S., Melissa Lewis, L.S., Tyrisha Lewis, L.E., Brittney Lewis, R.B., E.K., S.S., T.W., Chereeka Lewis, L.P., Salina Liggins, R.L., Anchina Lintz, J.L., Alicia Little, O.B., J.D., Marcella Littlejohn, D.T., L.P., Monica Loomis, J.S., S.S., J.Y., S.Y., Patrick Lopez, S.HL., Crystal Lopp, C.L., Tammy Loren, A.P., D.L., E.L., Amanda Lorick, S.T., D.L., Michael Love, L.M., L.I., R.L., L.I., L.S., Keaira Love, W.L., Talisha Lovett, G.L.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tashina Kowalski, T.B., T.S., Nadine Kuban, N.K., A.K., Alicia Kuykendall, S.C., S.C., Orlondra L Todd, C.S., J.S., Russell Lane, AJ.G., Tiana Lankford, A.B., C.B., Whitney Larock, J.H., G.L., Summer Larose, N.L., Tamika Laster, T.B., B.T., Deondre Laster Sr., DJ.L., N.M., K.L., K.L., K.L., Andriana Latchaw, J.L., Latonya Laury, J.G., Bianca Lavender, R.T., K.T., G.J., T.K., Crystal Law, N.T., Antanika Lawal, S.K., L.Z., Jasmine Lawler, L.W., J.W., J.W., J.W., J.W., Sharonda Lawrence, L.D., J.A., Teila Lawson, C.L., L.L., J.R., Heather Lay Marve, N.L.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs J.J., J.M., Frank Julius Horky, R.H., Danielle Kabel, K.A., Cyeenah Kalimah, K.C., A.W., A.N., A.N., Melissa Kelly, J.M., Ashley Kemp, J.K., M.K., M.K., Quadrina Kendall, A.K., GJ.K., Bridget Kennedy, D.D., Gabrielle Kent, G.W., E.W., Erik Keskes, B.K., C.K., Kiara Key, T.F., K.F., Zaquesha Keyes, C.K., Christine Keyes, H.L., Tylanuel Keyes, A.K., Tyree Keyes, A.K., Delano Kidd, JJ.A., Nadia Kidd, J.K., KS.A., Demetria Killin, J.K., J.D., Madison Kilpatrick, A.M., Laura Kindle, J.W., Laura King, H.K., K.U., Audra King, N.C., Racheal Kirksey, D.K., M.K., Lamara Kline, K.K., A.S., Joyce Kline, E.S., LaRenda Knapp, J.H., Johnny Knott, J.K., K.K.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs K.J., M.R., Latoya Johnson, L.F., G.K., Sheila Johnson-Toins, M.T., Takeya Jolly, A.B., M.J., K.M., J.M., Kokeeta Jones, H.T., Jaquielle Jones, J.W., Christina Jones, Z.J., Valarie Jones, C.J., Brenda Jones, P.A., Ebonie Jones, T.R., T.W., Chalonda Jones, J.J., Shaiketa Jones, D.J., J.C., A.J., F.W., Juana Jones, A.J., A.J., A.W., J.J., B.J., Keayana Jones, J.G., A.J., T.W., M.L., Christina Jones, B.J., A.W., L.J., Lula Jones, K.J., T.B., Toyanna Jones, J.J., Nicolette Jordan, J.S., J.S., J.S., A.P., Lakia Jourdan, J.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #13 Certificate of Service, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 12, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Jolynn Jackson, B.J., J.J., J.T., J.L., J.L., Janaisia Jackson, Markita Jackson, Z.D., Jameela James, Z.T., A.H., Deva James, WJ.A., ERIKA JENKINS, A.J., J.J., Alexsis Jenkins, J.J., Keri Jo Wells, J.W., M.W., Kimberly Johns, T.J., T.J., Sharonda Johnson, J.S., Evett Johnson, I.J., Candy Johnson, M.J., Darrick Johnson, J.A., T.J., M.J., Lonnie Johnson, C.T., Latasha Johnson, J.T., LJ.J., Jacrisha Johnson, R.T., Jessica Johnson, J.Y., S.J., Chantelle Johnson, D.D., Kecia Johnson, M.W., J.A., Starr Johnson, H.D., K.J., G.K., S.G., C.S., Merrill Johnson, C.M., J.N., Z.W.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs Upon Wells Fargo (Stern, Corey)
December 6, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Yolanda Ibarra, N.C., T.D., Emily Ingram, E.L., E.L., Woodrow Ingram Jr., Q.I., Jesse Irvin, J.I., Osheonna Ivey, A.N., Creola Ivy, D.I., Kristy Jackson, O.C., Lakisha Jackson, W.O., Anthony Jackson, B.E., J.A., J.A., Travis Jackson, J.K., Markita Travis, M.B., N.A., K.T., Evelyn Jackson, RJ.C., Brenda Jackson, A.E., J.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 6, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Charley Howell, W.A., Zwena Hughes, D.H., Crystal Hull, N.S., J.J., N.S., Sandra Hull, C.F., Tyrone Hunter, T.H., Angela Hunter, Z.H., L.H., S.H., Latasha Hunter, H.H., L.H., Timothy Hunter, S.J., C.H., Rex Huntley, A.H., S.H., SHANTEE HUNTLEY, W.I., L.R., Sasha Hurst, DJ.H., Z.H., Jennifer Husocki, MJ.S., Dekecia Hutchins, J.H.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 4, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Kenyrda Houston, K.H., Shareka Howard, P.H., MI.H., Roshania Howard, B.S., Mary Howe, A.B., L.B., M.H., Charley Howell, F.G., R.W., Taffiney Howell, B.H., A.H.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Mariah Hilliard, N.H., Ryan Hodgins, C.H., Kimberly Hoffman, H.E., H.J., Rotika Holiday, A.W., L.W., J.W., Kevin Holland, E.N., Annette Hollins, A.H., A.H., L.W., Brenda Holmes, M.H., I.G., Donna Holmes, E.H., J.H., Kanisha Holmes, D.S., Matangela Hopkins, M.S., Sheila Hopkins, SCH.S., Jessica Horne, R.E., BJ.D., T.B., A.H., H.H., Samara Horne, E.T., Y.A., A.Y., Genise Horton, D.S., Keith Horton, K.H., K.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Sarah Hester, H.D., Trisha Hill, W.W., H.X., J.H., H.J., Alma Hill, M.J., P.T., H.E., Catiera Hill, F.C., F.C., Talita Hill, C.M., D.M., Lawana Hillard, RI.M., T.M., T.B., A.L.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Gregory Harrison, S.K., Reekila Harrison-Dudley, R.K., Katrina Hart, K.H., Kyla Hart, K.H., Shannon Hatfield, N.H., Tony Haywood, C.H., Shaquilla Hearns, M.H., K.H., H.S., Amber Heilig, T.S., P.S., H.E., E.H., Okneea Hellems, E.H., E.H., E.H., Jessica Helms, D.H., Bradley Helms, B.H., Jamie Heltzel, A.B., A.G., O.H., Shakeisha Herbert, M.D., J.M., Charnita Herron, H.L., Sarah Hester, P.I., Julius Hester, H.A.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs L.M., L.M., Carl Hall, C.H., Tiseema Hall, H.T., T.H., T.H., Ebony Hall, A.M., A.M., shenika Hamilton, J.H., J.B., M.B., B.N., M.B., S.B., K.B., Shaquita Hamilton, J.H., J.F., J.C., L.C., Ladelia Hampton, T.H., Kamilah Hampton, K.H., K.H., Crystal Handley, E.F., E.F., E.F., Tatyonna Handley, TJ.M., Misti Hanna, J.Y., Gardell Haralson, H.A., Totiona Hardaway, R.H., A.H., Darlene Harden, B.H., Lisa Harman, H.M., Shemica Harper, M.K., H.S., Raushawnda Harper, M.M., M.M., M.M., Robert Harris, RJ.H., P.B., R.H., H.R., R.H.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Donna Greenlick, B.M., Danjuma Greer Sr., D.G., DJ.G., Langene Griffin, D.J., Ali Griffith, J.L., Lachandra Griggs, J.G., A.J., Nathaniel Grover, N.G., Jill Groves, C.G., A.G., Hannah Groves, S.G., Rosalinda Guerrero, M.CG., R.G., Mercedes Guzman, B.M., Teaonia Halford, H.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Jessica Grams, A.L., L.G., Innica Grass, T.T., David Gray, S.K., GJ.D., G.D., Kacetta Grear, G.K., G.K., Derisa Grear, G.M., PJ.K., Dewayne Green, M.J., Tierika Green, K.J., O.J., J.F., M.G., Chereese Green, B.GW., B.GW., Q.B., K.P., Dominque Green, D.M., Keiarah Green, E.R., Carrie Green, C.B., P.M., Delgarto Greene, G.J., Deaisha Greenlee, G.N., G.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Shalonda Golden, Z.G., Justis Gonzales, L.B., Alonzo Goodman, R.A., Sandra Goolsby, C.G., S.G., T.G., Billy Gorden, S.G., G.K., GJ.B., S.H., Tracey Gordon, S.B., H.U., Ricky Gordon, J.G., R.G., Meshae Gordon, G.N., Lindsey Goss, Z.G., Z.C., Lasoyna Gossett, Q.H., G.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 3, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Sad'e Gibson, C.G., T.R., Lisa Gilbert, G.K., Shaniquia Gilbert, G.T., G.D., G.D., D.G., D.G., Daniel Gill, G.A., Maresa Gillespie, M.G., Marlon Gillespie, N.G., A.G., Joesy Gindlesperger, J.GI., Anthony Glen Bowling, B.M., B.M., Pearlena Glenn, N.C., B.T., Lakeisha Glover, J.G., Erika Glover, J.H., J.H., Jessica Godfrey, JJ.T., Lajoi Goff, D.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Angela Garner, Z.C., Brooke Garrison, FI.S., Sharika Gary, K.GJ., K.G., Kenosha Gatewood, G.Z., G.D., G.N., J.C., Monica Geick, S.G., Jessica Getter, T.H., J.G., Nadia Gibson, N.G., J.B., J.B., Mary Gibson, D.G., L.G.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs A.F., A.J., T.F., Kenya Franklin, Z.B., J.F., Laurie Frost, S.F., Kimberly Frost, G.L., C.F., Marcia Fryer, D.D., Kimberly Gaddy, K.G., Dezrelon Gaddy, TJ.S., A.S., R.S., Jacobi Gaines, JJ.G., Meghan Galliway, K.F., F.L., Lydia Gamboa, A.S., A.L., M.K., Brittnie Gardner, BI.B., B.B., Michael Garland, W.M., J.G., A.G., M.G.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Lance Ford, I.J., A.J., LI.F., MI.F., Sonceria Ford, M.F., Robert Fordham, R.F., Michael Fordham, F.C., F.D., F.E., F.F., Bianca Forster, S.F., R.F., A.B., J.B., Alma Fox, W.V., Tesha Frank, T.F., K.F.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs M.F., Joyceland Fisher, P.P., Unique Fisher, Q.F., D.F., A.W., Tanayah Fisher, P.W., Brandi Flick, N.V., Z.V., A.F., A.F., Jerome Flood, J.P., Latasha Flowers, A.F., A.T., A.W., H.F., H.F., Stephan Flowers, W.H., M.F., J.F., Stacy Fluty, L.G., R.G., Sharondra Foard, K.F., K.F., K.F., K.F.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Cassandra Evans, M.E., M.E., Aneisha Evans, B.E., A.F., G.F., T.E., T.E., Mariam Fandjalan, D.C., M.C., G.F., M.C., Jackie Fells, J.F., S.F., Audrey Ferguson, L.D., L.L., S.L., Cynthia Ferguson-Willliams, D.W., Evreika Fields, A.S., J.F., J.F., Marquice Finley, J.F., M.FJ., M.F., M.F., M.F.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 2, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tiffany Edmonson, K.G., Mark Edwards, H.B., S.E., Kyna Edwards, C.G., K.G., Marcetta Elston, D.R., KaRon Elston, J.E., Amanda Engelmann, J.W., J.W., Larica English, M.E., Ashley Estrada, A.E., April Eubanks, A.E., A.E., A.E., A.E., C.E., Qwedra Evans, D.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 1, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Shameka Dunlap, M.D., K.L., S.D., Laqueta Durrett, A.G., O.D., J.J., Lawrence Durrett Jr, D.L., Alyissa Dustin, L.F., K.H., K.H., K.H., Linda E. Smith, V.N., V.N., Suzan Early, RI.C., A.E., Heather Eastman, E.A., Shayla Ecker, S.G., Edward Edelen, EI.J., E.J., P.E., Dominysha Edelen, T.M., J.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
December 1, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Samantha Denison, N.T., Meggan Deshazer, E.K., Melanie Diehl, A.B., Najah Dillard, T.D., Amie Dinnan, RJ.R., Krystal Dismuke, PJ.K., K.P., Mercades Dixon, S.G., G.L., Mohamed Djire, K.F., M.D., Jacqulyn Douglas, J.M., Tiffany Drake, M.L., Carlos Duane Sparks, S.C., Dequarus Dudley, D.D., D.D., Tia Duncan, J.D., J.D., D.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
November 24, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs M.A., Akera Davis, M.J., Kishon Davis, D.D., D.J., Tekisha Davis, T.H., C.D., Delores Davis, D.B., A.M., L.H., Taniya Dawson, N.M., P.K., Steve Deloney, S.D., Z.D., Tony Deloney. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
November 24, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs J.D., Willie Davis, D.D., D.D., Vanessa Davis, J.B., K.C., N.J., Derek Davis. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
November 24, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Crystle Davidson, F.J., Leondris Davis, K.D., Manuel Davis, A.D., Chameka Davis, MJ.D., P.B., Chevella Davis, A.D., Kishon Davis, DJ.C., Di'Anndra Davis, D.J., Letisha Davis, D.D.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, #12 Notice of Appearance, #7 Attorney Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, #1 Complaint,, #10 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #8 Stipulation, #11 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, (Stern, Corey)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Taylor on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Taylor, Charlotte)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation; Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due 12/18/2020, Response due by 1/29/2021, Reply due by 2/19/2021. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Gabel, Louis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corporation., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated. (Gabel, Louis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. identifying Other Affiliate J.P. MORGAN SECURITIES LLC, Other Affiliate J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings, Inc., for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.. (Gabel, Louis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Dates for Responsive Pleading, Stay Discovery, and Amend Complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Gabel, Louis)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Louis P. Gabel appearing on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Gabel, Louis)
November 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Shivone Darby, S.J., J.D., N.C., NI.C., Dunjeanetta Darling, D.S., Taraina Davenport, T.D., M.H., M.H., D.H., Lisa Davidson, W.S., R.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification (Stern, Corey)
November 4, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Danyell Croom, S.C., Z.S., M.C., KJ.G., D.C., Leandre Crosby, A.C., T.F.1, J.M., A.C., M.C., Onaka Cross, Latoria Cross, C.R., M.L., A.L., Irving Crowder, C.D., IJ.C., C.C., Sawnte Crudup, Z.S., C.L., Emma Cunningham, C.B., B.Z., A.B., Sajer Cureton, S.C., Jeffrey Curl, C.J., Sharonda Curry, A.C., Michael D. Zerka, B.Z., Stephanie Danette Bradley, C.C., Willie Daniel, D.D., Chelon Daniels, Marria Daniels, S.Q., D.T., SD.J., M.S., E.S., A.D., A.D.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #6 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification (Stern, Corey)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs Upon Stifel, Nicolaus and Company (Walker, Renner)
October 29, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Dessarea Crayton, D.D., Stacy Creed, Z.C., T.C., M.C., M.B., Terrie Crockett, J.C., N.C., Shalonda Crofton, E.B., M.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification (Stern, Corey)
October 26, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Keyla Cooper, R.R., R.K., A.R., Rabecka Cordell, D.C., Alexandria Corneilius, T.S., A.B., M.C., Iva Corthion, H.L., Litricia Couch, X.T., JASON COULTER, A.C., J.CI., J.C., Lonise Coulter, A.S., M.S., Cherish Cowan, B.T., T.T., T.T., Chantal Cox, C.D., Angelique Crandell, S.K., Z.C., Latricia Crane, K.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,,, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, #5 Certificate of Service, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 23, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Michael Cogar, P.W., Consuelo Coleman, R.C., Kanisha Coleman, W.D., Vernita Coleman, B.D., R.C., Janay Coleman-Sanders, M.S., J.S., Lin Coley, K.L., Takeia Collier, C.BJ, Janaka Collins, B.V., Gwendalyn Collins, C.R., Janaka Collins, B.J., Yolanda Collins, B.C., Vincent Conn, S.T., Geneva Cook, S.A., I.B., Pertrina Coolden, B.I., B.M., Latora Cooley, M.V., N.V.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,,, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, #5 Certificate of Service, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs Re: J.P. Morgan Chase (Stern, Corey)
October 21, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Junetta Christian, N.A., S.C., Lanay Clark, C.A., A.C., A.C., Jacquline Clark, N.C., A.E., Shannon Clark, M.C., A.C., J.C., Laloni Clark, A.C., Aquielle Clark, A.MJ., Taylor Clary-Genella, A.D., A.D., P.W., A.W., Alvera Cobb, A.A., JJ.C., C.C., She'a Cobb, B.S., B.Z., Tondalaya Coffee, M.C., J.C., J.T.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, Addition of Parties,,,, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 21, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Lacey Case, C.H., R.H., Cora Cathey, J.C., Britnay Cavazos, B.R., A.H., D.H., Tinisha Cephus, C.C., J.C., Simone Chambry, M.D., M.C., Victoria Chapman, J.C., Danielle Chapman, M.C., T.L., T.L., Sarah Cheeseman, D.C., A.C., Sharon Childress, O.C., T.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, Addition of Parties,,,, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 21, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Patricia Bush-Brown, J.F., Z.B., Christopher Buzzard, C.R., Darwin C Evans, E.D., Sharonda Cager, J.B., Hebony Caldwell, F.R., Cynthia Callaway, C.D., N.R., Crystal Callway, Debra Campbell, S.C., Artis Campbell, A.C., M.C., Jacqueline Carr, B.C., J.C., B.C., B.C., B.C., J.C., Kimberly Carradine, C.T., Cameron Carroll, A.C., A.N., Satoria Carroll, A.C., M.U., E.W., Jerry Carter, M.M., Defendant B.C.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, Addition of Parties,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 21, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs S.C., K.B., C.W., Tiffany Burnett, D.S., D.S., Laquisha Burnett, M.J., L.M., AJ.M., Mawiyah Burns, K.J., Shaquesha Burrell, T.T., R.B., D.T., T.T., Martina Burton, K.L., Quteka Bush, T.B., A.B., G.B., J.G.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 16, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Thomas Brown Sr., M.B., T.B., J.B., Tiffany Brown-Spencer, B.I., S.S., S.Z., J.S., K.B., Shawntele Browne, C.B., B.T., Shameka Browne, Z.S., Monique Bryant, I.B., I.M., R.A., Bianca Buchanon, Z.A., D.W., J.N., Shanice Buchanon, M.W., KneKisha Bunch, P.C., Amanda Burgess, D.W., M.W.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 15, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs E.W., B.A., T.D., Tichinay Brown, T.B., J.B., J.T., T.R., J.B., M.M., J.T., L.M., Renzellous Brown, U.B., Porchia Brown, P.J., B.V., J.B., Sharell Brown, G.A., G.A., P.J., J.B., Z.B., P.J.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Mistie Broughton, D.M., Fredrick Brown, Jawanza Brown, L.B., T.B., Shavonne Brown, M.T., M.T., Steven Brown, S.B., Cherry Brown, M.B., Yolanda Brown, T.B., Robert Brown, T.B., G.E., TerriLynn Brown, M.B., Antoinette Brown, EI.T., A.T., J.P., Alyssa Brown, A.B., A.B., Quenna Brown, A.B., B.B., Tanesha Brown, J.J., Somoya Brown, A.T., Shaniya Brown, D.W., Sheimyee Brown, K.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 14, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tarnisha Briggs, T.W., Kirklynn Briggs, S.E., Deetta Bright, J.B., H.B., D.B., Stephanie Britt, B.B., A.B., Shanai Britten, B.C., Dana Broadnax, B.A., B.C., Janice Broadnax, J.B., J.B., Joewillie Broadnax, M.J., M.J., J.M., Chanuwan Brooks, L.A., Shaketta Brooks, F.B., Clara Broom, R.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,,,, (Stern, Corey)
October 11, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs DaReisha Bobo, J.D., J.S., Carli Bolley, V.A., A.V. 1, Monique Booker, S.E., V.R., Shirley Booker, G.R., Teresa Boom, K.G., J.G., K.G,, Francine Boone, K.B., Delandra Boone, M.B., Shayla Boose, L.L., L.L., L.B., Anthony Bostic, C.B., Nichole Bovee, A.K., A.G., J.K., Terry Boven, Z.S., AMY BOYD, J.T., Emerald Boyd, A.A., Jessica Brackins, A.S., ASHLEY BRAND, D.J., D.J., G.C., Andre Brandon, M.A., M.J., Z.M., M.J., Jocelyn Brandon, D.B., B.B., Lakresha Brandon, JJ.G., B.J., Cherese Bransford, M.B., Caitlyn Brennan, P.S., C.S.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs La'Porcha Blueitt, L.S., S.S., KJ.J., L.S., SJ.L., D.F., T.F.1, Kamala Blount, K.B., K.B.1, A.B., Samone Bell, C.B., Audra Bell, M.B., F.B., Dewaun Bell Jr., H.B., Jodi Benedict, H.J., A.B.1. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, Addition of Parties,, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Sara Bell, T.A., Shawrica Bell, J.T., Sara Bell, K.AJ., Timothy Bell, B.T., Sara Bell, T.A., Chloe Bell, O.B., Sara Bell, T.A.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Cianna Batson, C.T., Heather Beach, K.R., E.R., T.R., C.R., Gladys Beal, Z.J., K.J., Kayairra Beard, E.L., E.L.2., Leandre Beard, B.J., Kenchelle Bedenfield, Dewayne Bedenfield, Joseph Belin, K.B., D.B., C.P., D.B., G.P., A.P., B.A., B.Z., B.Z.1. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs I.J., Tanya Barnett, B.E., B.E.2, Dorlesha Barnett, J.D., Cedric Barry Sr., D.B., T.B., Erika Barton, B.M., Chamika Bates, D.M., B.D., B.D.1. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, Addition of Parties,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Z.B., A.T., Brittney Barker, Mary-Ashley Barker, G.F., Starla Barnefske, H.WJ., M.W., C.W., Seneca Barnes, N.K., K.N., K.C., C.K., KIRA BARNES, E.B., P.B., Jennifer Barnett, T.G.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties,, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Chrie Atkins, ZENA ATOU, Carolyn Aubrey, Sonya Austin, Clinique B-Wallace, Barbara Bailey, Magen Baker, Corey Baker, Dashira Balknight, Laura Ball, Kapresha Barber, Jacquetta Barefield. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties,,, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 9, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Jeffrey Ampy, E.A., Madelyn Amy, V.O., Anika Anderson, X.W., N.C., A.C., Tennille Anderson, K.M., Joys Anthony, J.J., Teaira Anthony, J.N., Fred Anthony III, D.A., Danial Arnold, A.D., Vita Arrington, A.N., Aaliyah Arrington, L.R., Capitola Ashley, J.A., M.A., T.B., D.B., N.A., A.A.3, N.A.2, J.A., K.J., W.J., W.E., W.S., W.A., G.C., K.C., Z.C., T.S., P.B., J.H., M.B.2, G.J., N.H., H.T., J.B., B.K., B.A., A.B., Defendants B.J., Z.B.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Addition of Parties,, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Annetta Allen, C.C., JOhnetta Allen, L.E., Belinda Allen, A.A.3, BJ.C., H.A., Nicole Allen-Nelson, D.N., B.N.1, B.N.2, Goldie Alomar, G.A., GI.A., Debra Altheimer-Richardson, Z.R., S.R., G.R.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing Addition of Parties, #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, #4 Order of Reassignment/Disqualification, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Matthew F. Leitman in Flint to District Judge Judith E. Levy in Ann Arbor. (NAhm)
October 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Lucritia Allen, I.A., M.P.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Iyana Al-Amin, A.D., J.S., Denise Alexander, M.A., S.S., A.A., Dalia Alexis, M.B., Mayowa Alfolabi, A.A., A.D., A.O., A.E.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #3 Summons Issued, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance, Addition of Parties, (Stern, Corey)
October 8, 2020 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Tom Abney, M.D., Carlyn Abron, I.A., J.A., Kristine Acevedo, K.S., L.S., C.S., T.I., D.I., C.I., Nicole Adams, M.M., J.M.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option, #2 Notice of Appearance (Stern, Corey)
October 7, 2020 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renner Kincaid Walker on behalf of G.W.1, G.W.2., LeeAnne Walters. (Walker, Renner)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LeeAnne Walters against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8093261 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Genesee - County of 1st Defendant: New Castle, Delaware. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court - Eastern District of Michigan, 5:17-cv-10164, Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - New Claims and Supporting Documents) (Stern, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters et al v. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Louis P. Gabel
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Louis P. Gabel
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Louis P. Gabel
Represented By: Charlotte Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.W.1
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeAnne Walters
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.W.2.
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabecka Cordell
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernita Coleman
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ferguson-Willliams
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary-Ashley Barker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starla Barnefske
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.M.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ.G.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevella Davis
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laloni Clark
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherese Bransford
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Case
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najah Dillard
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyrda Houston
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Childress
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheimyee Brown
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Fox
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeia Collier
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.I.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BI.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Cook
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJ.L.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.E.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Heltzel
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.P.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.P.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshania Howard
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.O.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meshae Gordon
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.V.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.N.2
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annetta Allen
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kacetta Grear
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Aubrey
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCH.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Creed
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quteka Bush
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrie Atkins
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyissa Dustin
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Zerka
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sad'e Gibson
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danial Arnold
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Crockett
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KneKisha Bunch
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawntele Browne
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IJ.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Hodgins
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.E.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.N.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innica Grass
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.I.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Grover
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quenna Brown
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyell Croom
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.I.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Barnes
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Burgess
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawnte Crudup
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.K.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tichinay Brown
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gill
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.E.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.B.1
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Hatfield
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Daniel
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Handley
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ampy
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artis Campbell
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letisha Davis
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Allen
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Gibson
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalonda Crofton
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Acevedo
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taffiney Howell
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.V. 1
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chameka Davis
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Deloney
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlyn Brennan
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.CG.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cogar
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leandre Beard
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Corneilius
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Boven
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charnita Herron
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RJ.R.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Geick
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.E.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.U.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Hall
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okneea Hellems
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.R.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Beal
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominysha Edelen
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Austin
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lajoi Goff
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.Q.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Durrett Jr
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayowa Alfolabi
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GJ.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Gordon
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.K.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Booker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.R.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Flowers
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tekisha Davis
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.T.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Hill
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Buchanon
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iyana Al-Amin
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.AJ.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.G.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.G.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaliyah Arrington
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Green
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Holmes
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misti Hanna
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.M.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Beach
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GJ.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.W.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.GI.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Fryer
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Edelen
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catiera Hill
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Booker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda E. Smith
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Britt
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Chapman
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EI.T.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.P.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deaisha Greenlee
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.F.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.N.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Abney
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuelo Coleman
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.G,
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Frost
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonda Cager
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcetta Elston
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taraina Davenport
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenchelle Bedenfield
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.L.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larica English
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Baker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Glover
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: She'a Cobb
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanisha Coleman
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakresha Brandon
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Burnett
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesha Frank
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Dunlap
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorlesha Barnett
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.G.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.N.1
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.W.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.FJ.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawanza Brown
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bostic
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.S.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X.T.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.K.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Haywood
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanuwan Brooks
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzan Early
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.H.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gibson
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Cheeseman
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janaka Collins
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.H.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Greenlick
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalia Alexis
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaketta Brooks
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Flick
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Brown
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Amy
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KaRon Elston
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Grams
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Benedict
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B.2
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.X.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tinisha Cephus
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Danette Bradley
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.I.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Bryant
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariam Fandjalan
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunjeanetta Darling
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Hall
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.Z.1
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.Y.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magen Baker
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobi Gaines
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladelia Hampton
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Deloney
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonise Coulter
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.B.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Helms
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.J.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lin Coley
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Duane Sparks
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOhnetta Allen
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delgarto Greene
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.L.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.D.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.M.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.H.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Hill
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anika Anderson
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: shenika Hamilton
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RI.C.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Green
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Brackins
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.N.
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: Renner Kincaid Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.E.2
Represented By: Corey M. Stern
Represented By: